Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 17 Today
» 772 Yesterday
» 3439 Week
» 15217 Month
» 304609 Year
» 815711 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Dunfermline Townhill


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Dunfermline Townhill Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2437 4w/e 27/04/1968 62A Thornton Junction 5w/e 01/08/1970 62C 06/10/1980 Withdrawn
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2438 5w/e 01/06/1968 62A Thornton Junction 5w/e 01/08/1970 62C 19/11/1972 Withdrawn
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2439 4w/e 27/04/1968 62A Thornton Junction 5w/e 01/08/1970 62C 26/11/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2440 4w/e 27/04/1968 62A Thornton Junction 5w/e 01/08/1970 62C 30/08/1975 Withdrawn
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2442 5w/e 01/06/1968 62A Thornton Junction 5w/e 01/08/1970 62C 01/11/1972 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13341 05/04/1957 62A Thornton Junction (New) 5w/e 01/08/1970 62C 22/09/1981 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3560 5w/e 01/08/1970 62B Dundee West 5w/e 01/08/1970 62C 20/07/2001 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3734 4w/e 24/02/1968 62A Thornton Junction 5w/e 01/08/1970 62C w/e 26/02/1972 36A Doncaster
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3737 4w/e 25/11/1967 62A Thornton Junction 5w/e 01/08/1970 62C 18/01/1992 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3891 4w/e 28/12/1968 62A Thornton Junction 5w/e 01/08/1970 62C 4w/e 25/11/1972 66C Hamilton (West)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3892 5w/e 31/08/1968 62A Thornton Junction 5w/e 01/08/1970 62C 4w/e 28/11/1970 64H Leith Central
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2414 5w/e 29/01/1966 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 5w/e 06/02/1971 62C 4w/e 28/10/1972 62C Dunfermline Townhill
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2443 4w/e 28/12/1968 64H Leith Central 5w/e 06/02/1971 62C 4w/e 30/10/1971 62B Dundee West
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3213 5w/e 01/08/1970 64H Leith Central 4w/e 29/05/1971 62C 4w/e 29/05/1976 GM Grangemouth
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2426 w/e 15/03/1969 64H Leith Central 4w/e 26/02/1972 62C 4w/e 24/02/1973 62B Dundee West
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3540 5w/e 29/05/1965 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 26/02/1972 62C 5w/e 01/04/1972 62C Dunfermline Townhill
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3540 4w/e 26/02/1972 62C Dunfermline Townhill 5w/e 01/04/1972 62C 09/09/1985 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3411 5w/e 01/08/1970 62B Dundee West 5w/e 01/07/1972 62C 01/11/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2414 5w/e 06/02/1971 62C Dunfermline Townhill 4w/e 28/10/1972 62C 06/09/1981 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3316 4w/e 27/05/1972 64B Haymarket 4w/e 24/02/1973 62C 4w/e 29/12/1973 HA Haymarket
Diesel 06 0-4-0 06007 4w/e 24/02/1973 62B Dundee West 4w/e 24/03/1973 62C 26/09/1977 Withdrawn
Diesel 06 0-4-0 06004 4w/e 25/01/1969 65A Eastfield 4w/e 28/12/1974 DT 4w/e 01/03/1975 HN Hamilton (West)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08145 4w/e 29/05/1976 GM Grangemouth 5w/e 03/07/1976 DT 12/12/1977 Withdrawn