Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 17 Today
» 772 Yesterday
» 3439 Week
» 15217 Month
» 304609 Year
» 815711 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Knottingley


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Knottingley Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1994 3w/e 20/05/1967 66A Polmadie 4w/e 12/08/1967 56A 4w/e 26/08/1967 91N To North Eastern Region
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2246 4w/e 28/01/1967 55D Royston 4w/e 12/08/1967 56A 08/07/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2266 09/01/1958 55D Royston (New) 4w/e 12/08/1967 56A 27/11/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2323 05/04/1961 55E Normanton (New) 4w/e 12/08/1967 56A 08/07/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2324 26/04/1961 55E Normanton (New) 4w/e 12/08/1967 56A 4w/e 22/06/1968 55B York (North)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3379 05/09/1957 55D Royston (New) 4w/e 07/10/1967 56A 17/07/1992 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2173 4w/e 22/04/1967 56B Healey Mills 4w/e 04/11/1967 56A w/e 21/08/1971 50D Goole
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1890 w/e 25/11/1967 91N To North Eastern Region 4w/e 02/12/1967 55G      
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1891 w/e 25/11/1967 91N To North Eastern Region 4w/e 02/12/1967 55G      
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1893 w/e 25/11/1967 91N To North Eastern Region 4w/e 02/12/1967 55G 31/07/1992 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1979 11/12/1965 52A Gateshead (New) 4w/e 24/02/1968 55G 14/07/2000 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2161 4w/e 20/05/1967 56G Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 20/07/1968 55G w/e 08/05/1971 30E Colchester
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1782 4w/e 11/07/1970 40B Immingham w/e 23/01/1971 55G 31/01/2003 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1878 w/e 28/03/1970 40B Immingham w/e 27/02/1971 55G 4w/e 06/10/1973 TE Thornaby
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3276 w/e 03/04/1971 55B York (North) w/e 08/05/1971 55G 19/02/1988 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3375 w/e 12/09/1964 55H Neville Hill w/e 14/08/1971 55G 30/10/1988 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1789 w/e 08/03/1969 51L Thornaby 2w/e 30/10/1971 55G 31/01/2004 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1790 w/e 12/10/1968 51L Thornaby 2w/e 30/10/1971 55G 28/02/2007 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1783 w/e 07/11/1970 41A Tinsley 2w/e 10/03/1973 55G 28/02/2007 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1791 w/e 06/05/1972 41A Tinsley 2w/e 10/03/1973 55G 28/02/2004 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47375 w/e 08/07/1972 51L Thornaby w/e 11/05/1974 KY      
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47319 w/e 11/05/1974 ED Eastfield 2w/e 12/10/1974 KY 14/07/2000 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47286 w/e 28/10/1972 52A Gateshead w/e 08/03/1975 KY w/e 07/06/1975 HO Holbeck (MR)
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47376 2w/e 30/10/1971 51L Thornaby 3w/e 10/05/1975 KY w/e 15/05/1988 TI Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47296 w/e 08/03/1975 HO Holbeck (MR) w/e 07/06/1975 KY 31/07/2003 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47179 w/e 01/02/1976 HO Holbeck (MR) w/e 29/02/1976 KY      
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47304 w/e 01/08/1970 41A Tinsley w/e 29/02/1976 KY 16/06/2000 Withdrawn