Depot: Hurlford
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Hurlford | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3899 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 67A | Corkerhill | ||||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | 15260 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 68D | Beattock | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 15203 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | 4w/e | 04/07/1959 | 67A | Corkerhill | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 15236 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 60D | Wick | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 17236 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | on | 12/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 17277 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | on | 18/04/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 17331 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | w/e | 24/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 17383 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | w/e | 30/07/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 17353 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | on | 20/11/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 57570 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | m/e | 09/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 57571 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | 4w/e | 05/07/1958 | 63D | Oban | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 57572 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | on | 27/06/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 57573 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | on | 21/11/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 57574 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | on | 19/06/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 652 | 0-6-0 | 57637 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | on | 07/12/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 652 | 0-6-0 | 57643 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | w/e | 01/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | 57671 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | 66A | Polmadie | ||||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | 57672 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | 66A | Polmadie | ||||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | 57650 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | on | 20/11/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | 57651 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | on | 20/11/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | 57688 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | 4w/e | 26/10/1957 | 66B | Motherwell | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4159 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 67A | Corkerhill | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4198 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 67A | Corkerhill | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4312 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | w/e | 01/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4319 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | 4w/e | 25/10/1958 | 67A | Corkerhill | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4323 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | 8w/e | 16/04/1955 | 67C | Ayr | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4325 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | w/e | 01/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4329 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 67A | Corkerhill | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 56368 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | on | 04/12/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 43 | 4-4-0 | 14456 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | 14504 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | 4w/e | 30/10/1954 | 63B | Stirling | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 570 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | on | 23/08/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 571 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | on | 29/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 572 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 67A | Corkerhill | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 573 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | on | 05/05/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 593 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | on | 23/08/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 597 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | on | 23/08/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 612 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | on | 02/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 617 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 618 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 643 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | on | 31/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 644 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | on | 12/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 645 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | on | 31/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 661 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | on | 27/11/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 662 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | on | 18/09/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 663 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | 4w/e | 15/05/1954 | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 665 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | w/e | 11/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 686 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | on | 12/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 687 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | on | 31/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 688 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | on | 31/07/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 689 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | on | 31/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 57584 | on | 01/01/1948 | 28A | Motherwell | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 30B | m/e | 06/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1110 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30A | Corkerhill | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 30B | on | 13/08/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 566 | on | 21/06/1949 | 98S | on | 29/01/1950 | 30B | on | 15/05/1950 | To Store | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40605 | on | 01/01/1948 | 28C | Carstairs | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 67B | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 67A | Corkerhill |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 619 | on | 01/01/1948 | 28C | Carstairs | on | 08/05/1950 | 67B | on | 02/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 666 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 64D | Carstairs | on | 08/05/1950 | 67B | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 66A | Polmadie |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 566 | on | 15/05/1950 | 98S | on | 15/11/1950 | 67B | on | 17/09/1951 | To Store | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43996 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 67B | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 67B | Hurlford |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44001 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 67B | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 67B | Hurlford |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44281 | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 65B | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 67B | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 67B | Hurlford | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43996 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 67B | Hurlford | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 67B | on | 16/04/1951 | 67A | Corkerhill |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44001 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 67B | Hurlford | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 67B | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 67A | Corkerhill |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44281 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 67B | Hurlford | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 67B | on | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K | 0-6-0 | 17695 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 67B | m/e | 01/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K | 0-6-0 | 17698 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 67B | m/e | 12/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40592 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 67A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 67B | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 67B | Hurlford |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40592 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 67B | Hurlford | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 67B | on | 21/12/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40620 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30A | Corkerhill | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 67B | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 67B | Hurlford |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44791 | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 65C | Parkhead | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 67B | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 67B | Hurlford |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45010 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 67A | Corkerhill | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 67B | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 67B | Hurlford |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40620 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 67B | Hurlford | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 67B | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 67A | Corkerhill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44791 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 67B | Hurlford | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 67B | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 67A | Corkerhill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45010 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 67B | Hurlford | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 67B | on | 29/08/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 57359 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 67B | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 67A | Corkerhill |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42743 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 63A | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 67B | on | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 57357 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30C | Ardrossan | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 67B | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 67D | Ardrossan |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40566 | on | 17/09/1951 | 98S | on | 17/03/1952 | 67B | on | 14/11/1952 | 66A | Polmadie | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45266 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 63A | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 67B | on | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44159 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 67A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 67B | 4w/e | 08/06/1957 | 67D | Ardrossan |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40572 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 67A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 67B | on | 29/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40605 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 67A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 67B | on | 19/10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13007 | on | 27/12/1952 (New) | 67B | w/e | 05/11/1966 | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13008 | on | 27/12/1952 (New) | 67B | w/e | 05/11/1966 | 10A | Carnforth | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13009 | on | 27/12/1952 (New) | 67B | w/e | 05/11/1966 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | 55264 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30D | Ayr | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 67B | 4w/e | 04/07/1959 | 67A | Corkerhill |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40566 | on | 08/06/1953 | 67A | Corkerhill | on | 14/12/1953 | 67B | on | 25/10/1954 | To Store | |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40666 | 4w/e | 11/07/1953 | 67A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 67B | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 67D | Ardrossan |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44330 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | Stirling | 4w/e | 12/06/1954 | 67B | 4w/e | 29/10/1955 | 67C | Ayr |
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77015 | on | 29/07/1954 (New) | 67B | on | 17/07/1966 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77016 | on | 06/08/1954 (New) | 67B | on | 03/03/1966 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44331 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | Stirling | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 67B | 4w/e | 29/10/1955 | 67C | Ayr |
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77017 | on | 20/08/1954 (New) | 67B | on | 29/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77018 | on | 26/08/1954 (New) | 67B | on | 29/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77019 | on | 03/09/1954 (New) | 67B | w/e | 16/02/1963 | 66A | Polmadie | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41141 | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 67A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 04/09/1954 | 67B | on | 08/09/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 40915 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 30A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 02/10/1954 | 67B | m/e | 12/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40566 | on | 25/10/1954 | 98S | on | 01/05/1955 | 67B | on | 09/01/1956 | To Store | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40566 | on | 09/01/1956 | 98S | on | 04/06/1956 | 67B | on | 28/01/1957 | To Store | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 55211 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 19/01/1957 | 67B | on | 29/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40566 | on | 28/01/1957 | 98S | on | 27/05/1957 | 67B | on | 30/06/1958 | 68C | Stranraer | |
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 57577 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30C | Ardrossan | 4w/e | 08/06/1957 | 67B | w/e | 30/07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 57562 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 21/12/1957 | 67B | w/e | 21/05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | 57689 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 63D | Oban | 4w/e | 05/07/1958 | 67B | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | 64G | Hawick |
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 57284 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30D | Ayr | 4w/e | 25/10/1958 | 67B | w/e | 08/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 57295 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30D | Ayr | 4w/e | 25/10/1958 | 67B | w/e | 11/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40049 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 14/02/1959 | 67B | w/e | 29/08/1959 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40608 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30C | Ardrossan | 4w/e | 11/04/1959 | 67B | on | 29/09/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40609 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30C | Ardrossan | 4w/e | 11/04/1959 | 67B | on | 02/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40607 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 67D | Ardrossan | 4w/e | 06/06/1959 | 67B | on | 31/07/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40626 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30C | Ardrossan | 4w/e | 06/06/1959 | 67B | on | 02/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42739 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30D | Ayr | 4w/e | 04/07/1959 | 67B | on | 29/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42910 | 4w/e | 12/06/1954 | 67C | Ayr | 4w/e | 04/07/1959 | 67B | 4w/e | 26/09/1959 | 67C | Ayr |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40602 | 4w/e | 30/10/1954 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | 4w/e | 29/08/1959 | 67B | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40651 | 4w/e | 30/10/1954 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | 4w/e | 29/08/1959 | 67B | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40629 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 68C | Stranraer | 4w/e | 26/09/1959 | 67B | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40151 | 4w/e | 01/08/1959 | 65D | Dawsholm | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 67B | on | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40574 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30D | Ayr | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 67B | on | 26/04/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40575 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30D | Ayr | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 67B | on | 23/08/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40595 | 4w/e | 20/12/1958 | 67C | Ayr | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 67B | on | 20/06/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40647 | 4w/e | 26/10/1957 | 67C | Ayr | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 67B | on | 31/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40641 | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 68C | Stranraer | 4w/e | 16/01/1960 | 67B | on | 02/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40642 | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 68C | Stranraer | 4w/e | 16/01/1960 | 67B | on | 31/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | 57684 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30D | Ayr | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | 67B | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | 66A | Polmadie |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40602 | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | 67A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | 67B | w/e | 21/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40651 | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | 67A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | 67B | on | 22/11/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40695 | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | 67A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | 67B | w/e | 04/03/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40664 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30D | Ayr | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | 67B | w/e | 16/07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45007 | 4w/e | 02/08/1958 | 67A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 24/09/1960 | 67B | w/e | 23/07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45489 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 24/09/1960 | 67B | on | 29/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67607 | 4w/e | 02/08/1958 | 65C | Parkhead | 4w/e | 17/12/1960 | 67B | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 65C | Parkhead |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67616 | on | 01/01/1948 | PKD | Parkhead | 4w/e | 17/12/1960 | 67B | on | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67661 | w/e | 15/01/1949 | EFD | Eastfield | 4w/e | 17/12/1960 | 67B | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 65C | Parkhead |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67679 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 65C | Parkhead | 4w/e | 17/12/1960 | 67B | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 65C | Parkhead |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67681 | on | 01/01/1948 | STR | Stratford | 4w/e | 17/12/1960 | 67B | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 65C | Parkhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45124 | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | 67A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 11/02/1961 | 67B | 5w/e | 31/12/1966 | 67A | Corkerhill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45467 | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | 67A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 11/02/1961 | 67B | 4w/e | 24/11/1962 | 67A | Corkerhill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44992 | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | 4w/e | 06/05/1961 | 67B | w/e | 31/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44718 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 60A | Inverness | 4w/e | 03/06/1961 | 67B | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 65D | Dawsholm |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45463 | on | 01/01/1948 | 29A | Perth South | 4w/e | 03/06/1961 | 67B | 4w/e | 26/08/1961 | 67D | Ardrossan |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80111 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 67A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 67B | 5w/e | 30/04/1966 | 66F | Beattock |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80112 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 67A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 67B | 4w/e | 25/07/1964 | 67A | Corkerhill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45192 | 4w/e | 06/05/1961 | 67A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 29/07/1961 | 67B | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 65F | Grangemouth |
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 57249 | 4w/e | 26/08/1961 | 67D | Ardrossan | 4w/e | 26/08/1961 | 67B | w/e | 16/07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 57359 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 67A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 26/08/1961 | 67B | on | 26/03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80000 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 67A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 67B | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 67A | Corkerhill |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80128 | on | 23/11/1955 | 67A | Corkerhill (New) | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 67B | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 67A | Corkerhill |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46451 | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 91X | To Scottish Region | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 67B | m/e | 12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46467 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 91X | To Scottish Region | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 67B | 4w/e | 16/02/1963 | 67F | Stranraer |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42735 | on | 01/01/1948 | 27C | Hamilton (West) | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 67B | on | 30/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42746 | 4w/e | 11/04/1959 | 66C | Hamilton (West) | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 67B | on | 30/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42880 | w/e | 19/02/1949 | 66C | Hamilton (West) | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 67B | 4w/e | 16/02/1963 | 67C | Ayr |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67623 | 4w/e | 06/05/1961 | 65E | Kipps | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 67B | on | 25/01/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67661 | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 65C | Parkhead | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 67B | w/e | 05/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67679 | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 65C | Parkhead | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 67B | on | 25/01/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67681 | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 65C | Parkhead | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 67B | on | 16/11/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43899 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 67A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 18/11/1961 | 67B | w/e | 01/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 57300 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 18/11/1961 | 67B | w/e | 11/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44159 | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 67A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 18/11/1961 | 67B | w/e | 01/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44198 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 67A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 18/11/1961 | 67B | on | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67613 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 67D | Ardrossan | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | 67B | on | 25/01/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67614 | on | 01/01/1948 | PKD | Parkhead | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | 67B | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 65C | Parkhead |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67648 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 67D | Ardrossan | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | 67B | on | 25/01/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67676 | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 65C | Parkhead | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | 67B | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 65C | Parkhead |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67607 | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 65C | Parkhead | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 67B | on | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42741 | 4w/e | 14/02/1959 | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 67B | w/e | 29/05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67664 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 65A | Eastfield | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 67B | on | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67667 | on | 23/04/1950 | 65A | Eastfield | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 67B | on | 02/08/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45117 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 67A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 67B | on | 22/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45123 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 67A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 67B | on | 16/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67633 | 4w/e | 11/02/1961 | 65C | Parkhead | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 67B | on | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80091 | 4w/e | 24/09/1960 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 67B | 5w/e | 30/04/1966 | 66F | Beattock |
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 57336 | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 66C | Hamilton (West) | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 67B | 4w/e | 22/12/1962 | 67D | Ardrossan |
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 57341 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31E | Dawsholm | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 67B | w/e | 16/07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | 57691 | 4w/e | 24/09/1960 | 65D | Dawsholm | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 67B | w/e | 16/07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80028 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 67D | Ardrossan | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 67B | 4w/e | 06/07/1963 | 67F | Stranraer |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80029 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 67D | Ardrossan | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 67B | on | 16/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 65297 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 68B | Dumfries | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 67B | 4w/e | 06/07/1963 | 64A | St Margarets |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44189 | 4w/e | 18/11/1961 | 67C | Ayr | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 67B | on | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44283 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 66A | Polmadie | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 67B | on | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44331 | 4w/e | 29/10/1955 | 67C | Ayr | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 67B | on | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42802 | 4w/e | 11/02/1961 | 67C | Ayr | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 67B | on | 08/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42879 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30D | Ayr | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 67B | on | 10/09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2196 | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 67C | Ayr | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 67B | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42196 | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 67C | Ayr | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 67B | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43132 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | 4w/e | 22/12/1962 | 67B | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43133 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | 4w/e | 22/12/1962 | 67B | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76108 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 67B | on | 14/07/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43134 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 67B | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44789 | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | 68C | Stranraer | 4w/e | 16/02/1963 | 67B | on | 10/12/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44801 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 67A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 16/02/1963 | 67B | m/e | 05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45358 | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | 4w/e | 16/02/1963 | 67B | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 64C | Dalry Road |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44074 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 66A | Polmadie | 2w/e | 16/03/1963 | 67B | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44370 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 66A | Polmadie | 2w/e | 16/03/1963 | 67B | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42736 | 4w/e | 14/01/1961 | 67C | Ayr | 4w/e | 08/06/1963 | 67B | on | 29/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45490 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 67C | Ayr | 4w/e | 08/06/1963 | 67B | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 66B | Motherwell |
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77007 | 3w/e | 26/09/1959 | 66A | Polmadie | 2w/e | 07/09/1963 | 67B | on | 29/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44972 | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | 66A | Polmadie | 5w/e | 07/09/1963 | 67B | on | 29/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45459 | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | 66A | Polmadie | 5w/e | 07/09/1963 | 67B | on | 14/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77019 | w/e | 16/02/1963 | 66A | Polmadie | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 67B | on | 29/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76021 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51F | West Auckland | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 67B | on | 19/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76024 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 51L | Thornaby | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 67B | w/e | 31/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46409 | w/e | 27/01/1962 | 50E | Scarborough | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 67B | w/e | 13/07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46413 | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 50D | Goole | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 67B | 5w/e | 31/10/1964 | 67D | Ardrossan |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46435 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 56F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 67B | w/e | 13/07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42795 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 55D | Royston | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 67B | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 66B | Motherwell |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42861 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 67B | 5w/e | 31/10/1964 | 67C | Ayr |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76091 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 67A | Corkerhill | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | 67B | w/e | 31/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76092 | m/e | 06/1957 | 67A | Corkerhill (New) | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | 67B | on | 09/08/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76094 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 67A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 27/06/1964 | 67B | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 66F | Beattock |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44955 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 28C | Carstairs | 4w/e | 27/06/1964 | 67B | m/e | 07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3413 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | 4w/e | 25/07/1964 | 67B | 5w/e | 31/12/1966 | 67C | Ayr |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3414 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | 4w/e | 25/07/1964 | 67B | 4w/e | 27/02/1965 | 67C | Ayr |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3415 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | 4w/e | 25/07/1964 | 67B | 5w/e | 31/12/1966 | 67C | Ayr |
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | D2436 | on | 20/04/1960 | 67C | Ayr (New) | 4w/e | 27/02/1965 | 67B | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 67C | Ayr |
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | D2443 | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | 66C | Hamilton (West) | 4w/e | 27/02/1965 | 67B | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 67C | Ayr |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3209 | on | 09/02/1956 | 65A | Eastfield (New) | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | 67B | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 67C | Ayr |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76102 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 67E | Dumfries | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | 67B | m/e | 12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45115 | 5w/e | 30/01/1965 | 67E | Dumfries | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | 67B | on | 29/11/1966 | Withdrawn |