Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 114 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1039 Week
» 18375 Month
» 296171 Year
» 1180552 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Hornsey


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Hornsey Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam Q1 0-8-0 3434 03/1904 NWE New England (New) 05/1926 HSY 18/01/1928 HIT Hitchin (GNR)
Steam Q1 0-8-0 3435 03/1904 NWE New England (New) 05/1926 HSY 17/05/1929 Withdrawn
Steam O3 2-8-0 3456 12/1913 NWE New England (New) 23/06/1930 HSY 26/02/1931 NWE New England
Steam O3 2-8-0 3460 02/1914 NWE New England (New) 23/06/1930 HSY 01/10/1930 NWE New England
Steam C12 4-4-2T 7376       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 20/01/1951 35A New England
Steam J6 0-6-0 4188       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 17/02/1951 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam J6 0-6-0 4234       01/01/1948 HSY 5w/e 24/03/1951 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam J6 0-6-0 4239       01/01/1948 HSY 5w/e 17/12/1955 38A Colwick
Steam J6 0-6-0 4251       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 19/04/1952 34E Neasden
Steam J6 0-6-0 4256       01/01/1948 HSY 5w/e 24/03/1956 38A Colwick
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8808       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 15/11/1952 37A Ardsley
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8811       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 15/11/1952 39B Sheffield Darnall
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8815       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 15/11/1952 36C Frodingham
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8825       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 15/11/1952 38B Annesley
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8826       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 20/09/1952 35A New England
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8827       01/01/1948 HSY m/e 01/1956 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8829       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 25/08/1956 38A Colwick
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8833       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 15/11/1952 36A Doncaster
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8834       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 15/11/1952 38B Annesley
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8851       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 15/11/1952 38B Annesley
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8853       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 15/11/1952 36A Doncaster
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8856       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 15/11/1952 36A Doncaster
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8883       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 15/11/1952 38B Annesley
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8757       01/01/1948 HSY w/e 29/11/1954 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8758       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 18/10/1952 38A Colwick
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8759       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 18/10/1952 36A Doncaster
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8760       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 20/09/1952 35A New England
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8761       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 15/11/1952 36A Doncaster
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8773       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 18/10/1952 38A Colwick
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8774       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 15/11/1952 37A Ardsley
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8776       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 15/11/1952 37A Ardsley
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8777       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 15/11/1952 38A Colwick
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8778       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 18/10/1952 36A Doncaster
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8781       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 18/10/1952 38A Colwick
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8783       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 15/11/1952 39B Sheffield Darnall
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8784       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 18/10/1952 36A Doncaster
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8785       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 18/10/1952 36A Doncaster
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8787       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 18/10/1952 38A Colwick
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8788       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 18/10/1952 38A Colwick
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8791       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 15/11/1952 38A Colwick
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8793       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 15/11/1952 36C Frodingham
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8794       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 18/10/1952 36A Doncaster
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8795       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 15/11/1952 36A Doncaster
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 8796       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 15/11/1952 36A Doncaster
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9431       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 18/04/1953 37A Ardsley
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9432       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 21/07/1951 37C Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9433       01/01/1948 HSY 5w/e 21/03/1953 37C Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9435       01/01/1948 HSY m/e 03/1955 Withdrawn
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9439       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 21/07/1951 37C Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9441       01/01/1948 HSY 5w/e 24/04/1954 38A Colwick
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9442       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 13/12/1952 37C Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9445       01/01/1948 HSY m/e 01/1955 Withdrawn
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9450       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 21/07/1951 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9451       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 20/06/1953 34A Kings Cross
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9453       01/01/1948 HSY 5w/e 24/04/1954 38A Colwick
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9456       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 16/05/1953 37A Ardsley
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9457       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 20/02/1954 38A Colwick
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9458       01/01/1948 HSY m/e 11/1955 Withdrawn
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9460       01/01/1948 HSY m/e 08/1955 Withdrawn
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9463       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 21/07/1951 37A Ardsley
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9465       01/01/1948 HSY m/e 12/1955 Withdrawn
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9470       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 20/06/1953 34A Kings Cross
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9475       01/01/1948 HSY 5w/e 21/03/1953 37C Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9477       01/01/1948 HSY 4w/e 20/09/1952 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam N2 0-6-2T 9505       01/01/1948 HSY w/e 20/06/1959 34F Grantham
Steam N2 0-6-2T 9513       01/01/1948 HSY w/e 20/06/1959 34E New England
Steam N2 0-6-2T 9516       01/01/1948 HSY 5w/e 22/09/1951 34A Kings Cross
Steam N2 0-6-2T 9522       01/01/1948 HSY 5w/e 22/09/1951 34A Kings Cross
Steam N2 0-6-2T 9530       01/01/1948 HSY m/e 12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam N2 0-6-2T 9531       01/01/1948 HSY w/e 07/02/1959 34D Hitchin (GNR)
Steam N2 0-6-2T 9533       01/01/1948 HSY w/e 21/11/1959 34A Kings Cross
Steam N2 0-6-2T 9547       01/01/1948 HSY 3w/e 12/11/1955 34C Hatfield
Steam N2 0-6-2T 9556       01/01/1948 HSY m/e 12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam N2 0-6-2T 9566       01/01/1948 HSY 5w/e 22/09/1951 30F Parkeston Quay
Steam O1 2-8-0 63773 20/10/1946 GOR Gorton 02/07/1948 HSY 05/09/1948 GOR Gorton
Steam O1 2-8-0 63789 27/01/1946 GOR Gorton 02/07/1948 HSY 22/08/1948 GOR Gorton
Steam O1 2-8-0 63872 20/10/1946 GOR Gorton 02/07/1948 HSY 05/09/1948 GOR Gorton
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67707       4w/e 23/12/1950 34B 5w/e 21/03/1953 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67756       4w/e 23/12/1950 34B 4w/e 21/07/1951 34E Neasden
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67757       4w/e 23/12/1950 34B 4w/e 15/11/1952 34A Kings Cross
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67761       4w/e 23/12/1950 34B 5w/e 24/03/1951 34E Neasden
Steam J20 0-6-0 64684 01/01/1948 CAM Cambridge 4w/e 20/01/1951 34B 4w/e 24/10/1953 31B March
Steam J20 0-6-0 64678 01/01/1948 CAM Cambridge 4w/e 17/02/1951 34B 4w/e 24/10/1953 31B March
Steam J20 0-6-0 64679 01/01/1948 CAM Cambridge 4w/e 17/02/1951 34B 4w/e 24/10/1953 31B March
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67780       5w/e 24/03/1951 34B 4w/e 21/04/1951 34E Neasden
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67784       5w/e 24/03/1951 34B 4w/e 19/05/1951 34E Neasden
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67771       4w/e 19/05/1951 34B 5w/e 22/09/1951 34E Neasden
Steam J20 0-6-0 64699 01/01/1948 MAR March 5w/e 23/06/1951 34B 4w/e 24/10/1953 31B March
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67774 12/1949 NEA Neasden (New) 4w/e 21/07/1951 34B 4w/e 20/10/1956 34A Kings Cross
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68949 5w/e 23/06/1951 34E Neasden 5w/e 16/02/1952 34B m/e 04/1959 Withdrawn
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67775 12/1949 NEA Neasden (New) 4w/e 22/03/1952 34B 4w/e 15/11/1952 34A Kings Cross
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12112       19/07/1952 (New) 34B 4w/e 17/09/1955 34A Kings Cross
Steam J6 0-6-0 64221 01/01/1948 NWE New England 4w/e 20/09/1952 34B 5w/e 17/12/1955 38A Colwick
Steam J6 0-6-0 64266 01/01/1948 NWE New England 4w/e 20/09/1952 34B 29/04/1959 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12123       18/10/1952 (New) 34B 4w/e 18/02/1956 30A Stratford
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12124       18/10/1952 (New) 34B 4w/e 18/02/1956 30A Stratford
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68891 01/01/1948 WFD Woodford Halse 4w/e 18/10/1952 34B m/e 07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68894 m/e 07/1949 CLK Colwick 4w/e 18/10/1952 34B w/e 15/07/1961 34A Kings Cross
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68918 01/01/1948 DON Doncaster 4w/e 18/10/1952 34B m/e 07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68920 m/e 07/1949 CLK Colwick 4w/e 18/10/1952 34B m/e 07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68931 01/01/1948 ARD Ardsley 4w/e 18/10/1952 34B w/e 15/07/1961 34A Kings Cross
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68936 01/01/1948 DON Doncaster 4w/e 18/10/1952 34B m/e 04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68945 01/01/1948 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 18/10/1952 34B m/e 04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68961 01/01/1948 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 18/10/1952 34B w/e 15/07/1961 34E New England
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68972 01/01/1948 ANN Annesley 4w/e 18/10/1952 34B w/e 15/07/1961 36A Doncaster
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68991 01/01/1948 DON Doncaster 4w/e 18/10/1952 34B w/e 15/07/1961 34A Kings Cross
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68890 4w/e 21/10/1950 36A Doncaster 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B 4w/e 13/12/1952 37A Ardsley
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68903 01/01/1948 ARD Ardsley 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B m/e 04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68917 01/01/1948 ARD Ardsley 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B w/e 15/07/1961 36A Doncaster
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68921 01/01/1948 ARD Ardsley 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B m/e 04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68927 01/01/1948 ANN Annesley 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B 4w/e 13/12/1952 38B Annesley
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68928 01/01/1948 SHF Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B w/e 15/07/1961 36A Doncaster
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68929 01/01/1948 ANN Annesley 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B m/e 05/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68930 01/01/1948 ARD Ardsley 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B m/e 02/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68968 01/01/1948 FRO Frodingham 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B m/e 04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68971 01/01/1948 FRO Frodingham 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B w/e 15/07/1961 34E New England
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68975 01/01/1948 ANN Annesley 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B 4w/e 13/12/1952 38B Annesley
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68976 01/01/1948 ANN Annesley 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B 4w/e 13/12/1952 38B Annesley
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68981 4w/e 20/09/1952 38A Colwick 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B m/e 04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68982 01/01/1948 CLK Colwick 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B w/e 15/07/1961 40A Lincoln
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68983 01/01/1948 SHF Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B w/e 15/07/1961 36A Doncaster
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68985 01/01/1948 DON Doncaster 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B m/e 11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68986 01/01/1948 DON Doncaster 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B w/e 15/07/1961 36A Doncaster
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68987 01/01/1948 DON Doncaster 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B w/e 15/07/1961 36A Doncaster
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68989 01/01/1948 DON Doncaster 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B w/e 08/07/1961 34E New England
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68990 01/01/1948 SHF Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B m/e 04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam N2 0-6-2T 69522 5w/e 22/09/1951 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B w/e 18/07/1959 34D Hitchin (GNR)
Steam N2 0-6-2T 69560 5w/e 22/09/1951 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B w/e 20/06/1959 34F Grantham
Steam N2 0-6-2T 69590 5w/e 23/08/1952 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B 4w/e 18/04/1953 34A Kings Cross
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68808 4w/e 15/11/1952 37A Ardsley 4w/e 13/12/1952 34B m/e 04/1957 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68825 4w/e 15/11/1952 38B Annesley 4w/e 13/12/1952 34B m/e 08/1953 Withdrawn
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68834 4w/e 15/11/1952 38B Annesley 4w/e 13/12/1952 34B w/e 14/02/1959 56B Ardsley
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68883 4w/e 15/11/1952 38B Annesley 4w/e 13/12/1952 34B 26/09/1955 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68906 01/01/1948 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 5w/e 21/03/1953 34B m/e 05/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68907 01/01/1948 ARD Ardsley 5w/e 21/03/1953 34B m/e 04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam N2 0-6-2T 69567 5w/e 22/09/1951 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 18/04/1953 34B m/e 04/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68975 4w/e 13/12/1952 38B Annesley 4w/e 20/06/1953 34B 4w/e 25/07/1953 38B Annesley
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69451 4w/e 20/06/1953 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 25/07/1953 34B 4w/e 23/01/1954 38A Colwick
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69470 4w/e 20/06/1953 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 25/07/1953 34B m/e 08/1956 Withdrawn
Steam J6 0-6-0 64196 01/01/1948 BOS Boston 4w/e 24/10/1953 34B w/e 27/02/1960 34E New England
Steam J6 0-6-0 64222 01/01/1948 CLK Colwick 4w/e 24/10/1953 34B 5w/e 24/03/1956 37A Ardsley
Steam J6 0-6-0 64223 01/01/1948 CLK Colwick 4w/e 24/10/1953 34B w/e 27/02/1960 34E New England
Steam J6 0-6-0 64233 01/01/1948 CLK Colwick 4w/e 24/10/1953 34B w/e 27/02/1960 34E New England
Steam J6 0-6-0 64242 01/01/1948 BOS Boston 4w/e 24/10/1953 34B 29/08/1955 Withdrawn
Steam J6 0-6-0 64253 01/01/1948 CLK Colwick 4w/e 24/10/1953 34B w/e 27/02/1960 34E New England
Steam N2 0-6-2T 69537 01/01/1948 HAT Hatfield 4w/e 23/01/1954 34B m/e 04/1959 Withdrawn
Steam N2 0-6-2T 69587 4w/e 24/10/1953 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 23/01/1954 34B m/e 07/1960 Withdrawn
Steam N2 0-6-2T 69501 4w/e 24/10/1953 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 20/02/1954 34B m/e 11/1957 Withdrawn
Steam N2 0-6-2T 69594 01/01/1948 HAT Hatfield 5w/e 24/04/1954 34B w/e 18/07/1959 34D Hitchin (GNR)
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12137 4w/e 18/04/1953 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 13/11/1954 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69477 4w/e 21/08/1954 34C Hatfield 4w/e 19/02/1955 34B 4w/e 15/06/1957 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68979 4w/e 25/07/1953 40B Immingham 4w/e 19/03/1955 34B m/e 02/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68946 4w/e 25/07/1953 40B Immingham 5w/e 23/04/1955 34B m/e 02/1961 Withdrawn
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69462 4w/e 21/08/1954 34C Hatfield 5w/e 18/06/1955 34B 4w/e 18/05/1957 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12131 4w/e 18/04/1953 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 17/09/1955 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Steam N2 0-6-2T 69554 4w/e 23/01/1954 34C Hatfield 3w/e 12/11/1955 34B m/e 06/1958 Withdrawn
Steam N2 0-6-2T 69555 4w/e 18/10/1952 30E Colchester 5w/e 17/12/1955 34B 5w/e 21/01/1956 30E Colchester
Steam N7 0-6-2T 69618 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 5w/e 17/12/1955 34B w/e 07/02/1959 34C Hatfield
Steam N7 0-6-2T 69629 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 5w/e 21/01/1956 34B w/e 28/03/1959 34C Hatfield
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12129 4w/e 18/04/1953 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 18/02/1956 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12138 4w/e 18/04/1953 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 18/02/1956 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42374 4w/e 19/02/1955 34D Hitchin (GNR) 5w/e 24/03/1956 34B m/e 21/07/1956 34D Hitchin (GNR)
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68966 01/01/1948 ARD Ardsley 5w/e 24/03/1956 34B w/e 15/07/1961 34A Kings Cross
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68846 01/01/1948 DON Doncaster 5w/e 24/03/1956 34B w/e 28/02/1959 34A Kings Cross
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68875 5w/e 21/01/1956 38A Colwick 5w/e 24/03/1956 34B w/e 14/02/1959 56B Ardsley
Diesel BULL1 0-6-0 11001 m/e 07/1952 75C Norwood Junction 3w/e 16/06/1956 34B 9w/e 27/10/1956 75C Norwood Junction
Steam N7 0-6-2T 69612 5w/e 23/08/1952 30A Stratford 3w/e 16/06/1956 34B 5w/e 20/07/1957 30E Colchester
Steam N7 0-6-2T 69615 5w/e 24/04/1954 30A Stratford 3w/e 16/06/1956 34B 5w/e 20/07/1957 32C Lowestoft
Steam N2 0-6-2T 69555 4w/e 20/10/1956 34A Kings Cross 5w/e 20/04/1957 34B m/e 04/1959 Withdrawn
Steam N2 0-6-2T 69502 4w/e 17/11/1956 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 18/05/1957 34B m/e 05/1958 Withdrawn
Steam N2 0-6-2T 69550 4w/e 20/10/1956 34A Kings Cross 5w/e 20/07/1957 34B m/e 09/1958 Withdrawn
Steam N2 0-6-2T 69551 4w/e 17/11/1956 34A Kings Cross 5w/e 20/07/1957 34B m/e 12/1958 Withdrawn
Steam N2 0-6-2T 69552 4w/e 17/11/1956 34A Kings Cross 5w/e 20/07/1957 34B w/e 22/11/1958 34F Grantham
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13332 4w/e 18/05/1957 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 19/10/1957 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67772 4w/e 20/10/1956 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 19/10/1957 34B 5w/e 15/11/1958 34A Kings Cross
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67780 m/e 21/07/1956 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 19/10/1957 34B 4w/e 13/09/1958 34A Kings Cross
Steam N2 0-6-2T 69496 01/01/1948 KX Kings Cross 4w/e 19/10/1957 34B 4w/e 14/12/1957 34A Kings Cross
Steam N2 0-6-2T 69525 01/01/1948 KX Kings Cross 4w/e 19/10/1957 34B 4w/e 16/08/1958 34A Kings Cross
Steam N2 0-6-2T 69541 01/01/1948 KX Kings Cross 4w/e 19/10/1957 34B 4w/e 14/12/1957 34A Kings Cross
Steam N2 0-6-2T 69548 01/01/1948 KX Kings Cross 4w/e 19/10/1957 34B 4w/e 14/12/1957 34A Kings Cross
Steam N2 0-6-2T 69568 01/01/1948 KX Kings Cross 4w/e 19/10/1957 34B 4w/e 14/12/1957 34A Kings Cross
Steam N2 0-6-2T 69572 01/01/1948 KX Kings Cross 4w/e 19/10/1957 34B w/e 21/11/1959 34A Kings Cross
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D201 03/04/1958 30A Stratford (New) 4w/e 10/05/1958 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Steam N2 0-6-2T 69516 4w/e 12/04/1958 34A Kings Cross 5w/e 14/06/1958 34B w/e 22/11/1958 34F Grantham
Steam N2 0-6-2T 69534 4w/e 20/02/1954 34C Hatfield 5w/e 14/06/1958 34B m/e 02/1959 Withdrawn
Steam N7 0-6-2T 69637 5w/e 24/04/1954 34C Hatfield 5w/e 14/06/1958 34B m/e 03/1959 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D206       09/07/1958 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13331 4w/e 18/05/1957 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 19/07/1958 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D207       23/07/1958 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo D5300       30/07/1958 (New) 34B w/e 23/04/1960 64B Haymarket
Steam N2 0-6-2T 69561 5w/e 20/07/1957 34D Hitchin (GNR) 4w/e 16/08/1958 34B w/e 20/06/1959 34F Grantham
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D208       27/08/1958 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo D5301       12/09/1958 (New) 34B w/e 23/04/1960 64B Haymarket
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68869 01/01/1948 DON Doncaster 4w/e 13/09/1958 34B w/e 11/04/1959 56B Ardsley
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D209       15/09/1958 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo D5302       02/10/1958 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 64B Haymarket
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12112 4w/e 17/09/1955 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 11/10/1958 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo D5303       17/10/1958 (New) 34B 4w/e 22/11/1958 64H Leith Central
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo D5304       31/10/1958 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo D5305       14/11/1958 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68926 5w/e 22/10/1955 36A Doncaster 5w/e 15/11/1958 34B w/e 15/07/1961 36A Doncaster
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68960 4w/e 19/07/1958 36A Doncaster 5w/e 15/11/1958 34B m/e 07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68970 4w/e 19/07/1958 36A Doncaster 5w/e 15/11/1958 34B m/e 04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68980 4w/e 25/05/1956 36A Doncaster 5w/e 15/11/1958 34B m/e 02/1960 Withdrawn
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo D5306       28/11/1958 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6100       02/12/1958 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo D5307       05/12/1958 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6101       09/12/1958 (New) 34B 4w/e 07/05/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo D5308       12/12/1958 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo D5309       19/12/1958 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo D5303 4w/e 22/11/1958 64H Leith Central w/e 20/12/1958 34B w/e 30/04/1960 64B Haymarket
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 68033 5w/e 15/11/1958 40B Immingham w/e 20/12/1958 34B w/e 07/02/1959 34A Kings Cross
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6102       23/12/1958 (New) 34B w/e 16/04/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel DELTIC Co-Co DP1 m/e 10/1956 1B Camden m/e 01/1959 34B 03/1961 Withdrawn
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo D5310       06/01/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo D5311       09/01/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 68067 4w/e 20/03/1954 40B Immingham w/e 10/01/1959 34B w/e 24/06/1961 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo D5312       16/01/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo D5313       23/01/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 68073 01/01/1948 IMM Immingham w/e 24/01/1959 34B w/e 15/07/1961 34A Kings Cross
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 68075 01/01/1948 IMM Immingham w/e 24/01/1959 34B w/e 24/06/1961 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 68077 01/01/1948 IMM Immingham w/e 24/01/1959 34B w/e 15/07/1961 40F Boston
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo D5314       30/01/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3687       24/02/1959 (New) 34B w/e 28/03/1959 34A Kings Cross
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6104       26/02/1959 (New) 34B 10/04/1960 34B Hornsey
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3688       27/02/1959 (New) 34B w/e 07/03/1959 34A Kings Cross
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo D5317       27/02/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 68033 w/e 07/02/1959 34A Kings Cross w/e 28/02/1959 34B w/e 27/02/1960 40E Colwick
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo D5318       06/03/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3690       09/03/1959 (New) 34B w/e 05/03/1960 34C Hatfield
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3691       12/03/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo D5315       13/03/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo D5319       13/03/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6105       17/03/1959 (New) 34B 17/04/1960 34B Hornsey
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3692       19/03/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo D5316       20/03/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6106       24/03/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6107       24/03/1959 (New) 34B w/e 16/04/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3693       01/04/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6109       07/04/1959 (New) 34B w/e 16/04/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6108       14/04/1959 (New) 34B 17/04/1960 34B Hornsey
Diesel 23 Bo-Bo D5903       17/04/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 23 Bo-Bo D5904       24/04/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 23 Bo-Bo D5902       01/05/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6103       05/05/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel 23 Bo-Bo D5905       08/05/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 23 Bo-Bo D5906       08/05/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 23 Bo-Bo D5907       15/05/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 23 Bo-Bo D5900       22/05/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 23 Bo-Bo D5901       22/05/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 23 Bo-Bo D5908       29/05/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3704       03/06/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3705       08/06/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3706       15/06/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 23 Bo-Bo D5909       19/06/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo D5330 19/06/1959 64B Haymarket (New) w/e 25/07/1959 34B w/e 26/09/1959 64B Haymarket
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo D5331 26/06/1959 64B Haymarket (New) w/e 25/07/1959 34B w/e 26/09/1959 64B Haymarket
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo D5332 02/07/1959 64B Haymarket (New) w/e 25/07/1959 34B w/e 03/10/1959 64B Haymarket
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo D5333 10/07/1959 64B Haymarket (New) w/e 25/07/1959 34B w/e 03/10/1959 64B Haymarket
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo D5334 17/07/1959 64B Haymarket (New) w/e 01/08/1959 34B w/e 03/10/1959 64B Haymarket
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo D5335 24/07/1959 64B Haymarket (New) w/e 01/08/1959 34B w/e 03/10/1959 64B Haymarket
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3712       21/08/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3713       03/09/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3710 06/08/1959 34E New England (New) w/e 19/09/1959 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3711 14/08/1959 34E New England (New) w/e 19/09/1959 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8020       03/10/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6126 06/10/1959 32B Ipswich (New) w/e 17/10/1959 34B w/e 16/01/1960 32B Ipswich
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8021       20/10/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8022       29/10/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8023       13/11/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Steam N2 0-6-2T 69504 5w/e 14/06/1958 34A Kings Cross w/e 21/11/1959 34B w/e 08/07/1961 34E New England
Steam N2 0-6-2T 69520 01/01/1948 KX Kings Cross w/e 21/11/1959 34B w/e 15/07/1961 34E New England
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8024       25/11/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5567       26/11/1959 (New) 34B w/e 26/03/1960 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8025       27/11/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5568       03/12/1959 (New) 34B w/e 16/04/1960 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5569       03/12/1959 (New) 34B w/e 02/04/1960 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8026       04/12/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8045       04/12/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5565 19/11/1959 31B March (New) w/e 05/12/1959 34B w/e 02/04/1960 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5566 19/11/1959 30A Stratford (New) w/e 05/12/1959 34B w/e 26/03/1960 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8027       11/12/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D248 27/11/1959 52A Gateshead (New) w/e 12/12/1959 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8046       12/12/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8047       18/12/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8048       31/12/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8049       31/12/1959 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90502 4w/e 19/07/1958 41H Staveley (G.C.) w/e 16/01/1960 34B w/e 06/02/1960 34E New England
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68896 w/e 20/12/1958 34E New England w/e 30/01/1960 34B w/e 15/07/1961 34A Kings Cross
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68976 w/e 20/12/1958 34E New England w/e 30/01/1960 34B w/e 15/07/1961 34E New England
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5586       04/02/1960 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5587       04/02/1960 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5588       11/02/1960 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5589       11/02/1960 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5590       18/02/1960 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5591       18/02/1960 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68950 m/e 21/07/1956 38A Colwick w/e 20/02/1960 34B w/e 15/07/1961 34A Kings Cross
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5592       25/02/1960 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5593       25/02/1960 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5594       03/03/1960 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5595       03/03/1960 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5596       10/03/1960 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5597       10/03/1960 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5598       17/03/1960 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5599       17/03/1960 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5600       24/03/1960 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5601       24/03/1960 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5602       31/03/1960 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5603       31/03/1960 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5604       07/04/1960 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5605       07/04/1960 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90480 w/e 18/04/1959 30A Stratford w/e 09/04/1960 34B w/e 17/06/1961 36A Doncaster
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6104 26/02/1959 34B Hornsey (New) 10/04/1960 34B 24/04/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5606       14/04/1960 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5607       14/04/1960 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90660 5w/e 17/12/1955 30A Stratford w/e 16/04/1960 34B w/e 17/06/1961 34E New England
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6105 17/03/1959 34B Hornsey (New) 17/04/1960 34B 24/04/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6108 14/04/1959 34B Hornsey (New) 17/04/1960 34B 24/04/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5608       21/04/1960 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5609       21/04/1960 (New) 34B w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90129 w/e 18/04/1959 30A Stratford w/e 30/04/1960 34B w/e 17/06/1961 34E New England
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90156 w/e 18/04/1959 30A Stratford w/e 30/04/1960 34B w/e 17/06/1961 36A Doncaster
Steam N2 0-6-2T 69579 01/01/1948 KX Kings Cross w/e 23/07/1960 34B w/e 15/07/1961 34E New England
Steam N2 0-6-2T 69498 01/01/1948 KX Kings Cross w/e 01/10/1960 34B w/e 15/07/1961 34E New England
Steam N2 0-6-2T 69512 01/01/1948 KX Kings Cross w/e 01/10/1960 34B w/e 15/07/1961 34E New England
Steam N2 0-6-2T 69543 01/01/1948 KX Kings Cross w/e 01/10/1960 34B w/e 15/07/1961 34E New England