Depot: Llantrisant
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Llantrisant | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4253 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | LTS | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3584 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | LTS | ||||||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4241 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | LTS | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6416 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | LTS | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | CVCYS | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4821 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | LTS | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3617 | on | 15/06/1947 | LTS | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3656 | on | 15/06/1947 | LTS | m/e | 02/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3691 | on | 15/06/1947 | LTS | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3703 | on | 15/06/1947 | LTS | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4208 | on | 15/06/1947 | LTS | m/e | 11/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4261 | on | 15/06/1947 | LTS | m/e | 03/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4674 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 16 | on | 15/06/1947 | LTS | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 88B | Radyr | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1471 | on | 15/06/1947 | LTS | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5708 | on | 15/06/1947 | LTS | m/e | 04/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5777 | on | 15/06/1947 | LTS | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7721 | on | 15/06/1947 | LTS | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9616 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | on | 15/06/1947 | LTS | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9746 | on | 15/06/1947 | LTS | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9780 | on | 15/06/1947 | LTS | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 88C | Barry | ||||
Steam | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3586 | on | 15/06/1947 | LTS | ||||||||
Steam | Unclassified | 0-6-2T | 426 | on | 15/06/1947 | PILL | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | LTS | m/e | 31/05/1948 | PILL | Newport Pill |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3644 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | m/e | 31/05/1948 | LTS | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4620 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | m/e | 31/05/1948 | LTS | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | LTS | Llantrisant |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5228 | on | 15/06/1947 | LLY | Llanelli | m/e | 31/05/1948 | LTS | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5231 | on | 15/06/1947 | CARM | Carmarthen | m/e | 31/05/1948 | LTS | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | PILL | Newport Pill |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5241 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | m/e | 31/05/1948 | LTS | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5788 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | m/e | 31/05/1948 | LTS | m/e | 10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4620 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | LTS | Llantrisant | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | LTS | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | Unclassified | 0-6-2T | 426 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | PILL | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | LTS | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | PILL | Newport Pill |
Steam | Unclassified | 0-6-2T | 426 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | PILL | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | LTS | m/e | 03/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1421 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | LTS | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8739 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 86D | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 87H | Neyland |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3612 | on | 15/06/1947 | TDU | Tondu | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 86D | m/e | 10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6409 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 86D | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 86D | Llantrisant |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6409 | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 86D | Llantrisant | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 86D | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 86B | Newport Pill |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3776 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 86D | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 86D | Llantrisant |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3776 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 86D | Llantrisant | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 86D | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4637 | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 86D | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6439 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | w/e | 06/09/1952 | 86D | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4268 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 86D | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3680 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 86J | Aberdare | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 86D | m/e | 05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4662 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86D | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4273 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 86D | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 83E | St Blazey |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4252 | on | 15/06/1947 | NEA | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 86D | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3663 | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | PILL | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 86D | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 88A | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6600 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86D | m/e | 08/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4267 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 86D | on | 23/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6639 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 88B | Radyr | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 88G | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 84D | Leamington |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9778 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 88G | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6670 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88G | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3661 | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88G | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5248 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | LDR | Landore | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 88G | m/e | 10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5228 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 88G | m/e | 04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 81xx | 2-6-2T | 8103 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 88G | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4122 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 87H | Neyland | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 88G | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 88J | Aberdare |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4285 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 88G | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3738 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 88H | Tondu | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 88G | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4222 | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 86F | Tondu | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 88G | m/e | 10/1964 | Withdrawn |