Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 54 Today
» 986 Yesterday
» 5562 Week
» 26464 Month
» 26464 Year
» 1248029 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Leamington


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Leamington Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 3100/5100 2-6-2T 5137       4w/e 01/12/1945 94 6w/e 30/06/1951 84C Banbury
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8454       31/12/1949 (New) LMTN 4w/e 31/08/1951 87B Duffryn Yard
Steam Hall 4-6-0 6924       4w/e 31/12/1950 84D 4w/e 01/11/1952 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5923       4w/e 28/02/1951 84D 3w/e 19/05/1951 86E Severn Tunnel Junction
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5966       4w/e 28/02/1951 84D 4w/e 01/11/1952 84B Oxley
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90685 4w/e 31/12/1950 84K Chester West 4w/e 28/02/1951 84D 6w/e 30/06/1951 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Steam Grange 4-6-0 6835       3w/e 19/05/1951 84D 6w/e 30/06/1951 84C Banbury
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4987       m/e 31/07/1951 84D 4w/e 01/11/1952 84C Banbury
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3619 4w/e 31/12/1949 TYS Tyseley 4w/e 30/09/1951 84D 4w/e 19/05/1962 84G Kidderminster
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3624       4w/e 30/09/1951 84D 4w/e 08/10/1960 87H Neyland
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4102 4w/e 31/01/1952 84C Banbury 4w/e 30/04/1952 84D 3w/e 17/05/1952 84C Banbury
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6624 3w/e 19/05/1951 84G Shrewsbury w/e 06/09/1952 84D 4w/e 02/11/1957 88A Cardiff Cathays
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 5184       4w/e 21/02/1953 84D m/e 16/06/1956 83G Penzance
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90563 4w/e 21/02/1953 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 03/10/1953 84D 4w/e 24/04/1954 84G Shrewsbury
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90466 4w/e 05/09/1953 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 03/10/1953 84D 4w/e 27/03/1954 84G Shrewsbury
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90010 4w/e 03/10/1953 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 27/03/1954 84D 4w/e 14/07/1956 84G Shrewsbury
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90483 4w/e 03/10/1953 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 24/04/1954 84D 4w/e 05/09/1959 84C Banbury
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4118 4w/e 07/09/1946 OXF Oxford 4w/e 09/10/1954 84D m/e 09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4171 4w/e 22/05/1954 84E Tyseley 4w/e 09/10/1954 84D m/e 10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6633       8w/e 26/03/1955 84D 4w/e 16/07/1955 84J Croes Newydd
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 5161 m/e 16/06/1956 83G Penzance 4w/e 14/07/1956 84D m/e 04/1957 Withdrawn
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 5184 m/e 16/06/1956 83G Penzance 4w/e 14/07/1956 84D 4w/e 14/06/1958 83B Taunton
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90261 4w/e 31/10/1953 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 14/07/1956 84D 4w/e 05/09/1959 84C Banbury
Steam 58xx 0-4-2T 5813 8w/e 23/03/1946 BRD Bristol Bath Road 8w/e 20/04/1957 84D m/e 11/1957 Withdrawn
Steam 58xx 0-4-2T 5815       8w/e 20/04/1957 84D 4w/e 22/02/1958 84C Banbury
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 5101       4w/e 13/07/1957 84D m/e 06/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4128 8w/e 20/04/1957 84K Chester West 4w/e 02/11/1957 84D 4w/e 14/06/1958 83B Taunton
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 5198       4w/e 02/11/1957 84D 4w/e 09/08/1958 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4103 4w/e 25/11/1953 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 30/11/1957 84D 4w/e 05/09/1959 81F Oxford
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6134 4w/e 03/10/1953 84E Tyseley 4w/e 30/11/1957 84D 4w/e 25/01/1958 86E Severn Tunnel Junction
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4933 4w/e 05/10/1957 85A Worcester 4w/e 25/01/1958 84D 4w/e 06/09/1958 82D Westbury
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82007 4w/e 12/06/1958 84H Wellington 4w/e 14/06/1958 84D 4w/e 09/08/1958 84K Wrexham Rhosddu
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 5184 4w/e 14/06/1958 83B Taunton 4w/e 04/10/1958 84D 4w/e 08/09/1962 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4162 4w/e 19/04/1958 84E Tyseley 4w/e 01/11/1958 84D m/e 07/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42566 w/e 15/11/1958 2A Rugby 4w/e 29/11/1958 84D w/e 20/12/1958 2A Rugby
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41227 w/e 15/11/1958 2A Rugby 4w/e 29/11/1958 84D w/e 29/08/1959 91W To Western Region / GWR
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41228 w/e 15/11/1958 2A Rugby 4w/e 29/11/1958 84D w/e 06/02/1960 2A Rugby
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41285 w/e 15/11/1958 2A Rugby 4w/e 29/11/1958 84D 4w/e 08/08/1959 84K Wrexham Rhosddu
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42566 w/e 20/12/1958 2A Rugby 4w/e 21/02/1959 84D 4w/e 31/12/1960 87E Landore
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 5194 4w/e 01/11/1958 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 26/12/1959 84D m/e 04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9614 4w/e 30/06/1949 TYS Tyseley 4w/e 26/12/1959 84D 4w/e 30/01/1960 84E Tyseley
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9733       4w/e 26/12/1959 84D 4w/e 30/01/1960 84E Tyseley
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41285 4w/e 08/08/1959 84K Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 30/01/1960 84D w/e 19/03/1960 2A Rugby
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 5177 4w/e 09/08/1958 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 26/03/1960 84D m/e 05/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41285 w/e 19/03/1960 2A Rugby w/e 28/05/1960 84D w/e 20/07/1963 89D Oswestry
Steam 2251 0-6-0 2211 4w/e 13/06/1959 84E Tyseley 4w/e 03/12/1960 84D m/e 11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 2251 0-6-0 2257 4w/e 01/11/1952 84E Tyseley 4w/e 03/12/1960 84D 4w/e 14/07/1962 89B Croes Newydd
Steam 2251 0-6-0 2267 4w/e 21/02/1959 84E Tyseley 4w/e 03/12/1960 84D m/e 11/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4176 4w/e 21/05/1960 83C Exeter 4w/e 03/12/1960 84D w/e 17/04/1965 2B Oxley
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40085 4w/e 10/09/1960 84G Kidderminster 4w/e 03/12/1960 84D w/e 29/04/1961 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41204 4w/e 30/01/1960 84H Wellington 4w/e 03/12/1960 84D 4w/e 25/03/1961 84H Wellington
Steam 2251 0-6-0 3219 4w/e 25/11/1953 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 28/01/1961 84D 4w/e 25/02/1961 81D Reading (W.R.)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42566 4w/e 31/12/1960 87E Landore 4w/e 25/02/1961 84D w/e 18/08/1962 1A Willesden
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4125 4w/e 09/08/1958 81F Oxford 4w/e 20/05/1961 84D 4w/e 12/08/1961 84E Tyseley
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6618 4w/e 25/03/1961 84E Tyseley 4w/e 12/08/1961 84D m/e 11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44272 01/01/1948 22B Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 12/08/1961 84D 4w/e 09/09/1961 85C Gloucester Barnwood
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40537 4w/e 21/02/1959 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 09/09/1961 84D 4w/e 24/03/1962 82G Templecombe (S&D)
Steam 2251 0-6-0 2201 4w/e 17/06/1961 89B Croes Newydd 4w/e 07/10/1961 84D 4w/e 24/02/1962 81E Didcot
Steam 2251 0-6-0 2210 4w/e 17/06/1961 89B Croes Newydd 4w/e 07/10/1961 84D w/e 14/11/1964 2D Banbury
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41231 4w/e 26/03/1960 84H Wellington 4w/e 07/10/1961 84D m/e 05/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 5192 4w/e 09/10/1954 84E Tyseley 4w/e 04/11/1961 84D 4w/e 19/05/1962 84F Stourbridge Junction
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4125 4w/e 12/08/1961 84E Tyseley 4w/e 27/01/1962 84D w/e 06/03/1965 2A Tyseley
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6671 4w/e 07/10/1961 85A Worcester 4w/e 24/02/1962 84D w/e 19/06/1965 2D Banbury
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6644 4w/e 20/05/1961 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 21/04/1962 84D 4w/e 08/09/1962 84B Oxley
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6663 4w/e 22/04/1961 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 19/05/1962 84D m/e 06/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 2251 0-6-0 3217 4w/e 26/03/1960 84C Banbury 4w/e 16/06/1962 84D m/e 11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4178 4w/e 11/08/1962 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 08/09/1962 84D w/e 24/10/1964 2A Tyseley
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75000 4w/e 14/07/1962 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 08/09/1962 84D w/e 14/09/1963 83E Yeovil Town
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4120 4w/e 14/07/1962 84E Tyseley 4w/e 06/10/1962 84D m/e 11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5640 4w/e 08/10/1960 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 06/10/1962 84D m/e 06/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4133 4w/e 02/12/1961 84E Tyseley 4w/e 03/11/1962 84D m/e 10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5658 4w/e 04/10/1958 84E Tyseley 2w/e 17/11/1962 84D w/e 13/11/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6668 4w/e 03/10/1953 84E Tyseley 2w/e 17/11/1962 84D w/e 06/11/1965 6C Croes Newydd
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48412 4w/e 30/01/1960 81A Old Oak Common 2w/e 17/11/1962 84D w/e 23/03/1963 84E Tyseley
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4151 4w/e 08/09/1962 86E Severn Tunnel Junction w/e 22/06/1963 84D w/e 13/03/1965 2C Stourbridge Junction
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6639 4w/e 25/03/1961 88G Llantrisant 4w/e 29/06/1963 84D w/e 20/07/1963 84D Leamington
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6639 4w/e 29/06/1963 84D Leamington w/e 20/07/1963 84D m/e 10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41272 w/e 24/06/1961 72A Exmouth Junction w/e 20/07/1963 84D w/e 14/11/1964 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80072 w/e 21/07/1962 87D Swansea East Dock w/e 14/09/1963 2L w/e 19/06/1965 6D Shrewsbury
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6644 4w/e 08/09/1962 84B Oxley w/e 02/11/1963 2L w/e 19/06/1965 2A Tyseley
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41241 4w/e 31/10/1959 84H Wellington w/e 01/02/1964 2L w/e 13/06/1964 2M Wellington
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41232 4w/e 27/02/1960 84H Wellington w/e 08/02/1964 2L w/e 14/11/1964 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6364 4w/e 06/10/1962 84G Kidderminster w/e 22/02/1964 2L w/e 08/08/1964 2P Kidderminster
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41204 w/e 22/06/1963 5A Crewe North w/e 07/03/1964 2L w/e 13/06/1964 5A Crewe North
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 5153 4w/e 08/09/1962 84G Kidderminster w/e 15/08/1964 2L m/e 11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6697 4w/e 20/07/1964 88B Radyr w/e 12/09/1964 2L w/e 19/06/1965 2D Banbury
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73066 w/e 18/05/1963 14A Cricklewood East w/e 10/10/1964 2L w/e 19/06/1965 2A Tyseley
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73069 w/e 18/05/1963 14A Cricklewood East w/e 10/10/1964 2L w/e 19/06/1965 2A Tyseley
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73156 w/e 18/05/1963 14A Cricklewood East w/e 10/10/1964 2L w/e 19/06/1965 2A Tyseley
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73026 w/e 11/04/1959 84G Shrewsbury w/e 24/10/1964 2L w/e 19/06/1965 2A Tyseley
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46428 w/e 24/03/1962 21C Bushbury w/e 24/10/1964 2L w/e 19/06/1965 2A Tyseley
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46442 w/e 01/02/1964 6C Croes Newydd w/e 24/10/1964 2L w/e 19/06/1965 2A Tyseley
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46457 w/e 18/07/1964 6A Chester (MR) w/e 24/10/1964 2L w/e 19/06/1965 2A Tyseley
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46470 w/e 09/03/1963 6A Chester (MR) w/e 24/10/1964 2L w/e 19/06/1965 2A Tyseley
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46505 w/e 07/12/1963 2E Saltley w/e 24/10/1964 2L w/e 19/06/1965 2E Saltley