Depot: Moor Row
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Moor Row | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12176 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 12E | on | 01/01/1948 | 7B | Bangor | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12328 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 12E | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12341 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 12E | on | 01/01/1948 | 10B | Preston | ||||
Steam | 898 | 0-6-0 | 12551 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12E | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12098 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12E | w/e | 31/10/1953 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52110 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12E | m/e | 05/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12184 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | on | 01/01/1948 | 12E | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 10B | Preston |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12201 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12E | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 12D | Workington | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12285 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12E | w/e | 06/12/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12418 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26C | Bolton | on | 01/01/1948 | 12E | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 12D | Workington |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7337 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12E | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 12D | Workington | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7390 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12E | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 12D | Workington | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7525 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12E | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 12D | Workington | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12453 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 12E | w/e | 07/01/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7319 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10B | Preston | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 12E | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 12E | Moor Row |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7319 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 12E | Moor Row | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 12E | w/e | 22/01/1949 | 10B | Preston |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44461 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 12E | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 12D | Workington |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4549 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | Bletchley | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 12E | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 12D | Workington |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7604 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12D | Workington | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 12E | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 12D | Workington |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52184 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 10B | Preston | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 12E | w/e | 10/12/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D5 | 0-6-0 | 52509 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 12E | m/e | 12/1956 | Withdrawn |