Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 710 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2434 Week
» 12569 Month
» 328800 Year
» 839902 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Leicester Midland


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Leicester Midland Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1728 m/e 03/1886 16 Kentish Town (New) m/e 04/1892 10 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1729 m/e 03/1886 3W Walsall Pleck (New) m/e 04/1892 10 m/e 01/1899 3B Bournville
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 2019       m/e 05/1892 (New) 10 m/e 01/1899 10 Leicester Midland
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 2020       m/e 05/1892 (New) 10 m/e 01/1899 10 Leicester Midland
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 2021       m/e 05/1892 (New) 10 m/e 01/1899 10C Coalville
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 2017 m/e 05/1892 7 Gloucester Barnwood (New) m/e 01/1899 10 m/e 12/1902 10 Leicester Midland
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 2019 m/e 05/1892 10 Leicester Midland (New) m/e 01/1899 10 m/e 12/1902 10 Leicester Midland
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 2020 m/e 05/1892 10 Leicester Midland (New) m/e 01/1899 10 m/e 12/1902 10 Leicester Midland
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 2022 m/e 05/1892 14H Hitchin (MR) (New) m/e 01/1899 10 m/e 12/1902 10 Leicester Midland
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 2017 m/e 01/1899 10 Leicester Midland m/e 12/1902 10 m/e 05/1908 10 Leicester Midland
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 2019 m/e 01/1899 10 Leicester Midland m/e 12/1902 10 m/e 05/1908 10 Leicester Midland
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 2020 m/e 01/1899 10 Leicester Midland m/e 12/1902 10 m/e 05/1908 10 Leicester Midland
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 2022 m/e 01/1899 10 Leicester Midland m/e 12/1902 10 m/e 05/1908 10 Leicester Midland
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1365 m/e 12/1902 10 Leicester Midland m/e 05/1908 10 m/e 04/1914 10 Leicester Midland
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1366 m/e 12/1902 10C Coalville m/e 05/1908 10 m/e 04/1914 10 Leicester Midland
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1367 m/e 12/1902 10 Leicester Midland m/e 05/1908 10 m/e 04/1914 10 Leicester Midland
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1368 m/e 12/1902 10 Leicester Midland m/e 05/1908 10 m/e 04/1914 10 Leicester Midland
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1369 m/e 12/1902 10C Coalville m/e 05/1908 10 m/e 04/1914 10 Leicester Midland
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1370 m/e 12/1902 10 Leicester Midland m/e 05/1908 10 m/e 04/1914 10 Leicester Midland
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1365 m/e 05/1908 10 Leicester Midland m/e 04/1914 10 m/e 12/1921 10 Leicester Midland
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1366 m/e 05/1908 10 Leicester Midland m/e 04/1914 10 m/e 12/1921 10 Leicester Midland
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1367 m/e 05/1908 10 Leicester Midland m/e 04/1914 10 m/e 12/1921 10 Leicester Midland
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1368 m/e 05/1908 10 Leicester Midland m/e 04/1914 10 m/e 12/1921 10 Leicester Midland
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1369 m/e 05/1908 10 Leicester Midland m/e 04/1914 10 m/e 12/1921 10 Leicester Midland
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1370 m/e 05/1908 10 Leicester Midland m/e 04/1914 10 m/e 12/1921 10 Leicester Midland
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1365 m/e 04/1914 10 Leicester Midland m/e 12/1921 10 m/e 03/1930 4 Worcester (MR)
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1366 m/e 04/1914 10 Leicester Midland m/e 12/1921 10 m/e 03/1930 20 Buxton (MR)
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1367 m/e 04/1914 10 Leicester Midland m/e 12/1921 10 m/e 03/1930 M10 Leicester Midland
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1368 m/e 04/1914 10 Leicester Midland m/e 12/1921 10 m/e 03/1930 M10 Leicester Midland
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1369 m/e 04/1914 10 Leicester Midland m/e 12/1921 10 m/e 03/1930 M10 Leicester Midland
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1370 m/e 04/1914 10 Leicester Midland m/e 12/1921 10 m/e 03/1930 M10 Leicester Midland
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1367 m/e 12/1921 10 Leicester Midland m/e 03/1930 M10 m/e 09/1933 M10 Leicester Midland
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1368 m/e 12/1921 10 Leicester Midland m/e 03/1930 M10 m/e 09/1933 25 Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1369 m/e 12/1921 10 Leicester Midland m/e 03/1930 M10 m/e 09/1933 M14 Bedford
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1370 m/e 12/1921 10 Leicester Midland m/e 03/1930 M10 m/e 09/1933 6 Swansea (Upper Bank)
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1367 m/e 03/1930 M10 Leicester Midland m/e 09/1933 M10 m/e 11/1945 21A Saltley
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1381 m/e 03/1930 M16 Kentish Town m/e 09/1933 M10 4w/e 02/12/1933 Withdrawn
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1425 m/e 03/1930 M18 Nottingham m/e 09/1933 M10 m/e 11/1945 16A Nottingham
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1402 m/e 09/1933 M18 Nottingham m/e 11/1945 15C 4w/e 21/05/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1407 m/e 09/1933 29 Manningham m/e 11/1945 15C 4w/e 18/05/1946 Withdrawn
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1422 m/e 11/1945 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 22/06/1946 15C 4w/e 21/03/1953 16A Nottingham
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2792       01/01/1948 15C 4w/e 19/04/1952 17D Rowsley
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 116       01/01/1948 15C 4w/e 04/11/1950 22A Bristol Barrow Road
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 120       01/01/1948 15C 5w/e 24/12/1949 16A Nottingham
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 141       01/01/1948 15C 5w/e 16/07/1949 15D Bedford
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 145       01/01/1948 15C 4w/e 31/12/1951 86K Abergavenny
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 146       01/01/1948 15C 4w/e 23/02/1952 16D Mansfield
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 165       01/01/1948 15C w/e 10/01/1959 15E Leicester (G.C.)
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 182       01/01/1948 15C 4w/e 26/02/1955 22A Bristol Barrow Road
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7274       01/01/1948 15C m/e 12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7441       01/01/1948 15C w/e 06/02/1960 17A Derby
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7442       01/01/1948 15C w/e 24/10/1959 15E Leicester (G.C.)
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7533       01/01/1948 15C w/e 06/02/1960 17A Derby
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7534       01/01/1948 15C w/e 22/10/1960 17A Derby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3937       01/01/1948 15C w/e 19/05/1962 9G Gorton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3965       01/01/1948 15C 4w/e 18/05/1957 21A Saltley
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3977       01/01/1948 15C 4w/e 22/03/1952 15B Kettering
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4034       01/01/1948 15C m/e 07/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4123       01/01/1948 15C 4w/e 07/10/1950 22B Gloucester Barnwood
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4231       01/01/1948 15C m/e 06/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4403       01/01/1948 15C w/e 28/09/1963 15C Kettering
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4423       01/01/1948 15C m/e 11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1089       01/01/1948 15C 8w/e 14/06/1952 15B Kettering
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2330       01/01/1948 15C w/e 09/12/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2334       01/01/1948 15C 4w/e 04/12/1954 21B Bournville
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1008       01/01/1948 15C 4w/e 16/07/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1011       01/01/1948 15C m/e 02/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1031       01/01/1948 15C m/e 11/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1041       01/01/1948 15C m/e 11/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 400 4w/e 22/06/1946 16A Nottingham 01/01/1948 15C m/e 01/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 468       01/01/1948 15C 3w/e 11/12/1948 15A Wellingborough
Steam 2P 4-4-0 485       01/01/1948 15C m/e 08/1957 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 536       01/01/1948 15C 5w/e 16/02/1952 35C Spital Bridge
Steam 2P 4-4-0 538       01/01/1948 15C 4w/e 27/01/1951 19B Sheffield Millhouses
Steam 2P 4-4-0 541       01/01/1948 15C 8w/e 29/11/1952 22B Gloucester Barnwood
Steam 2P 4-4-0 542       01/01/1948 15C 4w/e 08/09/1956 16A Nottingham
Steam 2P 4-4-0 543       01/01/1948 15C m/e 01/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 549       01/01/1948 15C 3w/e 14/01/1950 19B Sheffield Millhouses
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8132       01/01/1948 15C 2w/e 17/06/1950 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8211       01/01/1948 15C w/e 06/02/1960 16A Nottingham
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8397       01/01/1948 15C 4w/e 08/08/1953 19C Canklow
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8398       01/01/1948 15C 5w/e 24/12/1949 2A Rugby
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8399       01/01/1948 15C 4w/e 09/09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8531       01/01/1948 15C 4w/e 26/01/1952 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8619       01/01/1948 15C 4w/e 16/05/1953 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8668       01/01/1948 15C m/e 16/06/1956 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8709       01/01/1948 15C 4w/e 23/02/1952 16A Nottingham
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8728       01/01/1948 15C 4w/e 22/03/1958 18A Toton
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3790       01/01/1948 15C 02/06/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3807       01/01/1948 15C 06/09/1952 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3829       01/01/1948 15C 4w/e 09/10/1954 15D Bedford
Steam 3P 4-4-0 740       01/01/1948 15C m/e 11/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3183       01/01/1948 15C 3w/e 24/01/1953 20D Normanton
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3205       01/01/1948 15C 19/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3232       01/01/1948 15C 03/09/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3326       01/01/1948 15C 30/07/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3333       01/01/1948 15C 4w/e 22/03/1958 15B Kettering
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3411       01/01/1948 15C 27/05/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3653       01/01/1948 15C 04/07/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3676       01/01/1948 15C 15/10/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3710       01/01/1948 15C 15/03/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3728       01/01/1948 15C 05/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3748       01/01/1948 15C 03/11/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3753       01/01/1948 15C 4w/e 08/03/1958 41D Canklow
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2120       01/01/1948 15C 4w/e 24/02/1951 16D Mansfield
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44663       w/e 18/06/1949 (New) 15C 4w/e 26/01/1957 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44583 01/01/1948 21A Saltley 5w/e 24/12/1949 15C 8w/e 19/06/1954 21A Saltley
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43454 01/01/1948 20A Holbeck (MR) 5w/e 24/12/1949 15C 4w/e 23/02/1952 15D Bedford
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48027 01/01/1948 16C Kirkby in Ashfield 3w/e 14/01/1950 15C w/e 26/03/1960 15A Wellingborough
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41053 01/01/1948 20H Lancaster Green Ayre 2w/e 17/06/1950 15C 4w/e 07/10/1950 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41075 01/01/1948 19B Sheffield Millhouses 2w/e 17/06/1950 15C 8w/e 16/07/1955 20E Manningham
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41006 01/01/1948 20G Hellifield 2w/e 17/06/1950 15C m/e 05/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1341 m/e 11/1945 16D Mansfield 2w/e 17/06/1950 15C 4w/e 09/09/1950 15D Bedford
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41268       08/1950 (New) 15C w/e 14/02/1959 27A Bank Hall
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1379 m/e 11/1945 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 09/09/1950 15C 4w/e 19/03/1952 71J Highbridge
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41053 2w/e 17/06/1950 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 07/10/1950 15C w/e 26/05/1956 Withdrawn
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42791 01/01/1948 20E Manningham 4w/e 04/11/1950 15C 4w/e 31/12/1950 14B Kentish Town
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44020 01/01/1948 20B Stourton 4w/e 27/01/1951 15C 4w/e 26/01/1952 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45221 4w/e 02/12/1950 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 24/02/1951 15C 4w/e 26/01/1957 15D Bedford
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 41938 4w/e 24/02/1951 16D Mansfield 4w/e 24/03/1951 15C m/e 02/1955 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73003       05/1951 (New) 15C 4w/e 25/01/1958 22A Bristol Barrow Road
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73004       06/1951 (New) 15C 4w/e 29/12/1951 17A Derby
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41059 01/01/1948 17A Derby 4w/e 16/06/1951 15C 4w/e 17/07/1951 15B Kettering
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41059 4w/e 17/07/1951 15B Kettering 4w/e 06/10/1951 15C 4w/e 09/10/1954 15D Bedford
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44917 3w/e 14/01/1950 17A Derby 4w/e 29/12/1951 15C 4w/e 26/01/1952 17A Derby
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73004 4w/e 29/12/1951 17A Derby 4w/e 26/01/1952 15C 4w/e 26/01/1957 17E Heaton Mersey
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42769 4w/e 02/12/1950 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe 4w/e 26/01/1952 15C 4w/e 19/04/1952 16A Nottingham
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44535 4w/e 26/01/1952 21A Saltley 4w/e 23/02/1952 15C 4w/e 22/03/1952 15B Kettering
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40146 4w/e 23/02/1952 16D Mansfield 4w/e 19/04/1952 15C 4w/e 25/02/1956 16C Mansfield
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43018       4w/e 12/07/1952 15C w/e 08/11/1958 24J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41089 8w/e 14/06/1952 15B Kettering 4w/e 06/09/1952 15C 4w/e 26/01/1957 21B Bournville
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41097 4w/e 06/09/1952 15D Bedford 8w/e 29/11/1952 15C 4w/e 03/12/1955 16A Nottingham
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43629 4w/e 26/01/1952 15D Bedford 4w/e 18/04/1953 15C 11/04/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48183 01/01/1948 28A Motherwell 4w/e 16/05/1953 15C 8w/e 11/07/1953 15A Wellingborough
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48619 01/01/1948 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 16/05/1953 15C w/e 21/02/1959 15D Coalville
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41094 5w/e 16/07/1949 15D Bedford 8w/e 11/07/1953 15C 4w/e 17/07/1954 17A Derby
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40409 4w/e 16/05/1953 22A Bristol Barrow Road 8w/e 11/07/1953 15C 4w/e 08/10/1955 20F Skipton
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41198 8w/e 11/07/1953 22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 08/08/1953 15C m/e 11/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47227 01/01/1948 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 31/10/1953 15C m/e 07/1957 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73046       11/1953 (New) 15C 4w/e 10/05/1958 41C Sheffield Millhouses
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43799 01/01/1948 18A Toton 4w/e 28/11/1953 15C 26/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73049       12/1953 (New) 15C 5w/e 12/08/1955 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48149 4w/e 31/12/1950 20B Stourton 4w/e 02/01/1954 15C w/e 26/03/1960 15A Wellingborough
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48266 4w/e 30/01/1954 16A Nottingham 4w/e 27/02/1954 15C w/e 26/03/1960 15A Wellingborough
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48313 4w/e 03/10/1953 20D Normanton 4w/e 27/02/1954 15C 4w/e 05/11/1955 18A Toton
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42327 8w/e 14/06/1952 21A Saltley 8w/e 19/06/1954 15C 4w/e 14/08/1954 21A Saltley
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40452 01/01/1948 20F Skipton 8w/e 19/06/1954 15C m/e 01/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48061 4w/e 30/01/1954 18A Toton 8w/e 19/06/1954 15C w/e 26/03/1960 15A Wellingborough
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48107 4w/e 27/03/1954 18A Toton 8w/e 19/06/1954 15C w/e 26/03/1960 15A Wellingborough
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78028       07/1954 (New) 15C w/e 10/01/1959 15B Kettering
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78029       07/1954 (New) 15C w/e 07/11/1959 16A Nottingham
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44182 4w/e 14/08/1954 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 09/10/1954 15C 4w/e 21/05/1955 15A Wellingborough
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43843 01/01/1948 21A Saltley 4w/e 04/12/1954 15C 4w/e 18/05/1957 27E Walton on the Hill
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44184 01/01/1948 21A Saltley 4w/e 04/12/1954 15C 4w/e 06/09/1958 21A Saltley
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58193 4w/e 21/03/1953 15B Kettering 4w/e 04/12/1954 15C m/e 04/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 1142 0-6-0 58164 4w/e 21/03/1953 15B Kettering 4w/e 04/12/1954 15C 21/04/1955 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41091 01/01/1948 15D Bedford 4w/e 29/01/1955 15C m/e 04/1955 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41181 8w/e 14/06/1952 16A Nottingham 4w/e 26/02/1955 15C 4w/e 20/04/1957 22B Gloucester Barnwood
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48007 01/01/1948 16C Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 26/03/1955 15C w/e 26/03/1960 15A Wellingborough
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48418 01/01/1948 18A Toton 4w/e 26/03/1955 15C m/e 16/06/1956 86G Pontypool Road
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48507 4w/e 18/04/1953 18A Toton 4w/e 26/03/1955 15C 4w/e 22/03/1958 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48533 01/01/1948 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 26/03/1955 15C 4w/e 05/11/1955 16C Mansfield
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40182 4w/e 26/02/1955 22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 23/04/1955 15C w/e 10/01/1959 15E Leicester (G.C.)
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73073 6w/e 20/04/1955 71G Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 13/08/1955 15C 4w/e 10/05/1958 41C Sheffield Millhouses
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43995 01/01/1948 18A Toton 4w/e 03/12/1955 15C 4w/e 26/01/1957 15A Wellingborough
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42160 4w/e 19/05/1951 17A Derby 4w/e 03/12/1955 15C w/e 30/04/1960 21A Saltley
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44252 01/01/1948 17C Coalville 4w/e 31/12/1955 15C w/e 10/01/1959 16C Mansfield
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43930 01/01/1948 17B Burton 4w/e 25/02/1956 15C 4w/e 25/01/1958 17E Heaton Mersey
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41078 4w/e 28/01/1956 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 25/02/1956 15C 4w/e 18/05/1957 21A Saltley
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43244 4w/e 12/07/1952 15B Kettering 4w/e 25/02/1956 15C 10/01/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41049 4w/e 28/01/1956 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 21/04/1956 15C 4w/e 19/05/1956 22B Gloucester Barnwood
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58305       4w/e 19/05/1956 15C 4w/e 22/03/1958 17B Burton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48010 01/01/1948 21A Saltley 4w/e 19/05/1956 15C w/e 26/03/1960 15A Wellingborough
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40585 4w/e 08/10/1955 16A Nottingham 4w/e 08/09/1956 15C 8w/e 05/10/1957 16A Nottingham
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41144 8w/e 29/11/1952 16A Nottingham 4w/e 06/10/1956 15C 4w/e 01/12/1956 16A Nottingham
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73140       11/1956 (New) 15C 4w/e 26/01/1957 6J Holyhead
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73141       12/1956 (New) 15C w/e 10/01/1959 17A Derby
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73142       12/1956 (New) 15C w/e 10/01/1959 17A Derby
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73143       12/1956 (New) 15C 4w/e 19/04/1958 16A Nottingham
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73144       12/1956 (New) 15C 4w/e 19/04/1958 16A Nottingham
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48133 4w/e 31/12/1950 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 01/12/1956 15C w/e 26/03/1960 15A Wellingborough
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46402 01/01/1948 15B Kettering 4w/e 01/12/1956 15C w/e 10/01/1959 17A Derby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44855 4w/e 16/05/1953 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe 4w/e 01/12/1956 15C 4w/e 29/12/1956 14B Kentish Town
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44175 4w/e 01/12/1956 17B Burton 4w/e 29/12/1956 15C 4w/e 26/01/1957 15A Wellingborough
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73138 11/1956 6J Holyhead (New) 4w/e 26/01/1957 15C w/e 10/01/1959 17A Derby
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48623 01/01/1948 18B Westhouses 4w/e 26/01/1957 15C 4w/e 10/08/1957 2B Nuneaton
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75057       03/1957 (New) 15C w/e 22/09/1962 17A Derby
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73004 4w/e 26/01/1957 17E Heaton Mersey 4w/e 23/03/1957 15C 4w/e 10/05/1958 41C Sheffield Millhouses
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40402 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South 4w/e 23/03/1957 15C w/e 17/09/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40464 4w/e 26/01/1952 4B Northampton 4w/e 23/03/1957 15C m/e 03/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75058       04/1957 (New) 15C w/e 22/09/1962 17A Derby
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75059       04/1957 (New) 15C w/e 22/09/1962 17A Derby
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76085       04/1957 (New) 15C 4w/e 10/08/1957 21A Saltley
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75060       05/1957 (New) 15C w/e 22/09/1962 17A Derby
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75061       05/1957 (New) 15C w/e 22/09/1962 17A Derby
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76086       05/1957 (New) 15C w/e 10/01/1959 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45263 4w/e 08/10/1955 17A Derby 4w/e 16/06/1957 15C 4w/e 22/02/1958 16A Nottingham
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92109 4w/e 16/06/1957 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 10/08/1957 15C w/e 30/11/1963 16B Annesley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92121 4w/e 16/06/1957 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 10/08/1957 15C w/e 10/04/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47543 01/01/1948 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 10/08/1957 15C w/e 10/03/1962 14A Cricklewood East
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73030 4w/e 28/11/1953 17A Derby 4w/e 25/01/1958 15C 4w/e 17/05/1958 10C Patricroft
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73067 10/1954 16A Nottingham (New) 4w/e 22/02/1958 15C 4w/e 10/05/1958 41C Sheffield Millhouses
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92100 31/08/1956 18A Toton (New) 4w/e 22/03/1958 15C w/e 12/12/1959 18A Toton
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92101 31/08/1956 18A Toton (New) 4w/e 22/03/1958 15C w/e 09/01/1960 15A Wellingborough
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92102 31/08/1956 18A Toton (New) 4w/e 22/03/1958 15C w/e 10/04/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92103 31/08/1956 18A Toton (New) 4w/e 22/03/1958 15C w/e 10/04/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92104 31/08/1956 18A Toton (New) 4w/e 22/03/1958 15C w/e 07/04/1962 18B Westhouses
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92128 30/04/1957 18A Toton (New) 4w/e 22/03/1958 15C w/e 30/06/1962 21A Saltley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92164       30/04/1958 (New) 15C w/e 30/06/1962 21A Saltley
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73135 27/10/1956 6J Holyhead (New) 4w/e 17/05/1958 15C w/e 10/01/1959 17A Derby
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73136 03/11/1956 6J Holyhead (New) 4w/e 17/05/1958 15C w/e 10/01/1959 17A Derby
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73137 11/1956 6J Holyhead (New) 4w/e 17/05/1958 15C 4w/e 14/06/1958 16A Nottingham
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73139 11/1956 6J Holyhead (New) 4w/e 17/05/1958 15C w/e 10/01/1959 17A Derby
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73140 4w/e 26/01/1957 6J Holyhead 4w/e 17/05/1958 15C 4w/e 04/10/1958 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73137 4w/e 14/06/1958 16A Nottingham 4w/e 12/07/1958 15C w/e 10/01/1959 17A Derby
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46454 4w/e 16/06/1957 17B Burton 4w/e 12/07/1958 15C w/e 24/09/1960 17A Derby
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73140 4w/e 04/10/1958 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 11/10/1958 15C w/e 10/01/1959 17A Derby
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47313 01/01/1948 21C Bromsgrove w/e 10/01/1959 15C w/e 29/10/1960 17B Burton
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43261 4w/e 26/01/1952 14A Cricklewood East w/e 10/01/1959 15C w/e 31/10/1959 14E Bedford
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47213 01/01/1948 14A Cricklewood East w/e 10/01/1959 15C w/e 31/10/1959 14A Cricklewood East
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44667       w/e 10/01/1959 15C w/e 29/09/1962 2F Woodford Halse
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44690 4w/e 14/06/1958 17A Derby w/e 10/01/1959 15C w/e 17/03/1962 15E Leicester (G.C.)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44811 4w/e 26/03/1955 17B Burton w/e 10/01/1959 15C w/e 23/11/1963 16C Derby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44815 01/01/1948 17A Derby w/e 10/01/1959 15C w/e 18/05/1963 21A Saltley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44843 4w/e 29/01/1955 17B Burton w/e 10/01/1959 15C w/e 13/07/1963 21A Saltley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44848 4w/e 08/10/1955 17A Derby w/e 10/01/1959 15C w/e 17/03/1962 15E Leicester (G.C.)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45264 4w/e 29/01/1955 17B Burton w/e 10/01/1959 15C w/e 18/05/1963 21A Saltley
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43405 01/01/1948 18A Toton w/e 07/02/1959 15C 18/02/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43277 4w/e 31/10/1953 84G Shrewsbury w/e 21/02/1959 15C 15/07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47250 01/01/1948 14A Cricklewood East w/e 21/02/1959 15C w/e 02/04/1960 18B Westhouses
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43919 8w/e 05/10/1957 17C Coalville w/e 07/03/1959 15C 05/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48118 4w/e 04/10/1958 18A Toton w/e 07/03/1959 15C w/e 21/03/1959 18A Toton
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43374 01/01/1948 21A Saltley w/e 28/03/1959 15C 24/06/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42428 4w/e 23/04/1955 3B Bushbury w/e 04/04/1959 15C w/e 06/02/1960 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47231 01/01/1948 17B Burton w/e 04/04/1959 15C w/e 16/04/1960 18A Toton
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47257 4w/e 02/01/1954 17B Burton w/e 04/04/1959 15C w/e 22/10/1960 17A Derby
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92119 w/e 10/01/1959 14A Cricklewood East w/e 11/04/1959 15C w/e 13/03/1965 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75042 4w/e 29/01/1955 15D Bedford w/e 02/05/1959 15C w/e 22/09/1962 17A Derby
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43763 w/e 13/12/1958 9G Gorton w/e 02/05/1959 15C w/e 03/10/1959 9G Gorton
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92163 30/04/1958 15B Kettering (New) w/e 20/06/1959 15C w/e 07/11/1959 15B Kettering
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40502 w/e 10/01/1959 16A Nottingham w/e 20/06/1959 15C w/e 03/10/1959 16A Nottingham
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43969 4w/e 11/08/1956 17A Derby w/e 22/08/1959 15C w/e 27/01/1962 18A Toton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3785 19/09/1959 26A Newton Heath (New) w/e 26/09/1959 15C w/e 19/03/1960 15E Leicester (G.C.)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3786       26/09/1959 (New) 15C 22/06/1998 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3787       26/09/1959 (New) 15C w/e 30/10/1971 60A Inverness
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3788       10/10/1959 (New) 15C w/e 15/07/1972 16A Toton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3789       17/10/1959 (New) 15C w/e 09/03/1968 16F Burton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3790       24/10/1959 (New) 15C w/e 27/07/1968 16B Colwick
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3791       24/10/1959 (New) 15C w/e 10/12/1966 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43793 01/01/1948 18A Toton w/e 07/11/1959 15C w/e 10/03/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45333 w/e 20/06/1959 16A Nottingham w/e 12/12/1959 15C w/e 18/05/1963 21A Saltley
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75041 4w/e 29/01/1955 15D Bedford w/e 16/01/1960 15C w/e 22/09/1962 17A Derby
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75043 4w/e 29/01/1955 15D Bedford w/e 16/01/1960 15C w/e 22/09/1962 17A Derby
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45585 w/e 21/11/1959 14B Kentish Town w/e 16/01/1960 15C w/e 01/07/1961 26A Newton Heath
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45615 01/01/1948 14B Kentish Town w/e 16/01/1960 15C w/e 08/07/1961 26A Newton Heath
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45652 4w/e 12/07/1958 14B Kentish Town w/e 16/01/1960 15C w/e 30/04/1960 14B Kentish Town
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75040 w/e 16/01/1960 17A Derby w/e 23/01/1960 15C w/e 22/09/1962 17A Derby
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75044 w/e 16/01/1960 16A Nottingham w/e 23/01/1960 15C w/e 22/09/1962 17A Derby
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75055 w/e 16/01/1960 16A Nottingham w/e 23/01/1960 15C w/e 25/02/1961 16A Nottingham
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45616 w/e 21/11/1959 16A Nottingham w/e 23/01/1960 15C w/e 27/02/1960 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45636 01/01/1948 16A Nottingham w/e 23/01/1960 15C w/e 01/07/1961 26A Newton Heath
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45650 4w/e 30/11/1957 16A Nottingham w/e 23/01/1960 15C w/e 01/07/1961 26A Newton Heath
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41321 w/e 22/11/1958 9G Gorton w/e 30/01/1960 15C w/e 16/09/1961 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47485 4w/e 22/03/1952 17B Burton w/e 06/02/1960 15C w/e 04/03/1961 14B Kentish Town
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47502 8w/e 05/10/1957 17B Burton w/e 06/02/1960 15C w/e 18/11/1961 14B Kentish Town
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44476 01/01/1948 16B Spital Bridge w/e 06/02/1960 15C w/e 28/05/1960 17B Burton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44519 01/01/1948 16B Spital Bridge w/e 06/02/1960 15C w/e 26/01/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41279 4w/e 14/06/1958 3B Bushbury w/e 20/02/1960 15C m/e 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45616 w/e 27/02/1960 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 19/03/1960 15C 21/01/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92108 w/e 18/04/1959 15A Wellingborough w/e 26/03/1960 15C w/e 10/02/1962 15A Wellingborough
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92110 w/e 18/04/1959 15A Wellingborough w/e 26/03/1960 15C w/e 10/02/1962 26B Agecroft
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92111 w/e 18/04/1959 15A Wellingborough w/e 26/03/1960 15C w/e 23/11/1963 16E Kirkby in Ashfield
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92112 w/e 18/04/1959 15A Wellingborough w/e 26/03/1960 15C w/e 07/07/1962 15A Wellingborough
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92120 w/e 21/11/1959 15A Wellingborough w/e 26/03/1960 15C w/e 12/11/1960 16D Annesley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92122 28/02/1957 15A Wellingborough (New) w/e 26/03/1960 15C w/e 07/07/1962 15A Wellingborough
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92123 31/03/1957 15A Wellingborough (New) w/e 26/03/1960 15C w/e 10/04/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92101 w/e 09/01/1960 15A Wellingborough w/e 09/04/1960 15C w/e 10/04/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42446 w/e 30/04/1960 21A Saltley w/e 13/06/1960 15C w/e 20/08/1960 6H Bangor
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45652 w/e 30/04/1960 14B Kentish Town w/e 18/06/1960 15C w/e 25/06/1960 26A Newton Heath
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43846 w/e 16/01/1960 16A Nottingham w/e 25/06/1960 15C 24/06/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43977 w/e 02/04/1960 15F Market Harborough w/e 24/09/1960 15C w/e 22/07/1961 2B Nuneaton
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41225 w/e 31/10/1959 14E Bedford w/e 24/09/1960 15C w/e 09/12/1961 14E Bedford
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44182 4w/e 21/05/1955 15A Wellingborough w/e 08/10/1960 15C m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42112 4w/e 31/10/1953 27E Walton on the Hill w/e 19/11/1960 15C w/e 10/12/1960 17A Derby
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42352 w/e 07/11/1959 17A Derby w/e 10/12/1960 15C w/e 28/04/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42361 w/e 23/01/1960 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 07/01/1961 15C w/e 10/11/1962 9G Gorton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44530 4w/e 22/03/1952 14A Cricklewood East w/e 21/01/1961 15C m/e 10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42415 w/e 20/08/1960 21A Saltley w/e 21/01/1961 15C w/e 25/11/1961 12E Barrow in Furness
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41271 09/1950 15D Bedford (New) w/e 01/07/1961 15C w/e 03/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44013 4w/e 06/09/1958 21A Saltley w/e 05/08/1961 15C m/e 10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44414 w/e 24/06/1961 17B Burton w/e 05/08/1961 15C w/e 19/09/1964 15E Coalville
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45650 w/e 01/07/1961 26A Newton Heath w/e 26/08/1961 15C w/e 18/11/1961 17B Burton
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44664 w/e 30/05/1959 16A Nottingham w/e 16/09/1961 15C w/e 14/10/1961 17A Derby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45262 w/e 10/01/1959 27F Brunswick w/e 16/09/1961 15C w/e 17/03/1962 15E Leicester (G.C.)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45346 4w/e 24/03/1951 8E Brunswick w/e 16/09/1961 15C w/e 14/10/1961 17A Derby
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45585 w/e 01/07/1961 26A Newton Heath w/e 23/09/1961 15C w/e 18/11/1961 17B Burton
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45615 w/e 08/07/1961 26A Newton Heath w/e 23/09/1961 15C w/e 18/11/1961 17B Burton
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45636 w/e 01/07/1961 26A Newton Heath w/e 23/09/1961 15C w/e 18/11/1961 17B Burton
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41228 w/e 18/02/1961 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 30/09/1961 15C w/e 08/02/1964 15B Wellingborough
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92120 w/e 12/11/1960 16D Annesley w/e 14/10/1961 15C w/e 10/04/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44030 01/01/1948 16A Nottingham w/e 18/11/1961 15C m/e 04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44158 01/01/1948 16A Nottingham w/e 18/11/1961 15C w/e 14/07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42355 w/e 10/06/1961 12E Barrow in Furness w/e 25/11/1961 15C m/e 11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42088 w/e 05/12/1959 14D Neasden w/e 09/12/1961 15C w/e 10/02/1962 9G Gorton
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75055 w/e 25/02/1961 16A Nottingham w/e 10/02/1962 15C w/e 22/09/1962 17A Derby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43969 w/e 27/01/1962 18A Toton w/e 10/03/1962 15C w/e 01/06/1963 18A Toton
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41225 w/e 09/12/1961 14E Bedford w/e 17/03/1962 15C w/e 08/02/1964 15B Wellingborough
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44203 w/e 06/01/1962 17A Derby w/e 24/03/1962 15C w/e 07/04/1962 14E Bedford
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42334 w/e 01/11/1958 14B Kentish Town w/e 19/05/1962 15C w/e 22/06/1963 9G Gorton
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73137 w/e 07/04/1962 17C Rowsley w/e 26/05/1962 15C w/e 23/06/1962 17C Rowsley
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42333 w/e 27/01/1962 14B Kentish Town w/e 26/05/1962 15C w/e 04/05/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42338 w/e 01/11/1958 14B Kentish Town w/e 26/05/1962 15C w/e 29/06/1963 9G Gorton
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45059 w/e 10/02/1962 17A Derby w/e 26/05/1962 15C w/e 23/06/1962 17A Derby
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92112 w/e 07/07/1962 15A Wellingborough w/e 14/07/1962 15C w/e 10/04/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43988 w/e 19/12/1959 27E Walton on the Hill w/e 28/07/1962 15C w/e 28/09/1963 15C Kettering
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42087 w/e 30/06/1962 14A Cricklewood East w/e 22/09/1962 15C w/e 02/05/1964 9K Bolton
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42174 w/e 17/01/1959 17A Derby w/e 22/09/1962 15C w/e 30/03/1963 14E Bedford
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42184 w/e 11/07/1959 17A Derby w/e 22/09/1962 15C w/e 15/02/1964 16D Nottingham
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42279 w/e 30/06/1962 14A Cricklewood East w/e 22/09/1962 15C 13/07/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92054 4w/e 22/03/1958 15A Wellingborough w/e 29/09/1962 15C w/e 08/12/1962 18B Westhouses
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92108 w/e 10/02/1962 15A Wellingborough w/e 29/09/1962 15C w/e 10/04/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92110 w/e 14/07/1962 15A Wellingborough w/e 29/09/1962 15C w/e 23/11/1963 16E Kirkby in Ashfield
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92122 w/e 07/07/1962 15A Wellingborough w/e 29/09/1962 15C w/e 10/04/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41280 w/e 14/04/1962 15A Wellingborough w/e 17/11/1962 15C w/e 08/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84008 w/e 07/07/1962 14B Kentish Town w/e 29/12/1962 15C w/e 04/05/1963 15A Wellingborough
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92089 4w/e 16/03/1957 38B Annesley w/e 09/02/1963 15C w/e 26/09/1964 8C Speke Junction
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84029 w/e 19/01/1963 15A Wellingborough w/e 16/02/1963 15C 13/06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44776 w/e 13/10/1962 17A Derby w/e 09/03/1963 15C w/e 22/06/1963 21A Saltley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45279 w/e 22/09/1962 17B Burton w/e 09/03/1963 15C w/e 18/05/1963 2F Woodford Halse
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45253 w/e 09/03/1963 21A Saltley w/e 16/03/1963 15C w/e 21/12/1963 16C Derby
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41227 w/e 24/03/1962 15A Wellingborough w/e 04/05/1963 15C w/e 28/09/1963 15B Wellingborough
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92070 w/e 09/03/1963 15A Wellingborough w/e 18/05/1963 15C w/e 13/03/1965 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92100 w/e 09/03/1963 15A Wellingborough w/e 18/05/1963 15C w/e 10/04/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44659       w/e 18/05/1963 15C w/e 30/11/1963 16C Derby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44804 w/e 09/09/1961 21A Saltley w/e 18/05/1963 15C w/e 30/11/1963 16C Derby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44888 w/e 26/09/1959 21A Saltley w/e 18/05/1963 15C w/e 16/11/1963 16C Derby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44920 01/01/1948 21A Saltley w/e 18/05/1963 15C w/e 23/11/1963 16C Derby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44962 5w/e 16/07/1949 20A Holbeck (MR) w/e 18/05/1963 15C w/e 23/11/1963 16C Derby
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92010 w/e 09/03/1963 15A Wellingborough w/e 22/06/1963 15C w/e 28/03/1964 9D Newton Heath
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44815 w/e 18/05/1963 21A Saltley w/e 22/06/1963 15C w/e 23/11/1963 16C Derby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45267 w/e 09/03/1963 14A Cricklewood East w/e 22/06/1963 15C w/e 24/10/1964 16B Annesley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45333 w/e 18/05/1963 21A Saltley w/e 22/06/1963 15C w/e 24/10/1964 16B Annesley
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44284 w/e 17/11/1962 16A Nottingham w/e 20/07/1963 15C w/e 28/09/1963 16C Derby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45088 w/e 21/11/1959 21A Saltley w/e 10/08/1963 15C w/e 30/11/1963 16C Derby
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5386 18/05/1962 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 05/10/1963 15A w/e 27/06/1964 14B Cricklewood West
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5387 21/05/1962 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 05/10/1963 15A 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5392 12/06/1962 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 05/10/1963 15A 16/01/1965 D15 Leicester Division
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5393 12/06/1962 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 05/10/1963 15A 16/01/1965 D15 Leicester Division
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5394 20/06/1962 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 05/10/1963 15A 16/01/1965 D15 Leicester Division
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5405 24/07/1962 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 05/10/1963 15A 16/01/1965 D15 Leicester Division
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5406 31/07/1962 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 05/10/1963 15A 16/01/1965 D15 Leicester Division
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5409 10/08/1962 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 05/10/1963 15A w/e 27/06/1964 14B Cricklewood West
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5411 10/09/1962 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 05/10/1963 15A 16/01/1965 D15 Leicester Division
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5412 03/09/1962 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 05/10/1963 15A 16/01/1965 D15 Leicester Division
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5388 28/05/1962 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 19/10/1963 15A 16/01/1965 D15 Leicester Division
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5384 01/05/1962 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 02/11/1963 15A w/e 04/07/1964 14B Cricklewood West
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44540 w/e 14/09/1963 15B Wellingborough w/e 02/11/1963 15A m/e 05/1964 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5390 w/e 16/11/1963 14B Cricklewood West w/e 30/11/1963 15A 16/01/1965 D15 Leicester Division
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5391 04/06/1962 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 30/11/1963 15A 16/01/1965 D15 Leicester Division
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5395 20/06/1962 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 30/11/1963 15A 16/01/1965 D15 Leicester Division
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5397 10/08/1962 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 30/11/1963 15A 16/01/1965 D15 Leicester Division
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5404 w/e 26/10/1963 16C Derby w/e 30/11/1963 15A 16/01/1965 D15 Leicester Division
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5407 02/08/1962 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 30/11/1963 15A w/e 08/08/1964 14B Cricklewood West
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5413 13/09/1962 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 30/11/1963 15A 16/01/1965 D15 Leicester Division
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5414 18/09/1962 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 30/11/1963 15A 16/01/1965 D15 Leicester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5185 22/05/1963 18A Toton (New) w/e 04/01/1964 15A w/e 23/05/1964 16A Toton
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5186 19/03/1963 18A Toton (New) w/e 08/02/1964 15A 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5191 30/04/1963 18A Toton (New) w/e 08/02/1964 15A 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5192 29/04/1963 18A Toton (New) w/e 08/02/1964 15A 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5194 30/04/1963 18A Toton (New) w/e 08/02/1964 15A 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5198 16/05/1963 18A Toton (New) w/e 08/02/1964 15A 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7579 w/e 04/01/1964 16C Derby w/e 08/02/1964 15A 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84005 w/e 09/02/1963 15A Wellingborough w/e 08/02/1964 15A w/e 30/05/1964 15B Wellingborough
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84008 w/e 04/05/1963 15A Wellingborough w/e 08/02/1964 15A w/e 30/05/1964 15B Wellingborough
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92133 4w/e 28/12/1957 15A Wellingborough w/e 15/02/1964 15A w/e 10/04/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92134 4w/e 28/12/1957 15A Wellingborough w/e 15/02/1964 15A w/e 10/04/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7584 01/02/1964 16A Toton (New) w/e 22/02/1964 15A 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92058 w/e 07/07/1962 18B Westhouses w/e 25/04/1964 15A w/e 13/03/1965 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92109 w/e 30/11/1963 16B Annesley w/e 25/04/1964 15A w/e 10/04/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42161 w/e 05/10/1963 16J Rowsley w/e 02/05/1964 15A w/e 14/11/1964 16C Derby
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42284 w/e 22/12/1962 17C Rowsley w/e 02/05/1964 15A w/e 27/06/1964 16D Nottingham
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45289 w/e 06/07/1963 14A Cricklewood East w/e 02/05/1964 15A w/e 17/10/1964 16B Annesley
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5225 w/e 18/01/1964 16D Nottingham w/e 09/05/1964 15A 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7588 10/03/1964 16A Toton (New) w/e 09/05/1964 15A 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7589 13/04/1964 16A Toton (New) w/e 09/05/1964 15A 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45335 w/e 12/01/1963 15E Leicester (G.C.) w/e 20/06/1964 15A w/e 19/09/1964 16B Annesley
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5240 w/e 11/04/1964 14B Cricklewood West w/e 27/06/1964 15A w/e 04/07/1964 15B Wellingborough
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5241 w/e 11/04/1964 14B Cricklewood West w/e 27/06/1964 15A w/e 04/07/1964 15B Wellingborough
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5242 w/e 11/04/1964 14B Cricklewood West w/e 27/06/1964 15A w/e 25/07/1964 15B Wellingborough
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5386 w/e 27/06/1964 14B Cricklewood West w/e 04/07/1964 15A 16/01/1965 D15 Leicester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7592 w/e 06/06/1964 15B Wellingborough w/e 04/07/1964 15A 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7593 27/06/1964 16A Toton (New) w/e 04/07/1964 15A 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3785 w/e 19/03/1960 15E Leicester (G.C.) w/e 11/07/1964 15A w/e 16/04/1966 15B Wellingborough
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7595 w/e 11/07/1964 15B Wellingborough w/e 25/07/1964 15A 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44575 w/e 26/01/1963 18A Toton w/e 08/08/1964 15A w/e 03/10/1964 15E Coalville
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5289 13/08/1964 16A Toton (New) w/e 29/08/1964 15A w/e 09/01/1965 15A Leicester Midland
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84005 w/e 30/05/1964 15B Wellingborough w/e 19/09/1964 15A 30/10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84006 w/e 18/07/1964 15B Wellingborough w/e 19/09/1964 15A 30/10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84008 w/e 30/05/1964 15B Wellingborough w/e 19/09/1964 15A 30/10/1965 Withdrawn
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 D57 w/e 29/06/1963 18A Toton w/e 26/09/1964 15A 16/01/1965 D15 Leicester Division
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78013 w/e 07/12/1963 15E Coalville w/e 26/09/1964 15A w/e 16/07/1966 16A Toton
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78028 w/e 04/01/1964 15E Coalville w/e 26/09/1964 15A w/e 16/07/1966 16A Toton
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78027 w/e 23/05/1964 16C Derby w/e 03/10/1964 15A m/e 09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78061 w/e 23/05/1964 16C Derby w/e 03/10/1964 15A w/e 16/07/1966 16A Toton
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92083 w/e 18/01/1964 15C Kettering w/e 24/10/1964 15A w/e 09/01/1965 16B Annesley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92086 w/e 18/01/1964 15C Kettering w/e 24/10/1964 15A w/e 13/03/1965 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92105 w/e 18/01/1964 15C Kettering w/e 24/10/1964 15A w/e 10/04/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92106 4w/e 01/12/1956 15B Kettering w/e 24/10/1964 15A w/e 10/04/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5289 w/e 29/08/1964 15A Leicester Midland w/e 09/01/1965 15A 16/01/1965 D15 Leicester Division
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78021 w/e 25/01/1964 16C Derby w/e 06/02/1965 15A w/e 16/07/1966 16A Toton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3862 w/e 13/02/1965 15E Coalville w/e 20/02/1965 15A 28/02/2007 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48024 w/e 09/05/1964 16D Nottingham w/e 27/03/1965 15A w/e 08/05/1965 16B Annesley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48065 w/e 18/08/1962 17B Burton w/e 27/03/1965 15A w/e 12/02/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48185 w/e 12/09/1964 16E Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 27/03/1965 15A w/e 15/01/1966 16B Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48361 w/e 26/12/1964 16E Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 27/03/1965 15A w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48528 4w/e 12/07/1958 16B Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 27/03/1965 15A w/e 25/06/1966 8A Edge Hill
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48637 w/e 13/03/1965 15B Wellingborough w/e 27/03/1965 15A w/e 25/06/1966 10D Lostock Hall
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48645 w/e 13/03/1965 15B Wellingborough w/e 27/03/1965 15A w/e 18/12/1965 40E Colwick
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3056 w/e 16/12/1961 15A Wellingborough w/e 03/04/1965 15A w/e 16/04/1966 15B Wellingborough
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3057 14/08/1954 15A Wellingborough (New) w/e 03/04/1965 15A w/e 16/04/1966 15B Wellingborough
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3058 w/e 11/05/1963 15A Wellingborough w/e 03/04/1965 15A w/e 16/04/1966 15B Wellingborough
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3059 w/e 16/06/1962 15A Wellingborough w/e 03/04/1965 15A w/e 16/04/1966 15B Wellingborough
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3776 w/e 09/07/1960 15A Wellingborough w/e 03/04/1965 15A w/e 04/11/1967 15B Wellingborough
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3777 w/e 09/07/1960 15A Wellingborough w/e 03/04/1965 15A w/e 13/11/1965 16F Burton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3778 w/e 09/07/1960 15A Wellingborough w/e 03/04/1965 15A w/e 15/01/1966 16F Burton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48625 w/e 23/06/1962 18B Westhouses w/e 03/04/1965 15A w/e 18/06/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48053 w/e 22/11/1958 15D Coalville w/e 10/04/1965 15A w/e 17/04/1965 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48165 w/e 14/03/1964 16D Nottingham w/e 10/04/1965 15A w/e 25/06/1966 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48116 w/e 30/05/1964 16A Toton w/e 17/04/1965 15A w/e 08/05/1965 16A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48212 w/e 15/09/1962 18A Toton w/e 17/04/1965 15A w/e 18/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48279 w/e 14/09/1963 16A Toton w/e 17/04/1965 15A w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48414 w/e 23/05/1959 18A Toton w/e 17/04/1965 15A w/e 18/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48685 01/01/1948 18A Toton w/e 17/04/1965 15A w/e 15/01/1966 16B Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48698 4w/e 06/09/1958 18A Toton w/e 17/04/1965 15A w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48671 01/01/1948 15A Wellingborough w/e 08/05/1965 15A w/e 28/05/1966 9J Agecroft
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84013 w/e 19/12/1964 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 22/05/1965 15A w/e 10/07/1965 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48107 w/e 23/01/1965 15E Coalville w/e 22/05/1965 15A w/e 18/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48132 w/e 15/05/1965 15E Coalville w/e 22/05/1965 15A w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48082 w/e 18/04/1964 15B Wellingborough w/e 26/06/1965 15A w/e 25/06/1966 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48180 w/e 13/03/1965 15B Wellingborough w/e 26/06/1965 15A w/e 18/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48183 w/e 29/02/1964 15B Wellingborough w/e 26/06/1965 15A w/e 31/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48285 w/e 18/01/1964 15B Wellingborough w/e 26/06/1965 15A w/e 18/09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48301 w/e 04/04/1964 15B Wellingborough w/e 26/06/1965 15A w/e 10/07/1965 8L Aintree
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48374 01/01/1948 15A Wellingborough w/e 26/06/1965 15A w/e 10/07/1965 8E Northwich
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48376 w/e 15/02/1964 15B Wellingborough w/e 26/06/1965 15A w/e 31/07/1965 15E Coalville
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48381 w/e 24/10/1964 15B Wellingborough w/e 26/06/1965 15A w/e 28/05/1966 9J Agecroft
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48382 w/e 13/03/1965 15B Wellingborough w/e 26/06/1965 15A w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48492 w/e 29/02/1964 15B Wellingborough w/e 26/06/1965 15A w/e 11/06/1966 16E Kirkby in Ashfield
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48530 w/e 13/03/1965 15B Wellingborough w/e 26/06/1965 15A w/e 19/03/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48545 w/e 13/03/1965 15B Wellingborough w/e 26/06/1965 15A w/e 25/06/1966 8E Northwich
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48607 w/e 07/11/1964 15E Coalville w/e 26/06/1965 15A w/e 28/08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48609 w/e 18/01/1964 15B Wellingborough w/e 26/06/1965 15A w/e 15/01/1966 16B Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48759 w/e 13/03/1965 15B Wellingborough w/e 26/06/1965 15A w/e 27/11/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41212 w/e 19/06/1965 5D Stoke w/e 24/07/1965 15A m/e 11/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41219 w/e 31/03/1962 2E Northampton w/e 24/07/1965 15A m/e 10/1965 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4149 15/10/1962 17B Burton (New) w/e 30/10/1965 15A w/e 06/09/1969 2E Saltley
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3863 w/e 16/10/1965 16D Nottingham w/e 06/11/1965 15A w/e 16/04/1966 15B Wellingborough
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48137 w/e 07/11/1964 15E Coalville w/e 06/11/1965 15A w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48380 w/e 19/09/1964 15E Coalville w/e 06/11/1965 15A w/e 18/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48467 w/e 19/09/1964 15E Coalville w/e 06/11/1965 15A w/e 25/06/1966 8A Edge Hill
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48552 w/e 21/11/1964 15E Coalville w/e 06/11/1965 15A w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48617 w/e 23/01/1965 15E Coalville w/e 06/11/1965 15A w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48687 w/e 19/11/1960 15D Coalville w/e 06/11/1965 15A w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48696 w/e 23/01/1965 15E Coalville w/e 06/11/1965 15A w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4137 29/06/1962 17B Burton (New) w/e 04/12/1965 15A w/e 20/09/1969 6J Holyhead
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48315 w/e 08/07/1961 15D Coalville w/e 04/12/1965 15A w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3059 w/e 16/04/1966 15B Wellingborough w/e 04/11/1967 15A w/e 11/11/1967 16C Derby
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3586 13/11/1958 17B Burton (New) w/e 04/11/1967 15A 09/09/1985 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3057 w/e 16/04/1966 15B Wellingborough w/e 29/03/1969 15A w/e 15/06/1974 DR Doncaster
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3587 w/e 24/08/1963 17A Derby w/e 29/03/1969 15A      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3776 w/e 04/11/1967 15B Wellingborough w/e 29/03/1969 15A 08/11/1993 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3785 w/e 16/04/1966 15B Wellingborough w/e 29/03/1969 15A 14/09/1990 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3863 w/e 16/04/1966 15B Wellingborough w/e 29/03/1969 15A      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3864 w/e 17/05/1969 2E Saltley w/e 06/09/1969 15A w/e 18/12/1971 2E Saltley
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3866 w/e 16/12/1967 5A Crewe Diesel w/e 20/09/1969 15A 22/10/1993 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3933 5w/e 30/09/1967 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill w/e 23/10/1971 15A 2w/e 29/04/1972 2F Bescot
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3864 w/e 18/12/1971 2E Saltley 2w/e 01/01/1972 15A      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08704 w/e 22/04/1967 2F Bescot w/e 25/05/1974 LR 05/11/1990 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08692 w/e 11/01/1969 1E Bletchley w/e 11/01/1975 LR 31/01/1994 Withdrawn