Depot: Mexborough
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Mexborough | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 1053 | m/e | 11/1902 (New) | MEX | on | 24/11/1936 | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 58 | m/e | 10/1903 (New) | MEX | on | 19/05/1925 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 64 | on | 14/12/1903 | MEX | on | 15/10/1926 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 67 | on | 14/12/1903 | MEX | on | 02/01/1931 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 135 | m/e | 01/1904 (New) | MEX | on | 31/01/1927 | MAR | March | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 145 | m/e | 03/1904 (New) | MEX | on | 21/09/1936 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 148 | m/e | 04/1904 (New) | MEX | m/e | 04/1929 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 149 | m/e | 04/1904 (New) | MEX | on | 15/10/1926 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 136 | on | 01/04/1904 | MEX | on | 24/03/1924 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 151 | m/e | 05/1904 (New) | MEX | m/e | 07/1907 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 1073 | m/e | 07/1905 (New) | MEX | on | 15/10/1927 | ARD | Ardsley | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 1054 | on | 19/06/1908 | MEX | on | 30/01/1930 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 44 | m/e | 04/1909 (New) | MEX | m/e | 11/1936 | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 62 | m/e | 07/1907 | DON | Doncaster | m/e | 06/1909 (New) | MEX | on | 13/05/1928 | MAR | March |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 48 | on | 14/07/1909 | MEX | on | 30/04/1928 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 49 | on | 13/08/1909 | MEX | on | 15/10/1926 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 356 | on | 11/12/1909 | MEX | on | 31/01/1928 | ARD | Ardsley | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 963 | y/e | 1910 (New) | MEX | m/e | 07/1924 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 65 | on | 14/03/1910 | MEX | on | 19/05/1925 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 401 | m/e | 06/1910 (New) | MEX | on | 22/12/1937 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 1174 | m/e | 06/1910 (New) | MEX | on | 16/04/1928 | ARD | Ardsley | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 958 | m/e | 08/1910 (New) | MEX | m/e | 07/1924 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 1175 | on | 21/08/1910 | MEX | on | 19/11/1936 | ARD | Ardsley | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 960 | m/e | 10/1910 (New) | MEX | m/e | 07/1924 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 1177 | on | 04/10/1910 | MEX | on | 18/03/1924 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 965 | m/e | 12/1910 (New) | MEX | m/e | 1924 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 1182 | m/e | 02/1911 (New) | MEX | on | 30/06/1928 | ARD | Ardsley | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 962 | on | 08/02/1911 | MEX | on | 31/01/1924 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 1178 | on | 29/04/1911 | MEX | m/e | 1922 | KEA | Keadby | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 164 | on | 27/04/1912 | MEX | m/e | 1923 | KEA | Keadby | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 163 | on | 19/05/1912 | MEX | on | 17/01/1928 | ARD | Ardsley | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1209 | m/e | 08/1912 (New) | MEX | on | 11/08/1926 | ARD | Ardsley | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1183 | on | 08/07/1912 | GOR | Gorton | on | 13/08/1912 | MEX | on | 10/09/1941 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1184 | on | 13/08/1912 | MEX | on | 27/04/1947 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1185 | on | 13/08/1912 | MEX | on | 06/06/1923 | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1186 | on | 15/08/1912 | MEX | on | 28/12/1947 | ARD | Ardsley | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1187 | on | 15/08/1912 | MEX | on | 20/10/1947 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1188 | on | 16/08/1912 | MEX | on | 23/12/1945 | IMM | Immingham | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1189 | on | 20/08/1912 | MEX | on | 27/04/1947 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1190 | on | 20/08/1912 | MEX | on | 16/09/1945 | FRO | Frodingham | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1191 | on | 24/08/1912 | MEX | on | 29/06/1932 | LIN | Lincoln | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1192 | on | 01/09/1912 | MEX | on | 02/01/1931 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1193 | on | 18/09/1912 | MEX | on | 02/07/1950 | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1194 | on | 18/09/1912 | MEX | on | 27/04/1947 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1195 | on | 24/09/1912 | MEX | on | 15/10/1944 | GOR | Gorton | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1196 | on | 19/09/1912 | GOR | Gorton | on | 26/09/1912 | MEX | on | 12/09/1941 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 159 | on | 11/10/1912 | MEX | on | 15/10/1926 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 162 | on | 18/10/1912 | MEX | m/e | 1922 | KEA | Keadby | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1198 | on | 21/10/1912 | MEX | on | 18/08/1946 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1199 | on | 24/10/1912 | MEX | on | 13/01/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1200 | on | 24/10/1912 | MEX | on | 23/12/1945 | IMM | Immingham | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1201 | on | 01/11/1912 | MEX | on | 26/02/1950 | 36D | Barnsley | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 1075 | on | 14/12/1912 | MEX | on | 15/12/1923 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 146 | on | 21/12/1912 | MEX | on | 15/10/1926 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 160 | on | 11/01/1913 | MEX | on | 23/02/1920 | KEA | Keadby | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 152 | on | 01/02/1913 | MEX | on | 02/04/1924 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 391 | m/e | 03/1914 (New) | MEX | on | 24/11/1940 | MEX | Mexborough | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 392 | m/e | 03/1914 (New) | MEX | on | 18/10/1928 | NWE | New England | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 398 | m/e | 05/1914 (New) | MEX | on | 11/08/1926 | ARD | Ardsley | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1202 | on | 03/04/1915 | MEX | on | 07/05/1929 | GOR | Gorton | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 85 | on | 05/05/1916 | MEX | m/e | 10/1922 | KEA | Keadby | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 347 | on | 10/06/1916 | MEX | on | 20/10/1947 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 961 | on | 15/09/1916 | MEX | on | 16/02/1924 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 407 | on | 30/09/1916 | MEX | on | 21/07/1924 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 57 | on | 10/11/1916 | MEX | m/e | 1922 | KEA | Keadby | ||||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 1068 | on | 19/01/1917 | MEX | on | 05/01/1924 | ARD | Ardsley | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 133 | on | 19/01/1917 | MEX | on | 26/10/1926 | IMM | Immingham | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1207 | on | 13/09/1912 | GRI | Grimsby | on | 19/01/1917 | MEX | on | 02/03/1929 | MAR | March |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1243 | on | 17/02/1917 | MEX | on | 20/10/1922 | IMM | Immingham | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 405 | on | 17/03/1917 | MEX | on | 21/07/1924 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1241 | on | 17/03/1917 | MEX | on | 27/04/1947 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 331 | on | 30/03/1917 | MEX | on | 02/07/1950 | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 348 | on | 30/03/1917 | MEX | on | 02/07/1950 | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 386 | on | 30/03/1917 | MEX | on | 26/05/1963 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 406 | on | 11/05/1917 | MEX | on | 21/07/1924 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 388 | on | 11/05/1917 | MEX | on | 28/01/1945 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 397 | on | 11/05/1917 | MEX | on | 11/08/1926 | ARD | Ardsley | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 69 | on | 06/12/1918 | MEX | on | 20/10/1926 | IMM | Immingham | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 376 | on | 05/04/1919 | MEX | on | 10/09/1941 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 349 | on | 07/06/1919 | MEX | on | 23/09/1945 | ARD | Ardsley | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 350 | on | 07/06/1919 | MEX | on | 27/04/1947 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 402 | on | 18/07/1919 | MEX | on | 21/07/1924 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 333 | on | 24/07/1919 | MEX | on | 05/07/1929 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 400 | on | 24/07/1919 | MEX | on | 17/11/1933 | MAR | March | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 384 | on | 24/07/1919 | MEX | on | 28/04/1931 | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 346 | on | 20/09/1919 | MEX | on | 04/10/1941 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1216 | on | 25/09/1912 | ANN | Annesley | on | 20/09/1919 | MEX | on | 27/01/1946 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1222 | on | 20/09/1919 | MEX | on | 28/01/1945 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1224 | m/e | 10/1912 | ANN | Annesley (New) | on | 20/09/1919 | MEX | on | 19/09/1944 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 390 | on | 20/09/1919 | MEX | on | 05/10/1947 | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||||
Steam | O5 | 2-8-0 | 417 | on | 20/09/1919 | MEX | on | 25/12/1949 | FRO | Frodingham | ||||
Steam | O5 | 2-8-0 | 421 | on | 20/09/1919 | MEX | on | 01/04/1932 | MAR | March | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1210 | on | 17/10/1919 | MEX | on | 28/01/1945 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | O5 | 2-8-0 | 10 | on | 17/10/1919 | MEX | on | 18/09/1944 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 1076 | on | 08/11/1919 | MEX | m/e | 1922 | KEA | Keadby | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 335 | on | 15/11/1919 | MEX | on | 09/01/1931 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 404 | on | 15/11/1919 | MEX | on | 08/07/1929 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1208 | on | 20/09/1912 | GRI | Grimsby | on | 15/11/1919 | MEX | on | 18/08/1946 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | O5 | 2-8-0 | 11 | on | 15/11/1919 | MEX | on | 07/06/1937 | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 1180 | on | 15/11/1919 | MEX | on | 18/03/1924 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | O5 | 2-8-0 | 12 | on | 12/12/1919 | MEX | on | 13/01/1946 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||||
Steam | O5 | 2-8-0 | 13 | on | 17/01/1920 | MEX | on | 18/08/1946 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1197 | on | 04/07/1919 | GOR | Gorton | on | 01/05/1920 | MEX | on | 04/10/1941 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 1070 | m/e | 05/1922 | MEX | on | 30/06/1931 | LIN | Lincoln | ||||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 1067 | on | 19/05/1922 | MEX | on | 02/06/1924 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 1072 | on | 19/05/1922 | MEX | on | 19/05/1924 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 1071 | on | 28/07/1922 | MEX | on | 26/02/1924 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 1069 | on | 01/09/1922 | MEX | on | 22/03/1924 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 186 | on | 15/12/1922 | MEX | on | 05/01/1924 | ARD | Ardsley | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 332 | m/e | 1923 | MEX | on | 18/08/1946 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | J13 | 0-6-0 | 568 | on | 01/01/1923 | MEX | m/e | 09/1932 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | J13 | 0-6-0 | 569 | on | 01/01/1923 | MEX | m/e | 08/1931 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J13 | 0-6-0 | 570 | on | 01/01/1923 | MEX | m/e | 10/1930 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | J13 | 0-6-0 | 571 | on | 01/01/1923 | MEX | m/e | 11/1935 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J13 | 0-6-0 | 572 | on | 01/01/1923 | MEX | m/e | 11/1935 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J13 | 0-6-0 | 573 | on | 01/01/1923 | MEX | m/e | 10/1931 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1252 | on | 17/11/1922 | IMM | Immingham | on | 02/02/1923 | MEX | on | 18/09/1944 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | 1100 | on | 04/06/1923 | MAR | March | m/e | 10/1923 | MEX | on | 02/06/1924 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | 1101 | m/e | 06/1923 | MAR | March | m/e | 10/1923 | MEX | on | 22/03/1924 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | 1104 | m/e | 06/1923 | MAR | March | m/e | 10/1923 | MEX | on | 12/08/1924 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend |
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | 1169 | m/e | 08/1923 | KX | Kings Cross | m/e | 11/1923 | MEX | on | 15/05/1924 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1185 | on | 06/06/1923 | THJ | Thornton Junction | on | 02/11/1923 | MEX | on | 14/09/1941 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | 1095 | on | 08/12/1922 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | m/e | 01/1924 | MEX | on | 02/06/1924 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | 1097 | on | 27/10/1922 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | m/e | 01/1924 | MEX | on | 28/03/1924 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | 1098 | on | 06/10/1922 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | m/e | 01/1924 | MEX | on | 02/06/1924 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 93 | on | 15/12/1921 | GOR | Gorton | on | 29/01/1924 | MEX | on | 19/09/1944 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 26 | on | 16/06/1922 | GOR | Gorton | on | 30/01/1924 | MEX | on | 20/10/1926 | IMM | Immingham |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 102 | on | 29/09/1921 | GOR | Gorton | on | 30/01/1924 | MEX | on | 08/12/1939 | BRN | Barnsley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 155 | on | 29/09/1922 | GOR | Gorton | on | 30/01/1924 | MEX | on | 07/09/1944 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 354 | on | 23/10/1912 | GOR | Gorton | on | 30/01/1924 | MEX | on | 09/01/1931 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1 | on | 05/08/1921 | GOR | Gorton | on | 31/01/1924 | MEX | m/e | 1930 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 8 | on | 16/06/1922 | GOR | Gorton | on | 01/02/1924 | MEX | on | 18/10/1933 | NWE | New England |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5 | on | 17/03/1922 | GOR | Gorton | on | 02/02/1924 | MEX | on | 20/10/1926 | IMM | Immingham |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 355 | on | 05/08/1921 | GOR | Gorton | on | 09/02/1924 | MEX | on | 06/01/1931 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 412 | on | 01/07/1922 | GOR | Gorton | on | 09/02/1924 | MEX | on | 27/04/1947 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 413 | on | 01/07/1922 | GOR | Gorton | on | 09/02/1924 | MEX | on | 08/11/1941 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O5 | 2-8-0 | 420 | on | 12/03/1920 | GOR | Gorton | on | 09/02/1924 | MEX | on | 28/03/1932 | MAR | March |
Steam | O5 | 2-8-0 | 422 | on | 28/06/1919 | GOR | Gorton | on | 09/02/1924 | MEX | on | 18/08/1946 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 1052 | on | 24/07/1919 | GOR | Gorton | on | 16/02/1924 | MEX | on | 01/01/1931 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O5 | 2-8-0 | 15 | on | 03/03/1924 | MEX | on | 27/04/1947 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||||
Steam | O5 | 2-8-0 | 17 | on | 04/03/1921 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 03/03/1924 | MEX | on | 18/10/1941 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O5 | 2-8-0 | 19 | on | 18/03/1921 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 03/03/1924 | MEX | on | 23/08/1939 | FRO | Frodingham |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 399 | on | 01/12/1916 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 13/03/1924 | MEX | on | 11/08/1926 | ARD | Ardsley |
Steam | O5 | 2-8-0 | 14 | on | 11/02/1921 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 22/03/1924 | MEX | on | 25/10/1941 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O5 | 2-8-0 | 22 | on | 15/04/1921 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 22/03/1924 | MEX | on | 09/06/1937 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 402 | on | 21/07/1924 | DON | Doncaster | on | 23/08/1924 | MEX | on | 26/10/1941 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 1075 | on | 15/12/1923 | DON | Doncaster | on | 26/03/1925 | MEX | on | 05/03/1929 | ARD | Ardsley |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5958 | m/e | 07/1924 | DON | Doncaster | on | 19/05/1925 | MEX | on | 07/05/1930 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | U1 | 2-8-8-2T | 2395 | on | 21/08/1925 | BRN | Barnsley | on | 17/10/1925 | MEX | on | 07/03/1949 | 21C | Bromsgrove |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6273 | on | 09/10/1924 | ARD | Ardsley | on | 09/08/1926 | MEX | on | 20/05/1929 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6349 | on | 05/02/1925 | ARD | Ardsley | on | 10/08/1926 | MEX | on | 21/02/1929 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6274 | on | 09/10/1924 | ARD | Ardsley | on | 13/08/1926 | MEX | on | 18/02/1929 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5149 | on | 15/10/1926 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 07/12/1926 | MEX | on | 05/09/1929 | BRN | Barnsley |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5159 | on | 15/10/1926 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 07/12/1926 | MEX | on | 12/06/1928 | ARD | Ardsley |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5146 | on | 15/10/1926 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 08/12/1926 | MEX | on | 21/10/1936 | ARD | Ardsley |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5049 | on | 15/10/1926 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 10/12/1926 | MEX | on | 28/04/1928 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5026 | on | 20/10/1926 | IMM | Immingham | on | 24/12/1926 | MEX | on | 02/07/1950 | 40E | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5069 | on | 20/10/1926 | IMM | Immingham | on | 24/12/1926 | MEX | on | 19/09/1944 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5133 | on | 26/10/1926 | IMM | Immingham | on | 29/12/1926 | MEX | on | 16/09/1945 | IMM | Immingham |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6620 | on | 11/11/1927 | DON | Doncaster | on | 25/11/1927 | MEX | on | 23/02/1929 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5064 | on | 15/12/1926 | DON | Doncaster | m/e | 1928 | MEX | on | 05/01/1931 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5271 | on | 12/08/1926 | ARD | Ardsley | on | 09/01/1928 | MEX | on | 05/10/1941 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6209 | on | 11/08/1926 | ARD | Ardsley | on | 18/01/1928 | MEX | on | 24/11/1940 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 3490 | on | 30/11/1923 | NWE | New England (New) | on | 07/03/1928 | MEX | on | 20/04/1928 | NWE | New England |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6560 | on | 10/04/1928 | MEX | on | 23/02/1929 | ANN | Annesley | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5398 | on | 30/06/1928 | DON | Doncaster | on | 10/07/1928 | MEX | on | 17/11/1933 | MAR | March |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6626 | on | 24/09/1928 | DON | Doncaster | on | 01/10/1928 | MEX | on | 19/11/1928 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6507 | on | 07/10/1925 | NWE | New England | on | 18/10/1928 | MEX | on | 20/08/1944 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6553 | on | 24/09/1928 | DON | Doncaster | on | 22/10/1928 | MEX | on | 16/11/1928 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2705 | on | 07/09/1928 | DON | Doncaster (New) | on | 15/12/1928 | MEX | on | 16/04/1929 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2702 | on | 27/08/1928 | DON | Doncaster (New) | on | 19/01/1929 | MEX | on | 24/01/1929 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5343 | on | 12/03/1920 | ANN | Annesley | on | 09/02/1929 | MEX | on | 04/08/1942 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5340 | on | 10/03/1923 | ANN | Annesley | on | 18/02/1929 | MEX | on | 15/08/1933 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5345 | on | 07/01/1920 | ANN | Annesley | on | 23/02/1929 | MEX | on | 12/03/1929 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5366 | on | 02/02/1923 | ANN | Annesley | on | 23/02/1929 | MEX | on | 25/08/1946 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5370 | on | 14/04/1928 | ANN | Annesley | on | 23/02/1929 | MEX | on | 11/11/1937 | IMM | Immingham |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5345 | on | 23/02/1929 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 12/03/1929 | MEX | on | 21/11/1942 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6559 | on | 18/04/1929 | DON | Doncaster | on | 01/05/1929 | MEX | on | 28/01/1945 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 4634 | on | 10/05/1929 | DON | Doncaster | on | 16/05/1929 | MEX | m/e | 11/1935 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 4637 | on | 11/05/1929 | DON | Doncaster | on | 16/05/1929 | MEX | on | 27/05/1936 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5274 | on | 28/03/1929 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 29/06/1929 | MEX | on | 06/08/1942 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5338 | on | 09/08/1925 | NEA | Neasden | on | 01/07/1929 | MEX | on | 21/11/1942 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 6054 | on | 30/01/1930 | DON | Doncaster | on | 08/02/1930 | MEX | on | 06/01/1931 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6526 | on | 16/01/1926 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 07/05/1930 | MEX | on | 18/09/1944 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 4636 | on | 07/08/1925 | CLK | Colwick | on | 29/07/1930 | MEX | on | 27/02/1940 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 4632 | on | 13/08/1930 | DON | Doncaster | on | 09/10/1930 | MEX | on | 28/02/1940 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2500 | on | 23/10/1929 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 01/01/1931 | MEX | on | 27/04/1931 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2501 | on | 06/07/1929 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 01/01/1931 | MEX | on | 06/08/1931 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2505 | on | 18/11/1929 | SEL | Selby | on | 01/01/1931 | MEX | on | 30/07/1931 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2506 | on | 18/11/1929 | SEL | Selby | on | 01/01/1931 | MEX | on | 06/08/1931 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2499 | on | 18/11/1929 | SEL | Selby | on | 02/01/1931 | MEX | on | 31/07/1931 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2502 | on | 22/10/1928 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 02/01/1931 | MEX | on | 15/07/1931 | MAR | March |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2508 | on | 18/11/1929 | SEL | Selby | on | 02/01/1931 | MEX | on | 14/09/1931 | MAR | March |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2510 | on | 23/10/1929 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 02/01/1931 | MEX | on | 30/07/1931 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2504 | on | 01/01/1931 | DON | Doncaster | on | 06/01/1931 | MEX | on | 15/07/1931 | MAR | March |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2507 | on | 01/01/1931 | DON | Doncaster | on | 06/01/1931 | MEX | on | 10/08/1931 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 4633 | on | 01/07/1925 | CLK | Colwick | on | 14/01/1931 | MEX | on | 18/01/1933 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6267 | on | 06/10/1931 | MAR | March | on | 31/03/1932 | MEX | on | 02/07/1950 | 40E | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6227 | on | 09/03/1929 | MAR | March | on | 01/04/1932 | MEX | on | 19/09/1944 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6304 | m/e | 1928 | LIN | Lincoln | on | 18/06/1932 | MEX | on | 16/09/1945 | IMM | Immingham |
Steam | J13 | 0-6-0 | 5568 | m/e | 09/1932 | DON | Doncaster | m/e | 10/1932 | MEX | m/e | 11/1933 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | 6097 | on | 23/09/1932 | DON | Doncaster | on | 25/01/1933 | MEX | on | 08/03/1933 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | 6103 | on | 21/09/1932 | DON | Doncaster | on | 30/01/1933 | MEX | on | 16/03/1933 | IMM | Immingham |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4633 | on | 18/01/1933 | DON | Doncaster | on | 06/03/1933 | MEX | m/e | 11/1935 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5272 | on | 06/10/1929 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | on | 09/03/1933 | MEX | on | 21/11/1942 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5341 | on | 19/02/1931 | NEA | Neasden | on | 07/09/1933 | MEX | on | 18/11/1939 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 430 | on | 06/05/1931 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 12/12/1933 | MEX | on | 20/02/1934 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 2122 | m/e | 11/1901 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) (New) | on | 15/12/1933 | MEX | on | 19/02/1934 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 773 | m/e | 09/1911 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates (New) | on | 15/12/1933 | MEX | on | 19/02/1934 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2249 | m/e | 06/1919 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates (New) | on | 15/12/1933 | MEX | m/e | 1934 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2223 | on | 21/02/1927 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 18/12/1933 | MEX | on | 06/05/1937 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5344 | on | 18/10/1932 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | on | 27/12/1933 | MEX | on | 10/02/1934 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5368 | on | 18/10/1932 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | on | 27/12/1933 | MEX | on | 27/01/1934 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5960 | m/e | 07/1924 | DON | Doncaster | on | 17/02/1934 | MEX | on | 02/05/1936 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 6181 | on | 06/04/1927 | DON | Doncaster | on | 17/02/1934 | MEX | on | 04/12/1936 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5049 | on | 28/04/1928 | DON | Doncaster | on | 23/02/1934 | MEX | on | 16/11/1936 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5368 | on | 27/01/1934 | DON | Doncaster | on | 30/05/1934 | MEX | m/e | 12/1935 | IMM | Immingham |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 4638 | on | 01/11/1933 | DON | Doncaster | on | 27/04/1935 | MEX | on | 28/02/1940 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6542 | on | 18/12/1928 | NEA | Neasden | m/e | 12/1935 | MEX | on | 13/01/1936 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2982 | on | 30/08/1935 | DON | Doncaster (New) | on | 07/12/1935 | MEX | on | 30/01/1937 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2983 | on | 04/09/1935 | DON | Doncaster (New) | on | 07/12/1935 | MEX | on | 21/07/1936 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2249 | on | 02/10/1935 | SEL | Selby | on | 07/12/1935 | MEX | on | 28/06/1936 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6542 | m/e | 12/1935 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 13/01/1936 | MEX | on | 02/07/1950 | 40E | Langwith Junction |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4637 | on | 27/05/1936 | DON | Doncaster | on | 21/07/1936 | MEX | on | 27/02/1940 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6277 | on | 29/11/1924 | DON | Doncaster | on | 28/10/1936 | MEX | on | 06/05/1937 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 773 | on | 19/02/1934 | DON | Doncaster | on | 22/11/1936 | MEX | on | 01/04/1937 | FER | Ferryhill (Co. Durham) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6636 | on | 02/08/1927 | DON | Doncaster | on | 23/11/1936 | MEX | on | 11/05/1937 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 430 | on | 20/02/1934 | DON | Doncaster | on | 23/11/1936 | MEX | on | 13/03/1937 | FER | Ferryhill (Co. Durham) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6271 | on | 25/03/1924 | DON | Doncaster | on | 01/12/1936 | MEX | on | 04/06/1937 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 2122 | on | 19/02/1934 | DON | Doncaster | on | 05/12/1936 | MEX | on | 08/05/1937 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5049 | on | 16/11/1936 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 06/05/1937 | MEX | on | 17/11/1939 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 6180 | on | 02/03/1929 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 07/05/1937 | MEX | on | 23/02/1947 | GRA | Grantham |
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | 3456 | on | 26/02/1931 | NWE | New England | on | 31/05/1937 | MEX | on | 04/01/1938 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | 3457 | m/e | 12/1913 | NWE | New England (New) | on | 31/05/1937 | MEX | on | 18/01/1938 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 6077 | on | 20/06/1914 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 05/06/1937 | MEX | on | 13/02/1944 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5367 | on | 21/11/1929 | IMM | Immingham | on | 29/10/1937 | MEX | on | 07/08/1942 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5162 | on | 12/10/1930 | IMM | Immingham | on | 08/01/1938 | MEX | on | 23/02/1947 | GRA | Grantham |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5961 | on | 31/01/1936 | FRO | Frodingham | on | 22/08/1939 | MEX | on | 01/10/1945 | CAM | Cambridge |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5039 | on | 07/01/1939 | BRN | Barnsley | on | 07/12/1939 | MEX | on | 23/02/1947 | GRA | Grantham |
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 6072 | on | 15/03/1940 | DON | Doncaster | on | 18/03/1940 | MEX | on | 14/08/1947 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 5181 | on | 03/02/1937 | IMM | Immingham | on | 18/03/1940 | MEX | on | 22/12/1946 | LIN | Lincoln |
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 5184 | on | 15/03/1940 | DON | Doncaster | on | 18/03/1940 | MEX | on | 04/07/1947 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 5185 | on | 22/08/1930 | LIN | Lincoln | on | 18/03/1940 | MEX | on | 17/06/1947 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street |
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 5187 | on | 30/06/1936 | IMM | Immingham | on | 18/03/1940 | MEX | on | 20/04/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5275 | m/e | 03/1915 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 27/04/1940 | MEX | on | 05/08/1942 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5397 | on | 08/11/1934 | DON | Doncaster | on | 04/08/1940 | MEX | on | 27/04/1947 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4812 | on | 18/11/1938 | DON | Doncaster (New) | on | 03/11/1940 | MEX | on | 19/08/1945 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4877 | on | 17/04/1940 | DON | Doncaster (New) | on | 03/11/1940 | MEX | on | 19/08/1945 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6209 | on | 18/01/1928 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 24/11/1940 | MEX | on | 06/08/1942 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5391 | m/e | 03/1914 | MEX | Mexborough (New) | on | 24/11/1940 | MEX | on | 18/07/1942 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5102 | on | 08/12/1939 | BRN | Barnsley | on | 13/12/1940 | MEX | on | 16/09/1945 | IMM | Immingham |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5483 | on | 08/05/1929 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 11/02/1941 | MEX | on | 03/05/1943 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5001 | on | 07/05/1941 | GRA | Grantham | on | 21/11/1942 | MEX | on | 16/09/1945 | IMM | Immingham |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6627 | on | 02/05/1937 | GRA | Grantham | on | 21/11/1942 | MEX | on | 27/08/1944 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6635 | on | 28/12/1935 | GRA | Grantham | on | 21/11/1942 | MEX | on | 07/09/1944 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 6071 | on | 24/07/1939 | GOR | Gorton | on | 16/04/1943 | MEX | on | 22/12/1946 | LIN | Lincoln |
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 5180 | on | 21/08/1930 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 19/04/1943 | MEX | on | 29/12/1946 | LIN | Lincoln |
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 6067 | on | 11/04/1943 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | on | 31/05/1943 | MEX | on | 20/11/1947 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 5182 | on | 11/04/1943 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | on | 31/05/1943 | MEX | on | 22/12/1946 | LIN | Lincoln |
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 5186 | on | 11/04/1943 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | on | 31/05/1943 | MEX | on | 22/12/1946 | LIN | Lincoln |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6285 | on | 24/03/1924 | DON | Doncaster | on | 20/06/1943 | MEX | on | 28/01/1945 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6555 | on | 10/05/1927 | DON | Doncaster | on | 20/06/1943 | MEX | on | 08/07/1945 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5337 | on | 18/02/1943 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 21/06/1943 | MEX | on | 25/08/1946 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5344 | on | 15/02/1943 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 21/06/1943 | MEX | on | 10/09/1946 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5367 | on | 07/08/1942 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 21/06/1943 | MEX | on | 25/08/1946 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5396 | on | 12/03/1927 | DON | Doncaster | on | 25/07/1943 | MEX | on | 18/08/1946 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6564 | on | 02/09/1927 | DON | Doncaster | on | 25/07/1943 | MEX | on | 27/04/1947 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6554 | on | 23/06/1927 | DON | Doncaster | on | 25/07/1943 | MEX | on | 01/07/1945 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6552 | on | 12/08/1927 | DON | Doncaster | on | 25/07/1943 | MEX | on | 02/07/1950 | 40E | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6333 | on | 28/09/1928 | DON | Doncaster | on | 25/07/1943 | MEX | on | 02/07/1950 | 40E | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6314 | on | 08/11/1934 | DON | Doncaster | on | 25/07/1943 | MEX | on | 02/07/1950 | 40E | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6372 | on | 15/07/1943 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | on | 30/09/1943 | MEX | on | 02/07/1950 | 40E | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6524 | on | 25/01/1943 | THJ | Thornton Junction | on | 01/10/1943 | MEX | on | 02/07/1950 | 40E | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6543 | on | 23/03/1929 | THJ | Thornton Junction | on | 03/10/1943 | MEX | on | 16/09/1945 | FRO | Frodingham |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6548 | on | 03/11/1928 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | on | 06/10/1943 | MEX | on | 16/09/1945 | FRO | Frodingham |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5272 | on | 21/11/1942 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 20/02/1944 | MEX | on | 21/07/1946 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5338 | on | 21/11/1942 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 20/02/1944 | MEX | on | 28/08/1946 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5345 | on | 21/11/1942 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 20/02/1944 | MEX | on | 12/10/1946 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5387 | on | 23/01/1944 | DON | Doncaster | on | 12/03/1944 | MEX | on | 25/11/1956 | 36D | Barnsley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6535 | on | 23/01/1944 | DON | Doncaster | on | 12/03/1944 | MEX | on | 27/08/1944 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5368 | on | 13/03/1943 | GOR | Gorton | on | 11/04/1944 | MEX | on | 21/07/1946 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | 5959 | on | 18/05/1931 | ARD | Ardsley | on | 14/04/1944 | MEX | on | 02/07/1944 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | 5044 | on | 13/02/1944 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 06/05/1944 | MEX | on | 17/09/1944 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | 5087 | on | 26/06/1944 | ARD | Ardsley | on | 19/07/1944 | MEX | on | 17/09/1944 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | 5959 | on | 02/07/1944 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | on | 17/08/1944 | MEX | on | 25/08/1946 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6500 | on | 04/02/1943 | GOR | Gorton | on | 20/08/1944 | MEX | on | 16/09/1945 | IMM | Immingham |
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | 6077 | on | 09/05/1944 | IMM | Immingham | on | 13/09/1944 | MEX | on | 25/08/1946 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | 5068 | m/e | 11/1903 | BRN | Barnsley (New) | on | 06/10/1944 | MEX | on | 25/08/1946 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6319 | on | 13/02/1924 | GOR | Gorton | on | 24/10/1944 | MEX | on | 16/09/1945 | IMM | Immingham |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5273 | on | 15/09/1932 | FRO | Frodingham | on | 16/11/1944 | MEX | on | 08/09/1946 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6586 | on | 25/06/1945 | GOR | Gorton | on | 08/07/1945 | MEX | on | 16/12/1945 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | 5138 | on | 10/10/1929 | ARD | Ardsley | on | 19/09/1945 | MEX | on | 25/08/1946 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6567 | on | 25/10/1928 | GOR | Gorton | on | 27/01/1946 | MEX | on | 18/08/1946 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3509 | on | 16/09/1945 | IMM | Immingham | on | 07/07/1946 | MEX | on | 29/12/1946 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3510 | on | 16/09/1945 | IMM | Immingham | on | 07/07/1946 | MEX | on | 18/08/1946 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5349 | on | 23/09/1945 | ARD | Ardsley | on | 18/08/1946 | MEX | on | 02/07/1950 | 40E | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6229 | on | 11/06/1944 | ARD | Ardsley | on | 18/08/1946 | MEX | on | 07/08/1949 | FRO | Frodingham |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5399 | on | 07/04/1946 | DON | Doncaster | on | 18/08/1946 | MEX | on | 20/10/1947 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6363 | on | 17/02/1946 | DON | Doncaster | on | 18/08/1946 | MEX | on | 02/07/1950 | 40E | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6546 | on | 23/01/1944 | DON | Doncaster | on | 18/08/1946 | MEX | on | 20/10/1947 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6360 | on | 29/08/1932 | DON | Doncaster | on | 18/08/1946 | MEX | on | 20/10/1947 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6336 | on | 11/06/1944 | ARD | Ardsley | on | 18/08/1946 | MEX | on | 02/07/1950 | 40E | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3791 | on | 23/01/1944 | DON | Doncaster | on | 18/08/1946 | MEX | on | 10/12/1961 | 36C | Frodingham |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3807 | on | 07/04/1946 | DON | Doncaster | on | 18/08/1946 | MEX | on | 02/07/1950 | 40E | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6531 | on | 23/01/1944 | DON | Doncaster | on | 18/08/1946 | MEX | on | 02/07/1950 | 40E | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6257 | on | 23/01/1944 | DON | Doncaster | on | 18/08/1946 | MEX | on | 02/07/1950 | 40E | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6633 | on | 11/06/1944 | ARD | Ardsley | on | 18/08/1946 | MEX | on | 20/10/1947 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6637 | on | 25/11/1945 | ARD | Ardsley | on | 18/08/1946 | MEX | on | 27/04/1947 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6354 | on | 07/04/1946 | DON | Doncaster | on | 25/08/1946 | MEX | on | 10/12/1961 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6604 | on | 07/04/1946 | DON | Doncaster | on | 25/08/1946 | MEX | on | 22/09/1963 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3870 | on | 27/08/1944 | DON | Doncaster | on | 25/08/1946 | MEX | on | 02/07/1950 | 40E | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3747 | on | 07/04/1946 | DON | Doncaster | on | 08/09/1946 | MEX | on | 25/12/1949 | FRO | Frodingham |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6543 | on | 07/04/1946 | DON | Doncaster | on | 08/09/1946 | MEX | on | 05/09/1947 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6250 | on | 07/04/1946 | DON | Doncaster | on | 17/09/1946 | MEX | on | 05/09/1947 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3837 | on | 07/04/1946 | DON | Doncaster | on | 29/12/1946 | MEX | on | 05/10/1947 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 9065 | on | 25/08/1946 | NEA | Neasden | on | 22/04/1947 | MEX | on | 11/04/1948 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 9050 | on | 21/07/1946 | NEA | Neasden | on | 30/04/1947 | MEX | on | 17/08/1947 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 9051 | on | 02/04/1947 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | on | 07/05/1947 | MEX | on | 22/02/1948 | FRO | Frodingham |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1165 | on | 28/05/1947 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 14/06/1947 | MEX | on | 11/03/1962 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1166 | on | 30/05/1947 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 16/06/1947 | MEX | on | 10/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1167 | on | 30/05/1947 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 16/06/1947 | MEX | on | 21/06/1953 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1168 | on | 04/06/1947 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 16/06/1947 | MEX | on | 21/06/1953 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 1681 | on | 22/12/1946 | LIN | Lincoln | on | 14/07/1947 | MEX | on | 23/06/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 1683 | on | 29/12/1946 | LIN | Lincoln | on | 14/07/1947 | MEX | on | 23/12/1947 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 1685 | on | 22/12/1946 | LIN | Lincoln | on | 14/07/1947 | MEX | on | 06/03/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 1689 | on | 22/12/1946 | LIN | Lincoln | on | 14/07/1947 | MEX | on | 19/10/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 9066 | on | 25/08/1946 | NEA | Neasden | on | 11/08/1947 | MEX | on | 22/02/1948 | FRO | Frodingham |
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 1679 | on | 06/10/1946 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | on | 24/08/1947 | MEX | on | 23/12/1947 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 1680 | on | 08/01/1947 | 19D | Heaton Mersey | on | 24/08/1947 | MEX | on | 13/11/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 1686 | on | 06/10/1946 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | on | 24/08/1947 | MEX | on | 12/06/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 1688 | on | 17/06/1947 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | on | 07/09/1947 | MEX | on | 31/10/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 9059 | on | 27/09/1941 | NEA | Neasden | on | 28/10/1947 | MEX | on | 11/04/1948 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1174 | on | 20/07/1947 | DON | Doncaster | on | 05/11/1947 | MEX | on | 24/02/1952 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9264 | m/e | 01/1936 | ARD | Ardsley | on | 01/01/1948 | MEX | w/e | 14/02/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9282 | on | 01/01/1948 | MEX | w/e | 06/11/1948 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9297 | on | 01/01/1948 | MEX | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 40B | Immingham | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9314 | on | 01/01/1948 | MEX | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9316 | on | 01/01/1948 | MEX | 6w/e | 25/12/1954 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||||
Steam | S1 | 0-8-4T | 9900 | on | 01/01/1948 | MEX | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 36A | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | S1 | 0-8-4T | 9901 | on | 01/01/1948 | MEX | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 36A | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | S1 | 0-8-4T | 9904 | on | 01/01/1948 | MEX | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 40B | Immingham | ||||
Steam | S1 | 0-8-4T | 9905 | on | 01/01/1948 | MEX | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 36A | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3668 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | FRO | Frodingham | on | 02/02/1948 | MEX | w/e | 28/02/1948 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 3594 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | FRO | Frodingham | on | 22/02/1948 | MEX | w/e | 28/02/1948 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3683 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | ARD | Ardsley | on | 22/02/1948 | MEX | w/e | 28/02/1948 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 3594 | on | 22/02/1948 | MEX | Mexborough | w/e | 28/02/1948 | MEX | on | 16/01/1949 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3683 | on | 22/02/1948 | MEX | Mexborough | w/e | 28/02/1948 | MEX | on | 02/07/1950 | 40E | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3668 | on | 02/02/1948 | MEX | Mexborough | w/e | 28/02/1948 | MEX | on | 02/12/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9273 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEA | Neasden | w/e | 17/04/1948 | MEX | w/e | 01/05/1948 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9313 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEA | Neasden | w/e | 17/04/1948 | MEX | w/e | 01/05/1948 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77004 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | MEX | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 31B | March | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77067 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | MEX | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 36A | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77128 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | MEX | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 40B | Immingham | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77138 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | MEX | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41D | Canklow | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77149 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | MEX | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 40B | Immingham | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77167 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | MEX | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 38A | Colwick | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77218 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | MEX | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 41F | Mexborough | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77307 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | MEX | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 40A | Lincoln | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77353 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | MEX | on | 18/06/1950 | 31B | March | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77468 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | HLS | Hull Springhead | w/e | 04/09/1948 | MEX | on | 01/03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J3 | 0-6-0 | 4150 | m/e | 03/1933 | Withdrawn | w/e | 06/11/1948 (R) | MEX | w/e | 04/12/1948 | DON | Doncaster | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3750 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | ANN | Annesley | on | 16/01/1949 | MEX | w/e | 22/01/1949 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3750 | on | 16/01/1949 | MEX | Mexborough | w/e | 22/01/1949 | MEX | on | 07/08/1949 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61194 | on | 21/05/1947 | DON | Doncaster (New) | on | 06/03/1949 | MEX | w/e | 12/03/1949 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61194 | on | 06/03/1949 | MEX | Mexborough | w/e | 12/03/1949 | MEX | on | 11/09/1949 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3904 | on | 22/12/1947 | CAM | Cambridge | on | 22/05/1949 | MEX | w/e | 28/05/1949 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3913 | on | 22/12/1947 | CAM | Cambridge | on | 22/05/1949 | MEX | w/e | 28/05/1949 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3904 | on | 22/05/1949 | MEX | Mexborough | w/e | 28/05/1949 | MEX | on | 21/08/1949 | BRN | Barnsley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3913 | on | 22/05/1949 | MEX | Mexborough | w/e | 28/05/1949 | MEX | on | 21/08/1949 | BRN | Barnsley |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77050 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | MEX | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41D | Canklow | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61194 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | DON | Doncaster | on | 20/11/1949 | MEX | w/e | 26/11/1949 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61194 | on | 20/11/1949 | MEX | Mexborough | w/e | 26/11/1949 | MEX | on | 09/12/1962 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77338 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 24/12/1949 | MEX | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 35A | New England |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77480 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 24/12/1949 | MEX | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68890 | on | 01/01/1948 | DON | Doncaster | w/e | 24/12/1949 | MEX | w/e | 16/10/1950 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68946 | w/e | 16/04/1949 | DON | Doncaster | w/e | 24/12/1949 | MEX | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68960 | w/e | 04/12/1948 | DON | Doncaster | w/e | 24/12/1949 | MEX | w/e | 16/10/1950 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 8974 | on | 01/01/1948 | DON | Doncaster | w/e | 24/12/1949 | MEX | w/e | 16/10/1950 | 36C | Frodingham |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63779 | on | 22/12/1947 | CAM | Cambridge | on | 11/01/1950 | MEX | w/e | 14/01/1950 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63898 | on | 22/12/1947 | CAM | Cambridge | on | 13/01/1950 | MEX | w/e | 14/01/1950 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63779 | on | 11/01/1950 | MEX | Mexborough | w/e | 14/01/1950 | MEX | on | 16/07/1961 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63898 | on | 13/01/1950 | MEX | Mexborough | w/e | 14/01/1950 | MEX | on | 10/12/1961 | 36C | Frodingham |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 63987 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 07/02/1950 | 36B | w/e | 02/07/1950 | 36B | Mexborough |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90340 | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 36B | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 31B | March | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90383 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NWE | New England | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 36B | on | 27/09/1950 | 31B | March |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 63924 | on | 27/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 18/06/1950 | 36B | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 36B | Mexborough |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 63974 | on | 20/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 18/06/1950 | 36B | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 36B | Mexborough |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 63924 | on | 18/06/1950 | 36B | Mexborough | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 36B | on | 14/09/1952 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 63974 | on | 18/06/1950 | 36B | Mexborough | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 36B | on | 27/08/1950 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 63927 | on | 27/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 02/07/1950 | 36B | on | 25/02/1951 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 63969 | on | 20/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 02/07/1950 | 36B | on | 18/03/1951 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 63970 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 02/07/1950 | 36B | on | 05/08/1951 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 63971 | on | 20/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 02/07/1950 | 36B | on | 18/03/1951 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 63972 | on | 20/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 02/07/1950 | 36B | on | 05/08/1951 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 63973 | on | 20/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 02/07/1950 | 36B | on | 27/08/1950 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 63975 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 40E | Langwith Junction | on | 02/07/1950 | 36B | on | 18/03/1951 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 63977 | on | 21/11/1942 | DON | Doncaster (New) | w/e | 02/07/1950 | 36B | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 63978 | on | 20/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 02/07/1950 | 36B | on | 18/03/1951 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 63979 | on | 05/10/1947 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 02/07/1950 | 36B | on | 18/03/1951 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 63980 | on | 20/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 02/07/1950 | 36B | on | 25/02/1951 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 63981 | on | 20/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 02/07/1950 | 36B | on | 14/09/1952 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 63982 | on | 05/10/1947 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 02/07/1950 | 36B | on | 05/08/1951 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 63983 | on | 20/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 02/07/1950 | 36B | on | 17/08/1952 | 36C | Frodingham |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 63984 | on | 27/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 02/07/1950 | 36B | on | 17/08/1952 | 36C | Frodingham |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 63985 | on | 27/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 02/07/1950 | 36B | on | 17/08/1952 | 36C | Frodingham |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 63986 | on | 27/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 02/07/1950 | 36B | on | 27/08/1950 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 63987 | on | 07/02/1950 | 36B | Mexborough | w/e | 02/07/1950 | 36B | on | 27/08/1950 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 63976 | on | 27/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 16/07/1950 | 36B | w/e | 11/08/1951 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63682 | on | 07/04/1946 | DON | Doncaster | on | 27/08/1950 | 36B | on | 10/09/1950 | 40E | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63774 | on | 08/07/1945 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | on | 27/08/1950 | 36B | on | 03/09/1961 | 41J | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63775 | on | 16/12/1945 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | on | 27/08/1950 | 36B | on | 20/01/1957 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63627 | on | 07/04/1946 | DON | Doncaster | on | 27/08/1950 | 36B | on | 10/09/1950 | 40E | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63757 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 40E | Langwith Junction | on | 10/09/1950 | 36B | on | 24/11/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63666 | on | 02/07/1950 | 40E | Langwith Junction | on | 10/09/1950 | 36B | on | 22/09/1952 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 8979 | w/e | 05/03/1949 | FRO | Frodingham | w/e | 16/10/1950 | 36B | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 36B | Mexborough |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 8979 | w/e | 16/10/1950 | 36B | Mexborough | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 36B | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | U1 | 2-8-8-2T | 69999 | on | 07/03/1949 | 21C | Bromsgrove | on | 11/11/1950 | 36B | on | 03/07/1955 | 21C | Bromsgrove |
Steam | S1 | 0-8-4T | 9903 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | FRO | Frodingham | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 36B | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 36B | Mexborough |
Steam | S1 | 0-8-4T | 9903 | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 36B | Mexborough | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 36B | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | S1 | 0-8-4T | 69902 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | FRO | Frodingham | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 36B | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | C11 | 4-4-2 | 9902 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 36B | ||||||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90383 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 31B | March | w/e | 11/02/1951 | 36B | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 36B | Mexborough |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90653 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 31B | March | w/e | 11/02/1951 | 36B | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 36B | Mexborough |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90709 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 31B | March | w/e | 11/02/1951 | 36B | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 36B | Mexborough |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90383 | w/e | 11/02/1951 | 36B | Mexborough | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 36B | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90653 | w/e | 11/02/1951 | 36B | Mexborough | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 36B | 3w/e | 14/05/1955 | 33A | Plaistow |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90709 | w/e | 11/02/1951 | 36B | Mexborough | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 36B | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 35A | New England |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90118 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 31B | March | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 36B | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 36B | Mexborough |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90119 | on | 18/06/1950 | 31B | March | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 36B | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 36B | Mexborough |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90582 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 36B | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 36A | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90502 | w/e | 18/09/1948 | MAR | March | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 36B | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 36B | Mexborough |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90118 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 36B | Mexborough | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 36B | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90119 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 36B | Mexborough | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 36B | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90581 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 36B | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90502 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 36B | Mexborough | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 36B | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 35A | New England |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64348 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 36B | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 36A | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62039 | on | 01/04/1951 | 31B | March | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 36B | on | 29/04/1962 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12091 | on | 17/07/1951 | 3A | Bescot (New) | 4w/e | 18/08/1951 | 36B | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 2C | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 63935 | on | 29/10/1950 | 35B | Grantham | on | 28/10/1951 | 36B | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 36B | Mexborough |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 63949 | w/e | 22/09/1951 | 35A | New England | on | 28/10/1951 | 36B | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 36B | Mexborough |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 63965 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 35B | Grantham | on | 28/10/1951 | 36B | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 36B | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63753 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 36A | Doncaster | on | 28/10/1951 | 36B | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 36B | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63701 | on | 16/03/1942 | MAR | March | on | 28/10/1951 | 36B | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 36B | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63704 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | MAR | March | on | 28/10/1951 | 36B | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 36B | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63828 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 36A | Doncaster | on | 28/10/1951 | 36B | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 36B | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63843 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 36A | Doncaster | on | 28/10/1951 | 36B | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 36B | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63897 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | MAR | March | on | 28/10/1951 | 36B | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 36B | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63730 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | MAR | March | on | 28/10/1951 | 36B | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 36B | Mexborough |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 63935 | on | 28/10/1951 | 36B | Mexborough | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 36B | on | 16/11/1952 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 63949 | on | 28/10/1951 | 36B | Mexborough | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 36B | on | 17/08/1952 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 63965 | on | 28/10/1951 | 36B | Mexborough | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 36B | on | 17/02/1952 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63753 | on | 28/10/1951 | 36B | Mexborough | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 36B | on | 21/11/1954 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63701 | on | 28/10/1951 | 36B | Mexborough | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 36B | on | 11/02/1962 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63704 | on | 28/10/1951 | 36B | Mexborough | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 36B | on | 13/02/1955 | 36D | Barnsley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63828 | on | 28/10/1951 | 36B | Mexborough | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 36B | on | 22/09/1952 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63843 | on | 28/10/1951 | 36B | Mexborough | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 36B | on | 01/03/1964 | 41J | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63897 | on | 28/10/1951 | 36B | Mexborough | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 36B | on | 03/12/1961 | 36C | Frodingham |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63730 | on | 28/10/1951 | 36B | Mexborough | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 36B | on | 27/12/1959 | 36C | Frodingham |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90130 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 36B | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 38A | Colwick | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90495 | w/e | 04/12/1948 | NWE | New England | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 36B | on | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68980 | on | 01/01/1948 | DON | Doncaster | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 36B | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 36C | Frodingham |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63586 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 40B | Immingham | on | 09/12/1951 | 36B | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 36B | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63693 | on | 25/06/1950 | 40B | Immingham | on | 09/12/1951 | 36B | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 36B | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63698 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 40B | Immingham | on | 09/12/1951 | 36B | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 36B | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63593 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 40B | Immingham | on | 09/12/1951 | 36B | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 36B | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63586 | on | 09/12/1951 | 36B | Mexborough | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 36B | on | 30/07/1961 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63693 | on | 09/12/1951 | 36B | Mexborough | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 36B | on | 22/03/1959 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63698 | on | 09/12/1951 | 36B | Mexborough | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 36B | on | 05/04/1959 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63593 | on | 09/12/1951 | 36B | Mexborough | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 36B | on | 05/11/1961 | 36C | Frodingham |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90582 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 36A | Doncaster | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 36B | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 36B | Mexborough |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90582 | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 36B | Mexborough | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 36B | on | 01/03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63666 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 40B | Immingham | on | 05/10/1952 | 36B | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 36B | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63828 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 40B | Immingham | on | 05/10/1952 | 36B | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 36B | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63666 | on | 05/10/1952 | 36B | Mexborough | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 36B | on | 27/12/1959 | 36C | Frodingham |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63828 | on | 05/10/1952 | 36B | Mexborough | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 36B | on | 03/09/1961 | 41J | Langwith Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90330 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 36B | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90104 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 31B | March | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 36B | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90580 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 36B | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41D | Canklow | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90358 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 36B | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90015 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 36B | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 38A | Colwick | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90304 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 31B | March | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 36B | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 34E | New England |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90085 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 31B | March | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 36B | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69337 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 37C | Bradford Hammerton Street | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 36B | 6w/e | 25/12/1954 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 62666 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 40B | Immingham | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 36B | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 40A | Lincoln |
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 62667 | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 40F | Boston | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 36B | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 40A | Lincoln |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69280 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 40C | Louth | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 36B | on | 22/11/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69306 | on | 01/01/1948 | LTH | Louth | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 36B | on | 08/11/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13060 | on | 22/08/1953 (New) | 36B | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41C | Wath | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13061 | on | 22/08/1953 (New) | 36B | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41C | Wath | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12105 | on | 19/04/1952 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 36B | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13064 | on | 09/09/1953 (New) | 36B | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41C | Wath | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13062 | on | 10/09/1953 (New) | 36B | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41C | Wath | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12103 | on | 22/03/1952 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 36B | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12104 | on | 19/04/1952 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 36B | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 30A | Stratford |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61112 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 40A | Lincoln | on | 04/10/1953 | 36B | on | 24/05/1959 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61167 | on | 21/06/1953 | 40B | Immingham | on | 04/10/1953 | 36B | on | 01/03/1964 | 41D | Canklow |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13063 | on | 24/10/1953 (New) | 36B | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41C | Wath | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69357 | on | 01/01/1948 | BRN | Barnsley | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 36B | on | 11/11/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12133 | on | 13/12/1952 | 31B | March (New) | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 36B | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 31B | March |
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 68833 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 36A | Doncaster | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 36B | on | 20/02/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 68520 | on | 01/01/1948 | STR | Stratford | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 36B | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90066 | on | 27/09/1953 | 36A | Doncaster | on | 13/06/1954 | 36B | on | 29/01/1956 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90053 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 36A | Doncaster | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 36B | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90005 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 36A | Doncaster | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 36B | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90220 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 36A | Doncaster | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 36B | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90290 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 36A | Doncaster | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 36B | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 41J | Langwith Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90498 | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 36A | Doncaster | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 36B | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 31B | March |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90506 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 36A | Doncaster | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 36B | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 36A | Doncaster |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12132 | on | 15/11/1952 | 31B | March (New) | w/e | 23/10/1954 | 36B | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 31B | March |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63753 | on | 21/11/1954 | 36A | Doncaster | on | 06/02/1955 | 36B | on | 02/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63764 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 36A | Doncaster | on | 15/05/1955 | 36B | on | 27/12/1959 | 36C | Frodingham |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90024 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 36A | Doncaster | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 36B | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90270 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 36A | Doncaster | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 36B | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 34E | New England |
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 68847 | on | 01/01/1948 | DON | Doncaster | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 36B | on | 01/08/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 68870 | on | 01/01/1948 | DON | Doncaster | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 36B | on | 22/03/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69305 | on | 01/01/1948 | IMM | Immingham | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 36B | on | 03/08/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64393 | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 36B | on | 26/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64402 | m/e | 11/1935 | ANN | Annesley | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 36B | on | 25/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69308 | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 36B | on | 17/02/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63677 | on | 27/09/1953 | 37A | Ardsley | on | 18/12/1955 | 36B | on | 22/03/1959 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63684 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 38A | Colwick | on | 29/01/1956 | 36B | on | 09/12/1962 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63723 | on | 08/10/1950 | 38A | Colwick | on | 29/01/1956 | 36B | on | 09/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63745 | on | 20/09/1953 | 38A | Colwick | on | 29/01/1956 | 36B | on | 16/04/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63751 | on | 27/12/1953 | 38A | Colwick | on | 29/01/1956 | 36B | on | 12/03/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63756 | w/e | 10/07/1948 | CLK | Colwick | on | 29/01/1956 | 36B | on | 18/06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63673 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 38A | Colwick | on | 29/01/1956 | 36B | on | 08/05/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63781 | on | 18/07/1954 | 38A | Colwick | on | 29/01/1956 | 36B | on | 21/12/1958 | 36C | Frodingham |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63798 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 38A | Colwick | on | 29/01/1956 | 36B | on | 06/08/1961 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63812 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 38A | Colwick | on | 29/01/1956 | 36B | on | 08/05/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63832 | on | 20/09/1953 | 38A | Colwick | on | 29/01/1956 | 36B | on | 03/12/1961 | 36C | Frodingham |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63835 | on | 04/07/1954 | 38A | Colwick | on | 29/01/1956 | 36B | on | 23/02/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63841 | on | 13/06/1954 | 38A | Colwick | on | 29/01/1956 | 36B | on | 11/02/1962 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63628 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 38A | Colwick | on | 29/01/1956 | 36B | on | 03/12/1961 | 36C | Frodingham |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63851 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 38A | Colwick | on | 29/01/1956 | 36B | on | 16/04/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63876 | on | 13/06/1954 | 38A | Colwick | on | 29/01/1956 | 36B | on | 10/03/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63891 | on | 13/06/1954 | 38A | Colwick | on | 29/01/1956 | 36B | on | 13/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63894 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 38A | Colwick | on | 29/01/1956 | 36B | on | 11/07/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63908 | on | 20/09/1953 | 38A | Colwick | on | 29/01/1956 | 36B | on | 26/11/1961 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61850 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 31B | March | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 36B | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61867 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 31B | March | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 36B | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61868 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 31B | March | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 36B | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64285 | w/e | 05/03/1949 | DON | Doncaster | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 36B | on | 04/08/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13328 | on | 06/12/1956 (New) | 36B | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 31B | March | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13329 | on | 14/12/1956 (New) | 36B | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41C | Wath | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13330 | on | 21/12/1956 (New) | 36B | on | 02/11/1958 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13333 | on | 16/01/1957 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 36B | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41C | Wath |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13335 | on | 30/01/1957 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 36B | on | 02/11/1958 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64406 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 38B | Annesley | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 36B | on | 23/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92189 | on | 21/03/1958 (New) | 36B | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 41B | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92190 | on | 31/03/1958 (New) | 41F | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 68497 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 41F | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 41B | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43729 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16A | Nottingham | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 41F | on | 27/04/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90119 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 36A | Doncaster | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 41F | w/e | 25/08/1962 | 36C | Frodingham |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90136 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 41F | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 41D | Canklow | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90139 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 41F | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90567 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 36A | Doncaster | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 41F | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90153 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 41F | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90203 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 36A | Doncaster | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 41F | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90301 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 36A | Doncaster | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 41F | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 41J | Langwith Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90608 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 36A | Doncaster | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 41F | on | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90384 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 41F | w/e | 22/02/1964 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90491 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 36A | Doncaster | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 41F | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90499 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 41F | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 68623 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 41F | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 41J | Langwith Junction |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61836 | on | 01/01/1948 | IMM | Immingham | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 41F | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61839 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 41F | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64403 | 4w/e | 16/08/1958 | 41G | Barnsley | w/e | 25/04/1959 | 41F | on | 11/07/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61083 | on | 14/12/1958 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | on | 24/05/1959 | 41F | on | 31/12/1961 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61090 | on | 24/10/1946 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall (New) | on | 14/06/1959 | 41F | on | 15/05/1960 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61093 | on | 04/11/1946 | DON | Doncaster (New) | on | 14/06/1959 | 41F | on | 31/12/1961 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90052 | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 41G | Barnsley | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 41F | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90064 | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 41G | Barnsley | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 41F | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90519 | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 41G | Barnsley | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 41F | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41D | Canklow |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3697 | on | 01/05/1959 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 08/08/1959 | 41F | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41C | Wath |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3714 | on | 17/09/1959 (New) | 41F | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 36A | Doncaster | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3715 | on | 17/09/1959 (New) | 41F | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 36A | Doncaster | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13127 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | w/e | 31/10/1959 | 41F | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61104 | on | 03/05/1959 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | on | 29/11/1959 | 41F | on | 10/01/1960 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64828 | on | 02/06/1957 | 36D | Barnsley | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | on | 21/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64902 | on | 25/11/1956 | 36D | Barnsley | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | on | 11/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63669 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 36D | Barnsley | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | on | 14/11/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63632 | on | 29/11/1959 | 41G | Barnsley | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | on | 26/11/1961 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63722 | on | 29/11/1959 | 41G | Barnsley | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | on | 28/02/1960 | 41J | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63727 | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 36D | Barnsley | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | on | 26/11/1961 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63622 | on | 29/11/1959 | 41G | Barnsley | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | on | 03/09/1961 | 41J | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63623 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | BRN | Barnsley | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | on | 09/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63656 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 36D | Barnsley | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | on | 02/10/1960 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63659 | on | 13/11/1955 | 36D | Barnsley | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | on | 09/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63802 | on | 02/02/1958 | 36D | Barnsley | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | on | 05/11/1961 | 36C | Frodingham |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63883 | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 36D | Barnsley | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | on | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63726 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 36D | Barnsley | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | on | 23/07/1961 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63904 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | BRN | Barnsley | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | on | 09/07/1961 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63907 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 36D | Barnsley | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | on | 01/03/1964 | 41J | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63911 | on | 13/11/1955 | 36D | Barnsley | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | on | 09/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63913 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 20F | Skipton | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | on | 11/02/1962 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64417 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 36D | Barnsley | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 41F | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64425 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | BRN | Barnsley | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 41F | on | 08/11/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64442 | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 36D | Barnsley | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 41F | on | 23/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64452 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 41F | on | 31/05/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69343 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 41G | Barnsley | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 41F | on | 11/01/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69354 | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 36D | Barnsley | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 41F | on | 12/02/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69370 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 41G | Barnsley | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 41F | on | 10/09/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63772 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 31/01/1960 | 41F | on | 09/12/1962 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63648 | on | 02/12/1957 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 31/01/1960 | 41F | on | 26/01/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63702 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 31/01/1960 | 41F | on | 26/11/1961 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63771 | on | 25/06/1945 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | on | 31/01/1960 | 41F | on | 30/07/1961 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63877 | on | 22/01/1956 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 31/01/1960 | 41F | on | 01/03/1964 | 41J | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63884 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 31/01/1960 | 41F | on | 03/12/1961 | 36C | Frodingham |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63718 | on | 29/11/1959 | 41J | Langwith Junction | on | 28/02/1960 | 41F | on | 10/12/1961 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63612 | on | 29/11/1959 | 41J | Langwith Junction | on | 01/05/1960 | 41F | on | 02/10/1960 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63704 | on | 29/11/1959 | 41J | Langwith Junction | on | 01/05/1960 | 41F | on | 09/07/1961 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90028 | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 41F | on | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90508 | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 41F | on | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61316 | on | 13/10/1948 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | on | 15/05/1960 | 41F | on | 11/03/1962 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61820 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 41F | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61822 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 41F | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61959 | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 41F | w/e | 29/07/1961 | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63661 | on | 27/03/1960 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 04/12/1960 | 41F | on | 11/02/1962 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63720 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 04/12/1960 | 41F | on | 03/09/1961 | 41J | Langwith Junction |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3726 | on | 18/12/1959 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 41F | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41C | Wath |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61908 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 41F | on | 19/01/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61981 | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 41F | w/e | 09/06/1962 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61989 | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 41F | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61958 | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 41J | Langwith Junction | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41F | on | 31/05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61004 | on | 10/01/1960 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | on | 09/09/1962 | 41F | on | 09/12/1962 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61090 | on | 15/05/1960 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | on | 09/09/1962 | 41F | on | 22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61104 | on | 10/01/1960 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | on | 09/09/1962 | 41F | on | 09/12/1962 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61138 | on | 23/04/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | on | 09/09/1962 | 41F | on | 26/01/1964 | 34E | New England |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63661 | on | 11/02/1962 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 09/09/1962 | 41F | on | 09/12/1962 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63841 | on | 11/02/1962 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 09/09/1962 | 41F | on | 09/12/1962 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63852 | on | 20/12/1953 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | on | 09/09/1962 | 41F | on | 09/12/1962 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63734 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | on | 09/09/1962 | 41F | on | 09/12/1962 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90313 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 84C | Banbury | on | 02/12/1962 | 41F | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90529 | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | on | 02/12/1962 | 41F | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90572 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81C | Southall | on | 02/12/1962 | 41F | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90579 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81C | Southall | on | 02/12/1962 | 41F | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90149 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81C | Southall | on | 02/12/1962 | 41F | w/e | 22/02/1964 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90188 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | on | 02/12/1962 | 41F | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90225 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | on | 02/12/1962 | 41F | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90485 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 84C | Banbury | on | 02/12/1962 | 41F | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61112 | on | 02/12/1962 | 41D | Canklow | on | 09/12/1962 | 41F | on | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61155 | on | 02/12/1962 | 41D | Canklow | on | 09/12/1962 | 41F | on | 01/03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61169 | on | 02/12/1962 | 41D | Canklow | on | 09/12/1962 | 41F | on | 28/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68070 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 40E | Colwick | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 41F | on | 19/03/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63684 | on | 09/12/1962 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | on | 20/01/1963 | 41F | on | 22/09/1963 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63661 | on | 09/12/1962 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | on | 20/01/1963 | 41F | on | 22/09/1963 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63734 | on | 09/12/1962 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | on | 20/01/1963 | 41F | on | 22/09/1963 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90544 | on | 02/12/1962 | 36C | Frodingham | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 41F | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90573 | on | 02/12/1962 | 36C | Frodingham | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 41F | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90165 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 36C | Frodingham | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 41F | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90190 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | MEX | Mexborough | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 41F | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61075 | on | 03/06/1962 | 34A | Kings Cross | on | 16/06/1963 | 41F | on | 22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61312 | on | 10/03/1963 | 34A | Kings Cross | on | 16/06/1963 | 41F | on | 01/03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61393 | on | 24/01/1960 | 34A | Kings Cross | on | 16/06/1963 | 41F | on | 22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61394 | on | 19/05/1957 | 34A | Kings Cross | on | 16/06/1963 | 41F | on | 01/03/1964 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63645 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | on | 16/06/1963 | 41F | on | 22/12/1963 | 41J | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63822 | on | 14/02/1924 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 16/06/1963 | 41F | on | 01/03/1964 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63846 | on | 11/04/1943 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | on | 16/06/1963 | 41F | on | 01/03/1964 | 41J | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63850 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | on | 16/06/1963 | 41F | on | 22/12/1963 | 41J | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63882 | on | 23/09/1962 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | on | 16/06/1963 | 41F | on | 01/03/1964 | 41J | Langwith Junction |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4031 | on | 06/08/1960 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 41F | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41C | Wath |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4032 | on | 15/08/1960 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 41F | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41C | Wath |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4033 | on | 09/09/1960 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 41F | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41C | Wath |