Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 36 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 5468 Week
» 17289 Month
» 186061 Year
» 1070442 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Immingham


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Immingham Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam Y2 0-4-0ST 511       03/1883 (New) IMM 08/07/1931 Withdrawn
Steam Y2 0-4-0ST 512       03/1883 (New) IMM 08/07/1931 Withdrawn
Steam B5 4-6-0 181       01/1904 (New) IMM 14/01/1928 LIN Lincoln
Steam B18 4-6-0 196       01/1904 (New) IMM 27/04/1926 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam Q4 0-8-0 144       03/1904 (New) IMM 11/08/1928 ARD Ardsley
Steam Q4 0-8-0 964       12/1910 (New) IMM 01/10/1927 ARD Ardsley
Steam Q4 0-8-0 1181       01/1911 (New) IMM 06/04/1927 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 1203       27/08/1912 IMM 15/01/1926 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O4 2-8-0 1242       12/1912 (New) IMM 06/11/1930 KEA Keadby
Steam O4 2-8-0 1245       12/1912 (New) IMM 09/12/1930 SHF Sheffield Neepsend
Steam O4 2-8-0 1237       01/11/1914 IMM 22/12/1931 KEA Keadby
Steam L3 2-6-4T 272       12/1914 (New) IMM 02/10/1929 SHF Sheffield Neepsend
Steam O4 2-8-0 403       27/04/1917 IMM 12/05/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 1244       06/02/1920 IMM 09/12/1930 SHF Sheffield Neepsend
Steam B3 4-6-0 1164 06/1920 GOR Gorton (New) 22/10/1920 IMM 15/02/1924 KX Kings Cross
Steam B7 4-6-0 36 04/11/1921 NEA Neasden 03/02/1922 IMM 12/01/1923 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam B7 4-6-0 37 04/11/1921 NEA Neasden 03/02/1922 IMM 26/01/1923 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam B3 4-6-0 1168 10/1920 GOR Gorton (New) 04/1922 IMM 06/04/1924 KX Kings Cross
Steam B5 4-6-0 180       19/05/1922 IMM 26/07/1927 DON Doncaster
Steam B5 4-6-0 183       19/05/1922 IMM 05/01/1924 ARD Ardsley
Steam B5 4-6-0 184       19/05/1922 IMM 05/01/1924 ARD Ardsley
Steam B7 4-6-0 38 03/02/1922 GOR Gorton 28/07/1922 IMM 28/01/1923 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam O4 2-8-0 1204       20/10/1922 IMM 05/03/1929 MAR March
Steam O4 2-8-0 1240       20/10/1922 IMM 1923 KEA Keadby
Steam O4 2-8-0 1243 17/02/1917 MEX Mexborough 20/10/1922 IMM 15/11/1929 KEA Keadby
Steam O4 2-8-0 1248       17/11/1922 IMM 06/11/1930 KEA Keadby
Steam O4 2-8-0 1249       17/11/1922 IMM 01/11/1927 CLK Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 1250       17/11/1922 IMM 12/08/1931 KEA Keadby
Steam O4 2-8-0 1252       17/11/1922 IMM 02/02/1923 MEX Mexborough
Steam B3 4-6-0 1169 11/1917 GOR Gorton (New) 01/1923 IMM 08/1923 KX Kings Cross
Steam L3 2-6-4T 273 08/11/1919 ANN Annesley 10/03/1923 IMM 24/06/1929 KEA Keadby
Steam L3 2-6-4T 274 08/11/1919 ANN Annesley 10/03/1923 IMM 31/01/1925 NEA Neasden
Steam L3 2-6-4T 276 20/10/1922 NEA Neasden 10/03/1923 IMM 17/08/1929 MAR March
Steam L3 2-6-4T 337 08/11/1919 ANN Annesley 10/03/1923 IMM 18/02/1943 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam L3 2-6-4T 367 20/10/1922 NEA Neasden 10/03/1923 IMM 24/06/1929 KEA Keadby
Steam B18 4-6-0 195 12/1903 GOR Gorton (New) 27/04/1923 IMM 28/04/1926 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam B3 4-6-0 1167 02/08/1923 KX Kings Cross 12/1923 IMM 05/08/1924 KX Kings Cross
Steam O4 2-8-0 334 15/01/1912 GOR Gorton 06/01/1924 IMM 04/09/1934 FRO Frodingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 352 08/1912 GOR Gorton (New) 06/01/1924 IMM 04/11/1930 KEA Keadby
Steam O4 2-8-0 379 18/11/1921 GOR Gorton 06/01/1924 IMM 20/05/1937 TUX Tuxford
Steam O4 2-8-0 393 03/1914 GOR Gorton (New) 06/01/1924 IMM 23/11/1940 IMM Immingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 395 10/08/1917 GOR Gorton 06/01/1924 IMM 30/08/1940 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 378 17/08/1921 GOR Gorton 09/02/1924 IMM 01/01/1926 SHF Sheffield Neepsend
Steam O4 2-8-0 6345   08/1921 ROD   22/02/1924 IMM 02/03/1929 MAR March
Steam O4 2-8-0 6364 15/02/1924 GOR Gorton 22/02/1924 IMM 17/04/1930 MAR March
Steam O4 2-8-0 1247 12/1912 SHF Sheffield Neepsend (New) 24/02/1924 IMM 17/10/1929 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam O4 2-8-0 6304 23/02/1924 GOR Gorton 01/03/1924 IMM 1928 LIN Lincoln
Steam B5 4-6-0 186 07/01/1924 GOR Gorton 04/03/1924 IMM 07/08/1926 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam O4 2-8-0 1246 12/1912 SHF Sheffield Neepsend (New) 26/03/1924 IMM 04/07/1925 MAR March
Steam O4 2-8-0 6340 29/03/1924 GOR Gorton 08/04/1924 IMM 04/07/1925 MAR March
Steam O4 2-8-0 6329 29/03/1924 GOR Gorton 12/04/1924 IMM 27/01/1926 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam B5 4-6-0 185 05/01/1924 ARD Ardsley 24/04/1924 IMM 15/08/1924 LIN Lincoln
Steam O4 2-8-0 1206 1920 KEA Keadby 24/04/1924 IMM 01/03/1929 MAR March
Steam B7 4-6-0 5482 22/12/1923 GOR Gorton (New) 03/05/1924 IMM 17/12/1925 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 6348 25/04/1924 GOR Gorton 03/05/1924 IMM 27/10/1928 TUX Tuxford
Steam O4 2-8-0 6339 14/04/1924 GOR Gorton 03/05/1924 IMM 05/06/1930 CLK Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 6334 02/01/1924 GOR Gorton 03/05/1924 IMM 21/05/1944 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 6297 25/04/1924 GOR Gorton 03/05/1924 IMM 15/12/1926 SHF Sheffield Neepsend
Steam B7 4-6-0 5469 14/07/1922 WFD Woodford Halse 10/05/1924 IMM 18/07/1929 GOR Gorton
Steam B5 4-6-0 1068 05/01/1924 ARD Ardsley 22/05/1924 IMM 22/02/1926 COP Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam B7 4-6-0 5484 01/03/1924 GOR Gorton (New) 30/05/1924 IMM 05/06/1926 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 1240 1923 KEA Keadby 09/06/1924 IMM 18/01/1929 TUX Tuxford
Steam O4 2-8-0 5966 14/10/1921 GOR Gorton 05/07/1924 IMM 18/12/1926 SHF Sheffield Neepsend
Steam O4 2-8-0 6246 04/07/1925 MAR March 09/07/1925 IMM 27/10/1927 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O4 2-8-0 6340 04/07/1925 MAR March 09/07/1925 IMM 05/10/1941 Withdrawn
Steam B5 4-6-0 6071 26/02/1924 DON Doncaster 18/07/1925 IMM 18/07/1928 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam O4 2-8-0 6512 01/10/1925 GOR Gorton 07/10/1925 IMM 07/05/1941 GRA Grantham
Steam B5 4-6-0 5184 16/04/1924 GOR Gorton 08/10/1925 IMM 06/08/1926 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam O4 2-8-0 6538 06/10/1925 GOR Gorton 15/10/1925 IMM 10/04/1930 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam O4 2-8-0 6515 13/10/1925 GOR Gorton 22/10/1925 IMM 11/06/1932 KEA Keadby
Steam O4 2-8-0 6500 15/10/1925 GOR Gorton 24/10/1925 IMM 21/10/1940 DON Doncaster
Steam B7 4-6-0 477 28/06/1924 NEA Neasden 19/11/1925 IMM 27/06/1927 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 6203 15/01/1926 LNG Langwith Junction 29/01/1926 IMM 28/02/1931 SHF Sheffield Neepsend
Steam O4 2-8-0 6329 27/01/1926 LNG Langwith Junction 06/02/1926 IMM 08/09/1944 MAR March
Steam B7 4-6-0 5459 25/11/1921 NEA Neasden 20/02/1926 IMM 18/07/1929 NEA Neasden
Steam B5 4-6-0 6068 22/02/1926 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 27/04/1926 IMM 26/07/1927 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 5026 30/01/1924 MEX Mexborough 20/10/1926 IMM 24/12/1926 MEX Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 5069 06/12/1918 MEX Mexborough 20/10/1926 IMM 24/12/1926 MEX Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 5005 02/02/1924 MEX Mexborough 20/10/1926 IMM 24/12/1926 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 5133 19/01/1917 MEX Mexborough 26/10/1926 IMM 29/12/1926 MEX Mexborough
Steam J39 0-6-0 1484       30/11/1926 (New) IMM 13/10/1927 STR Stratford
Steam J39 0-6-0 1492       02/12/1926 (New) IMM 28/02/1940 DON Doncaster
Steam J39 0-6-0 1493       03/12/1926 (New) IMM 13/02/1931 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1494       10/12/1926 (New) IMM 16/06/1929 LIN Lincoln
Steam J39 0-6-0 1495       14/12/1926 (New) IMM 16/06/1929 LIN Lincoln
Steam J39 0-6-0 1265       13/05/1927 (New) IMM 13/10/1927 STR Stratford
Steam B3 4-6-0 6168 16/04/1927 GOR Gorton 14/05/1927 IMM 20/07/1928 NEA Neasden
Steam J39 0-6-0 1266       18/05/1927 (New) IMM 14/10/1927 STR Stratford
Steam J39 0-6-0 1267       20/05/1927 (New) IMM 14/10/1927 STR Stratford
Steam J39 0-6-0 1272       25/05/1927 (New) IMM 04/07/1929 ARD Ardsley
Steam J39 0-6-0 1273       28/05/1927 (New) IMM 26/07/1930 LIN Lincoln
Steam J39 0-6-0 1268       28/05/1927 (New) IMM 14/10/1927 STR Stratford
Steam J39 0-6-0 1269       30/05/1927 (New) IMM 08/10/1927 STR Stratford
Steam J39 0-6-0 1274       30/05/1927 (New) IMM 17/02/1928 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 1817       03/06/1927 IMM 07/01/1931 KEA Keadby
Steam J39 0-6-0 1277       08/06/1927 (New) IMM 05/08/1932 DON Doncaster
Steam J39 0-6-0 1275       09/06/1927 (New) IMM 19/06/1929 LIN Lincoln
Steam J39 0-6-0 1281       10/06/1927 (New) IMM 14/12/1929 LIN Lincoln
Steam J39 0-6-0 1282       16/06/1927 (New) IMM 22/06/1935 LIN Lincoln
Steam O4 2-8-0 1816       23/06/1927 IMM 27/02/1930 KEA Keadby
Steam B7 4-6-0 5072 25/05/1921 GOR Gorton 26/06/1927 IMM 09/05/1929 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 6571   06/1920 ROD   25/07/1927 IMM 01/09/1934 FRO Frodingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 2879   08/1921 ROD   11/08/1927 IMM 05/11/1929 NEA Neasden
Steam J39 0-6-0 1298       02/09/1927 (New) IMM 20/02/1928 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 6572 12/05/1927 ARD Ardsley 10/09/1927 IMM 27/02/1930 KEA Keadby
Steam O4 2-8-0 1833       16/09/1927 IMM 30/08/1940 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 6621       29/09/1927 IMM 25/11/1940 IMM Immingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 1886       30/09/1927 IMM 21/10/1940 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6622       19/10/1927 IMM 21/01/1930 TUX Tuxford
Steam O4 2-8-0 6639   08/1921 ROD   09/11/1927 IMM 22/11/1940 IMM Immingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 6629       24/11/1927 IMM 07/02/1934 TUX Tuxford
Steam J39 0-6-0 1270 06/02/1928 NPT Newport (Teeside) 10/02/1928 IMM 18/03/1939 SHF Sheffield Neepsend
Steam B19 4-6-0 5427 03/1913 GOR Gorton (New) 25/04/1928 IMM 15/12/1928 GOR Gorton
Steam B3 4-6-0 6164 23/02/1927 GOR Gorton 12/12/1928 IMM 06/12/1930 NEA Neasden
Steam B3 4-6-0 6165 28/03/1927 GOR Gorton 15/12/1928 IMM 14/11/1931 NEA Neasden
Steam O4 2-8-0 6240 18/01/1929 TUX Tuxford 02/02/1929 IMM 20/12/1932 TUX Tuxford
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5062 13/05/1928 MAR March 02/03/1929 IMM 10/06/1929 KEA Keadby
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6177 15/07/1925 MAR March 03/03/1929 IMM 20/09/1929 KEA Keadby
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5151 02/02/1927 MAR March 08/03/1929 IMM 13/06/1929 KEA Keadby
Steam B5 4-6-0 5184 06/08/1926 WFD Woodford Halse 30/05/1929 IMM 24/07/1930 LIN Lincoln
Steam O4 2-8-0 6374 16/01/1925 DON Doncaster 30/05/1929 IMM 16/10/1941 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O4 2-8-0 6215 23/09/1912 ANN Annesley 04/06/1929 IMM 23/07/1931 KEA Keadby
Steam O4 2-8-0 6223 10/1912 ANN Annesley (New) 06/06/1929 IMM 16/06/1931 KEA Keadby
Steam J39 0-6-0 2704 04/09/1928 DON Doncaster (New) 10/07/1929 IMM 21/09/1929 DON Doncaster
Steam B7 4-6-0 5467 14/01/1928 NEA Neasden 16/07/1929 IMM 03/05/1943 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam B7 4-6-0 5478 20/10/1923 GOR Gorton (New) 19/07/1929 IMM 03/05/1943 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam J39 0-6-0 1494 16/06/1929 LIN Lincoln 29/07/1929 IMM 23/01/1944 LIN Lincoln
Steam J39 0-6-0 1272 04/07/1929 ARD Ardsley 19/08/1929 IMM 26/07/1930 LIN Lincoln
Steam O4 2-8-0 6517 07/11/1925 WFD Woodford Halse 03/09/1929 IMM 10/06/1939 RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam O4 2-8-0 6278 07/04/1927 WFD Woodford Halse 14/09/1929 IMM 27/09/1929 KEA Keadby
Steam O4 2-8-0 6366 05/04/1927 WFD Woodford Halse 25/10/1929 IMM 14/04/1932 KEA Keadby
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5085 10/1922 KEA Keadby 29/10/1929 IMM 11/06/1932 KEA Keadby
Steam J39 0-6-0 1495 16/06/1929 LIN Lincoln 30/10/1929 IMM 03/09/1930 MAR March
Steam L3 2-6-4T 5369 29/06/1929 NEA Neasden 05/11/1929 IMM 20/09/1932 FRO Frodingham
Steam L3 2-6-4T 5367 24/06/1929 KEA Keadby 21/11/1929 IMM 29/10/1937 MEX Mexborough
Steam L3 2-6-4T 5273 24/06/1929 KEA Keadby 30/11/1929 IMM 15/09/1932 FRO Frodingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 6362 13/12/1924 DON Doncaster 07/12/1929 IMM 17/03/1932 KEA Keadby
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5139 02/1904 KEA Keadby (New) 10/01/1930 IMM 11/06/1932 KEA Keadby
Steam O4 2-8-0 6642 28/11/1928 WFD Woodford Halse 20/02/1930 IMM 24/02/1930 TUX Tuxford
Steam O4 2-8-0 6348 27/10/1928 TUX Tuxford 26/03/1930 IMM 05/10/1941 Withdrawn
Steam B3 4-6-0 6169 02/03/1929 NEA Neasden 15/05/1930 IMM 20/03/1933 NEA Neasden
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6144 04/1907 KEA Keadby (New) 02/08/1930 IMM 07/01/1938 Withdrawn
Steam B5 4-6-0 5184 24/07/1930 LIN Lincoln 25/09/1930 IMM 06/07/1937 LIN Lincoln
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5162 1922 KEA Keadby 12/10/1930 IMM 08/01/1938 MEX Mexborough
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5057 1922 KEA Keadby 30/10/1930 IMM 09/08/1943 RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam O4 2-8-0 5404 10/10/1929 KEA Keadby 01/11/1930 IMM 04/03/1931 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5063 07/1909 KEA Keadby (New) 01/11/1930 IMM 22/06/1936 Withdrawn
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5163 10/10/1929 KEA Keadby 12/12/1930 IMM 03/05/1942 LIN Lincoln
Steam L3 2-6-4T 5276 17/08/1929 MAR March 16/03/1931 IMM 18/01/1941 NEA Neasden
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6140 11/09/1929 KEA Keadby 25/03/1931 IMM 04/10/1941 CLK Colwick
Steam B7 4-6-0 5073 25/06/1921 GOR Gorton 23/06/1931 IMM 09/08/1931 GOR Gorton
Steam L3 2-6-4T 5336 14/10/1921 NEA Neasden 24/06/1931 IMM 26/10/1939 NEA Neasden
Steam O4 2-8-0 6278 27/09/1929 KEA Keadby 29/06/1931 IMM 09/01/1944 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam B3 4-6-0 6167 14/06/1929 NEA Neasden 16/07/1931 IMM 16/12/1932 NEA Neasden
Steam B5 4-6-0 6070 30/06/1931 LIN Lincoln 21/07/1931 IMM 07/07/1937 LIN Lincoln
Steam J39 0-6-0 2967       29/10/1931 (New) IMM 06/11/1931 LIN Lincoln
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5956 08/1910 KEA Keadby (New) 07/11/1931 IMM 04/07/1939 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 6568 27/02/1930 KEA Keadby 17/03/1932 IMM 11/06/1932 FRO Frodingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 6518 10/10/1929 KEA Keadby 09/04/1932 IMM 11/06/1932 FRO Frodingham
Steam B3 4-6-0 6165 14/11/1931 NEA Neasden 03/06/1932 IMM 21/04/1933 NEA Neasden
Steam B7 4-6-0 5078 30/07/1921 GOR Gorton 27/08/1932 IMM 20/10/1932 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1277 05/08/1932 DON Doncaster 09/09/1932 IMM 27/11/1934 SHF Sheffield Neepsend
Steam B4 4-6-0 6095 24/10/1932 NEA Neasden 15/12/1932 IMM 09/05/1933 MAR March
Steam C5 4-4-2 5259 28/11/1932 LIN Lincoln 28/12/1932 IMM 11/04/1947 Withdrawn
Steam B4 4-6-0 6103 30/01/1933 MEX Mexborough 16/03/1933 IMM 03/06/1933 MAR March
Steam B4 4-6-0 6101 29/05/1925 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 18/03/1933 IMM 24/08/1933 COP Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam B19 4-6-0 5426 09/09/1930 SHF Sheffield Neepsend 04/05/1933 IMM 27/02/1935 SHF Sheffield Neepsend
Steam C5 4-4-2 5258 08/04/1921 LEI Leicester (G.C.) 17/05/1933 IMM 31/12/1946 Withdrawn
Steam C5 4-4-2 5365 17/09/1920 LEI Leicester (G.C.) 17/05/1933 IMM 25/08/1947 Withdrawn
Steam C5 4-4-2 5364 28/01/1932 LEI Leicester (G.C.) 27/05/1933 IMM 31/12/1947 Withdrawn
Steam B19 4-6-0 5425 02/1913 GOR Gorton (New) 10/06/1933 IMM 22/02/1935 SHF Sheffield Neepsend
Steam B3 4-6-0 6169 20/03/1933 NEA Neasden 17/06/1933 IMM 18/09/1933 GOR Gorton
Steam B19 4-6-0 5423 09/12/1930 SHF Sheffield Neepsend 27/06/1933 IMM 21/11/1942 SHF Sheffield Neepsend
Steam B19 4-6-0 5428 24/05/1924 GOR Gorton 19/07/1933 IMM 18/02/1935 SHF Sheffield Neepsend
Steam O4 2-8-0 6558 03/05/1928 DON Doncaster 19/09/1933 IMM 11/01/1939 RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam O4 2-8-0 6562 25/10/1927 DON Doncaster 22/09/1933 IMM 23/11/1940 IMM Immingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 6563 17/02/1928 DON Doncaster 22/09/1933 IMM 18/10/1941 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 6629 07/02/1934 TUX Tuxford 07/05/1934 IMM 22/11/1940 IMM Immingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 6367 09/02/1924 GOR Gorton 01/01/1935 IMM 28/02/1940 HTN Heaton
Steam B3 4-6-0 6165 06/12/1934 GOR Gorton 21/02/1935 IMM 07/12/1935 NEA Neasden
Steam B3 4-6-0 6167 01/02/1935 GOR Gorton 01/03/1935 IMM 29/11/1938 NEA Neasden
Steam B3 4-6-0 6164 05/12/1934 GOR Gorton 13/04/1935 IMM 24/07/1939 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam B3 4-6-0 6169 18/09/1933 GOR Gorton 11/12/1935 IMM 21/07/1939 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam B7 4-6-0 5476 01/12/1925 GOR Gorton 01/01/1936 IMM 29/06/1938 GOR Gorton
Steam B7 4-6-0 5477 27/06/1927 GOR Gorton 05/01/1936 IMM 05/07/1942 LIN Lincoln
Steam L3 2-6-4T 5368 30/05/1934 MEX Mexborough 24/01/1936 IMM 13/03/1943 GOR Gorton
Steam B5 4-6-0 5187 28/07/1922 LIN Lincoln 30/06/1936 IMM 18/03/1940 MEX Mexborough
Steam B5 4-6-0 6072 02/01/1931 LIN Lincoln 15/12/1936 IMM 15/03/1940 DON Doncaster
Steam B5 4-6-0 5181 14/01/1928 LIN Lincoln 03/02/1937 IMM 18/03/1940 MEX Mexborough
Steam B4 4-6-0 6104 03/10/1935 LIN Lincoln 06/07/1937 IMM 03/09/1937 LIN Lincoln
Steam B4 4-6-0 6095 09/1935 LIN Lincoln 07/07/1937 IMM 02/09/1937 LIN Lincoln
Steam B5 4-6-0 6070 07/07/1937 LIN Lincoln 02/09/1937 IMM 16/05/1938 LIN Lincoln
Steam B5 4-6-0 5184 06/07/1937 LIN Lincoln 03/09/1937 IMM 15/03/1940 DON Doncaster
Steam L3 2-6-4T 5370 23/02/1929 MEX Mexborough 11/11/1937 IMM 20/01/1941 NEA Neasden
Steam O4 2-8-0 6633 08/01/1938 DON Doncaster 17/01/1938 IMM 23/11/1940 IMM Immingham
Steam B3 4-6-0 6165 07/12/1935 NEA Neasden 28/11/1938 IMM 25/07/1939 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam O4 2-8-0 5001 24/11/1933 CLK Colwick 30/12/1938 IMM 07/05/1941 GRA Grantham
Steam B7 4-6-0 5034 13/12/1937 SHF Sheffield Neepsend 17/03/1939 IMM 03/05/1943 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam A7 4-6-2T 1129 21/10/1926 DON Doncaster 03/05/1939 IMM 06/06/1939 DON Doncaster
Steam B19 4-6-0 5426 27/02/1935 SHF Sheffield Neepsend 20/07/1939 IMM 29/05/1942 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam B19 4-6-0 5428 18/02/1935 SHF Sheffield Neepsend 23/07/1939 IMM 13/12/1942 SHF Sheffield Neepsend
Steam B19 4-6-0 5425 22/02/1935 SHF Sheffield Neepsend 24/07/1939 IMM 28/05/1942 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5085 18/06/1932 FRO Frodingham 13/09/1939 IMM 09/08/1943 RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam B7 4-6-0 5473 27/01/1927 NEA Neasden 04/03/1940 IMM 05/07/1942 LIN Lincoln
Steam B7 4-6-0 5035 23/03/1929 GOR Gorton 30/08/1940 IMM 05/07/1942 LIN Lincoln
Steam B7 4-6-0 5475 05/11/1935 GOR Gorton 30/08/1940 IMM 24/10/1943 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 6629 07/05/1934 IMM Immingham 22/11/1940 IMM 21/07/1942 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam O4 2-8-0 6639 09/11/1927 IMM Immingham 22/11/1940 IMM 20/07/1942 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam O4 2-8-0 5393 06/01/1924 IMM Immingham 23/11/1940 IMM 31/01/1943 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 6562 22/09/1933 IMM Immingham 23/11/1940 IMM 21/01/1943 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam O4 2-8-0 6633 17/01/1938 IMM Immingham 23/11/1940 IMM 12/01/1943 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam O4 2-8-0 6621 29/09/1927 IMM Immingham 25/11/1940 IMM 20/07/1942 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6140 05/10/1941 LNG Langwith Junction 16/10/1941 IMM 07/05/1942 LIN Lincoln
Steam B19 4-6-0 5425 28/05/1942 LNG Langwith Junction 19/06/1942 IMM 04/07/1947 Withdrawn
Steam B19 4-6-0 5426 29/05/1942 LNG Langwith Junction 28/06/1942 IMM 21/11/1942 SHF Sheffield Neepsend
Steam B7 4-6-0 5477 05/07/1942 LIN Lincoln 09/08/1942 IMM 03/05/1943 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam B7 4-6-0 5473 05/07/1942 LIN Lincoln 01/11/1942 IMM 29/05/1943 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam B7 4-6-0 5035 05/07/1942 LIN Lincoln 01/11/1942 IMM 03/05/1943 WFD Woodford Halse
Steam B19 4-6-0 5427 22/06/1939 LIN Lincoln 21/11/1942 IMM 14/11/1947 Withdrawn
Steam B19 4-6-0 5424 11/10/1936 LIN Lincoln 13/12/1942 IMM 01/12/1945 Withdrawn
Steam B19 4-6-0 5426 21/11/1942 SHF Sheffield Neepsend 13/12/1942 IMM 22/12/1944 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 6220 10/02/1943 DFU Dunfermline Upper 14/07/1943 IMM 09/01/1944 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O4 2-8-0 6370 02/11/1939 ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill 16/07/1943 IMM 07/09/1944 MAR March
Steam O4 2-8-0 6351 19/08/1924 29B Aberdeen Ferryhill 22/07/1943 IMM 12/05/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 6286 09/1931 ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill 22/07/1943 IMM 07/09/1944 MAR March
Steam O4 2-8-0 6291 03/08/1937 ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill 24/07/1943 IMM 09/01/1944 TUX Tuxford
Steam Q1 0-8-0T 5070 19/12/1943 LNG Langwith Junction 09/05/1944 IMM 15/10/1944 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam Q1 0-8-0T 6077 13/02/1944 LNG Langwith Junction 09/05/1944 IMM 13/09/1944 MEX Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 6631 07/05/1940 WHL West Hartlepool 11/06/1944 IMM 23/09/1962 40E Colwick
Steam Q1 0-8-0T 5048 13/04/1943 LNG Langwith Junction 28/08/1944 IMM 01/10/1944 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O4 2-8-0 6291 09/01/1944 TUX Tuxford 15/10/1944 IMM 12/05/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam B3 4-6-0 6169 24/12/1944 NEA Neasden 16/04/1945 IMM 01/06/1947 LIN Lincoln
Steam B3 4-6-0 6165 24/12/1944 NEA Neasden 16/04/1945 IMM 01/06/1947 LIN Lincoln
Steam B19 4-6-0 5428 11/04/1943 SHF Sheffield Darnall 20/04/1945 IMM 19/04/1947 Withdrawn
Steam B19 4-6-0 5423 11/04/1943 SHF Sheffield Darnall 05/05/1945 IMM 19/04/1947 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 1450 15/09/1944 LIN Lincoln 17/06/1945 IMM 21/10/1945 LIN Lincoln
Steam J39 0-6-0 1494 23/01/1944 LIN Lincoln 17/06/1945 IMM 23/09/1945 LIN Lincoln
Steam J39 0-6-0 2966 09/12/1931 LIN Lincoln (New) 17/06/1945 IMM 09/12/1945 LIN Lincoln
Steam O4 2-8-0 5102 13/12/1940 MEX Mexborough 16/09/1945 IMM 07/07/1946 MEX Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 5133 29/12/1926 MEX Mexborough 16/09/1945 IMM 07/07/1946 MEX Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 6319 24/10/1944 MEX Mexborough 16/09/1945 IMM 12/05/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 6304 18/06/1932 MEX Mexborough 16/09/1945 IMM 12/05/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 5001 21/11/1942 MEX Mexborough 16/09/1945 IMM 12/05/1946 FRO Frodingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 6500 20/08/1944 MEX Mexborough 16/09/1945 IMM 12/05/1946 FRO Frodingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 5405 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster 09/12/1945 IMM 12/05/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 6353 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster 09/12/1945 IMM 12/05/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 6325 03/06/1945 DON Doncaster 09/12/1945 IMM 18/12/1949 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O4 2-8-0 6264 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster 09/12/1945 IMM 12/05/1946 FRO Frodingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 6188 16/08/1912 MEX Mexborough 23/12/1945 IMM 12/05/1946 FRO Frodingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 6200 24/10/1912 MEX Mexborough 23/12/1945 IMM 12/05/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 4734 16/09/1945 LIN Lincoln 22/12/1946 IMM 27/04/1947 LIN Lincoln
Steam J39 0-6-0 4827 09/12/1945 LIN Lincoln 22/12/1946 IMM 27/04/1947 CLK Colwick
Steam J39 0-6-0 4828 06/11/1931 LIN Lincoln 22/12/1946 IMM 27/04/1947 CLK Colwick
Steam J39 0-6-0 4937 15/09/1944 LIN Lincoln 22/12/1946 IMM 27/04/1947 LIN Lincoln
Steam J39 0-6-0 4971 01/07/1945 LIN Lincoln 22/12/1946 IMM 27/04/1947 LIN Lincoln
Steam K2 2-6-0 1720 16/04/1945 CLK Colwick 27/04/1947 IMM 10/07/1955 40F Boston
Steam K2 2-6-0 1722 21/08/1946 CLK Colwick 27/04/1947 IMM 11/03/1951 65A Eastfield
Steam K2 2-6-0 1724 23/08/1946 CLK Colwick 27/04/1947 IMM 10/07/1955 41A Sheffield Darnall
Steam K2 2-6-0 1727 18/08/1946 CLK Colwick 27/04/1947 IMM 06/06/1956 Withdrawn
Steam K2 2-6-0 1728 23/08/1946 CLK Colwick 27/04/1947 IMM 15/03/1953 40F Boston
Steam K2 2-6-0 1733 01/1929 CLK Colwick 27/04/1947 IMM 14/01/1951 65A Eastfield
Steam K2 2-6-0 1735 21/08/1946 CLK Colwick 27/04/1947 IMM 01/05/1949 NWE New England
Steam K2 2-6-0 1739 16/04/1945 CLK Colwick 27/04/1947 IMM 01/05/1949 NWE New England
Steam B1 4-6-0 1079 24/09/1946 GOR Gorton (New) 17/05/1947 IMM 18/06/1962 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 1082 04/10/1946 GOR Gorton (New) 17/05/1947 IMM 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 1195       24/05/1947 (New) IMM 09/05/1965 36C Frodingham
Steam B1 4-6-0 1202       12/06/1947 (New) IMM 29/03/1953 40A Lincoln
Steam B1 4-6-0 1142 27/04/1947 SHF Sheffield Darnall 16/06/1947 IMM 06/12/1959 40E Colwick
Steam B1 4-6-0 1204       19/06/1947 (New) IMM 20/09/1953 35A New England
Steam B3 4-6-0 1498 29/11/1938 NEA Neasden 26/06/1947 IMM 31/12/1947 Withdrawn
Steam B3 4-6-0 1495 13/02/1943 NEA Neasden 28/06/1947 IMM 27/09/1947 Withdrawn
Steam B3 4-6-0 1497 01/11/1945 NEA Neasden 14/07/1947 IMM 14/04/1949 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 3634 27/04/1947 SHF Sheffield Darnall 04/10/1947 IMM 18/12/1949 TUX Tuxford
Steam O4 2-8-0 3692 27/04/1947 SHF Sheffield Darnall 04/10/1947 IMM 18/12/1949 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 3902 27/04/1947 SHF Sheffield Darnall 04/10/1947 IMM 18/12/1949 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 3917 27/04/1947 SHF Sheffield Darnall 04/10/1947 IMM 10/12/1949 FRO Frodingham
Steam D3 4-4-0 2132       01/01/1948 IMM m/e 07/1949 LTH Louth
Steam D3 4-4-0 2139       01/01/1948 IMM m/e 06/1949 Withdrawn
Steam C4 4-4-2 2902       01/01/1948 IMM 01/04/1949 Withdrawn
Steam C4 4-4-2 2903       01/01/1948 IMM 15/06/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 2660       01/01/1948 IMM 4w/e 24/02/1951 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 2661       01/01/1948 IMM 4w/e 24/02/1951 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 2662       01/01/1948 IMM 4w/e 04/11/1950 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 2663       01/01/1948 IMM 5w/e 24/07/1954 40A Lincoln
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 2664       01/01/1948 IMM 4w/e 27/01/1951 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 2665       01/01/1948 IMM 4w/e 04/12/1954 9G Northwich
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 2666       01/01/1948 IMM 4w/e 04/11/1950 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 2667       01/01/1948 IMM 4w/e 27/01/1951 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 2668       01/01/1948 IMM 4w/e 02/12/1950 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 2669       01/01/1948 IMM 4w/e 02/12/1950 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 2670       01/01/1948 IMM 4w/e 21/11/1953 40B Immingham
Steam J62 0-6-0ST 8203       01/01/1948 IMM m/e 02/1949 Withdrawn
Steam J63 0-6-0T 8208       01/01/1948 IMM m/e 10/1953 Withdrawn
Steam J63 0-6-0T 8209       01/01/1948 IMM 4w/e 26/01/1952 6E Wrexham Rhosddu
Steam J63 0-6-0T 8210       01/01/1948 IMM 25/02/1957 Withdrawn
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8006       01/01/1948 IMM 4w/e 11/08/1956 17D Rowsley
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8009       01/01/1948 IMM w/e 20/02/1960 40E Colwick
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8012       01/01/1948 IMM w/e 03/10/1959 17C Rowsley
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8013       01/01/1948 IMM 4w/e 29/12/1951 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8018       01/01/1948 IMM w/e 15/04/1961 40E Colwick
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8020       01/01/1948 IMM 3w/e 12/11/1955 36A Doncaster
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8022       01/01/1948 IMM 3w/e 12/11/1955 36A Doncaster
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8026       01/01/1948 IMM 4w/e 19/07/1958 41J Langwith Junction
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8028       01/01/1948 IMM w/e 13/12/1958 40E Colwick
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8030       01/01/1948 IMM 4w/e 29/12/1951 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8033       01/01/1948 IMM 4w/e 08/03/1958 38A Colwick
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8034       01/01/1948 IMM 4w/e 29/12/1951 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8068       01/01/1948 IMM 4w/e 18/05/1957 39A Gorton
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8069       01/01/1948 IMM 4w/e 08/02/1958 36A Doncaster
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8070       01/01/1948 IMM w/e 20/08/1960 40E Colwick
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8071       01/01/1948 IMM 4w/e 04/11/1950 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8072       01/01/1948 IMM w/e 13/12/1958 40E Colwick
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8073       01/01/1948 IMM w/e 24/01/1959 34B Hornsey
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8074       01/01/1948 IMM w/e 20/08/1960 40E Colwick
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8075       01/01/1948 IMM w/e 24/01/1959 34B Hornsey
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8076       01/01/1948 IMM w/e 13/12/1958 40E Colwick
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8077       01/01/1948 IMM w/e 24/01/1959 34B Hornsey
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 71463       01/01/1948 IMM w/e 20/06/1959 51L Thornaby
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8078       01/01/1948 IMM w/e 20/06/1959 51L Thornaby
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 71464       01/01/1948 IMM w/e 14/07/1962 17C Rowsley
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8079       01/01/1948 IMM w/e 14/07/1962 17C Rowsley
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 71465       01/01/1948 IMM 4w/e 19/07/1958 41J Langwith Junction
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8080       01/01/1948 IMM 4w/e 19/07/1958 41J Langwith Junction
Steam K3 2-6-0 1800       01/01/1948 IMM w/e 07/02/1959 36A Doncaster
Steam K3 2-6-0 1803       01/01/1948 IMM w/e 07/02/1959 36A Doncaster
Steam K3 2-6-0 1806       01/01/1948 IMM 5w/e 15/11/1958 40A Lincoln
Steam K3 2-6-0 1836       01/01/1948 IMM w/e 07/02/1959 41F Mexborough
Steam K3 2-6-0 1837       01/01/1948 IMM 4w/e 08/01/1958 38A Colwick
Steam K3 2-6-0 1838       01/01/1948 IMM 4w/e 16/03/1957 38A Colwick
Steam K3 2-6-0 1842       01/01/1948 IMM 4w/e 24/10/1953 31B March
Steam K3 2-6-0 1845       01/01/1948 IMM 4w/e 18/04/1953 40A Lincoln
Steam K3 2-6-0 1891       01/01/1948 IMM w/e 15/07/1961 40A Lincoln
Steam K3 2-6-0 1912       01/01/1948 IMM w/e 28/10/1961 40A Lincoln
Steam K3 2-6-0 1963       01/01/1948 IMM 4w/e 19/07/1952 40A Lincoln
Steam N5 0-6-2T 9305       01/01/1948 IMM 3w/e 12/11/1955 36B Mexborough
Steam N5 0-6-2T 9309       01/01/1948 IMM 4w/e 25/07/1953 40C Louth
Steam N5 0-6-2T 9322       01/01/1948 IMM 4w/e 25/07/1953 40C Louth
Steam Y3 0-4-0T 8162       01/01/1948 IMM 4w/e 17/07/1951 6E Wrexham Rhosddu
Steam Y3 0-4-0T 8179       01/01/1948 IMM m/e 12/1951 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 1284       06/02/1948 (New) IMM 22/11/1959 40A Lincoln
Steam B1 4-6-0 61318       11/05/1948 (New) IMM 22/09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam O3 2-8-0 3479 18/01/1948 DON Doncaster 30/05/1948 IMM 25/06/1950 36A Doncaster
Steam O3 2-8-0 3480 18/01/1948 DON Doncaster 30/05/1948 IMM 18/03/1951 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam O3 2-8-0 3482 18/01/1948 DON Doncaster 30/05/1948 IMM 25/06/1950 36A Doncaster
Steam B1 4-6-0 61325       03/06/1948 (New) IMM 22/09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61328       16/06/1948 (New) IMM 22/09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90118       m/e 30/11/1949 IMM 5w/e 24/03/1951 36B Mexborough
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90275       m/e 30/11/1949 IMM 4w/e 24/10/1953 40B Immingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 63738 27/10/1946 DON Doncaster 18/12/1949 IMM 23/09/1962 40E Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 63651 16/09/1927 LNG Langwith Junction 18/12/1949 IMM 23/09/1962 40E Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 63802 07/01/1945 FRO Frodingham 18/12/1949 IMM 02/02/1958 36D Barnsley
Steam O4 2-8-0 63819 14/12/1947 TUX Tuxford 18/12/1949 IMM 09/08/1959 40E Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 63836 01/12/1949 DON Doncaster 18/12/1949 IMM 02/02/1958 36D Barnsley
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69800 30/05/1943 NEA Neasden 26/03/1950 40B 23/10/1955 38A Colwick
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69808 15/02/1943 NEA Neasden 26/03/1950 40B 06/08/1950 40F Boston
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69819 15/02/1943 NEA Neasden 26/03/1950 40B 06/08/1950 40F Boston
Steam B1 4-6-0 61365       21/04/1950 (New) 40B 01/11/1953 36A Doncaster
Steam B1 4-6-0 61366       24/04/1950 (New) 40B 17/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61406 20/05/1950 40A Lincoln (New) 21/05/1950 40B 06/02/1966 36A Doncaster
Steam B1 4-6-0 61407       10/06/1950 (New) 40B 13/09/1953 64A St Margarets
Steam B1 4-6-0 61408       13/06/1950 (New) 40B 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61409       15/06/1950 (New) 40B 29/11/1959 40A Lincoln
Steam B1 4-6-0 61190 08/05/1947 DON Doncaster (New) 18/06/1950 40B 10/01/1965 41D Canklow
Steam B1 4-6-0 61191 13/05/1947 DON Doncaster (New) 18/06/1950 40B 21/10/1951 30A Stratford
Steam O4 2-8-0 3586 18/08/1946 DON Doncaster 25/06/1950 40B 09/12/1951 36B Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 63607 18/08/1946 DON Doncaster 25/06/1950 40B 20/09/1953 39B Sheffield Darnall
Steam O4 2-8-0 63692 18/12/1949 DON Doncaster 25/06/1950 40B 23/09/1962 40E Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 3693 07/04/1946 DON Doncaster 25/06/1950 40B 09/12/1951 36B Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 63698 27/10/1946 DON Doncaster 25/06/1950 40B 09/12/1951 36B Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 63593 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster 25/06/1950 40B 09/12/1951 36B Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 3616 03/02/1946 DON Doncaster 25/06/1950 40B 10/04/1960 40E Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 63621 18/08/1946 DON Doncaster 25/06/1950 40B 15/03/1953 40E Langwith Junction
Steam O4 2-8-0 3624 20/10/1947 DON Doncaster 25/06/1950 40B 15/03/1953 40E Langwith Junction
Steam O4 2-8-0 3647 27/10/1946 DON Doncaster 25/06/1950 40B 20/09/1953 38A Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 3657 20/10/1947 DON Doncaster 25/06/1950 40B 20/09/1953 38A Colwick
Steam B1 4-6-0 61372       08/12/1950 (New) 40B 21/10/1951 30A Stratford
Steam B1 4-6-0 61373       26/12/1950 (New) 40B 04/03/1951 35A New England
Steam K2 2-6-0 61740 18/10/1949 NWE New England 07/01/1951 40B 12/06/1960 40E Colwick
Steam Y3 0-4-0T 68171 m/e 06/05/1950 40F Boston 4w/e 20/01/1951 40B 4w/e 21/04/1951 40F Boston
Steam B1 4-6-0 61374       12/02/1951 (New) 40B 22/09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61375       23/02/1951 (New) 40B 21/10/1951 30A Stratford
Steam K2 2-6-0 61730 15/10/1950 32A Norwich Thorpe 11/03/1951 40B 20/08/1957 Withdrawn
Steam Y3 0-4-0T 68171 4w/e 21/04/1951 40F Boston 4w/e 19/05/1951 40B 4w/e 18/08/1951 40F Boston
Steam K2 2-6-0 61736 07/01/1951 40F Boston 20/05/1951 40B 07/05/1957 Withdrawn
Steam K2 2-6-0 61739 07/01/1951 40F Boston 20/05/1951 40B 25/01/1953 62A Thornton Junction
Steam O4 2-8-0 63601 18/01/1948 FRO Frodingham 20/05/1951 40B 20/09/1953 39A Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 63649 29/09/1943 FRO Frodingham 20/05/1951 40B 20/09/1953 38A Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 63832 18/01/1948 FRO Frodingham 20/05/1951 40B 20/09/1953 38A Colwick
Steam B1 4-6-0 61089 28/08/1949 STR Stratford 27/05/1951 40B 24/06/1951 30A Stratford
Steam B1 4-6-0 61373 08/04/1951 31B March 17/06/1951 40B 21/10/1951 30A Stratford
Steam K3 2-6-0 61839 m/e 07/1949 GOR Gorton 5w/e 23/06/1951 40B w/e 07/02/1959 41F Mexborough
Steam K3 2-6-0 61956 m/e 07/1949 GOR Gorton 5w/e 23/06/1951 40B 16/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61379 14/06/1951 38A Colwick (New) 08/07/1951 40B 06/08/1962 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63620 02/09/1951 53A Hull Dairycoates 16/09/1951 40B 20/09/1953 39B Sheffield Darnall
Steam O4 2-8-0 63770 02/09/1951 53C Hull Springhead 16/09/1951 40B 07/12/1958 40E Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 63823 02/09/1951 53A Hull Dairycoates 16/09/1951 40B 09/11/1952 40D Tuxford
Steam O4 2-8-0 63881 02/09/1951 53A Hull Dairycoates 16/09/1951 40B 20/09/1953 38A Colwick
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90052 4w/e 21/04/1951 38B Annesley 5w/e 22/09/1951 40B 4w/e 19/01/1952 38A Colwick
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90001 4w/e 21/04/1951 38B Annesley 5w/e 22/09/1951 40B 5w/e 24/08/1957 31B March
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90346       5w/e 22/09/1951 40B 5w/e 21/06/1952 38A Colwick
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90025 4w/e 20/01/1951 38B Annesley 5w/e 22/09/1951 40B 4w/e 25/07/1953 38A Colwick
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90460 5w/e 24/03/1951 35A New England 5w/e 22/09/1951 40B 5w/e 23/07/1955 38A Colwick
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90492 4w/e 20/01/1951 38B Annesley 5w/e 22/09/1951 40B 5w/e 23/04/1955 40E Langwith Junction
Steam B1 4-6-0 61107 07/05/1950 36A Doncaster 30/09/1951 40B 11/11/1951 36A Doncaster
Steam B1 4-6-0 61098 31/07/1949 STR Stratford 21/10/1951 40B 11/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61130 15/10/1950 30A Stratford 21/10/1951 40B 16/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61144 18/11/1949 STR Stratford 21/10/1951 40B 19/04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61175 07/12/1949 STR Stratford 21/10/1951 40B 16/10/1960 40E Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 63658 12/02/1950 40E Langwith Junction 02/12/1951 40B 20/09/1953 38A Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 63807 02/07/1950 40E Langwith Junction 02/12/1951 40B 15/03/1953 40E Langwith Junction
Steam O4 2-8-0 63900 25/06/1950 40E Langwith Junction 02/12/1951 40B 10/04/1960 40E Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 63908 10/09/1950 40E Langwith Junction 02/12/1951 40B 20/09/1953 38A Colwick
Steam N5 0-6-2T 69287 01/01/1948 TUX Tuxford 4w/e 19/01/1952 40B 5w/e 21/06/1952 40A Lincoln
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69820 23/04/1950 40A Lincoln 10/02/1952 40B 02/12/1956 40A Lincoln
Steam Y3 0-4-0T 68174 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 4w/e 22/03/1952 40B m/e 04/1953 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63729 27/10/1946 CLK Colwick 11/05/1952 40B 20/09/1953 38A Colwick
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68893 01/01/1948 DON Doncaster 5w/e 21/06/1952 40B 4w/e 19/03/1955 30A Stratford
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68926 01/01/1948 DON Doncaster 5w/e 21/06/1952 40B 5w/e 22/10/1955 36A Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 63575 16/07/1950 39A Gorton 18/07/1952 40B 20/09/1953 39A Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 63915 3w/e 31/05/1950 39A Gorton 17/08/1952 40B 20/09/1953 40E Langwith Junction
Steam O4 2-8-0 63666 10/09/1950 36B Mexborough 22/09/1952 40B 05/10/1952 36B Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 63828 28/10/1951 36B Mexborough 22/09/1952 40B 05/10/1952 36B Mexborough
Steam J11 0-6-0 64307 4w/e 18/10/1952 40D Tuxford 4w/e 15/11/1952 40B 04/07/1955 Withdrawn
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 62666 4w/e 04/11/1950 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 14/02/1953 40B 4w/e 25/07/1953 36B Mexborough
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 62667 4w/e 27/01/1951 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 14/02/1953 40B 5w/e 21/03/1953 40F Boston
Steam K2 2-6-0 61739 25/01/1953 62A Thornton Junction 25/03/1953 40B 10/07/1955 41A Sheffield Darnall
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90223       4w/e 18/04/1953 40B w/e 21/02/1959 34E New England
Steam Y3 0-4-0T 68185 01/01/1948 NWE New England 4w/e 16/05/1953 40B m/e 04/1955 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63745 18/01/1948 FRO Frodingham 07/06/1953 40B 20/09/1953 38A Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 63621 15/03/1953 40E Langwith Junction 07/06/1953 40B 20/09/1953 39B Sheffield Darnall
Steam O4 2-8-0 63624 15/03/1953 40E Langwith Junction 07/06/1953 40B 20/09/1953 39B Sheffield Darnall
Steam O4 2-8-0 63807 15/03/1953 40E Langwith Junction 07/06/1953 40B 20/09/1953 38A Colwick
Steam B1 4-6-0 61167 16/06/1947 MEX Mexborough 21/06/1953 40B 04/10/1953 36B Mexborough
Steam B1 4-6-0 61168 16/06/1947 MEX Mexborough 21/06/1953 40B 03/10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68946 01/01/1948 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 25/07/1953 40B 5w/e 23/04/1955 34B Hornsey
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68979 4w/e 21/10/1950 36B Mexborough 4w/e 25/07/1953 40B 4w/e 19/03/1955 34B Hornsey
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90055       4w/e 24/10/1953 40B 4w/e 20/08/1955 40E Langwith Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90131       4w/e 24/10/1953 40B w/e 28/09/1963 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90431 4w/e 20/10/1951 31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953 40B 4w/e 20/08/1955 40E Langwith Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90145 4w/e 22/03/1952 31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953 40B w/e 12/09/1959 41D Canklow
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90175       4w/e 24/10/1953 40B m/e 04/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90203 4w/e 22/03/1952 31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953 40B 4w/e 22/09/1956 31B March
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90029 4w/e 20/10/1951 31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953 40B m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90003       4w/e 24/10/1953 40B w/e 22/07/1961 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90221       4w/e 24/10/1953 40B m/e 01/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90224       4w/e 24/10/1953 40B w/e 22/07/1961 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90275 m/e 30/11/1949 IMM Immingham 4w/e 24/10/1953 40B 4w/e 20/08/1955 40E Langwith Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90280 5w/e 23/06/1951 31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953 40B w/e 28/09/1963 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90035       4w/e 24/10/1953 40B w/e 11/09/1965 36C Frodingham
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90294       4w/e 24/10/1953 40B m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90298 4w/e 22/03/1952 31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953 40B 4w/e 22/09/1956 31B March
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90302       4w/e 24/10/1953 40B 4w/e 20/08/1955 40E Langwith Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90442       4w/e 24/10/1953 40B 3w/e 14/05/1955 33A Plaistow
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90083       4w/e 24/10/1953 40B 4w/e 22/09/1956 31B March
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90087       4w/e 24/10/1953 40B 5w/e 23/04/1955 40E Langwith Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90393       4w/e 24/10/1953 40B w/e 22/10/1960 40E Colwick
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90453       4w/e 24/10/1953 40B 4w/e 22/09/1956 31B March
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90471 4w/e 20/10/1951 31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953 40B w/e 12/09/1959 41D Canklow
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90477 4w/e 20/10/1951 31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953 40B 4w/e 22/09/1956 31B March
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90660       4w/e 24/10/1953 40B 4w/e 20/08/1955 40E Langwith Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90508 4w/e 20/10/1951 31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953 40B 5w/e 23/04/1955 40E Langwith Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90510       4w/e 24/10/1953 40B w/e 22/10/1960 40E Colwick
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 62670 01/01/1948 IMM Immingham 4w/e 21/11/1953 40B 4w/e 25/05/1956 40A Lincoln
Steam S1 0-8-4T 69903 4w/e 23/12/1950 36B Mexborough 4w/e 21/11/1953 40B m/e 03/1954 Withdrawn
Steam S1 0-8-4T 69904 01/01/1948 MEX Mexborough 4w/e 23/01/1954 40B 4w/e 20/03/1954 36A Doncaster
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 68067 4w/e 25/11/1950 39A Gorton 4w/e 20/03/1954 40B w/e 10/01/1959 34B Hornsey
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 68071 4w/e 21/07/1951 39A Gorton 4w/e 20/03/1954 40B 4w/e 18/05/1957 36A Doncaster
Steam B1 4-6-0 61159 14/05/1947 GOR Gorton (New) 13/06/1954 40B 22/09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61182 27/01/1952 39A Gorton 13/06/1954 40B 17/02/1957 30A Stratford
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69813 23/04/1950 40A Lincoln 26/09/1954 40B 02/01/1955 40A Lincoln
Steam K2 2-6-0 61742 13/09/1953 40A Lincoln 10/10/1954 40B 07/11/1954 40F Boston
Steam B1 4-6-0 61390 29/06/1952 38A Colwick 24/10/1954 40B 13/12/1959 36A Doncaster
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69815 16/01/1949 LNG Langwith Junction 07/11/1954 40B 11/09/1955 39A Gorton
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12127 15/11/1952 31B March (New) 6w/e 25/12/1954 40B 5w/e 17/12/1955 30A Stratford
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12133 5w/e 24/07/1954 31B March 6w/e 25/12/1954 40B 5w/e 21/01/1956 31B March
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12134 13/12/1952 30A Stratford (New) 6w/e 25/12/1954 40B 5w/e 24/03/1956 30A Stratford
Diesel D3/5 0-6-0 13152       02/02/1955 (New) 40B w/e 04/12/1965 16D Nottingham
Diesel D3/5 0-6-0 13153       07/02/1955 (New) 40B w/e 04/12/1965 16D Nottingham
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69812 24/10/1954 40A Lincoln 13/02/1955 40B 11/03/1956 40F Boston
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69821 24/10/1954 40A Lincoln 13/02/1955 40B 10/07/1955 40E Langwith Junction
Diesel D3/5 0-6-0 13154       17/02/1955 (New) 40B w/e 05/02/1966 16B Colwick
Diesel D3/5 0-6-0 13155       17/02/1955 (New) 40B 17/09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69804 23/04/1950 40A Lincoln 20/02/1955 40B 24/04/1955 40F Boston
Diesel D3/5 0-6-0 13156       02/03/1955 (New) 40B w/e 05/02/1966 16B Colwick
Diesel D3/5 0-6-0 13157       18/03/1955 (New) 40B w/e 05/02/1966 16B Colwick
Diesel D3/5 0-6-0 13158       25/03/1955 (New) 40B 4w/e 18/02/1956 34A Kings Cross
Steam Y3 0-4-0T 68169 01/01/1948 GOR Gorton 5w/e 23/04/1955 40B m/e 07/1955 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61248 19/12/1954 40A Lincoln 08/05/1955 40B 19/02/1956 40A Lincoln
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90443 4w/e 19/03/1955 33A Plaistow 3w/e 14/05/1955 40B m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90668 4w/e 19/03/1955 33A Plaistow 3w/e 14/05/1955 40B w/e 07/03/1964 41D Canklow
Steam K3 2-6-0 61852 4w/e 19/06/1954 40A Lincoln 3w/e 14/05/1955 40B 4w/e 08/01/1958 38A Colwick
Steam K3 2-6-0 61950 4w/e 23/10/1954 40A Lincoln 3w/e 14/05/1955 40B w/e 24/12/1960 40E Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 63615 05/10/1947 LNG Langwith Junction 24/07/1955 40B 23/09/1962 40E Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 63750 25/06/1950 40E Langwith Junction 24/07/1955 40B 10/04/1960 40E Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 63644 06/05/1951 40E Langwith Junction 24/07/1955 40B 10/04/1960 40E Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 63665 07/04/1946 LNG Langwith Junction 24/07/1955 40B 26/02/1956 40D Tuxford
Steam O4 2-8-0 63759 23/02/1949 LNG Langwith Junction 24/07/1955 40B 23/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63837 20/05/1951 40E Langwith Junction 24/07/1955 40B 23/09/1962 40E Colwick
Diesel D3/5 0-6-0 13159       12/08/1955 (New) 40B 4w/e 18/02/1956 34A Kings Cross
Diesel D3/5 0-6-0 13160       16/08/1955 (New) 40B 4w/e 18/02/1956 34A Kings Cross
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69803 29/10/1950 40F Boston 28/08/1955 40B 24/06/1956 40E Langwith Junction
Diesel D3/5 0-6-0 13161       07/09/1955 (New) 40B 4w/e 18/02/1956 34A Kings Cross
Diesel D3/5 0-6-0 13162       16/09/1955 (New) 40B 2w/e 30/09/1955 30A Stratford
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11108 w/e 23/10/1954 34A Kings Cross 5w/e 22/10/1955 40B w/e 19/10/1963 40E Colwick
Steam N5 0-6-2T 69261 3w/e 31/05/1950 40F Boston 3w/e 12/11/1955 40B 4w/e 16/03/1957 40E Langwith Junction
Steam N5 0-6-2T 69269 4w/e 18/04/1953 38D Staveley (G.C.) 3w/e 12/11/1955 40B 5w/e 24/03/1956 40F Boston
Steam N5 0-6-2T 69297 01/01/1948 MEX Mexborough 3w/e 12/11/1955 40B 4w/e 25/08/1956 36D Barnsley
Diesel DES1 0-6-0 15001 m/e 11/1945 MAR March 5w/e 21/01/1956 40B 4w/e 18/02/1956 31B March
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11152       10/02/1956 (New) 40B w/e 01/05/1965 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11153       17/02/1956 (New) 40B w/e 01/05/1965 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68950 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 4w/e 18/02/1956 40B m/e 21/07/1956 38A Colwick
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68963 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 4w/e 18/02/1956 40B 4w/e 25/08/1956 36A Doncaster
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68965 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 4w/e 18/02/1956 40B 4w/e 15/12/1956 36C Frodingham
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68967 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 4w/e 18/02/1956 40B 4w/e 22/09/1956 38A Colwick
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68977 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 4w/e 18/02/1956 40B 5w/e 19/01/1957 36C Frodingham
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69808 06/08/1950 40F Boston 19/02/1956 40B 26/02/1956 40F Boston
Steam B1 4-6-0 61281 27/01/1948 LIN Lincoln (New) 19/02/1956 40B 01/06/1958 38A Colwick
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69813 19/02/1956 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 26/02/1956 40B 02/12/1956 40A Lincoln
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11154       06/03/1956 (New) 40B w/e 24/02/1962 40A Lincoln
Diesel D1/3 0-4-0 11507       06/03/1956 (New) 40B 4w/e 16/02/1957 30A Stratford
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69816 29/10/1950 40F Boston 11/03/1956 40B 09/12/1956 40A Lincoln
Steam N5 0-6-2T 69369 3w/e 12/11/1955 40F Boston 5w/e 24/03/1956 40B m/e 02/1957 Withdrawn
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11126 5w/e 22/10/1955 30A Stratford w/e 25/05/1956 40B w/e 11/10/1958 5B Crewe South
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 11117 17/01/1956 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street (New) w/e 25/05/1956 40B w/e 21/01/1967 12C Barrow in Furness
Diesel D1/3 0-4-0 11508       28/05/1956 (New) 40B 5w/e 19/01/1957 30A Stratford
Steam O4 2-8-0 63708 13/06/1954 39B Sheffield Darnall 16/09/1956 40B 23/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63860 03/02/1946 SHF Sheffield Darnall 16/09/1956 40B 10/04/1960 40E Colwick
Diesel 05 0-6-0 11177 4w/e 22/09/1956 40A Lincoln 4w/e 15/12/1956 40B w/e 17/03/1962 40A Lincoln
Steam C12 4-4-2T 67398 01/01/1948 LTH Louth 4w/e 15/12/1956 40B 4w/e 16/02/1957 35A New England
Steam J11 0-6-0 64320       4w/e 15/12/1956 40B 19/10/1957 Withdrawn
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11124 5w/e 24/03/1956 30A Stratford 4w/e 16/02/1957 40B w/e 11/10/1958 5B Crewe South
Diesel D3/5 0-6-0 13159 4w/e 18/02/1956 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 16/02/1957 40B 17/09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90383 5w/e 23/06/1951 36A Doncaster 4w/e 16/02/1957 40B w/e 22/10/1960 40E Colwick
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90674 5w/e 24/03/1956 36A Doncaster 4w/e 16/02/1957 40B w/e 22/10/1960 40E Colwick
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69821 23/10/1955 38A Colwick 17/02/1957 40B 16/06/1957 40A Lincoln
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69824 30/10/1955 32C Lowestoft 17/02/1957 40B 13/04/1958 34F Grantham
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69826 29/01/1956 32C Lowestoft 17/02/1957 40B 02/06/1958 Withdrawn
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69829 08/01/1956 32C Lowestoft 17/02/1957 40B 30/05/1960 Withdrawn
Diesel 05 0-6-0 11180 12/10/1956 40A Lincoln (New) 4w/e 16/03/1957 40B w/e 17/03/1962 40F Boston
Steam J11 0-6-0 64365       5w/e 20/04/1957 40B 4w/e 08/01/1958 36C Frodingham
Diesel D3/5 0-6-0 13158 4w/e 18/02/1956 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 18/05/1957 40B 19/02/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D3/5 0-6-0 13160 4w/e 18/02/1956 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 18/05/1957 40B w/e 05/02/1966 16B Colwick
Steam J11 0-6-0 64386 4w/e 20/08/1955 38B Annesley 4w/e 18/05/1957 40B 23/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam K2 2-6-0 61778 24/04/1955 40A Lincoln 16/06/1957 40B 09/10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90438 4w/e 23/09/1950 35A New England 4w/e 19/10/1957 40B 4w/e 09/11/1957 40E Langwith Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90088       4w/e 19/10/1957 40B 4w/e 09/11/1957 40E Langwith Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90657       4w/e 19/10/1957 40B 4w/e 09/11/1957 40E Langwith Junction
Steam B1 4-6-0 61143 26/06/1955 40A Lincoln 17/11/1957 40B 24/02/1964 Withdrawn
Diesel D3/5 0-6-0 13161 4w/e 18/02/1956 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 08/01/1958 40B 17/09/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D3/5 0-6-0 13162 2w/e 30/09/1955 30A Stratford 4w/e 08/01/1958 40B w/e 05/02/1966 16B Colwick
Diesel D3/5 0-6-0 13163 20/09/1955 34A Kings Cross (New) 4w/e 08/01/1958 40B 17/09/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D3/5 0-6-0 13164 27/09/1955 34A Kings Cross (New) 4w/e 08/01/1958 40B w/e 04/12/1965 16D Nottingham
Steam K3 2-6-0 61866 4w/e 22/09/1956 38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 08/01/1958 40B w/e 24/12/1960 40A Lincoln
Steam K3 2-6-0 61966 4w/e 14/12/1957 38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 08/01/1958 40B w/e 15/07/1961 40E Colwick
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2020       06/05/1958 (New) 40B w/e 30/07/1966 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2021       27/05/1958 (New) 40B w/e 17/05/1969 40A Lincoln
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2022       27/05/1958 (New) 40B w/e 17/05/1969 40A Lincoln
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90036 5w/e 24/03/1951 38A Colwick 4w/e 13/09/1958 40B w/e 22/10/1960 40E Colwick
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90460 5w/e 23/07/1955 38A Colwick 4w/e 13/09/1958 40B w/e 03/12/1960 40A Lincoln
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90648 4w/e 16/05/1953 38A Colwick 4w/e 13/09/1958 40B w/e 15/08/1959 40E Colwick
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2023 4w/e 13/09/1958 40A Lincoln 4w/e 11/10/1958 40B 5w/e 15/11/1958 40F Boston
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3637       13/11/1958 (New) 40B w/e 26/09/1959 34A Kings Cross
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 68033 4w/e 08/03/1958 38A Colwick 5w/e 15/11/1958 40B w/e 20/12/1958 34B Hornsey
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12123 4w/e 18/02/1956 30A Stratford w/e 22/11/1958 40B 25/06/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12124 4w/e 18/02/1956 30A Stratford w/e 22/11/1958 40B 19/11/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12125 4w/e 18/02/1956 30A Stratford w/e 22/11/1958 40B 28/06/1969 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12126 4w/e 11/10/1958 31B March w/e 29/11/1958 40B 25/11/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12133 4w/e 18/02/1956 30A Stratford w/e 29/11/1958 40B 01/02/1969 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12135 17/01/1953 30A Stratford (New) w/e 29/11/1958 40B 28/06/1969 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90263 4w/e 16/05/1953 38A Colwick w/e 13/12/1958 40B w/e 15/08/1959 40E Colwick
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92039 17/12/1954 35A New England (New) w/e 07/02/1959 40B w/e 23/09/1961 34E New England
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92193 31/05/1958 36A Doncaster (New) w/e 07/02/1959 40B m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92194 30/06/1958 36A Doncaster (New) w/e 07/02/1959 40B w/e 05/12/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92195 30/06/1958 36A Doncaster (New) w/e 07/02/1959 40B w/e 20/06/1964 34E New England
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92196 31/08/1958 36A Doncaster (New) w/e 07/02/1959 40B m/e 12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam K2 2-6-0 61745 15/03/1953 40F Boston 01/03/1959 40B 25/11/1960 Withdrawn
Steam K2 2-6-0 61756 08/01/1950 BOS Boston 01/03/1959 40B 12/06/1960 40E Colwick
Steam K2 2-6-0 61763 09/11/1958 40F Boston 01/03/1959 40B 15/11/1959 34E New England
Steam K2 2-6-0 61766 25/03/1953 40F Boston 01/03/1959 40B 12/06/1960 40E Colwick
Steam K2 2-6-0 61767 27/06/1954 40F Boston 01/03/1959 40B 12/06/1960 40E Colwick
Steam K2 2-6-0 61771 16/03/1958 40F Boston 01/03/1959 40B 04/09/1960 40E Colwick
Steam K2 2-6-0 61773 09/11/1958 40F Boston 01/03/1959 40B 04/09/1960 40E Colwick
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92202 31/12/1958 36A Doncaster (New) w/e 11/04/1959 40B m/e 12/1965 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3707       23/06/1959 (New) 40B w/e 26/09/1959 41A Sheffield Darnall
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3708       30/06/1959 (New) 40B w/e 29/04/1961 34D Hitchin (GNR)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3709       10/07/1959 (New) 40B w/e 29/04/1961 34D Hitchin (GNR)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90162 w/e 20/06/1959 41D Canklow w/e 12/09/1959 40B w/e 09/01/1960 41D Canklow
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90411 w/e 20/06/1959 41D Canklow w/e 12/09/1959 40B w/e 09/01/1960 41D Canklow
Diesel D3/5 0-6-0 D3165 06/10/1955 34A Kings Cross (New) w/e 26/09/1959 40B w/e 04/12/1965 16D Nottingham
Diesel D3/5 0-6-0 13166 12/10/1955 34A Kings Cross (New) w/e 26/09/1959 40B w/e 04/12/1965 16D Nottingham
Steam B1 4-6-0 61248 19/02/1956 40A Lincoln 22/11/1959 40B 10/01/1965 40E Colwick
Steam B1 4-6-0 61026 10/11/1957 40A Lincoln 29/11/1959 40B 06/03/1960 40A Lincoln
Steam B1 4-6-0 61185 11/11/1956 38A Colwick 06/12/1959 40B 11/10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61114 28/02/1954 36A Doncaster 13/12/1959 40B 16/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61235 12/10/1958 32A Norwich Thorpe 03/01/1960 40B 16/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61223 28/02/1960 40A Lincoln 20/03/1960 40B 27/03/1960 40A Lincoln
Steam B1 4-6-0 61317 14/02/1960 40A Lincoln 20/03/1960 40B 16/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90053 4w/e 18/02/1956 38A Colwick w/e 16/04/1960 40B w/e 15/10/1960 36C Frodingham
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90161 4w/e 18/02/1956 38A Colwick w/e 16/04/1960 40B w/e 15/10/1960 36C Frodingham
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90166 4w/e 18/02/1956 38A Colwick w/e 16/04/1960 40B w/e 15/10/1960 36C Frodingham
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90288 4w/e 25/07/1953 38A Colwick w/e 16/04/1960 40B w/e 13/08/1960 40E Colwick
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90394 5w/e 23/07/1955 38A Colwick w/e 16/04/1960 40B m/e 04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63607 01/02/1959 41J Langwith Junction 01/05/1960 40B 23/09/1962 40E Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 63634 27/09/1953 40E Langwith Junction 01/05/1960 40B 23/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63758 01/02/1959 41J Langwith Junction 01/05/1960 40B 24/05/1962 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63643 01/02/1959 41J Langwith Junction 16/05/1960 40B 30/11/1960 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63707 02/07/1950 40E Langwith Junction 16/05/1960 40B 23/09/1962 40E Colwick
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92148 30/09/1957 35A New England (New) w/e 25/06/1960 40B w/e 23/09/1961 34E New England
Steam A5 4-6-2T 69820 02/12/1956 40A Lincoln 10/07/1960 40B 14/11/1960 Withdrawn
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3442 w/e 14/11/1959 34C Hatfield w/e 16/07/1960 40B w/e 12/11/1960 40E Colwick
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3475 w/e 14/03/1959 34C Hatfield w/e 16/07/1960 40B w/e 02/03/1963 41A Sheffield Darnall
Steam K3 2-6-0 61877 w/e 26/03/1960 40A Lincoln w/e 06/08/1960 40B w/e 04/11/1961 40E Colwick
Steam K3 2-6-0 61914 4w/e 19/06/1954 38A Colwick w/e 06/08/1960 40B w/e 23/09/1961 40E Colwick
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90648 w/e 15/08/1959 40E Colwick w/e 13/08/1960 40B w/e 15/10/1960 36C Frodingham
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92197 w/e 02/05/1959 36A Doncaster w/e 17/09/1960 40B m/e 09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70039 w/e 31/01/1959 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 10/12/1960 40B w/e 07/12/1963 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70040 w/e 31/01/1959 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 17/12/1960 40B w/e 07/12/1963 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70041 w/e 31/01/1959 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 24/12/1960 40B w/e 07/12/1963 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam K3 2-6-0 61944 01/01/1948 LIN Lincoln w/e 24/12/1960 40B w/e 20/01/1962 40E Colwick
Steam K3 2-6-0 61974 4w/e 19/02/1955 38A Colwick w/e 24/12/1960 40B 02/07/1962 Withdrawn
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3477 w/e 07/01/1961 34D Hitchin (GNR) w/e 29/04/1961 40B w/e 06/05/1967 30A Stratford
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3478 w/e 07/01/1961 34D Hitchin (GNR) w/e 29/04/1961 40B w/e 11/05/1963 40A Lincoln
Steam K3 2-6-0 61950 w/e 24/12/1960 40E Colwick w/e 15/07/1961 40B w/e 20/01/1962 40A Lincoln
Steam K3 2-6-0 61960 01/01/1948 LIN Lincoln w/e 15/07/1961 40B 16/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70037 w/e 26/11/1960 31B March w/e 30/09/1961 40B w/e 07/12/1963 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70036 w/e 26/11/1960 31B March w/e 07/10/1961 40B w/e 07/12/1963 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70035 w/e 31/01/1959 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 14/10/1961 40B w/e 22/06/1963 31B March
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70038 w/e 26/11/1960 31B March w/e 28/10/1961 40B w/e 07/12/1963 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam K3 2-6-0 61807 5w/e 16/02/1952 40A Lincoln w/e 20/01/1962 40B 04/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam K3 2-6-0 61889 w/e 22/10/1960 40E Colwick w/e 20/01/1962 40B 04/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam K3 2-6-0 61939 w/e 17/12/1960 40E Colwick w/e 20/01/1962 40B 04/11/1962 Withdrawn
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D4087       28/02/1962 (New) 40B w/e 18/05/1963 34E New England
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D4088       02/03/1962 (New) 40B w/e 19/06/1965 40E Colwick
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92144 31/08/1957 35A New England (New) w/e 29/09/1962 40B w/e 09/03/1963 34E New England
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90055 w/e 07/05/1960 34E New England w/e 29/09/1962 40B m/e 03/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90129 w/e 17/06/1961 34E New England w/e 29/09/1962 40B m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90180       w/e 29/09/1962 40B m/e 03/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90185 w/e 07/05/1960 34E New England w/e 29/09/1962 40B m/e 03/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90215 w/e 07/05/1960 34E New England w/e 29/09/1962 40B m/e 04/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90075 w/e 20/02/1960 34E New England w/e 29/09/1962 40B w/e 11/09/1965 36C Frodingham
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90618 w/e 07/05/1960 34E New England w/e 29/09/1962 40B m/e 05/1964 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90490 w/e 11/11/1961 34E New England w/e 29/09/1962 40B m/e 02/1964 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90660 w/e 17/06/1961 34E New England w/e 29/09/1962 40B m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90662 w/e 07/05/1960 34E New England w/e 29/09/1962 40B m/e 08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61056 24/01/1960 41A Sheffield Darnall 04/11/1962 40B 19/04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61003 15/11/1959 36A Doncaster 30/12/1962 40B 26/09/1965 40E Colwick
Steam B1 4-6-0 61145 06/12/1953 36A Doncaster 30/12/1962 40B 10/01/1965 41D Canklow
Steam B1 4-6-0 61365 01/11/1953 36A Doncaster 30/12/1962 40B 11/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61152 23/04/1961 41A Sheffield Darnall 03/03/1963 40B 19/04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92147 30/09/1957 35A New England (New) w/e 09/03/1963 40B m/e 04/1965 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2026 05/09/1958 40A Lincoln (New) w/e 11/05/1963 40B w/e 19/07/1969 40A Lincoln
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12137 w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park w/e 11/05/1963 40B w/e 03/09/1966 31B March
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92034 w/e 25/04/1959 34E New England w/e 22/06/1963 40B m/e 05/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92035 w/e 25/04/1959 34E New England w/e 22/06/1963 40B m/e 02/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92037 08/12/1954 35A New England (New) w/e 22/06/1963 40B m/e 02/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92038 14/12/1954 35A New England (New) w/e 22/06/1963 40B w/e 20/06/1964 34E New England
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92200 30/11/1958 36A Doncaster (New) w/e 14/09/1963 40B w/e 20/06/1964 36A Doncaster
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92201 05/12/1958 36A Doncaster (New) w/e 14/09/1963 40B w/e 20/06/1964 36A Doncaster
Steam B1 4-6-0 61026 06/03/1960 40A Lincoln 22/09/1963 40B 26/09/1965 40E Colwick
Steam B1 4-6-0 61042 21/02/1960 40A Lincoln 22/09/1963 40B 26/09/1965 40E Colwick
Steam B1 4-6-0 61089 27/11/1960 40A Lincoln 22/09/1963 40B 11/07/1965 40E Colwick
Steam B1 4-6-0 61223 27/03/1960 40A Lincoln 22/09/1963 40B 02/01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61251 08/09/1963 36A Doncaster 22/09/1963 40B 19/04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61384 10/04/1960 40A Lincoln 22/09/1963 40B 07/03/1965 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3624 19/09/1958 40E Colwick (New) w/e 19/10/1963 40B w/e 19/06/1965 40A Lincoln
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92039 w/e 22/06/1963 40E Colwick w/e 30/11/1963 40B w/e 20/06/1964 36A Doncaster
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92184 w/e 09/11/1963 34E New England w/e 11/01/1964 40B m/e 02/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92185 w/e 09/11/1963 34E New England w/e 11/01/1964 40B m/e 02/1965 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1564 14/03/1964 41A Sheffield Darnall (New) w/e 02/05/1964 40B w/e 09/01/1965 31B March
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1565 23/03/1964 41A Sheffield Darnall (New) w/e 02/05/1964 40B w/e 24/10/1964 30A Stratford
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1566 23/03/1964 41A Sheffield Darnall (New) w/e 02/05/1964 40B w/e 23/05/1964 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1567 28/03/1964 41A Sheffield Darnall (New) w/e 02/05/1964 40B w/e 09/01/1965 31B March
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1568 28/03/1964 41A Sheffield Darnall (New) w/e 02/05/1964 40B w/e 20/06/1964 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1569 31/03/1964 41A Sheffield Darnall (New) w/e 02/05/1964 40B w/e 23/05/1964 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1758 23/05/1964 41A Tinsley (New) w/e 13/06/1964 40B w/e 24/10/1964 34G Finsbury Park
Steam B1 4-6-0 61179 16/06/1963 36A Doncaster 14/06/1964 40B 10/01/1965 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61389 08/09/1963 36A Doncaster 14/06/1964 40B 09/05/1965 36C Frodingham
Steam B1 4-6-0 61392 08/09/1963 36A Doncaster 14/06/1964 40B 10/01/1965 41D Canklow
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90142 w/e 06/05/1961 26B Agecroft w/e 12/09/1964 40B m/e 12/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90242 w/e 14/12/1963 8L Aintree w/e 12/09/1964 40B m/e 09/1965 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1568 w/e 20/06/1964 34G Finsbury Park w/e 09/01/1965 40B w/e 10/04/1965 31B March
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1569 w/e 23/05/1964 34G Finsbury Park w/e 09/01/1965 40B w/e 09/06/1973 BS Bescot
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5679 22/12/1960 34G Finsbury Park (New) w/e 09/01/1965 40B w/e 11/09/1965 31B March
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5680 w/e 12/05/1962 34G Finsbury Park w/e 09/01/1965 40B w/e 15/05/1965 41A Tinsley
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5681 w/e 12/05/1962 34G Finsbury Park w/e 09/01/1965 40B w/e 10/07/1965 41A Tinsley
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5853 w/e 14/09/1963 34G Finsbury Park w/e 09/01/1965 40B 2w/e 12/10/1974 YK York (North)
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5854 w/e 14/09/1963 34G Finsbury Park w/e 09/01/1965 40B w/e 06/11/1965 41A Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1548 w/e 02/05/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 27/02/1965 40B w/e 28/12/1968 D05 Stoke Division
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1549 w/e 09/01/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 27/02/1965 40B w/e 08/05/1971 41A Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1768 30/10/1964 41A Tinsley (New) w/e 27/02/1965 40B w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1769 22/10/1964 41A Tinsley (New) w/e 27/02/1965 40B w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley
Steam B1 4-6-0 61370 03/04/1960 41D Canklow 28/03/1965 40B 09/05/1965 36C Frodingham
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5851 w/e 10/04/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 15/05/1965 40B w/e 11/09/1965 31B March
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5592 w/e 09/01/1965 34G Finsbury Park w/e 19/06/1965 40B w/e 06/08/1966 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5593 w/e 20/03/1965 34G Finsbury Park w/e 19/06/1965 40B w/e 06/08/1966 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5595 w/e 09/01/1965 34G Finsbury Park w/e 19/06/1965 40B w/e 17/07/1965 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5596 w/e 09/01/1965 34G Finsbury Park w/e 19/06/1965 40B w/e 17/07/1965 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5597 w/e 09/01/1965 34G Finsbury Park w/e 19/06/1965 40B w/e 06/08/1966 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5599 w/e 28/11/1964 34G Finsbury Park w/e 19/06/1965 40B w/e 06/11/1965 41A Tinsley
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5668 w/e 13/03/1965 40A Lincoln w/e 19/06/1965 40B w/e 06/11/1965 41A Tinsley
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5678 15/12/1960 34G Finsbury Park (New) w/e 19/06/1965 40B w/e 17/07/1965 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1875       02/07/1965 (New) 40B w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1882       02/07/1965 (New) 40B w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1884       06/07/1965 (New) 40B w/e 11/10/1969 51L Thornaby
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1879       07/07/1965 (New) 40B w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1883       09/07/1965 (New) 40B w/e 11/10/1969 51L Thornaby
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1885       09/07/1965 (New) 40B w/e 29/01/1966 30A Stratford
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5852 w/e 02/05/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 10/07/1965 40B 2w/e 12/10/1974 MR March
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90569 4w/e 16/03/1957 36A Doncaster w/e 10/07/1965 40B m/e 10/1965 Withdrawn
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5578 w/e 09/01/1965 32B Ipswich w/e 17/07/1965 40B w/e 06/11/1965 41A Tinsley
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5690 w/e 20/02/1965 32B Ipswich w/e 17/07/1965 40B w/e 08/07/1972 81A Old Oak Common
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8022 w/e 02/05/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 07/08/1965 40B 4w/e 28/01/1967 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8023 w/e 02/05/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 07/08/1965 40B w/e 03/12/1966 30A Stratford
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8024 w/e 02/05/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 07/08/1965 40B 4w/e 28/01/1967 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8050 w/e 02/05/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 07/08/1965 40B 4w/e 06/10/1973 TI Tinsley
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8051 w/e 02/05/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 07/08/1965 40B 04/02/1991 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8052 w/e 02/05/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 07/08/1965 40B w/e 11/03/1967 41A Tinsley
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8053 w/e 02/05/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 07/08/1965 40B w/e 03/12/1966 30A Stratford
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1893       13/08/1965 (New) 40B w/e 04/06/1966 41A Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1887       17/08/1965 (New) 40B w/e 09/09/1967 41A Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1898       24/08/1965 (New) 40B w/e 09/09/1967 41A Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1886       26/08/1965 (New) 40B w/e 09/09/1967 41A Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1899       26/08/1965 (New) 40B w/e 09/09/1967 41A Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1900       02/09/1965 (New) 40B w/e 09/09/1967 41A Tinsley
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8056 w/e 02/05/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 18/09/1965 40B w/e 11/03/1967 41A Tinsley
Steam B1 4-6-0 61250 08/09/1963 36A Doncaster 22/09/1965 40B 30/01/1966 36A Doncaster
Steam B1 4-6-0 61058 13/06/1965 36A Doncaster 03/10/1965 40B 10/02/1966 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61384 13/06/1965 36A Doncaster 03/10/1965 40B 09/01/1966 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8013 w/e 15/02/1964 30A Stratford w/e 09/10/1965 40B w/e 08/10/1966 41A Tinsley
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8014 w/e 15/02/1964 30A Stratford w/e 09/10/1965 40B w/e 08/10/1966 41A Tinsley
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8054 w/e 02/05/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1965 40B w/e 03/12/1966 30A Stratford
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8055 w/e 02/05/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1965 40B w/e 03/12/1966 30A Stratford
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8057 w/e 02/05/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1965 40B w/e 11/03/1967 41A Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1551 w/e 10/07/1965 34G Finsbury Park w/e 06/11/1965 40B w/e 08/05/1971 41A Tinsley
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90538 4w/e 16/03/1957 36A Doncaster w/e 06/11/1965 40B w/e 12/02/1966 36A Doncaster
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90364 w/e 12/06/1965 36A Doncaster w/e 06/11/1965 40B w/e 05/12/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90448 w/e 12/06/1965 36A Doncaster w/e 06/11/1965 40B w/e 05/12/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90477 w/e 28/10/1961 36A Doncaster w/e 06/11/1965 40B w/e 12/02/1966 36A Doncaster
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90506 w/e 10/12/1960 36A Doncaster w/e 06/11/1965 40B m/e 01/1966 Withdrawn
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D4059 w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 13/11/1965 40B 12/12/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D4062 w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 13/11/1965 40B w/e 29/11/1969 36C Frodingham
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D4063 w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 13/11/1965 40B w/e 24/10/1970 40A Lincoln
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1894       03/12/1965 (New) 40B w/e 11/12/1965 41A Tinsley
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D4065 w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 11/12/1965 40B w/e 17/05/1969 40A Lincoln
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D4068 w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 11/12/1965 40B 4w/e 31/10/1966 41J Shirebrook
Steam B1 4-6-0 61026 26/09/1965 40E Colwick 19/12/1965 40B 10/02/1966 Withdrawn
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D4073 w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 25/12/1965 40B 25/06/1972 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92145 w/e 06/11/1965 40E Colwick w/e 25/12/1965 40B m/e 02/1966 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2018 w/e 22/08/1964 40E Colwick w/e 01/01/1966 40B w/e 16/07/1966 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2019 w/e 22/08/1964 40E Colwick w/e 01/01/1966 40B w/e 16/07/1966 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2023 w/e 11/01/1964 40E Colwick w/e 01/01/1966 40B w/e 17/05/1969 40A Lincoln
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2024 w/e 17/06/1961 40E Colwick w/e 01/01/1966 40B w/e 31/05/1969 40A Lincoln
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2025 w/e 11/01/1964 40E Colwick w/e 01/01/1966 40B w/e 13/09/1969 40A Lincoln
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2027 w/e 11/01/1964 40E Colwick w/e 01/01/1966 40B w/e 20/07/1968 40A Lincoln
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D4088 w/e 19/06/1965 40E Colwick w/e 01/01/1966 40B 11/08/1968 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90190 w/e 09/10/1965 40E Colwick w/e 01/01/1966 40B m/e 02/1966 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90037 4w/e 18/02/1956 38A Colwick w/e 01/01/1966 40B w/e 12/02/1966 36A Doncaster
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1797 w/e 11/12/1965 41C Wath w/e 29/01/1966 40B w/e 12/10/1968 51L Thornaby
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5533 w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 12/02/1966 40B w/e 20/08/1966 32B Ipswich
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5550 w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 12/02/1966 40B 4w/e 11/07/1970 41A Tinsley
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5552 w/e 19/06/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 12/02/1966 40B 4w/e 11/07/1970 41A Tinsley
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5565 w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 12/02/1966 40B 4w/e 11/07/1970 41A Tinsley
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5578 w/e 06/11/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 12/02/1966 40B w/e 15/04/1967 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5589 w/e 06/11/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 12/02/1966 40B w/e 06/08/1966 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5698 w/e 06/11/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 12/02/1966 40B w/e 16/05/1976 HO Holbeck (MR)
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5842 w/e 01/05/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 12/02/1966 40B w/e 20/08/1966 41C Wath
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5858 w/e 02/05/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 12/02/1966 40B w/e 09/10/1971 41A Tinsley
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5860 w/e 19/06/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 12/02/1966 40B w/e 07/10/1972 31B March
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5543 w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 05/03/1966 40B w/e 25/03/1967 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5558 w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 05/03/1966 40B 4w/e 11/07/1970 41A Tinsley
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5561 w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 05/03/1966 40B w/e 19/11/1966 30A Stratford
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5567 w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 05/03/1966 40B 4w/e 11/07/1970 41A Tinsley
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5579 w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 05/03/1966 40B w/e 25/03/1967 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5586 w/e 20/11/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 05/03/1966 40B w/e 06/08/1966 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5670 w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 05/03/1966 40B 14/12/1998 Withdrawn
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5688 w/e 06/11/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 05/03/1966 40B w/e 08/01/1972 81A Old Oak Common
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5691 w/e 02/05/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 05/03/1966 40B w/e 04/03/1972 52A Gateshead
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5862 w/e 02/05/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 05/03/1966 40B w/e 07/03/1970 41A Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1552 w/e 02/05/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 19/03/1966 40B w/e 08/05/1971 41A Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1801 w/e 11/12/1965 41C Wath w/e 23/04/1966 40B w/e 06/08/1966 D16 Nottingham Division
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1802 w/e 11/12/1965 41C Wath w/e 23/04/1966 40B w/e 06/08/1966 D16 Nottingham Division
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1803 w/e 11/12/1965 41C Wath w/e 23/04/1966 40B w/e 06/08/1966 D16 Nottingham Division
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1804 w/e 11/12/1965 41C Wath w/e 23/04/1966 40B w/e 06/08/1966 D16 Nottingham Division
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1805 w/e 11/12/1965 41C Wath w/e 23/04/1966 40B w/e 06/08/1966 D16 Nottingham Division
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1806 w/e 11/12/1965 41C Wath w/e 23/04/1966 40B w/e 06/08/1966 D16 Nottingham Division
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1885 w/e 26/03/1966 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 23/04/1966 40B w/e 09/09/1967 41A Tinsley
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5525 w/e 25/09/1965 30A Stratford w/e 23/04/1966 40B w/e 12/08/1967 32B Ipswich
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5527 w/e 13/03/1965 30A Stratford w/e 23/04/1966 40B w/e 12/08/1967 32B Ipswich
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5534 w/e 13/03/1965 30A Stratford w/e 23/04/1966 40B w/e 12/08/1967 32B Ipswich
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5559 w/e 10/04/1965 30A Stratford w/e 23/04/1966 40B w/e 12/08/1967 32B Ipswich
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5570 w/e 26/06/1965 30A Stratford w/e 23/04/1966 40B w/e 12/08/1967 32B Ipswich
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5571 w/e 14/08/1965 30A Stratford w/e 23/04/1966 40B w/e 12/08/1967 32B Ipswich
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5574 w/e 13/11/1965 30A Stratford w/e 23/04/1966 40B w/e 12/08/1967 32B Ipswich
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5580 w/e 16/09/1961 31B March w/e 23/04/1966 40B w/e 25/03/1967 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5582 w/e 16/09/1961 31B March w/e 23/04/1966 40B w/e 12/08/1967 32B Ipswich
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5600 w/e 14/01/1961 31B March w/e 23/04/1966 40B w/e 06/08/1966 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5617 w/e 23/06/1962 31B March w/e 23/04/1966 40B w/e 08/10/1966 31B March
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5618 w/e 23/06/1962 31B March w/e 23/04/1966 40B w/e 06/06/1970 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8020 w/e 15/09/1962 34G Finsbury Park w/e 23/04/1966 40B w/e 08/10/1966 41A Tinsley
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8021 w/e 02/03/1963 34G Finsbury Park w/e 23/04/1966 40B 4w/e 28/01/1967 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8025 w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park w/e 23/04/1966 40B 4w/e 28/01/1967 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8026 w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park w/e 23/04/1966 40B 4w/e 28/01/1967 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8027 w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park w/e 23/04/1966 40B 4w/e 28/01/1967 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8045 w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park w/e 23/04/1966 40B w/e 09/09/1967 52A Gateshead
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8046 w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park w/e 23/04/1966 40B w/e 09/09/1967 52A Gateshead
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8047 w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park w/e 23/04/1966 40B w/e 09/09/1967 52A Gateshead
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8048 w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park w/e 23/04/1966 40B w/e 09/09/1967 52A Gateshead
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8049 w/e 30/04/1960 34G Finsbury Park w/e 23/04/1966 40B w/e 02/06/1973 TI Tinsley
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5671 w/e 28/01/1961 34G Finsbury Park w/e 07/05/1966 40B w/e 11/06/1966 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1800 w/e 23/04/1966 41A Tinsley w/e 04/06/1966 40B w/e 11/05/1974 ED Eastfield
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1576 w/e 24/07/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 30/06/1966 40B w/e 29/05/1971 30A Stratford
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1769 w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 30/06/1966 40B w/e 29/10/1966 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1771 w/e 14/05/1966 30A Stratford w/e 30/06/1966 40B w/e 29/05/1971 40B Immingham
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1782 w/e 23/04/1966 30A Stratford w/e 30/06/1966 40B w/e 09/11/1968 41A Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1783 14/11/1964 41A Tinsley (New) w/e 30/06/1966 40B w/e 09/11/1968 41A Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1784 07/11/1964 41A Tinsley (New) w/e 30/06/1966 40B w/e 09/11/1968 41A Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1785 09/12/1964 41A Tinsley (New) w/e 30/06/1966 40B w/e 09/11/1968 41A Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1786 26/11/1964 41A Tinsley (New) w/e 30/06/1966 40B 2w/e 07/07/1973 TI Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1787 w/e 07/05/1966 41A Tinsley w/e 30/06/1966 40B w/e 12/08/1967 40B Immingham
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2299 11/10/1960 40A Lincoln (New) w/e 23/07/1966 40B w/e 02/03/1968 40A Lincoln
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1554 w/e 09/01/1965 31B March w/e 06/08/1966 40B w/e 09/10/1971 D05 Stoke Division
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1555 w/e 09/01/1965 31B March w/e 06/08/1966 40B w/e 09/10/1971 D05 Stoke Division
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1556 w/e 09/01/1965 31B March w/e 06/08/1966 40B w/e 10/03/1973 D05 Stoke Division
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1557 w/e 09/01/1965 31B March w/e 06/08/1966 40B w/e 07/04/1973 D05 Stoke Division
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1558 w/e 09/01/1965 31B March w/e 06/08/1966 40B w/e 09/09/1967 31B March
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1559 w/e 09/01/1965 31B March w/e 06/08/1966 40B w/e 09/09/1967 31B March
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5599 w/e 18/12/1965 31B March w/e 06/08/1966 40B w/e 08/10/1966 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1553 w/e 02/05/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 20/08/1966 40B w/e 08/05/1971 41A Tinsley
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2408 11/02/1957 40A Lincoln (New) w/e 03/09/1966 40B 07/05/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1547 w/e 16/04/1966 41A Tinsley w/e 10/09/1966 40B w/e 28/12/1968 D05 Stoke Division
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1550 w/e 05/03/1966 41A Tinsley w/e 10/09/1966 40B w/e 29/05/1971 30A Stratford
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1531 w/e 16/04/1966 34G Finsbury Park w/e 08/10/1966 40B w/e 25/11/1967 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1533 w/e 24/10/1964 34G Finsbury Park w/e 08/10/1966 40B w/e 25/11/1967 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1534 w/e 09/01/1965 34G Finsbury Park w/e 08/10/1966 40B w/e 25/11/1967 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1535 w/e 06/08/1966 41A Tinsley w/e 08/10/1966 40B w/e 25/11/1967 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1536 w/e 06/08/1966 41A Tinsley w/e 08/10/1966 40B w/e 25/11/1967 41A Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1537 w/e 06/08/1966 41A Tinsley w/e 08/10/1966 40B w/e 25/11/1967 41A Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1538 w/e 06/08/1966 41A Tinsley w/e 08/10/1966 40B w/e 18/03/1967 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5533 w/e 20/08/1966 32B Ipswich w/e 15/10/1966 40B w/e 25/03/1967 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1528 05/07/1963 34G Finsbury Park (New) w/e 29/10/1966 40B w/e 25/11/1967 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8208 w/e 23/06/1962 30A Stratford w/e 19/11/1966 40B w/e 26/11/1966 30A Stratford
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1532 w/e 09/01/1965 34G Finsbury Park w/e 26/11/1966 40B w/e 25/11/1967 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8242 w/e 27/04/1963 30A Stratford w/e 26/11/1966 40B 27/03/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5544 20/08/1959 32B Ipswich (New) w/e 07/01/1967 40B w/e 25/03/1967 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5548 w/e 06/08/1966 31B March w/e 07/01/1967 40B w/e 12/08/1967 32B Ipswich
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5617 w/e 08/10/1966 31B March w/e 07/01/1967 40B w/e 09/05/1970 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8053 w/e 03/12/1966 30A Stratford w/e 07/01/1967 40B w/e 11/03/1967 41A Tinsley
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8054 w/e 03/12/1966 30A Stratford w/e 07/01/1967 40B w/e 11/03/1967 41A Tinsley
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8055 w/e 03/12/1966 30A Stratford w/e 07/01/1967 40B w/e 11/03/1967 41A Tinsley
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5671 w/e 11/06/1966 34G Finsbury Park w/e 25/03/1967 40B 08/04/1991 Withdrawn
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5672 24/11/1960 34G Finsbury Park (New) w/e 25/03/1967 40B 3w/e 12/07/1975 MR March
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5673 01/12/1960 34G Finsbury Park (New) w/e 25/03/1967 40B m/e 30/11/1979 HM Healey Mills
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5674 01/12/1960 34G Finsbury Park (New) w/e 25/03/1967 40B 01/09/1996 Withdrawn
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5675 08/12/1960 34G Finsbury Park (New) w/e 25/03/1967 40B 04/02/2000 Withdrawn
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5676 08/12/1960 34G Finsbury Park (New) w/e 25/03/1967 40B w/e 09/03/1974 FP Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5655 w/e 15/09/1962 30A Stratford w/e 15/04/1967 40B w/e 29/03/1969 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5656 w/e 14/09/1963 31B March w/e 15/04/1967 40B w/e 10/08/1968 31B March
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5657 w/e 14/09/1963 31B March w/e 15/04/1967 40B w/e 12/08/1967 32B Ipswich
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5658 w/e 14/09/1963 31B March w/e 15/04/1967 40B w/e 12/08/1967 32B Ipswich
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3618 4w/e 31/10/1966 41J Shirebrook w/e 22/07/1967 40B w/e 06/07/1968 40A Lincoln
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1527 w/e 29/10/1966 31B March w/e 12/08/1967 40B w/e 25/11/1967 30A Stratford
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1529 w/e 29/10/1966 31B March w/e 12/08/1967 40B w/e 25/11/1967 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1538 w/e 18/03/1967 34G Finsbury Park w/e 12/08/1967 40B 2w/e 07/07/1973 SX Stratford
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1787 w/e 30/06/1966 40B Immingham w/e 12/08/1967 40B w/e 02/06/1973 CE Crewe Diesel
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8052 w/e 11/03/1967 41A Tinsley w/e 12/08/1967 40B 17/11/1990 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8053 w/e 11/03/1967 41A Tinsley w/e 12/08/1967 40B 10/10/1990 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8054 w/e 11/03/1967 41A Tinsley w/e 12/08/1967 40B 2w/e 11/01/1975 TI Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1762 w/e 09/01/1965 31B March w/e 09/09/1967 40B w/e 12/10/1968 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1763 w/e 09/01/1965 31B March w/e 09/09/1967 40B w/e 12/10/1968 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1862 13/05/1965 41A Tinsley (New) w/e 09/09/1967 40B w/e 11/10/1969 55A Holbeck (MR)
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1863 11/06/1965 41A Tinsley (New) w/e 09/09/1967 40B w/e 11/10/1969 55A Holbeck (MR)
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1864 11/05/1965 41A Tinsley (New) w/e 09/09/1967 40B w/e 11/10/1969 55A Holbeck (MR)
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1869 17/06/1965 41A Tinsley (New) w/e 09/09/1967 40B 28/02/2007 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1870 11/06/1965 41A Tinsley (New) w/e 09/09/1967 40B 02/07/1993 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1871 18/06/1965 41A Tinsley (New) w/e 09/09/1967 40B w/e 17/05/1969 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D4089 w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 23/09/1967 40B 18/08/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D4090 w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 23/09/1967 40B 11/08/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D4093 w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 23/09/1967 40B 11/08/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D4094 w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 23/09/1967 40B 11/08/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8055 w/e 11/03/1967 41A Tinsley w/e 07/10/1967 40B w/e 10/08/1968 30A Stratford
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8056 w/e 11/03/1967 41A Tinsley w/e 07/10/1967 40B w/e 10/08/1968 30A Stratford
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8057 w/e 11/03/1967 41A Tinsley w/e 07/10/1967 40B w/e 10/08/1968 30A Stratford
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1500 w/e 09/01/1965 34G Finsbury Park w/e 25/11/1967 40B w/e 23/01/1971 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1501 w/e 02/05/1964 34G Finsbury Park w/e 25/11/1967 40B w/e 27/09/1969 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1502 30/11/1962 34G Finsbury Park (New) w/e 25/11/1967 40B w/e 01/11/1969 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1503 31/12/1962 34G Finsbury Park (New) w/e 25/11/1967 40B w/e 23/08/1969 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1504 03/01/1963 34G Finsbury Park (New) w/e 25/11/1967 40B w/e 16/08/1969 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1505 11/01/1963 34G Finsbury Park (New) w/e 25/11/1967 40B w/e 27/09/1969 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1506 18/01/1963 34G Finsbury Park (New) w/e 25/11/1967 40B w/e 04/10/1969 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1507 18/01/1963 34G Finsbury Park (New) w/e 25/11/1967 40B w/e 23/08/1969 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1508 23/01/1963 34G Finsbury Park (New) w/e 25/11/1967 40B w/e 11/10/1969 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1509 04/02/1963 34G Finsbury Park (New) w/e 25/11/1967 40B w/e 01/11/1969 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5554 w/e 22/06/1963 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 24/02/1968 40B 4w/e 11/07/1970 41A Tinsley
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5657 w/e 12/08/1967 32B Ipswich w/e 24/02/1968 40B w/e 10/08/1968 31B March
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D4056 w/e 06/11/1965 40A Lincoln w/e 02/03/1968 40B w/e 27/12/1969 41J Shirebrook
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5573 w/e 11/03/1967 32B Ipswich w/e 09/03/1968 40B 26/05/2000 Withdrawn
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5619 w/e 23/06/1962 31B March w/e 09/03/1968 40B 4w/e 06/10/1973 FP Finsbury Park
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5551 w/e 11/03/1967 32B Ipswich w/e 11/05/1968 40B 4w/e 11/07/1970 41A Tinsley
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5555 w/e 11/03/1967 32B Ipswich w/e 11/05/1968 40B 4w/e 11/07/1970 41A Tinsley
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5556 w/e 12/08/1967 32B Ipswich w/e 11/05/1968 40B 4w/e 11/07/1970 41A Tinsley
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5559 w/e 12/08/1967 32B Ipswich w/e 11/05/1968 40B 4w/e 11/07/1970 41A Tinsley
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5562 w/e 12/08/1967 32B Ipswich w/e 11/05/1968 40B 4w/e 11/07/1970 41A Tinsley
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5570 w/e 12/08/1967 32B Ipswich w/e 11/05/1968 40B w/e 11/05/1974 TE Thornaby
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5571 w/e 12/08/1967 32B Ipswich w/e 11/05/1968 40B w/e 06/07/1974 TE Thornaby
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5837 w/e 31/07/1965 41C Wath w/e 11/05/1968 40B w/e 07/03/1970 41A Tinsley
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5838 w/e 07/03/1964 41C Wath w/e 11/05/1968 40B w/e 07/03/1970 41A Tinsley
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5839 w/e 24/07/1965 41C Wath w/e 11/05/1968 40B w/e 07/03/1970 41A Tinsley
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3639 25/11/1958 36C Frodingham (New) w/e 06/07/1968 40B w/e 03/05/1969 36A Doncaster
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3427 w/e 29/11/1964 86A Cardiff Canton w/e 10/08/1968 40B 04/09/1977 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3428 w/e 29/11/1964 86A Cardiff Canton w/e 10/08/1968 40B 06/10/1977 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3506 w/e 29/11/1964 82A Bristol Bath Road w/e 10/08/1968 40B 2w/e 09/11/1974 FH Frodingham
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3508 2w/e 15/01/1967 86A Cardiff Canton w/e 10/08/1968 40B m/e 30/11/1979 MR March
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3507 w/e 29/11/1964 82A Bristol Bath Road w/e 17/08/1968 40B w/e 19/02/1972 36C Frodingham
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5602 w/e 20/05/1961 34G Finsbury Park w/e 24/08/1968 40B w/e 28/12/1968 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1882 w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 12/10/1968 40B w/e 08/07/1972 41A Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1885 w/e 09/09/1967 41A Tinsley w/e 12/10/1968 40B 4w/e 06/10/1973 TI Tinsley
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5557 w/e 13/03/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 12/10/1968 40B 2w/e 12/10/1974 TE Thornaby
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1558 w/e 11/05/1968 41A Tinsley w/e 09/11/1968 40B w/e 09/12/1972 D05 Stoke Division
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1559 w/e 11/05/1968 41A Tinsley w/e 09/11/1968 40B w/e 21/04/1973 D05 Stoke Division
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1560 w/e 11/05/1968 41A Tinsley w/e 09/11/1968 40B w/e 02/06/1973 BS Bescot
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1561 w/e 11/05/1968 41A Tinsley w/e 09/11/1968 40B w/e 29/05/1971 30A Stratford
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1836 17/06/1968 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 23/11/1968 40B w/e 06/12/1969 D05 Stoke Division
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12117 4w/e 22/05/1954 53C Hull Springhead w/e 30/11/1968 40B 28/02/1969 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12118 4w/e 22/05/1954 53C Hull Springhead w/e 30/11/1968 40B 25/04/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1833 w/e 23/11/1968 41A Tinsley w/e 28/12/1968 40B w/e 06/12/1969 D05 Stoke Division
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3312 w/e 14/01/1961 34G Finsbury Park w/e 28/12/1968 40B 14/12/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5583 w/e 12/10/1968 31B March w/e 25/01/1969 40B w/e 03/04/1971 30A Stratford
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5660 w/e 09/10/1965 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 25/01/1969 40B w/e 12/01/1974 MR March
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3520 6w/e 13/04/1964 87B Margam w/e 29/03/1969 40B      
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5685 w/e 23/11/1968 30A Stratford w/e 29/03/1969 40B w/e 07/11/1970 41A Tinsley
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3195 9w/e 09/11/1968 87E Landore w/e 05/04/1969 40B w/e 10/10/1970 51L Thornaby
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3549 w/e 29/03/1969 36C Frodingham w/e 12/04/1969 40B 10/02/1992 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3549 4w/e 29/03/1969 91E To Eastern Region w/e 12/04/1969 40B 10/02/1992 Withdrawn
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5577 w/e 12/10/1968 31B March w/e 17/05/1969 40B w/e 12/08/1972 31B March
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5689 w/e 22/02/1964 40A Lincoln w/e 17/05/1969 40B w/e 08/07/1972 81A Old Oak Common
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5801 w/e 17/08/1963 40A Lincoln w/e 17/05/1969 40B w/e 07/03/1970 41A Tinsley
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5802 w/e 24/08/1963 40A Lincoln w/e 17/05/1969 40B w/e 18/09/1971 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5803 w/e 24/08/1963 40A Lincoln w/e 17/05/1969 40B w/e 08/01/1972 81A Old Oak Common
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5828 w/e 26/11/1966 31B March w/e 17/05/1969 40B w/e 07/03/1970 41A Tinsley
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5855 w/e 24/04/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 17/05/1969 40B 2w/e 12/10/1974 MR March
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5856 w/e 18/09/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 17/05/1969 40B w/e 06/05/1972 52A Gateshead
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5859 w/e 15/05/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 17/05/1969 40B w/e 19/05/1973 SX Stratford
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8058 w/e 06/04/1968 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 17/05/1969 40B w/e 08/05/1971 41A Tinsley
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6938 5w/e 24/08/1964 86A Cardiff Canton w/e 24/05/1969 40B 5w/e 14/06/1969 91E To Eastern Region
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5547 w/e 28/12/1968 34G Finsbury Park w/e 07/06/1969 40B w/e 27/03/1971 31B March
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5655 w/e 29/03/1969 34G Finsbury Park w/e 07/06/1969 40B w/e 08/01/1972 81A Old Oak Common
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1565 w/e 11/05/1968 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 14/06/1969 40B w/e 24/03/1973 D02 Birmingham Division
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D4079 w/e 08/02/1969 36A Doncaster w/e 14/06/1969 40B 25/06/1972 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1529 w/e 09/11/1968 52A Gateshead w/e 28/06/1969 40B w/e 24/06/1972 30A Stratford
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5568 w/e 22/02/1969 34G Finsbury Park w/e 05/07/1969 40B w/e 12/08/1972 31B March
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5586 w/e 15/04/1967 34G Finsbury Park w/e 05/07/1969 40B w/e 10/01/1970 41A Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1537 w/e 29/03/1969 52A Gateshead w/e 26/07/1969 40B w/e 24/06/1972 30A Stratford
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D4053 4w/e 31/10/1966 41J Shirebrook w/e 26/07/1969 40B 31/12/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1871 w/e 17/05/1969 34G Finsbury Park w/e 16/08/1969 40B      
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1868 w/e 03/06/1967 34G Finsbury Park w/e 23/08/1969 40B      
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1873 w/e 25/11/1967 34G Finsbury Park w/e 23/08/1969 40B w/e 31/01/1970 30A Stratford
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D4070 w/e 10/09/1966 30A Stratford w/e 13/09/1969 40B w/e 27/12/1969 41J Shirebrook
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1866 w/e 25/11/1967 34G Finsbury Park w/e 27/09/1969 40B 01/04/1999 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1874 w/e 21/05/1966 34G Finsbury Park w/e 27/09/1969 40B w/e 31/01/1970 30A Stratford
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1865 w/e 25/11/1967 34G Finsbury Park w/e 04/10/1969 40B w/e 11/10/1969 55A Holbeck (MR)
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1536 w/e 29/03/1969 52A Gateshead w/e 11/10/1969 40B w/e 02/09/1972 52A Gateshead
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1539 w/e 09/11/1968 52A Gateshead w/e 11/10/1969 40B w/e 15/04/1972 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1539 w/e 09/11/1968 52A Gateshead w/e 11/10/1969 40B w/e 15/04/1972 D05 Stoke Division
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1564 w/e 11/05/1968 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 11/10/1969 40B w/e 07/07/1973 BS Bescot
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1573 w/e 12/10/1968 64B Haymarket w/e 11/10/1969 40B w/e 10/01/1970 52A Gateshead
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1577 w/e 12/10/1968 64B Haymarket w/e 11/10/1969 40B w/e 03/06/1972 52A Gateshead
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1578 w/e 12/10/1968 64B Haymarket w/e 11/10/1969 40B w/e 10/06/1972 52A Gateshead
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1580 w/e 12/10/1968 64B Haymarket w/e 11/10/1969 40B w/e 29/05/1971 30A Stratford
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1581 w/e 12/10/1968 64B Haymarket w/e 11/10/1969 40B w/e 24/06/1972 52A Gateshead
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1867 w/e 03/06/1967 34G Finsbury Park w/e 11/10/1969 40B 30/06/2005 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3320 16/10/1956 50A York (North) (New) w/e 18/10/1969 40B w/e 13/02/1971 30A Stratford
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1775 w/e 28/10/1967 34G Finsbury Park w/e 01/11/1969 40B w/e 06/05/1972 52A Gateshead
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1872 w/e 25/11/1967 34G Finsbury Park w/e 01/11/1969 40B w/e 31/01/1970 30A Stratford
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12122 w/e 26/05/1962 50B Hull Dairycoates w/e 29/11/1969 40B 04/07/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1864 w/e 11/10/1969 55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 06/12/1969 40B w/e 12/10/1974 CD Crewe Diesel
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1865 w/e 11/10/1969 55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 06/12/1969 40B 01/03/1991 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1862 w/e 06/12/1969 41A Tinsley w/e 10/01/1970 40B 31/01/2004 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1863 w/e 06/12/1969 41A Tinsley w/e 10/01/1970 40B 31/08/2005 Withdrawn
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5548 w/e 07/10/1967 41A Tinsley w/e 10/01/1970 40B w/e 29/05/1971 52A Gateshead
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5549 w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 10/01/1970 40B w/e 18/09/1971 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5622 w/e 11/10/1969 41A Tinsley w/e 10/01/1970 40B w/e 09/05/1970 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5677 w/e 09/09/1967 41A Tinsley w/e 10/01/1970 40B w/e 09/05/1970 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1888 w/e 12/10/1968 30A Stratford w/e 31/01/1970 40B w/e 11/05/1974 CD Crewe Diesel
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1889 w/e 12/10/1968 30A Stratford w/e 31/01/1970 40B 01/01/2003 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1896 w/e 12/10/1968 30A Stratford w/e 31/01/1970 40B 4w/e 06/10/1973 TI Tinsley
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5813 w/e 11/05/1968 41A Tinsley w/e 07/03/1970 40B w/e 11/05/1974 TE Thornaby
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5815 w/e 11/05/1968 41A Tinsley w/e 07/03/1970 40B w/e 11/05/1974 TE Thornaby
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5817 w/e 11/05/1968 41A Tinsley w/e 07/03/1970 40B w/e 11/09/1971 D16 Nottingham Division
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5825 w/e 11/05/1968 41A Tinsley w/e 07/03/1970 40B w/e 14/08/1971 D16 Nottingham Division
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5829 w/e 11/05/1968 41A Tinsley w/e 07/03/1970 40B w/e 12/01/1974 TE Thornaby
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5834 w/e 18/03/1967 41A Tinsley w/e 07/03/1970 40B 2w/e 07/07/1973 TI Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1875 w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 28/03/1970 40B w/e 12/05/1973 CE Crewe Diesel
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1876 18/06/1965 41A Tinsley (New) w/e 28/03/1970 40B w/e 12/05/1973 CE Crewe Diesel
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1877 11/06/1965 41A Tinsley (New) w/e 28/03/1970 40B w/e 12/05/1973 CE Crewe Diesel
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1878 11/06/1965 41A Tinsley (New) w/e 28/03/1970 40B w/e 27/02/1971 55G Knottingley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1886 w/e 09/09/1967 41A Tinsley w/e 18/04/1970 40B w/e 12/05/1973 CE Crewe Diesel
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1769 w/e 03/08/1968 51L Thornaby w/e 02/05/1970 40B w/e 11/08/1973 IM Immingham
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1769 w/e 03/08/1968 91N To North Eastern Region w/e 02/05/1970 40B w/e 11/08/1973 IM Immingham
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5617 w/e 09/05/1970 34G Finsbury Park w/e 06/06/1970 40B w/e 08/07/1972 82A Bristol Bath Road
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1106 w/e 21/03/1970 52A Gateshead 4w/e 11/07/1970 40B w/e 10/10/1970 55B York (North)
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1107 w/e 21/03/1970 52A Gateshead 4w/e 11/07/1970 40B w/e 10/10/1970 55B York (North)
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1534 w/e 12/10/1968 41A Tinsley 4w/e 11/07/1970 40B w/e 04/11/1972 52A Gateshead
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1535 w/e 12/10/1968 41A Tinsley 4w/e 11/07/1970 40B w/e 10/07/1971 55A Holbeck (MR)
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1767 w/e 21/03/1970 34G Finsbury Park 4w/e 11/07/1970 40B w/e 06/05/1972 52A Gateshead
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1773 w/e 21/03/1970 34G Finsbury Park 4w/e 11/07/1970 40B w/e 10/07/1971 41A Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1782 w/e 09/11/1968 41A Tinsley 4w/e 11/07/1970 40B w/e 23/01/1971 55G Knottingley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1783 w/e 09/11/1968 41A Tinsley 4w/e 11/07/1970 40B w/e 07/11/1970 41A Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1791 w/e 16/07/1966 41A Tinsley 4w/e 11/07/1970 40B w/e 08/01/1972 51L Thornaby
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1897 02/09/1965 41A Tinsley (New) 4w/e 11/07/1970 40B 4w/e 06/10/1973 TI Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1898 w/e 09/09/1967 41A Tinsley 4w/e 11/07/1970 40B 14/01/2000 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1899 w/e 09/09/1967 41A Tinsley 4w/e 11/07/1970 40B 4w/e 06/10/1973 TI Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1768 4w/e 11/07/1970 55B York (North) w/e 10/10/1970 40B w/e 06/05/1972 52A Gateshead
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8027 w/e 06/06/1970 55B York (North) w/e 10/10/1970 40B w/e 09/10/1971 65A Eastfield
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8028 w/e 24/06/1967 52A Gateshead w/e 10/10/1970 40B 15/11/1991 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8029 w/e 18/04/1970 55B York (North) w/e 10/10/1970 40B 05/07/1991 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8031 w/e 27/06/1970 52A Gateshead w/e 10/10/1970 40B 14/09/1990 Withdrawn
Diesel