Depot: Horsham
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Horsham | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 1157 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | P | 02/01/1948 | HOR | Horsham | ||||
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 1273 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | P | 02/01/1948 | HOR | Horsham | ||||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 1730 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | P | 02/01/1948 | HOR | Horsham | ||||
Steam | Greybacks | 4-4-0 | 2045 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||||
Steam | Scotchmen | 4-4-0 | 2051 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | m/e | 03/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Greybacks | 4-4-0 | 2055 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | m/e | 12/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Greybacks | 4-4-0 | 2067 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||||
Steam | Scotchmen | 4-4-0 | 2074 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | m/e | 02/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D1M | 0-4-2T | 2252 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | m/e | 09/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D1M | 0-4-2T | 2283 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | m/e | 11/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D Tanks | 0-4-2T | 2286 | q/e | 12/1935 | FRA | Fratton | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | P | 02/01/1948 | HOR | Horsham |
Steam | D1M | 0-4-2T | 2289 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | P | 02/01/1948 | HOR | Horsham | ||||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | 2366 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | m/e | 03/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | 2373 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | m/e | 11/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | 2384 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 75G | Eastbourne | ||||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | 2387 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | m/e | 03/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | 2389 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 2399 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 71D | Fratton | ||||
Steam | E5X | 0-6-2T | 2401 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 75A | Brighton | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 2449 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | RED | Redhill | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2464 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | w/e | 04/02/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2496 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | P | 02/01/1948 | HOR | Horsham | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2501 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 70A | Nine Elms | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2511 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75A | Brighton | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2515 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 75A | Brighton | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 2521 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | 3w/e | 01/11/1955 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 2550 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2556 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 71A | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2557 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | ELH | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | E5X | 0-6-2T | 2570 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 75D | Horsham | ||||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 2571 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 75B | Redhill | ||||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 2573 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 3B | Three Bridges | ||||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 2584 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 75E | Three Bridges | ||||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 2594 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | EBN | Eastbourne | ||||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 540 | on | 04/01/1939 | BM | Bournemouth (New) | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | 3B | Three Bridges |
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 543 | on | 29/03/1939 | GFD | Guildford (New) | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 544 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | ||||
Steam | C3 | 0-6-0 | 2300 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | FRA | Fratton | ||||
Steam | C3 | 0-6-0 | 2301 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | FRA | Fratton | ||||
Steam | C3 | 0-6-0 | 2306 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | FRA | Fratton | ||||
Steam | C3 | 0-6-0 | 2307 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | m/e | 05/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | C3 | 0-6-0 | 2308 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | m/e | 11/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 1157 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | Horsham | P | 02/01/1948 | HOR | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 1273 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | Horsham | P | 02/01/1948 | HOR | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | RED | Redhill |
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 1730 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | Horsham | P | 02/01/1948 | HOR | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | TON | Tonbridge |
Steam | D Tanks | 0-4-2T | 2286 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | Horsham | P | 02/01/1948 | HOR | m/e | 07/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D1M | 0-4-2T | 2289 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | Horsham | P | 02/01/1948 | HOR | m/e | 07/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2496 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | Horsham | P | 02/01/1948 | HOR | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | NHN | Newhaven |
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 542 | P | 02/01/1948 | 3B | Three Bridges | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | HOR | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 531 | P | 02/01/1948 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | HOR | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 545 | P | 02/01/1948 | RED | Redhill | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | HOR | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 546 | P | 02/01/1948 | RED | Redhill | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | HOR | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 32537 | on | 01/01/1948 | FRA | Fratton | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | HOR | m/e | 30/11/1950 | NHN | Newhaven |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 2548 | on | 01/01/1948 | FRA | Fratton | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | HOR | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 71D | Fratton |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 2554 | on | 01/01/1948 | FRA | Fratton | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | HOR | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | BA | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 21 | on | 01/01/1948 | BM | Bournemouth | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | HOR | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 27 | on | 01/01/1948 | FRA | Fratton | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | HOR | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 47 | on | 01/01/1948 | BM | Bournemouth | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | HOR | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 50 | on | 01/01/1948 | BM | Bournemouth | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | HOR | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 71D | Fratton |
Steam | C3 | 0-6-0 | 32302 | on | 01/01/1948 | NORW | Norwood Junction | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | HOR | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 71D | Fratton |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32482 | on | 01/01/1948 | NHN | Newhaven | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | HOR | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | 32364 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | 4w/e | 31/07/1949 | HOR | m/e | 10/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | 32380 | on | 01/01/1948 | AFD | Ashford | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 75D | m/e | 05/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | 32365 | on | 01/01/1948 | AFD | Ashford | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 75D | 5w/e | 09/10/1950 | 75D | Horsham |
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | 32379 | on | 01/01/1948 | STL | St Leonards | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 75D | 5w/e | 09/10/1950 | 75D | Horsham |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 32544 | on | 01/01/1948 | NORW | Norwood Junction | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 75D | 5w/e | 09/10/1950 | 75D | Horsham |
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | 32365 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 75D | Horsham | 5w/e | 09/10/1950 | 75D | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | 32379 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 75D | Horsham | 5w/e | 09/10/1950 | 75D | m/e | 12/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 32544 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 75D | Horsham | 5w/e | 09/10/1950 | 75D | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75C | Norwood Junction |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 32539 | on | 01/01/1948 | BTN | Brighton | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 75D | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 75D | Horsham |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 32539 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 75D | Horsham | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 75D | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 32399 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 71D | Fratton | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 75D | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30049 | on | 01/01/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 75D | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 75D | Horsham |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30049 | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 75D | Horsham | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 75D | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | E5X | 0-6-2T | 32576 | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 75A | Brighton | 3w/e | 05/05/1951 | 75D | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75D | Horsham |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 32522 | P | 02/01/1948 | 3B | Three Bridges | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75D | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 32523 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75D | 6w/e | 01/04/1957 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | E5X | 0-6-2T | 32576 | 3w/e | 05/05/1951 | 75D | Horsham | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75D | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 75D | Horsham |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30048 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 75D | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32463 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 75D | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 75D | Horsham |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32465 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3B | Three Bridges | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 75D | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 75D | Horsham |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32467 | P | 02/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 75D | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 75D | Horsham |
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 2573 | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 75D | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 32583 | on | 01/01/1948 | BTN | Brighton | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 75D | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32463 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 75D | Horsham | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 75D | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32465 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 75D | Horsham | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 75D | m/e | 04/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32467 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 75D | Horsham | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 75D | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32468 | 5w/e | 04/09/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 75D | 5w/e | 11/03/1955 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32469 | P | 02/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 75D | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32470 | on | 01/01/1948 | BTN | Brighton | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 75D | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30050 | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 71D | Fratton | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 75D | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | E5X | 0-6-2T | 32570 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | Horsham | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 75D | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | E5X | 0-6-2T | 32576 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75D | Horsham | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 75D | m/e | 30/06/1952 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | E5X | 0-6-2T | 32570 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 30/07/1952 | 75D | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 75D | Horsham |
Steam | E5X | 0-6-2T | 32576 | m/e | 30/06/1952 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 30/07/1952 | 75D | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 75D | Horsham |
Steam | E5X | 0-6-2T | 32570 | 4w/e | 30/07/1952 | 75D | Horsham | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 75D | 5w/e | 11/03/1955 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | E5X | 0-6-2T | 32576 | 4w/e | 30/07/1952 | 75D | Horsham | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 75D | 5w/e | 11/03/1955 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 32541 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75G | Eastbourne | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 75D | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30108 | on | 01/01/1948 | GFD | Guildford | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 75D | 3w/e | 01/11/1955 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30051 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 75D | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 30544 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 75D | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31725 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 4w/e | 11/12/1954 | 75D | 5w/e | 11/03/1955 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 32165 | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 75A | Brighton | 6w/e | 20/04/1955 | 75D | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 32166 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 75A | Brighton | 6w/e | 20/04/1955 | 75D | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 32170 | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 75A | Brighton | 6w/e | 20/04/1955 | 75D | 6w/e | 27/01/1956 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) |
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 30547 | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | NORW | Norwood Junction | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 75D | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32480 | P | 02/01/1948 | 3B | Three Bridges | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 75D | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 32526 | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 75E | Three Bridges | 6w/e | 01/04/1957 | 75D | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 75E | Three Bridges |