Depot: Landore
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Landore | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4085 | on | 12/02/1932 | CARM | Carmarthen | m/e | 06/1932 | LDR | m/e | 07/1932 | CARM | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5009 | on | 19/09/1929 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 08/07/1932 | LDR | on | 20/12/1934 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4074 | on | 24/06/1932 | NA | Newton Abbot | m/e | 07/1933 | LDR | on | 16/09/1934 | EXE | Exeter |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4096 | m/e | 02/1933 | SRD | Stafford Road | on | 03/06/1934 | LDR | on | 18/11/1935 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5006 | m/e | 06/1933 | LA | Laira | on | 29/06/1934 | LDR | on | 17/12/1935 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4084 | on | 19/04/1934 | CARM | Carmarthen | m/e | 10/1934 | LDR | on | 03/07/1935 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4073 | on | 04/03/1934 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 02/10/1934 | LDR | on | 06/04/1935 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4076 | on | 20/05/1934 | CARM | Carmarthen | m/e | 11/1934 | LDR | on | 30/08/1935 | EXE | Exeter |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5020 | on | 18/02/1934 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 27/03/1935 | LDR | on | 26/06/1939 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4080 | m/e | 01/1935 | PZ | Penzance | on | 26/05/1935 | LDR | on | 09/01/1941 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4078 | on | 10/07/1935 | 4A | Shrewsbury | on | 01/11/1935 | LDR | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4089 | on | 20/12/1932 | SRD | Stafford Road | on | 02/11/1935 | LDR | on | 05/04/1936 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5604 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | LDR | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5908 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | LDR | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | CARM | Carmarthen | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5915 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | LDR | on | 15/06/1947 | PZ | Penzance | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4023 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | LDR | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4050 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | LDR | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4212 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | LDR | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5047 | on | 21/04/1936 (New) | LDR | on | 27/04/1940 | NA | Newton Abbot | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4089 | on | 05/04/1936 | PDN | Old Oak Common | m/e | 30/04/1936 | LDR | on | 07/01/1937 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5051 | on | 24/05/1936 (New) | LDR | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4095 | on | 19/05/1935 | NA | Newton Abbot | on | 22/08/1936 | LDR | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4089 | on | 07/01/1937 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 17/02/1937 | LDR | on | 09/02/1938 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5083 | on | 07/06/1937 | LDR | on | 02/10/1937 | NEA | Neath (Court Sart) | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5083 | on | 02/10/1937 | NEA | Neath (Court Sart) | on | 24/11/1937 | LDR | on | 06/12/1946 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5048 | on | 04/05/1936 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road (New) | on | 19/01/1938 | LDR | on | 18/12/1939 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5016 | m/e | 01/1938 | PZ | Penzance | on | 03/05/1938 | LDR | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5007 | on | 27/06/1935 | SRD | Stafford Road | on | 05/05/1938 | LDR | on | 15/03/1940 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4091 | on | 03/10/1934 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 07/1938 | LDR | m/e | 10/1938 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5010 | on | 31/12/1935 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 08/1938 | LDR | m/e | 10/1938 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5076 | on | 25/08/1938 | EXE | Exeter (New) | m/e | 12/1938 | LDR | m/e | 02/1939 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5002 | on | 28/01/1934 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 13/06/1939 | LDR | on | 12/01/1941 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5089 | on | 01/11/1939 | LDR | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5013 | on | 19/09/1939 | PZ | Penzance | on | 11/03/1940 | LDR | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4074 | on | 29/08/1937 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 08/04/1940 | LDR | on | 26/04/1941 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5002 | on | 12/01/1941 | SDN | Swindon | m/e | 02/1941 | LDR | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5079 | on | 13/11/1940 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 03/1941 | LDR | on | 24/01/1947 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5093 | m/e | 02/1941 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | m/e | 03/1941 | LDR | on | 26/12/1941 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4074 | on | 26/04/1941 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 01/11/1941 | LDR | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4080 | on | 09/01/1941 | LA | Laira | on | 23/12/1941 | LDR | on | 09/11/1942 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5093 | on | 26/12/1941 | SDN | Swindon | m/e | 02/1942 | LDR | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5006 | m/e | 06/1938 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 12/1942 | LDR | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4819 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 77 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | LDR | on | 15/06/1947 | FGD | Fishguard Goodwick | |
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5400 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | LDR | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | ||||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5408 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | LDR | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5913 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | FGD | Fishguard Goodwick | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | LDR | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9625 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | LDR | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | SED | Swansea East Dock | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3785 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | LDR | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4972 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | LDR | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7002 | on | 06/06/1946 (New) | LDR | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7003 | on | 13/06/1946 (New) | LDR | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4081 | on | 12/07/1941 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 26/11/1946 | LDR | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5072 | on | 07/07/1938 | NA | Newton Abbot (New) | m/e | 03/1947 | LDR | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2273 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87G | Carmarthen | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3678 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87H | Neyland | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3701 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87F | Llanelli | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3713 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3768 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3785 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | LDR | Landore | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3797 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4003 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | m/e | 07/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4023 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | LDR | Landore | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | m/e | 07/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4039 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | m/e | 11/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4048 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | m/e | 01/1953 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4050 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | LDR | Landore | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | m/e | 02/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4074 | on | 01/11/1941 | LDR | Landore | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | m/e | 09/1956 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4078 | on | 01/11/1935 | LDR | Landore | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | CHR | Chester West |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4081 | on | 26/11/1946 | LDR | Landore | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | on | 10/07/1948 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4095 | on | 22/08/1936 | LDR | Landore | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | on | 07/06/1952 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4134 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 87 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 87G | Carmarthen | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4212 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | LDR | Landore | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | m/e | 30/04/1948 | DYD | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4250 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4256 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4295 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | NEA | Neath (Court Sart) | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4982 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | LA | Laira | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | on | 14/10/1948 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5002 | m/e | 02/1941 | LDR | Landore | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | m/e | 07/1949 | CARM | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5006 | m/e | 12/1942 | LDR | Landore | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | m/e | 07/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5013 | on | 11/03/1940 | LDR | Landore | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | m/e | 08/1951 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5016 | on | 03/05/1938 | LDR | Landore | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | on | 11/10/1954 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5051 | on | 24/05/1936 | LDR | Landore (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | on | 23/06/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5072 | m/e | 03/1947 | LDR | Landore | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | m/e | 12/1955 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5089 | on | 01/11/1939 | LDR | Landore | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | m/e | 07/1948 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5093 | m/e | 02/1942 | LDR | Landore | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | m/e | 06/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5211 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5219 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 87F | Llanelli | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5341 | on | 01/01/1934 | 114 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | CARM | Carmarthen | |
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5400 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | LDR | Landore | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick |
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5408 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | LDR | Landore | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5604 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | LDR | Landore | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5631 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5759 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5913 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | LDR | Landore | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6304 | on | 01/01/1934 | 77 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | CARM | Carmarthen | |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6412 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6425 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6431 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 86J | Aberdare | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6604 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6606 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 85C | Hereford | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6638 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | LMTN | Leamington | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6644 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6667 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 2A | Tyseley | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6678 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | m/e | 11/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6679 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6683 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 84K | Chester West | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6800 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | PZ | Penzance | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6806 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | PZ | Penzance | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6828 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | m/e | 30/06/1948 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6857 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | m/e | 30/06/1948 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6872 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | TR | Truro | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6903 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6918 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7002 | on | 06/06/1946 | LDR | Landore (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | m/e | 10/1956 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7003 | on | 13/06/1946 | LDR | Landore (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | on | 02/12/1958 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7787 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8789 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | m/e | 06/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9738 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 86F | Tondu | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9761 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9775 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9777 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Unclassified | 0-6-0T | 2168 | on | 15/06/1947 | LLY | Llanelli | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | LDR | m/e | 05/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3752 | on | 15/06/1947 | LLY | Llanelli | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | LDR | m/e | 31/03/1948 | LLY | Llanelli |
Steam | Unclassified | 0-6-0T | 2167 | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | LLY | Llanelli | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | LDR | m/e | 02/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7776 | on | 15/06/1947 | LLY | Llanelli | m/e | 31/03/1948 | LDR | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | LLY | Llanelli |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9788 | on | 15/06/1947 | LLY | Llanelli | m/e | 31/03/1948 | LDR | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | LLY | Llanelli |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2085 | on | 15/06/1947 | LLY | Llanelli | m/e | 30/04/1948 | LDR | m/e | 31/05/1948 | LLY | Llanelli |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2059 | on | 15/06/1947 | LLY | Llanelli | m/e | 31/05/1948 | LDR | m/e | 11/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5247 | on | 15/06/1947 | LLY | Llanelli | m/e | 31/05/1948 | LDR | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5248 | m/e | 30/04/1948 | LLY | Llanelli | m/e | 31/05/1948 | LDR | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 88G | Llantrisant |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5656 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | m/e | 31/05/1948 | LDR | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6688 | m/e | 30/04/1948 | LLY | Llanelli | m/e | 31/05/1948 | LDR | on | 14/10/1948 | LLY | Llanelli |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5010 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 11/06/1948 | LDR | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7009 | m/e | 07/1948 (New) | LDR | on | 27/06/1961 | 87G | Carmarthen | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2081 | m/e | 30/04/1948 | LLY | Llanelli | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | LDR | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | LLY | Llanelli |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5010 | on | 11/06/1948 | LDR | Landore | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | LDR | on | 08/05/1950 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5223 | on | 15/06/1947 | LLY | Llanelli | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | LDR | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | LLY | Llanelli |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7012 | m/e | 08/1948 (New) | LDR | on | 14/04/1950 | 82C | Swindon | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2042 | on | 15/06/1947 | LLY | Llanelli | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | LDR | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | LLY | Llanelli |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5213 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | LLY | Llanelli | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | LDR | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5705 | on | 15/06/1947 | LLY | Llanelli | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | LDR | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | LLY | Llanelli |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5782 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | LLY | Llanelli | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | LDR | m/e | 11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2082 | on | 15/06/1947 | DG | Danygraig | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | LDR | on | 14/10/1948 | DG | Danygraig |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4908 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | LDR | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Unclassified | 0-6-0T | 2162 | on | 15/06/1947 | LLY | Llanelli | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | LDR | on | 14/10/1948 | LLY | Llanelli |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4982 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | on | 14/10/1948 | LDR | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4937 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | LDR | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | CARM | Carmarthen |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4957 | on | 15/06/1947 | NEY | Neyland | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | LDR | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7211 | on | 15/06/1947 | SED | Swansea East Dock | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | LDR | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5929 | on | 15/06/1947 | NEY | Neyland | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | LDR | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6688 | on | 14/10/1948 | LLY | Llanelli | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | LDR | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | LLY | Llanelli |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9788 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | LLY | Llanelli | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | LDR | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | LLY | Llanelli |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8732 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | LLY | Llanelli | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | LDR | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | LLY | Llanelli |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5675 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | LLY | Llanelli | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | LDR | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | LLY | Llanelli |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7776 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | LLY | Llanelli | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | LDR | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | LLY | Llanelli |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8708 | on | 15/06/1947 | LLY | Llanelli | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | LDR | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8732 | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | LLY | Llanelli | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | LDR | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | LLY | Llanelli |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7018 | m/e | 06/1949 (New) | LDR | on | 15/08/1955 | 82C | Swindon | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1609 | on | 18/11/1949 (New) | LDR | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 87F | Llanelli | ||||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 2012 | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | LLY | Llanelli | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | LDR | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5162 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | LDR | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5002 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | CARM | Carmarthen | on | 10/01/1950 | 87E | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1614 | on | 05/12/1949 | LLY | Llanelli (New) | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | LDR | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1618 | on | 19/12/1949 | LLY | Llanelli (New) | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | LDR | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5002 | on | 10/01/1950 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | LDR | m/e | 09/1956 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7012 | on | 14/04/1950 | 82C | Swindon | on | 12/05/1950 | 87E | on | 22/09/1959 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7028 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 87E | m/e | 06/1950 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7028 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 87E | Landore | m/e | 06/1950 (New) | 87E | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7028 | m/e | 06/1950 | 87E | Landore (New) | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 87E | m/e | 10/1956 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4929 | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 87E | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5400 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 87E | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5955 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | LLY | Llanelli | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 87E | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5955 | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 87E | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4081 | on | 10/07/1948 | SDN | Swindon | on | 04/11/1950 | 87E | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4081 | on | 04/11/1950 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 87E | on | 20/03/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7021 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 87G | Carmarthen | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 87E | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7021 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 87G | Carmarthen | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 87E | m/e | 02/1951 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7021 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 87E | Landore | m/e | 02/1951 | 87E | m/e | 11/1957 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5929 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 87E | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5929 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 87E | Landore | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 87E | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5356 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | SHL | Southall | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 87E | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6325 | on | 15/06/1947 | SHL | Southall | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 87E | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5356 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 87E | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6325 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 87E | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4978 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 87E | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4978 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 87E | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5013 | m/e | 08/1951 | 87G | Carmarthen | m/e | 01/1952 | 87E | on | 17/06/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5039 | m/e | 06/1952 | 87G | Carmarthen | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 87E | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4095 | on | 07/06/1952 | 84C | Banbury | on | 17/06/1952 | 87E | on | 12/12/1957 | 83G | Penzance |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7207 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 87E | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7217 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 87E | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4093 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 85A | Worcester | m/e | 10/1952 | 87E | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9484 | on | 31/10/1952 (New) | 87E | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4093 | m/e | 10/1952 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87E | on | 13/06/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4106 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87E | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4107 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87E | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83F | Truro |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7236 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87E | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7200 | on | 15/06/1947 | NA | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87E | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7209 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 83E | St Blazey | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87E | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5673 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87E | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9484 | on | 31/10/1952 | 87E | Landore (New) | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87E | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6688 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 87E | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6816 | on | 15/06/1947 | BAN | Banbury | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 87E | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6905 | on | 15/06/1947 | HFD | Hereford | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 87E | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1428 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | OSW | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 87E | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4917 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 87E | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 84K | Chester West |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5958 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 87E | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5988 | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 87E | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4981 | on | 15/06/1947 | CARM | Carmarthen | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 87E | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2284 | on | 15/06/1947 | CARM | Carmarthen | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 87E | m/e | 06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8463 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 87E | m/e | 01/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73022 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 87E | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5958 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 87E | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5089 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 04/1954 | 87E | on | 25/10/1955 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6368 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 87E | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3768 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 87E | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4965 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 87E | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7248 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 87E | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5016 | on | 11/10/1954 | 83D | Laira | m/e | 12/1954 | 87E | on | 13/06/1961 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4106 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 87E | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83F | Truro |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5074 | on | 02/07/1954 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 07/1955 | 87E | on | 05/07/1956 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4918 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 87E | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4924 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 87E | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4937 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 87E | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5041 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 83A | Newton Abbot | on | 27/09/1955 | 87E | on | 13/06/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5080 | on | 13/09/1949 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 12/1955 | 87E | on | 07/09/1961 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1428 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 87E | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5913 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 87E | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9637 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 87E | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8788 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 87E | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4923 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | PDN | Old Oak Common | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 87E | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5990 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 83G | Penzance | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 87E | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7809 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 83D | Laira | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 87E | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5077 | on | 15/06/1954 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 07/1956 | 87E | on | 13/06/1961 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4106 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83F | Truro | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 87E | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87H | Neyland |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4107 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83F | Truro | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 87E | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 87H | Neyland |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8794 | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 87E | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9436 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 87H | Neyland | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 87E | m/e | 07/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9715 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 87E | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7016 | on | 15/12/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | on | 20/09/1956 | 87E | on | 22/09/1959 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4000 | m/e | 09/1956 | 87G | Carmarthen | m/e | 10/1956 | 87E | on | 25/04/1957 | To Store | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5002 | m/e | 09/1956 | 87G | Carmarthen | m/e | 10/1956 | 87E | on | 03/01/1958 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2226 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 87H | Neyland | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 87E | m/e | 08/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5955 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 87G | Carmarthen | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 87E | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4037 | on | 28/09/1956 | 83A | Newton Abbot | on | 23/02/1957 | 87E | m/e | 06/1957 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5959 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 83C | Exeter | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 87E | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4074 | m/e | 09/1956 | 87G | Carmarthen | m/e | 06/1957 | 87E | on | 13/07/1959 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4094 | m/e | 07/1954 | 84A | Stafford Road | m/e | 06/1957 | 87E | on | 11/09/1961 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4097 | on | 02/10/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common | m/e | 06/1957 | 87E | on | 04/04/1960 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5039 | m/e | 03/1956 | 87G | Carmarthen | m/e | 06/1957 | 87E | on | 30/12/1959 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7028 | m/e | 10/1956 | 87G | Carmarthen | m/e | 06/1957 | 87E | on | 31/10/1961 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6828 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 87E | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6912 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 87G | Carmarthen | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 87E | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4099 | on | 26/03/1955 | 83G | Penzance | on | 02/11/1957 | 87E | on | 13/05/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4076 | m/e | 01/1955 | 84K | Chester West | on | 30/11/1957 | 87E | on | 15/08/1961 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5004 | on | 20/09/1957 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | on | 20/03/1958 | 87E | on | 13/06/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4122 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 87E | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 87H | Neyland |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5091 | m/e | 09/1957 | 87G | Carmarthen | on | 12/06/1958 | 87E | on | 13/06/1961 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7002 | m/e | 10/1956 | 87G | Carmarthen | on | 12/06/1958 | 87E | on | 26/11/1959 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5909 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 87E | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6649 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 86J | Aberdare | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 87E | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2821 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 87E | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2844 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 87E | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3849 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 87E | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7224 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 87E | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7035 | on | 01/12/1956 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | on | 16/02/1959 | 87E | on | 29/02/1960 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7230 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 87E | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 84J | Croes Newydd |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7021 | m/e | 11/1957 | 87G | Carmarthen | on | 18/06/1959 | 87E | on | 13/06/1961 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6114 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 87E | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87H | Neyland |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2291 | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 87E | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4090 | m/e | 12/1955 | 81A | Old Oak Common | on | 11/08/1959 | 87E | on | 22/09/1959 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4074 | on | 13/07/1959 | 81A | Old Oak Common | on | 12/08/1959 | 87E | on | 03/05/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42305 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 87E | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42307 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 87E | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42385 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 87E | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42387 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 87E | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42388 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 87E | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42390 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 87E | on | 10/09/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42394 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 87E | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6641 | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.BRY | Barry | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 87E | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5203 | on | 15/06/1947 | LLY | Llanelli | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 87E | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5361 | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 87E | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6963 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 87E | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8439 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 87E | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6933 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 87E | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 83G | Penzance |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42645 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 87E | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42651 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 87E | w/e | 16/04/1960 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42296 | w/e | 30/07/1949 | 24C | Lostock Hall | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 87E | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 24C | Lostock Hall |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5039 | on | 30/12/1959 | 85A | Worcester | on | 18/02/1960 | 87E | on | 13/09/1960 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5079 | m/e | 11/1947 | NA | Newton Abbot | on | 22/04/1960 | 87E | on | 06/05/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4090 | on | 22/09/1959 | 87G | Carmarthen | on | 16/06/1960 | 87E | on | 28/08/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5015 | on | 20/03/1958 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | on | 16/06/1960 | 87E | on | 25/01/1961 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5030 | on | 19/08/1958 | 87G | Carmarthen | on | 16/06/1960 | 87E | on | 07/09/1960 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5074 | m/e | 12/1956 | 81A | Old Oak Common | on | 16/06/1960 | 87E | on | 13/06/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5909 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 87E | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6602 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 87E | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6650 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 87E | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6912 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 87E | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5006 | on | 20/03/1958 | 87G | Carmarthen | on | 13/07/1960 | 87E | on | 06/07/1961 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9777 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 87E | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4147 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 87E | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5062 | on | 23/04/1958 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | on | 16/09/1960 | 87E | on | 13/06/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7014 | m/e | 08/1948 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 16/09/1960 | 87E | on | 03/10/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5078 | on | 16/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | on | 03/10/1960 | 87E | on | 13/06/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9416 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 87E | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42182 | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 87E | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42566 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 84D | Leamington | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 87E | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 84D | Leamington |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6837 | on | 24/04/1963 (New) | 87E | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6821 | on | 08/04/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 87E | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6822 | on | 10/04/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 87E | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6823 | on | 25/04/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 87E | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6833 | on | 05/04/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 87E | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6837 | on | 24/04/1963 | 87E | Landore (New) | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 87E | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | 64B | Haymarket |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6831 | on | 29/03/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 87E | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6836 | on | 19/04/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 87E | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6852 | on | 08/07/1963 (New) | 87E | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6853 | on | 10/07/1963 (New) | 87E | 4w/e | 20/08/1966 | 66A | Polmadie | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6854 | on | 11/07/1963 (New) | 87E | 4w/e | 20/08/1966 | 66A | Polmadie | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6855 | on | 18/07/1963 (New) | 87E | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6861 | on | 19/07/1963 (New) | 87E | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6862 | on | 23/07/1963 (New) | 87E | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6856 | on | 25/07/1963 (New) | 87E | 4w/e | 20/08/1966 | 66A | Polmadie | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6863 | on | 06/08/1963 (New) | 87E | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6858 | on | 15/08/1963 (New) | 87E | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | 64B | Haymarket | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6864 | on | 22/08/1963 (New) | 87E | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6869 | on | 23/08/1963 (New) | 87E | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6865 | on | 29/08/1963 (New) | 87E | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6870 | on | 30/08/1963 (New) | 87E | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6873 | on | 12/09/1963 (New) | 87E | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6880 | on | 24/10/1963 (New) | 87E | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6905 | on | 05/11/1963 (New) | 87E | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6883 | on | 07/11/1963 (New) | 87E | ||||||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6906 | on | 08/11/1963 (New) | 87E | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6884 | on | 14/11/1963 (New) | 87E | on | 19/05/2000 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6907 | on | 15/11/1963 (New) | 87E | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6908 | on | 20/11/1963 (New) | 87E | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6910 | on | 26/11/1963 (New) | 87E | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6886 | on | 29/11/1963 (New) | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6911 | on | 02/12/1963 (New) | 87E | w/e | 26/10/1968 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6909 | on | 24/12/1963 (New) | 87E | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6885 | on | 28/12/1963 (New) | 87E | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7248 | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 87E | m/e | 06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5656 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 87E | m/e | 02/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6602 | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 87E | m/e | 10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6915 | on | 01/01/1964 (New) | 87E | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6916 | on | 02/01/1964 (New) | 87E | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6917 | on | 02/01/1964 (New) | 87E | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6918 | on | 03/01/1964 (New) | 87E | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6912 | on | 06/01/1964 (New) | 87E | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6913 | on | 07/01/1964 (New) | 87E | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6888 | on | 16/01/1964 (New) | 87E | on | 22/11/1981 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6921 | on | 17/01/1964 (New) | 87E | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6890 | on | 21/01/1964 (New) | 87E | on | 01/11/1981 | ED | Eastfield | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6891 | on | 21/01/1964 (New) | 87E | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6922 | on | 24/01/1964 (New) | 87E | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6924 | on | 30/01/1964 (New) | 87E | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6887 | on | 31/01/1964 (New) | 87E | on | 22/11/1981 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6923 | on | 03/02/1964 (New) | 87E | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6925 | on | 07/02/1964 (New) | 87E | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6926 | on | 14/02/1964 (New) | 87E | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6927 | on | 19/02/1964 (New) | 87E | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6892 | on | 20/02/1964 (New) | 87E | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6893 | on | 20/02/1964 (New) | 87E | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6919 | on | 16/01/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/06/1968 | 65A | Eastfield |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6928 | on | 28/02/1964 (New) | 87E | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6929 | on | 28/02/1964 (New) | 87E | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1721 | on | 06/03/1964 (New) | 87E | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6930 | on | 06/03/1964 (New) | 87E | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6931 | on | 12/03/1964 (New) | 87E | ||||||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6894 | on | 16/03/1964 (New) | 87E | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6895 | on | 17/03/1964 (New) | 87E | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6932 | on | 20/03/1964 (New) | 87E | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6933 | on | 01/04/1964 (New) | 87E | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6896 | on | 06/04/1964 (New) | 87E | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1729 | on | 09/04/1964 (New) | 87E | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6934 | on | 10/04/1964 (New) | 87E | m/e | 11/1969 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1055 | on | 02/03/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1056 | on | 08/03/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1057 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1058 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1059 | on | 06/04/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1060 | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1061 | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1062 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1063 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1064 | on | 24/05/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1066 | on | 14/06/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1067 | on | 18/07/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1069 | on | 21/10/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1070 | on | 28/10/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1697 | on | 21/12/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2114 | on | 02/07/1959 | 87C | Danygraig (New) | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | 85A | Worcester |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2116 | on | 21/08/1959 | 87C | Danygraig (New) | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | w/e | 15/10/1966 | 16A | Toton |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2117 | on | 04/09/1959 | 87C | Danygraig (New) | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 16C | Derby |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2118 | on | 17/09/1959 | 87C | Danygraig (New) | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 16C | Derby |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2119 | on | 25/09/1959 | 87C | Danygraig (New) | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 85H | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2120 | on | 08/10/1959 | 87C | Danygraig (New) | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | on | 23/02/1986 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2121 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 87C | Danygraig | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | 82C | Swindon |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2122 | on | 30/10/1959 | 87C | Danygraig (New) | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2124 | on | 23/11/1959 | 87C | Danygraig (New) | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 16C | Derby |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3359 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 87C | Danygraig | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 91M | To London Midland Region |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3360 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 87C | Danygraig | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 91M | To London Midland Region |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3361 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 87C | Danygraig | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | w/e | 28/10/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3401 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 87C | Danygraig | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 91N | To North Eastern Region |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3743 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | DG | Danygraig | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3744 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | DG | Danygraig | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3758 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | DG | Danygraig | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | on | 26/02/1993 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3760 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | DG | Danygraig | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | w/e | 03/03/1973 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3816 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3826 | on | 13/05/1959 | 87C | Danygraig (New) | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | w/e | 05/11/1966 | 10A | Carnforth |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3827 | on | 19/05/1959 | 87C | Danygraig (New) | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | on | 12/06/1988 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3828 | on | 22/05/1959 | 87C | Danygraig (New) | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | on | 22/12/1977 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3830 | on | 05/06/1959 | 87C | Danygraig (New) | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | on | 12/06/1988 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3986 | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 87C | Danygraig | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | on | 02/04/1997 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3987 | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 87C | Danygraig | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | on | 12/06/1988 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6897 | on | 15/04/1964 (New) | 87E | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6935 | on | 20/04/1964 (New) | 87E | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6936 | on | 29/04/1964 (New) | 87E | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1054 | on | 02/03/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1728 | on | 21/04/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 87E | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3352 | on | 07/06/1957 | 87F | Llanelli (New) | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 87E | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 87B | Margam |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3355 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 87F | Llanelli | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 87E | m/e | 30/04/1967 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3356 | on | 21/06/1957 | 87F | Llanelli (New) | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 87E | on | 31/12/1980 | 98Ss | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3357 | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 87F | Llanelli | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 87E | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3358 | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 87F | Llanelli | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 87E | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3593 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 87F | Llanelli | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 87E | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3596 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 87F | Llanelli | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 87E | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 87B | Margam |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3825 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 87F | Llanelli | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 87E | on | 05/02/1993 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3829 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 87F | Llanelli | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 87E | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6898 | on | 05/05/1964 (New) | 87E | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1584 | on | 16/05/1964 (New) | 87E | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1585 | on | 16/05/1964 (New) | 87E | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1735 | on | 23/05/1964 (New) | 87E | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1732 | on | 28/04/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 87E | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3353 | on | 11/06/1957 | 87F | Llanelli (New) | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 87E | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3354 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 87F | Llanelli | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 87E | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80133 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 87E | on | 09/08/1964 | 70B | Feltham |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1599 | on | 29/06/1964 (New) | 87E | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1600 | on | 30/06/1964 (New) | 87E | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1601 | on | 06/07/1964 (New) | 87E | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1602 | on | 07/07/1964 (New) | 87E | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1751 | on | 14/07/1964 (New) | 87E | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1603 | on | 17/07/1964 (New) | 87E | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1604 | on | 20/07/1964 (New) | 87E | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2087 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 87E | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 83B | Taunton |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2115 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 85A | Worcester |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3255 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 87E | m/e | 30/04/1967 | 84B | St Blazey |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1752 | on | 21/07/1964 (New) | 87E | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1605 | on | 29/07/1964 (New) | 87E | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1606 | on | 29/07/1964 (New) | 87E | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1607 | on | 31/07/1964 (New) | 87E | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1608 | on | 31/07/1964 (New) | 87E | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1609 | on | 11/08/1964 (New) | 87E | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1610 | on | 13/08/1964 (New) | 87E | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1755 | on | 14/08/1964 (New) | 87E | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1611 | on | 18/08/1964 (New) | 87E | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1754 | on | 19/08/1964 (New) | 87E | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1612 | on | 21/08/1964 (New) | 87E | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1756 | on | 04/09/1964 (New) | 87E | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1753 | on | 21/07/1964 | 2B | Oxley (New) | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 87E | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9511 | on | 17/09/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 87E | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1583 | on | 23/05/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1586 | on | 25/05/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1587 | on | 27/05/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1588 | on | 29/05/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1589 | on | 29/05/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1590 | on | 30/05/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1591 | on | 05/06/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1592 | on | 06/06/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1593 | on | 09/06/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1594 | on | 16/06/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1595 | on | 16/06/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1596 | on | 22/06/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1597 | on | 22/06/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1598 | on | 29/06/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1613 | on | 25/08/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1656 | on | 01/02/1965 (New) | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1657 | on | 01/02/1965 (New) | 87E | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1659 | on | 06/02/1965 (New) | 87E | m/e | 10/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1636 | on | 10/12/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1637 | on | 07/12/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1638 | on | 08/12/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 87E | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1639 | on | 14/12/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 87E | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1640 | on | 16/12/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 87E | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1642 | on | 19/12/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 87E | m/e | 30/04/1967 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1658 | on | 12/02/1965 (New) | 87E | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1660 | on | 13/02/1965 (New) | 87E | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1661 | on | 13/02/1965 (New) | 87E | w/e | 28/04/1973 | OC | |||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1662 | on | 20/02/1965 (New) | 87E | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1663 | on | 20/02/1965 (New) | 87E | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1664 | on | 27/02/1965 (New) | 87E | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1665 | on | 05/03/1965 (New) | 87E | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1666 | on | 05/03/1965 (New) | 87E | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1667 | on | 06/03/1965 (New) | 87E | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1007 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1008 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1011 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1012 | on | 17/11/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1013 | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1014 | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1016 | on | 16/02/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1017 | on | 15/03/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1018 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1022 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1023 | on | 23/09/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1037 | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1038 | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1040 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1042 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1052 | on | 04/02/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1644 | on | 23/12/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1645 | on | 24/12/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1646 | on | 31/12/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1648 | on | 22/01/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1650 | on | 09/01/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1652 | on | 16/01/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1653 | on | 16/01/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1654 | on | 23/01/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1655 | on | 30/01/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6906 | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6913 | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6914 | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 91N | To North Eastern Region |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6916 | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 91N | To North Eastern Region |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6917 | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 91N | To North Eastern Region |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1669 | on | 20/03/1965 (New) | 87E | 2w/e | 11/04/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1641 | on | 17/12/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 87E | m/e | 28/02/1967 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1643 | on | 19/12/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 87E | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1647 | on | 02/01/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 87E | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1649 | on | 02/01/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1651 | on | 09/01/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 87E | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2146 | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 85A | Worcester | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 87E | on | 21/09/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2129 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 84B | St Blazey | 2w/e | 11/04/1965 | 87E | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 16C | Derby |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9508 | on | 07/09/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 87E | on | 05/10/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9509 | on | 08/09/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 87E | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9511 | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 87E | 2w/e | 07/05/1967 | To Store | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9516 | on | 21/10/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 87E | on | 29/12/1966 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9529 | on | 26/01/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 87E | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9531 | on | 02/02/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 87E | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9535 | on | 08/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 87E | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9536 | on | 16/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 87E | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9545 | on | 08/06/1965 (New) | 87E | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2181 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 87H | Whitland | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 87E | m/e | 30/07/1967 | To Store | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9542 | on | 06/05/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 87E | on | 23/01/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1600 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 87E | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1601 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 87E | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1668 | on | 13/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 87E | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1669 | 2w/e | 11/04/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 87E | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1670 | on | 20/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 87E | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2142 | on | 12/05/1960 | 83B | Taunton (New) | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 87E | on | 02/10/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2145 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 87E | on | 07/07/1985 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9543 | on | 28/06/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 87E | 4w/e | 17/06/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9544 | on | 29/05/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 87E | 4w/e | 17/06/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2143 | 4w/e | 27/12/1964 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 87E | on | 06/07/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9546 | on | 28/06/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 87E | on | 09/01/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6601 | on | 06/09/1965 (New) | 87E | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6603 | on | 16/09/1965 (New) | 87E | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2141 | on | 04/05/1960 | 83B | Taunton (New) | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 87E | on | 07/07/1985 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2144 | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 85A | Worcester | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 87E | on | 23/02/1986 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6604 | on | 22/09/1965 (New) | 87E | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2130 | m/e | 08/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 10/1965 | 87E | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 16C | Derby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6606 | on | 11/10/1965 (New) | 87E | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6607 | on | 22/10/1965 (New) | 87E | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6602 | on | 09/09/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 87E | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6885 | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6889 | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 87E | on | 22/11/1981 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6608 | on | 09/11/1965 (New) | 87E | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9536 | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 87E | Landore | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 87E | on | 03/05/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2125 | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 87H | Whitland | 2w/e | 31/01/1966 | 87E | on | 28/12/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2182 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 87H | Whitland | 2w/e | 31/01/1966 | 87E | m/e | 30/07/1967 | To Store | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2184 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 87H | Whitland | 2w/e | 31/01/1966 | 87E | on | 28/12/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2185 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 87H | Whitland | 2w/e | 31/01/1966 | 87E | on | 28/12/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2190 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 87H | Whitland | 2w/e | 31/01/1966 | 87E | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2191 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 87H | Whitland | 2w/e | 31/01/1966 | 87E | m/e | 30/07/1967 | To Store | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3363 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | 87E | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 16A | Toton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3364 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | 87E | w/e | 02/03/1968 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7027 | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | 87E | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6852 | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 87E | 4w/e | 20/08/1966 | 66A | Polmadie |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6855 | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 87E | 4w/e | 20/08/1966 | 66A | Polmadie |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6859 | on | 26/06/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 87E | 4w/e | 20/08/1966 | 66A | Polmadie |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6860 | on | 05/07/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 87E | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6877 | on | 03/10/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 87E | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6881 | on | 21/10/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 87E | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6882 | on | 28/10/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 87E | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6891 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 87E | on | 01/11/1981 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6892 | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 87E | on | 01/11/1981 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1584 | 2w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 28/08/1966 | 87E | m/e | 30/04/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1586 | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 87E | 2w/e | 14/05/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1588 | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 87E | 2w/e | 14/05/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1614 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 87E | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1615 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 87E | w/e | 13/05/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1662 | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 87E | w/e | 08/12/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1663 | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 87E | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1664 | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 87E | w/e | 16/12/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1665 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 87E | w/e | 17/02/1973 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1666 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 87E | 2w/e | 02/12/1972 | D02 | Birmingham Division |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1667 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 87E | w/e | 12/05/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1589 | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 87E | 2w/e | 14/05/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1590 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 87E | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1592 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 87E | m/e | 31/01/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1593 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 87E | m/e | 31/01/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1596 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 87E | m/e | 31/01/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9547 | on | 20/07/1965 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction (New) | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 87E | on | 09/01/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1754 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 87E | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1755 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 87E | w/e | 22/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1756 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 87E | w/e | 20/07/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1757 | on | 17/09/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 87E | w/e | 27/07/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4001 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 87E | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4002 | on | 12/11/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 87E | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6893 | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 87E | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6894 | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 87E | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6895 | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 87E | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6896 | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 87E | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9540 | on | 22/04/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 2w/e | 15/01/1967 | 87E | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1594 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | m/e | 28/02/1967 | 87E | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3515 | 2w/e | 15/01/1967 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 87E | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6935 | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 87E | w/e | 26/04/1969 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9529 | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 87E | m/e | 31/05/1967 | To Store | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3397 | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 87E | w/e | 02/03/1968 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6930 | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 87E | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9501 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 87E | on | 31/03/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9513 | on | 06/10/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 87E | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9519 | on | 30/10/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 87E | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6924 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 87E | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6925 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 87E | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 91N | To North Eastern Region |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9521 | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 87E | on | 03/05/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9522 | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 87E | on | 31/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9555 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 87E | on | 03/05/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1600 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 87E | w/e | 13/07/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1601 | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 87E | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1602 | m/e | 30/04/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 87E | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1604 | m/e | 30/04/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 87E | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1654 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 87E | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1655 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 87E | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1656 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 87E | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1668 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 87E | w/e | 12/05/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6604 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 87E | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9524 | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 87E | on | 03/05/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | D20/2 | A1A-A1A | D604 | on | 20/01/1959 | 83D | Laira (New) | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 87E | on | 31/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6605 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 87E | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6606 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 87E | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6607 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 87E | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1000 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 87E | on | 05/10/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1001 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 87E | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1003 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 87E | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1004 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 87E | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1005 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 87E | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1006 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 87E | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1007 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 87E | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1008 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 87E | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1009 | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 87E | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1010 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 87E | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1012 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 87E | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3268 | on | 07/09/1956 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 87E | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3403 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 87E | w/e | 20/07/1968 | 16C | Derby |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3605 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87B | Margam | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 87E | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3606 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 87E | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3823 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 87E | m/e | 12/1976 | RG | Reading (W.R.) |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1002 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 84A | Laira | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 87E | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1011 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 87E | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1013 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 87E | on | 05/10/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1014 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 87E | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1041 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 87E | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1043 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 87E | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1071 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 87E | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1669 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 87E | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1678 | on | 24/04/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 87E | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2183 | m/e | 30/07/1967 | 98S | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 87E | on | 21/09/1968 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1031 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 87E | on | 05/10/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1062 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 87E | on | 05/10/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1063 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 87E | on | 05/10/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1066 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 87E | on | 05/10/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1679 | on | 01/05/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 87E | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3195 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 87E | w/e | 05/04/1969 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3196 | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 87E | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3804 | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 87E | on | 09/08/1991 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3998 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 87E | 7w/e | 02/01/1971 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1015 | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 87E | on | 05/10/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1025 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 87E | on | 05/10/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1026 | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 87E | on | 05/10/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1055 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 87E | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1061 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 87E | on | 05/10/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1069 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 87E | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1596 | m/e | 31/01/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 87E | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6941 | on | 03/09/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 87E | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6943 | on | 17/09/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 87E | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6944 | on | 24/09/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 87E | w/e | 24/11/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1070 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 87E | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1603 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 87E | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1606 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 87E | w/e | 31/03/1973 | D02 | Birmingham Division |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1610 | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 87E | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1611 | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 87E | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1612 | w/e | 13/05/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 87E | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1613 | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 87E | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1614 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 87E | w/e | 03/02/1973 | D02 | Birmingham Division |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1650 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 87E | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1757 | on | 29/12/1968 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 87E | w/e | 12/12/1970 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9538 | on | 26/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 87E | on | 03/05/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4126 | on | 12/04/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | 87E | m/e | 05/1977 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4174 | on | 20/06/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | 87E | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1003 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 87E | on | 05/10/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1068 | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 84A | Laira | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | 87E | 7w/e | 29/05/1970 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4172 | on | 07/06/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | 87E | on | 28/02/2007 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1060 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 87E | on | 05/10/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1064 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 87E | 2w/e | 27/12/1969 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1071 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 84A | Laira | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 87E | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1609 | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 87E | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1615 | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 87E | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1752 | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 87E | w/e | 14/04/1973 | D02 | Birmingham Division |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1756 | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 87E | w/e | 12/12/1970 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4128 | on | 30/04/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 87E | on | 31/05/1981 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1073 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 84A | Laira | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | 87E | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1009 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 87E | on | 05/10/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1030 | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 87E | on | 05/10/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1055 | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 87E | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1592 | m/e | 31/01/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 87E | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1593 | m/e | 31/01/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 87E | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1594 | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 87E | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1597 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 87E | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1071 | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 84A | Laira | 7w/e | 29/05/1970 | 87E | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3745 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87B | Margam | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 87A | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1068 | 7w/e | 29/05/1970 | 84A | Laira | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 87A | on | 05/10/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3744 | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 87A | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4127 | on | 19/04/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 87A | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4180 | on | 12/09/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 87A | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6924 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 87A | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6941 | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 87A | on | 04/10/1987 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6943 | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 87A | w/e | 17/11/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1676 | w/e | 04/01/1969 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 12/12/1970 | 87A | w/e | 27/01/1973 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1677 | w/e | 04/01/1969 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 12/12/1970 | 87A | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2119 | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 84A | Laira | w/e | 19/12/1970 | 87A | on | 23/02/1986 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2087 | 4w/e | 19/09/1966 | 73F | Ashford | 2w/e | 01/03/1971 | 87A | q/e | 22/05/1971 | To Store | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2378 | w/e | 29/07/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 03/04/1971 | 87A | q/e | 22/05/1971 | To Store | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1715 | w/e | 06/02/1971 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 87A | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1716 | on | 17/06/1968 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 87A | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1717 | on | 17/06/1968 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 87A | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1718 | on | 17/06/1968 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 87A | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2087 | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 98S | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 87A | on | 13/06/1971 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3594 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 6w/e | 03/07/1971 | 87A | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6600 | on | 26/08/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 87A | on | 01/10/2002 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6601 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 87A | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6602 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 87A | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6603 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 87A | on | 04/10/1987 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6604 | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 87A | on | 04/10/1987 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6605 | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 87A | on | 01/03/2000 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6606 | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 87A | on | 01/09/1991 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6607 | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 87A | on | 01/03/2000 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6608 | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 87A | on | 01/01/2005 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6878 | on | 17/09/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 87A | 4w/e | 06/12/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6879 | on | 02/10/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 87A | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6954 | on | 05/01/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 87A | w/e | 17/11/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6955 | on | 06/01/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 87A | w/e | 24/11/1973 | CG | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6956 | on | 08/01/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 87A | w/e | 17/11/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6957 | on | 12/01/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 87A | w/e | 17/11/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6958 | on | 15/01/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 87A | on | 01/12/1999 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6969 | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 87A | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1584 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 87A | w/e | 06/10/1973 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1585 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 87A | w/e | 24/11/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1588 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 87A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1591 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 87A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1592 | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 87A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1641 | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 87A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1644 | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 87A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1645 | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 87A | w/e | 08/09/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6906 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 87A | on | 01/01/1999 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6907 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 87A | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6908 | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 87A | on | 01/10/2000 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6909 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 87A | w/e | 09/02/1974 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6910 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 87A | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6970 | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 87A | m/e | 02/1977 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6842 | 5w/e | 01/04/1972 | 65A | Eastfield | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 87A | 3w/e | 25/02/1978 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6858 | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | 64B | Haymarket | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 87A | 4w/e | 25/11/1972 | 65A | Eastfield |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6859 | 5w/e | 01/04/1972 | 65A | Eastfield | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 87A | on | 01/12/2004 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6936 | 4w/e | 31/10/1970 | 65A | Eastfield | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 87A | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1608 | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 25/11/1972 | 87A | w/e | 13/07/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1947 | 2w/e | 10/06/1972 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 16/12/1972 | 87A | w/e | 17/03/1973 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1607 | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 27/01/1973 | 87A | w/e | 07/09/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1939 | w/e | 06/11/1971 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 03/02/1973 | 87A | m/e | 05/1977 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1954 | w/e | 26/06/1971 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 17/02/1973 | 87A | m/e | 03/1978 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47057 | w/e | 10/02/1973 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 17/03/1973 | 87A | w/e | 24/03/1973 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1955 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 17/03/1973 | 87A | m/e | 11/1978 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1943 | w/e | 13/05/1972 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 31/03/1973 | 87A | m/e | 05/1977 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1952 | w/e | 07/04/1973 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 14/04/1973 | 87A | m/e | 07/1977 | O/L | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1958 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 28/04/1973 | 87A | on | 01/10/1991 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1947 | w/e | 17/03/1973 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 05/05/1973 | 87A | on | 04/10/1987 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47062 | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 12/05/1973 | LE | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1659 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 12/05/1973 | LE | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1959 | w/e | 25/11/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 12/05/1973 | LE | m/e | 03/1978 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1681 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 09/06/1973 | LE | w/e | 23/06/1973 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1951 | w/e | 10/03/1973 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 23/06/1973 | LE | m/e | 03/1978 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1589 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 25/08/1973 | LE | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47057 | w/e | 24/03/1973 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 06/10/1973 | LE | w/e | 06/04/1974 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6837 | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 17/11/1973 | LE | w/e | 10/08/1974 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6839 | 5w/e | 05/08/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 17/11/1973 | LE | w/e | 02/02/1974 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6840 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 17/11/1973 | LE | w/e | 09/02/1974 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6841 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 17/11/1973 | LE | w/e | 10/08/1974 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47530 | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 24/11/1973 | LE | m/e | 05/1977 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6896 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 24/11/1973 | LE | on | 04/10/1987 | IS | Inverness |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6903 | 5w/e | 05/08/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 24/11/1973 | LE | on | 15/05/1988 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6971 | on | 18/03/1965 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction (New) | w/e | 02/02/1974 | LE | m/e | 02/1977 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6974 | on | 06/04/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | w/e | 09/02/1974 | LE | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37289 | on | 17/06/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | w/e | 09/02/1974 | LE | m/e | 07/1981 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47074 | w/e | 07/07/1973 | BS | Bescot | w/e | 06/04/1974 | LE | w/e | 06/04/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47464 | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47484 | w/e | 08/12/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | m/e | 05/1977 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47493 | on | 24/02/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | m/e | 05/1977 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47494 | w/e | 08/07/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | m/e | 05/1977 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47495 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | m/e | 05/1977 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1940 | 2w/e | 10/06/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | m/e | 05/1977 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47498 | w/e | 13/05/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | m/e | 05/1977 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47499 | 3w/e | 30/09/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | m/e | 05/1977 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47502 | w/e | 19/08/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | m/e | 05/1977 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47505 | w/e | 22/07/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | on | 04/10/1987 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47506 | 2w/e | 02/09/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | on | 04/10/1987 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47509 | w/e | 05/05/1973 | BR | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | m/e | 03/1978 | OC | Old Oak Common | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47059 | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 13/07/1974 | LE | w/e | 09/11/1974 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47185 | w/e | 10/11/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 13/07/1974 | LE | w/e | 20/07/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 03151 | w/e | 10/02/1973 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens | w/e | 13/07/1974 | LE | on | 07/07/1985 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 03152 | w/e | 10/02/1973 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens | w/e | 13/07/1974 | LE | on | 02/10/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47054 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 20/07/1974 | LE | w/e | 11/10/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37235 | w/e | 28/10/1972 | 52A | Gateshead | 2w/e | 10/08/1974 | LE | on | 31/03/2008 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37240 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | w/e | 10/08/1974 | LE | on | 04/09/1988 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47024 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 07/09/1974 | LE | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47063 | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | BS | Bescot | w/e | 05/10/1974 | LE | w/e | 11/10/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47020 | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | LE | w/e | 09/11/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47129 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | LE | w/e | 11/10/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47131 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | LE | w/e | 10/01/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47134 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | LE | on | 15/05/1988 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47146 | w/e | 07/07/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | LE | 2w/e | 08/02/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47258 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | LE | 2w/e | 21/12/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37143 | 4w/e | 26/10/1968 | 65A | Eastfield | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | LE | w/e | 09/11/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47540 | w/e | 03/08/1974 | CD | Crewe Diesel | w/e | 09/11/1974 | LE | on | 01/05/1977 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47148 | w/e | 07/07/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 09/11/1974 | LE | m/e | 10/1976 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47543 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 21/12/1974 | LE | w/e | 15/03/1975 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47478 | w/e | 13/07/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 15/03/1975 | LE | m/e | 05/1977 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47464 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | LE | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47140 | 2w/e | 08/02/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | LE | w/e | 11/10/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47146 | 2w/e | 08/02/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | LE | on | 04/10/1987 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47147 | w/e | 07/07/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | LE | on | 28/04/1998 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47157 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | LE | on | 04/10/1987 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37290 | on | 18/06/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 06/12/1975 | LE | m/e | 07/1981 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47026 | 2w/e | 08/02/1975 | LA | Laira | w/e | 08/05/1976 | LE | w/e | 10/07/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47151 | w/e | 01/06/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 08/05/1976 | LE | on | 01/10/1995 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47152 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 08/05/1976 | LE | on | 04/10/1987 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47060 | w/e | 07/12/1974 | OC | Old Oak Common | w/e | 10/07/1976 | LE | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08792 | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 10/1976 | LE | on | 31/05/1981 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08492 | m/e | 10/1976 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 11/1976 | LE | m/e | 01/1977 | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08484 | on | 10/10/1958 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 2w/e | 06/12/1976 | LE | 3w/e | 26/11/1977 | RG | Reading (W.R.) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37298 | on | 12/08/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | m/e | 02/1977 | LE | on | 04/10/1987 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37299 | on | 20/08/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | m/e | 02/1977 | LE | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47054 | w/e | 10/01/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | on | 17/07/1992 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47055 | w/e | 10/01/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47056 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47059 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | on | 01/03/2000 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47066 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47068 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | m/e | 11/1981 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47075 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | m/e | 11/1981 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47125 | w/e | 07/12/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47129 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47131 | w/e | 10/01/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | on | 23/02/1987 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47136 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47137 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | on | 03/08/1987 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47148 | m/e | 10/1976 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | on | 22/07/1987 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08664 | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47508 | m/e | 07/1977 | O/L | m/e | 10/1977 | LE | m/e | 03/1978 | OC | Old Oak Common | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37295 | on | 13/07/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | m/e | 10/1977 | LE | on | 22/11/1981 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37296 | on | 16/07/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | m/e | 10/1977 | LE | on | 22/11/1981 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37297 | on | 21/07/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | m/e | 10/1977 | LE | on | 22/11/1981 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47500 | m/e | 05/1977 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | 3w/e | 26/11/1977 | LE | m/e | 03/1978 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47502 | m/e | 05/1977 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | 3w/e | 26/11/1977 | LE | on | 04/10/1987 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08110 | w/e | 12/10/1974 | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | on | 09/01/1978 | LE | on | 21/10/1979 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08118 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | m/e | 30/11/1979 | LE | on | 23/03/1980 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08364 | w/e | 10/01/1976 | OC | Old Oak Common | on | 08/12/1980 | LE | on | 21/01/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08592 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | on | 08/12/1980 | LE | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47482 | w/e | 30/03/1974 | BS | Bescot | on | 05/01/1981 | LE | on | 04/10/1987 | IS | Inverness |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08898 | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 87E | Landore | on | 31/05/1981 | LE | on | 07/12/1988 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47477 | w/e | 07/09/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | on | 01/11/1981 | LE | on | 15/05/1988 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37264 | w/e | 13/12/1969 | 30A | Stratford | on | 01/11/1981 | LE | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37265 | w/e | 13/12/1969 | 30A | Stratford | on | 01/11/1981 | LE | on | 01/03/2000 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37266 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 30A | Stratford | on | 01/11/1981 | LE | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37295 | m/e | 10/1977 | LE | Landore | on | 22/11/1981 | LE | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37296 | m/e | 10/1977 | LE | Landore | on | 22/11/1981 | LE | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37297 | m/e | 10/1977 | LE | Landore | on | 22/11/1981 | LE | on | 01/07/2000 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08646 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 83A | Newton Abbot | on | 11/10/1987 | LE | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08756 | w/e | 21/02/1976 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | on | 11/10/1987 | LE |