Depot: Ashford Chart Leacon
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Ashford Chart Leacon | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Electric | Class 71 | Bo-Bo | E5024 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | m/e | 02/1968 | 70D | Eastleigh | ||||
Electric | Class 71 | Bo-Bo | E5001 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | w/e | 04/10/1976 | To Store | |||||
Electric | Class 71 | Bo-Bo | E5002 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | w/e | 04/10/1976 | To Store | |||||
Electric | Class 71 | Bo-Bo | E5003 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | m/e | 03/1968 | 70D | Eastleigh | ||||
Electric | Class 71 | Bo-Bo | E5004 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | w/e | 03/10/1976 | To Store | |||||
Electric | Class 71 | Bo-Bo | E5005 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | m/e | 04/1968 | 70D | Eastleigh | ||||
Electric | Class 71 | Bo-Bo | E5006 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | on | 10/12/1967 | 70D | Eastleigh | ||||
Electric | Class 71 | Bo-Bo | E5007 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | m/e | 08/1976 | To Store | |||||
Electric | Class 71 | Bo-Bo | E5008 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | m/e | 31/10/1976 | To Store | |||||
Electric | Class 71 | Bo-Bo | E5009 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | w/e | 03/10/1976 | To Store | |||||
Electric | Class 71 | Bo-Bo | E5010 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | w/e | 03/10/1976 | To Store | |||||
Electric | Class 71 | Bo-Bo | E5011 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | w/e | 03/10/1976 | To Store | |||||
Electric | Class 71 | Bo-Bo | E5012 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | m/e | 09/1976 | To Store | |||||
Electric | Class 71 | Bo-Bo | E5013 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | w/e | 03/10/1976 | To Store | |||||
Electric | Class 71 | Bo-Bo | E5014 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | w/e | 03/10/1976 | To Store | |||||
Electric | Class 71 | Bo-Bo | E5015 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | m/e | 02/1968 | 70D | Eastleigh | ||||
Electric | Class 71 | Bo-Bo | E5016 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | m/e | 11/1967 | 70D | Eastleigh | ||||
Electric | Class 71 | Bo-Bo | E5017 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | m/e | 04/1968 | 70D | Eastleigh | ||||
Electric | Class 71 | Bo-Bo | E5018 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | w/e | 03/10/1976 | To Store | |||||
Electric | Class 71 | Bo-Bo | E5019 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | on | 10/03/1968 | 70D | Eastleigh | ||||
Electric | Class 71 | Bo-Bo | E5020 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | w/e | 04/10/1976 | To Store | |||||
Electric | Class 71 | Bo-Bo | E5021 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | m/e | 05/1968 | 70D | Eastleigh | ||||
Electric | Class 71 | Bo-Bo | E5022 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | m/e | 08/1976 | To Store | |||||
Electric | Class 71 | Bo-Bo | E5023 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | 73f | m/e | 03/1968 | 70D | Eastleigh | ||||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D4101 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70B | Feltham | 4w/e | 29/01/1968 | 73F | on | 29/05/1988 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 15231 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70F | Bournemouth | w/e | 05/02/1968 | 73F | on | 31/10/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2341 | m/e | 03/1967 | 73C | Hither Green | 3w/e | 08/04/1968 | 73F | on | 22/12/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 15230 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70F | Bournemouth | 4w/e | 14/06/1968 | 73F | on | 31/10/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2040 | 4w/e | 19/09/1966 | 70D | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 09/07/1968 | 73F | on | 31/05/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2001 | 4w/e | 25/07/1966 | 75A | Brighton | w/e | 30/09/1968 | 73F | on | 31/05/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D4099 | m/e | 09/12/1963 | 73C | Hither Green | w/e | 30/09/1968 | 73F | ||||
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 15232 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70F | Bournemouth | w/e | 30/09/1968 | 73F | on | 30/04/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 15233 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70F | Bournemouth | w/e | 30/09/1968 | 73F | on | 07/05/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D4106 | 4w/e | 10/02/1969 | 70B | Feltham | 3w/e | 05/03/1969 | 73F | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2043 | w/e | 24/10/1967 | 70F | Bournemouth | 2w/e | 07/05/1969 | 73F | on | 30/09/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3101 | m/e | 12/10/1964 | 70D | Eastleigh | 2w/e | 07/05/1969 | 73F | on | 31/05/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3224 | w/e | 30/09/1968 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 03/06/1969 | 73F | on | 02/01/1979 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D4107 | w/e | 30/09/1968 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 03/06/1969 | 73F | ||||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D4110 | w/e | 25/11/1967 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | 4w/e | 03/06/1969 | 73F | w/e | 21/06/1969 | SR | To Southern Region |
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 15214 | 4w/e | 05/03/1962 | 73C | Hither Green | 2w/e | 25/02/1971 | 73F | on | 10/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3048 | 4w/e | 03/06/1969 | 70D | Eastleigh | 5w/e | 30/09/1971 | 73F | 6w/e | 16/11/1972 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3093 | w/e | 26/04/1969 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | 5w/e | 30/09/1971 | 73F | w/e | 16/10/1971 | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3095 | w/e | 21/06/1969 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | 5w/e | 30/09/1971 | 73F | w/e | 16/10/1971 | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3098 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | 5w/e | 30/09/1971 | 73F | on | 01/10/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3187 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | Allerton | 5w/e | 30/09/1971 | 73F | w/e | 16/11/1975 | DN | Darlington |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3998 | 7w/e | 02/01/1971 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 5w/e | 30/09/1971 | 73F | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3093 | 5w/e | 30/09/1971 | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon | w/e | 16/10/1971 | 73F | on | 31/05/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3095 | 5w/e | 30/09/1971 | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon | w/e | 16/10/1971 | 73F | on | 31/05/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D3719 | m/e | 09/12/1963 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 30/04/1972 | 73F | on | 29/05/1988 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4015 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 3w/e | 30/09/1972 | 73F | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4122 | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 3w/e | 30/09/1972 | 73F | m/e | 07/1977 | EH | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3225 | w/e | 30/09/1968 | 73C | Hither Green | 9w/e | 04/10/1972 | 73F | on | 09/04/1977 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4001 | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 6w/e | 16/11/1972 | 73F | on | 01/11/1981 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3016 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 27/04/1974 | AF | on | 30/11/1975 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08811 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 2F | Bescot | w/e | 25/09/1976 | AF | on | 29/08/1997 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08414 | w/e | 17/05/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | on | 03/10/1976 | AF | on | 28/02/2007 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 09023 | 9w/e | 22/07/1970 | 75C | Selhurst | m/e | 31/03/1979 | AF | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08928 | m/e | 09/1981 | TS | Tyseley | on | 29/05/1988 | AF | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08929 | 9w/e | 19/07/1973 | EH | Eastleigh | on | 29/05/1988 | AF | on | 09/12/1991 | Withdrawn |