Depot: Eastleigh
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Eastleigh | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | G6 | 0-6-0T | 275 | q/e | 12/1935 | ELH | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | H15 | 4-6-0 | 477 | q/e | 12/1935 | ELH | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | ||||
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 730 | q/e | 12/1935 | ELH | on | 01/01/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | ||||
Steam | T1 | 0-4-4T | 360 | q/e | 12/1935 | ELH | m/e | 07/1944 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G6 | 0-6-0T | 265 | q/e | 12/1935 | BM | Bournemouth | m/e | 01/1936 | ELH | on | 01/01/1948 | BAS | Basingstoke |
Diesel | D3/12 | 0-6-0 | 3 | m/e | 04/1938 | ELH | y/e | 12/1941 | ELH | Eastleigh | ||||
Diesel | D3/12 | 0-6-0 | 3 | m/e | 04/1938 | ELH | Eastleigh | y/e | 12/1941 | ELH | m/e | 07/1946 | NORW | Norwood Junction |
Steam | B4 | 0-4-0T | 82 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | w/e | 20/07/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | B4 | 0-4-0T | 87 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 31/07/1949 | BM | Bournemouth | ||||
Steam | B4 | 0-4-0T | 88 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Steam | B4 | 0-4-0T | 96 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | P | 02/01/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | B4 | 0-4-0T | 102 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | P | 02/01/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 120 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 71C | Dorchester | ||||
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 121 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | w/e | 07/04/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 148 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | w/e | 08/03/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Small Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 150 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 02/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Small Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 151 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 02/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 154 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 04/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 155 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 04/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 157 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | w/e | 08/03/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 159 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | w/e | 10/03/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 165 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 171 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 09/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 175 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 12/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G6 | 0-6-0T | 240 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 03/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G6 | 0-6-0T | 261 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 11/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G6 | 0-6-0T | 264 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 02/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G6 | 0-6-0T | 267 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 02/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G6 | 0-6-0T | 272 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 6w/e | 12/12/1949 | BAS | Basingstoke | ||||
Steam | G6 | 0-6-0T | 274 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | SAL | Salisbury | ||||
Steam | G6 | 0-6-0T | 275 | q/e | 12/1935 | ELH | Eastleigh | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 12/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G6 | 0-6-0T | 277 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 2w/e | 20/05/1950 | 72C | Yeovil Town | ||||
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 286 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | w/e | 07/04/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 302 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 306 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 71B | Bournemouth | ||||
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 313 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 70G | |||||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 316 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | on | 23/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 336 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | To Store | |||||
Steam | Small Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 341 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 12/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Small Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 345 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 09/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 350 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 29/10/1953 | 70C | Guildford | ||||
Steam | G6 | 0-6-0T | 351 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 03/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Small Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 385 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 02/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | S11 | 4-4-0 | 402 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | FRA | Fratton | ||||
Steam | S11 | 4-4-0 | 403 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | BM | Bournemouth | ||||
Steam | S11 | 4-4-0 | 404 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | FRA | Fratton | ||||
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 406 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 06/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Bulldogs | 4-4-0 | 420 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | GFD | Guildford | ||||
Steam | Bulldogs | 4-4-0 | 422 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | Bulldogs | 4-4-0 | 423 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | w/e | 07/07/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Bulldogs | 4-4-0 | 428 | m/e | 11/1935 | BAS | Basingstoke | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Bulldogs | 4-4-0 | 430 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 437 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 06/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D15 | 4-4-0 | 463 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 12/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D15 | 4-4-0 | 464 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 70A | Nine Elms | ||||
Steam | D15 | 4-4-0 | 465 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 70A | Nine Elms | ||||
Steam | D15 | 4-4-0 | 466 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 10/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D15 | 4-4-0 | 467 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 70A | Nine Elms | ||||
Steam | D15 | 4-4-0 | 468 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 03/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D15 | 4-4-0 | 469 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | ELH | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | D15 | 4-4-0 | 470 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | ELH | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | D15 | 4-4-0 | 471 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 70A | Nine Elms | ||||
Steam | D15 | 4-4-0 | 472 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 03/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | H15 | 4-6-0 | 473 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 07/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | H15 | 4-6-0 | 474 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | w/e | 30/04/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | H15 | 4-6-0 | 478 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | ELH | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | H15 | 4-6-0 | 521 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 70A | Nine Elms | ||||
Steam | H15 | 4-6-0 | 522 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 70A | Nine Elms | ||||
Steam | H15 | 4-6-0 | 523 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 70A | Nine Elms | ||||
Steam | H15 | 4-6-0 | 524 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 70A | Nine Elms | ||||
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | 3101 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | w/e | 07/02/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | 3397 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 70B | Feltham | ||||
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | 3509 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | ||||
Steam | Potato Cans | 0-4-0T | 3741 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | w/e | 28/12/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Potato Cans | 0-4-0T | 3744 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | w/e | 08/06/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 705 | m/e | 11/1935 | 9E | Nine Elms | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 707 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | ||||
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 713 | m/e | 01/1936 | BAS | Basingstoke | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | P | 02/01/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh |
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 722 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | P | 02/01/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 737 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | BM | Bournemouth | ||||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 739 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | BM | Bournemouth | ||||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 740 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 8w/e | 08/01/1949 | BM | Bournemouth | ||||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 741 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | BAS | Basingstoke | ||||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 745 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | 9E | Nine Elms | ||||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 748 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | ELH | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 749 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | ELH | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 750 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | BM | Bournemouth | ||||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 751 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | BM | Bournemouth | ||||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 752 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | BM | Bournemouth | ||||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 754 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | ELH | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | 756 | 0-6-0T | 756 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | P | 02/01/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 777 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | ELH | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 784 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 70A | Nine Elms | ||||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 785 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 70A | Nine Elms | ||||
Steam | Z | 0-8-0T | 952 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 74C | Dover Marine | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1827 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1829 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1866 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 13/11/1950 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1867 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 13/11/1950 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1870 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | FRA | Fratton | ||||
Steam | Black Tanks | 0-6-0T | 2133 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 71I | Southampton Docks | ||||
Steam | Black Tanks | 0-6-0T | 2147 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 75A | Brighton | ||||
Steam | E1-1 | 0-6-0T | 2160 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | BAS | Basingstoke | ||||
Steam | D1M | 0-4-2T | 2239 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 03/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D1M | 0-4-2T | 2259 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 03/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D1M | 0-4-2T | 2361 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 03/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 2409 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2510 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | w/e | 29/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Black Tanks | 0-6-0T | 2609 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 06/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D1M | 0-4-2T | 2699 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 02/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | C14 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 70C | Guildford | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | C15 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 70C | Guildford | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | C16 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 70C | Guildford | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | C17 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 75A | Brighton | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | C18 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 6w/e | 27/03/1953 | 74B | Ramsgate | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | C19 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 6w/e | 27/03/1953 | 74B | Ramsgate | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | C20 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 22/06/1964 | 70B | Feltham | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | C21 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | w/e | 18/08/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | C22 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 6w/e | 27/03/1953 | 74B | Ramsgate | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | C23 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | w/e | 14/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | C24 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 29/10/1953 | 74D | Tonbridge | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | C25 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 70A | Nine Elms | ||||
Steam | T1 | 0-4-4T | 1 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 07/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | T1 | 0-4-4T | 2 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 02/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | T1 | 0-4-4T | 5 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 01/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | T1 | 0-4-4T | 8 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 05/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | T1 | 0-4-4T | 366 | m/e | 07/1896 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction (New) | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 10/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | T1 | 0-4-4T | 367 | m/e | 07/1896 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction (New) | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 05/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O2 | 0-4-4T | 200 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | WAD | Wadebridge | ||||
Steam | O2 | 0-4-4T | 213 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | w/e | 14/02/1953 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | O2 | 0-4-4T | 225 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 72D | Plymouth Friary | ||||
Steam | O2 | 0-4-4T | 231 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 71C | Dorchester | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 242 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 70A | Nine Elms | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 674 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 72B | Salisbury | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 357 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 29 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 70C | Guildford | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 109 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 70C | Guildford | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 48 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 75D | Horsham | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 53 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 71D | Fratton | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 125 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 6w/e | 05/10/1960 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 128 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 72C | Yeovil Town | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 479 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | w/e | 22/04/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 530 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 532 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 72B | Salisbury | ||||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 535 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 5w/e | 06/07/1961 | 75A | Brighton | ||||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 536 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | 3w/e | 30/01/1963 | 75E | Three Bridges | ||||
Steam | B4 | 0-4-0T | 96 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | P | 02/01/1948 | ELH | 6w/e | 26/09/1949 | AFD | Ashford |
Steam | B4 | 0-4-0T | 102 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | P | 02/01/1948 | ELH | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | YEO | Yeovil Town |
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 713 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | P | 02/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 04/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 722 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | P | 02/01/1948 | ELH | m/e | 04/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 756 | 0-6-0T | 756 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | P | 02/01/1948 | ELH | 5w/e | 04/09/1948 | DOV | Dover Marine |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2481 | on | 01/01/1948 | NORW | Norwood Junction | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | ELH | 6w/e | 05/09/1951 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2562 | on | 01/01/1948 | FRA | Fratton | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | ELH | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 21C136 | on | 01/01/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | BTN | Brighton |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 21C119 | on | 01/01/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | B4 | 0-4-0T | 98 | on | 01/01/1948 | SOT | Southampton Docks | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | ELH | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms |
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 166 | on | 01/01/1948 | FRA | Fratton | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | ELH | on | 15/07/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | S11 | 4-4-0 | 396 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | Feltham | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | ELH | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | FRA | Fratton |
Steam | Bulldogs | 4-4-0 | 433 | on | 01/01/1948 | GFD | Guildford | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | ELH | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | H15 | 4-6-0 | 477 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | ELH | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | ELH | Eastleigh |
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 711 | on | 01/01/1948 | PLY | Plymouth Friary | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 71D | Fratton |
Steam | B4 | 0-4-0T | 101 | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | ELH | m/e | 11/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 169 | on | 01/01/1948 | BM | Bournemouth | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | ELH | m/e | 07/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 117 | on | 01/01/1948 | SAL | Salisbury | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | ELH | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | FRA | Fratton |
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 165 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | ELH | m/e | 04/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 302 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | ELH | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | BAS | Basingstoke |
Steam | S11 | 4-4-0 | 395 | on | 01/01/1948 | FRA | Fratton | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | ELH | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | FRA | Fratton |
Steam | S11 | 4-4-0 | 30399 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | ELH | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | FRA | Fratton |
Steam | Bulldogs | 4-4-0 | 422 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | Bulldogs | 4-4-0 | 30429 | on | 01/01/1948 | BM | Bournemouth | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 70D | Basingstoke |
Steam | Bulldogs | 4-4-0 | 430 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | BAS | Basingstoke |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 736 | on | 01/01/1948 | BM | Bournemouth | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | ELH | 8w/e | 08/01/1949 | BM | Bournemouth |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 737 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | BM | Bournemouth | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | ELH | 8w/e | 08/01/1949 | BM | Bournemouth |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 779 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | ELH | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Bulldogs | 4-4-0 | 30432 | on | 01/01/1948 | SAL | Salisbury | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | ELH | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 746 | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | ELH | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | BM | Bournemouth |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32559 | on | 01/01/1948 | FRA | Fratton | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | ELH | m/e | 06/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34036 | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | BTN | Brighton | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | ELH | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | BTN | Brighton |
Steam | B4 | 0-4-0T | 30081 | on | 01/01/1948 | SOT | Southampton Docks | 8w/e | 08/01/1949 | ELH | m/e | 02/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B4 | 0-4-0T | 30085 | on | 01/01/1948 | SOT | Southampton Docks | 8w/e | 08/01/1949 | ELH | m/e | 02/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B4 | 0-4-0T | 30097 | on | 01/01/1948 | SOT | Southampton Docks | 8w/e | 08/01/1949 | ELH | m/e | 03/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B4 | 0-4-0T | 30147 | on | 01/01/1948 | SOT | Southampton Docks | 8w/e | 08/01/1949 | ELH | m/e | 02/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 30410 | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | BM | Bournemouth | 8w/e | 08/01/1949 | ELH | m/e | 12/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Lord Nelson | 4-6-0 | 30850 | on | 24/02/1943 | BM | Bournemouth | on | 08/01/1949 | ELH | on | 18/08/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Lord Nelson | 4-6-0 | 851 | on | 01/01/1948 | BM | Bournemouth | 8w/e | 08/01/1949 | ELH | w/e | 23/12/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Lord Nelson | 4-6-0 | 852 | on | 01/01/1948 | BM | Bournemouth | 8w/e | 08/01/1949 | ELH | w/e | 17/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Lord Nelson | 4-6-0 | 30853 | on | 01/01/1948 | BM | Bournemouth | 8w/e | 08/01/1949 | ELH | w/e | 03/03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Lord Nelson | 4-6-0 | 854 | on | 01/01/1948 | BM | Bournemouth | 8w/e | 08/01/1949 | ELH | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | 9E | Nine Elms |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32492 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | FRA | Fratton | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | ELH | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2557 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | Horsham | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | ELH | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32558 | P | 02/01/1948 | BTN | Brighton | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | ELH | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 71C | Dorchester |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32563 | on | 01/01/1948 | NORW | Norwood Junction | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | ELH | 6w/e | 27/01/1956 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2579 | on | 01/01/1948 | NORW | Norwood Junction | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | ELH | w/e | 14/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30673 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | ELH | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 72B | Salisbury |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30772 | on | 01/01/1948 | BM | Bournemouth | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | ELH | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | BM | Bournemouth |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30777 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | ELH | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30787 | on | 01/01/1948 | BM | Bournemouth | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | ELH | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | BM | Bournemouth |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30788 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | ELH | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30789 | on | 01/01/1948 | BM | Bournemouth | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | ELH | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 70D | Basingstoke |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30790 | on | 01/01/1948 | BM | Bournemouth | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | ELH | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 70D | Basingstoke |
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 338 | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | FRA | Fratton | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | ELH | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | DOR | Dorchester |
Steam | D15 | 4-4-0 | 30469 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | ELH | on | 29/12/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D15 | 4-4-0 | 30470 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | ELH | w/e | 13/12/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | H15 | 4-6-0 | 30477 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | ELH | w/e | 04/07/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | H15 | 4-6-0 | 30478 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | ELH | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30748 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | ELH | 2w/e | 12/08/1949 | 9E | Nine Elms |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30749 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | ELH | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 70D | Basingstoke |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30753 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | ELH | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 9E | Nine Elms |
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 2404 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | EBN | Eastbourne | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | ELH | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 75G | Eastbourne |
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 30413 | 5w/e | 04/09/1948 | DOR | Dorchester | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | ELH | 4w/e | 13/11/1950 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30754 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | ELH | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30378 | on | 01/01/1948 | SAL | Salisbury | 4w/e | 31/07/1949 | ELH | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | B4 | 0-4-0T | 89 | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 6w/e | 26/09/1949 | ELH | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 72D | Plymouth Friary |
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 30287 | on | 01/01/1948 | FRA | Fratton | 6w/e | 26/09/1949 | ELH | w/e | 16/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30772 | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | BM | Bournemouth | 6w/e | 26/09/1949 | ELH | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | Z | 0-8-0T | 30950 | on | 01/01/1948 | HIT | Hither Green | 6w/e | 26/09/1949 | ELH | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | P | 0-6-0T | 31325 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | BTN | Brighton | 6w/e | 26/09/1949 | ELH | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 30161 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | DOR | Dorchester | 5w/e | 15/10/1949 | ELH | m/e | 02/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 30700 | on | 01/01/1948 | BM | Bournemouth | 5w/e | 15/10/1949 | ELH | 6w/e | 20/04/1955 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30752 | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | BM | Bournemouth | 6w/e | 12/12/1949 | ELH | w/e | 17/12/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 30156 | on | 01/01/1948 | DOR | Dorchester | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | ELH | w/e | 05/05/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 30173 | on | 01/01/1948 | BM | Bournemouth | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | ELH | m/e | 05/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 30442 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | ELH | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30783 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | ELH | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Lord Nelson | 4-6-0 | 30854 | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | 9E | Nine Elms | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | ELH | w/e | 09/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Lord Nelson | 4-6-0 | 30855 | 8w/e | 08/01/1949 | 9E | Nine Elms | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | ELH | w/e | 30/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Lord Nelson | 4-6-0 | 30856 | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | ELH | w/e | 22/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Lord Nelson | 4-6-0 | 30857 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | ELH | w/e | 22/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O2 | 0-4-4T | 30233 | 5w/e | 15/10/1949 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | ELH | w/e | 15/02/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 30721 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | DOR | Dorchester | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 71A | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 30729 | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | FRA | Fratton | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 71A | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31828 | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 71A | 4w/e | 13/11/1950 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32491 | on | 01/01/1948 | BTN | Brighton | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 71A | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30032 | P | 02/01/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 71A | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30033 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 71A | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 72E | Barnstaple Junction |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30031 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 72B | Salisbury | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 71A | 5w/e | 31/07/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30031 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh | 5w/e | 31/07/1950 | 71A | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Bulldogs | 4-4-0 | 422 | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 71A | m/e | 09/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 30531 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | HOR | Horsham | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 71A | 5w/e | 09/10/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 30542 | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | HOR | Horsham | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 71A | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 30543 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | Horsham | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 71A | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 75D | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 30544 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 71A | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | B4 | 0-4-0T | 96 | 6w/e | 26/09/1949 | AFD | Ashford | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 71A | w/e | 06/10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 30414 | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | FRA | Fratton | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 71A | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 72C | Yeovil Town |
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | 30565 | on | 01/01/1948 | GFD | Guildford | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 71A | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 30726 | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 71A | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30787 | 6w/e | 26/09/1949 | 9E | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 71A | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 72B | Salisbury |
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 32409 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 71A | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 32412 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 71A | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 32416 | P | 02/01/1948 | NORW | Norwood Junction | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 71A | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 30531 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh | 5w/e | 09/10/1950 | 71A | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | 30565 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 71A | w/e | 14/02/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 30726 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 71A | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 72B | Salisbury |
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 32409 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 71A | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 32412 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 71A | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 32416 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 71A | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 75C | Norwood Junction |
Steam | H15 | 4-6-0 | 30476 | 8w/e | 08/01/1949 | 9E | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 13/11/1950 | 71A | 3w/e | 30/11/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30778 | on | 01/01/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 13/11/1950 | 71A | 3w/e | 30/11/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30667 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 13/11/1950 | 71A | 3w/e | 30/11/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | Bulldogs | 4-4-0 | 30421 | on | 01/01/1948 | SAL | Salisbury | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 71A | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | H15 | 4-6-0 | 30476 | 4w/e | 13/11/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh | 3w/e | 30/11/1950 | 71A | w/e | 09/12/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30744 | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | SAL | Salisbury | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 71A | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30745 | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 70D | Basingstoke | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 71A | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30751 | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | BM | Bournemouth | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 71A | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30778 | 4w/e | 13/11/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh | 3w/e | 30/11/1950 | 71A | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30243 | on | 01/01/1948 | SAL | Salisbury | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 71A | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30667 | 4w/e | 13/11/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh | 3w/e | 30/11/1950 | 71A | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 127 | on | 01/01/1948 | SAL | Salisbury | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 71A | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 30285 | on | 01/01/1948 | SAL | Salisbury | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 71A | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71C | Dorchester |
Steam | Bulldogs | 4-4-0 | 30421 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 71A | 8w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30744 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 71A | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 70D | Basingstoke |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30745 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 71A | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 70D | Basingstoke |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30746 | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | BM | Bournemouth | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 71A | m/e | 11/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30747 | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | 9E | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 71A | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 70D | Basingstoke |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30748 | 2w/e | 20/05/1950 | 72B | Salisbury | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 71A | 9w/e | 12/06/1957 | 70D | Basingstoke |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30750 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 71B | Bournemouth | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 71A | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30751 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 71A | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 70D | Basingstoke |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30753 | 2w/e | 20/05/1950 | 72B | Salisbury | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 71A | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 70D | Basingstoke |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30754 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 71B | Bournemouth | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 71A | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 70D | Basingstoke |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30780 | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | 9E | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 71A | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30243 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 71A | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 127 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 71A | 8w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 30281 | 2w/e | 12/08/1949 | GFD | Guildford | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71A | m/e | 12/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 30283 | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71A | w/e | 28/12/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 30288 | on | 01/01/1948 | SAL | Salisbury | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71A | w/e | 10/12/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 30289 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | SAL | Salisbury | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71A | w/e | 14/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Bulldogs | 4-4-0 | 30420 | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | GFD | Guildford | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71A | w/e | 01/09/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Bulldogs | 4-4-0 | 30421 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh | 8w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71A | w/e | 01/09/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Bulldogs | 4-4-0 | 30424 | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 70C | Guildford | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71A | w/e | 21/07/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Bulldogs | 4-4-0 | 30425 | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | GFD | Guildford | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71A | m/e | 09/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Bulldogs | 4-4-0 | 30426 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 71D | Fratton | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71A | m/e | 11/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Bulldogs | 4-4-0 | 30427 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 71D | Fratton | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71A | w/e | 03/11/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Bulldogs | 4-4-0 | 30428 | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 70C | Guildford | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71A | w/e | 07/04/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30755 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71A | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30781 | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | DOV | Dover Marine | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71A | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30782 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71A | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30783 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71A | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30784 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71A | w/e | 17/10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30785 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71A | w/e | 17/10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30786 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71A | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30787 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71A | w/e | 28/02/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30788 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71A | w/e | 10/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30789 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 70D | Basingstoke | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71A | on | 26/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30790 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 70D | Basingstoke | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71A | m/e | 10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Black Tanks | 0-6-0T | 32151 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71A | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 71I | Southampton Docks |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30127 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh | 8w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71A | 9w/e | 08/02/1955 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 30442 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 70C | Guildford | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 71A | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30480 | on | 01/01/1948 | FRA | Fratton | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 71A | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30481 | on | 01/01/1948 | GFD | Guildford | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 71A | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 30442 | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 71A | Eastleigh | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 71A | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30480 | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 71A | Eastleigh | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 71A | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30481 | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 71A | Eastleigh | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 71A | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30781 | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 71A | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30786 | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 71A | w/e | 29/08/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30322 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 71A | w/e | 22/11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30323 | on | 01/01/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 71A | on | 19/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30324 | on | 01/01/1948 | GFD | Guildford | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 71A | 9w/e | 08/02/1955 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30123 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 71A | 4w/e | 10/12/1953 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30124 | on | 01/01/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 71A | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30030 | on | 01/01/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 71A | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30328 | on | 01/01/1948 | GFD | Guildford | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 71A | 9w/e | 08/02/1955 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 30284 | on | 01/01/1948 | DOR | Dorchester | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 71A | m/e | 04/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 30285 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71C | Dorchester | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 71A | m/e | 08/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 30442 | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 71A | m/e | 12/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 32413 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 71A | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 75C | Norwood Junction |
Steam | O2 | 0-4-4T | 30229 | on | 01/01/1948 | DOR | Dorchester | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 71A | w/e | 25/03/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30480 | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 71A | 3w/e | 30/01/1963 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30780 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 71A | 6w/e | 27/01/1956 | 70D | Basingstoke |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30379 | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 71A | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30481 | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 71A | Eastleigh | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 71A | w/e | 30/05/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31631 | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 75A | Brighton | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 71A | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 71C | Dorchester |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31638 | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 75A | Brighton | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 71A | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32556 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | Horsham | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 71A | m/e | 09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 31771 | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | AFD | Ashford | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 71A | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 31772 | 6w/e | 26/09/1949 | AFD | Ashford | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 71A | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 31773 | on | 01/01/1948 | AFD | Ashford | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 71A | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 31774 | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | AFD | Ashford | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 71A | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 31775 | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | AFD | Ashford | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 71A | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 31776 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 74A | Ashford | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 71A | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 31777 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 74A | Ashford | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 71A | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 31778 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 74B | Ramsgate | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 71A | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 31779 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 74B | Ramsgate | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 71A | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 74B | Ramsgate |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31805 | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | FRA | Fratton | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 71A | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33016 | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 71D | Fratton | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 71A | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 73E | Faversham |
Steam | P | 0-6-0T | 31027 | on | 01/01/1948 | DOV | Dover Marine | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 71A | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 71D | Fratton |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31808 | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 73E | Faversham | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 71A | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 71D | Fratton |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32486 | on | 01/01/1948 | BTN | Brighton | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 71A | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 72B | Salisbury |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30030 | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 71A | w/e | 17/10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B4 | 0-4-0T | 30088 | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | PLY | Plymouth Friary | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 71A | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 72D | Plymouth Friary |
Steam | Z | 0-8-0T | 30955 | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 74A | Ashford | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 71A | 4w/e | 20/08/1954 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41293 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 71A | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41303 | m/e | 03/1952 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms (New) | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 71A | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41304 | m/e | 03/1952 | 73E | Faversham (New) | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 71A | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 74B | Ramsgate |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82014 | on | 01/08/1952 (New) | 71A | 10w/e | 07/10/1952 | 71A | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82015 | on | 13/08/1952 (New) | 71A | 10w/e | 07/10/1952 | 71A | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 32453 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 71A | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 32460 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 71A | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41305 | m/e | 04/1952 | 73E | Faversham (New) | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 71A | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82016 | on | 21/08/1952 (New) | 71A | 10w/e | 07/10/1952 | 71A | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82014 | on | 01/08/1952 | 71A | Eastleigh (New) | 10w/e | 07/10/1952 | 71A | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82015 | on | 13/08/1952 | 71A | Eastleigh (New) | 10w/e | 07/10/1952 | 71A | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82016 | on | 21/08/1952 | 71A | Eastleigh (New) | 10w/e | 07/10/1952 | 71A | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33038 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 71A | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 75C | Norwood Junction |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30133 | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 72C | Yeovil Town | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 71A | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30376 | on | 01/01/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 71A | w/e | 10/01/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30377 | on | 01/01/1948 | FRA | Fratton | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 71A | 4w/e | 10/12/1953 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 31785 | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 74A | Ashford | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 71A | 4w/e | 08/01/1953 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 31786 | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 74A | Ashford | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 71A | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 31787 | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 74A | Ashford | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 71A | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 31788 | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 74A | Ashford | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 71A | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 31789 | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 74A | Ashford | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 71A | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76008 | m/e | 02/1953 (New) | 71A | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 72B | Salisbury | ||||
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 15230 | w/e | 22/09/1951 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 71A | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 15231 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 71A | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70F | Bournemouth | ||||
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 15233 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 71A | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70F | Bournemouth | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82012 | on | 04/07/1952 | 72A | Exmouth Junction (New) | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 71A | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | P | 0-6-0T | 31558 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 71A | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Black Tanks | 0-6-0T | 32113 | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 71A | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 71I | Southampton Docks |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30133 | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 70A | Nine Elms | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 71A | 4w/e | 20/08/1954 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76012 | m/e | 04/1953 (New) | 71A | 4w/e | 27/06/1966 | 70C | Guildford | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76014 | m/e | 05/1953 (New) | 71A | 7w/e | 27/08/1956 | 75B | Redhill | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82014 | 10w/e | 07/10/1952 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 71A | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | O2 | 0-4-4T | 30177 | on | 01/01/1948 | DOR | Dorchester | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 71A | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 70B | Feltham |
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 15232 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 71A | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70F | Bournemouth | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30375 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 71A | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 72E | Barnstaple Junction |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31624 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 70C | Guildford | 5w/e | 24/08/1953 | 71A | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31625 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 70C | Guildford | 5w/e | 24/08/1953 | 71A | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31626 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 70C | Guildford | 5w/e | 24/08/1953 | 71A | 5w/e | 11/03/1955 | 72C | Yeovil Town |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76025 | m/e | 10/1953 (New) | 71A | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 71B | Bournemouth | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76026 | m/e | 10/1953 (New) | 71A | 7w/e | 23/08/1961 | 71B | Bournemouth | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76028 | m/e | 10/1953 (New) | 71A | w/e | 10/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76005 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 71B | Bournemouth | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 71A | m/e | 01/1954 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76006 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 71B | Bournemouth | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 71A | m/e | 01/1954 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 30117 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71C | Dorchester | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 71A | w/e | 22/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 30120 | 4w/e | 08/01/1953 | 71C | Dorchester | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 71A | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | Z | 0-8-0T | 30952 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 74C | Dover Marine | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 71A | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31613 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 71A | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 72C | Yeovil Town |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31620 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 71A | 4w/e | 30/12/1953 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31621 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 71A | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31801 | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 70C | Guildford | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 71A | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | B4 | 0-4-0T | 30083 | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 72D | Plymouth Friary | 4w/e | 29/10/1953 | 71A | m/e | 10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 30310 | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 70C | Guildford | 4w/e | 29/10/1953 | 71A | 7w/e | 08/10/1957 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76029 | m/e | 11/1953 (New) | 71A | w/e | 04/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | O2 | 0-4-4T | 30179 | 4w/e | 30/12/1953 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 71A | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30377 | 4w/e | 10/12/1953 | 75B | Redhill | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 71A | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70F | Fratton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13013 | on | 23/12/1952 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 71A | on | 01/10/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13014 | on | 24/12/1952 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 71A | 6w/e | 05/10/1960 | 75C | Norwood Junction |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31618 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 71C | Dorchester | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 71A | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 70D | Basingstoke |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31619 | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 71A | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31620 | 4w/e | 30/12/1953 | 70C | Guildford | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 71A | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30130 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 20/08/1954 | 71A | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 70B | Feltham |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13010 | on | 17/12/1952 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 71A | w/e | 04/08/1973 | GL | Gloucester Horton Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13011 | on | 19/12/1952 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 71A | on | 01/10/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13012 | on | 23/12/1952 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 71A | on | 01/01/1973 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34040 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 71A | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34041 | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 71A | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34042 | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 71A | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30324 | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 71A | Eastleigh | 9w/e | 08/02/1955 | 71A | 7w/e | 19/12/1955 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30356 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 71D | Fratton | 9w/e | 08/02/1955 | 71A | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 70F | Fratton |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30328 | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 71A | Eastleigh | 9w/e | 08/02/1955 | 71A | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 15234 | w/e | 01/12/1951 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 5w/e | 11/03/1955 | 71A | on | 22/12/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76005 | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 71C | Dorchester | 5w/e | 11/03/1955 | 71A | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 72B | Salisbury |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76006 | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 71C | Dorchester | 5w/e | 11/03/1955 | 71A | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 72B | Salisbury |
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 30707 | 4w/e | 11/12/1954 | 72C | Yeovil Town | 5w/e | 11/03/1955 | 71A | 7w/e | 08/10/1957 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 30727 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 5w/e | 11/03/1955 | 71A | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 15236 | w/e | 19/01/1952 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 6w/e | 20/04/1955 | 71A | on | 22/12/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 15235 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 73C | Hither Green | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 71A | w/e | 09/06/1969 | 73C | Hither Green |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31629 | 4w/e | 20/08/1954 | 70A | Nine Elms | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 71A | w/e | 05/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31635 | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 72B | Salisbury | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 71A | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31636 | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 72B | Salisbury | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 71A | 7w/e | 27/08/1956 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31639 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 72B | Salisbury | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 71A | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31802 | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 73E | Faversham | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 71A | 4w/e | 10/03/1960 | 72C | Yeovil Town |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31803 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73E | Faversham | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 71A | 4w/e | 22/06/1964 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31804 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73E | Faversham | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 71A | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30764 | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 2w/e | 07/07/1955 | 71A | 5w/e | 12/08/1955 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | G6 | 0-6-0T | 30162 | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 71B | Bournemouth | 5w/e | 12/08/1955 | 71A | 7w/e | 27/08/1956 | 72D | Plymouth Friary |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30791 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 5w/e | 16/09/1955 | 71A | w/e | 21/05/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30749 | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 70D | Basingstoke | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 71A | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 70D | Basingstoke |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30750 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 71A | 6w/e | 27/01/1956 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30755 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 71A | 6w/e | 27/01/1956 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30795 | 4w/e | 20/08/1954 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 71A | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | D15 | 4-4-0 | 30465 | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 70A | Nine Elms | 3w/e | 01/11/1955 | 71A | w/e | 14/01/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30379 | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 75E | Three Bridges | 7w/e | 19/12/1955 | 71A | 4w/e | 10/03/1960 | 73J | Tonbridge |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13046 | 7w/e | 19/12/1955 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 6w/e | 27/01/1956 | 71A | 4w/e | 24/02/1958 | 75C | Norwood Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75073 | m/e | 11/1955 | 72A | Exmouth Junction (New) | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 71A | 6w/e | 01/04/1957 | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75074 | m/e | 12/1955 | 72A | Exmouth Junction (New) | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 71A | 7w/e | 08/10/1957 | 70D | Basingstoke |
Steam | 757 | 0-6-2T | 30757 | on | 01/01/1948 | PLY | Plymouth Friary | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 71A | w/e | 14/12/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 757 | 0-6-2T | 30758 | on | 01/01/1948 | PLY | Plymouth Friary | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 71A | w/e | 22/12/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30763 | 5w/e | 12/08/1955 | 70D | Basingstoke | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 71A | 9w/e | 12/06/1957 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30770 | 5w/e | 12/08/1955 | 70D | Basingstoke | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 71A | 4w/e | 24/09/1962 | 70D | Basingstoke |
Steam | Lord Nelson | 4-6-0 | 30861 | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | BM | Bournemouth | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 71A | w/e | 06/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Lord Nelson | 4-6-0 | 30862 | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | BM | Bournemouth | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 71A | w/e | 06/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Lord Nelson | 4-6-0 | 30863 | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | BM | Bournemouth | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 71A | w/e | 10/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30028 | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 75E | Three Bridges | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 71A | w/e | 29/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30328 | 7w/e | 19/12/1955 | 75E | Three Bridges | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 71A | 4w/e | 10/03/1960 | 73J | Tonbridge |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76063 | m/e | 07/1956 (New) | 71A | w/e | 09/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76064 | m/e | 07/1956 (New) | 71A | w/e | 09/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76065 | m/e | 07/1956 (New) | 71A | w/e | 10/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76066 | m/e | 07/1956 (New) | 71A | 4w/e | 10/03/1960 | 72B | Salisbury | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76067 | m/e | 08/1956 (New) | 71A | 4w/e | 10/03/1960 | 72B | Salisbury | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76068 | m/e | 08/1956 (New) | 71A | w/e | 10/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73087 | 7w/e | 27/08/1956 | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 9w/e | 27/10/1956 | 71A | 5w/e | 19/07/1957 | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73116 | 7w/e | 27/08/1956 | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 9w/e | 27/10/1956 | 71A | m/e | 11/1956 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32491 | 6w/e | 27/01/1956 | 70D | Basingstoke | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 71A | w/e | 14/01/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O2 | 0-4-4T | 30212 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | BM | Bournemouth | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 71A | on | 05/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O2 | 0-4-4T | 30223 | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 71B | Bournemouth | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 71A | m/e | 10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | E2 | 0-6-0T | 32108 | on | 01/01/1948 | DOV | Dover Marine | 4w/e | 17/12/1956 | 71A | 6w/e | 25/01/1957 | 71I | Southampton Docks |
Steam | E2 | 0-6-0T | 32109 | on | 01/01/1948 | DOV | Dover Marine | 4w/e | 17/12/1956 | 71A | 6w/e | 25/01/1957 | 71I | Southampton Docks |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76009 | 7w/e | 27/08/1956 | 75B | Redhill | 6w/e | 25/01/1957 | 71A | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 72C | Yeovil Town |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76014 | 7w/e | 27/08/1956 | 75B | Redhill | 6w/e | 25/01/1957 | 71A | m/e | 12/10/1964 | 70F | Bournemouth |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75070 | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 6w/e | 01/04/1957 | 71A | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 30306 | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 71B | Bournemouth | 6w/e | 01/04/1957 | 71A | w/e | 21/04/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30792 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 9w/e | 12/06/1957 | 71A | w/e | 14/02/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | P | 0-6-0T | 31325 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 75A | Brighton | 9w/e | 12/06/1957 | 71A | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76007 | m/e | 01/1953 | 71A | Eastleigh (New) | 4w/e | 06/06/1958 | 71A | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 72B | Salisbury |
Steam | Lord Nelson | 4-6-0 | 30858 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 71A | w/e | 19/08/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Lord Nelson | 4-6-0 | 30859 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 71A | w/e | 09/12/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B4 | 0-4-0T | 30088 | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 72D | Plymouth Friary | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 71A | w/e | 11/07/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B4 | 0-4-0T | 30089 | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 72D | Plymouth Friary | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 71A | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | B4 | 0-4-0T | 30102 | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | PLY | Plymouth Friary | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 71A | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31611 | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 70F | Fratton | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 71A | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 70D | Basingstoke |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31633 | on | 01/01/1948 | BAS | Basingstoke | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 71A | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 72C | Yeovil Town |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31792 | on | 01/01/1948 | YEO | Yeovil Town | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 71A | 4w/e | 10/03/1960 | 72C | Yeovil Town |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31793 | 8w/e | 05/02/1951 | 72C | Yeovil Town | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 71A | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31794 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 72C | Yeovil Town | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 71A | w/e | 23/06/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31795 | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 72C | Yeovil Town | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 71A | w/e | 23/06/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31796 | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 72C | Yeovil Town | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 71A | 3w/e | 01/05/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D3665 | on | 02/02/1959 (New) | 71A | 4w/e | 24/09/1962 | 73C | Hither Green | ||||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D3666 | on | 03/02/1959 (New) | 71A | m/e | 20/07/1964 | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D3668 | on | 17/02/1959 (New) | 71A | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D3667 | on | 19/02/1959 (New) | 71A | m/e | 20/07/1964 | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 11222 | on | 17/04/1957 | 75A | Brighton (New) | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 71A | 4w/e | 01/02/1962 | 73F | Ashford |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 11224 | on | 26/04/1957 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 71A | 4w/e | 27/04/1964 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76010 | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 72C | Yeovil Town | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 71A | on | 10/10/1965 | 70F | Bournemouth |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76011 | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 72C | Yeovil Town | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 71A | on | 10/10/1965 | 70F | Bournemouth |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31808 | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 71D | Fratton | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 71A | w/e | 05/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30130 | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 70B | Feltham | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 71A | on | 12/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2085 | on | 03/04/1959 (New) | 71A | 4w/e | 01/05/1962 | 73C | Hither Green | ||||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30773 | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 70D | Basingstoke | 3w/e | 01/05/1959 | 71A | w/e | 10/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76061 | m/e | 07/1955 | 75B | Redhill (New) | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 71A | w/e | 08/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76062 | m/e | 07/1955 | 75B | Redhill (New) | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 71A | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 30732 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 71D | Fratton | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 71A | w/e | 10/10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30767 | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 71A | w/e | 27/06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30768 | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 71A | m/e | 10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30769 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 71A | w/e | 27/02/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30800 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 71A | m/e | 08/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30802 | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 71A | w/e | 08/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30803 | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 71A | m/e | 08/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30804 | 9w/e | 12/06/1957 | 74C | Dover Marine | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 71A | w/e | 17/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30805 | 9w/e | 12/06/1957 | 74C | Dover Marine | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 71A | on | 28/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30806 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73C | Hither Green | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 71A | w/e | 29/04/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31632 | 5w/e | 11/03/1955 | 71B | Bournemouth | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 71A | 4w/e | 10/03/1960 | 72C | Yeovil Town |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30109 | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 75A | Brighton | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 71A | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30110 | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 75A | Brighton | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 71A | 6w/e | 22/10/1959 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30052 | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 75A | Brighton | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 71A | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30053 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 75A | Brighton | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 71A | 4w/e | 10/03/1960 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30055 | 7w/e | 20/04/1956 | 75A | Brighton | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 71A | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30056 | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 75A | Brighton | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 71A | 6w/e | 22/10/1959 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41319 | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 71A | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31735 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 19/08/1959 | 71A | w/e | 22/04/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 15214 | w/e | 07/05/1949 | NORW | Norwood Junction (New) | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 71A | 4w/e | 05/03/1962 | 73C | Hither Green |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76056 | m/e | 05/1955 | 75B | Redhill (New) | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 71A | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76057 | m/e | 05/1955 | 75B | Redhill (New) | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 71A | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76058 | m/e | 06/1955 | 75B | Redhill (New) | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 71A | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | Lord Nelson | 4-6-0 | 30860 | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 71B | Bournemouth | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 71A | w/e | 11/08/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Lord Nelson | 4-6-0 | 30864 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 71B | Bournemouth | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 71A | w/e | 27/01/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Lord Nelson | 4-6-0 | 30865 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 71B | Bournemouth | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 71A | w/e | 20/05/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31804 | 6w/e | 25/01/1957 | 70F | Fratton | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 71A | w/e | 14/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31809 | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | FRA | Fratton | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 71A | 4w/e | 22/06/1964 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30039 | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 70F | Fratton | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 71A | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30357 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 71D | Fratton | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 71A | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30375 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 72E | Barnstaple Junction | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 71A | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30377 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70F | Fratton | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 71A | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | Terriers | 0-6-0T | 32636 | 6w/e | 22/10/1959 | 70F | Fratton | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 71A | 4w/e | 10/03/1960 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Terriers | 0-6-0T | 32640 | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 70F | Fratton | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 71A | 4w/e | 27/05/1963 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Terriers | 0-6-0T | 32646 | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 70F | Fratton | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 71A | on | 04/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Terriers | 0-6-0T | 32650 | 5w/e | 24/08/1953 | 71D | Fratton | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 71A | on | 04/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Terriers | 0-6-0T | 32661 | on | 01/01/1948 | FRA | Fratton | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 71A | w/e | 28/04/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Terriers | 0-6-0T | 32678 | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 70F | Fratton | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 71A | 4w/e | 27/05/1963 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | 30516 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | Feltham | 6w/e | 09/02/1960 | 71A | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | 30517 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | Feltham | 6w/e | 09/02/1960 | 71A | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30035 | on | 01/01/1948 | PLY | Plymouth Friary | 6w/e | 09/02/1960 | 71A | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41311 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73F | Ashford | 6w/e | 09/02/1960 | 71A | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76006 | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 72B | Salisbury | 4w/e | 10/03/1960 | 71A | on | 10/10/1965 | 70F | Bournemouth |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76009 | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 72B | Salisbury | 4w/e | 10/03/1960 | 71A | on | 10/10/1965 | 70F | Bournemouth |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76059 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 72B | Salisbury | 4w/e | 10/03/1960 | 71A | 4w/e | 27/06/1966 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76060 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 72B | Salisbury | 4w/e | 10/03/1960 | 71A | w/e | 05/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31613 | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 72C | Yeovil Town | 4w/e | 10/03/1960 | 71A | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31626 | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 72C | Yeovil Town | 4w/e | 10/03/1960 | 71A | w/e | 05/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31791 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 72C | Yeovil Town | 4w/e | 10/03/1960 | 71A | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Terriers | 0-6-0T | 32655 | 3w/e | 01/11/1955 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 10/03/1960 | 71A | w/e | 28/05/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 15230 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 71A | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70F | Bournemouth |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76062 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 71A | w/e | 03/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30357 | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 71A | w/e | 29/04/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30133 | 4w/e | 20/08/1954 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 71A | 3w/e | 30/01/1963 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30375 | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 71A | on | 12/08/1962 | 83H | Plymouth Friary |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30377 | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 71A | w/e | 18/08/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41319 | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 71A | 5w/e | 17/04/1967 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2289 | on | 29/04/1960 (New) | 71A | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2291 | on | 15/05/1960 (New) | 71A | 7w/e | 03/05/1961 | 73C | Hither Green | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92205 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 82D | Westbury | on | 01/01/1961 | 71A | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92206 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 82D | Westbury | on | 01/01/1961 | 71A | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92231 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | on | 01/01/1961 | 71A | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | E2 | 0-6-0T | 32104 | 6w/e | 22/10/1959 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 71A | w/e | 28/04/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | E2 | 0-6-0T | 32105 | 6w/e | 22/10/1959 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 71A | m/e | 08/12/1961 | 71I | Southampton Docks |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32506 | 4w/e | 06/05/1960 | 70A | Nine Elms | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 71A | w/e | 24/06/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32563 | 6w/e | 27/01/1956 | 70A | Nine Elms | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 71A | m/e | 08/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | 30518 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | Feltham | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 71A | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | 30519 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | Feltham | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 71A | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | 30520 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | Feltham | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 71A | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31908 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 74D | Tonbridge | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 71A | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31909 | 4w/e | 20/08/1954 | 74D | Tonbridge | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 71A | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31910 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 74D | Tonbridge | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 71A | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73041 | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 71A | 7w/e | 03/05/1961 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73042 | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 71A | 7w/e | 03/05/1961 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73080 | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 71A | 7w/e | 03/05/1961 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | O2 | 0-4-4T | 30200 | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | WAD | Wadebridge | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 71A | on | 25/03/1962 | 83H | Plymouth Friary |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41305 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 75A | Brighton | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 71A | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30379 | 7w/e | 23/08/1960 | 75A | Brighton | 7w/e | 03/05/1961 | 71A | 5w/e | 06/07/1961 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30050 | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 75A | Brighton | 7w/e | 03/05/1961 | 71A | 5w/e | 06/07/1961 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30328 | 7w/e | 23/08/1960 | 75A | Brighton | 7w/e | 03/05/1961 | 71A | 5w/e | 06/07/1961 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75068 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 71B | Bournemouth | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 71A | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84028 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73F | Ashford | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 71A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 24G | Skipton |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84029 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73F | Ashford | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 71A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 14E | Bedford |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31413 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73H | Dover Marine | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 71A | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31810 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73H | Dover Marine | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 71A | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31816 | 6w/e | 22/10/1959 | 73C | Hither Green | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 71A | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31818 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 73J | Tonbridge | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 71A | 4w/e | 01/02/1962 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | 31911 | on | 01/01/1948 | HIT | Hither Green | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 71A | m/e | 10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | 31912 | 5w/e | 24/08/1953 | 73C | Hither Green | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 71A | 4w/e | 19/11/1962 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | 31913 | on | 01/01/1948 | HIT | Hither Green | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 71A | 3w/e | 30/01/1963 | 75C | Norwood Junction |
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | 31916 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 73C | Hither Green | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 71A | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | 31922 | on | 01/01/1948 | HIT | Hither Green | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 71A | w/e | 25/08/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33037 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73J | Tonbridge | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 71A | w/e | 06/10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33039 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73J | Tonbridge | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 71A | w/e | 14/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34004 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 71A | on | 10/10/1965 | 70F | Bournemouth |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34016 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 71A | w/e | 14/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34022 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 71A | w/e | 25/04/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34025 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 71A | on | 10/10/1965 | 70F | Bournemouth |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75066 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 71B | Bournemouth | 5w/e | 06/07/1961 | 71A | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 70D | Basingstoke |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75065 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 71B | Bournemouth | 7w/e | 23/08/1961 | 71A | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 70D | Basingstoke |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75067 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 71B | Bournemouth | 7w/e | 23/08/1961 | 71A | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92211 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 82D | Westbury | 7w/e | 23/08/1961 | 71A | on | 02/12/1962 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92239 | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 82D | Westbury | 7w/e | 23/08/1961 | 71A | on | 02/12/1962 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41328 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 27C | Southport | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 71A | m/e | 07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41329 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 14E | Bedford | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 71A | m/e | 07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2291 | 7w/e | 03/05/1961 | 73C | Hither Green | m/e | 09/11/1961 | 71A | on | 24/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B4 | 0-4-0T | 30102 | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 71B | Bournemouth | m/e | 09/11/1961 | 71A | w/e | 15/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 30120 | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | m/e | 09/11/1961 | 71A | m/e | 07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 30695 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | BM | Bournemouth | m/e | 09/11/1961 | 71A | on | 23/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O2 | 0-4-4T | 30199 | 5w/e | 19/07/1957 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | m/e | 09/11/1961 | 71A | on | 23/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34034 | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | m/e | 09/11/1961 | 71A | 4w/e | 27/06/1966 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34038 | 4w/e | 24/11/1960 | 75A | Brighton | m/e | 09/11/1961 | 71A | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34061 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 73F | Ashford | m/e | 09/11/1961 | 71A | on | 03/11/1963 | 83D | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34104 | 4w/e | 24/02/1958 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | m/e | 09/11/1961 | 71A | w/e | 25/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O2 | 0-4-4T | 30225 | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 72D | Plymouth Friary | 4w/e | 02/1962 | 71A | on | 23/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2083 | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 73F | Ashford | 4w/e | 01/02/1962 | 71A | 4w/e | 05/03/1962 | 73C | Hither Green |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2292 | 7w/e | 03/05/1961 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 05/03/1962 | 71A | on | 24/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3014 | 6w/e | 05/10/1960 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 4w/e | 05/03/1962 | 71A | on | 01/10/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 15229 | 4w/e | 06/05/1960 | 73F | Ashford | 4w/e | 05/03/1962 | 71A | 4w/e | 19/08/1963 | 73C | Hither Green |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76058 | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 71B | Bournemouth | 4w/e | 05/03/1962 | 71A | 4w/e | 27/06/1966 | 70C | Guildford |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2290 | on | 06/05/1960 | 70C | Guildford (New) | 4w/e | 01/05/1962 | 71A | on | 19/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 32408 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 70B | Feltham | 4w/e | 01/05/1962 | 71A | on | 23/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34097 | 4w/e | 24/11/1960 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 4w/e | 28/05/1962 | 71A | w/e | 10/04/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34098 | 4w/e | 24/11/1960 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 4w/e | 28/05/1962 | 71A | w/e | 25/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80065 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 73J | Tonbridge | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 71A | on | 04/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80066 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 73J | Tonbridge | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 71A | on | 13/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80082 | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 71A | on | 04/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80083 | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 71A | on | 07/08/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30053 | 7w/e | 03/05/1961 | 75E | Three Bridges | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 71A | 3w/e | 30/01/1963 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30036 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 72D | Plymouth Friary | 4w/e | 30/07/1962 | 71A | 3w/e | 30/01/1963 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6504 | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 27/08/1962 | 71A | 4w/e | 27/04/1964 | 73C | Hither Green |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6505 | on | 09/04/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 27/08/1962 | 71A | on | 25/06/1987 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6506 | on | 23/04/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 27/08/1962 | 71A | on | 06/08/1991 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6508 | on | 21/05/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 27/08/1962 | 71A | 4w/e | 27/04/1964 | 73C | Hither Green |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6530 | on | 12/11/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 27/08/1962 | 71A | on | 01/02/1988 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6533 | on | 03/12/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 27/08/1962 | 71A | on | 04/10/1987 | SL | Stewarts Lane |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6536 | on | 17/12/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 27/08/1962 | 71A | on | 04/10/1987 | SL | Stewarts Lane |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6546 | on | 18/03/1961 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 27/08/1962 | 71A | m/e | 27/01/1964 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6549 | on | 01/04/1961 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 27/08/1962 | 71A | w/e | 29/04/1971 | 73C | Hither Green |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6556 | on | 03/12/1961 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 27/08/1962 | 71A | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 73C | Hither Green |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6583 | on | 06/01/1962 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 27/08/1962 | 71A | w/e | 10/10/1967 | 73C | Hither Green |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6585 | on | 13/01/1962 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 27/08/1962 | 71A | w/e | 10/10/1967 | 73C | Hither Green |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82010 | on | 25/06/1952 | 72A | Exmouth Junction (New) | 4w/e | 24/09/1962 | 71A | on | 24/04/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82011 | on | 01/07/1952 | 72A | Exmouth Junction (New) | 4w/e | 24/09/1962 | 71A | on | 30/08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82013 | on | 09/07/1952 | 72A | Exmouth Junction (New) | 4w/e | 24/09/1962 | 71A | on | 14/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82017 | on | 08/08/1952 | 72A | Exmouth Junction (New) | 4w/e | 24/09/1962 | 71A | on | 25/04/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82018 | on | 08/09/1952 | 72A | Exmouth Junction (New) | 4w/e | 24/09/1962 | 71A | on | 10/07/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82019 | on | 26/09/1952 | 72A | Exmouth Junction (New) | 4w/e | 24/09/1962 | 71A | on | 09/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82022 | on | 15/10/1954 | 72A | Exmouth Junction (New) | 4w/e | 24/09/1962 | 71A | on | 17/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82023 | on | 22/10/1954 | 72A | Exmouth Junction (New) | 4w/e | 24/09/1962 | 71A | on | 02/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82024 | on | 29/10/1954 | 72A | Exmouth Junction (New) | 4w/e | 24/09/1962 | 71A | on | 30/01/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82025 | on | 05/11/1954 | 72A | Exmouth Junction (New) | 4w/e | 24/09/1962 | 71A | on | 09/08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34008 | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 24/09/1962 | 71A | 4w/e | 27/06/1966 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34021 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 71B | Bournemouth | 4w/e | 24/09/1962 | 71A | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34028 | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 71B | Bournemouth | 4w/e | 24/09/1962 | 71A | w/e | 31/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34037 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 71B | Bournemouth | 4w/e | 24/09/1962 | 71A | 4w/e | 27/06/1966 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34039 | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 71B | Bournemouth | 4w/e | 24/09/1962 | 71A | w/e | 09/05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92211 | 7w/e | 23/08/1961 | 71A | Eastleigh | on | 02/12/1962 | 71A | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92239 | 7w/e | 23/08/1961 | 71A | Eastleigh | on | 02/12/1962 | 71A | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73002 | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 41D | Canklow | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 71A | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73016 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 71A | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73043 | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 41D | Canklow | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 71A | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73065 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 71A | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73155 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 71A | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80087 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 75E | Three Bridges | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 71A | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80095 | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 71A | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80137 | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 71A | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41210 | w/e | 29/10/1960 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 71A | on | 24/03/1963 | 72E | Barnstaple Junction |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41213 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 71A | on | 24/03/1963 | 72E | Barnstaple Junction |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41224 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 71A | on | 24/03/1963 | 72E | Barnstaple Junction |
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 30548 | 3w/e | 07/01/1963 | 75E | Three Bridges | 3w/e | 30/01/1963 | 71A | w/e | 21/03/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75065 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 70D | Basingstoke | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 71A | w/e | 04/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75066 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 70D | Basingstoke | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 71A | m/e | 02/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75079 | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 70D | Basingstoke | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 71A | on | 20/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30249 | 3w/e | 30/01/1963 | 70E | Salisbury | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 71A | w/e | 07/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30251 | 3w/e | 30/01/1963 | 70B | Feltham | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 71A | w/e | 07/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30032 | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 70B | Feltham | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 71A | w/e | 07/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30241 | 4w/e | 22/10/1962 | 72B | Salisbury | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 71A | w/e | 07/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41297 | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 72E | Barnstaple Junction | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 71A | on | 08/09/1963 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41298 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 72E | Barnstaple Junction | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 71A | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41310 | on | 10/07/1961 | 72E | Barnstaple Junction | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 71A | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Terriers | 0-6-0T | 32636 | 4w/e | 10/03/1960 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 27/05/1963 | 71A | on | 04/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Terriers | 0-6-0T | 32662 | 4w/e | 30/12/1953 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 27/05/1963 | 71A | on | 04/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Terriers | 0-6-0T | 32670 | 4w/e | 14/01/1958 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 27/05/1963 | 71A | on | 04/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | USA | 0-6-0T | 30064 | on | 01/01/1948 | SOT | Southampton Docks | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 71A | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR |
Steam | USA | 0-6-0T | 30067 | on | 01/01/1948 | SOT | Southampton Docks | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 71A | w/e | 09/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | USA | 0-6-0T | 30068 | on | 01/01/1948 | SOT | Southampton Docks | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 71A | w/e | 15/03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | USA | 0-6-0T | 30069 | on | 01/01/1948 | SOT | Southampton Docks | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 71A | w/e | 09/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | USA | 0-6-0T | 30071 | on | 01/01/1948 | SOT | Southampton Docks | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 71A | w/e | 09/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | USA | 0-6-0T | 30073 | on | 01/01/1948 | SOT | Southampton Docks | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 71A | w/e | 08/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6512 | on | 18/06/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 71A | on | 23/03/1989 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6520 | on | 03/09/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 71A | on | 16/05/1989 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6521 | on | 11/09/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 71A | ||||
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6523 | on | 24/09/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 71A | on | 28/07/1989 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6524 | on | 01/10/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 71A | on | 04/10/1989 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6525 | on | 08/10/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 71A | ||||
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6526 | on | 15/10/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 71A | on | 05/01/1988 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6527 | on | 22/10/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 71A | on | 01/09/1992 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6534 | on | 03/12/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 71A | ||||
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6537 | on | 31/12/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 71A | on | 20/04/1993 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6578 | on | 25/11/1961 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 71A | 2w/e | 23/09/1968 | 73C | Hither Green |
Diesel | D3/12 | 0-6-0 | 15201 | 4w/e | 01/02/1962 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 19/08/1963 | 71A | on | 29/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80015 | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 71A | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80146 | on | 30/10/1956 | 75A | Brighton (New) | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 71A | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70F | Bournemouth |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80150 | on | 28/12/1956 | 75A | Brighton (New) | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 71A | on | 17/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2274 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 70B | Feltham | 4w/e | 14/10/1963 | 70D | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34058 | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | on | 03/11/1963 | 70D | w/e | 11/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75067 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75C | Norwood Junction | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70D | w/e | 04/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75068 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75C | Norwood Junction | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70D | w/e | 02/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75074 | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 75C | Norwood Junction | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70D | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75075 | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 75C | Norwood Junction | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70D | w/e | 09/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34017 | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70D | 4w/e | 27/06/1966 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34018 | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70D | 4w/e | 27/06/1966 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34064 | 4w/e | 28/05/1962 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70D | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 70E | Salisbury |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34073 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70D | w/e | 28/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6546 | 4w/e | 27/08/1962 | 71A | Eastleigh | m/e | 27/01/1964 | 70D | on | 05/10/1988 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2285 | 4w/e | 02/1962 | 70C | Guildford | 4w/e | 27/04/1964 | 70D | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 32B | Ipswich |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41313 | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 25/05/1964 | 70D | w/e | 24/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41325 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 25/05/1964 | 70D | w/e | 13/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34061 | on | 03/11/1963 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | on | 14/06/1964 | 70D | w/e | 16/08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34072 | 4w/e | 24/02/1958 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | on | 14/06/1964 | 70D | w/e | 25/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34081 | 7w/e | 08/10/1957 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | on | 14/06/1964 | 70D | w/e | 16/08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80014 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 22/06/1964 | 70D | on | 02/05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80016 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 22/06/1964 | 70D | on | 09/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80017 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 22/06/1964 | 70D | on | 13/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 07 | 0-6-0 | D2985 | on | 27/06/1962 | 71I | Southampton Docks (New) | m/e | 20/07/1964 | 70D | on | 02/07/1977 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 07 | 0-6-0 | D2998 | on | 10/11/1962 | 71I | Southampton Docks (New) | m/e | 20/07/1964 | 70D | on | 06/05/1973 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6540 | on | 21/01/1961 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | m/e | 17/08/1964 | 70D | on | 24/12/1989 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6541 | on | 28/01/1961 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | m/e | 17/08/1964 | 70D | 4w/e | 10/05/1965 | 73C | Hither Green |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34002 | on | 01/01/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | on | 06/09/1964 | 70D | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34023 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | on | 06/09/1964 | 70D | 4w/e | 15/05/1967 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34033 | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | on | 06/09/1964 | 70D | w/e | 19/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34076 | 7w/e | 08/10/1957 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | on | 06/09/1964 | 70D | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 70E | Salisbury |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34079 | 4w/e | 24/02/1958 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | on | 06/09/1964 | 70D | w/e | 27/02/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34084 | on | 03/11/1963 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | on | 06/09/1964 | 70D | w/e | 03/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34086 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | on | 06/09/1964 | 70D | w/e | 19/06/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73029 | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73041 | 7w/e | 03/05/1961 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73043 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70B | Feltham | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73089 | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73110 | m/e | 10/1956 | 70A | Nine Elms (New) | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73111 | m/e | 10/1956 | 70A | Nine Elms (New) | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | m/e | 10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73112 | m/e | 10/1956 | 70A | Nine Elms (New) | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | m/e | 12/10/1964 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73113 | m/e | 10/1956 | 70A | Nine Elms (New) | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 70G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73114 | m/e | 11/1956 | 70A | Nine Elms (New) | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 70G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73115 | m/e | 11/1956 | 70A | Nine Elms (New) | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | 4w/e | 27/06/1966 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73116 | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | w/e | 29/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73117 | m/e | 11/1956 | 70A | Nine Elms (New) | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | 4w/e | 27/06/1966 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73118 | m/e | 12/1956 | 70A | Nine Elms (New) | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | 4w/e | 27/06/1966 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73119 | m/e | 12/1956 | 70A | Nine Elms (New) | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | w/e | 19/03/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76018 | 4w/e | 10/03/1960 | 72B | Salisbury | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | 4w/e | 27/06/1966 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76019 | 7w/e | 23/08/1961 | 71B | Bournemouth | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | w/e | 20/02/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34001 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34009 | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | 4w/e | 27/06/1966 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34010 | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | w/e | 07/03/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34031 | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | w/e | 07/02/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34036 | on | 03/11/1963 | 70E | Salisbury | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | 4w/e | 27/06/1966 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34041 | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 71B | Bournemouth | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | w/e | 23/01/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34042 | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 71B | Bournemouth | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | w/e | 03/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34050 | m/e | 09/11/1961 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | w/e | 29/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34060 | on | 03/11/1963 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | m/e | 06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34071 | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | w/e | 30/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34082 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | w/e | 24/04/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34087 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | w/e | 09/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34088 | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | w/e | 19/03/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34090 | 9w/e | 12/06/1957 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | w/e | 09/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34093 | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | w/e | 09/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34095 | 6w/e | 27/01/1956 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | w/e | 09/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34101 | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | w/e | 17/07/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34102 | 4w/e | 24/02/1958 | 71B | Bournemouth | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | w/e | 09/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34103 | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 71B | Bournemouth | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | w/e | 26/09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34105 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | w/e | 04/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2085 | 4w/e | 01/05/1962 | 73C | Hither Green | m/e | 12/10/1964 | 70D | on | 31/12/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2251 | 4w/e | 19/04/1963 | 73C | Hither Green | m/e | 12/10/1964 | 70D | on | 01/12/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3101 | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 73C | Hither Green | m/e | 12/10/1964 | 70D | 2w/e | 07/05/1969 | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73022 | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | m/e | 12/10/1964 | 70D | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73087 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70B | Feltham | m/e | 12/10/1964 | 70D | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70C | Guildford |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6504 | 4w/e | 27/04/1964 | 73C | Hither Green | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70D | on | 21/06/1991 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73155 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70B | Feltham | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70D | 5w/e | 17/04/1967 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73168 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 70B | Feltham | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70D | w/e | 19/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73169 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 70B | Feltham | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70D | w/e | 02/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73170 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 70B | Feltham | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70D | w/e | 19/06/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73171 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 70B | Feltham | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70D | w/e | 02/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80012 | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 70B | Feltham | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70D | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80018 | 4w/e | 22/06/1964 | 70B | Feltham | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70D | on | 11/04/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34019 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70B | Feltham | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70D | 4w/e | 27/06/1966 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34077 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70B | Feltham | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70D | w/e | 26/03/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6528 | on | 29/10/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 21/12/1964 | 70D | on | 24/06/1991 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6535 | on | 10/12/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 21/12/1964 | 70D | on | 04/10/1987 | SL | Stewarts Lane |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6545 | on | 08/03/1961 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 21/12/1964 | 70D | on | 05/07/1991 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3040 | on | 22/01/1954 | 70B | Feltham (New) | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70D | w/e | 09/03/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3226 | w/e | 02/07/1955 | 75C | Norwood Junction (New) | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70D | 4w/e | 14/11/1966 | 75A | Brighton |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6532 | on | 19/11/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70D | on | 01/02/1993 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6544 | on | 25/02/1961 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70D | on | 31/08/2003 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6548 | on | 01/04/1961 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70D | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76030 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 70C | Guildford | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70D | w/e | 25/04/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76031 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 70C | Guildford | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70D | 4w/e | 27/06/1966 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76033 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 70C | Guildford | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70D | 4w/e | 27/06/1966 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30824 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70B | Feltham | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70D | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30833 | m/e | 03/1943 | FEL | Feltham | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70D | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30837 | 5w/e | 06/07/1961 | 70B | Feltham | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70D | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30838 | m/e | 10/1939 | FEL | Feltham | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70D | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30839 | m/e | 10/1939 | FEL | Feltham | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70D | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30842 | on | 08/09/1963 | 70B | Feltham | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70D | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80139 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | Redhill | 4w/e | 15/03/1965 | 70D | on | 09/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73037 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 81F | Oxford | on | 28/03/1965 | 70D | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73092 | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | on | 28/03/1965 | 70D | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73093 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | on | 28/03/1965 | 70D | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73032 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 5E | Nuneaton | 2w/e | 11/04/1965 | 70D | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 6C | Croes Newydd |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73033 | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 5E | Nuneaton | 2w/e | 11/04/1965 | 70D | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 9H | Patricroft |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2179 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 70B | Feltham | 4w/e | 12/04/1965 | 70D | 3w/e | 25/03/1969 | 70F | Bournemouth |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2294 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 70B | Feltham | 4w/e | 12/04/1965 | 70D | on | 28/02/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3042 | on | 03/02/1954 | 70B | Feltham (New) | 4w/e | 12/04/1965 | 70D | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80070 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 89A | Shrewsbury | w/e | 01/05/1965 | 70D | on | 20/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80102 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 6D | Shrewsbury | w/e | 01/05/1965 | 70D | on | 05/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80132 | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 01/05/1965 | 70D | on | 09/01/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6508 | 4w/e | 27/04/1964 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 10/05/1965 | 70D | on | 01/02/1996 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3093 | 4w/e | 14/10/1963 | 70B | Feltham | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70D | w/e | 26/04/1969 | 5A | Crewe Diesel |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75069 | 4w/e | 19/08/1963 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70D | w/e | 25/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75070 | 4w/e | 19/08/1963 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70D | w/e | 11/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75074 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70D | w/e | 09/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75076 | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70D | w/e | 09/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75077 | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70D | w/e | 09/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75078 | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70D | w/e | 10/07/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80011 | 4w/e | 22/06/1964 | 75B | Redhill | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70D | on | 10/10/1965 | 70F | Bournemouth |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41287 | 4w/e | 25/05/1964 | 70C | Guildford | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70D | w/e | 17/07/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41294 | 4w/e | 25/05/1964 | 70C | Guildford | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70D | w/e | 04/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41299 | 4w/e | 25/05/1964 | 70C | Guildford | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70D | w/e | 02/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76053 | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70B | Feltham | 4w/e | 05/07/1965 | 70D | 4w/e | 27/06/1966 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76066 | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70B | Feltham | 4w/e | 05/07/1965 | 70D | w/e | 09/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30824 | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70B | Feltham | 4w/e | 05/07/1965 | 70D | w/e | 05/09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30842 | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70B | Feltham | 4w/e | 05/07/1965 | 70D | w/e | 05/09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6501 | on | 27/02/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 70D | on | 01/09/1996 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6503 | on | 19/03/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 70D | on | 05/08/1987 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6507 | on | 04/05/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 70D | on | 10/12/1986 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6509 | on | 21/05/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 70D | on | 13/03/1993 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6515 | on | 08/07/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 70D | on | 01/02/1997 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6541 | 4w/e | 10/05/1965 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 70D | on | 31/05/2005 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6550 | on | 13/04/1961 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 70D | w/e | 29/04/1971 | 73C | Hither Green |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6580 | on | 09/12/1961 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 70D | 4w/e | 22/11/1965 | 73C | Hither Green |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84010 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 24F | Fleetwood | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 70D | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 91M | To London Midland Region |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84013 | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 70D | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 91M | To London Midland Region |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84014 | w/e | 19/12/1964 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 70D | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 91M | To London Midland Region |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84015 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 24G | Skipton | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 70D | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 91M | To London Midland Region |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84016 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 10C | Fleetwood | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 70D | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 91M | To London Midland Region |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84017 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 70D | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 91M | To London Midland Region |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84019 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 70D | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 91M | To London Midland Region |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84025 | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 70D | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 91M | To London Midland Region |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84026 | w/e | 19/12/1964 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 70D | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 91M | To London Midland Region |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84028 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 24G | Skipton | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 70D | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 91M | To London Midland Region |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73084 | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 70B | Feltham | 4w/e | 22/11/1965 | 70D | w/e | 19/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73085 | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 70B | Feltham | 4w/e | 22/11/1965 | 70D | 4w/e | 27/06/1966 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84010 | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 91M | To London Midland Region | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 70D | on | 11/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84013 | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 91M | To London Midland Region | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 70D | on | 11/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84014 | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 91M | To London Midland Region | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 70D | on | 11/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84015 | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 91M | To London Midland Region | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 70D | on | 11/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84016 | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 91M | To London Midland Region | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 70D | on | 11/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84017 | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 91M | To London Midland Region | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 70D | on | 11/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84019 | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 91M | To London Midland Region | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 70D | on | 11/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84025 | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 91M | To London Midland Region | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 70D | on | 11/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84026 | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 91M | To London Midland Region | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 70D | on | 11/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84028 | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 91M | To London Midland Region | 2w/e | 06/12/1965 | 70D | on | 11/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80144 | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70E | Salisbury | 4w/e | 20/12/1965 | 70D | 4w/e | 07/02/1966 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3270 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 70B | Feltham | 3w/e | 10/01/1966 | 70D | on | 13/04/1986 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6529 | on | 05/11/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 3w/e | 10/01/1966 | 70D | 4w/e | 07/02/1966 | 73C | Hither Green |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6573 | on | 04/11/1961 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 3w/e | 10/01/1966 | 70D | 4w/e | 15/05/1967 | 73C | Hither Green |
Diesel | 07 | 0-6-0 | D2986 | on | 16/06/1962 | 71I | Southampton Docks (New) | 4w/e | 07/02/1966 | 70D | on | 02/07/1977 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 07 | 0-6-0 | D2987 | on | 16/06/1962 | 71I | Southampton Docks (New) | 4w/e | 07/02/1966 | 70D | on | 04/10/1976 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 07 | 0-6-0 | D2988 | on | 16/06/1962 | 71I | Southampton Docks (New) | 4w/e | 07/02/1966 | 70D | on | 06/05/1973 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 07 | 0-6-0 | D2989 | on | 27/06/1962 | 71I | Southampton Docks (New) | 4w/e | 07/02/1966 | 70D | on | 02/07/1977 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 07 | 0-6-0 | D2990 | on | 13/07/1962 | 71I | Southampton Docks (New) | 4w/e | 07/02/1966 | 70D | on | 02/07/1977 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 07 | 0-6-0 | D2991 | on | 21/07/1962 | 71I | Southampton Docks (New) | 4w/e | 07/02/1966 | 70D | on | 06/05/1973 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 07 | 0-6-0 | D2992 | on | 28/07/1962 | 71I | Southampton Docks (New) | 4w/e | 07/02/1966 | 70D | on | 06/05/1973 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 07 | 0-6-0 | D2993 | on | 21/08/1962 | 71I | Southampton Docks (New) | 4w/e | 07/02/1966 | 70D | on | 04/10/1976 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 07 | 0-6-0 | D2994 | on | 05/09/1962 | 71I | Southampton Docks (New) | 4w/e | 07/02/1966 | 70D | m/e | 31/10/1975 | BM | Bournemouth |
Diesel | 07 | 0-6-0 | D2995 | on | 22/09/1962 | 71I | Southampton Docks (New) | 4w/e | 07/02/1966 | 70D | on | 02/07/1977 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 07 | 0-6-0 | D2996 | on | 06/10/1962 | 71I | Southampton Docks (New) | 4w/e | 07/02/1966 | 70D | m/e | 31/10/1975 | BM | Bournemouth |
Diesel | 07 | 0-6-0 | D2997 | on | 20/10/1962 | 71I | Southampton Docks (New) | 4w/e | 07/02/1966 | 70D | m/e | 31/10/1975 | BM | Bournemouth |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6500 | on | 30/01/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 07/02/1966 | 70D | on | 17/03/1988 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6511 | on | 04/06/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 07/02/1966 | 70D | on | 24/05/1993 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80142 | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70E | Salisbury | 4w/e | 07/02/1966 | 70D | on | 03/03/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6510 | on | 04/06/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 07/03/1966 | 70D | on | 18/04/1988 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6517 | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 34E | New England | 4w/e | 07/03/1966 | 70D | on | 27/10/1987 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6522 | on | 17/09/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 07/03/1966 | 70D | 2w/e | 18/03/1968 | 73C | Hither Green |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6516 | on | 15/07/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 04/04/1966 | 70D | on | 16/12/1985 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6514 | on | 02/07/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 02/05/1966 | 70D | ||||
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6518 | on | 19/08/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 02/05/1966 | 70D | on | 14/03/1989 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6519 | on | 27/08/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 02/05/1966 | 70D | on | 16/11/1990 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2030 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 32B | Ipswich | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 70D | 4w/e | 25/07/1966 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2030 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 70D | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 25/07/1966 | 70D | 4w/e | 19/09/1966 | 75A | Brighton |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6531 | on | 22/11/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 70D | on | 09/10/1992 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6538 | on | 07/01/1961 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 70D | on | 04/10/1987 | SL | Stewarts Lane |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6539 | on | 14/01/1961 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 70D | 5w/e | 17/04/1967 | 73C | Hither Green |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6542 | on | 04/02/1961 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 70D | on | 17/02/1986 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1923 | on | 16/12/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 19/09/1966 | 70D | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2040 | 4w/e | 25/07/1966 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 4w/e | 19/09/1966 | 70D | 4w/e | 09/07/1968 | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6543 | on | 10/02/1961 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 19/09/1966 | 70D | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1921 | on | 03/12/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | 70D | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1922 | on | 09/12/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | 70D | 6w/e | 09/09/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6552 | on | 24/04/1961 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | 70D | m/e | 21/05/1968 | 73C | Hither Green |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6565 | on | 19/08/1961 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | 70D | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | 73C | Hither Green |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6577 | on | 18/11/1961 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | 70D | 4w/e | 12/12/1966 | 73C | Hither Green |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80151 | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70E | Salisbury | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | 70D | on | 07/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80152 | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70E | Salisbury | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | 70D | on | 09/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | USA | 0-6-0T | 30064 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | 70D | w/e | 09/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2288 | 4w/e | 01/05/1962 | 71B | Bournemouth | 4w/e | 14/11/1966 | 70D | on | 17/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6551 | on | 20/04/1961 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 12/12/1966 | 70D | w/e | 29/04/1971 | 73C | Hither Green |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1924 | on | 20/12/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 09/01/1967 | 70D | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1925 | on | 22/12/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 4w/e | 09/01/1967 | 70D | 5w/e | 09/12/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1926 | on | 01/01/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 4w/e | 09/01/1967 | 70D | 5w/e | 09/12/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2231 | 4w/e | 19/06/1965 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 18/01/1967 | 70D | w/e | 27/05/1967 | 16C | Derby |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2255 | 4w/e | 07/02/1966 | 73C | Hither Green | w/e | 18/01/1967 | 70D | on | 03/03/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6553 | m/e | 04/1964 | 73C | Hither Green | w/e | 18/01/1967 | 70D | 6w/e | 22/12/1970 | 73C | Hither Green |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6554 | on | 13/05/1961 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | w/e | 18/01/1967 | 70D | 4w/e | 30/10/1970 | 73C | Hither Green |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6529 | 4w/e | 07/02/1966 | 73C | Hither Green | 5w/e | 17/04/1967 | 70D | on | 11/11/1988 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6513 | on | 25/06/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 15/05/1967 | 70D | on | 06/11/1992 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34037 | 4w/e | 27/06/1966 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 15/05/1967 | 70D | w/e | 09/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2041 | 4w/e | 19/09/1966 | 70C | Guildford | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70D | w/e | 30/09/1968 | 75C | Selhurst |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2043 | 4w/e | 25/07/1966 | 70G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70D | w/e | 24/10/1967 | 70F | Bournemouth |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2082 | 4w/e | 19/04/1963 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70D | on | 31/12/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3472 | on | 30/08/1957 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70D | 5w/e | 30/09/1971 | 73C | Hither Green |
Electric | Class 73 | Bo-Bo | E6007 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70D | 4w/e | 14/06/1968 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Electric | Class 73 | Bo-Bo | E6008 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70D | 4w/e | 14/06/1968 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Electric | Class 73 | Bo-Bo | E6009 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70D | 4w/e | 14/06/1968 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Electric | Class 73 | Bo-Bo | E6010 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70D | 4w/e | 14/06/1968 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Electric | Class 73 | Bo-Bo | E6011 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70D | 4w/e | 14/06/1968 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Electric | Class 73 | Bo-Bo | E6012 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70D | 4w/e | 14/06/1968 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Electric | Class 73 | Bo-Bo | E6013 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70D | 4w/e | 14/06/1968 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Electric | Class 73 | Bo-Bo | E6014 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70D | 4w/e | 14/06/1968 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Electric | Class 73 | Bo-Bo | E6015 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70D | 4w/e | 14/06/1968 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Electric | Class 73 | Bo-Bo | E6016 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70D | 4w/e | 14/06/1968 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Electric | Class 73 | Bo-Bo | E6017 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70D | 4w/e | 14/06/1968 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Electric | Class 73 | Bo-Bo | E6018 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70D | 4w/e | 14/06/1968 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Electric | Class 73 | Bo-Bo | E6019 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70D | 4w/e | 14/06/1968 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Electric | Class 73 | Bo-Bo | E6020 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70D | 4w/e | 14/06/1968 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Electric | Class 73 | Bo-Bo | E6021 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70D | 4w/e | 14/06/1968 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Electric | Class 73 | Bo-Bo | E6022 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70D | 4w/e | 14/06/1968 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Electric | Class 73 | Bo-Bo | E6023 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70D | 4w/e | 14/06/1968 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Electric | Class 73 | Bo-Bo | E6024 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70D | 4w/e | 14/06/1968 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Electric | Class 73 | Bo-Bo | E6025 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70D | 4w/e | 14/06/1968 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Electric | Class 73 | Bo-Bo | E6026 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70D | 4w/e | 14/06/1968 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Electric | Class 73 | Bo-Bo | E6027 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70D | 4w/e | 14/06/1968 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Electric | Class 73 | Bo-Bo | E6028 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70D | 4w/e | 14/06/1968 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6539 | 5w/e | 17/04/1967 | 73C | Hither Green | w/e | 10/10/1967 | 70D | ||||
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6580 | 4w/e | 22/11/1965 | 73C | Hither Green | w/e | 10/10/1967 | 70D | on | 04/10/1987 | SL | Stewarts Lane |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2083 | 4w/e | 05/03/1962 | 73C | Hither Green | w/e | 24/10/1967 | 70D | on | 31/05/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Electric | Class 74 | Bo-Bo | E5016 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | Ashford Chart Leacon | m/e | 11/1967 | 70D | on | 06/1977 | Withdrawn | |
Electric | Class 74 | Bo-Bo | E6103 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | Ashford Chart Leacon | on | 10/12/1967 | 70D | on | 12/1977 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2289 | 4w/e | 19/09/1966 | 75C | Selhurst | 4w/e | 01/01/1968 | 70D | on | 30/09/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3094 | w/e | 10/10/1967 | 70B | Feltham | 4w/e | 01/01/1968 | 70D | w/e | 05/02/1968 | 70B | Feltham |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3095 | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 4w/e | 01/01/1968 | 70D | w/e | 21/06/1969 | 5A | Crewe Diesel |
Electric | Class 74 | Bo-Bo | E5024 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | Ashford Chart Leacon | m/e | 02/1968 | 70D | on | 12/1977 | Withdrawn | |
Electric | Class 74 | Bo-Bo | E5015 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | Ashford Chart Leacon | m/e | 02/1968 | 70D | on | 12/1977 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 15221 | m/e | 27/01/1964 | 73F | Ashford | w/e | 05/02/1968 | 70D | 4w/e | 30/04/1970 | 73C | Hither Green |
Electric | Class 71 | Bo-Bo | E5003 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | Ashford Chart Leacon | m/e | 03/1968 | 70D | on | 12/1977 | Withdrawn | |
Electric | Class 71 | Bo-Bo | E5023 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | Ashford Chart Leacon | m/e | 03/1968 | 70D | on | 06/1976 | Withdrawn | |
Electric | Class 74 | Bo-Bo | E6105 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | Ashford Chart Leacon | on | 10/03/1968 | 70D | on | 12/1977 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6579 | on | 02/12/1961 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 2w/e | 18/03/1968 | 70D | 2w/e | 23/09/1968 | 73C | Hither Green |
Electric | Class 74 | Bo-Bo | E5005 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | Ashford Chart Leacon | m/e | 04/1968 | 70D | on | 12/1977 | Withdrawn | |
Electric | Class 74 | Bo-Bo | E5017 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | Ashford Chart Leacon | m/e | 04/1968 | 70D | on | 12/1977 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2239 | on | 09/08/1964 | 70F | Bournemouth | 3w/e | 08/04/1968 | 70D | w/e | 09/06/1969 | 75C | Selhurst |
Electric | Class 74 | Bo-Bo | E5021 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | Ashford Chart Leacon | m/e | 05/1968 | 70D | on | 12/1977 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6522 | 2w/e | 18/03/1968 | 73C | Hither Green | 2w/e | 23/09/1968 | 70D | on | 17/02/1986 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6547 | on | 25/03/1961 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 2w/e | 23/09/1968 | 70D | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3045 | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 70B | Feltham | w/e | 30/09/1968 | 70D | on | 05/11/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3094 | w/e | 05/02/1968 | 70B | Feltham | w/e | 30/09/1968 | 70D | 2w/e | 11/10/1968 | 70B | Feltham |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3096 | 4w/e | 05/03/1962 | 75A | Brighton | w/e | 30/09/1968 | 70D | 3w/e | 25/03/1969 | 75C | Selhurst |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3100 | w/e | 18/01/1967 | 75A | Brighton | w/e | 30/09/1968 | 70D | 3w/e | 25/03/1969 | 75C | Selhurst |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3217 | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 75A | Brighton | w/e | 30/09/1968 | 70D | on | 29/12/1968 | 5A | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2197 | w/e | 05/02/1968 | 70F | Bournemouth | 2w/e | 11/10/1968 | 70D | 3w/e | 05/03/1969 | 70F | Bournemouth |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3047 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70B | Feltham | 4w/e | 01/01/1969 | 70D | on | 01/07/1973 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3094 | 2w/e | 11/10/1968 | 70B | Feltham | 4w/e | 01/01/1969 | 70D | w/e | 09/06/1969 | 75C | Selhurst |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6552 | m/e | 21/05/1968 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 01/01/1969 | 70D | w/e | 29/04/1971 | 73C | Hither Green |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6555 | on | 20/05/1961 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 01/01/1969 | 70D | 4w/e | 30/10/1970 | 73C | Hither Green |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D4108 | w/e | 01/02/1969 | SR | To Southern Region | 4w/e | 10/02/1969 | 70D | 4w/e | 03/06/1969 | 70B | Feltham |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2295 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70F | Bournemouth | 3w/e | 05/03/1969 | 70D | on | 30/04/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2028 | 4w/e | 25/07/1966 | 70F | Bournemouth | 3w/e | 25/03/1969 | 70D | on | 31/12/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D4111 | w/e | 26/04/1969 | 70B | Feltham | 5w/e | 28/04/1969 | 70D | 9w/e | 22/07/1970 | 75C | Selhurst |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3048 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70B | Feltham | 4w/e | 03/06/1969 | 70D | 5w/e | 30/09/1971 | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3271 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 70B | Feltham | 4w/e | 03/06/1969 | 70D | m/e | 11/1981 | WN | Willesden |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3272 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 70B | Feltham | 4w/e | 03/06/1969 | 70D | on | 23/05/1989 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3273 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 70B | Feltham | 4w/e | 03/06/1969 | 70D | on | 01/07/1987 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3274 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 70B | Feltham | 4w/e | 03/06/1969 | 70D | on | 21/08/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3219 | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 30/04/1970 | 70D | on | 02/01/1979 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3809 | 7w/e | 01/01/1971 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | w/e | 01/01/1971 | 70D | 2w/e | 25/02/1971 | 75C | Selhurst |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3815 | 7w/e | 01/01/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 01/01/1971 | 70D | 2w/e | 13/01/1971 | 73C | Hither Green |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3820 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | w/e | 01/01/1971 | 70D | 2w/e | 13/01/1971 | 73C | Hither Green |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3822 | 7w/e | 01/01/1971 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | w/e | 01/01/1971 | 70D | 2w/e | 25/02/1971 | 75C | Selhurst |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3924 | 5w/e | 31/05/1969 | 67C | Ayr | w/e | 01/01/1971 | 70D | 5w/e | 30/09/1971 | 73C | Hither Green |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3928 | 4w/e | 27/02/1965 | 67C | Ayr | w/e | 01/01/1971 | 70D | 4w/e | 29/10/1971 | 73C | Hither Green |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6549 | w/e | 29/04/1971 | 73C | Hither Green | 5w/e | 30/09/1971 | 70D | w/e | 26/09/1973 | NG | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6550 | w/e | 29/04/1971 | 73C | Hither Green | 5w/e | 30/09/1971 | 70D | w/e | 26/09/1973 | NG | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6551 | w/e | 29/04/1971 | 73C | Hither Green | 5w/e | 30/09/1971 | 70D | 9w/e | 19/07/1973 | HG | Hither Green |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6552 | w/e | 29/04/1971 | 73C | Hither Green | 5w/e | 30/09/1971 | 70D | 2w/e | 18/05/1973 | HG | Hither Green |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6553 | 6w/e | 22/12/1970 | 73C | Hither Green | 5w/e | 30/09/1971 | 70D | w/e | 02/05/1973 | 73C | Hither Green |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3472 | 5w/e | 30/09/1971 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 29/10/1971 | 70D | on | 28/05/1982 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | D6554 | 4w/e | 30/10/1970 | 73C | Hither Green | 9w/e | 29/12/1971 | 70D | 4w/e | 31/01/1972 | 73C | Hither Green |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3042 | 4w/e | 01/01/1969 | 73C | Hither Green | 9w/e | 04/10/1972 | 70D | on | 10/07/1982 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3043 | m/e | 12/10/1964 | 73C | Hither Green | 9w/e | 04/10/1972 | 70D | w/e | 08/12/1973 | SW | Swindon |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3048 | 5w/e | 30/09/1971 | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon | 6w/e | 16/11/1972 | 70D | w/e | 23/03/1974 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4013 | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | w/e | 03/02/1973 | 70D | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3041 | 9w/e | 29/12/1971 | 75C | Selhurst | 9w/e | 19/07/1973 | EH | w/e | 09/03/1974 | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4159 | w/e | 23/06/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 19/07/1973 | EH | on | 29/05/1988 | AF | Ashford Chart Leacon |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4163 | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 82C | Swindon | w/e | 08/12/1973 | EH | on | 30/09/2008 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08850 | w/e | 14/07/1973 | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 5w/e | 07/03/1974 | EH | w/e | 09/03/1974 | SR | To Southern Region |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08854 | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 5w/e | 07/03/1974 | EH | w/e | 09/03/1974 | SR | To Southern Region |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08831 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 23/03/1974 | EH | 3w/e | 26/03/1974 | EH | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08831 | w/e | 23/03/1974 | EH | Eastleigh | 3w/e | 26/03/1974 | EH | on | 07/04/1993 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | 33031 | w/e | 26/09/1973 | NG | 6w/e | 30/06/1974 | EH | on | 06/02/1989 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | 33032 | w/e | 26/09/1973 | NG | 3w/e | 18/04/1975 | EH | on | 25/03/1987 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | 33033 | 9w/e | 19/07/1973 | HG | Hither Green | 3w/e | 18/04/1975 | EH | on | 04/10/1976 | HG | Hither Green |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08028 | w/e | 09/03/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 12/07/1975 | EH | on | 05/04/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08031 | w/e | 08/12/1973 | SW | Swindon | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | EH | w/e | 17/12/1980 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08323 | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | SR | To Southern Region | m/e | 31/07/1975 | EH | on | 11/07/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 09024 | w/e | 20/07/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 31/01/1976 | EH | w/e | 21/02/1976 | SR | To Southern Region |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 09025 | w/e | 13/07/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 31/01/1976 | EH | w/e | 21/02/1976 | SR | To Southern Region |
Diesel | 07 | 0-6-0 | 07012 | m/e | 31/10/1975 | BM | Bournemouth | m/e | 31/10/1976 | EH | on | 02/07/1977 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 07 | 0-6-0 | 07013 | m/e | 31/10/1975 | BM | Bournemouth | m/e | 31/10/1976 | EH | on | 02/07/1977 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08150 | 4w/e | 03/06/1969 | 75C | Selhurst | m/e | 31/10/1976 | EH | on | 23/08/1981 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | 33033 | on | 04/10/1976 | HG | Hither Green | on | 01/11/1976 | EH | m/e | 10/1977 | HG | Hither Green |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08556 | m/e | 05/1977 | 98S | m/e | 05/1977 | EH | m/e | 31/03/1979 | SU | Selhurst | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08642 | 2w/e | 25/02/1971 | 75C | Selhurst | m/e | 07/1977 | EH | on | 31/05/2006 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08650 | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | m/e | 07/1977 | EH | on | 01/08/1989 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08892 | 3w/e | 30/09/1972 | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon | m/e | 07/1977 | EH |