Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 63 Today
» 1154 Yesterday
» 4585 Week
» 25487 Month
» 25487 Year
» 1247052 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Longsight


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Longsight Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1274 m/e 03/1930 WD LNWR Western Division m/e 09/1933 W16 4w/e 01/01/1938 Withdrawn
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1276 m/e 03/1930 WD LNWR Western Division m/e 09/1933 W16 4w/e 26/03/1938 Withdrawn
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1278 m/e 03/1930 W13 Bushbury m/e 09/1933 W16 m/e 11/1945 9D Buxton (LNWR)
Steam Princess Royal 4-6-2 6201 24/06/1939 1B Camden 15/07/1939 9A 16/09/1939 1B Camden
Steam Princess Royal 4-6-2 6206 24/08/1935 1B Camden 15/07/1939 9A 02/12/1939 8A Edge Hill
Steam Princess Royal 4-6-2 6209 19/02/1938 1B Camden 06/09/1939 9A 02/12/1939 1B Camden
Steam Princess Royal 4-6-2 6207 16/09/1939 2A Rugby 21/10/1939 9A 02/12/1939 1B Camden
Steam Princess Royal 4-6-2 6208 06/08/1938 1B Camden 21/10/1939 9A 02/12/1939 1B Camden
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2983 w/e 26/11/1938 5B Crewe South w/e 04/10/1941 9A w/e 29/08/1942 5B Crewe South
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2951 w/e 26/10/1940 7B Bangor w/e 11/10/1941 9A w/e 29/08/1942 BHD Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1416 m/e 09/1933 23 Hasland m/e 11/1945 9A 4w/e 22/04/1950 Withdrawn
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1421 m/e 09/1933 20 Buxton (MR) m/e 11/1945 9A 4w/e 26/02/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3726       4w/e 03/11/1945 16 4w/e 29/12/1945 NPT Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3716       4w/e 01/12/1945 16 4w/e 20/04/1946 CDF Cardiff Canton
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3776       4w/e 01/12/1945 16 4w/e 28/02/1951 86D Llantrisant
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4222       4w/e 01/12/1945 16 m/e 31/07/1951 86H Aberbeeg
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4251       4w/e 01/12/1945 16 m/e 06/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4273       4w/e 01/12/1945 16 4w/e 13/07/1957 87B Duffryn Yard
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4674       4w/e 01/12/1945 16 6w/e 12/10/1964 88B Radyr
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4685       4w/e 01/12/1945 16 m/e 05/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4686       4w/e 01/12/1945 16 4w/e 17/07/1954 88B Cardiff East Dock
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 7703       4w/e 01/12/1945 16 4w/e 25/01/1958 86B Newport Pill
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8723       4w/e 01/12/1945 16 4w/e 16/06/1962 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6114       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 21/05/1955 1B Camden
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6120       01/01/1948 9A 3w/e 11/12/1948 9A Longsight
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6121       01/01/1948 9A 5w/e 16/07/1949 91X To Scottish Region
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6122       01/01/1948 9A w/e 25/04/1959 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6129       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 21/02/1953 6J Holyhead
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6131       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 30/11/1957 14B Kentish Town
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6145       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 11/08/1951 7C Holyhead
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6149       01/01/1948 9A 3w/e 11/12/1948 7C Holyhead
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6150       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 11/08/1951 7C Holyhead
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6160       01/01/1948 9A w/e 19/09/1959 14B Kentish Town
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 6169       01/01/1948 9A w/e 18/07/1959 5A Crewe North
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2775       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 27/01/1951 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2776       01/01/1948 9A 8w/e 19/06/1954 5B Crewe South
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2778       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 03/11/1956 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2813       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 03/10/1953 5B Crewe South
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2848       01/01/1948 9A w/e 08/08/1959 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2849       01/01/1948 9A w/e 09/01/1960 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2852       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 27/01/1951 2B Nuneaton
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2854       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 27/01/1951 2B Nuneaton
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2858       01/01/1948 9A w/e 26/11/1960 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2886       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 17/05/1958 9D Buxton (LNWR)
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2887       01/01/1948 9A w/e 26/11/1960 5D Stoke
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2889       01/01/1948 9A w/e 14/01/1961 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2923       01/01/1948 9A w/e 05/11/1960 5D Stoke
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2924       01/01/1948 9A w/e 19/11/1960 2B Nuneaton
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2925 4w/e 22/06/1946 8A Edge Hill 01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 04/11/1950 8A Edge Hill
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2930       01/01/1948 9A w/e 14/01/1961 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2935       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 10/08/1957 3A Bescot
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2936       01/01/1948 9A w/e 26/11/1960 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2937       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 27/02/1954 1A Willesden
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 71       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 22/03/1958 24L  
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 106       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 03/11/1956 6E Wrexham Rhosddu
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 107       01/01/1948 9A w/e 28/05/1960 8D Widnes
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 108       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 23/02/1952 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 138       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 03/11/1956 2B Nuneaton
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2481       01/01/1948 9A 8w/e 11/07/1953 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2487       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 19/05/1956 9G Northwich
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2478       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 10/08/1957 6H Bangor
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2575       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 19/05/1956 9G Northwich
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2580       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 02/01/1954 1E Bletchley
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2599       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 03/11/1956 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2608       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 03/11/1956 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5552       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 25/02/1956 3B Bushbury
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5556       01/01/1948 9A 8w/e 19/06/1954 5A Crewe North
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5593       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 17/07/1951 10B Preston
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5631       01/01/1948 9A w/e 10/06/1961 5A Crewe North
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5633       01/01/1948 9A w/e 09/09/1961 24L Carnforth
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5638       01/01/1948 9A w/e 10/09/1960 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5680       01/01/1948 9A w/e 15/10/1960 8A Edge Hill
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5703       01/01/1948 9A 2w/e 17/06/1950 3B Bushbury
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5723       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 07/09/1957 5A Crewe North
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 5740       01/01/1948 9A 8w/e 11/07/1953 1B Camden
Steam 2P 4-4-0 674       01/01/1948 9A m/e 11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7267       01/01/1948 9A w/e 20/06/1959 6H Bangor
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7341       01/01/1948 9A w/e 10/09/1960 5B Crewe South
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7343       01/01/1948 9A w/e 20/06/1959 6F Bidston
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7345       01/01/1948 9A w/e 07/11/1959 11A Barrow in Furness
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7347       01/01/1948 9A w/e 07/11/1959 24J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7369       01/01/1948 9A w/e 07/11/1959 24J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7394       01/01/1948 9A m/e 12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7400       01/01/1948 9A w/e 07/05/1960 5B Crewe South
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7528       01/01/1948 9A m/e 03/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7673       01/01/1948 9A w/e 30/04/1960 6B Mold Junction
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 51       01/01/1948 9A 8w/e 11/07/1953 1A Willesden
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4078       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 14/06/1958 3A Bescot
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4303       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 27/01/1951 9A Longsight
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4308       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 31/12/1950 8E Brunswick
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4357       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 23/03/1957 5F Uttoxeter
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1113       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 12/07/1952 2A Rugby
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1122       01/01/1948 9A 5w/e 16/07/1949 3E Monument Lane
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1159       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 16/06/1957 5A Crewe North
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1166       01/01/1948 9A 5w/e 16/07/1949 TFD Trafford Park (LNER)
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1168       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 16/06/1957 5A Crewe North
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2322       01/01/1948 9A w/e 31/01/1959 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2350       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 04/10/1958 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2351       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 10/08/1957 11B Barrow in Furness
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2395       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 21/02/1959 84G Shrewsbury
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2396       01/01/1948 9A w/e 07/07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2397       01/01/1948 9A 8w/e 05/10/1957 9C Macclesfield
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2398       01/01/1948 9A w/e 20/08/1960 21A Saltley
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2399       01/01/1948 9A 03/09/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2401       01/01/1948 9A w/e 23/02/1963 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2402       01/01/1948 9A w/e 13/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 5530       01/01/1948 9A w/e 25/04/1959 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 2P 4-4-0 531       01/01/1948 9A 3w/e 11/12/1948 9D Buxton (LNWR)
Steam 2P 4-4-0 539       01/01/1948 9A 5w/e 16/07/1949 TFD Trafford Park (LNER)
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3275       01/01/1948 9A 14/01/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3457       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 04/10/1958 9G Gorton
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3717       01/01/1948 9A 01/06/1957 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9002       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 19/05/1951 2B Nuneaton
Steam G1 0-8-0 9054       01/01/1948 9A m/e 04/1949 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9363       01/01/1948 9A m/e 03/1949 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9343       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 30/11/1957 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)
Steam G1 0-8-0 9171       01/01/1948 9A m/e 02/1952 Withdrawn
Steam G1 0-8-0 9183       01/01/1948 9A m/e 06/1950 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9227       01/01/1948 9A m/e 02/1949 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9284       01/01/1948 9A m/e 03/1950 Withdrawn
Steam G1 0-8-0 9285       01/01/1948 9A 3w/e 11/12/1948 1A Willesden
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9298       01/01/1948 9A 31/12/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4870       01/01/1948 9A w/e 16/01/1965 1E Bletchley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4871       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 06/10/1951 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4937       01/01/1948 9A w/e 26/11/1960 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4938       01/01/1948 9A 2w/e 17/06/1950 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4969       01/01/1948 9A m/e 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4970       01/01/1948 9A 4w/e 11/05/1957 65A Eastfield
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5294       01/01/1948 9A 3w/e 11/12/1948 5B Crewe South
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46120 01/01/1948 9A Longsight 3w/e 11/12/1948 9A 5w/e 16/07/1949 17A Derby
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42788 01/01/1948 8C Speke Junction 3w/e 11/12/1948 9A 4w/e 27/01/1951 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40693 01/01/1948 9D Buxton (LNWR) 3w/e 11/12/1948 9A m/e 07/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45536 01/01/1948 10B Preston 3w/e 11/12/1948 9A 2w/e 17/06/1950 9A Longsight
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44837 01/01/1948 5A Crewe North 3w/e 11/12/1948 9A 4w/e 17/07/1951 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44838 01/01/1948 5A Crewe North 3w/e 11/12/1948 9A 4w/e 12/07/1952 1A Willesden
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46143 01/01/1948 27A Polmadie 5w/e 16/07/1949 9A 4w/e 24/02/1951 5A Crewe North
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42978 w/e 27/10/1945 8C Speke Junction w/e 19/11/1949 9A w/e 21/07/1951 3D Aston
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42979 w/e 04/12/1948 8C Speke Junction w/e 19/11/1949 9A w/e 13/06/1953 3D Aston
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45578 01/01/1948 5A Crewe North 5w/e 24/12/1949 9A 3w/e 14/01/1950 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46166 3w/e 11/12/1948 7C Holyhead 3w/e 14/01/1950 9A 2w/e 17/06/1950 7C Holyhead
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44971 01/01/1948 19B Sheffield Millhouses 3w/e 14/01/1950 9A 2w/e 17/06/1950 6A Chester (MR)
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45655 01/01/1948 19G Trafford Park (LMS) 2w/e 17/06/1950 9A 4w/e 16/06/1951 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45534 3w/e 11/12/1948 5A Crewe North 2w/e 17/06/1950 9A 4w/e 04/11/1950 9A Longsight
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45536 3w/e 11/12/1948 9A Longsight 2w/e 17/06/1950 9A w/e 06/02/1960 41C Sheffield Millhouses
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45540 01/01/1948 3B Bushbury 2w/e 17/06/1950 9A w/e 07/11/1959 3B Bushbury
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44759 01/01/1948 5A Crewe North 2w/e 17/06/1950 9A 4w/e 24/02/1951 6A Chester (MR)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44760 01/01/1948 5A Crewe North 2w/e 17/06/1950 9A 4w/e 06/10/1951 8E Brunswick
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45289 3w/e 11/12/1948 5A Crewe North 2w/e 17/06/1950 9A 4w/e 07/10/1950 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45617 01/01/1948 1B Camden 4w/e 09/09/1950 9A 5w/e 03/01/1953 5A Crewe North
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45742 2w/e 17/06/1950 3B Bushbury 4w/e 04/11/1950 9A 4w/e 17/07/1951 3B Bushbury
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45534 2w/e 17/06/1950 9A Longsight 4w/e 04/11/1950 9A 4w/e 11/08/1951 1B Camden
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48633 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 4w/e 04/11/1950 9A 4w/e 17/05/1958 6B Mold Junction
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42925 4w/e 04/11/1950 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 02/12/1950 9A 4w/e 12/07/1952 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42960 w/e 17/07/1948 3D Aston w/e 20/01/1951 9A w/e 31/08/1957 6B Mold Junction
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44303 01/01/1948 9A Longsight 4w/e 27/01/1951 9A 4w/e 22/03/1958 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45014 01/01/1948 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 27/01/1951 9A 4w/e 17/07/1951 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46141 01/01/1948 1B Camden 4w/e 24/02/1951 9A 4w/e 24/03/1951 1B Camden
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46152 01/01/1948 1B Camden 4w/e 24/02/1951 9A 3w/e 24/01/1953 8A Edge Hill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44763 01/01/1948 5A Crewe North 4w/e 24/02/1951 9A 4w/e 17/07/1951 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44686       30/04/1951 (New) 9A w/e 30/04/1960 21E Monument Lane
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44687       31/05/1951 (New) 9A w/e 10/09/1960 5B Crewe South
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45553 01/01/1948 12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 16/06/1951 9A m/e 16/06/1956 5A Crewe North
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45555 01/01/1948 5A Crewe North 4w/e 17/07/1951 9A 8w/e 19/06/1954 5A Crewe North
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45595 01/01/1948 12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 17/07/1951 9A w/e 20/06/1959 5A Crewe North
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45718 4w/e 07/10/1950 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 17/07/1951 9A 4w/e 04/10/1952 63A Perth South
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48744 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South 4w/e 17/07/1951 9A w/e 26/11/1960 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45587 4w/e 24/02/1951 5A Crewe North 4w/e 11/08/1951 9A 4w/e 21/05/1955 10B Preston
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46145 4w/e 11/08/1951 7C Holyhead 4w/e 06/10/1951 9A 3w/e 24/01/1953 20A Holbeck (MR)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42462 01/01/1948 11B Barrow in Furness 4w/e 06/10/1951 9A 4w/e 05/09/1953 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45678 01/01/1948 12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 26/01/1952 9A 4w/e 12/07/1952 5A Crewe North
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48731 4w/e 26/01/1952 9F Heaton Mersey 4w/e 23/02/1952 9A 4w/e 08/10/1955 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45624 01/01/1948 12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 19/04/1952 9A 4w/e 10/08/1957 5A Crewe North
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48680 4w/e 23/02/1952 9G Northwich 8w/e 14/06/1952 9A 4w/e 08/09/1956 9A Longsight
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43945 01/01/1948 19D Heaton Mersey 4w/e 12/07/1952 9A 4w/e 04/10/1952 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44090 01/01/1948 19D Heaton Mersey 4w/e 12/07/1952 9A 4w/e 09/08/1952 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44971 4w/e 26/01/1952 1A Willesden 4w/e 12/07/1952 9A 4w/e 04/10/1952 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45109 01/01/1948 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 12/07/1952 9A w/e 12/09/1959 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44144 01/01/1948 19D Heaton Mersey 4w/e 09/08/1952 9A 4w/e 04/10/1952 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45644 01/01/1948 30A Corkerhill 4w/e 06/09/1952 9A w/e 31/12/1960 5B Crewe South
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42772 4w/e 12/07/1952 9F Heaton Mersey 4w/e 04/10/1952 9A w/e 19/11/1960 2B Nuneaton
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42925 4w/e 12/07/1952 9F Heaton Mersey 4w/e 04/10/1952 9A w/e 19/11/1960 2B Nuneaton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44069 4w/e 07/10/1950 9B Stockport Edgeley 4w/e 04/10/1952 9A 4w/e 22/03/1958 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44941 4w/e 02/12/1950 7A Llandudno Junction 4w/e 04/10/1952 9A 4w/e 14/06/1958 17A Derby
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42932 01/01/1948 2D Nuneaton 8w/e 29/11/1952 9A 8w/e 19/06/1954 5B Crewe South
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40482 01/01/1948 17A Derby 8w/e 29/11/1952 9A 4w/e 23/03/1957 19B Sheffield Millhouses
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70034       20/12/1952 (New) 9A 4w/e 25/07/1953 30A Stratford
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70030 19/11/1952 6J Holyhead (New) 5w/e 03/01/1953 9A 4w/e 21/02/1953 9A Longsight
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46143 8w/e 29/11/1952 5A Crewe North 5w/e 03/01/1953 9A 4w/e 05/11/1955 20A Holbeck (MR)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42391 01/01/1948 5C Stafford 5w/e 03/01/1953 9A 4w/e 03/11/1956 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40405 8w/e 14/06/1952 9F Heaton Mersey 5w/e 03/01/1953 9A m/e 06/1955 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70031 29/11/1952 6J Holyhead (New) 3w/e 24/01/1953 9A w/e 30/04/1960 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70032 10/12/1952 6J Holyhead (New) 3w/e 24/01/1953 9A w/e 06/02/1960 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70033 13/12/1952 6J Holyhead (New) 3w/e 24/01/1953 9A w/e 06/02/1960 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70030 5w/e 03/01/1953 9A Longsight 4w/e 21/02/1953 9A 4w/e 25/07/1953 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70043       04/06/1953 (New) 9A 4w/e 03/10/1953 18A Toton
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70044       04/06/1953 (New) 9A w/e 18/08/1962 5A Crewe North
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46111 4w/e 04/10/1952 5A Crewe North 8w/e 11/07/1953 9A 4w/e 05/09/1953 6J Holyhead
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46130 4w/e 31/12/1950 5A Crewe North 8w/e 11/07/1953 9A 4w/e 21/05/1955 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44760 4w/e 16/05/1953 6J Holyhead 8w/e 11/07/1953 9A 8w/e 05/10/1957 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45294 3w/e 11/12/1948 5B Crewe South 8w/e 11/07/1953 9A 4w/e 03/10/1953 10C Patricroft
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45327 4w/e 23/02/1952 5B Crewe South 8w/e 11/07/1953 9A 4w/e 30/01/1954 11A Carnforth
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45352 01/01/1948 5D Stoke 8w/e 11/07/1953 9A 4w/e 03/10/1953 10C Patricroft
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46111 4w/e 05/09/1953 6J Holyhead 4w/e 03/10/1953 9A w/e 10/09/1960 5A Crewe North
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46161 8w/e 11/07/1953 6J Holyhead 4w/e 03/10/1953 9A m/e 16/06/1956 1B Camden
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45578 8w/e 11/07/1953 5A Crewe North 4w/e 03/10/1953 9A w/e 20/06/1959 5A Crewe North
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45689 4w/e 05/09/1953 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 03/10/1953 9A 4w/e 22/03/1958 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44741       4w/e 03/10/1953 9A w/e 10/09/1960 1A Willesden
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44742       4w/e 03/10/1953 9A w/e 10/09/1960 21D Aston
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70043 4w/e 03/10/1953 18A Toton 4w/e 02/01/1954 9A w/e 09/09/1961 21D Aston
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80039 18/06/1952 1E Bletchley (New) 4w/e 02/01/1954 9A 4w/e 26/02/1955 1E Bletchley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44935 4w/e 28/11/1953 6J Holyhead 4w/e 02/01/1954 9A 8w/e 05/10/1957 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46125 4w/e 03/10/1953 5A Crewe North 4w/e 30/01/1954 9A 4w/e 27/02/1954 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45385 4w/e 02/01/1954 5A Crewe North 4w/e 30/01/1954 9A 8w/e 19/06/1954 6J Holyhead
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46140 4w/e 17/07/1951 5A Crewe North 8w/e 19/06/1954 9A w/e 26/09/1959 14B Kentish Town
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40093 4w/e 16/05/1953 8E Brunswick 8w/e 19/06/1954 9A w/e 11/06/1960 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46120 4w/e 17/07/1954 6J Holyhead 4w/e 14/08/1954 9A 4w/e 06/11/1954 5A Crewe North
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45505 8w/e 19/06/1954 10B Preston 4w/e 09/10/1954 9A w/e 10/09/1960 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45519 4w/e 24/03/1951 10B Preston 4w/e 09/10/1954 9A m/e 16/06/1956 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45146 8w/e 19/06/1954 10C Patricroft 4w/e 09/10/1954 9A w/e 29/11/1958 1B Camden
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46128 4w/e 09/10/1954 5A Crewe North 4w/e 04/12/1954 9A 4w/e 26/03/1955 5A Crewe North
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46132 4w/e 09/10/1954 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 04/12/1954 9A 4w/e 29/01/1955 8A Edge Hill
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46138 4w/e 03/10/1953 5A Crewe North 4w/e 04/12/1954 9A 4w/e 01/01/1955 5A Crewe North
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46166 4w/e 09/10/1954 5A Crewe North 4w/e 04/12/1954 9A 4w/e 01/01/1955 5A Crewe North
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42597 4w/e 29/01/1955 1E Bletchley 4w/e 26/02/1955 9A 4w/e 03/11/1956 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45528 4w/e 09/10/1954 5A Crewe North 4w/e 26/02/1955 9A 4w/e 26/03/1955 6J Holyhead
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46153 4w/e 24/03/1951 8A Edge Hill 8w/e 16/07/1955 9A w/e 07/11/1959 3B Bushbury
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46158 4w/e 17/07/1951 8A Edge Hill 8w/e 16/07/1955 9A w/e 25/04/1959 14B Kentish Town
Steam 2P 0-4-4T 41908 01/01/1948 1C Watford 4w/e 13/08/1955 9A m/e 11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40084 4w/e 21/05/1955 6K Rhyl 4w/e 08/10/1955 9A 21/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45587 4w/e 21/05/1955 10B Preston 4w/e 08/10/1955 9A 4w/e 14/06/1958 5A Crewe North
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45520 4w/e 21/05/1955 10B Preston 4w/e 08/10/1955 9A w/e 31/12/1960 8A Edge Hill
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48275 01/01/1948 19D Heaton Mersey 4w/e 08/10/1955 9A 4w/e 22/03/1958 9D Buxton (LNWR)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45299 4w/e 10/09/1955 6J Holyhead 4w/e 08/10/1955 9A 4w/e 22/03/1958 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45441 01/01/1948 2A Rugby 4w/e 08/10/1955 9A 4w/e 06/10/1956 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42566 4w/e 04/12/1954 5A Crewe North 4w/e 05/11/1955 9A 4w/e 03/12/1955 6H Bangor
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42319 01/01/1948 9C Macclesfield 4w/e 05/11/1955 9A 8w/e 05/10/1957 9C Macclesfield
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42673 4w/e 08/10/1955 9D Buxton (LNWR) 4w/e 05/11/1955 9A 4w/e 24/03/1956 2A Rugby
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42677 4w/e 16/06/1951 5A Crewe North 4w/e 05/11/1955 9A 4w/e 03/12/1955 5A Crewe North
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46143 4w/e 05/11/1955 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 03/12/1955 9A w/e 07/11/1959 3B Bushbury
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42677 4w/e 03/12/1955 5A Crewe North 4w/e 31/12/1955 9A 4w/e 25/02/1956 5A Crewe North
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45736 4w/e 10/09/1955 6J Holyhead 4w/e 28/01/1956 9A 4w/e 25/02/1956 5A Crewe North
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42304 8w/e 11/07/1953 5F Uttoxeter 4w/e 28/01/1956 9A 4w/e 04/10/1958 1A Willesden
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45528 4w/e 21/05/1955 5A Crewe North 4w/e 28/01/1956 9A 4w/e 21/04/1956 5A Crewe North
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43325 4w/e 03/12/1955 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe 4w/e 28/01/1956 9A 4w/e 12/07/1958 1C Watford
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46120 4w/e 03/12/1955 17A Derby 4w/e 25/02/1956 9A m/e 16/06/1956 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45304 01/01/1948 10C Patricroft 4w/e 25/02/1956 9A 4w/e 24/03/1956 10C Patricroft
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45113 4w/e 04/11/1950 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 24/03/1956 9A 4w/e 21/04/1956 2A Rugby
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42381 01/01/1948 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 19/05/1956 9A w/e 12/11/1960 2A Rugby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44840 4w/e 18/04/1953 5A Crewe North 4w/e 19/05/1956 9A 8w/e 05/10/1957 3E Monument Lane
Steam 2P 0-4-4T 41900 01/01/1948 22C Bath Green Park (S&D) m/e 16/06/1956 9A 4w/e 23/02/1957 22B Gloucester Barnwood
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45113 4w/e 21/04/1956 2A Rugby m/e 16/06/1956 9A 4w/e 03/11/1956 5A Crewe North
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46149 3w/e 24/01/1953 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 11/08/1956 9A 4w/e 06/10/1956 6J Holyhead
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45519 m/e 16/06/1956 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 11/08/1956 9A 4w/e 08/09/1956 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46147 4w/e 11/08/1956 6J Holyhead 4w/e 08/09/1956 9A 4w/e 06/10/1956 6J Holyhead
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48680 8w/e 14/06/1952 9A Longsight 4w/e 08/09/1956 9A w/e 26/11/1960 2E Northampton
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46135 4w/e 14/08/1954 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 06/10/1956 9A 4w/e 23/02/1957 5A Crewe North
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45622 01/01/1948 19G Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 06/10/1956 9A 4w/e 03/11/1956 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45628 01/01/1948 19G Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 06/10/1956 9A 4w/e 03/11/1956 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44938 2w/e 17/06/1950 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 06/10/1956 9A 8w/e 05/10/1957 2A Rugby
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45652 01/01/1948 19G Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 03/11/1956 9A 4w/e 01/12/1956 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45655 4w/e 16/06/1951 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 03/11/1956 9A 4w/e 10/08/1957 5A Crewe North
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46137 3w/e 24/01/1953 5A Crewe North 4w/e 01/12/1956 9A 4w/e 23/02/1957 5A Crewe North
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45629 01/01/1948 19G Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 01/12/1956 9A 4w/e 14/06/1958 5A Crewe North
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45643 4w/e 29/01/1955 5A Crewe North 4w/e 01/12/1956 9A 4w/e 23/02/1957 5A Crewe North
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45519 4w/e 03/11/1956 10B Preston 4w/e 01/12/1956 9A 4w/e 14/06/1958 5A Crewe North
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40433 8w/e 19/06/1954 9F Heaton Mersey 4w/e 01/12/1956 9A 4w/e 23/03/1957 19B Sheffield Millhouses
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42786 4w/e 07/10/1950 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 26/01/1957 9A w/e 14/01/1961 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40143 4w/e 05/09/1953 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 26/01/1957 9A 4w/e 23/03/1957 8D Widnes
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42348 4w/e 29/12/1951 5D Stoke 4w/e 23/02/1957 9A 8w/e 05/10/1957 9C Macclesfield
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46136 01/01/1948 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 23/03/1957 9A 4w/e 20/04/1957 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44061 4w/e 07/10/1950 4B Northampton 4w/e 23/03/1957 9A w/e 07/11/1959 5E Alsager
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42542 4w/e 11/08/1956 11A Carnforth 4w/e 20/04/1957 9A 4w/e 28/12/1957 9G Northwich
Steam 2P 0-4-4T 41900 4w/e 23/02/1957 22B Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 20/04/1957 9A 4w/e 10/08/1957 22B Gloucester Barnwood
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42931 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 4w/e 18/05/1957 9A 4w/e 22/03/1958 5B Crewe South
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43189 3w/e 14/01/1950 5B Crewe South 4w/e 16/06/1957 9A w/e 20/12/1958 9G Gorton
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45613 4w/e 24/03/1956 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 10/08/1957 9A 4w/e 07/09/1957 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42365 01/01/1948 9D Buxton (LNWR) 4w/e 10/08/1957 9A 4w/e 04/10/1958 1A Willesden
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45033 4w/e 03/11/1956 5A Crewe North 4w/e 10/08/1957 9A 8w/e 05/10/1957 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45150 4w/e 24/03/1956 5A Crewe North 4w/e 10/08/1957 9A 4w/e 07/09/1957 3E Monument Lane
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45188 4w/e 31/12/1955 5B Crewe South 4w/e 10/08/1957 9A 4w/e 07/09/1957 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45403 4w/e 03/11/1956 3B Bushbury 4w/e 10/08/1957 9A 8w/e 05/10/1957 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42935 4w/e 10/08/1957 3A Bescot 4w/e 07/09/1957 9A 4w/e 22/03/1958 5B Crewe South
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46137 4w/e 07/09/1957 12A Carlisle Upperby 8w/e 05/10/1957 9A 4w/e 30/11/1957 8A Edge Hill
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42934 3w/e 11/12/1948 5B Crewe South 8w/e 05/10/1957 9A w/e 26/11/1960 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45150 4w/e 07/09/1957 3E Monument Lane 8w/e 05/10/1957 9A w/e 12/09/1959 24K Preston
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45671 01/01/1948 25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 30/11/1957 9A w/e 10/09/1960 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46137 4w/e 30/11/1957 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 28/12/1957 9A w/e 30/04/1960 26A Newton Heath
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49154 8w/e 05/10/1957 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 28/12/1957 9A 4w/e 25/01/1958 2B Nuneaton
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40202 4w/e 10/08/1957 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 25/01/1958 9A 4w/e 22/03/1958 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42602 4w/e 28/12/1957 2A Rugby 4w/e 25/01/1958 9A 4w/e 22/03/1958 8A Edge Hill
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42320 4w/e 11/08/1956 11B Barrow in Furness 4w/e 25/01/1958 9A 4w/e 22/03/1958 11A Carnforth
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48745 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South 4w/e 22/03/1958 9A w/e 22/11/1958 26A Newton Heath
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45416 4w/e 22/02/1958 3D Aston 4w/e 22/03/1958 9A 4w/e 14/06/1958 17A Derby
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48428 4w/e 19/04/1958 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 17/05/1958 9A w/e 26/11/1960 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46106 8w/e 05/10/1957 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 14/06/1958 9A w/e 30/04/1960 26A Newton Heath
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46166 4w/e 03/12/1955 5A Crewe North 4w/e 14/06/1958 9A w/e 10/09/1960 5A Crewe North
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42360 4w/e 30/11/1957 1A Willesden 4w/e 14/06/1958 9A 4w/e 04/10/1958 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42416 4w/e 30/11/1957 1A Willesden 4w/e 14/06/1958 9A w/e 09/01/1960 5B Crewe South
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48165 8w/e 16/07/1955 9D Buxton (LNWR) 4w/e 14/06/1958 9A w/e 30/04/1960 9D Buxton (LNWR)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48275 4w/e 22/03/1958 9D Buxton (LNWR) 4w/e 14/06/1958 9A w/e 26/11/1960 9D Buxton (LNWR)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48465 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South 4w/e 14/06/1958 9A w/e 12/12/1959 8E Northwich
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44746 4w/e 16/06/1957 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 14/06/1958 9A w/e 30/04/1960 26A Newton Heath
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44747 4w/e 10/08/1957 17A Derby 4w/e 14/06/1958 9A w/e 14/02/1959 26F Patricroft
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44827 4w/e 30/11/1957 5A Crewe North 4w/e 14/06/1958 9A w/e 12/09/1959 24K Preston
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45004 4w/e 26/02/1955 1E Bletchley 4w/e 14/06/1958 9A 4w/e 04/10/1958 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45111 4w/e 30/11/1957 5A Crewe North 4w/e 14/06/1958 9A w/e 30/04/1960 21E Monument Lane
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45254 4w/e 03/10/1953 5A Crewe North 4w/e 14/06/1958 9A 4w/e 04/10/1958 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45302 4w/e 03/11/1956 5A Crewe North 4w/e 14/06/1958 9A w/e 12/09/1959 24K Preston
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45305 4w/e 30/11/1957 5A Crewe North 4w/e 14/06/1958 9A 4w/e 04/10/1958 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45426 4w/e 16/06/1957 5A Crewe North 4w/e 14/06/1958 9A w/e 07/05/1960 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42400 4w/e 27/03/1954 5D Stoke 4w/e 09/08/1958 9A 4w/e 06/09/1958 5C Stafford
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42369 01/01/1948 9C Macclesfield 4w/e 06/09/1958 9A w/e 19/11/1960 8E Northwich
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45587 4w/e 14/06/1958 5A Crewe North 4w/e 04/10/1958 9A w/e 30/05/1959 3B Bushbury
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47291 01/01/1948 10B Preston 4w/e 04/10/1958 9A m/e 12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41217 4w/e 06/10/1951 11B Barrow in Furness 4w/e 04/10/1958 9A w/e 13/08/1960 8D Widnes
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41221       4w/e 04/10/1958 9A w/e 13/08/1960 8D Widnes
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46131 4w/e 04/10/1958 5A Crewe North w/e 18/10/1958 9A w/e 06/02/1960 41C Sheffield Millhouses
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46108 01/01/1948 20A Holbeck (MR) w/e 06/12/1958 9A w/e 28/11/1959 24K Preston
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45146 w/e 29/11/1958 1B Camden w/e 27/12/1958 9A w/e 10/01/1959 2A Rugby
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46148 4w/e 30/11/1957 12A Carlisle Upperby w/e 10/01/1959 9A w/e 14/02/1959 14B Kentish Town
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45543 w/e 15/11/1958 24K Preston w/e 17/01/1959 9A w/e 31/12/1960 8A Edge Hill
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47356 4w/e 14/06/1958 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 24/01/1959 9A w/e 07/11/1959 11A Barrow in Furness
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40076 w/e 15/11/1958 9G Gorton w/e 14/03/1959 9A w/e 20/06/1959 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40078 w/e 15/11/1958 9G Gorton w/e 14/03/1959 9A w/e 20/06/1959 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40122 w/e 15/11/1958 9G Gorton w/e 14/03/1959 9A w/e 09/05/1959 5C Stafford
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3765       02/05/1959 (New) 9A w/e 12/05/1973 NH Newton Heath
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3766       09/05/1959 (New) 9A w/e 30/05/1959 17A Derby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44747 w/e 14/02/1959 26F Patricroft w/e 09/05/1959 9A w/e 04/05/1963 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3767       16/05/1959 (New) 9A w/e 30/05/1959 17A Derby
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3768       16/05/1959 (New) 9A w/e 30/05/1959 17A Derby
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3769       30/05/1959 (New) 9A w/e 30/05/1959 17A Derby
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3770       30/05/1959 (New) 9A w/e 05/12/1964 9B Stockport Edgeley
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3771       13/06/1959 (New) 9A w/e 11/07/1959 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46122 w/e 25/04/1959 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 13/06/1959 9A w/e 20/06/1959 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46158 w/e 25/04/1959 14B Kentish Town w/e 13/06/1959 9A w/e 07/11/1959 3B Bushbury
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45530 w/e 25/04/1959 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 13/06/1959 9A w/e 10/09/1960 1B Camden
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45108 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South w/e 20/06/1959 9A w/e 12/09/1959 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45372 4w/e 25/02/1956 1A Willesden w/e 20/06/1959 9A w/e 12/09/1959 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42304 4w/e 04/10/1958 1A Willesden w/e 11/07/1959 9A w/e 05/03/1960 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D217 09/06/1959 5A Crewe North (New) w/e 18/07/1959 9A w/e 30/04/1960 1B Camden
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46151 4w/e 06/10/1956 5A Crewe North w/e 18/07/1959 9A w/e 06/02/1960 41C Sheffield Millhouses
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40122 w/e 09/05/1959 5C Stafford w/e 18/07/1959 9A w/e 28/05/1960 8D Widnes
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45587 w/e 30/05/1959 3B Bushbury w/e 01/08/1959 9A w/e 10/06/1961 5A Crewe North
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D221 20/07/1959 5A Crewe North (New) w/e 22/08/1959 9A w/e 07/10/1961 26A Newton Heath
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D227       24/08/1959 (New) 9A w/e 19/09/1959 5A Crewe North
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D228       28/08/1959 (New) 9A w/e 18/07/1964 8A Edge Hill
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3764 25/04/1959 6A Chester (MR) (New) w/e 29/08/1959 9A w/e 29/08/1959 6A Chester (MR)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3766 w/e 30/05/1959 17A Derby w/e 05/09/1959 9A 2w/e 23/12/1972 5A Crewe Diesel
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3767 w/e 30/05/1959 17A Derby w/e 05/09/1959 9A w/e 12/05/1973 NH Newton Heath
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3768 w/e 30/05/1959 17A Derby w/e 05/09/1959 9A w/e 08/05/1971 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3769 w/e 30/05/1959 17A Derby w/e 12/09/1959 9A w/e 17/07/1965 9B Stockport Edgeley
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D214 08/06/1959 1A Willesden (New) w/e 19/09/1959 9A w/e 30/04/1960 8A Edge Hill
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42848 w/e 08/08/1959 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 03/10/1959 9A w/e 07/11/1959 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45037 4w/e 28/01/1956 11A Carnforth w/e 07/11/1959 9A w/e 09/01/1960 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45046 4w/e 06/10/1956 11A Carnforth w/e 07/11/1959 9A w/e 09/01/1960 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45339 w/e 08/11/1958 6A Chester (MR) w/e 07/11/1959 9A w/e 30/04/1960 26A Newton Heath
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46108 w/e 28/11/1959 24K Preston w/e 23/01/1960 9A w/e 10/09/1960 5A Crewe North
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70046 w/e 07/11/1959 5A Crewe North w/e 06/02/1960 9A w/e 09/09/1961 1A Willesden
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48465 w/e 12/12/1959 8E Northwich w/e 06/02/1960 9A w/e 26/11/1960 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44842 w/e 20/06/1959 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 06/02/1960 9A w/e 30/04/1960 21E Monument Lane
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44855 4w/e 29/12/1956 14B Kentish Town w/e 06/02/1960 9A w/e 07/05/1960 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46156 w/e 07/11/1959 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 27/02/1960 9A w/e 26/03/1960 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42542 4w/e 22/03/1958 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 05/03/1960 9A w/e 14/01/1961 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45623 4w/e 14/06/1958 5A Crewe North w/e 30/04/1960 9A w/e 31/12/1960 5B Crewe South
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45679 w/e 20/06/1959 5A Crewe North w/e 30/04/1960 9A w/e 25/06/1960 26A Newton Heath
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D225 w/e 19/09/1959 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 14/05/1960 9A w/e 28/05/1960 12B Carlisle Upperby
Diesel Peak 1Co-Co1 D1 w/e 09/04/1960 1B Camden w/e 21/05/1960 9A w/e 03/03/1962 18A Toton
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5083 w/e 09/04/1960 1A Willesden w/e 21/05/1960 9A w/e 05/11/1960 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42539 4w/e 16/06/1957 12A Carlisle Upperby w/e 28/05/1960 9A 11/02/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46120 4w/e 04/10/1958 5A Crewe North w/e 11/06/1960 9A w/e 10/09/1960 1B Camden
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46127 w/e 30/04/1960 5A Crewe North w/e 11/06/1960 9A w/e 10/09/1960 5A Crewe North
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46135 w/e 12/09/1959 5A Crewe North w/e 11/06/1960 9A w/e 10/09/1960 5A Crewe North
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45736 4w/e 25/02/1956 5A Crewe North w/e 11/06/1960 9A w/e 10/09/1960 5A Crewe North
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42583 w/e 02/01/1960 8A Edge Hill w/e 18/06/1960 9A w/e 14/01/1961 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45534 w/e 07/11/1959 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 18/06/1960 9A w/e 10/09/1960 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44758 w/e 20/06/1959 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 18/06/1960 9A w/e 10/09/1960 8A Edge Hill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44780 w/e 07/11/1959 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 18/06/1960 9A w/e 26/11/1960 5A Crewe North
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13176 30/09/1955 5B Crewe South (New) w/e 23/07/1960 9A w/e 10/09/1960 5B Crewe South
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42658 4w/e 14/06/1958 3D Aston w/e 20/08/1960 9A w/e 14/01/1961 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42137 w/e 07/05/1960 21A Saltley w/e 20/08/1960 9A w/e 23/06/1962 5F Uttoxeter
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D289 15/08/1960 5A Crewe North (New) w/e 03/09/1960 9A w/e 15/09/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D214 w/e 30/04/1960 8A Edge Hill w/e 17/09/1960 9A w/e 14/07/1962 5A Crewe North
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D218 w/e 18/07/1959 8A Edge Hill w/e 17/09/1960 9A w/e 28/05/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D222 w/e 22/08/1959 8A Edge Hill w/e 17/09/1960 9A w/e 28/05/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42425 w/e 05/12/1959 6H Bangor w/e 17/09/1960 9A w/e 29/06/1963 24C Lostock Hall
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48310 4w/e 17/07/1951 3A Bescot w/e 17/09/1960 9A w/e 07/08/1965 10C Fleetwood
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42081 w/e 16/07/1960 6H Bangor w/e 17/09/1960 9A w/e 17/12/1960 8B Warrington Dallam
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5133       24/09/1960 (New) 9A w/e 12/11/1960 5A Crewe North
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70031 w/e 30/04/1960 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 24/09/1960 9A w/e 09/09/1961 21D Aston
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45426 w/e 07/05/1960 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 24/09/1960 9A w/e 26/11/1960 5A Crewe North
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5134       06/10/1960 (New) 9A w/e 06/01/1962 1B Camden
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D294 23/09/1960 5A Crewe North (New) w/e 08/10/1960 9A w/e 15/09/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5079 w/e 24/09/1960 1A Willesden w/e 08/10/1960 9A w/e 15/10/1960 12B Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5135       08/10/1960 (New) 9A w/e 07/04/1962 1B Camden
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5137       18/10/1960 (New) 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5136       22/10/1960 (New) 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5138       27/10/1960 (New) 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5060 02/01/1960 31B March (New) w/e 29/10/1960 9A w/e 05/11/1960 1A Willesden
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5139       29/10/1960 (New) 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47341 w/e 10/09/1960 5B Crewe South w/e 29/10/1960 9A w/e 26/11/1960 24L Carnforth
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45034 4w/e 03/11/1956 3E Monument Lane w/e 29/10/1960 9A w/e 26/11/1960 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45044 w/e 18/06/1960 5D Stoke w/e 29/10/1960 9A w/e 19/11/1960 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45111 w/e 30/04/1960 21E Monument Lane w/e 29/10/1960 9A w/e 19/11/1960 12B Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5140       05/11/1960 (New) 9A w/e 03/01/1966 1E Bletchley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45282 4w/e 08/10/1955 5A Crewe North w/e 05/11/1960 9A w/e 19/11/1960 12F Workington
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45305 4w/e 04/10/1958 5A Crewe North w/e 05/11/1960 9A w/e 19/11/1960 12F Workington
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45434 3w/e 24/01/1953 5A Crewe North w/e 05/11/1960 9A w/e 19/11/1960 12F Workington
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D220 w/e 01/10/1960 5A Crewe North w/e 12/11/1960 9A w/e 28/05/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D224 w/e 02/07/1960 5A Crewe North w/e 12/11/1960 9A w/e 28/05/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D227 w/e 10/09/1960 5A Crewe North w/e 12/11/1960 9A w/e 28/05/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR)
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5141       12/11/1960 (New) 9A w/e 03/01/1966 2F Bescot
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5060 w/e 12/11/1960 1A Willesden w/e 19/11/1960 9A w/e 14/01/1961 5A Crewe North
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5083 w/e 05/11/1960 1A Willesden w/e 19/11/1960 9A w/e 18/03/1961 1A Willesden
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5142       19/11/1960 (New) 9A w/e 27/01/1962 1B Camden
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D217 w/e 30/04/1960 1B Camden w/e 26/11/1960 9A w/e 07/03/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D225 w/e 27/08/1960 1B Camden w/e 26/11/1960 9A w/e 20/04/1963 1B Camden
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D307 27/10/1960 5A Crewe North (New) w/e 26/11/1960 9A w/e 11/02/1961 1B Camden
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D308 07/11/1960 5A Crewe North (New) w/e 26/11/1960 9A w/e 11/02/1961 1B Camden
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42887 w/e 26/11/1960 5D Stoke w/e 17/12/1960 9A w/e 07/01/1961 5D Stoke
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D313 20/12/1960 5A Crewe North (New) w/e 14/01/1961 9A w/e 15/09/1962 5A Crewe North
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D301 w/e 24/12/1960 1B Camden w/e 11/02/1961 9A w/e 15/09/1962 5A Crewe North
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D304 w/e 24/12/1960 1B Camden w/e 11/02/1961 9A w/e 22/04/1961 17A Derby
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D321 10/04/1961 5A Crewe North (New) 2w/e 22/04/1961 9A w/e 20/05/1961 5A Crewe North
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D304 w/e 22/04/1961 17A Derby w/e 20/05/1961 9A w/e 15/09/1962 5A Crewe North
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42363 4w/e 09/09/1950 9C Macclesfield w/e 10/06/1961 9A w/e 23/12/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46149 w/e 30/04/1960 5A Crewe North w/e 24/06/1961 9A m/e 09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46115 w/e 06/05/1961 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 15/07/1961 9A w/e 06/06/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45385 w/e 14/10/1961 24J Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 09/12/1961 9A w/e 29/06/1963 26F Patricroft
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D221 w/e 07/10/1961 26A Newton Heath w/e 16/12/1961 9A w/e 28/05/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR)
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46110 w/e 28/10/1961 8A Edge Hill w/e 16/12/1961 9A w/e 30/12/1961 8A Edge Hill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45024 w/e 09/12/1961 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 16/12/1961 9A w/e 30/12/1961 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45302 w/e 16/09/1961 2E Northampton w/e 16/12/1961 9A w/e 30/12/1961 2E Northampton
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D331 w/e 09/09/1961 8A Edge Hill w/e 30/12/1961 9A w/e 15/09/1962 5A Crewe North
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D332 w/e 09/09/1961 8A Edge Hill w/e 30/12/1961 9A w/e 15/09/1962 5A Crewe North
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D344 w/e 12/08/1961 5A Crewe North w/e 30/12/1961 9A w/e 06/01/1962 5A Crewe North
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D372       03/01/1962 (New) 9A w/e 06/01/1962 1B Camden
Diesel 09 0-6-0 D4113       04/01/1962 (New) 9A w/e 21/09/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D291 w/e 04/11/1961 5A Crewe North w/e 06/01/1962 9A w/e 15/09/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42578 w/e 11/11/1961 24L Carnforth w/e 06/01/1962 9A w/e 13/10/1962 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D298 w/e 19/11/1960 1B Camden w/e 27/01/1962 9A w/e 15/09/1962 5A Crewe North
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70043 w/e 09/09/1961 21D Aston w/e 24/03/1962 9A w/e 16/06/1962 21D Aston
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70028 w/e 16/09/1961 21D Aston w/e 31/03/1962 9A w/e 16/06/1962 21D Aston
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5142 w/e 24/03/1962 1B Camden w/e 07/04/1962 9A w/e 07/03/1964 16C Derby
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70016 w/e 16/09/1961 12C Carlisle Canal w/e 19/05/1962 9A w/e 15/09/1962 5A Crewe North
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70018 w/e 16/09/1961 12C Carlisle Canal w/e 19/05/1962 9A w/e 15/09/1962 5A Crewe North
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70019 w/e 16/09/1961 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 16/06/1962 9A w/e 15/09/1962 5A Crewe North
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70020 w/e 16/09/1961 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 16/06/1962 9A w/e 15/09/1962 5A Crewe North
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70022 w/e 16/09/1961 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 16/06/1962 9A w/e 15/09/1962 21D Aston
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70023 w/e 16/09/1961 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 16/06/1962 9A w/e 15/09/1962 21D Aston
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5133 w/e 07/07/1962 1A Willesden w/e 07/07/1962 9A w/e 15/09/1962 5A Crewe North
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70028 w/e 16/06/1962 21D Aston w/e 07/07/1962 9A w/e 15/09/1962 21D Aston
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46129 w/e 10/03/1962 5A Crewe North w/e 15/09/1962 9A 06/06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44916 w/e 23/06/1962 6A Chester (MR) w/e 13/10/1962 9A w/e 20/02/1965 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45256 w/e 23/06/1962 6A Chester (MR) w/e 13/10/1962 9A w/e 23/02/1963 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42357 w/e 10/06/1961 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 20/10/1962 9A w/e 19/01/1963 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42670 w/e 24/11/1962 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 19/01/1963 9A w/e 29/06/1963 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44809 4w/e 30/11/1957 17F Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 23/02/1963 9A w/e 18/05/1963 27C Southport
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D269 04/04/1960 1B Camden (New) w/e 20/04/1963 9A w/e 01/06/1963 1B Camden
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44744 w/e 17/03/1962 27C Southport w/e 18/05/1963 9A m/e 11/1963 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D225 w/e 20/04/1963 1B Camden w/e 01/06/1963 9A w/e 28/05/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D269 w/e 01/06/1963 1B Camden w/e 22/06/1963 9A w/e 14/09/1963 1B Camden
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D298 w/e 15/09/1962 5A Crewe North w/e 22/06/1963 9A w/e 14/09/1963 5A Crewe North
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46140 w/e 16/09/1961 26A Newton Heath w/e 22/06/1963 9A w/e 10/10/1964 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46142 w/e 16/09/1961 26A Newton Heath w/e 22/06/1963 9A 11/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45522 w/e 16/09/1961 26A Newton Heath w/e 22/06/1963 9A 19/09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45380 w/e 27/07/1963 26A Newton Heath w/e 24/08/1963 9A w/e 20/02/1965 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42670 w/e 29/06/1963 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 14/09/1963 9A w/e 03/10/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D317 w/e 25/02/1961 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 28/09/1963 9A w/e 07/03/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45404 w/e 22/06/1963 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 26/10/1963 9A w/e 20/02/1965 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5202 28/05/1963 18A Toton (New) w/e 04/01/1964 9A w/e 09/05/1964 10G Skipton
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5142 w/e 07/03/1964 16C Derby w/e 28/03/1964 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D290 w/e 07/03/1964 5A Crewe North w/e 11/04/1964 9A w/e 18/07/1964 8A Edge Hill
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D292 w/e 02/12/1961 5A Crewe North w/e 11/04/1964 9A w/e 20/06/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D293 w/e 23/06/1962 5A Crewe North w/e 11/04/1964 9A w/e 20/06/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5146 w/e 08/07/1961 1A Willesden w/e 25/04/1964 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5202 w/e 09/05/1964 10G Skipton w/e 01/08/1964 9A w/e 05/09/1964 16A Toton
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5014 w/e 30/06/1962 2A Rugby w/e 26/12/1964 9A w/e 01/05/1965 1F Rugby
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D223 w/e 03/10/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 02/01/1965 9A w/e 28/05/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D228 w/e 03/10/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 02/01/1965 9A w/e 28/05/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3771 w/e 11/07/1959 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 01/05/1965 9A 16/07/1993 Withdrawn
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5134 w/e 26/12/1964 1F Rugby w/e 01/05/1965 9A w/e 20/11/1965 1F Rugby
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13335 w/e 05/05/1962 9G Gorton w/e 12/06/1965 9A w/e 07/01/1967 9D Newton Heath
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3686 w/e 05/05/1962 9G Gorton w/e 12/06/1965 9A w/e 12/11/1966 9D Newton Heath
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3694 w/e 05/05/1962 9G Gorton w/e 12/06/1965 9A 2w/e 05/08/1972 8J Allerton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3695 w/e 02/06/1962 9G Gorton w/e 12/06/1965 9A w/e 12/05/1973 NH Newton Heath
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3700 w/e 02/06/1962 9G Gorton w/e 12/06/1965 9A w/e 06/03/1971 14A Cricklewood East
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4145 11/09/1962 9B Stockport Edgeley (New) w/e 17/07/1965 9A m/e 31/10/1979 LO Longsight
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3852 19/09/1959 9F Heaton Mersey (New) w/e 18/09/1965 9A w/e 09/03/1968 1E Bletchley
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3853 26/09/1959 9F Heaton Mersey (New) w/e 18/09/1965 9A 22/11/1991 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3854 03/10/1959 9F Heaton Mersey (New) w/e 18/09/1965 9A      
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5014 w/e 01/05/1965 1F Rugby w/e 20/11/1965 9A 18/04/1966 D01 London Division
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3769 w/e 17/07/1965 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 26/02/1966 9A 30/03/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3770 w/e 05/12/1964 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 26/02/1966 9A w/e 08/05/1971 1A Willesden
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3860 w/e 08/10/1960 16A Nottingham w/e 05/03/1966 9A w/e 29/10/1966 9D Newton Heath
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5134 18/04/1966 D01 London Division w/e 23/04/1966 9A w/e 24/12/1966 D01 London Division
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3778 w/e 15/01/1966 16F Burton w/e 30/04/1966 9A w/e 12/07/1969 8J Allerton
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2200 w/e 29/11/1964 85A Worcester w/e 04/06/1966 9A 7w/e 19/06/1966 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2240 w/e 29/11/1964 85A Worcester w/e 04/06/1966 9A 7w/e 19/06/1966 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12081 4w/e 01/12/1956 8C Speke Junction w/e 11/06/1966 9A w/e 12/11/1966 9D Newton Heath
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3699 w/e 12/06/1965 9D Newton Heath w/e 02/07/1966 9A w/e 08/01/1972 1E Bletchley
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3988 w/e 28/05/1966 9D Newton Heath w/e 02/07/1966 9A 22/02/1990 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2389 w/e 12/10/1963 8C Speke Junction w/e 06/08/1966 9A w/e 20/04/1968 9D Newton Heath
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2390 w/e 12/10/1963 8C Speke Junction w/e 06/08/1966 9A w/e 03/06/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2394 w/e 18/04/1964 8C Speke Junction w/e 06/08/1966 9A w/e 07/10/1967 12C Barrow in Furness
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2373 02/08/1961 8A Edge Hill (New) w/e 01/10/1966 9A w/e 20/04/1968 9D Newton Heath
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2391 w/e 28/11/1964 8A Edge Hill w/e 01/10/1966 9A w/e 20/04/1968 9D Newton Heath
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2392 w/e 28/11/1964 8A Edge Hill w/e 01/10/1966 9A w/e 03/06/1967 10A Carnforth
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12033 4w/e 25/01/1958 17A Derby w/e 10/12/1966 9A w/e 07/01/1967 9D Newton Heath
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5091 18/04/1966 D01 London Division w/e 24/12/1966 9A w/e 11/03/1967 D05 Stoke Division
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3009 w/e 05/11/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 04/03/1967 9A w/e 26/06/1971 8J Allerton
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5134 w/e 24/12/1966 D01 London Division w/e 11/03/1967 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3779 w/e 12/12/1959 26A Newton Heath w/e 17/06/1967 9A w/e 08/05/1971 16C Derby
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D212 18/04/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 19/08/1967 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D213 18/04/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 26/08/1967 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5242 w/e 05/07/1967 D05 Stoke Division w/e 26/08/1967 9A w/e 18/05/1968 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D214 18/04/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 14/10/1967 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7586 w/e 29/02/1964 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 28/10/1967 9A 4w/e 25/05/1968 55A Holbeck (MR)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D200 w/e 12/08/1967 91M To London Midland Region w/e 30/12/1967 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D201 w/e 12/08/1967 91M To London Midland Region w/e 30/12/1967 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D202 w/e 12/08/1967 91M To London Midland Region w/e 30/12/1967 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D203 w/e 12/08/1967 91M To London Midland Region w/e 30/12/1967 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D204 w/e 19/08/1967 91M To London Midland Region w/e 30/12/1967 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D204 w/e 19/08/1967 WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 30/12/1967 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D205 w/e 12/08/1967 91M To London Midland Region w/e 30/12/1967 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5273 w/e 07/10/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 30/12/1967 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5293 w/e 25/11/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 30/12/1967 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D340 18/04/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 13/01/1968 9A w/e 09/03/1968 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D341 18/04/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 13/01/1968 9A w/e 09/03/1968 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D342 18/04/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 13/01/1968 9A w/e 09/03/1968 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D343 18/04/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 13/01/1968 9A w/e 09/03/1968 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D344 18/04/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 13/01/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5050 5w/e 31/12/1966 64B Haymarket w/e 13/01/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5062 w/e 13/08/1966 64B Haymarket w/e 13/01/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5063 w/e 05/11/1966 64B Haymarket w/e 13/01/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7558 w/e 13/05/1967 D02 Birmingham Division w/e 13/01/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5064 w/e 13/08/1966 64B Haymarket w/e 27/01/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D225 w/e 13/01/1968 WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 03/02/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5061 w/e 13/08/1966 64B Haymarket w/e 03/02/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5208 w/e 08/10/1966 ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 03/02/1968 9A w/e 09/03/1968 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5209 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 03/02/1968 9A w/e 09/03/1968 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5244 w/e 26/08/1967 D02 Birmingham Division w/e 03/02/1968 9A w/e 18/05/1968 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5210 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 24/02/1968 9A w/e 09/03/1968 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5211 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 24/02/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D370 18/04/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 09/03/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D371 18/04/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 09/03/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D377 18/04/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 09/03/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5197 w/e 23/04/1966 ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 09/03/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5212 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 09/03/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5257 w/e 05/07/1967 D05 Stoke Division w/e 09/03/1968 9A w/e 11/05/1968 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5263 w/e 14/10/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 09/03/1968 9A w/e 18/05/1968 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5264 w/e 14/10/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 09/03/1968 9A w/e 18/05/1968 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5265 w/e 14/10/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 09/03/1968 9A w/e 18/05/1968 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5274 w/e 27/06/1964 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 09/03/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5275 w/e 13/06/1964 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 09/03/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5276 w/e 27/06/1964 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 09/03/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5277 w/e 01/08/1964 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 09/03/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5278 w/e 01/08/1964 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 09/03/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5279 w/e 01/08/1964 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 09/03/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7647 w/e 22/04/1967 D02 Birmingham Division w/e 09/03/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7648 w/e 22/04/1967 D02 Birmingham Division w/e 09/03/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7649 w/e 22/04/1967 D02 Birmingham Division w/e 09/03/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7650 w/e 22/04/1967 D02 Birmingham Division w/e 09/03/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7651 w/e 22/04/1967 D02 Birmingham Division w/e 09/03/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D369 18/04/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 23/03/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7513 w/e 19/08/1967 D05 Stoke Division w/e 23/03/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D226 18/04/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 06/04/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D378 18/04/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 06/04/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D380 18/04/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 06/04/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5052 w/e 08/10/1966 65A Eastfield w/e 06/04/1968 9A 4w/e 27/04/1968 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5053 w/e 08/10/1966 65A Eastfield w/e 06/04/1968 9A 4w/e 27/04/1968 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5054 w/e 08/10/1966 65A Eastfield w/e 06/04/1968 9A 4w/e 27/04/1968 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5055 w/e 08/10/1966 65A Eastfield w/e 06/04/1968 9A 4w/e 27/04/1968 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5144 w/e 01/10/1966 D05 Stoke Division w/e 06/04/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5145 w/e 01/10/1966 D05 Stoke Division w/e 06/04/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D227 w/e 28/05/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 27/04/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5056 w/e 08/10/1966 65A Eastfield w/e 04/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D228 w/e 28/05/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 11/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D293 18/04/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 11/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D294 w/e 28/05/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 11/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5065 5w/e 30/03/1968 65A Eastfield w/e 11/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5066 5w/e 30/03/1968 65A Eastfield w/e 11/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5198 w/e 14/10/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 11/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5199 w/e 14/10/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 11/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5200 w/e 14/10/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 11/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7573 4w/e 12/08/1967 55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 11/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7573 w/e 12/08/1967 91N To North Eastern Region w/e 11/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7674 w/e 17/02/1968 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 11/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7675 w/e 17/02/1968 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 11/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7676 w/e 17/02/1968 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 11/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7677 w/e 17/02/1968 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 11/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5151 w/e 06/01/1968 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 18/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5152 w/e 06/01/1968 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 18/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5153 w/e 06/01/1968 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 18/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5154 w/e 06/01/1968 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 18/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5155 w/e 06/01/1968 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 18/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5156 w/e 06/01/1968 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 18/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7538 19/03/1965 D16 Nottingham Division (New) w/e 25/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7539 25/03/1965 D16 Nottingham Division (New) w/e 25/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7540 29/03/1965 D16 Nottingham Division (New) w/e 25/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7541 w/e 16/10/1965 D14 London (Midland) w/e 25/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7542 09/04/1965 D16 Nottingham Division (New) w/e 25/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7543 15/04/1965 D16 Nottingham Division (New) w/e 25/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7544 13/05/1965 D16 Nottingham Division (New) w/e 25/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7545 06/05/1965 D16 Nottingham Division (New) w/e 25/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7588 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 25/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7589 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 25/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7590 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 25/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7591 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 25/05/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7653 w/e 05/07/1967 D02 Birmingham Division w/e 01/06/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D290 w/e 09/12/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 15/06/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D291 w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton w/e 15/06/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D292 w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton w/e 15/06/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D372 18/04/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 15/06/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D373 18/04/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 15/06/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D374 18/04/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 15/06/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D375 18/04/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 15/06/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D376 18/04/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 15/06/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D379 18/04/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 15/06/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7592 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 15/06/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7594 w/e 11/03/1967 ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 15/06/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7595 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 15/06/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7597 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 15/06/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7629 w/e 12/08/1967 91M To London Midland Region w/e 15/06/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7629 w/e 12/08/1967 ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 15/06/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7630 w/e 12/08/1967 91M To London Midland Region w/e 15/06/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7630 w/e 12/08/1967 ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 15/06/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7631 w/e 12/08/1967 91M To London Midland Region w/e 15/06/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7631 w/e 12/08/1967 ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 15/06/1968 9A 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 02 0-4-0 D2858 w/e 06/01/1968 9D Newton Heath w/e 06/07/1968 9A 28/02/1970 Withdrawn
Diesel 02 0-4-0 D2864 w/e 27/07/1963 26A Newton Heath w/e 06/07/1968 9A 28/02/1970 Withdrawn
Diesel 02 0-4-0 D2866 w/e 19/10/1963 9D Newton Heath w/e 06/07/1968 9A 28/02/1970 Withdrawn
Diesel 02 0-4-0 D2869 w/e 20/07/1963 26A Newton Heath w/e 06/07/1968 9A w/e 10/05/1969 To Store
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13335 w/e 07/01/1967 9D Newton Heath w/e 06/07/1968 9A w/e 09/10/1971 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3372 10/08/1957 26A Newton Heath (New) w/e 06/07/1968 9A w/e 09/10/1971 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3373 15/08/1957 26A Newton Heath (New) w/e 06/07/1968 9A w/e 09/10/1971 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3588 28/11/1958 26A Newton Heath (New) w/e 06/07/1968 9A w/e 12/05/1973 NH Newton Heath
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3589 02/12/1958 26A Newton Heath (New) w/e 06/07/1968 9A w/e 12/05/1973 NH Newton Heath
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3590 10/12/1958 26A Newton Heath (New) w/e 06/07/1968 9A w/e 12/05/1973 NH Newton Heath
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3591 17/12/1958 26A Newton Heath (New) w/e 06/07/1968 9A w/e 27/11/1971 66A Polmadie
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3592 03/01/1959 26A Newton Heath (New) w/e 06/07/1968 9A w/e 12/05/1973 NH Newton Heath
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3686 w/e 12/11/1966 9D Newton Heath w/e 06/07/1968 9A w/e 12/05/1973 NH Newton Heath
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3772 w/e 20/11/1965 9D Newton Heath w/e 06/07/1968 9A 2w/e 05/04/1975 NH Newton Heath
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3784 12/09/1959 26A Newton Heath (New) w/e 06/07/1968 9A w/e 09/10/1971 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3842 w/e 12/12/1959 26A Newton Heath w/e 06/07/1968 9A w/e 12/05/1973 NH Newton Heath
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3843 w/e 12/12/1959 26A Newton Heath w/e 06/07/1968 9A w/e 12/05/1973 NH Newton Heath
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3844 w/e 12/12/1959 26A Newton Heath w/e 06/07/1968 9A w/e 12/05/1973 NH Newton Heath
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3845 w/e 12/12/1959 26A Newton Heath w/e 06/07/1968 9A w/e 12/05/1973 NH Newton Heath
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3860 w/e 29/10/1966 9D Newton Heath w/e 06/07/1968 9A 2w/e 05/08/1972 65A Eastfield
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3868 05/02/1960 26A Newton Heath (New) w/e 06/07/1968 9A w/e 10/05/1969 5A Crewe Diesel
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12033 w/e 07/01/1967 9D Newton Heath w/e 06/07/1968 9A 25/01/1969 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12050 w/e 12/11/1966 9D Newton Heath w/e 06/07/1968 9A 11/07/1970 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12051 w/e 12/11/1966 9D Newton Heath w/e 06/07/1968 9A w/e 09/01/1971 8J Allerton
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12060 w/e 10/12/1966 9D Newton Heath w/e 06/07/1968 9A 07/02/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12081 w/e 12/11/1966 9D Newton Heath w/e 06/07/1968 9A 20/06/1970 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12095 w/e 28/05/1966 9D Newton Heath w/e 06/07/1968 9A 16/04/1969 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12098 w/e 12/11/1966 9D Newton Heath w/e 06/07/1968 9A 27/02/1970 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4144 w/e 18/01/1964 1F Rugby w/e 14/09/1968 9A 30/06/2005 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3007 w/e 27/07/1968 10D Lostock Hall w/e 07/12/1968 9A w/e 04/01/1969 10D Lostock Hall
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3007 w/e 04/01/1969 10D Lostock Hall w/e 15/02/1969 9A w/e 08/05/1971 8J Allerton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4136 w/e 07/03/1964 14B Cricklewood West w/e 12/03/1969 9A 31/08/2005 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3778 w/e 12/07/1969 8J Allerton w/e 29/11/1969 9A      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3783 w/e 27/03/1965 10D Lostock Hall w/e 21/03/1970 9A w/e 01/08/1970 10D Lostock Hall
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3407 w/e 27/07/1968 16B Colwick w/e 18/04/1970 9A w/e 13/11/1971 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3407 7w/e 27/07/1968 91M To London Midland Region w/e 18/04/1970 9A w/e 13/11/1971 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12077 w/e 01/10/1966 6A Chester (MR) w/e 03/04/1971 9A w/e 08/05/1971 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3696 w/e 28/02/1970 16A Toton w/e 08/05/1971 9A w/e 24/02/1973 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3925 01/02/1961 67A Corkerhill (New) w/e 30/10/1971 9A w/e 22/01/1972 2F Bescot
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3927 4w/e 25/07/1964 67C Ayr w/e 06/11/1971 9A 4w/e 27/11/1971 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3083 w/e 25/11/1967 5A Crewe Diesel w/e 06/05/1972 9A w/e 27/05/1972 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3907 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A Eastfield w/e 17/06/1972 9A 5w/e 01/07/1972 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3909 4w/e 29/04/1972 91M To London Midland Region 2w/e 02/09/1972 9A w/e 30/06/1973 TO Toton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3024 w/e 11/05/1968 1E Bletchley 2w/e 07/10/1972 9A w/e 12/05/1973 NH Newton Heath
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3736 w/e 04/03/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 2w/e 07/10/1972 9A 2w/e 23/08/1975 NH Newton Heath
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3038 w/e 19/10/1968 6A Chester (MR) w/e 21/10/1972 9A 30/12/1972 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3087 w/e 22/06/1963 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 04/11/1972 9A w/e 13/01/1973 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3766 2w/e 23/12/1972 5A Crewe Diesel 2w/e 23/12/1972 9A 31/12/2007 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3793 w/e 15/01/1972 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 14/04/1973 9A w/e 12/05/1973 NH Newton Heath
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D300 w/e 08/05/1971 D10 Preston Division w/e 12/05/1973 LO w/e 11/08/1973 KM Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D301 w/e 08/05/1971 D10 Preston Division w/e 12/05/1973 LO w/e 11/08/1973 KM Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D303 w/e 11/11/1972 D10 Preston Division w/e 12/05/1973 LO w/e 11/08/1973 KM Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5025 w/e 12/08/1967 D05 Stoke Division w/e 12/05/1973 LO w/e 10/05/1975 CD Crewe Diesel
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5026 w/e 12/08/1967 D05 Stoke Division w/e 12/05/1973 LO w/e 09/03/1974 CD Crewe Diesel
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5029 w/e 12/08/1967 D05 Stoke Division w/e 12/05/1973 LO 3w/e 06/10/1973 CE Crewe Diesel
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25062 2w/e 19/08/1972 D01 London Division w/e 12/05/1973 LO 2w/e 23/08/1975 ED Eastfield
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25308 w/e 10/03/1973 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 07/07/1973 LO w/e 11/08/1973 WN Willesden
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25309 w/e 12/05/1973 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 07/07/1973 LO w/e 11/08/1973 WN Willesden
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D212 2w/e 10/06/1972 D10 Preston Division w/e 11/08/1973 LO 08/02/1985 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D213 2w/e 10/06/1972 D10 Preston Division w/e 11/08/1973 LO 18/10/1984 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D295 w/e 10/10/1970 D10 Preston Division w/e 11/08/1973 LO w/e 12/01/1974 KM Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D297 w/e 09/05/1970 D10 Preston Division w/e 11/08/1973 LO 3w/e 06/10/1973 KM Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25051 17/06/1968 D08 Liverpool Division w/e 08/09/1973 LO 18/09/1985 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D210 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division 3w/e 06/10/1973 LO 12/07/1981 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D211 w/e 06/07/1968 D10 Preston Division 3w/e 06/10/1973 LO w/e 11/10/1975 KD Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5027 w/e 12/08/1967 D05 Stoke Division 3w/e 06/10/1973 LO 2w/e 12/07/1975 To Store
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25088 w/e 11/08/1973 TO Toton 3w/e 06/10/1973 LO 16/08/1981 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25303 w/e 07/11/1970 D08 Liverpool Division 3w/e 06/10/1973 LO 2w/e 10/01/1976 TO Toton
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D331 17/06/1968 D08 Liverpool Division w/e 13/10/1973 LO w/e 12/01/1974 KM Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D325 17/06/1968 D08 Liverpool Division w/e 10/11/1973 LO w/e 12/01/1974 SP Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25217 2w/e 19/08/1972 D01 London Division w/e 10/11/1973 LO 4w/e 26/01/1974 ED Eastfield
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25147 3w/e 06/10/1973 BS Bescot w/e 08/12/1973 LO w/e 12/01/1974 KM Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D304 w/e 11/08/1973 KM Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 12/01/1974 LO w/e 09/02/1974 KM Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25266 w/e 08/01/1972 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 12/01/1974 LO w/e 10/08/1974 SP Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25297 w/e 11/10/1969 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 12/01/1974 LO w/e 11/05/1974 SP Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25086 4w/e 01/12/1973 91M To London Midland Region w/e 09/03/1974 LO 3w/e 02/08/1975 91X To Scottish Region
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25147 w/e 12/01/1974 KM Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 09/03/1974 LO 30/03/1980 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25196 w/e 12/10/1968 D10 Preston Division w/e 09/03/1974 LO w/e 07/09/1974 KM Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08068 w/e 06/04/1974 NH Newton Heath w/e 13/04/1974 LO w/e 28/12/1974 CD Crewe Diesel
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08298 w/e 06/05/1972 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 11/05/1974 LO 08/03/1981 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25278 w/e 25/01/1969 D02 Birmingham Division w/e 11/05/1974 LO w/e 07/12/1974 SP Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40024 w/e 04/07/1970 D08 Liverpool Division w/e 06/07/1974 LO 13/06/1984 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40028 w/e 25/03/1972 D08 Liverpool Division w/e 06/07/1974 LO 18/10/1984 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40043 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division w/e 06/07/1974 LO w/e 11/10/1975 KD Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40044 w/e 06/01/1973 D08 Liverpool Division w/e 06/07/1974 LO 22/01/1985 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40045 w/e 09/05/1970 D10 Preston Division w/e 06/07/1974 LO w/e 11/01/1975 SP Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40104 w/e 11/05/1974 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 06/07/1974 LO 22/01/1985 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25148 w/e 19/07/1969 D10 Preston Division w/e 06/07/1974 LO 07/09/1981 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25194 w/e 11/08/1973 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 06/07/1974 LO 03/06/1985 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25195 w/e 10/07/1971 D10 Preston Division w/e 06/07/1974 LO 14/06/1985 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25290 w/e 11/05/1974 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 06/07/1974 LO w/e 11/10/1975 CD Crewe Diesel
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25291 w/e 11/05/1974 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 06/07/1974 LO w/e 11/10/1975 CD Crewe Diesel
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25292 w/e 11/05/1974 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 06/07/1974 LO w/e 11/10/1975 CD Crewe Diesel
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25293 w/e 09/05/1970 D02 Birmingham Division w/e 06/07/1974 LO w/e 11/10/1975 CD Crewe Diesel
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25294 w/e 09/05/1970 D02 Birmingham Division w/e 06/07/1974 LO w/e 11/10/1975 CD Crewe Diesel
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25189 w/e 23/03/1974 WN Willesden w/e 10/08/1974 LO w/e 28/02/1976 CW Cricklewood East
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25208 w/e 07/11/1970 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 10/08/1974 LO 06/05/1984 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25209 w/e 07/11/1970 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 10/08/1974 LO 17/12/1985 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25043 w/e 09/05/1970 D10 Preston Division w/e 07/09/1974 LO 3w/e 08/05/1976 CD Crewe Diesel
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25141 w/e 12/01/1974 TO Toton w/e 07/09/1974 LO 19/09/1982 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08703 w/e 19/10/1968 5A Crewe Diesel w/e 28/09/1974 LO w/e 12/10/1974 NH Newton Heath
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40003 w/e 11/05/1974 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 12/10/1974 LO w/e 11/01/1975 SP Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40021 w/e 11/05/1974 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 12/10/1974 LO w/e 11/01/1975 SP Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40125 w/e 12/01/1974 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 12/10/1974 LO 31/05/1981 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40137 w/e 10/08/1974 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 12/10/1974 LO w/e 11/01/1975 KD Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40138 w/e 06/07/1974 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 12/10/1974 LO w/e 11/01/1975 KD Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25242 w/e 11/08/1973 WN Willesden w/e 12/10/1974 LO 06/05/1984 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25257 w/e 12/10/1974 HA Haymarket w/e 09/11/1974 LO 02/12/1985 Withdrawn
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo 24005 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A Eastfield w/e 11/01/1975 LO 2w/e 12/07/1975 To Store
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo 24001 m/e 03/1972 65A Eastfield w/e 11/01/1975 LO w/e 08/02/1975 ED Eastfield
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo 24004 w/e 06/03/1971 65A Eastfield w/e 11/01/1975 LO w/e 08/02/1975 ED Eastfield
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo 24026 w/e 09/03/1974 CD Crewe Diesel w/e 11/01/1975 LO w/e 10/05/1975 CD Crewe Diesel
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo 24029 3w/e 06/10/1973 CE Crewe Diesel w/e 11/01/1975 LO 2w/e 08/03/1975 CD Crewe Diesel
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25056 w/e 23/11/1968 D08 Liverpool Division w/e 11/01/1975 LO 3w/e 08/05/1976 CD Crewe Diesel
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40003 w/e 11/01/1975 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 08/02/1975 LO 12/09/1982 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25093 w/e 08/02/1975 TO Toton 2w/e 22/02/1975 LO w/e 10/05/1975 91W To Western Region / GWR
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25093 w/e 08/02/1975 TO Toton 2w/e 22/02/1975 LO 4w/e 10/05/1975 BR Bristol Bath Road
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25094 w/e 08/02/1975 TO Toton 2w/e 22/02/1975 LO 2w/e 08/03/1975 SP Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25042 w/e 09/11/1968 D10 Preston Division 2w/e 22/03/1975 LO 3w/e 08/05/1976 CD Crewe Diesel
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40017 w/e 07/01/1970 D08 Liverpool Division w/e 10/05/1975 LO w/e 11/10/1975 KD Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40021 w/e 11/01/1975 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 10/05/1975 LO 4w/e 17/04/1976 To Store
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40042 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division w/e 10/05/1975 LO w/e 11/10/1975 KD Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40045 w/e 11/01/1975 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 10/05/1975 LO 2w/e 07/02/1976 To Store
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40055 w/e 07/07/1973 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 10/05/1975 LO 2w/e 10/01/1976 SP Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40098 3w/e 06/10/1973 KM Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 10/05/1975 LO w/e 11/10/1975 KD Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40099 3w/e 06/10/1973 KM Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 10/05/1975 LO w/e 11/10/1975 HA Haymarket
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40135 w/e 11/08/1973 KM Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 10/05/1975 LO 22/01/1985 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40136 w/e 11/08/1973 KM Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 10/05/1975 LO 2w/e 10/07/1976 KD Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40140 w/e 08/02/1975 KD Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 10/05/1975 LO w/e 11/10/1975 KD Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40181 w/e 14/09/1968 D08 Liverpool Division w/e 10/05/1975 LO 2w/e 10/01/1976 SP Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25197 w/e 11/01/1975 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 10/05/1975 LO 01/12/1980 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08891 2w/e 08/03/1975 91M To London Midland Region 2w/e 14/06/1975 LO      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08891 2w/e 08/03/1975 DY Derby 2w/e 14/06/1975 LO      
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25104 w/e 11/01/1975 BS Bescot 2w/e 12/07/1975 LO 26/09/1982 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25105 w/e 11/01/1975 BS Bescot 2w/e 12/07/1975 LO 04/04/1982 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25106 w/e 11/01/1975 BS Bescot 2w/e 12/07/1975 LO 09/10/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25186 w/e 12/10/1974 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) 2w/e 12/07/1975 LO 28/11/1982 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25089 3w/e 12/07/1975 ED Eastfield 3w/e 02/08/1975 LO 4w/e 23/08/1975 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25090 3w/e 12/07/1975 ED Eastfield w/e 02/08/1975 LO 22/05/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25150 5w/e 26/07/1975 ED Eastfield 2w/e 23/08/1975 LO 13/06/1982 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25151 5w/e 26/07/1975 ED Eastfield 2w/e 23/08/1975 LO 12/09/1982 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08283 w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton w/e 11/10/1975 LO 24/02/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25196 w/e 09/08/1975 TO Toton w/e 11/10/1975 LO 17/03/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25198 17/06/1968 D08 Liverpool Division w/e 11/10/1975 LO 21/02/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25199 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division w/e 11/10/1975 LO 09/02/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25249 w/e 11/01/1975 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 11/10/1975 LO 29/01/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25266 w/e 10/08/1974 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 11/10/1975 LO 2w/e 10/01/1976 SP Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40131 w/e 12/04/1975 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 08/11/1975 LO 2w/e 10/01/1976 SP Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25100 w/e 07/11/1970 D16 Nottingham Division 2w/e 10/01/1976 LO 01/02/1981 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25102 w/e 06/01/1973 D16 Nottingham Division 2w/e 10/01/1976 LO 11/05/1980 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25184 2w/e 14/06/1975 CW Cricklewood East 2w/e 10/01/1976 LO 28/08/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25185 2w/e 14/06/1975 CW Cricklewood East 2w/e 10/01/1976 LO 05/11/1984 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40111 3w/e 29/11/1975 98S   2w/e 24/01/1976 LO 03/05/1981 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25156 w/e 07/09/1974 BR Bristol Bath Road 2w/e 07/02/1976 LO w/e 28/02/1976 CD Crewe Diesel
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40026 2w/e 07/02/1976 98S   4w/e 17/04/1976 LO 24/08/1980 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40011 w/e 11/10/1975 KD Carlisle Kingmoor 3w/e 08/05/1976 LO 05/10/1980 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40017 w/e 11/10/1975 KD Carlisle Kingmoor 3w/e 08/05/1976 LO 01/02/1981 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40042 w/e 11/10/1975 KD Carlisle Kingmoor 3w/e 08/05/1976 LO 14/12/1980 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40087 3w/e 06/10/1973 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) 3w/e 08/05/1976 LO 16/08/1982 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40088 3w/e 06/10/1973 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) 3w/e 08/05/1976 LO 14/02/1982 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40144 w/e 09/05/1970 D08 Liverpool Division 3w/e 08/05/1976 LO 31/05/1981 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40045 2w/e 07/02/1976 98S   w/e 26/06/1976 LO 01/08/1976 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40175 w/e 11/05/1974 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) 2w/e 10/07/1976 LO 31/05/1981 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40020 17/06/1968 D08 Liverpool Division 2w/e 07/08/1976 LO 29/08/1982 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 40106 w/e 26/06/1976 98S   2w/e 07/08/1976 LO 21/04/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08915 w/e 17/07/1965 9A Longsight m/e 31/10/1979 LO 01/02/2004 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25316 w/e 10/07/1971 D01 London Division m/e 04/1984 LO 01/09/1986 Withdrawn