Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 131 Today
» 869 Yesterday
» 131 Week
» 18253 Month
» 187025 Year
» 1071406 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Ardsley


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Ardsley Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam Q1 0-8-0 405       04/1902 (New) ARD 26/06/1935 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0 406       04/1902 (New) ARD 03/02/1934 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0 407       04/1902 (New) ARD 16/06/1934 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0 413       09/1902 (New) ARD 16/05/1927 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0 419       01/1903 (New) ARD 13/09/1928 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0 428       09/1903 (New) ARD 10/04/1926 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0 444       12/1906 (New) ARD 12/07/1932 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0 445       12/1906 (New) ARD 25/04/1925 ARD Ardsley
Steam K1 2-6-0 1634       02/1913 (New) ARD 05/1924 STR Stratford
Steam J51 0-6-0T 157       12/1913 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 DON Doncaster
Steam J51 0-6-0T 158       02/1914 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam J51 0-6-0T 160       02/1914 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 DON Doncaster
Steam J51 0-6-0T 161       02/1914 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam J51 0-6-0T 163       03/1914 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 ARD Ardsley
Steam J51 0-6-0T 166       03/1914 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam J51 0-6-0T 167       04/1914 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 DON Doncaster
Steam K2 2-6-0 1640       04/1914 (New) ARD 05/1924 NWE New England
Steam K2 2-6-0 1648       06/1914 (New) ARD 1923 NWE New England
Steam J51 0-6-0T 168       12/1914 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 ARD Ardsley
Steam J51 0-6-0T 169       12/1914 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 ARD Ardsley
Steam J51 0-6-0T 170       12/1914 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam J51 0-6-0T 171       02/1915 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 ARD Ardsley
Steam J51 0-6-0T 172       02/1915 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 ARD Ardsley
Steam J51 0-6-0T 173       03/1915 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 STR Stratford
Steam J51 0-6-0T 174       04/1915 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam J51 0-6-0T 175       04/1915 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 ARD Ardsley
Steam J51 0-6-0T 176       06/1915 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam J51 0-6-0T 178       06/1915 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 ARD Ardsley
Steam K2 2-6-0 1652   07/1907 STR Southend Victoria 05/1916 (New) ARD 1924 MAR March
Steam K2 2-6-0 1658       12/1916 (New) ARD 21/02/1928 DON Doncaster
Steam K2 2-6-0 1675       07/1918 (New) ARD 1923 DON Doncaster
Steam K2 2-6-0 1676       08/1918 (New) ARD 1924 MAR March
Steam J51 0-6-0T 211       06/1919 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 ARD Ardsley
Steam J51 0-6-0T 212       06/1919 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 COP Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam J51 0-6-0T 213       07/1919 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam J51 0-6-0T 214       07/1919 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 COP Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam J51 0-6-0T 215       07/1919 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 ARD Ardsley
Steam J51 0-6-0T 216       07/1919 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 ARD Ardsley
Steam J51 0-6-0T 217       07/1919 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 ARD Ardsley
Steam J51 0-6-0T 218       08/1919 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 ARD Ardsley
Steam J51 0-6-0T 219       08/1919 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 DON Doncaster
Steam J51 0-6-0T 220       08/1919 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 ARD Ardsley
Steam J50 0-6-0T 221       10/1922 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam J50 0-6-0T 222       11/1922 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 ARD Ardsley
Steam J50 0-6-0T 223       11/1922 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam J50 0-6-0T 224       11/1922 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam J50 0-6-0T 225       11/1922 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 STR Stratford
Steam J50 0-6-0T 226       12/1922 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 ARD Ardsley
Steam J50 0-6-0T 227       12/1922 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 DON Doncaster
Steam J50 0-6-0T 228       12/1922 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 ANN Annesley
Steam J50 0-6-0T 229       12/1922 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 SHF Sheffield Darnall
Steam J50 0-6-0T 230       12/1922 (New) ARD 01/01/1948 ANN Annesley
Steam K2 2-6-0 1650 01/1916 DON Doncaster (New) 1923 ARD 06/12/1925 CLK Colwick
Steam K2 2-6-0 1663 07/1918 NWE New England (New) 1923 ARD 03/11/1927 STR Stratford
Steam K2 2-6-0 1672 06/1918 DON Doncaster (New) 1923 ARD 01/08/1927 DON Doncaster
Steam A5 4-6-2T 165 18/03/1911 ANN Annesley (New) 05/01/1924 ARD 21/04/1924 NEA Neasden
Steam A5 4-6-2T 170 10/06/1911 ANN Annesley (New) 05/01/1924 ARD 25/03/1924 GOR Gorton
Steam A5 4-6-2T 448 12/08/1911 ANN Annesley (New) 05/01/1924 ARD 21/04/1924 NEA Neasden
Steam A5 4-6-2T 450 02/11/1912 ANN Annesley (New) 05/01/1924 ARD 21/04/1924 NEA Neasden
Steam B5 4-6-0 1068 19/01/1917 MEX Mexborough 05/01/1924 ARD 22/05/1924 IMM Immingham
Steam B5 4-6-0 183 19/05/1922 IMM Immingham 05/01/1924 ARD 15/04/1924 GOR Gorton
Steam B5 4-6-0 184 19/05/1922 IMM Immingham 05/01/1924 ARD 16/04/1924 GOR Gorton
Steam B5 4-6-0 185 02/1904 GOR Gorton (New) 05/01/1924 ARD 24/04/1924 IMM Immingham
Steam B5 4-6-0 186 15/12/1922 MEX Mexborough 05/01/1924 ARD 07/01/1924 GOR Gorton
Steam B19 4-6-0 428 12/1913 GOR Gorton (New) 10/03/1924 ARD 24/05/1924 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 6272 16/01/1924 GOR Gorton 13/09/1924 ARD 30/08/1926 SHF Sheffield Neepsend
Steam O4 2-8-0 6270 22/03/1924 GOR Gorton 13/09/1924 ARD 24/02/1925 NWE New England
Steam O4 2-8-0 6273 05/04/1924 GOR Gorton 09/10/1924 ARD 09/08/1926 MEX Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 6274 01/02/1924 GOR Gorton 09/10/1924 ARD 13/08/1926 MEX Mexborough
Steam A5 4-6-2T 5167 06/05/1911 NEA Neasden (New) 20/11/1924 ARD 15/02/1928 KX Kings Cross
Steam A5 4-6-2T 5168 20/05/1911 NEA Neasden (New) 20/11/1924 ARD 28/07/1927 NEA Neasden
Steam A5 4-6-2T 5128 07/07/1924 NEA Neasden 20/11/1924 ARD 01/10/1928 NEA Neasden
Steam A5 4-6-2T 5129 21/04/1924 NEA Neasden 20/11/1924 ARD 07/05/1928 KX Kings Cross
Steam K2 2-6-0 1648 1923 NWE New England 1925 ARD 14/02/1928 DON Doncaster
Steam B4 4-6-0 6097 28/03/1924 DON Doncaster 03/01/1925 ARD 23/09/1932 DON Doncaster
Steam A5 4-6-2T 5371 30/06/1917 NEA Neasden (New) 05/01/1925 ARD 20/09/1927 NEA Neasden
Steam A5 4-6-2T 5374 29/09/1917 NEA Neasden (New) 08/01/1925 ARD 15/09/1927 NEA Neasden
Steam O4 2-8-0 6363 16/03/1924 SHF Sheffield Neepsend 31/01/1925 ARD 14/03/1925 CLK Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 6279 14/03/1924 SHF Sheffield Neepsend 02/02/1925 ARD 02/03/1925 NWE New England
Steam O4 2-8-0 6266 15/02/1924 SHF Sheffield Neepsend 02/02/1925 ARD 23/02/1925 NWE New England
Steam O4 2-8-0 6308 21/03/1924 SHF Sheffield Neepsend 04/02/1925 ARD 20/02/1925 NWE New England
Steam O4 2-8-0 6358 08/03/1924 SHF Sheffield Neepsend 05/02/1925 ARD 17/08/1926 SHF Sheffield Neepsend
Steam O4 2-8-0 6357 20/03/1924 SHF Sheffield Neepsend 05/02/1925 ARD 30/08/1926 SHF Sheffield Neepsend
Steam O4 2-8-0 6349 11/07/1924 SHF Sheffield Neepsend 05/02/1925 ARD 10/08/1926 MEX Mexborough
Steam Q3 0-8-0 3420 01/1903 NWE New England (New) 15/02/1925 ARD 10/02/1937 Withdrawn
Steam K2 2-6-0 4659 1923 NWE New England 19/02/1925 ARD 21/07/1927 DON Doncaster
Steam K2 2-6-0 1654 07/1916 KX Kings Cross (New) 21/02/1925 ARD 04/12/1925 LIV Brunswick
Steam K2 2-6-0 4662 1923 DON Doncaster 21/02/1925 ARD 06/10/1927 STR Stratford
Steam K2 2-6-0 4657 11/1916 DON Doncaster (New) 26/02/1925 ARD 1926 COP Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam Q1 0-8-0 3445 12/1906 ARD Ardsley (New) 25/04/1925 ARD 27/06/1928 Withdrawn
Steam C1 4-4-2 4436       14/09/1925 ARD 05/10/1925 KX Kings Cross
Steam Q1 0-8-0 3439 08/1904 CLK Colwick (New) 22/09/1925 ARD 09/02/1927 Withdrawn
Steam A7 4-6-2T 1129 23/05/1925 SHI Shildon 30/10/1925 ARD 01/09/1926 SHI Shildon
Steam A7 4-6-2T 1195 20/03/1925 YK York (North) 30/10/1925 ARD 22/02/1926 YK York (North)
Steam B4 4-6-0 6099 30/05/1925 NWE New England 02/01/1926 ARD 01/1935 COP Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam C1 4-4-2 4419 05/12/1925 HTN Heaton 01/02/1926 ARD 18/02/1926 COP Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam A5 4-6-2T 5450 21/04/1924 NEA Neasden 05/02/1926 ARD 18/07/1927 NEA Neasden
Steam A5 4-6-2T 5451 16/11/1912 NEA Neasden (New) 11/02/1926 ARD 13/01/1927 NEA Neasden
Steam B13 4-6-0 757 07/07/1924 YK York (North) 23/02/1926 ARD 07/06/1926 CLK Colwick
Steam B13 4-6-0 743 06/1908 NEV Neville Hill (New) 23/02/1926 ARD 09/1926 NEV Neville Hill
Steam A7 4-6-2T 1190 04/1911 SKN Stockton (New) 26/02/1926 ARD 01/09/1926 SKN Stockton
Steam J85 0-6-0ST 3114 m/e 09/1898 ? Robin Hood (New) m/e 07/1926 ARD m/e 02/1933 Withdrawn
Steam N19 0-6-2ST 5 m/e 05/1899 ? Robin Hood (New) m/e 07/1926 ARD m/e 03/1928 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 6209 08/1912 MEX Mexborough (New) 11/08/1926 ARD 18/01/1928 MEX Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 5397 11/05/1917 MEX Mexborough 11/08/1926 ARD 07/09/1928 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 5398 05/1914 MEX Mexborough (New) 11/08/1926 ARD 30/06/1928 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 5399 13/03/1924 MEX Mexborough 11/08/1926 ARD 09/10/1928 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 5271 02/02/1923 STV Staveley (G.C.) 12/08/1926 ARD 09/01/1928 MEX Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 6251 20/10/1922 STV Staveley (G.C.) 13/08/1926 ARD 01/12/1928 DON Doncaster
Steam C1 4-4-2 4419 01/03/1927 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 04/03/1927 ARD 02/07/1927 KX Kings Cross
Steam A5 4-6-2T 5045 07/04/1923 NEA Neasden (New) 29/04/1927 ARD 16/06/1927 NEA Neasden
Steam A5 4-6-2T 5046 28/04/1923 NEA Neasden (New) 29/04/1927 ARD 19/07/1927 NEA Neasden
Steam J39 0-6-0 1259       10/05/1927 (New) ARD 19/03/1936 MAR March
Steam O4 2-8-0 1824       12/05/1927 ARD 10/09/1927 IMM Immingham
Steam J39 0-6-0 1290       16/07/1927 (New) ARD 01/02/1936 RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam J39 0-6-0 1295       16/07/1927 (New) ARD 08/10/1927 STR Stratford
Steam J39 0-6-0 1289 30/06/1927 DON Doncaster (New) 21/07/1927 ARD 22/08/1929 COP Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam M1 0-6-4T 6149 06/1904 TUX Tuxford (New) w/e 20/08/1927 ARD w/e 24/09/1927 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam J39 0-6-0 1296       31/08/1927 (New) ARD 08/10/1927 STR Stratford
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5964 12/1910 IMM Immingham (New) 01/10/1927 ARD 10/10/1929 KEA Keadby
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6073 07/1905 MEX Mexborough (New) 15/10/1927 ARD 16/10/1929 KEA Keadby
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5160 23/02/1920 KEA Keadby 01/11/1927 ARD 05/06/1950 Withdrawn
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6076 1922 KEA Keadby 11/11/1927 ARD 10/10/1929 KEA Keadby
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5163 19/05/1912 MEX Mexborough 17/01/1928 ARD 10/10/1929 KEA Keadby
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6143 04/1907 LNG Langwith Junction (New) 31/01/1928 ARD 16/05/1936 Withdrawn
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5356 11/12/1909 MEX Mexborough 31/01/1928 ARD 12/10/1929 KEA Keadby
Steam B6 4-6-0 5052 10/02/1926 SHF Sheffield Neepsend 07/02/1928 ARD 13/05/1930 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam B6 4-6-0 5416 07/05/1927 SHF Sheffield Neepsend 17/02/1928 ARD 30/04/1928 COP Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam B6 4-6-0 5053 02/02/1927 SHF Sheffield Neepsend 17/02/1928 ARD 26/03/1928 COP Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6174 06/1910 MEX Mexborough (New) 16/04/1928 ARD 02/03/1931 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam B6 4-6-0 5053 26/03/1928 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 30/04/1928 ARD 01/02/1930 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5136 24/03/1924 DON Doncaster 05/06/1928 ARD 19/06/1950 Withdrawn
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5159 07/12/1926 MEX Mexborough 12/06/1928 ARD 20/03/1950 Withdrawn
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6182 02/1911 MEX Mexborough (New) 30/06/1928 ARD 16/05/1939 Withdrawn
Steam C1 4-4-2 3276       04/07/1928 ARD 14/07/1928 COP Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam J39 0-6-0 2697       09/08/1928 (New) ARD 12/07/1940 GRA Grantham
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5144 03/1904 IMM Immingham (New) 11/08/1928 ARD 14/05/1938 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 2698       14/08/1928 (New) ARD 31/05/1933 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam J39 0-6-0 2700       17/08/1928 (New) ARD 15/01/1936 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam J39 0-6-0 2701       25/08/1928 (New) ARD 12/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0 3441 12/1906 NWE New England (New) 16/09/1928 ARD 11/06/1930 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0 3446 07/1909 NWE New England (New) 16/09/1928 ARD 27/02/1932 Withdrawn
Steam B6 4-6-0 5416 30/04/1928 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 01/10/1928 ARD 15/06/1929 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5135 31/01/1927 MAR March 04/01/1929 ARD 16/03/1929 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6075 26/03/1925 MEX Mexborough 05/03/1929 ARD 06/01/1940 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 1272 25/05/1927 IMM Immingham (New) 04/07/1929 ARD 19/08/1929 IMM Immingham
Steam J39 0-6-0 2709 24/06/1929 LIN Lincoln 07/08/1929 ARD 20/08/1929 ANN Annesley
Steam J39 0-6-0 2710 24/06/1929 LIN Lincoln 14/08/1929 ARD 19/08/1929 ANN Annesley
Steam J39 0-6-0 1289 22/08/1929 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 07/10/1929 ARD 30/01/1931 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5138 02/02/1928 BRN Barnsley 10/10/1929 ARD 19/09/1945 MEX Mexborough
Steam Q1 0-8-0 3447 05/09/1925 HIT Hitchin (GNR) 17/10/1929 ARD 18/10/1935 Withdrawn
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6178 1922 KEA Keadby 31/12/1929 ARD 04/10/1930 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6076 10/10/1929 KEA Keadby 22/03/1930 ARD 26/12/1950 Withdrawn
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6073 16/10/1929 KEA Keadby 01/04/1930 ARD 10/12/1935 Withdrawn
Steam B5 4-6-0 5185 16/06/1930 WFD Woodford Halse 24/07/1930 ARD 22/08/1930 LIN Lincoln
Steam B5 4-6-0 5180 08/07/1929 WFD Woodford Halse 30/07/1930 ARD 21/08/1930 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam J39 0-6-0 2780 20/06/1930 LIN Lincoln 04/08/1930 ARD 19/08/1930 ANN Annesley
Steam J39 0-6-0 2709 20/06/1930 LIN Lincoln 05/08/1930 ARD 21/08/1930 ANN Annesley
Steam J39 0-6-0 1498 02/07/1930 MAR March 06/08/1930 ARD 19/08/1930 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1496 02/07/1930 MAR March 08/08/1930 ARD 13/08/1930 GOR Gorton
Steam B6 4-6-0 5052 13/05/1930 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 10/09/1930 ARD 29/12/1930 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam B6 4-6-0 5052 29/12/1930 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 14/04/1931 ARD 15/05/1934 SHF Sheffield Neepsend
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6135 03/1907 LNG Langwith Junction (New) 07/05/1931 ARD 16/10/1950 Withdrawn
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5959 21/06/1913 LNG Langwith Junction 18/05/1931 ARD 14/04/1944 MEX Mexborough
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5963 09/03/1929 ANN Annesley 22/05/1931 ARD 03/10/1936 Withdrawn
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6174 02/03/1931 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 04/06/1931 ARD 05/06/1936 Withdrawn
Steam K1 2-6-0 4639 31/12/1930 NWE New England 14/07/1931 ARD 17/08/1931 NWE New England
Steam J39 0-6-0 1289 30/01/1931 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 10/08/1931 ARD 15/11/1934 ANN Annesley
Steam Q2 0-8-0 3410 07/1902 CLK Colwick (New) 10/08/1932 ARD 18/10/1935 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 2698 31/05/1933 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 31/07/1933 ARD 27/09/1953 40D Tuxford
Steam J39 0-6-0 1484 21/08/1933 DON Doncaster 17/10/1933 ARD 12/02/1936 MAR March
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5152 02/03/1929 LNG Langwith Junction 28/02/1934 ARD 06/12/1940 BRN Barnsley
Steam J39 0-6-0 2785 10/12/1929 SHF Sheffield Neepsend 14/03/1934 ARD 12/02/1936 CLK Colwick
Steam J39 0-6-0 2706 12/09/1928 DON Doncaster (New) 15/03/1934 ARD 11/04/1934 COP Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5135 16/03/1929 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 23/04/1934 ARD 10/06/1937 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 2973 17/02/1932 SHF Sheffield Neepsend (New) 02/05/1934 ARD 05/05/1934 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam J39 0-6-0 2706 11/04/1934 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 27/06/1934 ARD 26/03/1941 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5965 1924 DON Doncaster 13/11/1934 ARD 29/10/1938 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 2950 11/07/1935 DON Doncaster (New) 07/08/1935 ARD 19/08/1935 DON Doncaster
Steam J39 0-6-0 2941 07/06/1935 DON Doncaster (New) 09/08/1935 ARD 19/08/1935 DON Doncaster
Steam J39 0-6-0 2942 08/06/1935 DON Doncaster (New) 09/08/1935 ARD 22/08/1935 DON Doncaster
Steam J39 0-6-0 2945 21/06/1935 DON Doncaster (New) 09/08/1935 ARD 19/08/1935 DON Doncaster
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6132 21/02/1934 CLK Colwick 07/10/1935 ARD 11/06/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6137 23/02/1934 CLK Colwick 02/11/1935 ARD 28/02/1939 Withdrawn
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5064 05/01/1931 ANN Annesley 28/12/1935 ARD 26/12/1950 Withdrawn
Steam K2 2-6-0 4678 17/12/1935 NOR Norwich Thorpe 30/01/1936 ARD 05/05/1937 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam J39 0-6-0 2770 09/02/1935 PKS Parkeston Quay 01/02/1936 ARD 16/06/1957 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam J39 0-6-0 2964 29/09/1931 PKS Parkeston Quay (New) 07/02/1936 ARD 13/12/1959 52G Sunderland
Steam J39 0-6-0 2699 15/08/1928 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 09/02/1936 ARD 11/09/1943 IPS Ipswich
Steam J39 0-6-0 2700 15/01/1936 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 17/02/1936 ARD 04/08/1946 SHF Sheffield Darnall
Steam J39 0-6-0 1484 12/02/1936 MAR March 29/02/1936 ARD 19/10/1941 DON Doncaster
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5048 30/04/1928 DON Doncaster 26/06/1936 ARD 10/11/1937 BRN Barnsley
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5148 04/1929 DON Doncaster 21/08/1936 ARD 29/10/1938 Withdrawn
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5146 08/12/1926 MEX Mexborough 21/10/1936 ARD 30/06/1946 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6175 21/08/1910 MEX Mexborough 19/11/1936 ARD 19/07/1943 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 1286 23/06/1927 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) (New) 02/12/1936 ARD 12/07/1940 GRA Grantham
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6181 04/12/1936 LNG Langwith Junction 09/03/1937 ARD 16/03/1939 Withdrawn
Steam K2 2-6-0 4678 05/05/1937 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 27/10/1937 ARD 09/05/1938 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam J39 0-6-0 1943       09/06/1938 (New) ARD 19/10/1941 DON Doncaster
Steam J39 0-6-0 1952       15/06/1938 (New) ARD 23/02/1940 NWE New England
Steam J39 0-6-0 1965       17/06/1938 (New) ARD 19/10/1941 DON Doncaster
Steam J39 0-6-0 1977       08/07/1938 (New) ARD 19/10/1941 DON Doncaster
Steam J39 0-6-0 1980       20/07/1938 (New) ARD 02/12/1941 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam O4 2-8-0 6301 24/05/1924 GOR Gorton 17/04/1939 ARD 06/07/1939 LIN Lincoln
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5164 19/02/1939 BRN Barnsley 04/05/1939 ARD 26/05/1951 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 6242 22/01/1939 ANN Annesley 30/05/1939 ARD 01/07/1939 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 2998 11/09/1936 GOR Gorton 30/06/1939 ARD 30/07/1945 DON Doncaster
Steam J39 0-6-0 2707 02/12/1934 DON Doncaster 01/07/1939 ARD 26/03/1941 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam J39 0-6-0 1493 10/06/1931 LIN Lincoln 06/07/1939 ARD 19/10/1941 DON Doncaster
Steam K2 2-6-0 4661 02/12/1936 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 30/07/1939 ARD 23/02/1940 NWE New England
Steam J39 0-6-0 2982 30/01/1937 DON Doncaster 04/08/1939 ARD 23/02/1940 NWE New England
Steam B4 4-6-0 6098 10/01/1925 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 25/01/1940 ARD 03/11/1946 COP Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam B4 4-6-0 6100 19/11/1924 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 25/01/1940 ARD 19/10/1941 COP Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam B4 4-6-0 6101 24/08/1933 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 25/01/1940 ARD 11/07/1941 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam K2 2-6-0 4666 12/02/1936 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 25/01/1940 ARD 23/02/1940 NWE New England
Steam K2 2-6-0 4670 22/01/1936 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 25/01/1940 ARD 23/02/1940 NWE New England
Steam K2 2-6-0 4678 09/05/1938 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 25/01/1940 ARD 23/02/1940 NWE New England
Steam B4 4-6-0 6102 25/01/1940 GOR Gorton 28/02/1940 ARD 02/12/1945 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam B4 4-6-0 6099 25/01/1940 GOR Gorton 27/04/1940 ARD 21/11/1942 DON Doncaster
Steam J39 0-6-0 2981 22/02/1938 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 24/07/1940 ARD 30/07/1945 DON Doncaster
Steam C1 4-4-2 3299 08/06/1938 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 04/11/1940 ARD 15/10/1941 DON Doncaster
Steam C1 4-4-2 4428 08/08/1938 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 04/11/1940 ARD 15/10/1941 DON Doncaster
Steam J39 0-6-0 2973 05/05/1934 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 02/02/1941 ARD 09/09/1943 STR Stratford
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6177 21/11/1934 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 02/02/1941 ARD 17/04/1950 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 2707 26/03/1941 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 11/07/1941 ARD 30/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam A5 4-6-2T 5373 07/11/1940 NEA Neasden 05/09/1941 ARD 15/02/1943 NEA Neasden
Steam A5 4-6-2T 5448 08/01/1930 NEA Neasden 16/10/1941 ARD 15/02/1943 NEA Neasden
Steam A5 4-6-2T 5006 10/02/1923 NEA Neasden (New) 16/10/1941 ARD 13/12/1941 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam A5 4-6-2T 5165 08/11/1940 NEA Neasden 27/10/1941 ARD 30/05/1943 NEA Neasden
Steam A5 4-6-2T 5411 17/04/1938 NEA Neasden 27/10/1941 ARD 15/02/1943 NEA Neasden
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5147 27/08/1939 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 02/12/1941 ARD 25/08/1946 DON Doncaster
Steam A5 4-6-2T 5006 13/12/1941 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 15/03/1942 ARD 15/02/1943 NEA Neasden
Steam C1 4-4-2 4433 12/05/1932 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 16/08/1942 ARD 23/05/1943 COP Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam B4 4-6-0 6100 19/10/1941 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 06/09/1942 ARD 04/06/1949 Withdrawn
Steam C1 4-4-2 3300 08/07/1939 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 20/09/1942 ARD 28/03/1943 COP Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam B4 4-6-0 6095 29/11/1942 LNG Langwith Junction 20/02/1943 ARD 10/02/1944 Withdrawn
Steam B4 4-6-0 6101 10/12/1942 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 28/03/1943 ARD 30/06/1943 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam C1 4-4-2 4445 15/02/1943 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 23/05/1943 ARD 09/12/1945 COP Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam B4 4-6-0 6101 30/06/1943 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 07/07/1943 ARD 02/12/1945 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam J39 0-6-0 2992 08/09/1940 STR Stratford 07/09/1943 ARD 28/12/1952 35C Spital Bridge
Steam J39 0-6-0 2775 03/06/1943 STR Stratford 30/09/1943 ARD 27/05/1956 37C Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam J39 0-6-0 1943 19/10/1941 DON Doncaster 11/06/1944 ARD 30/07/1945 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6229 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster 11/06/1944 ARD 18/08/1946 MEX Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 6336 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster 11/06/1944 ARD 18/08/1946 MEX Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 6633 02/10/1943 DON Doncaster 11/06/1944 ARD 18/08/1946 MEX Mexborough
Steam Q1 0-8-0T 5087 11/1903 BRN Barnsley (New) 26/06/1944 ARD 19/07/1944 MEX Mexborough
Steam J39 0-6-0 1980 02/12/1941 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 17/09/1944 ARD 30/07/1945 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6575 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster 25/06/1945 ARD 25/11/1945 GOR Gorton
Steam K2 2-6-0 4637 25/07/1943 DON Doncaster 30/07/1945 ARD 18/08/1946 CLK Colwick
Steam K2 2-6-0 4642 04/1914 DON Doncaster (New) 30/07/1945 ARD 19/08/1945 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam K2 2-6-0 4651 29/02/1940 DON Doncaster 30/07/1945 ARD 18/08/1946 CLK Colwick
Steam K2 2-6-0 4678 03/04/1942 DON Doncaster 30/07/1945 ARD 18/08/1946 CLK Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 5349 07/06/1919 MEX Mexborough 23/09/1945 ARD 18/08/1946 MEX Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 6637 29/11/1935 GOR Gorton 25/11/1945 ARD 18/08/1946 MEX Mexborough
Steam K2 2-6-0 4642 19/08/1945 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 02/12/1945 ARD 18/08/1946 CLK Colwick
Steam K2 2-6-0 4679 30/07/1945 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 02/12/1945 ARD 18/08/1946 CLK Colwick
Steam K2 2-6-0 4633 30/07/1945 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 30/12/1945 ARD 30/06/1946 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam J39 0-6-0 1854 14/11/1936 CLK Colwick 31/03/1946 ARD 28/07/1946 SHF Sheffield Darnall
Steam J39 0-6-0 1857 12/11/1936 CLK Colwick 31/03/1946 ARD 09/05/1954 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam J39 0-6-0 4952 29/04/1938 CLK Colwick (New) 31/03/1946 ARD 28/07/1946 SHF Sheffield Darnall
Steam B4 4-6-0 1494 02/12/1945 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 19/05/1946 ARD 20/11/1947 Withdrawn
Steam B4 4-6-0 1496 02/12/1945 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 19/05/1946 ARD 07/10/1947 Withdrawn
Steam B4 4-6-0 1497 02/12/1945 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 19/05/1946 ARD 10/12/1947 Withdrawn
Steam B6 4-6-0 1328 11/04/1943 SHF Sheffield Darnall 28/07/1946 ARD 28/11/1947 Withdrawn
Steam B6 4-6-0 1330 11/04/1943 SHF Sheffield Darnall 28/07/1946 ARD 31/12/1947 Withdrawn
Steam B6 4-6-0 1347 11/04/1943 SHF Sheffield Darnall 04/08/1946 ARD 31/12/1947 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 2780 16/02/1945 CLK Colwick 18/08/1946 ARD 13/12/1959 52B Heaton
Steam J39 0-6-0 2785 12/02/1936 CLK Colwick 18/08/1946 ARD 30/03/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 4836 09/08/1943 CLK Colwick 18/08/1946 ARD 25/04/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 3089 08/08/1943 CLK Colwick 18/08/1946 ARD 16/10/1960 51F West Auckland
Steam J39 0-6-0 3095 08/10/1941 CLK Colwick 18/08/1946 ARD 22/09/1952 30A Stratford
Steam B4 4-6-0 1483 03/11/1946 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 16/02/1947 ARD 26/09/1949 Withdrawn
Steam B4 4-6-0 1488 25/06/1945 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 16/02/1947 ARD 07/10/1948 Withdrawn
Steam Q4 0-8-0 3225 01/09/1946 GRA Grantham 22/04/1947 ARD 25/09/1951 Withdrawn
Steam B4 4-6-0 1482 12/08/1939 LIN Lincoln 11/07/1947 ARD 24/11/1950 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 1229       02/09/1947 (New) ARD 21/09/1947 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam B1 4-6-0 1230       04/09/1947 (New) ARD 21/09/1947 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam Q4 0-8-0 3200 03/08/1943 RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 05/10/1947 ARD 05/09/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Q4 0-8-0 3210 09/08/1943 RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 05/10/1947 ARD 10/10/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Q4 0-8-0 3224 03/08/1943 RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 05/10/1947 ARD 26/02/1949 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 4749 18/08/1946 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 16/11/1947 ARD 30/11/1947 COP Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam B1 4-6-0 1267       12/12/1947 (New) ARD 10/04/1949 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam B1 4-6-0 1268       16/12/1947 (New) ARD 10/04/1949 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam O4 2-8-0 3683 15/08/1912 MEX Mexborough 28/12/1947 ARD 22/02/1948 MEX Mexborough
Steam C14 4-4-2T 7440       01/01/1948 ARD 5w/e 24/03/1951 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam C14 4-4-2T 7441       01/01/1948 ARD 4w/e 21/07/1951 39A Gorton
Steam C14 4-4-2T 7442       01/01/1948 ARD m/e 11/1957 Withdrawn
Steam C14 4-4-2T 7443       01/01/1948 ARD 5w/e 18/06/1955 39A Gorton
Steam C14 4-4-2T 7444       01/01/1948 ARD 4w/e 18/04/1953 39A Gorton
Steam C14 4-4-2T 7445       01/01/1948 ARD 5w/e 17/01/1953 39A Gorton
Steam C14 4-4-2T 7446       01/01/1948 ARD 5w/e 18/06/1955 39A Gorton
Steam C14 4-4-2T 7449       01/01/1948 ARD m/e 12/1957 Withdrawn
Steam C14 4-4-2T 7451       01/01/1948 ARD 4w/e 21/07/1951 39A Gorton
Steam F2 2-4-2T 7104       01/01/1948 ARD m/e 05/1949 Withdrawn
Steam J6 0-6-0 4174       01/01/1948 ARD 5w/e 17/12/1955 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam J6 0-6-0 4182       01/01/1948 ARD 29/11/1960 Withdrawn
Steam J6 0-6-0 4208       01/01/1948 ARD 24/04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J6 0-6-0 4214       01/01/1948 ARD 5w/e 23/06/1951 40F Boston
Steam J6 0-6-0 4267       01/01/1948 ARD 5w/e 21/01/1956 38A Colwick
Steam J6 0-6-0 4272       01/01/1948 ARD 5w/e 23/06/1951 40F Boston
Steam J6 0-6-0 4277       01/01/1948 ARD 5w/e 23/06/1951 40F Boston
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8896 03/1914 ARD Ardsley (New) 01/01/1948 ARD 4w/e 13/12/1952 38B Annesley
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8900 12/1914 ARD Ardsley (New) 01/01/1948 ARD 22/01/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8901 12/1914 ARD Ardsley (New) 01/01/1948 ARD m/e 10/1960 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8903 02/1915 ARD Ardsley (New) 01/01/1948 ARD 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B Hornsey
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8904 02/1915 ARD Ardsley (New) 01/01/1948 ARD w/e 28/02/1959 56A Wakefield
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8907 04/1915 ARD Ardsley (New) 01/01/1948 ARD 5w/e 21/03/1953 34B Hornsey
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8909 06/1915 ARD Ardsley (New) 01/01/1948 ARD 5w/e 14/06/1958 51E Stockton
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8910 06/1919 ARD Ardsley (New) 01/01/1948 ARD w/e 28/02/1959 56A Wakefield
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8914 07/1919 ARD Ardsley (New) 01/01/1948 ARD m/e 11/1960 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8915 07/1919 ARD Ardsley (New) 01/01/1948 ARD m/e 10/1960 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8916 07/1919 ARD Ardsley (New) 01/01/1948 ARD m/e 04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8917 08/1919 ARD Ardsley (New) 01/01/1948 ARD 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B Hornsey
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8919 08/1919 ARD Ardsley (New) 01/01/1948 ARD m/e 09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8921 11/1922 ARD Ardsley (New) 01/01/1948 ARD 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B Hornsey
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8925 12/1922 ARD Ardsley (New) 01/01/1948 ARD w/e 18/03/1963 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8930       01/01/1948 ARD 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B Hornsey
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8931       01/01/1948 ARD 4w/e 18/10/1952 34B Hornsey
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8938       01/01/1948 ARD m/e 10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8939       01/01/1948 ARD w/e 28/02/1959 56A Wakefield
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8947       01/01/1948 ARD m/e 02/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8948       01/01/1948 ARD 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8949       01/01/1948 ARD 5w/e 23/06/1951 34E Neasden
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8951       01/01/1948 ARD 5w/e 14/06/1958 51C West Hartlepool
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8960       01/01/1948 ARD 4w/e 21/10/1950 36A Doncaster
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8966       01/01/1948 ARD 5w/e 24/03/1956 34B Hornsey
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8848       01/01/1948 ARD m/e 07/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8871       01/01/1948 ARD 5w/e 21/01/1956 38A Colwick
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8872       01/01/1948 ARD m/e 08/1956 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8766       01/01/1948 ARD 5w/e 24/03/1951 36A Doncaster
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8790       01/01/1948 ARD m/e 07/1955 Withdrawn
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9452       01/01/1948 ARD m/e 03/1959 Withdrawn
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9461       01/01/1948 ARD m/e 06/1954 Withdrawn
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9473       01/01/1948 ARD m/e 09/1952 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 1295       03/03/1948 (New) ARD 26/09/1948 COP Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam B1 4-6-0 1296       06/03/1948 (New) ARD 04/06/1950 37C Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam B1 4-6-0 1297       10/03/1948 (New) ARD 10/04/1949 COP Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam B1 4-6-0 61309       15/04/1948 (New) ARD 29/07/1951 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam B1 4-6-0 61310       19/04/1948 (New) ARD 18/02/1951 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam J39 0-6-0 4749 30/11/1947 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 02/05/1948 ARD 12/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64766 03/12/1928 STR Stratford 15/05/1949 ARD 18/09/1949 STR Stratford
Steam J39 0-6-0 64767 16/11/1941 STR Stratford 15/05/1949 ARD 28/09/1949 STR Stratford
Steam J39 0-6-0 4768 05/12/1928 STR Stratford 15/05/1949 ARD 18/09/1949 STR Stratford
Steam B1 4-6-0 61085 04/02/1949 GOR Gorton 17/07/1949 ARD 07/08/1949 COP Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam B1 4-6-0 61096 31/10/1948 GOR Gorton 17/07/1949 ARD 07/08/1949 COP Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam J39 0-6-0 64839 23/09/1947 STR Stratford 18/09/1949 ARD 09/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64840 24/09/1947 STR Stratford 18/09/1949 ARD 27/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 4907 20/10/1936 STR Stratford 18/09/1949 ARD 16/03/1952 37C Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam B1 4-6-0 1297 10/04/1949 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 02/10/1949 ARD 25/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63708 22/12/1947 CAM Cambridge 27/11/1949 ARD 11/06/1950 39A Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 63839 22/12/1947 CAM Cambridge 27/11/1949 ARD 11/06/1950 39A Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 63880 22/12/1947 CAM Cambridge 18/12/1949 ARD 11/06/1950 39A Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 64799 04/01/1948 NOR Norwich Thorpe 30/04/1950 37A 27/09/1953 40D Tuxford
Steam J39 0-6-0 64872 16/04/1950 32A Norwich Thorpe 30/04/1950 37A 16/06/1957 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam B1 4-6-0 61029 02/10/1949 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 04/06/1950 37A 24/09/1950 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam B1 4-6-0 61031 10/07/1947 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) (New) 04/06/1950 37A 13/05/1951 37C Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam B1 4-6-0 61033 21/09/1947 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 04/06/1950 37A 15/10/1950 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam B1 4-6-0 61085 07/08/1949 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 04/06/1950 37A 20/09/1953 35A New England
Steam B1 4-6-0 61096 07/08/1949 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 04/06/1950 37A 23/12/1951 39B Sheffield Darnall
Steam Q4 0-8-0 63202 06/03/1949 GRA Grantham 04/06/1950 37A 25/09/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Q4 0-8-0 63217 30/06/1946 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 04/06/1950 37A 14/03/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Q4 0-8-0 63234 23/02/1947 GRA Grantham 04/06/1950 37A 05/03/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Q4 0-8-0 63240 13/10/1946 GRA Grantham 04/06/1950 37A 13/06/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Q4 0-8-0 63204 13/02/1949 GRA Grantham 11/06/1950 37A 25/06/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Q4 0-8-0 63207 28/09/1946 GRA Grantham 11/06/1950 37A 07/08/1950 Withdrawn
Steam Q4 0-8-0 63243 23/02/1947 GRA Grantham 11/06/1950 37A 15/10/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Q4 0-8-0 63227 05/10/1947 BRN Barnsley 08/1950 37A 26/05/1951 Withdrawn
Steam N5 0-6-2T 69337 01/01/1948 LIV Brunswick 4w/e 23/09/1950 37A 4w/e 16/05/1953 37C Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam J39 0-6-0 64820 15/06/1947 IPS Ipswich 21/01/1951 37A w/e 24/05/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64833 27/12/1946 NOR Norwich Thorpe 21/01/1951 37A 21/06/1953 35C Spital Bridge
Steam B1 4-6-0 61029 24/09/1950 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 18/02/1951 37A 13/12/1951 39B Sheffield Darnall
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69472 01/01/1948 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 5w/e 24/03/1951 37A m/e 08/1958 Withdrawn
Steam N5 0-6-2T 9271 01/01/1948 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 5w/e 24/03/1951 37A 4w/e 16/05/1953 38A Colwick
Steam J39 0-6-0 64729 19/03/1950 38A Colwick 01/04/1951 37A 27/09/1953 40D Tuxford
Steam J39 0-6-0 64831 06/09/1940 CLK Colwick 01/04/1951 37A 10/05/1959 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam C12 4-4-2T 67353 01/01/1948 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 21/04/1951 37A 4w/e 19/01/1952 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam B1 4-6-0 61050 17/06/1946 NOR Norwich Thorpe (New) 13/05/1951 37A 28/10/1951 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam B1 4-6-0 61051 20/06/1946 NOR Norwich Thorpe (New) 13/05/1951 37A 16/12/1951 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam B1 4-6-0 61056 04/07/1946 IPS Ipswich (New) 13/05/1951 37A 16/12/1951 32B Ipswich
Steam J39 0-6-0 64720 30/03/1947 CLK Colwick 20/05/1951 37A 08/09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64757 30/03/1947 CLK Colwick 20/05/1951 37A 16/10/1960 51L Thornaby
Steam J39 0-6-0 64763 14/08/1943 CLK Colwick 20/05/1951 37A 27/09/1953 40D Tuxford
Steam J39 0-6-0 64787 16/01/1949 PKS Parkeston Quay 20/05/1951 37A 24/06/1951 30F Parkeston Quay
Steam J39 0-6-0 64837 14/05/1942 CLK Colwick 20/05/1951 37A 13/12/1959 52B Heaton
Steam J39 0-6-0 64981 08/10/1941 CLK Colwick 20/05/1951 37A 27/04/1952 38A Colwick
Steam J39 0-6-0 64876 29/08/1935 STR Stratford 24/06/1951 37A 22/09/1952 30A Stratford
Steam C14 4-4-2T 67440 5w/e 24/03/1951 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 21/07/1951 37A 4w/e 16/05/1953 39A Gorton
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69463 01/01/1948 HSY Hornsey 4w/e 21/07/1951 37A m/e 10/1955 Withdrawn
Steam N7 0-6-2T 69698 4w/e 21/07/1951 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 18/08/1951 37A 5w/e 22/09/1951 34A Kings Cross
Steam A1 4-6-2 60123 04/06/1950 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 09/09/1951 37A 15/09/1957 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam A1 4-6-2 60144 15/07/1951 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 09/09/1951 37A 15/02/1953 35B Grantham
Steam B1 4-6-0 61382       18/09/1951 (New) 37A 15/09/1957 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam B1 4-6-0 61122 08/01/1950 CLK Colwick 30/09/1951 37A 20/09/1953 35A New England
Steam B1 4-6-0 61123 01/01/1950 CLK Colwick 30/09/1951 37A 17/06/1962 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam B1 4-6-0 61145 15/05/1947 SHF Sheffield Darnall 30/09/1951 37A 18/11/1951 37C Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam B1 4-6-0 61383       03/10/1951 (New) 37A 15/09/1957 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam B1 4-6-0 61384       17/10/1951 (New) 37A 20/07/1952 37C Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69484 01/01/1948 KX Kings Cross 4w/e 20/10/1951 37A m/e 09/1957 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61385       25/10/1951 (New) 37A 27/07/1952 38C Leicester (G.C.)
Steam B1 4-6-0 61386       30/10/1951 (New) 37A 06/01/1952 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam B1 4-6-0 61387       02/11/1951 (New) 37A 06/01/1952 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam B1 4-6-0 61388       09/11/1951 (New) 37A 02/11/1952 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam B1 4-6-0 61129 18/02/1947 KX Kings Cross (New) 11/11/1951 37A 29/06/1952 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam J39 0-6-0 64903 17/10/1947 SHF Sheffield Darnall 23/12/1951 37A 16/03/1952 37C Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam J39 0-6-0 64972 08/04/1951 39B Sheffield Darnall 23/12/1951 37A 18/12/1955 36A Doncaster
Steam B1 4-6-0 61033 15/10/1950 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 06/01/1952 37A 22/09/1952 30A Stratford
Steam B1 4-6-0 61310 18/02/1951 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 06/01/1952 37A 05/04/1965 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61110 09/12/1951 32A Norwich Thorpe 27/01/1952 37A 31/10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61377 09/12/1951 32A Norwich Thorpe 27/01/1952 37A 29/06/1952 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam J39 0-6-0 64879 08/04/1951 39B Sheffield Darnall 03/02/1952 37A 13/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64969 22/01/1950 SHF Sheffield Darnall 03/02/1952 37A 16/10/1960 51F West Auckland
Steam J39 0-6-0 64732 01/04/1951 14A Cricklewood East 16/03/1952 37A 25/08/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64918 14/12/1949 14A Cricklewood East 16/03/1952 37A 30/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64966 01/04/1951 14A Cricklewood East 16/03/1952 37A 18/12/1955 36A Doncaster
Steam J3 0-6-0 64118       4w/e 22/03/1952 37A m/e 06/1952 Withdrawn
Steam J6 0-6-0 64271 01/01/1948 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 22/03/1952 37A 03/10/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J6 0-6-0 64274 01/01/1948 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 22/03/1952 37A 02/12/1958 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61385 27/07/1952 38C Leicester (G.C.) 10/08/1952 37A 22/02/1959 56A Wakefield
Steam N5 0-6-2T 69266 01/01/1948 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 5w/e 23/08/1952 37A 4w/e 14/02/1953 39B Sheffield Darnall
Steam O4 2-8-0 63633 02/04/1950 39A Gorton 22/09/1952 37A 08/08/1962 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63857 02/09/1951 38A Colwick 22/09/1952 37A 22/02/1959 56A Wakefield
Steam O4 2-8-0 63864 21/05/1950 39A Gorton 22/09/1952 37A 22/02/1959 56A Wakefield
Steam O4 2-8-0 63920 06/12/1944 FRO Frodingham 22/09/1952 37A 06/12/1953 37C Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam J6 0-6-0 64262 01/01/1948 DON Doncaster 4w/e 18/10/1952 37A 5w/e 21/01/1956 36A Doncaster
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68935 01/01/1948 ANN Annesley 4w/e 18/10/1952 37A m/e 09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61131 14/09/1952 30A Stratford 19/10/1952 37A 15/09/1957 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam C12 4-4-2T 67353 4w/e 19/01/1952 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 15/11/1952 37A 4w/e 20/06/1953 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68808 01/01/1948 HSY Hornsey 4w/e 15/11/1952 37A 4w/e 13/12/1952 34B Hornsey
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68774 01/01/1948 HSY Hornsey 4w/e 15/11/1952 37A 4w/e 13/12/1952 36A Doncaster
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68776 01/01/1948 HSY Hornsey 4w/e 15/11/1952 37A 4w/e 13/12/1952 36A Doncaster
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68890 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B Hornsey 4w/e 13/12/1952 37A m/e 03/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68837 01/01/1948 DON Doncaster 4w/e 13/12/1952 37A m/e 02/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68857 01/01/1948 DON Doncaster 4w/e 13/12/1952 37A m/e 04/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68875 01/01/1948 CLK Colwick 4w/e 13/12/1952 37A 5w/e 21/01/1956 38A Colwick
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68770 4w/e 15/11/1952 39B Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 14/02/1953 37A m/e 08/1953 Withdrawn
Steam A1 4-6-2 60130 09/09/1951 35B Grantham 15/02/1953 37A 15/09/1957 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68902 01/01/1948 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 5w/e 21/03/1953 37A m/e 09/1960 Withdrawn
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69431 01/01/1948 HSY Hornsey 4w/e 18/04/1953 37A m/e 03/1955 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68941 01/01/1948 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 16/05/1953 37A 5w/e 14/06/1958 51C West Hartlepool
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69456 01/01/1948 HSY Hornsey 4w/e 16/05/1953 37A w/e 15/11/1954 Withdrawn
Steam V2 2-6-2 60846 09/09/1951 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 07/06/1953 37A 14/09/1958 52B Heaton
Steam V2 2-6-2 60861 09/09/1951 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 07/06/1953 37A 10/09/1961 56A Wakefield
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68793 4w/e 25/07/1953 36A Doncaster 4w/e 22/08/1953 37A 4w/e 19/09/1953 35A New England
Steam V2 2-6-2 60876 30/05/1940 NWE New England (New) 30/08/1953 37A 20/09/1953 35A New England
Steam V2 2-6-2 60896 28/06/1953 36A Doncaster 30/08/1953 37A 20/09/1953 36A Doncaster
Steam V2 2-6-2 60902 12/07/1953 36A Doncaster 30/08/1953 37A 20/09/1953 36A Doncaster
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68868 01/01/1948 NWE New England 4w/e 19/09/1953 37A m/e 10/1955 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64833 13/09/1953 35A New England 27/09/1953 37A 10/05/1959 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam O4 2-8-0 63677 24/09/1950 40D Tuxford 27/09/1953 37A 18/12/1955 36B Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 63570 05/05/1946 TUX Tuxford 27/09/1953 37A 22/12/1961 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63588 06/03/1949 TUX Tuxford 27/09/1953 37A 22/02/1959 56A Wakefield
Steam O4 2-8-0 63691 14/12/1947 TUX Tuxford 27/09/1953 37A 20/12/1953 39B Sheffield Darnall
Steam O4 2-8-0 63823 09/11/1952 40D Tuxford 27/09/1953 37A 08/08/1962 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63852 02/02/1929 TUX Tuxford 27/09/1953 37A 20/12/1953 39B Sheffield Darnall
Steam O4 2-8-0 63885 10/07/1939 TUX Tuxford 27/09/1953 37A 08/08/1962 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63724 16/11/1952 40D Tuxford 27/09/1953 37A 08/08/1962 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61295 26/09/1948 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 11/10/1953 37A 25/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam V2 2-6-2 60826 14/10/1951 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 18/10/1953 37A 03/04/1955 35A New England
Steam O4 2-8-0 63584 01/07/1951 39B Sheffield Darnall 20/12/1953 37A 08/08/1962 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63605 09/05/1948 SHF Sheffield Darnall 20/12/1953 37A 08/08/1962 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61377 29/06/1952 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 07/03/1954 37A 18/12/1955 36A Doncaster
Steam N7 0-6-2T 69695 01/01/1948 HAT Hatfield 4w/e 22/05/1954 37A 4w/e 23/10/1954 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam N7 0-6-2T 69691 01/01/1948 HAT Hatfield 4w/e 19/06/1954 37A 4w/e 23/10/1954 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam N7 0-6-2T 69694 4w/e 21/07/1951 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 19/06/1954 37A 4w/e 23/10/1954 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam N7 0-6-2T 69696 5w/e 21/03/1953 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 19/06/1954 37A 4w/e 23/10/1954 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam A1 4-6-2 60133 04/06/1950 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 06/09/1954 37A 21/06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69440 01/01/1948 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 6w/e 25/12/1954 37A m/e 03/1957 Withdrawn
Steam V2 2-6-2 60916 28/06/1953 35A New England 03/04/1955 37A 11/09/1960 51L Thornaby
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69453 5w/e 24/04/1954 38A Colwick 5w/e 23/04/1955 37A m/e 04/1958 Withdrawn
Steam C13 4-4-2T 67427 4w/e 13/11/1954 40E Langwith Junction 5w/e 18/06/1955 37A m/e 01/1958 Withdrawn
Steam C13 4-4-2T 67437 4w/e 13/11/1954 40E Langwith Junction 5w/e 18/06/1955 37A 5w/e 21/01/1956 39A Gorton
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69457 4w/e 20/02/1954 38A Colwick 3w/e 12/11/1955 37A 4w/e 21/04/1956 37C Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69469 4w/e 13/11/1954 38A Colwick 3w/e 12/11/1955 37A 4w/e 17/11/1956 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69481 4w/e 23/01/1954 38A Colwick 3w/e 12/11/1955 37A m/e 05/1956 Withdrawn
Steam C13 4-4-2T 67433 3w/e 12/11/1955 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 5w/e 17/12/1955 37A 4w/e 18/02/1956 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam J6 0-6-0 64222 4w/e 24/10/1953 34B Hornsey 5w/e 24/03/1956 37A 26/11/1960 Withdrawn
Steam J6 0-6-0 64205 01/01/1948 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 3w/e 16/06/1956 37A m/e 10/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J6 0-6-0 64268 01/01/1948 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 3w/e 16/06/1956 37A w/e 10/10/1959 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam B1 4-6-0 61011 30/11/1946 GHD Gateshead (New) 23/09/1956 56B 22/02/1959 56A Wakefield
Steam B1 4-6-0 61013 14/12/1946 GHD Gateshead (New) 23/09/1956 56B 31/10/1965 56A Wakefield
Steam B1 4-6-0 61189 08/08/1947 SKN Stockton (New) 23/09/1956 56B 22/02/1959 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam V2 2-6-2 60884 08/05/1955 52B Heaton 23/09/1956 56B 10/09/1961 56A Wakefield
Steam C13 4-4-2T 67433 4w/e 18/02/1956 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 16/03/1957 56B m/e 01/1958 Withdrawn
Steam C13 4-4-2T 67438 4w/e 23/10/1954 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 16/03/1957 56B m/e 01/1958 Withdrawn
Steam K1 2-6-0 62043 12/02/1950 51E Stockton 16/06/1957 56B 15/09/1957 51A Darlington
Steam K1 2-6-0 62059 02/09/1951 51G Haverton Hill 16/06/1957 56B 15/09/1957 51A Darlington
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43075 4w/e 15/12/1956 52B Heaton 5w/e 20/07/1957 56B 4w/e 21/09/1957 56A Wakefield
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43101 4w/e 15/12/1956 52B Heaton 5w/e 20/07/1957 56B 4w/e 21/09/1957 56F Low Moor
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43126 5w/e 23/07/1955 52B Heaton 5w/e 20/07/1957 56B 4w/e 21/09/1957 56E Sowerby Bridge
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68895 01/01/1948 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 21/09/1957 56B 4w/e 19/10/1957 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68898 01/01/1948 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 21/09/1957 56B 5w/e 14/06/1958 51A Darlington
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68937 01/01/1948 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 21/09/1957 56B w/e 17/03/1962 56D Mirfield
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68959 01/01/1948 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 19/10/1957 56B 5w/e 14/06/1958 51F West Auckland
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69474 01/01/1948 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 19/10/1957 56B m/e 03/1959 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90698       4w/e 09/11/1957 56B 4w/e 08/01/1958 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90711 2w/e 17/06/1950 25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 09/11/1957 56B 5w/e 14/06/1958 56F Low Moor
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69443 01/01/1948 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 14/12/1957 56B m/e 03/1959 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63920 06/12/1953 37C Bradford Hammerton Street 05/01/1958 56B 22/02/1959 56A Wakefield
Steam J39 0-6-0 64911 09/05/1954 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 09/03/1958 56B 14/09/1958 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47443 01/01/1948 20B Stourton 5w/e 14/06/1958 56B w/e 20/06/1959 56D Mirfield
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47463 01/01/1948 20B Stourton 5w/e 14/06/1958 56B w/e 28/02/1959 56A Wakefield
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47538 01/01/1948 20B Stourton 5w/e 14/06/1958 56B w/e 28/02/1959 56A Wakefield
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47589       5w/e 14/06/1958 56B w/e 05/03/1960 50B Hull Dairycoates
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47632 8w/e 14/06/1952 20B Stourton 5w/e 14/06/1958 56B w/e 20/06/1959 56D Mirfield
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47640 5w/e 16/07/1949 20B Stourton 5w/e 14/06/1958 56B w/e 24/12/1960 26A Newton Heath
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43075 4w/e 21/09/1957 56A Wakefield 5w/e 14/06/1958 56B w/e 13/06/1959 56A Wakefield
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43101 4w/e 21/09/1957 56F Low Moor 5w/e 14/06/1958 56B w/e 13/06/1959 56A Wakefield
Steam J72 0-6-0T 68729 4w/e 21/09/1957 50A York (North) 5w/e 14/06/1958 56B w/e 31/01/1959 51L Thornaby
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40155 4w/e 19/10/1957 56F Low Moor 4w/e 11/10/1958 56B w/e 28/02/1959 56A Wakefield
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40169 4w/e 21/09/1957 56A Wakefield 4w/e 11/10/1958 56B w/e 28/02/1959 56A Wakefield
Steam J39 0-6-0 64705 16/06/1957 52d Alnmouth 25/01/1959 56B 12/06/1960 56A Wakefield
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68834 4w/e 13/12/1952 34B Hornsey w/e 14/02/1959 56B w/e 28/02/1959 56B Ardsley
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68875 5w/e 24/03/1956 34B Hornsey w/e 14/02/1959 56B w/e 28/02/1959 56B Ardsley
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68834 w/e 14/02/1959 56B Ardsley w/e 28/02/1959 56B m/e 02/1960 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68875 w/e 14/02/1959 56B Ardsley w/e 28/02/1959 56B m/e 03/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68824 01/01/1948 NWE New England w/e 11/04/1959 56B m/e 05/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68869 4w/e 13/09/1958 34B Hornsey w/e 11/04/1959 56B m/e 03/1961 Withdrawn
Steam K3 2-6-0 61853 4w/e 22/09/1956 38E Woodford Halse w/e 16/05/1959 56B w/e 17/06/1961 56F Low Moor
Steam K3 2-6-0 61856 4w/e 19/02/1955 38B Annesley w/e 16/05/1959 56B 17/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam K3 2-6-0 61975 4w/e 15/12/1956 38B Annesley w/e 16/05/1959 56B w/e 17/06/1961 56F Low Moor
Steam K3 2-6-0 61980 01/01/1948 ANN Annesley w/e 16/05/1959 56B 17/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64796 12/01/1958 56F Low Moor 14/06/1959 56B 13/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam K1 2-6-0 62005 06/07/1952 51A Darlington 14/06/1959 56B 30/08/1959 50A York (North)
Steam K1 2-6-0 62009 23/06/1949 DAR Darlington (New) 14/06/1959 56B 30/08/1959 50A York (North)
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68934 4w/e 08/03/1958 51A Darlington w/e 08/08/1959 56B m/e 09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48075 w/e 29/08/1959 56A Wakefield w/e 12/09/1959 56B w/e 23/01/1960 55B Stourton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48138 w/e 29/08/1959 56A Wakefield w/e 12/09/1959 56B w/e 18/06/1960 56A Wakefield
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68941 w/e 20/06/1959 50C Selby w/e 19/09/1959 56B 13/12/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68892 w/e 19/09/1959 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) w/e 03/10/1959 56B w/e 18/06/1960 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43099 w/e 20/06/1959 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) w/e 10/10/1959 56B w/e 07/11/1959 51A Darlington
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43100 w/e 20/06/1959 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) w/e 10/10/1959 56B w/e 07/11/1959 51C West Hartlepool
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2586       05/11/1959 (New) 56B w/e 22/02/1964 51C West Hartlepool
Steam B1 4-6-0 61023 08/06/1958 56F Low Moor 08/11/1959 56B 17/06/1962 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam B1 4-6-0 61039 08/06/1958 56F Low Moor 08/11/1959 56B 11/09/1960 50A York (North)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48202 5w/e 14/06/1958 56D Mirfield w/e 13/02/1960 56B w/e 18/06/1960 56A Wakefield
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2595 30/01/1960 50A York (North) (New) w/e 18/06/1960 56B 4w/e 06/11/1965 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2596 15/02/1960 55A Holbeck (MR) (New) w/e 18/06/1960 56B 4w/e 06/11/1965 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90361 4w/e 30/06/1949 91M To London Midland Region w/e 18/06/1960 56B 4w/e 11/09/1965 56A Wakefield
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90644       w/e 18/06/1960 56B 4w/e 06/11/1965 55E Normanton
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2597 28/06/1960 55A Holbeck (MR) (New) w/e 09/07/1960 56B 4w/e 06/11/1965 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2603       16/09/1960 (New) 56B 4w/e 06/11/1965 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2605       24/09/1960 (New) 56B 4w/e 06/11/1965 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2604       30/09/1960 (New) 56B 4w/e 06/11/1965 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam J6 0-6-0 64170 4w/e 08/02/1958 56F Low Moor w/e 01/10/1960 56B 03/07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J6 0-6-0 64226 4w/e 08/02/1958 56F Low Moor w/e 01/10/1960 56B w/e 23/09/1961 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2606       08/10/1960 (New) 56B 4w/e 06/11/1965 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2607       18/10/1960 (New) 56B 4w/e 06/11/1965 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam J39 0-6-0 64911 14/09/1958 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) 06/11/1960 56B 12/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90692       w/e 12/11/1960 56B w/e 17/06/1961 56E Sowerby Bridge
Steam J6 0-6-0 64173 01/01/1948 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) w/e 12/11/1960 56B 11/01/1961 Withdrawn
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2608       09/12/1960 (New) 56B 4w/e 06/11/1965 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 68008 01/01/1948 DAR Darlington w/e 07/01/1961 56B w/e 12/10/1963 51A Darlington
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 68011 4w/e 11/10/1958 53A Hull Dairycoates w/e 07/01/1961 56B w/e 12/10/1963 51A Darlington
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 68015 01/01/1948 BLA Blaydon w/e 07/01/1961 56B m/e 08/1963 Withdrawn
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 68045 01/01/1948 YK York (North) w/e 07/01/1961 56B m/e 09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 68049 w/e 20/06/1959 51L Thornaby w/e 11/03/1961 56B m/e 09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 68062 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby w/e 11/03/1961 56B w/e 04/01/1964 51C West Hartlepool
Steam J39 0-6-0 64705 12/06/1960 56A Wakefield 26/03/1961 56B 29/03/1962 Withdrawn
Steam A3 4-6-2 60092 08/05/1960 55A Holbeck (MR) 11/06/1961 56B 16/06/1963 52A Gateshead
Steam A3 4-6-2 60080 08/05/1960 55A Holbeck (MR) 11/06/1961 56B 16/06/1963 55H Neville Hill
Steam O4 2-8-0 63857 22/02/1959 56A Wakefield 11/06/1961 56B 08/08/1962 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63864 22/02/1959 56A Wakefield 11/06/1961 56B 08/08/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68951 5w/e 14/06/1958 51C West Hartlepool w/e 17/06/1961 56B m/e 07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68964 w/e 31/01/1959 36A Doncaster w/e 29/07/1961 56B w/e 19/08/1961 56B Ardsley
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68963 w/e 09/05/1959 36A Doncaster w/e 05/08/1961 56B w/e 19/08/1961 56B Ardsley
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68965 w/e 31/01/1959 36A Doncaster w/e 05/08/1961 56B w/e 19/08/1961 56B Ardsley
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68963 w/e 05/08/1961 56B Ardsley w/e 19/08/1961 56B w/e 13/01/1962 56F Low Moor
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68964 w/e 29/07/1961 56B Ardsley w/e 19/08/1961 56B w/e 13/01/1962 56F Low Moor
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68965 w/e 05/08/1961 56B Ardsley w/e 19/08/1961 56B w/e 17/03/1962 56D Mirfield
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90230 w/e 07/11/1959 56A Wakefield w/e 26/08/1961 56B 4w/e 06/11/1965 51C West Hartlepool
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90642 w/e 24/12/1960 56A Wakefield w/e 26/08/1961 56B 4w/e 11/09/1965 56A Wakefield
Steam A3 4-6-2 60036 11/06/1961 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) 10/09/1961 56B 16/06/1963 52A Gateshead
Steam A3 4-6-2 60069 11/06/1961 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) 10/09/1961 56B 01/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam A3 4-6-2 60070 11/06/1961 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) 10/09/1961 56B 16/06/1963 55H Neville Hill
Steam A3 4-6-2 60077 11/06/1961 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) 10/09/1961 56B 16/06/1963 64A St Margarets
Steam K3 2-6-0 61853 w/e 17/06/1961 56F Low Moor w/e 16/09/1961 56B 18/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam K3 2-6-0 61917 4w/e 19/01/1952 52D Tweedmouth w/e 16/09/1961 56B 26/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam K3 2-6-0 61934 5w/e 14/06/1958 52D Tweedmouth w/e 16/09/1961 56B 26/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam K3 2-6-0 61984 w/e 17/09/1960 52D Tweedmouth w/e 16/09/1961 56B 02/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J6 0-6-0 64203 w/e 01/10/1960 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) w/e 23/09/1961 56B 19/06/1962 Withdrawn
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67766 w/e 20/06/1959 51L Thornaby w/e 04/11/1961 56B 10/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67742       w/e 25/11/1961 56B 21/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67755 4w/e 21/09/1957 51A Darlington w/e 25/11/1961 56B 14/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67763 4w/e 21/09/1957 51A Darlington w/e 25/11/1961 56B 30/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67765 w/e 04/07/1959 51A Darlington w/e 25/11/1961 56B 29/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67777       w/e 25/11/1961 56B 21/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90405 w/e 18/06/1960 51A Darlington w/e 09/12/1961 56B 4w/e 11/09/1965 56A Wakefield
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2617 28/03/1961 51A Darlington (New) w/e 20/01/1962 56B 4w/e 06/11/1965 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam A1 4-6-2 60123 15/09/1957 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) 01/04/1962 56B 01/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam A1 4-6-2 60131 15/02/1953 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 01/04/1962 56B 28/07/1963 55H Neville Hill
Steam A1 4-6-2 60134 05/11/1948 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) (New) 01/04/1962 56B 28/07/1963 55H Neville Hill
Steam A1 4-6-2 60135 20/11/1960 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) 01/04/1962 56B 12/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68937 w/e 17/03/1962 56D Mirfield w/e 05/05/1962 56B m/e 09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68965 w/e 17/03/1962 56D Mirfield w/e 05/05/1962 56B m/e 09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64719 11/09/1960 51F West Auckland 17/06/1962 56B 23/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64756 26/06/1955 51F West Auckland 17/06/1962 56B 03/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64818 24/12/1961 51F West Auckland 17/06/1962 56B 03/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64969 16/10/1960 51F West Auckland 17/06/1962 56B 30/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90240 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby w/e 23/06/1962 56B 4w/e 06/11/1965 50B Hull Dairycoates
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90409 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby w/e 23/06/1962 56B 4w/e 17/07/1965 56A Wakefield
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90465 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby w/e 23/06/1962 56B 4w/e 06/11/1965 55E Normanton
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90126 w/e 17/06/1961 56D Mirfield w/e 07/07/1962 56B 4w/e 06/11/1965 56A Wakefield
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90236 w/e 16/09/1961 56D Mirfield w/e 07/07/1962 56B 4w/e 06/11/1965 56A Wakefield
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90625 4w/e 21/09/1957 56A Wakefield w/e 07/07/1962 56B 4w/e 06/11/1965 56A Wakefield
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90100 4w/e 21/09/1957 56A Wakefield w/e 07/07/1962 56B m/e 01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90481 w/e 10/03/1962 56D Mirfield w/e 07/07/1962 56B 4w/e 06/11/1965 55E Normanton
Steam A1 4-6-2 60118 12/11/1948 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) (New) 04/11/1962 56B 28/07/1963 55H Neville Hill
Steam J39 0-6-0 64859 15/04/1962 56D Mirfield 18/11/1962 56B 03/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64886 12/01/1958 56F Low Moor 18/11/1962 56B 27/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64927 15/04/1962 56D Mirfield 18/11/1962 56B 03/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61017 22/02/1959 56A Wakefield 25/11/1962 56B 31/10/1965 50A York (North)
Steam B1 4-6-0 61024 12/06/1960 56A Wakefield 25/11/1962 56B 31/03/1963 56A Wakefield
Steam B1 4-6-0 61030 11/06/1961 55H Neville Hill 25/11/1962 56B 31/10/1965 56A Wakefield
Steam B1 4-6-0 61034 14/06/1959 51L Thornaby 25/11/1962 56B 05/01/1964 56A Wakefield
Steam B1 4-6-0 61061 05/10/1958 51C West Hartlepool 25/11/1962 56B 13/09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61068 11/09/1960 50A York (North) 25/11/1962 56B 17/06/1963 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61131 01/03/1959 56A Wakefield 25/11/1962 56B 31/03/1963 56A Wakefield
Steam B1 4-6-0 61173 14/06/1959 51L Thornaby 25/11/1962 56B 05/01/1964 56A Wakefield
Steam B1 4-6-0 61215 14/06/1959 53A Hull Dairycoates 25/11/1962 56B 08/03/1965 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61218 05/02/1961 51L Thornaby 25/11/1962 56B 03/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61240 11/09/1960 50A York (North) 25/11/1962 56B 31/10/1965 56A Wakefield
Steam B1 4-6-0 61259 05/02/1961 51L Thornaby 25/11/1962 56B 26/08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61268 16/06/1957 56A Wakefield 25/11/1962 56B 28/12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61291 14/06/1959 50A York (North) 25/11/1962 56B 20/05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61388 30/08/1959 50A York (North) 25/11/1962 56B 31/10/1965 56F Low Moor
Steam V2 2-6-2 60861 10/09/1961 56A Wakefield 25/11/1962 56B 12/08/1963 Withdrawn
Steam V2 2-6-2 60884 10/09/1961 56A Wakefield 25/11/1962 56B 26/01/1964 51L Thornaby
Steam V2 2-6-2 60843 14/09/1958 52D Tweedmouth 02/12/1962 56B 04/10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam V2 2-6-2 60923 28/03/1943 GHD Gateshead 02/12/1962 56B 04/10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam V2 2-6-2 60952 08/06/1958 52A Gateshead 02/12/1962 56B 26/01/1964 51L Thornaby
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80071 w/e 15/09/1962 31B March w/e 08/12/1962 56B 4w/e 02/11/1963 66E Carstairs
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80073 w/e 15/09/1962 31B March w/e 08/12/1962 56B 4w/e 02/11/1963 66E Carstairs
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80074 w/e 15/09/1962 31B March w/e 08/12/1962 56B 4w/e 02/11/1963 66E Carstairs
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80075 w/e 15/09/1962 31B March w/e 08/12/1962 56B 4w/e 30/11/1963 66E Carstairs
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80076 w/e 15/09/1962 31B March w/e 08/12/1962 56B 4w/e 02/11/1963 67E Dumfries
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80077 w/e 15/09/1962 31B March w/e 08/12/1962 56B 4w/e 02/11/1963 67D Ardrossan
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43096 w/e 28/07/1962 56D Mirfield w/e 15/12/1962 56B 4w/e 06/11/1965 55B Stourton
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43072 w/e 25/08/1962 56F Low Moor w/e 30/03/1963 56B 11/11/1964 Withdrawn
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8501 w/e 07/09/1963 52H Tyne Dock w/e 14/09/1963 56B w/e 05/10/1963 66A Polmadie
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo D8536 w/e 07/09/1963 52H Tyne Dock w/e 14/09/1963 56B w/e 05/10/1963 66A Polmadie
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42108       w/e 14/09/1963 56B 4w/e 30/01/1965 56A Wakefield
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42055 3w/e 29/09/1962 66E Carstairs w/e 12/10/1963 56B 4w/e 30/01/1965 56F Low Moor
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42142 8w/e 09/09/1951 64D Carstairs w/e 12/10/1963 56B w/e 09/11/1963 56F Low Moor
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42145 8w/e 09/09/1951 64D Carstairs w/e 12/10/1963 56B w/e 12/09/1964 55A Holbeck (MR)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42165 4w/e 24/11/1962 66E Carstairs w/e 12/10/1963 56B 4w/e 30/01/1965 56A Wakefield
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42204 4w/e 20/01/1951 64D Carstairs w/e 12/10/1963 56B 4w/e 30/01/1965 56A Wakefield
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42177 4w/e 06/09/1952 68A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 19/10/1963 56B 4w/e 30/01/1965 56F Low Moor
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43134 4w/e 19/01/1963 67B Hurlford w/e 02/11/1963 56B m/e 02/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43136 4w/e 21/10/1961 65D Dawsholm w/e 02/11/1963 56B m/e 07/1964 Withdrawn
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2587 10/11/1959 56A Wakefield (New) w/e 11/01/1964 56B w/e 25/01/1964 51C West Hartlepool
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2588 24/11/1959 56A Wakefield (New) w/e 11/01/1964 56B w/e 22/02/1964 51C West Hartlepool
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2589 01/12/1959 56A Wakefield (New) w/e 11/01/1964 56B w/e 25/01/1964 51C West Hartlepool
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2591 08/12/1959 56A Wakefield (New) w/e 11/01/1964 56B w/e 01/02/1964 51C West Hartlepool
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2592 18/12/1959 56A Wakefield (New) w/e 11/01/1964 56B w/e 01/02/1964 51C West Hartlepool
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2593 30/12/1959 56A Wakefield (New) w/e 11/01/1964 56B 4w/e 06/11/1965 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90426 w/e 21/04/1962 56A Wakefield w/e 25/01/1964 56B m/e 03/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90135 w/e 17/06/1961 56D Mirfield w/e 07/03/1964 56B 4w/e 17/07/1965 56A Wakefield
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90731 4w/e 07/10/1950 25D Mirfield w/e 07/03/1964 56B 4w/e 19/06/1965 56F Low Moor
Steam B1 4-6-0 61238 10/09/1961 52H Tyne Dock 07/06/1964 56B 31/10/1965 50A York (North)
Steam B1 4-6-0 61304 27/03/1960 51A Darlington 07/06/1964 56B 31/10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61321 14/09/1958 51A Darlington 07/06/1964 56B 10/08/1964 Withdrawn
Steam A1 4-6-2 60117 15/02/1953 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 06/09/1964 56B 06/12/1964 52A Gateshead
Steam A1 4-6-2 60130 15/09/1957 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) 06/09/1964 56B 04/10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam A1 4-6-2 60148 28/08/1955 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 06/09/1964 56B 06/12/1964 52A Gateshead
Steam B1 4-6-0 61031 07/06/1964 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) 06/09/1964 56B 09/11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61382 16/06/1963 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) 06/09/1964 56B 07/12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61385 25/11/1962 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) 06/09/1964 56B 31/10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43101 w/e 11/01/1964 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) w/e 12/09/1964 56B 4w/e 06/11/1965 52F Blyth (North)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42073 w/e 01/10/1960 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) w/e 12/09/1964 56B 4w/e 30/01/1965 56F Low Moor
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43141 w/e 13/06/1964 56F Low Moor w/e 28/11/1964 56B 4w/e 06/11/1965 55E Normanton
Steam A1 4-6-2 60117 06/12/1964 52A Gateshead 03/01/1965 56B 21/06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam A1 4-6-2 60148 06/12/1964 52A Gateshead 03/01/1965 56B 21/06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43070 w/e 11/01/1964 56F Low Moor 4w/e 30/01/1965 56B 4w/e 06/11/1965 56A Wakefield
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43132 w/e 11/01/1964 56F Low Moor 4w/e 30/01/1965 56B 4w/e 06/11/1965 52F Blyth (North)
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43137 w/e 12/09/1964 56A Wakefield 4w/e 30/01/1965 56B 4w/e 06/11/1965 56A Wakefield