Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1056 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7445 Week
» 27887 Month
» 364733 Year
» 1586298 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Fort William


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Fort William Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam K2 2-6-0 4692 m/e 1928 EFD Eastfield on 07/10/1939 FW m/e 06/1952 65A Eastfield
Steam K2 2-6-0 4693 on 07/07/1925 EFD Eastfield on 07/10/1939 FW on 27/04/1953 65A Eastfield
Steam K2 2-6-0 4697 on 01/04/1925 EFD Eastfield on 07/10/1939 FW on 09/04/1956 65A Eastfield
Steam K2 2-6-0 4698 on 22/12/1924 EFD Eastfield on 07/10/1939 FW on 27/04/1953 65A Eastfield
Steam K2 2-6-0 4699 on 01/04/1925 EFD Eastfield on 07/10/1939 FW on 01/06/1952 65A Eastfield
Steam K2 2-6-0 4700 on 22/12/1924 EFD Eastfield on 07/10/1939 FW on 27/04/1953 65A Eastfield
Steam K2 2-6-0 4701 on 07/03/1940 EFD Eastfield on 07/07/1940 FW on 27/04/1953 65A Eastfield
Steam Glen 4-4-0 2470       on 01/01/1948 FW 4w/e 31/10/1953 63A Perth South
Steam Glen 4-4-0 2480       on 01/01/1948 FW 4w/e 31/10/1953 61A Kittybrewster
Steam J36 0-6-0 5237       on 01/01/1948 FW 4w/e 06/07/1957 65A Eastfield
Steam K4 2-6-0 1995       on 01/01/1948 FW 4w/e 12/06/1954 65A Eastfield
Steam K4 2-6-0 1996       on 01/01/1948 FW 4w/e 12/06/1954 65A Eastfield
Steam K1 2-6-0 62011 on 10/02/1952 65A Eastfield on 01/06/1952 63D on 02/12/1962 52d Alnmouth
Steam K1 2-6-0 62012 on 10/02/1952 65A Eastfield on 01/06/1952 63D on 02/12/1962 52d Alnmouth
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43132       4w/e 16/05/1953 63D 4w/e 11/07/1953 65A Eastfield
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43133 on 30/11/1951 65A Eastfield (New) 4w/e 16/05/1953 63D 4w/e 11/07/1953 65A Eastfield
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43135 on 31/12/1951 65A Eastfield (New) 4w/e 16/05/1953 63D 4w/e 11/07/1953 65A Eastfield
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43137 4w/e 14/07/1951 65A Eastfield 4w/e 16/05/1953 63D 4w/e 11/07/1953 65A Eastfield
Steam K2 2-6-0 61783 on 27/04/1953 65A Eastfield on 06/07/1953 63D on 06/06/1954 61A Kittybrewster
Steam K2 2-6-0 61788 on 27/04/1953 65A Eastfield on 06/07/1953 63D on 09/04/1956 65A Eastfield
Steam K2 2-6-0 61790 on 27/04/1953 65A Eastfield on 06/07/1953 63D on 06/06/1954 61A Kittybrewster
Steam K2 2-6-0 61791 on 27/04/1953 65A Eastfield on 06/07/1953 63D on 22/03/1960 Withdrawn
Steam K1 2-6-0 62031 on 17/02/1952 65A Eastfield on 24/05/1954 63D on 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam K1 2-6-0 62034 on 17/02/1952 65A Eastfield on 24/05/1954 63D on 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam K1 2-6-0 62052 on 17/02/1952 65A Eastfield on 24/05/1954 63D on 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam K1 2-6-0 61997 on 13/11/1949 EFD Eastfield on 24/05/1954 63D on 12/06/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44820 8w/e 09/09/1951 64A St Margarets 4w/e 12/06/1954 63D 4w/e 27/11/1954 63A Perth South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44921 4w/e 17/05/1952 68A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 12/06/1954 63D 4w/e 27/11/1954 63A Perth South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45047 4w/e 17/05/1952 67C Ayr 4w/e 12/06/1954 63D 4w/e 27/11/1954 63A Perth South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45245 8w/e 09/09/1951 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 12/06/1954 63D 4w/e 27/11/1954 63A Perth South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45367 8w/e 09/09/1951 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 12/06/1954 63D 4w/e 04/09/1954 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45487 4w/e 01/11/1952 64A St Margarets 4w/e 12/06/1954 63D 4w/e 27/11/1954 63A Perth South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45049 4w/e 17/05/1952 67C Ayr 4w/e 07/08/1954 63D 4w/e 27/11/1954 63A Perth South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44973 on 01/01/1948 29A Perth South 4w/e 04/09/1954 63D 6w/e 30/12/1961 66A Polmadie
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44972 on 01/01/1948 29A Perth South 4w/e 27/11/1954 63D 6w/e 30/12/1961 66A Polmadie
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44974 on 01/01/1948 29A Perth South 4w/e 27/11/1954 63D 6w/e 30/12/1961 66A Polmadie
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44975 m/e 05/1946 29A Perth South (New) 4w/e 27/11/1954 63D 3w/e 29/09/1962 64C Dalry Road
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44976 m/e 05/1946 29A Perth South (New) 4w/e 27/11/1954 63D 4w/e 08/09/1962 64C Dalry Road
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44977 on 15/06/1946 29A Perth South (New) 4w/e 27/11/1954 63D 4w/e 21/04/1962 67D Ardrossan
Steam K2 2-6-0 61784 m/e 10/1942 EFD Eastfield on 21/05/1957 65J on 24/03/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44255 on 01/01/1948 31A St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 18/01/1958 65J on 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80061 4w/e 25/02/1956 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 09/04/1960 65J 4w/e 22/08/1964 67E Dumfries
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42696 w/e 06/02/1960 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 09/04/1960 65J 4w/e 09/04/1960 91M To London Midland Region
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76001 m/e 05/1960 63C Oban 4w/e 02/07/1960 63B 4w/e 08/09/1962 67A Corkerhill
Steam J36 0-6-0 65313 4w/e 11/03/1961 65A Eastfield 4w/e 11/03/1961 63B w/e 30/07/1962 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4095       on 23/08/1961 (New) 63B 4w/e 18/11/1961 60A Inverness
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4096 on 30/08/1961 65A Eastfield (New) 4w/e 23/09/1961 63B 4w/e 18/11/1961 60A Inverness
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4097 on 08/09/1961 63A Perth South (New) 4w/e 18/11/1961 63B 5w/e 01/06/1968 63A Perth South
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4098 on 11/09/1961 63A Perth South (New) 4w/e 14/07/1962 63B 4w/e 25/01/1964 63B Fort William
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44960 m/e 05/1946 29A Perth South (New) 4w/e 22/12/1962 63B 4w/e 11/05/1963 63A Perth South
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4098 4w/e 14/07/1962 63B Fort William 4w/e 25/01/1964 63B 5w/e 01/08/1970 65A Eastfield
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3886 5w/e 31/08/1968 65A Eastfield 5w/e 29/06/1974 FW