Depot: Lowestoft
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Lowestoft | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Y5 | 0-4-0ST | 210 | m/e | 03/1875 (New) | LOW | m/e | 09/1914 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4687 | on | 24/02/1928 | STR | Stratford | on | 10/12/1928 | LOW | on | 23/01/1929 | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4676 | on | 14/06/1929 | DON | Doncaster | on | 17/09/1929 | LOW | on | 31/12/1929 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4663 | on | 24/09/1930 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | on | 04/10/1930 | LOW | on | 09/01/1931 | NWE | New England |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4650 | on | 28/12/1930 | STR | Stratford | on | 02/10/1931 | LOW | on | 18/12/1931 | STR | Stratford |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4663 | on | 06/08/1932 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | on | 02/10/1932 | LOW | on | 15/01/1933 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4663 | on | 15/01/1933 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | on | 06/10/1934 | LOW | on | 03/11/1934 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4676 | on | 09/10/1934 | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | on | 03/11/1934 | LOW | on | 28/12/1934 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4663 | on | 15/12/1934 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | on | 05/10/1935 | LOW | m/e | 11/1935 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 7543 | m/e | 11/1935 | LOW | on | 01/01/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 300 | m/e | 12/1935 | LOW | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 96 | m/e | 12/1935 | LOW | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | Lowestoft | ||||
Steam | F3 | 2-4-2T | 8080 | m/e | 12/1935 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | m/e | 01/1936 | LOW | m/e | 12/1938 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4663 | on | 17/12/1935 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | on | 04/10/1936 | LOW | on | 24/01/1937 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4655 | on | 17/10/1935 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | on | 05/11/1939 | LOW | on | 10/12/1939 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4667 | on | 22/10/1939 | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | on | 07/12/1939 | LOW | on | 21/01/1940 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2991 | on | 28/01/1946 | IPS | Ipswich | on | 17/04/1946 | LOW | on | 29/07/1946 | IPS | Ipswich |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1266 | on | 24/10/1943 | IPS | Ipswich | on | 30/04/1946 | LOW | on | 26/03/1947 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4968 | on | 06/09/1944 | IPS | Ipswich | on | 22/09/1946 | LOW | on | 26/03/1947 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2985 | on | 06/09/1944 | IPS | Ipswich | on | 06/10/1946 | LOW | on | 26/03/1947 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4912 | on | 22/10/1941 | IPS | Ipswich | on | 06/10/1946 | LOW | on | 24/03/1947 | CAR | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4959 | on | 29/01/1941 | IPS | Ipswich | on | 06/10/1946 | LOW | on | 26/03/1947 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 1738 | on | 07/02/1947 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | on | 26/03/1947 | LOW | on | 13/10/1947 | STR | Stratford |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 1745 | on | 06/12/1946 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | on | 26/03/1947 | LOW | on | 22/10/1947 | STR | Stratford |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 1748 | on | 13/01/1946 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | on | 26/03/1947 | LOW | on | 13/10/1947 | STR | Stratford |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 1754 | on | 13/01/1946 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | on | 26/03/1947 | LOW | on | 17/10/1947 | STR | Stratford |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 1730 | on | 22/05/1947 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | on | 27/08/1947 | LOW | on | 01/02/1948 | COL | Colchester |
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 2593 | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | w/e | 28/02/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||||
Steam | F3 | 2-4-2T | 7114 | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | on | 12/03/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | F3 | 2-4-2T | 7119 | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | on | 18/02/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | F3 | 2-4-2T | 7126 | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | w/e | 15/05/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||||
Steam | F3 | 2-4-2T | 7141 | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | w/e | 17/01/1948 | IPS | Ipswich | ||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 7158 | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | w/e | 03/01/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 7163 | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | on | 12/12/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 7165 | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | on | 15/01/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 7166 | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | on | 09/04/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 7167 | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | m/e | 04/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 7177 | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | w/e | 03/01/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5351 | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | m/e | 05/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5352 | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | on | 29/05/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5353 | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | w/e | 16/10/1948 | LOW | Lowestoft | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5355 | m/e | 11/1935 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | m/e | 04/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5389 | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 32B | Ipswich | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5400 | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | on | 18/02/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5462 | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 8602 | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | w/e | 26/11/1949 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 8611 | m/e | 11/1935 | COL | Colchester | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | on | 25/07/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 8640 | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1926 | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1949 | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1958 | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1959 | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | w/e | 16/10/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1981 | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 31B | March | ||||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 68130 | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | m/e | 01/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 39 | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | m/e | 04/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 68131 | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | m/e | 04/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 68168 | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | w/e | 07/01/1950 | LOWEng | |||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 68173 | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | w/e | 17/07/1948 | LOWED | |||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 68177 | m/e | 12/1935 | LOW | Lowestoft | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | m/e | 03/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 68178 | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | m/e | 07/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 7156 | on | 01/01/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 10/01/1948 | LOW | m/e | 11/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 7182 | m/e | 01/1931 | Withdrawn | w/e | 17/01/1948 (R) | LOW | |||||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 7230 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | COL | Colchester | w/e | 07/02/1948 | LOW | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 30A | Stratford |
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 7231 | on | 01/01/1948 | STR | Stratford | w/e | 07/02/1948 | LOW | m/e | 30/11/1949 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5435 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 07/02/1948 | LOW | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 32B | Ipswich |
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 7232 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | COL | Colchester | w/e | 21/02/1948 | LOW | m/e | 07/1949 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 7158 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 06/03/1948 | LOW | w/e | 13/01/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5374 | on | 01/01/1948 | COL | Colchester | w/e | 17/04/1948 | LOW | on | 25/11/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 67218 | on | 01/01/1948 | STR | Stratford | w/e | 24/04/1948 | LOW | w/e | 12/11/1949 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town |
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 7177 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 15/05/1948 | LOW | on | 12/03/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 7184 | on | 01/01/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 15/05/1948 | LOW | on | 08/12/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 7183 | m/e | 10/1934 | Withdrawn | w/e | 19/06/1948 (R) | LOW | |||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 7174 | on | 01/01/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 24/07/1948 | LOW | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5401 | on | 01/01/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 24/07/1948 | LOW | m/e | 09/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61947 | on | 01/01/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 14/08/1948 | LOW | w/e | 09/10/1948 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1953 | on | 01/01/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 28/08/1948 | LOW | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5479 | on | 01/01/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 09/10/1948 | LOW | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 30E | Colchester |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1939 | on | 01/01/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 09/10/1948 | LOW | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61973 | on | 01/01/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 09/10/1948 | LOW | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1989 | on | 01/01/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 09/10/1948 | LOW | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5353 | on | 01/01/1948 | LOW | Lowestoft | w/e | 16/10/1948 | LOW | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 2561 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | LOW | 5w/e | 26/02/1949 | YB | Yarmouth Beach |
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 2545 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | LOW | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 2612 | w/e | 23/10/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | LOW | 5w/e | 26/02/1949 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61959 | w/e | 16/10/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | LOW | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) |
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5478 | on | 01/01/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 5w/e | 26/02/1949 | LOW | w/e | 30/07/1950 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 2606 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | LOW | w/e | 30/07/1950 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5433 | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 11/06/1949 | LOW | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 32B | Ipswich |
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 67186 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 20/08/1949 | LOW | on | 22/07/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 7174 | w/e | 03/09/1949 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | w/e | 01/10/1949 | LOW | m/e | 30/11/1949 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town |
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 7233 | on | 01/01/1948 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | w/e | 08/10/1949 | LOW | w/e | 21/01/1950 | YB | Yarmouth Beach |
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 65534 | on | 01/01/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 08/10/1949 | LOW | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 31A | Cambridge |
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5471 | on | 01/01/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 15/10/1949 | LOW | m/e | 30/11/1949 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61939 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 22/10/1949 | LOW | w/e | 07/01/1950 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 7224 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 26/11/1949 | LOW | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 7216 | on | 01/01/1948 | STR | Stratford | m/e | 30/11/1949 | LOW | on | 17/12/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 7224 | m/e | 07/1949 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | m/e | 30/11/1949 | LOW | w/e | 09/07/1950 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 7216 | on | 04/12/1949 | STR | Stratford | on | 09/12/1949 | LOW | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 7201 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | STR | Stratford | w/e | 31/12/1949 | LOW | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 65566 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | w/e | 14/05/1950 | 32C | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 67174 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 32C | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 65566 | w/e | 14/05/1950 | 32C | Lowestoft | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 32C | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 32F | Yarmouth Beach |
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 67174 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 32C | Lowestoft | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 32C | w/e | 13/12/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 67231 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 09/07/1950 | 32C | on | 14/03/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 65478 | 5w/e | 26/02/1949 | LOW | Lowestoft | w/e | 30/07/1950 | 32C | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 32B | Ipswich |
Steam | F3 | 2-4-2T | 67127 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | IPS | Ipswich | w/e | 27/08/1950 | 32C | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | F3 | 2-4-2T | 67127 | w/e | 27/08/1950 | 32C | Lowestoft | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 32C | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 32B | Ipswich |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61844 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 31B | March | w/e | 08/10/1950 | 32C | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61864 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 31B | March | w/e | 08/10/1950 | 32C | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61961 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 31B | March | w/e | 08/10/1950 | 32C | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67794 | w/e | 09/07/1950 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 08/10/1950 | 32C | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 65570 | on | 01/01/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 08/10/1950 | 32C | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61844 | w/e | 08/10/1950 | 32C | Lowestoft | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 32C | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 31B | March |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61864 | w/e | 08/10/1950 | 32C | Lowestoft | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 32C | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61961 | w/e | 08/10/1950 | 32C | Lowestoft | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 32C | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 31B | March |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67794 | w/e | 08/10/1950 | 32C | Lowestoft | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 32C | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 34E | Neasden |
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 65570 | w/e | 08/10/1950 | 32C | Lowestoft | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 32C | w/e | 18/02/1951 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 62556 | w/e | 16/04/1950 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | on | 29/10/1950 | 32C | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 62556 | on | 29/10/1950 | 32C | Lowestoft | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 32C | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 65514 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 32C | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67795 | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 32C | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 32C | Lowestoft | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 65514 | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 32C | Lowestoft | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 32C | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67795 | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 32C | Lowestoft | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 32C | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 34E | Neasden |
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 65507 | 5w/e | 26/02/1949 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 32C | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 67232 | w/e | 16/07/1949 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 32C | on | 14/11/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 65507 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 32C | Lowestoft | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 32C | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 65558 | on | 01/01/1948 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 32C | on | 04/01/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 67176 | m/e | 30/11/1949 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 32C | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 67178 | on | 01/01/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 32C | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 67176 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 32C | Lowestoft | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 32C | on | 22/07/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 67178 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 32C | Lowestoft | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 32C | w/e | 18/08/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 65559 | on | 01/01/1948 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 32C | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67719 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 32B | Ipswich | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 32C | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 65559 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 32C | Lowestoft | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 32C | on | 16/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67719 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 32C | Lowestoft | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 32C | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 32B | Ipswich |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64959 | on | 26/03/1947 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | on | 30/09/1951 | 32C | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64959 | on | 30/09/1951 | 32C | Lowestoft | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 32C | on | 14/10/1951 | 30A | Stratford |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67708 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 32B | Ipswich | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 32C | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61877 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 31B | March | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 32C | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61908 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 31B | March | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 32C | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61981 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 31B | March | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 32C | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61877 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 32C | Lowestoft | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 32C | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61908 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 32C | Lowestoft | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 32C | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61981 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 32C | Lowestoft | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 32C | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67704 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 32B | Ipswich | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 32C | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67708 | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 32C | Lowestoft | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 32C | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64797 | on | 19/05/1946 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | on | 21/10/1951 | 32C | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64797 | on | 21/10/1951 | 32C | Lowestoft | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 32C | on | 10/02/1952 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 67187 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | MAR | March | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 32C | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 67187 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 32C | Lowestoft | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 32C | on | 18/08/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 65514 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 32C | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 65514 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 32C | Lowestoft | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 32C | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 62545 | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 32C | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 62545 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 32C | Lowestoft | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 32C | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 65586 | w/e | 01/12/1951 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 32C | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 65586 | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 32C | Lowestoft | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 32C | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 67190 | on | 01/01/1948 | COL | Colchester | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 32C | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67704 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 32B | Ipswich | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 32C | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67719 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 32B | Ipswich | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 32C | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64797 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | on | 28/09/1952 | 32C | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 67190 | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 32C | Lowestoft | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 32C | on | 23/11/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64797 | on | 28/09/1952 | 32C | Lowestoft | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 32C | on | 28/12/1952 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67704 | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 32C | Lowestoft | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 32C | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67719 | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 32C | Lowestoft | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 32C | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 32B | Ipswich |
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 67195 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 30A | Stratford | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 32C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61981 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 32C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 67195 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 32C | Lowestoft | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 32C | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61981 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 32C | Lowestoft | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 32C | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 67214 | on | 01/01/1948 | STR | Stratford | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 32C | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 32C | Lowestoft |
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 67214 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 32C | Lowestoft | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 32C | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town |
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 65507 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 32C | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 67206 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | STR | Stratford | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 32C | on | 27/09/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 67207 | on | 01/01/1948 | COL | Colchester | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 32C | on | 06/12/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61981 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 32C | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67715 | m/e | 30/11/1949 | NEA | Neasden | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 32C | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 32B | Ipswich |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67717 | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 32C | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 32B | Ipswich | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 67204 | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 30A | Stratford | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 32C | on | 27/09/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67714 | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 32C | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64724 | on | 30/04/1950 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | on | 18/10/1953 | 32C | on | 24/01/1954 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 67223 | on | 01/01/1948 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 32C | on | 13/12/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 67226 | on | 01/01/1948 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 32C | on | 14/11/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 67233 | w/e | 21/01/1950 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 32C | on | 13/12/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 67234 | on | 01/01/1948 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 32C | on | 17/08/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61953 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 32C | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61989 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 32C | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67715 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 32B | Ipswich | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 32C | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 32B | Ipswich |
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 62517 | on | 01/01/1948 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 32C | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67704 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 32C | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 32B | Ipswich |
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 67387 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 32C | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 30A | Stratford |
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 62797 | on | 01/01/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 32C | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 31A | Cambridge |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61989 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 32C | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67704 | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 32B | Ipswich | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 32C | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 30A | Stratford |
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 67214 | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 32C | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 30A | Stratford |
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 67229 | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 32C | on | 18/03/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 67195 | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | 6w/e | 25/12/1954 | 32C | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 30A | Stratford |
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 67199 | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 32C | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town |
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 65460 | on | 01/01/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 32C | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 65537 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 32C | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67717 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 32B | Ipswich | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 32C | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69824 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | on | 30/10/1955 | 32C | on | 17/02/1957 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 65507 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 32C | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 30E | Colchester |
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 68664 | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 32C | on | 02/09/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61918 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 32C | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 67224 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 32G | Melton Constable | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 32C | on | 19/11/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67770 | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 32C | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 34A | Kings Cross |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69829 | on | 11/09/1955 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | on | 08/01/1956 | 32C | on | 17/02/1957 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69826 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | on | 29/01/1956 | 32C | on | 17/02/1957 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 68565 | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 32C | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 30A | Stratford |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61918 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 32C | 4w/e | 25/05/1956 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 69690 | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 32C | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 31A | Cambridge |
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 69679 | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 32C | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town |
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 69706 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 4w/e | 25/08/1956 | 32C | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 11141 | on | 05/06/1956 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe (New) | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 32C | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 32B | Ipswich |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67710 | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 32B | Ipswich | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 32C | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 32B | Ipswich |
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 68628 | on | 01/01/1948 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 32C | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town |
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 69621 | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 30A | Stratford | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 32C | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 30A | Stratford |
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 68628 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 32C | on | 24/02/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61957 | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 32C | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 69706 | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 32C | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 11139 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 32C | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 65469 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 32C | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 69615 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 34B | Hornsey | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 32C | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 30A | Stratford |
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 69708 | 6w/e | 25/12/1954 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 32C | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67709 | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 32B | Ipswich | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 32C | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 30A | Stratford |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67710 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 32B | Ipswich | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 32C | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 32B | Ipswich |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67711 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 32B | Ipswich | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 32C | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 32B | Ipswich |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64797 | on | 28/12/1952 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | on | 29/09/1957 | 32C | on | 28/09/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 11171 | on | 20/09/1957 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe (New) | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 32C | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67738 | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | STR | Stratford | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 32C | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 11173 | on | 09/11/1957 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe (New) | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 32C | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 91 | on | 06/1958 (New) | 32C | w/e | 25/10/1969 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61970 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 32C | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 69690 | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 31A | Cambridge | 4w/e | 16/08/1958 | 32C | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 30A | Stratford |
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 68642 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 4w/e | 13/09/1958 | 32C | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 30A | Stratford |
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 68645 | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 4w/e | 13/09/1958 | 32C | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67707 | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 32C | w/e | 13/02/1960 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67708 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 32B | Ipswich | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 32C | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 30A | Stratford |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64726 | on | 15/06/1958 | 32G | Melton Constable | on | 19/10/1958 | 32C | on | 30/11/1958 | 40A | Lincoln |
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 65567 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 32G | Melton Constable | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 32C | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 65588 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 32G | Melton Constable | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 32C | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 92 | on | 31/12/1958 (New) | 32C | w/e | 28/09/1968 | 55F | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 61659 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 32C | on | 14/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 61660 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 32C | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 31B | March |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61223 | on | 14/09/1958 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | on | 03/05/1959 | 32C | on | 28/02/1960 | 40A | Lincoln |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2039 | on | 13/03/1959 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe (New) | w/e | 16/05/1959 | 32C | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2573 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 32C | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 61672 | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 32B | Ipswich | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 32C | on | 09/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67710 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 32B | Ipswich | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 32C | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 34A | Kings Cross |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61802 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 31B | March | w/e | 04/07/1959 | 32C | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 40A | Lincoln |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61160 | on | 06/10/1957 | 32B | Ipswich | on | 19/07/1959 | 32C | on | 13/03/1960 | 40A | Lincoln |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67701 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 31A | Cambridge | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 32C | w/e | 26/12/1959 | 30A | Stratford |
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 62604 | on | 01/01/1948 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | w/e | 31/10/1959 | 32C | on | 05/02/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 68656 | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | w/e | 31/10/1959 | 32C | on | 04/04/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 61664 | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 32C | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 31B | March |
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 61670 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 32C | on | 04/04/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2555 | w/e | 30/05/1959 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 32C | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 30F | Parkeston Quay |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61054 | on | 26/07/1959 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | on | 03/04/1960 | 32C | on | 11/09/1960 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2553 | 4w/e | 13/09/1958 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 32C | w/e | 03/06/1961 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2210 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 32C | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |