Depot: Low Moor
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Low Moor | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1190 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 25F | on | 01/01/1948 | 26C | Bolton | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4480 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 25F | on | 01/01/1948 | 16A | Nottingham | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12235 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 19C | Canklow | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 25F | on | 01/01/1948 | 25D | Mirfield |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12573 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 25F | ||||||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2732 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 25F | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | Low Moor | ||||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 52422 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | on | 06/03/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | 10909 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | 50952 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | on | 19/06/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12104 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 25D | Mirfield | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52127 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 16A | Nottingham | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | on | 19/06/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12217 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12237 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 25C | Goole | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12255 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 25D | Mirfield | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52403 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26A | Newton Heath | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | m/e | 12/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12410 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 25C | Goole | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12427 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 26C | Bolton | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50665 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 7D | Rhyl | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10715 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10762 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 25D | Mirfield | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10788 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10840 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 23C | Southport | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10855 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 23C | Southport | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10886 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2726 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 27B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2727 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 27B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2728 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 27B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2732 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 25F | Low Moor | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2828 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 24B | Rose Grove | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2843 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 24F | Fleetwood | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2865 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 25D | Mirfield | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2406 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 30/07/1949 | 25D | Mirfield | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2407 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 30/07/1949 | 25D | Mirfield | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2409 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2644 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 14/05/1949 | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2296 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 30/07/1949 | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2297 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 23/04/1949 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2298 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2299 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2187 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 24B | Rose Grove | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2188 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 55H | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2189 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 55F | Manningham | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1186 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 26C | Bolton | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1189 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 26C | Bolton | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4912 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5062 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 23A | Bank Hall | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5201 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 23A | Bank Hall | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5207 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 56D | Mirfield | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5208 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 56D | Mirfield | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5209 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 23A | Bank Hall | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5210 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 13/05/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5211 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | w/e | 13/05/1950 | 27A | Polmadie | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5221 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 14B | Kentish Town | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10715 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 25F | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10788 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 25F | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50813 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 25F | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4946 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23A | Bank Hall | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 25F | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4982 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23A | Bank Hall | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 25F | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 898 | 0-6-0 | 12549 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 25F | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 23B | Aintree |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52411 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 25F | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 25C | Goole |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12309 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 31/07/1948 | 25F | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 25C | Goole |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5043 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 25F | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 28A | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52590 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 25F | m/e | 06/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52092 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 25F | w/e | 10/02/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42107 | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 25F | on | 27/02/1966 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42108 | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 25F | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 56B | Ardsley | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42109 | on | 20/04/1949 (New) | 25F | on | 20/06/1965 | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51429 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 25F | w/e | 06/05/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42112 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 25F | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42113 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 25F | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42114 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 25F | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42115 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 25F | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42116 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 25F | on | 12/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48724 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 25F | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48725 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 25F | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52587 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 25F | w/e | 08/11/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51404 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 01/04/1950 | 25F | m/e | 11/10/1958 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44951 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 13/05/1950 | 25F | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44990 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23A | Bank Hall | w/e | 13/05/1950 | 25F | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44693 | m/e | 11/1950 (New) | 25F | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 56D | Mirfield | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44694 | m/e | 11/1950 (New) | 25F | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 56D | Mirfield | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44695 | on | 30/11/1950 (New) | 25F | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 56D | Mirfield | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45219 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 25F | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 25F | Low Moor |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45219 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 25F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 25F | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45210 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 25F | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 25G | Farnley Junction |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50736 | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 25F | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 25F | Low Moor |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50762 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 25F | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 25D | Mirfield |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50886 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 25F | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 25F | Low Moor |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52561 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 25F | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 25F | Low Moor |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52561 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 25F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 25F | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 25C | Goole |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50736 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 25F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 25F | m/e | 12/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50886 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 25F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 25F | w/e | 29/12/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52166 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25D | Mirfield | w/e | 28/07/1951 | 25F | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 25F | Low Moor |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52166 | w/e | 28/07/1951 | 25F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 25F | on | 27/10/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 52515 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 25D | Mirfield | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 25F | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 25F | Low Moor |
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 52515 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 25F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 25F | w/e | 21/03/1959 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 52521 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 25F | on | 24/05/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52351 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 25F | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50892 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 25D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 25F | m/e | 05/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52411 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 25C | Goole | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 25F | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 25F | Low Moor |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45210 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 25G | Farnley Junction | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 25F | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 25F | Low Moor |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52411 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 25F | Low Moor | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 25F | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50818 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 25F | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45210 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 25F | Low Moor | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 25F | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 27A | Bank Hall |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50762 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 25D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 25F | w/e | 19/12/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50807 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 25F | m/e | 05/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50831 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 24C | Lostock Hall | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 25F | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50865 | w/e | 01/04/1950 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 25F | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52561 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 25C | Goole | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 25F | w/e | 05/02/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52237 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 25C | Goole | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 25F | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50764 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 24C | Lostock Hall | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 25F | w/e | 07/07/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41101 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 25F | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41189 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 25F | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 40937 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 25F | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52427 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 25F | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84010 | on | 08/09/1953 (New) | 25F | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84012 | on | 17/09/1953 (New) | 25F | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84011 | on | 18/09/1953 (New) | 25F | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 27A | Bank Hall | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84013 | on | 21/09/1953 (New) | 25F | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 27A | Bank Hall | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84014 | on | 22/09/1953 (New) | 25F | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 27A | Bank Hall | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84015 | on | 02/10/1953 (New) | 25F | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52343 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 25F | w/e | 11/08/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52355 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 25F | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50869 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 25D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 25F | w/e | 05/11/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52154 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 25F | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50757 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 25F | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41101 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 25F | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 27C | Southport |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41186 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 25F | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 27C | Southport |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41187 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 25F | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 27C | Southport |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41189 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 25F | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 27C | Southport |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41250 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 25G | Farnley Junction | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 25F | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41262 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 25F | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41263 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 28A | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 25F | on | 12/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41264 | on | 18/11/1950 | 28A | Blackpool Central | on | 14/09/1954 | 25F | on | 14/09/1958 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52120 | w/e | 22/07/1950 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 25F | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52150 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 25F | w/e | 05/03/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52235 | w/e | 31/07/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 25F | on | 12/08/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42649 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 25F | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42650 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 25F | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50757 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 25F | m/e | 11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45435 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 25X | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 25F | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 25A | Wakefield | |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50831 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 25F | m/e | 11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45101 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 25F | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90397 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 25A | Wakefield | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 25F | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90406 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 25A | Wakefield | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 25F | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42622 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 25F | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50855 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 25F | m/e | 09/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90126 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 56F | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52089 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 26A | Newton Heath | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 56F | w/e | 21/03/1959 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52413 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 24D | Lower Darwen | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 56F | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52461 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 26C | Bolton | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 56F | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47335 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | Normanton | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 56F | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 47249 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 20B | Stourton | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 56F | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 56E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44062 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 25D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 56F | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43101 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 56B | Ardsley | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 56F | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40155 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 56F | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61031 | w/e | 19/05/1951 | 37C | Bradford Hammerton Street | on | 12/01/1958 | 56F | on | 14/09/1958 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61131 | on | 15/09/1957 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | on | 12/01/1958 | 56F | on | 01/03/1959 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61382 | on | 15/09/1957 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | on | 12/01/1958 | 56F | on | 14/09/1958 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61383 | on | 15/09/1957 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | on | 12/01/1958 | 56F | on | 21/01/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64791 | on | 15/09/1957 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | on | 12/01/1958 | 56F | on | 26/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64796 | on | 16/06/1957 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | on | 12/01/1958 | 56F | on | 14/06/1959 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64801 | on | 27/05/1956 | 37C | Bradford Hammerton Street | on | 12/01/1958 | 56F | on | 26/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64872 | on | 16/06/1957 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | on | 12/01/1958 | 56F | on | 26/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64886 | on | 15/09/1957 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | on | 12/01/1958 | 56F | on | 18/11/1962 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64903 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 37C | Bradford Hammerton Street | on | 12/01/1958 | 56F | on | 13/04/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64907 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 37C | Bradford Hammerton Street | on | 12/01/1958 | 56F | on | 26/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64947 | on | 15/09/1957 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | on | 12/01/1958 | 56F | on | 08/06/1958 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90698 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 56F | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64170 | on | 01/01/1948 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 56F | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64203 | on | 01/01/1948 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 56F | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64226 | on | 01/01/1948 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 56F | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68892 | on | 01/01/1948 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 56F | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68895 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 56F | on | 28/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68897 | on | 01/01/1948 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 56F | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68908 | on | 01/01/1948 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 56F | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68912 | on | 01/01/1948 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 56F | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68922 | on | 01/01/1948 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 56F | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68923 | on | 01/01/1948 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 56F | on | 13/12/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68932 | on | 01/01/1948 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 56F | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68933 | on | 01/01/1948 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 56F | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68934 | on | 01/01/1948 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 56F | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68940 | on | 01/01/1948 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 56F | on | 15/09/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68942 | on | 01/01/1948 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 56F | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68943 | on | 01/01/1948 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 56F | on | 20/02/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68944 | w/e | 09/07/1950 | 37C | Bradford Hammerton Street | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 56F | on | 17/09/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68969 | on | 01/01/1948 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 56F | on | 22/02/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46483 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 56F | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41253 | 2w/e | 03/12/1949 | 25A | Wakefield (New) | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 56F | w/e | 02/02/1963 | 55C | Farnley Junction |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47405 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | Normanton | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 56F | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47446 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 20D | Normanton | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 56F | on | 20/12/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47635 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 20D | Normanton | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 56F | m/e | 12/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61020 | on | 25/09/1955 | 51A | Darlington | on | 08/06/1958 | 56F | on | 08/11/1959 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61023 | on | 25/09/1955 | 51A | Darlington | on | 08/06/1958 | 56F | on | 08/11/1959 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61039 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 51A | Darlington | on | 08/06/1958 | 56F | on | 08/11/1959 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61040 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 51A | Darlington | on | 08/06/1958 | 56F | on | 15/03/1959 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61049 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 51A | Darlington | on | 08/06/1958 | 56F | on | 08/11/1959 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61061 | on | 02/09/1951 | 51A | Darlington | on | 08/06/1958 | 56F | on | 14/09/1958 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48080 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 20C | Royston | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 56F | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 55B | Stourton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48162 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | Royston | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 56F | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 55B | Stourton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48265 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 20C | Royston | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 56F | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48394 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 56A | Wakefield | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 56F | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 55B | Stourton |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43579 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 56A | Wakefield | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 56F | w/e | 31/10/1959 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90711 | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 56B | Ardsley | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 56F | 4w/e | 10/09/1966 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64203 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 56A | Wakefield | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 56F | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48702 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 56D | Mirfield | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 56F | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 55B | Stourton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90333 | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 25A | Wakefield | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 56F | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64817 | on | 25/09/1955 | 54A | Sunderland | on | 25/01/1959 | 56F | on | 29/03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64919 | on | 01/02/1953 | 54A | Sunderland | on | 25/01/1959 | 56F | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 47255 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20E | Manningham | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 56F | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42411 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 56F | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 56E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42073 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 56F | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68908 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 56F | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68912 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 53E | Goole | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 56F | on | 14/09/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44824 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 21/03/1959 | 56F | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42084 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50G | Whitby | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 56F | on | 29/11/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61198 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | DAR | Darlington | on | 14/06/1959 | 56F | on | 30/08/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61274 | on | 25/09/1955 | 51A | Darlington | on | 14/06/1959 | 56F | on | 23/12/1962 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61387 | on | 14/09/1958 | 51A | Darlington | on | 14/06/1959 | 56F | on | 23/12/1962 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62047 | on | 23/11/1958 | 51E | Stockton | on | 14/06/1959 | 56F | on | 30/08/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62065 | on | 25/06/1950 | 51E | Stockton | on | 14/06/1959 | 56F | on | 30/08/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43053 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 56F | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41274 | m/e | 09/1950 | 20C | Royston (New) | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 56F | on | 21/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42311 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 56F | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42380 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 56F | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 56E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68948 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 56F | on | 15/11/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90068 | on | 01/11/1959 | 56A | Wakefield | on | 08/11/1959 | 56F | on | 10/09/1961 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90200 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 56A | Wakefield | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 56F | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 56E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90236 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 56A | Wakefield | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 56F | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46413 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 56F | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46435 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 56F | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 67B | Hurlford |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90322 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 56D | Mirfield | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 56F | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90351 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 56D | Mirfield | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 56F | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90397 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 56D | Mirfield | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 56F | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68959 | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 56A | Wakefield | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 56F | on | 31/08/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41264 | on | 05/06/1960 | 56D | Mirfield | on | 12/06/1960 | 56F | on | 07/01/1962 | To Store | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40147 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 56F | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40190 | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 56F | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42324 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 56D | Mirfield | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 56F | on | 14/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42380 | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 56F | on | 10/12/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42411 | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 56F | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42622 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 56A | Wakefield | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 56F | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47271 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 56A | Wakefield | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 56F | on | 29/12/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47582 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 56F | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 24D | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40074 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 56F | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 52515 | w/e | 21/03/1959 | 56D | Mirfield | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 56F | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52121 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 25D | Mirfield | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 56F | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61853 | w/e | 16/05/1959 | 56B | Ardsley | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 56F | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61975 | w/e | 16/05/1959 | 56B | Ardsley | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 56F | on | 04/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48265 | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 56D | Mirfield | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 56F | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48276 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 56D | Mirfield | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 56F | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61040 | on | 22/03/1959 | 56D | Mirfield | on | 20/08/1961 | 56F | on | 10/09/1961 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61161 | on | 17/07/1960 | 56D | Mirfield | on | 20/08/1961 | 56F | on | 10/09/1961 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61189 | on | 22/02/1959 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | on | 20/08/1961 | 56F | on | 08/09/1963 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61386 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | on | 20/08/1961 | 56F | on | 08/09/1963 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68977 | w/e | 12/08/1961 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 56F | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46109 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 56F | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46113 | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 56F | w/e | 13/01/1962 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46117 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 56F | w/e | 13/01/1962 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46130 | w/e | 19/12/1959 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 56F | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46145 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 56F | w/e | 13/01/1962 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67754 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 56F | on | 05/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67759 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 56F | on | 08/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67764 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 56F | on | 27/08/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67721 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 02/12/1961 | 56F | on | 26/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68963 | w/e | 19/08/1961 | 56B | Ardsley | w/e | 13/01/1962 | 56F | on | 13/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68964 | w/e | 19/08/1961 | 56B | Ardsley | w/e | 13/01/1962 | 56F | on | 01/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90721 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 25D | Mirfield | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 56F | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90723 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 25D | Mirfield | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 56F | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44951 | w/e | 26/05/1962 | 56A | Wakefield | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 56F | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45207 | w/e | 26/05/1962 | 56A | Wakefield | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 56F | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 55D | Royston |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45208 | w/e | 26/05/1962 | 56A | Wakefield | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 56F | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45565 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 56F | 4w/e | 27/02/1965 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45694 | on | 01/01/1948 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 56F | 4w/e | 27/02/1965 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43072 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 56A | Wakefield | w/e | 25/08/1962 | 56F | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42285 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 25D | Mirfield | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 56F | on | 30/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82026 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 50E | Scarborough | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 56F | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90054 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 56A | Wakefield | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 56F | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90310 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 56F | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90698 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 56D | Mirfield | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 56F | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42151 | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 56F | on | 07/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44912 | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 56F | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 55D | Royston |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45219 | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 56F | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 55D | Royston |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61023 | on | 17/06/1962 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | on | 08/09/1963 | 56F | on | 05/01/1964 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61115 | on | 08/06/1958 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | on | 08/09/1963 | 56F | on | 05/01/1964 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61309 | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | on | 08/09/1963 | 56F | on | 05/01/1964 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41264 | on | 07/01/1962 | 98S | on | 27/10/1963 | 56F | on | 03/11/1963 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42142 | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 56B | Ardsley | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 56F | on | 26/06/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43070 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 56A | Wakefield | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 56F | 4w/e | 30/01/1965 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43132 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 56A | Wakefield | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 56F | 4w/e | 30/01/1965 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42311 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 56F | on | 13/04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42411 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 56F | m/e | 08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61016 | on | 08/09/1963 | 56D | Mirfield | on | 12/04/1964 | 56F | on | 31/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61023 | on | 05/01/1964 | 56D | Mirfield | on | 12/04/1964 | 56F | on | 31/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61115 | on | 05/01/1964 | 56D | Mirfield | on | 12/04/1964 | 56F | on | 13/11/1966 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61189 | on | 08/09/1963 | 56D | Mirfield | on | 12/04/1964 | 56F | on | 13/11/1966 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61214 | on | 08/09/1963 | 56D | Mirfield | on | 12/04/1964 | 56F | on | 03/05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61309 | on | 05/01/1964 | 56D | Mirfield | on | 12/04/1964 | 56F | on | 13/11/1966 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61386 | on | 08/09/1963 | 56D | Mirfield | on | 12/04/1964 | 56F | on | 21/08/1966 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61014 | on | 10/09/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock | on | 07/06/1964 | 56F | on | 21/08/1966 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43141 | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 56F | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42664 | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 56F | 4w/e | 10/09/1966 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42055 | on | 03/11/1963 | 56B | Ardsley | on | 03/01/1965 | 56F | on | 27/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90723 | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 52H | Tyne Dock | 4w/e | 30/01/1965 | 56F | 4w/e | 10/09/1966 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42177 | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 56B | Ardsley | 4w/e | 30/01/1965 | 56F | 4w/e | 10/09/1966 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42073 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 56B | Ardsley | 4w/e | 30/01/1965 | 56F | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90731 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 56B | Ardsley | 4w/e | 19/06/1965 | 56F | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45565 | 4w/e | 27/02/1965 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 19/06/1965 | 56F | on | 06/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42074 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 6A | Chester (MR) | on | 20/06/1965 | 56F | on | 04/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61388 | on | 25/11/1962 | 56B | Ardsley | on | 31/10/1965 | 56F | on | 13/11/1966 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2196 | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 55H | Neville Hill | 4w/e | 18/06/1966 | 56F | on | 29/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42196 | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 55H | Neville Hill | 4w/e | 18/06/1966 | 56F | on | 29/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42184 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 55H | Neville Hill | 4w/e | 18/06/1966 | 56F | on | 04/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44694 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 56D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 10/09/1966 | 56F | m/e | 10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44946 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 56D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 10/09/1966 | 56F | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44951 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 56D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 10/09/1966 | 56F | on | 14/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90711 | 4w/e | 10/09/1966 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 56F | on | 06/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42177 | 4w/e | 10/09/1966 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 56F | on | 17/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44693 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 56D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 56F | on | 29/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44695 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 56D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 56F | on | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44990 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 56D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 56F | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45208 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 56D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 56F | on | 01/10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42233 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 56F | m/e | 05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42235 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 56F | m/e | 07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90633 | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 56F | on | 12/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42587 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 56F | on | 12/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42665 | w/e | 11/06/1966 | 12E | Tebay | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 56F | on | 12/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42251 | w/e | 18/06/1966 | 12E | Tebay | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 56F | m/e | 10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42283 | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 56F | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42141 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55D | Royston | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 56F | m/e | 10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42616 | w/e | 27/05/1967 | 91E | To Eastern Region | 4w/e | 17/06/1967 | 56F | m/e | 10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42236 | on | 29/05/1967 | Withdrawn | 4w/e | 17/06/1967 (R) | 56F | |||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42252 | w/e | 27/05/1967 | 91E | To Eastern Region | 4w/e | 17/06/1967 | 56F | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42066 | w/e | 27/05/1967 | 91E | To Eastern Region | 4w/e | 17/06/1967 | 56F | m/e | 09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61030 | on | 22/01/1967 | 50A | York (North) | on | 25/06/1967 | 56F | on | 30/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61306 | on | 14/06/1959 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | on | 25/06/1967 | 56F | on | 30/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61337 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | YK | York (North) | on | 25/06/1967 | 56F | on | 30/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44662 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 56F | m/e | 10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43076 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 56F | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43084 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 56F | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42689 | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 56F | m/e | 10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42152 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 56F | m/e | 10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42145 | m/e | 09/1967 | Withdrawn | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 (R) | 56F | |||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42072 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 56F | m/e | 10/1967 | Withdrawn |