Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 711 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2435 Week
» 12570 Month
» 328801 Year
» 839903 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Hamilton (West)


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Hamilton (West) Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2735       01/01/1948 27C 4w/e 21/10/1961 67B Hurlford
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2740       01/01/1948 27C 4w/e 19/01/1957 66D Greenock Ladyburn
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2741       01/01/1948 27C 4w/e 14/02/1959 66D Greenock Ladyburn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 150       01/01/1948 27C 4w/e 07/08/1954 60B Aviemore
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 151       01/01/1948 27C 4w/e 07/08/1954 60B Aviemore
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 152       01/01/1948 27C 4w/e 04/06/1960 68B Dumfries
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 153       01/01/1948 27C 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 154       01/01/1948 27C 08/01/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 158       01/01/1948 27C 08/01/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 17237       01/01/1948 27C 4w/e 04/08/1956 66B Motherwell
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 17242       01/01/1948 27C w/e 16/07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 17244       01/01/1948 27C 4w/e 26/09/1959 66A Polmadie
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 17250       01/01/1948 27C 4w/e 26/09/1959 66A Polmadie
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 17260       01/01/1948 27C 07/10/1955 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 17280       01/01/1948 27C m/e 09/1952 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 17307       01/01/1948 27C m/e 08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 57382       01/01/1948 27C m/e 07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 17384       01/01/1948 27C 4w/e 26/09/1959 66B Motherwell
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 57393       01/01/1948 27C m/e 04/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 17395       01/01/1948 27C 4w/e 06/09/1952 68B Dumfries
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 17398       01/01/1948 27C 4w/e 26/09/1959 66B Motherwell
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 57401       01/01/1948 27C m/e 02/1950 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 17407       01/01/1948 27C m/e 05/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 57408       01/01/1948 27C 07/02/1948 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 17410       01/01/1948 27C m/e 02/1953 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 57420       01/01/1948 27C m/e 10/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 17430       01/01/1948 27C m/e 09/1957 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 17431       01/01/1948 27C 4w/e 26/09/1959 66B Motherwell
Steam 2P 0-4-4T 15146       01/01/1948 27C 4w/e 14/07/1951 66A Polmadie
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56237       01/01/1948 27C m/e 02/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56242       01/01/1948 27C m/e 07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56255       01/01/1948 27C m/e 12/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56256       01/01/1948 27C m/e 06/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56284       01/01/1948 27C m/e 05/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56286       01/01/1948 27C m/e 05/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56287       01/01/1948 27C 4w/e 23/12/1950 LOAN  
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56296       01/01/1948 27C m/e 08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 16303       01/01/1948 27C m/e 08/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56309       01/01/1948 27C 4w/e 12/03/1960 66B Motherwell
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 16319       01/01/1948 27C m/e 05/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56320       01/01/1948 27C m/e 01/1957 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56321       01/01/1948 27C 4w/e 17/02/1951 LOAN  
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56360       01/01/1948 27C m/e 08/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 16362       01/01/1948 27C m/e 08/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56371       01/01/1948 27C m/e 01/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 57609       01/01/1948 27C 4w/e 26/09/1959 66A Polmadie
Steam 3F 0-6-0 57630       01/01/1948 27C 4w/e 21/10/1950 66C Hamilton (West)
Steam 300 0-6-0 57663       01/01/1948 27C 20/11/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 300 0-6-0 57665       01/01/1948 27C 4w/e 26/09/1959 66B Motherwell
Steam 4P 4-6-0 54638       01/01/1948 27C m/e 05/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 4-6-0 54639       01/01/1948 27C m/e 12/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 4-6-0 54648       01/01/1948 27C m/e 11/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 6656       01/01/1948 27C 3w/e 11/12/1948 12G Dumfries
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2217       01/01/1948 27C w/e 06/02/1960 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42128 m/e 11/1949 66C Hamilton (West) 2w/e 03/12/1949 (New) 66C 4w/e 24/11/1962 66A Polmadie
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42129 m/e 11/1949 66C Hamilton (West) 2w/e 03/12/1949 (New) 66C 3w/e 14/01/1950 91X To Scottish Region
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42130 m/e 12/1949 66C Hamilton (West) 2w/e 03/12/1949 (New) 66C 4w/e 07/08/1954 68D Beattock
Steam 3F 0-6-0 57630 01/01/1948 27C Hamilton (West) 4w/e 21/10/1950 66C 4w/e 22/12/1962 66A Polmadie
Steam 2P 0-4-4T 55121 4w/e 23/09/1950 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 20/01/1951 66C 4w/e 17/02/1951 66A Polmadie
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 15182 01/01/1948 30A Corkerhill 4w/e 20/01/1951 66C m/e 05/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56287 4w/e 23/12/1950 LOAN   4w/e 20/01/1951 66C m/e 04/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56321 4w/e 17/02/1951 LOAN   5w/e 24/03/1951 66C m/e 09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 4-6-0 54636 01/01/1948 28A Motherwell 4w/e 29/12/1951 66C m/e 02/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 4-6-0 54634 01/01/1948 28A Motherwell 4w/e 17/05/1952 66C m/e 11/1952 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90468 4w/e 14/07/1951 66B Motherwell 4w/e 17/05/1952 66C 4w/e 27/09/1958 66B Motherwell
Steam 60 4-6-0 54650 01/01/1948 28A Motherwell 4w/e 29/11/1952 66C m/e 09/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40566 4w/e 29/11/1952 66A Polmadie 4w/e 27/12/1952 66C 4w/e 13/06/1953 67A Corkerhill
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90386 4w/e 17/06/1950 66B Motherwell 4w/e 18/04/1953 66C 4w/e 27/09/1958 66B Motherwell
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 57335 01/01/1948 27A Polmadie 4w/e 11/07/1953 66C m/e 10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam WD/10 2-10-0 90774       4w/e 20/02/1954 66C 4w/e 15/05/1954 68A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 77006       23/03/1954 (New) 66C w/e 03/11/1962 66E Carstairs
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 77007       31/03/1954 (New) 66C 3w/e 26/09/1959 66A Polmadie
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 77005 17/03/1954 65D Dawsholm (New) 4w/e 17/04/1954 66C 3w/e 26/09/1959 66A Polmadie
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42167       4w/e 22/01/1955 66C 4w/e 17/12/1960 66A Polmadie
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45433 8w/e 09/09/1951 66B Motherwell 4w/e 29/10/1955 66C 8w/e 31/08/1957 66B Motherwell
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13206       30/12/1955 (New) 66C 4w/e 06/06/1959 66B Motherwell
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47331 01/01/1948 27A Polmadie 4w/e 17/03/1956 66C m/e 04/1959 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90071 5w/e 24/03/1951 66B Motherwell 4w/e 04/08/1956 66C 4w/e 27/09/1958 66B Motherwell
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56294 01/01/1948 27A Polmadie 8w/e 27/10/1956 66C m/e 04/1957 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44196 01/01/1948 29A Perth South 4w/e 19/01/1957 66C 4w/e 26/09/1959 66B Motherwell
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42740 4w/e 19/01/1957 66D Greenock Ladyburn 8w/e 31/08/1957 66C 4w/e 23/11/1957 66D Greenock Ladyburn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3529       27/06/1958 (New) 66C 4w/e 26/09/1959 66A Polmadie
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 57370 01/01/1948 27A Polmadie 4w/e 27/09/1958 66C 4w/e 26/09/1959 66B Motherwell
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 57446 01/01/1948 27A Polmadie 4w/e 27/09/1958 66C 4w/e 26/09/1959 66B Motherwell
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 57447 01/01/1948 27A Polmadie 4w/e 27/09/1958 66C w/e 08/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam WD/10 2-10-0 90764       4w/e 27/09/1958 66C 4w/e 26/09/1959 66B Motherwell
Steam WD/10 2-10-0 90771       4w/e 27/09/1958 66C 4w/e 26/09/1959 66B Motherwell
Steam WD/10 2-10-0 90772       4w/e 27/09/1958 66C 4w/e 24/11/1962 66B Motherwell
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42738 01/01/1948 29D Forfar 4w/e 22/11/1958 66C 4w/e 26/09/1959 66A Polmadie
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 57321 01/01/1948 27A Polmadie 4w/e 22/11/1958 66C 20/11/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80109 4w/e 11/05/1957 66A Polmadie 4w/e 11/04/1959 66C 4w/e 26/09/1959 66A Polmadie
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42746 01/01/1948 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 11/04/1959 66C 4w/e 21/10/1961 67B Hurlford
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13283 16/11/1956 66B Motherwell (New) 4w/e 06/06/1959 66C 4w/e 26/09/1959 66A Polmadie
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13285 23/11/1956 66B Motherwell (New) 4w/e 06/06/1959 66C 4w/e 26/09/1959 66A Polmadie
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3382 13/09/1957 66B Motherwell (New) 4w/e 06/06/1959 66C 4w/e 26/09/1959 66B Motherwell
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 57336 01/01/1948 31E Dawsholm 4w/e 21/11/1959 66C 4w/e 16/06/1962 67B Hurlford
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42129 4w/e 26/09/1959 66A Polmadie 4w/e 19/12/1959 66C 4w/e 01/07/1961 66A Polmadie
Steam N15 0-6-2T 69196 01/01/1948 KPS Kipps 4w/e 19/12/1959 66C w/e 01/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam N15 0-6-2T 69207 01/01/1948 KPS Kipps 4w/e 19/12/1959 66C 4w/e 19/12/1959 66A Polmadie
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2430       25/01/1960 (New) 66C 4w/e 04/06/1960 66B Motherwell
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2431       09/02/1960 (New) 66C 4w/e 04/06/1960 66B Motherwell
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2432       22/02/1960 (New) 66C 4w/e 09/04/1960 66A Polmadie
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2433       07/03/1960 (New) 66C 4w/e 04/06/1960 66A Polmadie
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56349 m/e 03/1960 Withdrawn 4w/e 12/03/1960 (R) 66C      
Steam 3F 0-6-0 57609 4w/e 26/09/1959 66A Polmadie 4w/e 12/03/1960 66C m/e 07/1960 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45459 4w/e 22/11/1958 66A Polmadie 4w/e 09/04/1960 66C 4w/e 30/07/1960 66A Polmadie
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73099 4w/e 22/11/1958 66A Polmadie 4w/e 30/07/1960 66C 4w/e 21/10/1961 66A Polmadie
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 55207 01/01/1948 27A Polmadie 4w/e 24/09/1960 66C 4w/e 11/03/1961 63C Oban
Steam J72 0-6-0T 68709 4w/e 08/04/1961 66A Polmadie 4w/e 06/05/1961 66C w/e 26/02/1962 Withdrawn
Steam N15 0-6-2T 69178 4w/e 01/07/1961 66A Polmadie 4w/e 26/08/1961 66C 4w/e 22/12/1962 66B Motherwell
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45090 4w/e 12/03/1960 63A Perth South 4w/e 21/10/1961 66C 4w/e 24/11/1962 66A Polmadie
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45165 01/01/1948 29A Perth South 4w/e 21/10/1961 66C 4w/e 22/12/1962 66B Motherwell
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45179 4w/e 27/08/1960 63A Perth South 4w/e 21/10/1961 66C 4w/e 24/11/1962 66B Motherwell
Steam J72 0-6-0T 68733 4w/e 08/04/1961 66A Polmadie 4w/e 21/10/1961 66C w/e 16/07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J72 0-6-0T 68750 4w/e 03/06/1961 66B Motherwell 4w/e 21/10/1961 66C 4w/e 14/07/1962 68B Dumfries
Steam 2F 0-6-0T 47163 4w/e 24/09/1960 66D Greenock Ladyburn 4w/e 24/02/1962 66C 4w/e 16/06/1962 66D Greenock Ladyburn
Steam 2F 0-6-0T 47168 01/01/1948 27B Greenock Ladyburn 4w/e 24/02/1962 66C 4w/e 16/06/1962 66D Greenock Ladyburn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40186 4w/e 12/04/1958 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 24/03/1962 66C 4w/e 24/11/1962 66B Motherwell
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40187 01/01/1948 31E Dawsholm 4w/e 24/03/1962 66C 4w/e 22/12/1962 66B Motherwell
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3197 30/12/1955 66A Polmadie (New) 4w/e 16/06/1962 66C 5w/e 30/05/1964 66A Polmadie
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3198 08/12/1955 66A Polmadie (New) 4w/e 16/06/1962 66C 5w/e 30/05/1964 66A Polmadie
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44786 01/01/1948 12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 08/09/1962 66C 4w/e 24/11/1962 66B Motherwell
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2441 17/08/1960 67A Corkerhill (New) 4w/e 16/02/1963 66C 01/03/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2430 4w/e 04/06/1960 66B Motherwell 4w/e 16/03/1963 66C 4w/e 27/04/1968 62A Thornton Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3202 16/12/1955 66B Motherwell (New) 4w/e 16/03/1963 66C w/e 05/11/1966 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3203 21/12/1955 66B Motherwell (New) 4w/e 16/03/1963 66C w/e 09/02/1974 EJ Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3204 21/12/1955 66B Motherwell (New) 4w/e 16/03/1963 66C w/e 15/04/1972 36A Doncaster
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3205 23/12/1955 66B Motherwell (New) 4w/e 16/03/1963 66C w/e 09/11/1968 40A Lincoln
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3206 4w/e 06/06/1959 66B Motherwell 4w/e 16/03/1963 66C w/e 15/04/1972 36A Doncaster
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3282 16/11/1956 66B Motherwell (New) 4w/e 16/03/1963 66C w/e 16/11/1975 TE Thornaby
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3283 4w/e 11/03/1961 66B Motherwell 4w/e 16/03/1963 66C w/e 05/11/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3284 23/11/1956 66B Motherwell (New) 4w/e 16/03/1963 66C w/e 09/06/1973 TI Tinsley
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3285 4w/e 11/03/1961 66B Motherwell 4w/e 16/03/1963 66C w/e 30/12/1972 51L Thornaby
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3286 30/11/1956 66B Motherwell (New) 4w/e 16/03/1963 66C w/e 10/08/1968 12C Barrow in Furness
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13287 4w/e 19/01/1963 66B Motherwell 4w/e 16/03/1963 66C w/e 16/11/1975 GD Gateshead
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3348 03/05/1957 66B Motherwell (New) 4w/e 16/03/1963 66C 21/06/1977 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3349 10/05/1957 66B Motherwell (New) 4w/e 16/03/1963 66C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13350 10/05/1957 66B Motherwell (New) 4w/e 16/03/1963 66C 27/10/1980 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3351 4w/e 17/05/1957 66B Motherwell (New) 4w/e 16/03/1963 66C 4w/e 26/08/1967 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3382 4w/e 26/09/1959 66B Motherwell 4w/e 16/03/1963 66C 09/05/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3384 20/09/1957 66B Motherwell (New) 4w/e 16/03/1963 66C 22/02/1981 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3385 27/09/1957 66B Motherwell (New) 4w/e 16/03/1963 66C w/e 02/11/1968 31B March
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3528 27/06/1958 66B Motherwell (New) 4w/e 16/03/1963 66C 5w/e 31/08/1968 65F Grangemouth
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3201 16/12/1955 66A Polmadie (New) 5w/e 07/09/1963 66C 5w/e 30/05/1964 67A Corkerhill
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3280 4w/e 03/08/1963 66E Carstairs 5w/e 07/09/1963 66C w/e 05/10/1968 36C Frodingham
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3529 4w/e 26/09/1959 66A Polmadie 5w/e 07/09/1963 66C 5w/e 31/08/1968 65F Grangemouth
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2428 4w/e 11/03/1961 66D Greenock Ladyburn 5w/e 30/05/1964 66C 5w/e 01/06/1968 66A Polmadie
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2443 28/09/1960 67A Corkerhill (New) 5w/e 30/05/1964 66C 4w/e 27/02/1965 67B Hurlford
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3197 5w/e 30/05/1964 66A Polmadie 5w/e 30/05/1964 66C 4w/e 26/08/1967 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2410 19/06/1958 60A Inverness (New) 4w/e 27/06/1964 66C 4w/e 27/01/1968 65A Eastfield
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3533 9w/e 26/11/1966 65A Eastfield 9w/e 26/11/1966 66C 3w/e 29/06/1968 66A Polmadie
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3533 9w/e 26/11/1966 65A Eastfield 9w/e 26/11/1966 66C 3w/e 29/06/1968 66C Hamilton (West)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3906 5w/e 31/12/1966 66E Carstairs 5w/e 29/04/1967 66C 3w/e 29/06/1968 66A Polmadie
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3903 9w/e 26/11/1966 65A Eastfield 4w/e 26/08/1967 66C 3w/e 29/06/1968 66A Polmadie
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3910 01/11/1960 66A Polmadie (New) 4w/e 26/08/1967 66C 4w/e 27/04/1968 67C Ayr
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3386 4w/e 25/12/1965 65A Eastfield 4w/e 27/01/1968 66C 4w/e 06/03/1976 To Store
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3554 5w/e 30/12/1967 65A Eastfield 4w/e 27/01/1968 66C 3w/e 29/06/1968 66A Polmadie
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3533 9w/e 26/11/1966 66C Hamilton (West) 3w/e 29/06/1968 66C 3w/e 27/07/1968 66A Polmadie
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3211 4w/e 11/05/1957 65A Eastfield 4w/e 26/10/1968 66C 4w/e 25/01/1969 62A Thornton Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3212 4w/e 24/11/1962 65A Eastfield 4w/e 26/10/1968 66C 4w/e 29/04/1972 67C Ayr
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3552 5w/e 30/09/1967 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 31/01/1970 66C 01/12/1984 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3388 5w/e 30/11/1968 62B Dundee West 4w/e 28/10/1972 66C 6w/e 04/09/1976 To Store
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3891 5w/e 01/08/1970 62C Dunfermline Townhill 4w/e 25/11/1972 66C      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3730 4w/e 27/05/1972 64B Haymarket 4w/e 24/02/1973 66C 25/04/1982 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3389 5w/e 30/11/1968 62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 29/12/1973 HN 25/04/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 06 0-4-0 06004 4w/e 28/12/1974 DT Dunfermline Townhill 4w/e 01/03/1975 HN 5w/e 26/07/1975 DE Dundee West
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08732 9w/e 26/11/1966 65A Eastfield 3w/e 15/11/1975 HN      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08735 4w/e 28/12/1968 67C Ayr 4w/e 29/05/1976 HN