Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 71 Today
» 1187 Yesterday
» 2385 Week
» 13678 Month
» 278311 Year
» 1499876 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Melton Constable


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Melton Constable Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam C12 4-4-2T 7354       on 01/01/1948 MC w/e 22/06/1953 Withdrawn
Steam D2 4-4-0 2155       on 01/01/1948 MC on 26/02/1948 Withdrawn
Steam D2 4-4-0 2156       on 01/01/1948 MC m/e 01/1949 Withdrawn
Steam D2 4-4-0 2157       on 01/01/1948 MC on 08/04/1948 Withdrawn
Steam D2 4-4-0 2189       on 01/01/1948 MC on 25/11/1948 Withdrawn
Steam D2 4-4-0 2195       on 01/01/1948 MC on 26/02/1948 Withdrawn
Steam D2 4-4-0 2197       on 01/01/1948 MC m/e 01/1949 Withdrawn
Steam D16 4-4-0 2515       on 01/01/1948 MC on 01/04/1958 Withdrawn
Steam D15 4-4-0 2520       on 01/01/1948 MC on 27/08/1951 Withdrawn
Steam D15 4-4-0 2528       on 01/01/1948 MC on 25/06/1951 Withdrawn
Steam D16 4-4-0 2533       on 01/01/1948 MC w/e 23/09/1957 Withdrawn
Steam D16 4-4-0 2562       on 01/01/1948 MC 4w/e 19/04/1952 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam D16 4-4-0 2578       on 01/01/1948 MC on 21/10/1957 Withdrawn
Steam F3 2-4-2T 7140       on 01/01/1948 MC m/e 03/1949 Withdrawn
Steam F3 2-4-2T 7150       on 01/01/1948 MC m/e 10/1949 Withdrawn
Steam F4 2-4-2T 7152       on 01/01/1948 MC 4w/e 21/07/1951 32E Yarmouth Vauxhall
Steam F4 2-4-2T 7153       on 01/01/1948 MC m/e 07/1951 Withdrawn
Steam J17 0-6-0 5509       on 01/01/1948 MC 5w/e 16/02/1952 32F Yarmouth Beach
Steam J17 0-6-0 5514       on 01/01/1948 MC 4w/e 19/05/1951 32C Lowestoft
Steam J17 0-6-0 5551       on 01/01/1948 MC 5w/e 16/02/1952 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J17 0-6-0 5552       on 01/01/1948 MC 5w/e 16/02/1952 30A Stratford
Steam J17 0-6-0 5557       on 01/01/1948 MC 4w/e 23/01/1954 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J69 0-6-0T 8570       on 01/01/1948 MC 4w/e 22/08/1953 40F Boston
Steam J17 0-6-0 5566       on 01/01/1948 MC 3w/e 31/05/1950 32C Lowestoft
Steam J17 0-6-0 5567       on 01/01/1948 MC 5w/e 22/10/1955 32G Melton Constable
Steam J17 0-6-0 5586       on 01/01/1948 MC 4w/e 19/07/1952 32C Lowestoft
Steam F6 2-4-2T 67225 on 01/01/1948 STR Stratford m/e 30/11/1949 MC 5w/e 17/12/1955 30E Colchester
Steam F6 2-4-2T 7228 on 01/01/1948 STR Stratford m/e 30/11/1949 MC 5w/e 17/12/1955 30A Stratford
Steam N7 0-6-2T 69708 on 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 4w/e 23/12/1950 32G 4w/e 20/10/1951 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam D16 4-4-0 62617 on 01/01/1948 COL Colchester 5w/e 23/06/1951 32G on 20/05/1957 Withdrawn
Steam J66 0-6-0T 68388 on 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 5w/e 23/06/1951 32G on 28/04/1952 Withdrawn
Steam D16 4-4-0 62608 5w/e 23/06/1951 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 21/07/1951 32G 4w/e 19/01/1952 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam D16 4-4-0 62610 on 01/01/1948 NOR Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 22/09/1951 32G 3w/e 12/11/1955 31A Cambridge
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43146       on 28/09/1951 (New) 32G w/e 07/03/1959 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43147       on 08/10/1951 (New) 32G w/e 07/03/1959 40F Boston
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43148       on 17/10/1951 (New) 32G w/e 07/03/1959 30A Stratford
Steam F6 2-4-2T 67224 4w/e 23/09/1950 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 20/10/1951 32G 5w/e 17/12/1955 32C Lowestoft
Steam J17 0-6-0 65574 on 01/01/1948 YB Yarmouth Beach 4w/e 20/10/1951 32G on 19/04/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43155       on 28/12/1951 (New) 32G w/e 07/03/1959 40F Boston
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43156       on 07/01/1952 (New) 32G 5w/e 16/02/1952 32F Yarmouth Beach
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43145 on 20/09/1951 32F Yarmouth Beach (New) 5w/e 16/02/1952 32G w/e 07/03/1959 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J69 0-6-0T 68623 5w/e 22/09/1951 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 17/05/1952 32G 4w/e 22/08/1953 31D South Lynn
Steam F6 2-4-2T 67229 on 01/01/1948 PKS Parkeston Quay 4w/e 19/07/1952 32G 4w/e 25/09/1954 32D Yarmouth South Town
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43156 5w/e 16/02/1952 32F Yarmouth Beach 4w/e 18/10/1952 32G w/e 07/03/1959 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam D16 4-4-0 62592 4w/e 20/09/1952 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 25/07/1953 32G 4w/e 19/09/1953 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J67 0-6-0T 68515 4w/e 18/10/1952 31D South Lynn 4w/e 22/08/1953 32G on 09/01/1957 Withdrawn
Steam D16 4-4-0 62596 4w/e 20/09/1952 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 19/12/1953 32G 4w/e 23/01/1954 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J17 0-6-0 65509 4w/e 25/07/1953 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 23/01/1954 32G 4w/e 19/10/1957 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam D16 4-4-0 62564 4w/e 20/09/1952 32A Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 24/04/1954 32G 5w/e 24/07/1954 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J17 0-6-0 65551 5w/e 16/02/1952 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 22/05/1954 32G w/e 07/03/1959 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J39 0-6-0 64900 on 24/06/1951 32A Norwich Thorpe on 07/11/1954 32G on 06/03/1955 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J65 0-6-0T 68214 on 01/01/1948 CAM Cambridge 4w/e 13/11/1954 32G 6w/e 25/12/1954 32F Yarmouth Beach
Steam D16 4-4-0 62592 4w/e 19/03/1955 32F Yarmouth Beach 5w/e 23/04/1955 32G 3w/e 14/05/1955 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam D16 4-4-0 62561 4w/e 20/09/1952 32A Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 22/10/1955 32G on 10/02/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J17 0-6-0 65567 on 01/01/1948 MC Melton Constable 5w/e 22/10/1955 32G 5w/e 15/11/1958 32C Lowestoft
Steam J17 0-6-0 65514 5w/e 17/01/1953 32A Norwich Thorpe 3w/e 12/11/1955 32G 4w/e 16/03/1957 30A Stratford
Steam J69 0-6-0T 68625 4w/e 19/02/1955 31A Cambridge 5w/e 21/01/1956 32G 4w/e 19/07/1958 32D Yarmouth South Town
Steam J39 0-6-0 64913 on 11/12/1946 NOR Norwich Thorpe on 22/04/1956 32G on 07/10/1956 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J17 0-6-0 65557 m/e 21/07/1956 32F Yarmouth Beach 4w/e 20/10/1956 32G 4w/e 16/03/1957 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J39 0-6-0 64802 on 26/08/1956 32A Norwich Thorpe on 06/01/1957 32G on 13/10/1957 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J39 0-6-0 64913 on 07/10/1956 32A Norwich Thorpe on 06/01/1957 32G on 03/02/1957 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J17 0-6-0 65588 5w/e 18/06/1955 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 16/03/1957 32G 5w/e 15/11/1958 32C Lowestoft
Steam J39 0-6-0 64968 on 07/10/1953 32A Norwich Thorpe on 12/05/1957 32G on 28/07/1957 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam D16 4-4-0 62597 4w/e 20/10/1956 32F Yarmouth Beach 4w/e 18/05/1957 32G w/e 07/03/1959 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43086 on 24/11/1950 35A New England (New) 5w/e 20/07/1957 32G 4w/e 19/10/1957 35A New England
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43089 4w/e 25/09/1954 31A Cambridge 5w/e 20/07/1957 32G 4w/e 19/10/1957 31A Cambridge
Diesel 05 0-6-0 11170 on 04/08/1957 32A Norwich Thorpe (New) 4w/e 08/03/1958 32G w/e 07/03/1959 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 05 0-6-0 11176 on 13/01/1958 32A Norwich Thorpe (New) 4w/e 08/03/1958 32G w/e 07/03/1959 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 05 0-6-0 11172 on 20/09/1957 32A Norwich Thorpe (New) 4w/e 10/05/1958 32G 4w/e 19/07/1958 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J39 0-6-0 64726 on 09/05/1954 32B Ipswich on 15/06/1958 32G on 19/10/1958 32C Lowestoft