Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 1026 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3125 Week
» 14696 Month
» 262989 Year
» 1147370 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Lostock Hall


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Lostock Hall Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2434       4w/e 22/06/1946 24C 01/01/1948 24C Lostock Hall
Steam 6 2-4-2T 10891       4w/e 22/06/1946 24C 01/01/1948 25E Sowerby Bridge
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 190       01/01/1948 24C w/e 03/01/1959 55F Manningham
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 191       01/01/1948 24C w/e 23/09/1961 16B Kirkby in Ashfield
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 192       01/01/1948 24C w/e 29/11/1958 24A Accrington
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 194       01/01/1948 24C 28/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 198       01/01/1948 24C w/e 21/07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 199       01/01/1948 24C 28/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2434 4w/e 22/06/1946 24C Lostock Hall 01/01/1948 24C w/e 10/02/1962 24F Fleetwood
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2435 4w/e 22/06/1946 24B Rose Grove 01/01/1948 24C 4w/e 30/11/1957 5D Stoke
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2436       01/01/1948 24C 28/05/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2437       01/01/1948 24C 4w/e 04/10/1958 14D Neasden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2480       01/01/1948 24C 4w/e 22/02/1958 24A Accrington
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2481       01/01/1948 24C 26/09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2556       01/01/1948 24C 4w/e 04/10/1958 14D Neasden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2661       01/01/1948 24C w/e 09/01/1960 24C Lostock Hall
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8526       01/01/1948 24C 4w/e 01/12/1956 1A Willesden
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8527       01/01/1948 24C 3w/e 14/01/1950 19D Heaton Mersey
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8528       01/01/1948 24C 4w/e 18/04/1953 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8529       01/01/1948 24C 4w/e 09/08/1952 5B Crewe South
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8719       01/01/1948 24C 4w/e 31/12/1950 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8720       01/01/1948 24C 4w/e 07/10/1950 26A Newton Heath
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 11345       01/01/1948 24C m/e 10/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 11423       01/01/1948 24C 4w/e 31/12/1950 28B Fleetwood
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 11526       01/01/1948 24C m/e 09/1957 Withdrawn
Steam 27 0-6-0 12160       01/01/1948 24C 3w/e 24/01/1953 24D Lower Darwen
Steam 27 0-6-0 12171       01/01/1948 24C 4w/e 24/03/1951 27B Aintree
Steam 27 0-6-0 12244       01/01/1948 24C 8w/e 14/06/1952 25A Wakefield
Steam 27 0-6-0 12317       01/01/1948 24C 4w/e 17/07/1954 26A Newton Heath
Steam 27 0-6-0 12334       01/01/1948 24C 3w/e 14/01/1950 26D Bury
Steam 27 0-6-0 12336       01/01/1948 24C 4w/e 23/02/1952 25D Mirfield
Steam 27 0-6-0 12368       01/01/1948 24C 4w/e 17/07/1951 28B Fleetwood
Steam 27 0-6-0 12399       01/01/1948 24C 4w/e 11/08/1951 24D Lower Darwen
Steam 27 0-6-0 12460       01/01/1948 24C m/e 06/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 27 0-6-0 52467       01/01/1948 24C 22/05/1948 Withdrawn
Steam 27 0-6-0 12522       01/01/1948 24C 4w/e 22/03/1952 24D Lower Darwen
Steam 28 0-6-0 12541       01/01/1948 24C 4w/e 16/07/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 7F 0-8-0 9502       01/01/1948 24C 09/06/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 7F 0-8-0 9503       01/01/1948 24C 21/08/1954 Withdrawn
Steam 7F 0-8-0 9523       01/01/1948 24C 20/02/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 7F 0-8-0 9524       01/01/1948 24C 12/12/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 7F 0-8-0 9534       01/01/1948 24C 02/11/1950 Withdrawn
Steam 7F 0-8-0 9585       01/01/1948 24C 5w/e 24/12/1949 23D Wigan Central (L&Y)
Steam 7F 0-8-0 9611       01/01/1948 24C m/e 08/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 7F 0-8-0 9612       01/01/1948 24C 4w/e 04/11/1950 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)
Steam 7F 0-8-0 9614       01/01/1948 24C m/e 06/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 7F 0-8-0 9615       01/01/1948 24C 25/04/1950 Withdrawn
Steam 7F 0-8-0 9616       01/01/1948 24C m/e 03/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 7F 0-8-0 9617       01/01/1948 24C 4w/e 09/09/1950 27B Aintree
Steam 7F 0-8-0 9640       01/01/1948 24C 4w/e 31/12/1950 27B Aintree
Steam 7F 0-8-0 9649       01/01/1948 24C 29/11/1950 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42178       26/11/1948 (New) 24C w/e 03/12/1948 24C Lostock Hall
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42178 26/11/1948 24C Lostock Hall (New) w/e 03/12/1948 24C 4w/e 27/02/1954 1E Bletchley
Steam 27 0-6-0 12220 01/01/1948 24B Rose Grove 3w/e 11/12/1948 24C 4w/e 23/02/1952 24D Lower Darwen
Steam 27 0-6-0 12524 01/01/1948 24A Accrington 5w/e 24/12/1949 24C m/e 08/1954 Withdrawn
Steam 27 0-6-0 52523 5w/e 24/12/1949 24D Lower Darwen 3w/e 14/01/1950 24C m/e 16/06/1956 24E Blackpool Central
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50781 01/01/1948 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 07/10/1950 24C 4w/e 31/10/1953 27C Southport
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 51423 4w/e 31/12/1950 28B Fleetwood 4w/e 24/02/1951 24C m/e 12/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 28 0-6-0 52579 01/01/1948 26D Bury 4w/e 24/02/1951 24C 4w/e 17/07/1951 24B Rose Grove
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50720 01/01/1948 24F Fleetwood 4w/e 11/08/1951 24C m/e 12/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 27 0-6-0 52458 5w/e 24/12/1949 24F Fleetwood 4w/e 26/01/1952 24C m/e 08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 28 0-6-0 52572 01/01/1948 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 26/01/1952 24C 4w/e 23/02/1952 25D Mirfield
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90258       4w/e 23/02/1952 24C w/e 12/09/1964 41J Langwith Junction
Steam 27 0-6-0 52431 01/01/1948 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 22/03/1952 24C 4w/e 08/08/1953 24D Lower Darwen
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50831 4w/e 17/07/1951 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 22/03/1952 24C 4w/e 12/07/1952 25F Low Moor
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 50831       4w/e 22/03/1952 24C 4w/e 12/07/1952 25F Low Moor
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50764 4w/e 17/07/1951 24B Rose Grove 4w/e 19/04/1952 24C 4w/e 21/03/1953 25F Low Moor
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 50764       4w/e 19/04/1952 24C 4w/e 21/03/1953 25F Low Moor
Steam 27 0-6-0 52368 4w/e 17/07/1951 28B Fleetwood 8w/e 14/06/1952 24C m/e 08/1957 Withdrawn
Steam 27 0-6-0 52182 4w/e 26/01/1952 28A Blackpool Central 4w/e 09/08/1952 24C w/e 09/04/1960 26C Bolton
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50712 4w/e 19/05/1951 28A Blackpool Central 8w/e 11/07/1953 24C 4w/e 09/10/1954 27C Southport
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50725 01/01/1948 24E Blackpool Central 8w/e 11/07/1953 24C 8w/e 19/06/1954 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 50712       8w/e 11/07/1953 24C 4w/e 09/10/1954 27C Southport
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 50725       8w/e 11/07/1953 24C 8w/e 19/06/1954 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse
Steam 27 0-6-0 52203 3w/e 11/12/1948 25D Mirfield 4w/e 08/08/1953 24C m/e 03/1957 Withdrawn
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50777 8w/e 14/06/1952 27C Southport 4w/e 24/04/1954 24C 8w/e 19/06/1954 25E Sowerby Bridge
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 50777 8w/e 14/06/1952 27C Southport 4w/e 24/04/1954 24C 8w/e 19/06/1954 25E Sowerby Bridge
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42476 8w/e 19/06/1954 26D Bury 4w/e 17/07/1954 24C w/e 29/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 27 0-6-0 52445 3w/e 14/01/1950 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 14/08/1954 24C w/e 26/11/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 27 0-6-0 52290 2w/e 17/06/1950 28B Fleetwood 4w/e 11/09/1954 24C w/e 25/06/1960 24B Rose Grove
Steam 27 0-6-0 52272 5w/e 03/01/1953 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 04/12/1954 24C m/e 04/1955 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90277 4w/e 08/09/1956 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 06/10/1956 24C w/e 12/09/1964 36A Doncaster
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90556 4w/e 24/03/1956 24F Fleetwood 4w/e 23/02/1957 24C w/e 23/09/1961 24D Lower Darwen
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90413 4w/e 27/03/1954 26B Agecroft 4w/e 23/02/1957 24C w/e 23/09/1961 26D Bury
Steam 27 0-6-0 52216 4w/e 11/08/1951 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 23/03/1957 24C m/e 12/1958 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90266 4w/e 03/12/1955 24A Accrington 4w/e 20/04/1957 24C w/e 11/08/1962 24B Rose Grove
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42634 01/01/1948 24A Accrington 4w/e 10/08/1957 24C w/e 10/02/1962 24B Rose Grove
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 51457 01/01/1948 25A Wakefield 8w/e 05/10/1957 24C 4w/e 04/10/1958 26A Newton Heath
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42636 01/01/1948 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 30/11/1957 24C 4w/e 04/10/1958 14D Neasden
Steam 27 0-6-0 52429 4w/e 28/12/1957 99C Crewe Works 4w/e 25/01/1958 24C m/e 10/1960 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3374 16/08/1957 26A Newton Heath (New) 4w/e 04/10/1958 24C w/e 06/05/1972 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90584 4w/e 12/07/1958 24H Hellifield w/e 29/11/1958 24C w/e 11/08/1962 24B Rose Grove
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42286 4w/e 04/10/1958 26D Bury w/e 10/01/1959 24C 26/12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40192 w/e 29/11/1958 24A Accrington w/e 07/02/1959 24C w/e 05/11/1960 24D Lower Darwen
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90675 4w/e 22/02/1958 26A Newton Heath w/e 07/02/1959 24C w/e 12/09/1964 36A Doncaster
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42480 4w/e 22/02/1958 24A Accrington w/e 20/06/1959 24C w/e 19/01/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42187 01/01/1948 25F Low Moor w/e 20/06/1959 24C w/e 10/02/1962 24F Fleetwood
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42321 4w/e 30/11/1957 1A Willesden w/e 08/08/1959 24C w/e 19/09/1959 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42350 4w/e 04/10/1958 1A Willesden w/e 08/08/1959 24C w/e 12/09/1959 1A Willesden
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40183 4w/e 18/05/1957 24D Lower Darwen w/e 10/10/1959 24C w/e 05/11/1960 24D Lower Darwen
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42433 01/01/1948 24A Accrington w/e 09/01/1960 24C w/e 12/05/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42661 01/01/1948 24C Lostock Hall w/e 09/01/1960 24C w/e 29/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42296 4w/e 28/11/1959 87E Landore w/e 09/04/1960 24C m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90564 4w/e 11/08/1951 26B Agecroft w/e 18/06/1960 24C w/e 07/10/1961 26B Agecroft
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90713 4w/e 17/07/1951 26C Bolton w/e 18/06/1960 24C m/e 10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47386 01/01/1948 24B Rose Grove w/e 22/10/1960 24C w/e 27/04/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47572 4w/e 09/09/1950 25A Wakefield w/e 10/12/1960 24C w/e 14/05/1962 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3172 4w/e 04/10/1958 24K Preston w/e 16/09/1961 24C w/e 23/02/1963 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3368 4w/e 04/10/1958 24K Preston w/e 16/09/1961 24C w/e 06/05/1972 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3369 4w/e 04/10/1958 24K Preston w/e 16/09/1961 24C w/e 06/05/1972 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3371 4w/e 04/10/1958 24K Preston w/e 16/09/1961 24C w/e 06/05/1972 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3581 w/e 25/10/1958 24K Preston w/e 16/09/1961 24C w/e 10/10/1970 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3846 w/e 05/09/1959 24K Preston w/e 16/09/1961 24C w/e 06/05/1972 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78036 13/11/1954 10B Preston (New) w/e 16/09/1961 24C w/e 15/09/1962 24G Skipton
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78037 13/11/1954 10B Preston (New) w/e 16/09/1961 24C w/e 15/09/1962 24G Skipton
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47293 3w/e 11/12/1948 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 16/09/1961 24C m/e 12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47319 3w/e 11/12/1948 12E Moor Row w/e 16/09/1961 24C m/e 09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47360 4w/e 05/09/1953 10B Preston w/e 16/09/1961 24C m/e 07/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47413 4w/e 05/09/1953 10B Preston w/e 16/09/1961 24C m/e 05/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47472 4w/e 05/09/1953 10B Preston w/e 16/09/1961 24C m/e 11/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 0F 0-4-0ST 47008 12/1953 10B Preston (New) w/e 16/09/1961 24C m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49382 01/01/1948 25G Farnley Junction w/e 16/09/1961 24C w/e 23/09/1961 26F Patricroft
Steam G1 0-8-0 49135 w/e 28/01/1961 24K Preston w/e 16/09/1961 24C w/e 23/09/1961 26F Patricroft
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46449 w/e 17/09/1960 24K Preston w/e 16/09/1961 24C w/e 14/09/1963 9P Lees (Oldham)
Steam 0F 0-4-0ST 47002       w/e 16/12/1961 24C m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4115       18/01/1962 (New) 24C w/e 21/09/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 09 0-6-0 D4114       21/01/1962 (New) 24C w/e 14/12/1968 5A Crewe Diesel
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46452 4w/e 03/10/1953 20F Skipton w/e 15/09/1962 24C w/e 11/01/1964 9P Lees (Oldham)
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46501 w/e 18/06/1960 24G Skipton w/e 15/09/1962 24C w/e 11/01/1964 9M Bury
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42147       w/e 15/09/1962 24C w/e 08/02/1964 10A Carnforth
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42154       w/e 15/09/1962 24C w/e 30/05/1964 10A Carnforth
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47201 w/e 04/03/1961 24B Rose Grove w/e 06/04/1963 24C w/e 26/09/1964 10G Skipton
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47336 w/e 07/11/1959 8A Edge Hill w/e 11/05/1963 24C m/e 06/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47564 w/e 01/09/1962 12E Barrow in Furness w/e 11/05/1963 24C m/e 03/1965 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3563 28/11/1958 67C Ayr (New) w/e 18/05/1963 24C      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42439 w/e 09/01/1960 26F Patricroft w/e 22/06/1963 24C w/e 25/04/1964 10B Blackpool Central
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42445 w/e 16/09/1961 8C Speke Junction w/e 22/06/1963 24C 17/10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42484 4w/e 18/05/1957 24H Hellifield w/e 22/06/1963 24C w/e 14/03/1964 9K Bolton
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42492 4w/e 18/05/1957 24H Hellifield w/e 22/06/1963 24C w/e 14/09/1963 10G Skipton
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42584 w/e 16/09/1961 8C Speke Junction w/e 22/06/1963 24C 18/07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42187 w/e 11/05/1963 12C Carlisle Canal w/e 22/06/1963 24C 15/03/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44889 w/e 15/09/1962 24F Fleetwood w/e 22/06/1963 24C w/e 23/11/1963 10J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44894 w/e 15/09/1962 24F Fleetwood w/e 22/06/1963 24C w/e 30/11/1963 10J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45226 w/e 30/04/1960 24F Fleetwood w/e 22/06/1963 24C m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42425 w/e 17/09/1960 9A Longsight w/e 29/06/1963 24C 07/09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47211 w/e 19/01/1963 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 29/06/1963 24C w/e 26/09/1964 10F Rose Grove
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47577 w/e 09/07/1960 24G Skipton w/e 10/08/1963 24C w/e 26/12/1964 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42546 01/01/1948 24B Rose Grove w/e 17/08/1963 24C 01/04/1967 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90125 w/e 13/07/1963 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 14/09/1963 10D w/e 21/12/1963 16E Kirkby in Ashfield
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90535 w/e 13/07/1963 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 14/09/1963 10D m/e 10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42492 w/e 14/09/1963 10G Skipton w/e 28/09/1963 10D w/e 19/10/1963 9D Newton Heath
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78022 w/e 11/05/1963 27B Aintree w/e 28/12/1963 10D m/e 09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78044 w/e 15/09/1962 27B Aintree w/e 28/12/1963 10D w/e 11/04/1964 8L Aintree
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90264       w/e 18/01/1964 10D m/e 08/1964 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90297 w/e 06/04/1963 24B Rose Grove w/e 18/01/1964 10D m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44673       w/e 22/02/1964 10D w/e 06/02/1965 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44674       w/e 22/02/1964 10D w/e 10/10/1964 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44675       w/e 22/02/1964 10D w/e 13/03/1965 10C Fleetwood
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78040 w/e 14/01/1961 27B Aintree w/e 11/04/1964 10D m/e 01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90125 w/e 21/12/1963 16E Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 18/04/1964 10D m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78002 w/e 14/09/1963 8K Bank Hall w/e 20/06/1964 10D m/e 06/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78041 18/12/1954 27A Bank Hall (New) w/e 20/06/1964 10D m/e 05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45034 w/e 09/09/1961 8C Speke Junction w/e 20/06/1964 10D w/e 11/07/1964 8C Speke Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44816 w/e 20/06/1964 8K Bank Hall w/e 27/06/1964 10D w/e 18/09/1965 9K Bolton
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44692 w/e 18/05/1963 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 11/07/1964 10D w/e 10/10/1964 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45197 w/e 02/05/1964 8C Speke Junction w/e 11/07/1964 10D m/e 01/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80129 w/e 07/07/1964 Withdrawn m/e 08/1964 (R) 10D 10/10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80125   07/07/1964 Withdrawn m/e 09/1964 (R) 10D 10/10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48307 7w/e 22/06/1964 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) w/e 12/09/1964 10D w/e 11/11/1967 9H Patricroft
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48328 4w/e 03/10/1959 87F Llanelly w/e 12/09/1964 10D w/e 02/10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48400 4w/e 05/09/1959 87F Llanelly w/e 12/09/1964 10D w/e 19/02/1966 10F Rose Grove
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48419 4w/e 05/09/1959 87F Llanelly w/e 12/09/1964 10D w/e 08/05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48434 4w/e 08/10/1960 87F Llanelly w/e 12/09/1964 10D w/e 01/01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48438 7w/e 22/06/1964 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) w/e 12/09/1964 10D w/e 18/11/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48470 7w/e 22/06/1964 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) w/e 12/09/1964 10D w/e 11/11/1967 9H Patricroft
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48707 4w/e 20/07/1964 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) w/e 12/09/1964 10D w/e 15/04/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48730 4w/e 20/07/1964 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) w/e 12/09/1964 10D w/e 17/06/1967 10F Rose Grove
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48735 4w/e 05/09/1959 87F Llanelly w/e 12/09/1964 10D w/e 20/03/1965 8E Northwich
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42625 4w/e 09/10/1954 24E Blackpool Central w/e 19/09/1964 10D 07/05/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47333 w/e 15/07/1961 24B Rose Grove w/e 26/09/1964 10D m/e 11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47454 4w/e 04/10/1952 20F Skipton w/e 26/09/1964 10D m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42081 w/e 29/02/1964 10C Fleetwood w/e 26/09/1964 10D w/e 13/11/1965 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Diesel 02 0-4-0 D2862 14/10/1961 24F Fleetwood (New) w/e 10/10/1964 10D w/e 05/07/1969 To Store
Diesel 02 0-4-0 D2868 w/e 22/08/1964 10C Fleetwood w/e 10/10/1964 10D w/e 10/05/1969 To Store
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48039 w/e 22/08/1964 9L Buxton (LNWR) w/e 02/01/1965 10D w/e 24/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42660 w/e 20/06/1964 9D Newton Heath w/e 09/01/1965 10D 17/04/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48062 w/e 17/12/1960 9D Buxton (LNWR) w/e 09/01/1965 10D w/e 06/02/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78037 w/e 23/05/1964 16C Derby w/e 06/03/1965 10D m/e 05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78057 w/e 23/05/1964 16C Derby w/e 06/03/1965 10D m/e 05/1966 Withdrawn
Diesel 02 0-4-0 D2867 w/e 17/10/1964 10C Fleetwood w/e 27/03/1965 10D w/e 22/10/1966 8C Speke Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3782 05/09/1959 24B Rose Grove (New) w/e 27/03/1965 10D w/e 14/11/1970 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3783 05/09/1959 24B Rose Grove (New) w/e 27/03/1965 10D w/e 21/03/1970 9A Longsight
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42442 4w/e 30/01/1954 10C Patricroft w/e 27/03/1965 10D 07/08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42297 w/e 18/04/1964 9H Patricroft w/e 03/04/1965 10D 06/05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42468 4w/e 28/12/1957 10C Patricroft w/e 01/05/1965 10D 25/09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48716 w/e 13/02/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 22/05/1965 10D w/e 21/08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48771 w/e 07/11/1964 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 22/05/1965 10D w/e 11/12/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48211 w/e 23/11/1963 10C Fleetwood w/e 19/06/1965 10D w/e 13/11/1965 10J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48618 w/e 29/02/1964 10C Fleetwood w/e 19/06/1965 10D w/e 23/09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42096 w/e 03/04/1965 1A Willesden w/e 26/06/1965 10D 24/12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45351 w/e 14/12/1963 9K Bolton w/e 26/06/1965 10D m/e 08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45402 w/e 05/12/1964 8A Edge Hill w/e 26/06/1965 10D m/e 04/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44918 w/e 06/03/1965 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 03/07/1965 10D w/e 18/09/1965 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44958 w/e 18/05/1963 27B Aintree w/e 03/07/1965 10D m/e 03/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45346 w/e 18/07/1964 16B Annesley w/e 03/07/1965 10D w/e 18/09/1965 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45450 w/e 09/01/1960 16D Annesley w/e 03/07/1965 10D m/e 11/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44915 w/e 16/01/1965 1E Bletchley w/e 10/07/1965 10D m/e 12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48002 w/e 19/06/1965 1A Willesden w/e 24/07/1965 10D m/e 09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48079 w/e 03/07/1965 16A Toton w/e 24/07/1965 10D w/e 13/11/1965 10J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48141 w/e 03/07/1965 16A Toton w/e 24/07/1965 10D w/e 19/02/1966 10F Rose Grove
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42287 w/e 03/04/1965 1A Willesden w/e 24/07/1965 10D w/e 06/11/1965 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42295 w/e 19/09/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 14/08/1965 10D 16/10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45258 w/e 19/06/1965 10J Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 14/08/1965 10D w/e 18/09/1965 9K Bolton
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42251 w/e 12/06/1965 6A Chester (MR) w/e 21/08/1965 10D w/e 18/06/1966 12E Tebay
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42105 w/e 29/05/1965 10A Carnforth w/e 30/10/1965 10D 17/12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48302 w/e 14/08/1965 10J Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 13/11/1965 10D w/e 15/01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48679 w/e 12/12/1964 10J Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 13/11/1965 10D m/e 10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48739 w/e 21/08/1965 10A Carnforth w/e 15/01/1966 10D w/e 21/01/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 02 0-4-0 D2860 13/09/1961 24F Fleetwood (New) w/e 19/02/1966 10D w/e 18/06/1966 8K Bank Hall
Diesel 02 0-4-0 D2861 03/10/1961 24F Fleetwood (New) w/e 19/02/1966 10D w/e 05/07/1969 To Store
Diesel 02 0-4-0 D2863 18/10/1961 24F Fleetwood (New) w/e 19/02/1966 10D w/e 10/05/1969 To Store
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42431 w/e 29/05/1965 10C Fleetwood w/e 19/02/1966 10D 07/05/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47599 w/e 16/10/1965 10C Fleetwood w/e 19/02/1966 10D w/e 09/04/1966 10G Skipton
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47201 w/e 22/01/1966 10C Fleetwood w/e 19/02/1966 10D w/e 09/04/1966 9J Agecroft
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43019 w/e 06/02/1965 10H Lower Darwen w/e 19/02/1966 10D 04/05/1968 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43041 w/e 13/02/1965 10H Lower Darwen w/e 19/02/1966 10D 12/08/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43046 w/e 19/06/1965 10H Lower Darwen w/e 19/02/1966 10D 25/11/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43118 w/e 06/02/1965 10H Lower Darwen w/e 19/02/1966 10D w/e 11/03/1967 12D Workington
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43119 w/e 13/02/1965 10H Lower Darwen w/e 19/02/1966 10D w/e 26/11/1966 12E Tebay
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42224 w/e 21/08/1965 10C Fleetwood w/e 19/02/1966 10D 21/01/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45107 4w/e 04/11/1950 28B Fleetwood w/e 19/02/1966 10D m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45347 w/e 14/09/1963 10C Fleetwood w/e 19/02/1966 10D m/e 11/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45444 w/e 05/12/1964 10C Fleetwood w/e 19/02/1966 10D m/e 08/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45421 w/e 18/07/1964 10C Fleetwood w/e 19/03/1966 10D m/e 02/1968 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48077 w/e 10/07/1965 10J Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 23/04/1966 10D w/e 09/03/1968 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48079 w/e 13/11/1965 10J Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 23/04/1966 10D w/e 16/07/1966 10F Rose Grove
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48320 4w/e 04/10/1952 2B Nuneaton w/e 04/06/1966 10D w/e 18/03/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48445 w/e 29/05/1965 5E Nuneaton w/e 04/06/1966 10D w/e 04/05/1968 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48637 w/e 27/03/1965 15A Leicester Midland w/e 25/06/1966 10D w/e 16/09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48062 w/e 27/11/1965 10F Rose Grove w/e 16/07/1966 10D w/e 14/10/1967 10F Rose Grove
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47314 w/e 21/07/1962 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 23/07/1966 10D m/e 12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48468 w/e 20/06/1964 2C Stourbridge Junction w/e 23/07/1966 10D w/e 24/06/1967 10F Rose Grove
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48164 w/e 07/11/1964 9J Agecroft w/e 22/10/1966 10D w/e 21/10/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48266 w/e 03/09/1966 9J Agecroft w/e 22/10/1966 10D w/e 17/06/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48666 w/e 28/05/1966 9J Agecroft w/e 22/10/1966 10D w/e 17/06/1967 10F Rose Grove
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3005 14/11/1952 67C Ayr (New) w/e 05/11/1966 10D w/e 06/05/1972 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3006 27/12/1952 67C Ayr (New) w/e 05/11/1966 10D w/e 07/12/1968 5A Crewe Diesel
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3007 27/12/1952 67B Hurlford (New) w/e 05/11/1966 10D w/e 18/05/1968 10A Carnforth
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3210 4w/e 11/05/1957 65A Eastfield w/e 05/11/1966 10D w/e 13/01/1968 12C Barrow in Furness
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3410 4w/e 24/11/1962 65A Eastfield w/e 05/11/1966 10D w/e 06/05/1972 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3530 4w/e 27/09/1958 65E Kipps w/e 05/11/1966 10D w/e 18/09/1971 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3531 4w/e 27/09/1958 65E Kipps w/e 05/11/1966 10D w/e 18/09/1971 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3897 4w/e 19/11/1960 65A Eastfield w/e 05/11/1966 10D w/e 06/05/1972 41A Tinsley
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78020 w/e 08/10/1966 16A Toton w/e 12/11/1966 10D m/e 05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78021 w/e 16/07/1966 16A Toton w/e 12/11/1966 10D m/e 05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48393 w/e 18/12/1965 40E Colwick w/e 12/11/1966 10D w/e 17/06/1967 10F Rose Grove
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47326 m/e 12/1966 Withdrawn w/e 10/12/1966 (R) 10D      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47531 w/e 21/08/1965 12D Workington w/e 10/12/1966 10D m/e 02/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48510 w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick w/e 10/12/1966 10D w/e 20/01/1968 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42611 w/e 23/07/1966 12E Tebay w/e 07/01/1967 10D 15/03/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45141 w/e 17/12/1966 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 28/01/1967 10D m/e 03/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48517 w/e 26/03/1966 2E Saltley w/e 04/02/1967 10D w/e 02/12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48646 w/e 30/11/1963 2E Saltley w/e 04/02/1967 10D w/e 25/05/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45339 w/e 06/08/1966 10F Rose Grove w/e 04/02/1967 10D m/e 06/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48492 w/e 11/06/1966 16E Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 18/02/1967 10D w/e 10/02/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44942 w/e 17/09/1966 6D Shrewsbury w/e 11/03/1967 10D m/e 06/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45149 w/e 17/09/1966 6D Shrewsbury w/e 11/03/1967 10D m/e 06/1968 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48556 w/e 26/03/1966 2E Saltley w/e 18/03/1967 10D w/e 24/06/1967 10F Rose Grove
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44971 w/e 17/09/1966 6D Shrewsbury w/e 01/04/1967 10D m/e 08/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45227 w/e 03/10/1964 10A Carnforth w/e 01/04/1967 10D m/e 01/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45373 w/e 23/04/1966 10A Carnforth w/e 01/04/1967 10D m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43029 w/e 17/09/1960 12H Tebay w/e 22/04/1967 10D m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43033 w/e 27/11/1965 12E Tebay w/e 22/04/1967 10D 02/03/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75009 w/e 11/03/1967 6C Croes Newydd w/e 13/05/1967 10D w/e 24/06/1967 10A Carnforth
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75010 w/e 05/03/1966 6C Croes Newydd w/e 13/05/1967 10D w/e 24/06/1967 10A Carnforth
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75062 w/e 05/10/1963 5D Stoke w/e 13/05/1967 10D w/e 24/06/1967 10A Carnforth
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3367 w/e 18/07/1964 8C Speke Junction w/e 20/05/1967 10D w/e 06/05/1972 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12034 w/e 10/12/1966 8C Speke Junction w/e 20/05/1967 10D w/e 06/01/1968 8C Speke Junction
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12038 w/e 12/11/1966 8C Speke Junction w/e 20/05/1967 10D w/e 16/12/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44872 w/e 08/10/1966 6C Croes Newydd w/e 20/05/1967 10D m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45345 w/e 08/10/1966 6A Chester (MR) w/e 20/05/1967 10D m/e 06/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75048 w/e 21/05/1966 6C Croes Newydd w/e 27/05/1967 10D w/e 24/06/1967 10A Carnforth
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45000 w/e 02/11/1963 6A Chester (MR) w/e 27/05/1967 10D m/e 10/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43004 w/e 30/04/1966 10A Carnforth w/e 24/06/1967 10D m/e 09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43119 w/e 31/12/1966 10A Carnforth w/e 24/06/1967 10D 12/08/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44713 w/e 19/09/1964 5D Stoke w/e 24/06/1967 10D m/e 08/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45391 4w/e 02/01/1954 5B Crewe South w/e 12/08/1967 10D m/e 02/1968 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43088 w/e 03/06/1967 5B Crewe South w/e 19/08/1967 10D 23/12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44800 w/e 11/03/1967 5B Crewe South w/e 19/08/1967 10D m/e 03/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45353 w/e 10/06/1967 5B Crewe South w/e 19/08/1967 10D m/e 07/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45436 w/e 21/01/1967 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 19/08/1967 10D m/e 04/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D210 18/04/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 26/08/1967 10D 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5238 w/e 05/07/1967 D05 Stoke Division w/e 26/08/1967 10D 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3580 w/e 15/04/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 09/09/1967 10D w/e 15/08/1970 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43106 w/e 27/08/1966 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 23/09/1967 10D 22/06/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44816 w/e 17/06/1967 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 07/10/1967 10D m/e 07/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45041 w/e 21/11/1964 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 07/10/1967 10D m/e 12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44683 w/e 24/06/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 09/12/1967 10D m/e 04/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44761 w/e 24/06/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 09/12/1967 10D m/e 04/1968 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48253 w/e 04/03/1967 8C Speke Junction w/e 06/01/1968 10D w/e 03/08/1968 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48335 w/e 07/10/1967 9D Newton Heath w/e 06/01/1968 10D w/e 30/03/1968 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48476 w/e 06/03/1965 8C Speke Junction w/e 06/01/1968 10D w/e 10/08/1968 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43006 w/e 09/09/1961 12F Workington w/e 06/01/1968 10D 02/03/1968 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43008       w/e 06/01/1968 10D 02/03/1968 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43027 w/e 01/04/1967 12D Workington w/e 06/01/1968 10D 04/05/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44672       w/e 06/01/1968 10D m/e 03/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44878 01/01/1948 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 06/01/1968 10D m/e 07/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45212 w/e 25/09/1965 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 06/01/1968 10D m/e 08/1968 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48392 w/e 28/10/1967 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 09/03/1968 10D w/e 30/03/1968 9K Bolton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48763 w/e 12/11/1966 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 09/03/1968 10D w/e 13/04/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44806 w/e 13/03/1965 8C Speke Junction w/e 20/04/1968 10D m/e 08/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44950 w/e 19/09/1964 8C Speke Junction w/e 20/04/1968 10D m/e 08/1968 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48293 w/e 24/07/1965 8A Edge Hill w/e 11/05/1968 10D w/e 22/06/1968 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48294 w/e 07/10/1967 8A Edge Hill w/e 11/05/1968 10D w/e 03/08/1968 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48546 w/e 06/03/1965 9F Heaton Mersey w/e 11/05/1968 10D w/e 06/07/1968 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48723 w/e 11/03/1967 9F Heaton Mersey w/e 11/05/1968 10D w/e 03/08/1968 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48765 w/e 02/09/1967 9F Heaton Mersey w/e 11/05/1968 10D w/e 03/08/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45305 w/e 09/12/1967 8C Speke Junction w/e 11/05/1968 10D m/e 08/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45386 w/e 08/07/1961 8C Speke Junction w/e 11/05/1968 10D m/e 08/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45388 w/e 05/10/1963 8C Speke Junction w/e 11/05/1968 10D m/e 08/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45407 w/e 13/03/1965 8C Speke Junction w/e 11/05/1968 10D m/e 08/1968 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48775 w/e 22/10/1966 9H Patricroft w/e 06/07/1968 10D w/e 03/08/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44888 w/e 11/05/1968 9K Bolton w/e 06/07/1968 10D m/e 08/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45055 w/e 11/05/1968 9H Patricroft w/e 06/07/1968 10D m/e 08/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45073 w/e 13/04/1968 9K Bolton w/e 06/07/1968 10D m/e 08/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45110 w/e 24/07/1965 9K Bolton w/e 06/07/1968 10D m/e 08/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45260 w/e 13/02/1965 9K Bolton w/e 06/07/1968 10D m/e 08/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45269 w/e 11/05/1968 9K Bolton w/e 06/07/1968 10D m/e 08/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45318 w/e 10/04/1965 9K Bolton w/e 06/07/1968 10D m/e 08/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3007 w/e 18/05/1968 10A Carnforth w/e 27/07/1968 10D w/e 07/12/1968 9A Longsight
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3008 w/e 10/08/1968 12C Barrow in Furness w/e 12/10/1968 10D w/e 25/01/1969 8J Allerton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3412 w/e 26/11/1966 12C Barrow in Furness w/e 16/11/1968 10D w/e 06/05/1972 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3006 w/e 07/12/1968 5A Crewe Diesel w/e 04/01/1969 10D w/e 10/10/1970 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3007 w/e 07/12/1968 9A Longsight w/e 04/01/1969 10D w/e 15/02/1969 9A Longsight
Diesel 02 0-4-0 D2868 w/e 10/05/1969 98S   w/e 13/09/1969 10D w/e 27/09/1969 To Store
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3783 w/e 21/03/1970 9A Longsight w/e 01/08/1970 10D w/e 08/01/1972 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4139 w/e 10/08/1968 12C Barrow in Furness w/e 31/10/1970 10D w/e 14/11/1970 8J Allerton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4139 w/e 14/11/1970 8J Allerton w/e 12/12/1970 10D w/e 06/05/1972 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4117 02/02/1962 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 26/06/1971 10D w/e 06/05/1972 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3912 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A Eastfield w/e 15/04/1972 10D 4w/e 29/04/1972 91M To London Midland Region