Depot: Neville Hill
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Neville Hill | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 2006 | m/e | 12/1899 (New) | NEV | on | 10/06/1931 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 2008 | m/e | 05/1900 (New) | NEV | on | 31/12/1929 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | 686 | m/e | 12/1907 (New) | NEV | on | 23/06/1923 | WBY | Whitby | ||||
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 743 | m/e | 06/1908 (New) | NEV | on | 23/02/1926 | ARD | Ardsley | ||||
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 750 | m/e | 11/1908 (New) | NEV | on | 01/11/1932 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 753 | m/e | 12/1908 (New) | NEV | on | 21/10/1935 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 762 | m/e | 03/1909 (New) | NEV | on | 05/11/1928 | SBK | Starbeck | ||||
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 819 | m/e | 10/1912 (New) | NEV | on | 28/03/1943 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1257 | m/e | 03/1913 (New) | NEV | on | 08/07/1943 | DAR | Darlington | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1261 | m/e | 04/1913 (New) | NEV | on | 21/06/1943 | SKN | Stockton | ||||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | 2143 | m/e | 10/1913 (New) | NEV | on | 12/06/1933 | MID | Middlesbrough | ||||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | 2147 | m/e | 12/1913 (New) | NEV | on | 31/08/1933 | WBY | Whitby | ||||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | 1518 | m/e | 06/1920 (New) | NEV | on | 22/05/1933 | MID | Middlesbrough | ||||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | 1531 | m/e | 06/1920 (New) | NEV | on | 14/08/1926 | SBK | Starbeck | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2280 | m/e | 06/1920 (New) | NEV | on | 06/05/1931 | SBK | Starbeck | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2282 | m/e | 06/1920 (New) | NEV | on | 14/07/1943 | DAR | Darlington | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2298 | m/e | 12/1920 (New) | NEV | on | 19/06/1943 | CON | Consett | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 929 | m/e | 02/1921 (New) | NEV | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 931 | m/e | 03/1921 (New) | NEV | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | 1326 | m/e | 02/1922 (New) | NEV | on | 12/03/1935 | SCA | Scarborough | ||||
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | 688 | m/e | 12/1907 | WBY | Whitby (New) | on | 14/11/1923 | NEV | on | 13/02/1924 | WBY | Whitby |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1380 | on | 29/11/1923 (New) | NEV | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1185 | m/e | 04/1911 | SBK | Starbeck (New) | m/e | 08/1924 | NEV | on | 10/04/1939 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 1213 | y/e | 1923 | TSK | Thirsk | y/e | 1925 | NEV | on | 01/07/1939 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1180 | m/e | 12/1923 | SHI | Shildon | on | 20/01/1925 | NEV | on | 18/01/1937 | SBK | Starbeck |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1183 | m/e | 03/1911 | SHI | Shildon (New) | on | 20/01/1925 | NEV | on | 10/04/1939 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 924 | on | 08/05/1924 | YK | York (North) | on | 07/07/1925 | NEV | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 1719 | on | 03/10/1925 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 10/10/1925 | NEV | m/e | 03/1926 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 1767 | on | 11/12/1925 | YK | York (North) (New) | m/e | 02/1926 | NEV | on | 20/05/1926 | GHD | Gateshead |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 1766 | on | 14/12/1925 | YK | York (North) | on | 07/02/1926 | NEV | m/e | 03/1926 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | 1520 | m/e | 06/1920 | SBK | Starbeck (New) | on | 14/08/1926 | NEV | on | 22/05/1935 | SCA | Scarborough |
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 743 | on | 23/02/1926 | ARD | Ardsley | m/e | 09/1926 | NEV | on | 03/05/1932 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1195 | on | 22/02/1926 | YK | York (North) | m/e | 01/1927 | NEV | on | 12/09/1932 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1176 | m/e | 02/1911 | TSK | Thirsk (New) | on | 12/12/1927 | NEV | on | 25/09/1929 | SBK | Starbeck |
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | 689 | m/e | 01/1908 | WBY | Whitby (New) | on | 02/02/1928 | NEV | m/e | 06/1928 | WBY | Whitby |
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | 691 | m/e | 03/1908 | WBY | Whitby (New) | on | 05/02/1928 | NEV | on | 23/06/1928 | WBY | Whitby |
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | 4419 | on | 04/08/1928 | KX | Kings Cross | on | 29/09/1928 | NEV | on | 29/04/1929 | KX | Kings Cross |
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 762 | on | 05/11/1928 | SBK | Starbeck | on | 09/10/1929 | NEV | on | 27/05/1937 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 914 | m/e | 09/1920 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 31/10/1929 | NEV | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1383 | on | 20/12/1923 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 22/11/1929 | NEV | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 739 | on | 04/02/1927 | SKN | Stockton | on | 05/05/1930 | NEV | on | 01/07/1932 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 430 | on | 21/01/1931 | SBK | Starbeck | on | 06/05/1931 | NEV | on | 12/12/1933 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 848 | on | 23/06/1931 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 22/06/1932 | NEV | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 849 | on | 23/06/1931 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 22/06/1932 | NEV | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 824 | m/e | 12/1912 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 28/06/1932 | NEV | on | 12/08/1939 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1453 | on | 31/08/1932 (New) | NEV | on | 28/03/1943 | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1469 | on | 06/10/1932 (New) | NEV | on | 28/03/1943 | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||||
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 759 | on | 07/01/1925 | TWD | Tweedmouth | on | 27/03/1933 | NEV | on | 11/10/1933 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1136 | on | 14/06/1927 | MAL | Malton | on | 03/10/1933 | NEV | on | 16/10/1939 | SBK | Starbeck |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 2147 | on | 31/08/1933 | WBY | Whitby | on | 11/10/1933 | NEV | on | 27/06/1934 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 758 | m/e | 10/1933 | HTN | Heaton | m/e | 05/1934 | NEV | ||||
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 759 | on | 11/10/1933 | HTN | Heaton | on | 11/05/1934 | NEV | on | 05/12/1936 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | 2148 | on | 19/06/1934 | HTN | Heaton | on | 28/06/1934 | NEV | on | 13/10/1942 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1379 | on | 20/07/1931 | TWD | Tweedmouth | on | 16/10/1934 | NEV | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 1501 | on | 22/08/1934 | WBY | Whitby | on | 24/10/1934 | NEV | on | 05/09/1940 | MAL | Malton |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 1530 | m/e | 05/1922 | SBK | Starbeck (New) | on | 30/09/1935 | NEV | H | 12/1935 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1436 | on | 31/10/1935 (New) | NEV | on | 28/03/1943 | SBK | Starbeck | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1460 | on | 04/11/1935 (New) | NEV | on | 21/07/1937 | SBK | Starbeck | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1464 | on | 08/11/1935 (New) | NEV | on | 25/10/1937 | SBK | Starbeck | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 297 | H | 12/1935 | NEV | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | Gateshead | ||||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 1530 | on | 30/09/1935 | NEV | Neville Hill | H | 12/1935 | NEV | on | 19/10/1942 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 193 | H | 12/1935 | NEV | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | Selby | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1533 | on | 17/10/1936 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 12/11/1936 | NEV | on | 19/11/1936 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1544 | on | 09/11/1936 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 12/11/1936 | NEV | on | 19/11/1936 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1536 | on | 23/10/1936 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 18/11/1936 | NEV | on | 19/11/1936 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2253 | on | 09/04/1931 | SBK | Starbeck | on | 18/01/1937 | NEV | on | 26/06/1943 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 715 | on | 09/08/1929 | SBK | Starbeck | on | 27/07/1937 | NEV | on | 14/12/1937 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2267 | on | 18/04/1935 | DAR | Darlington | on | 14/12/1937 | NEV | on | 26/06/1943 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 820 | on | 01/04/1926 | YK | York (North) | on | 10/04/1939 | NEV | on | 06/03/1940 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 813 | m/e | 01/1924 | YK | York (North) | on | 14/04/1939 | NEV | on | 28/03/1943 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 821 | m/e | 11/1912 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 14/04/1939 | NEV | on | 06/03/1940 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 822 | m/e | 11/1912 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 14/04/1939 | NEV | on | 28/03/1943 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2228 | on | 14/05/1928 | YK | York (North) | on | 17/06/1939 | NEV | on | 14/07/1943 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1294 | on | 24/06/1937 | AFP | Annfield Plain | on | 15/07/1939 | NEV | on | 10/07/1943 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2597 | on | 30/09/1939 | HTN | Heaton | on | 02/12/1939 | NEV | on | 29/02/1940 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2573 | on | 21/02/1938 | GHD | Gateshead | on | 02/12/1939 | NEV | on | 28/02/1940 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2580 | on | 05/03/1930 | HTN | Heaton | on | 02/12/1939 | NEV | on | 28/02/1940 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 928 | on | 01/08/1929 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 06/03/1940 | NEV | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1375 | on | 16/09/1929 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 06/03/1940 | NEV | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 843 | on | 01/06/1940 | YK | York (North) | on | 07/11/1940 | NEV | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 847 | m/e | 03/1920 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 07/11/1940 | NEV | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | 692 | on | 21/05/1940 | MAL | Malton | on | 05/03/1942 | NEV | on | 31/07/1943 | MAL | Malton |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 1501 | on | 05/09/1940 | MAL | Malton | on | 05/03/1942 | NEV | on | 19/10/1942 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 2155 | on | 22/08/1934 | WBY | Whitby | on | 28/03/1942 | NEV | on | 07/11/1942 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | 686 | on | 10/02/1940 | MAL | Malton | on | 11/07/1942 | NEV | on | 12/03/1945 | SBK | Starbeck |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1696 | on | 29/06/1939 | SEL | Selby | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | on | 23/07/1945 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1252 | on | 09/04/1931 | SBK | Starbeck | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | on | 19/06/1943 | HAV | Haverton Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1253 | on | 02/03/1927 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | on | 19/06/1943 | HAV | Haverton Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1262 | on | 06/01/1940 | YK | York (North) | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | on | 26/06/1943 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1278 | on | 13/04/1926 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | on | 14/07/1943 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1284 | on | 10/05/1940 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | on | 10/07/1943 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1362 | on | 18/05/1940 | YK | York (North) | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | on | 08/07/1943 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2213 | on | 02/03/1927 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | on | 21/06/1943 | SKN | Stockton |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2217 | on | 20/01/1940 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | on | 23/06/1943 | SKN | Stockton |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2220 | on | 20/01/1940 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | on | 14/07/1943 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2227 | on | 06/05/1940 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | on | 19/06/1943 | HAV | Haverton Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2229 | on | 20/01/1940 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | on | 19/06/1943 | HAV | Haverton Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2239 | on | 23/05/1940 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | on | 21/06/1943 | SKN | Stockton |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2244 | on | 08/05/1940 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | on | 19/06/1943 | HAV | Haverton Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2250 | on | 25/03/1940 | CUD | Cudworth | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | on | 19/06/1943 | SKN | Stockton |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2254 | on | 18/05/1940 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | on | 19/06/1943 | HAV | Haverton Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2257 | on | 07/05/1940 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | on | 14/07/1943 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2261 | on | 06/01/1940 | YK | York (North) | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | on | 19/06/1943 | CON | Consett |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2264 | on | 20/01/1940 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | on | 08/07/1943 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2274 | on | 09/05/1941 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | on | 19/06/1943 | SKN | Stockton |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2280 | on | 06/05/1931 | SBK | Starbeck | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | on | 23/06/1943 | SKN | Stockton |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2283 | on | 20/01/1940 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | on | 23/06/1943 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2295 | m/e | 11/1920 | BOR | Borough Gardens (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | on | 26/06/1943 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | 694 | on | 05/08/1940 | MAL | Malton | on | 31/07/1943 | NEV | on | 08/01/1944 | AUK | West Auckland |
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | 690 | on | 21/08/1943 | DAR | Darlington | on | 08/01/1944 | NEV | on | 12/03/1945 | SBK | Starbeck |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 8310 | on | 19/06/1944 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 06/07/1944 | NEV | on | 03/01/1945 | PKS | Parkeston Quay |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 8309 | on | 03/06/1944 | GHD | Gateshead | on | 18/08/1944 | NEV | on | 03/01/1945 | PKS | Parkeston Quay |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1262 | on | 26/06/1943 | DAR | Darlington | on | 24/08/1944 | NEV | on | 23/07/1945 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2257 | on | 14/07/1943 | DAR | Darlington | on | 24/08/1944 | NEV | on | 04/05/1947 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2283 | on | 23/06/1943 | DAR | Darlington | on | 24/08/1944 | NEV | on | 05/10/1947 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2279 | on | 28/03/1943 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 02/09/1944 | NEV | on | 05/10/1947 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2220 | on | 14/07/1943 | DAR | Darlington | on | 04/09/1944 | NEV | on | 23/07/1945 | CON | Consett |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1254 | on | 12/04/1939 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 08/09/1944 | NEV | on | 23/07/1945 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1363 | on | 28/03/1943 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 08/09/1944 | NEV | on | 23/07/1945 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2299 | on | 22/05/1924 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 08/09/1944 | NEV | on | 05/10/1947 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1278 | on | 14/07/1943 | DAR | Darlington | on | 09/09/1944 | NEV | on | 23/07/1945 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1311 | on | 28/03/1943 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 09/09/1944 | NEV | on | 23/07/1945 | CON | Consett |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2265 | on | 09/06/1930 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 11/09/1944 | NEV | on | 04/05/1947 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2292 | on | 28/03/1943 | SEL | Selby | on | 11/09/1944 | NEV | on | 05/10/1947 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2272 | on | 28/03/1943 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 12/09/1944 | NEV | on | 05/10/1947 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2293 | on | 28/03/1943 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 12/09/1944 | NEV | on | 05/10/1947 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2294 | on | 09/05/1941 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 12/09/1944 | NEV | on | 05/10/1947 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1362 | on | 08/07/1943 | DAR | Darlington | on | 02/10/1944 | NEV | on | 23/07/1945 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2253 | on | 26/06/1943 | DAR | Darlington | on | 02/10/1944 | NEV | on | 04/05/1947 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2507 | on | 01/12/1934 | GHD | Gateshead (New) | on | 27/09/1945 | NEV | on | 06/05/1946 | GHD | Gateshead |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2570 | on | 11/11/1936 | YK | York (North) | on | 29/09/1945 | NEV | on | 06/05/1946 | GHD | Gateshead |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2577 | on | 07/01/1937 | YK | York (North) | on | 29/09/1945 | NEV | on | 06/05/1946 | GHD | Gateshead |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 739 | on | 19/10/1938 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 06/05/1946 | NEV | on | 29/09/1946 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 743 | on | 30/12/1938 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 06/05/1946 | NEV | on | 29/09/1946 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 747 | on | 06/03/1939 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 06/05/1946 | NEV | on | 29/09/1946 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 756 | on | 02/05/1939 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 06/05/1946 | NEV | on | 29/09/1946 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1060 | on | 01/08/1946 (New) | NEV | on | 16/05/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1062 | on | 07/08/1946 (New) | NEV | on | 01/11/1959 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1065 | on | 15/08/1946 (New) | NEV | on | 19/11/1950 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1068 | on | 23/08/1946 (New) | NEV | on | 16/05/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1069 | on | 26/08/1946 (New) | NEV | on | 25/01/1959 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | 9794 | on | 12/03/1945 | SBK | Starbeck | on | 13/04/1947 | NEV | on | 05/10/1947 | SBK | Starbeck |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1218 | on | 01/08/1947 (New) | NEV | on | 05/02/1961 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1237 | on | 24/09/1947 (New) | NEV | on | 15/01/1961 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1256 | on | 17/11/1947 (New) | NEV | on | 15/09/1957 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1257 | on | 19/11/1947 (New) | NEV | on | 01/11/1959 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1258 | on | 21/11/1947 (New) | NEV | on | 27/01/1952 | 36A | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1259 | on | 24/11/1947 (New) | NEV | on | 05/02/1961 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1034 | on | 03/10/1947 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 29/11/1947 | NEV | on | 06/02/1949 | SKN | Stockton |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2746 | H | 12/1935 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | w/e | 15/05/1948 | SCA | Scarborough |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2748 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | on | 17/12/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2756 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 50E | Scarborough | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2758 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | w/e | 21/08/1948 | SBX | |||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2765 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | w/e | 28/02/1948 | SBK | Starbeck | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2769 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | w/e | 29/05/1948 | SCA | Scarborough | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2770 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | w/e | 01/05/1948 | SCA | Scarborough | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2772 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | w/e | 10/01/1948 | SBK | Starbeck | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2774 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | w/e | 01/05/1948 | SCA | Scarborough | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2775 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 50C | Selby | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7240 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 50G | Whitby | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7274 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7278 | H | 12/1935 | SBK | Starbeck | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | w/e | 06/03/1948 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7290 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | w/e | 21/08/1948 | SBX | |||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7319 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 50F | Malton | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7337 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | w/e | 25/02/1951 | 50D | Starbeck | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5036 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | on | 12/12/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5037 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | w/e | 21/08/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5041 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | w/e | 03/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5049 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | on | 02/06/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5077 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | w/e | 17/07/1948 | KBY | Kirkby Stephen | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5094 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | w/e | 12/02/1949 | DAR | Darlington | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5097 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | w/e | 04/09/1948 | AUK | West Auckland | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5107 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | on | 16/05/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5109 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | w/e | 12/02/1949 | DAR | Darlington | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5116 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | m/e | 02/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5118 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | w/e | 03/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5861 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | on | 30/04/1950 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5883 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5885 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5888 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5894 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8672 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8681 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8746 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLA | |||||
Steam | N13 | 0-6-2T | 9114 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | on | 22/10/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N13 | 0-6-2T | 9115 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | on | 18/05/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N13 | 0-6-2T | 9117 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | on | 05/07/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N13 | 0-6-2T | 9118 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | on | 26/05/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 7645 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | w/e | 05/06/1948 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 7646 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | w/e | 05/06/1948 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 7647 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | w/e | 05/06/1948 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 7656 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | w/e | 05/06/1948 | GHD | Gateshead | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 7657 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5041 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 03/01/1948 | NEV | w/e | 03/09/1950 | 51J | Northallerton |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5118 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 03/01/1948 | NEV | m/e | 06/1949 | MAL | Malton |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3314 | on | 17/08/1946 | AUK | West Auckland | on | 04/01/1948 | NEV | w/e | 10/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3315 | on | 03/03/1941 | AUK | West Auckland | on | 04/01/1948 | NEV | w/e | 10/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3314 | on | 04/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 10/01/1948 | NEV | on | 30/05/1948 | 20D | Normanton |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3315 | on | 04/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 10/01/1948 | NEV | on | 25/03/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 526 | on | 09/01/1948 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 18/01/1948 | NEV | w/e | 24/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 522 | on | 16/08/1947 | YK | York (North) | on | 18/01/1948 | NEV | on | 30/05/1948 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 524 | on | 26/09/1947 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 18/01/1948 | NEV | on | 26/09/1948 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 526 | on | 18/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 24/01/1948 | NEV | on | 26/09/1948 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1035 | on | 31/10/1947 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 05/04/1948 | NEV | w/e | 10/04/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3300 | on | 20/07/1947 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 05/04/1948 | NEV | w/e | 10/04/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1035 | on | 05/04/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 10/04/1948 | NEV | on | 15/01/1961 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3300 | on | 05/04/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 10/04/1948 | NEV | on | 30/05/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2774 | w/e | 01/05/1948 | SCA | Scarborough | w/e | 15/05/1948 | NEV | w/e | 21/08/1948 | SCA | Scarborough |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1239 | on | 02/10/1947 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 16/05/1948 | NEV | w/e | 22/05/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1240 | on | 06/10/1947 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 16/05/1948 | NEV | w/e | 22/05/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1239 | on | 16/05/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 22/05/1948 | NEV | on | 23/05/1948 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1240 | on | 16/05/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 22/05/1948 | NEV | on | 01/11/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1216 | on | 15/07/1947 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 23/05/1948 | NEV | w/e | 29/05/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1216 | on | 23/05/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 29/05/1948 | NEV | on | 15/01/1961 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62746 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | SCA | Scarborough | w/e | 29/05/1948 | NEV | w/e | 28/07/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1017 | on | 28/01/1947 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 30/05/1948 | NEV | w/e | 05/06/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1018 | on | 04/02/1947 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 30/05/1948 | NEV | w/e | 05/06/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3443 | on | 17/08/1939 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 30/05/1948 | NEV | w/e | 05/06/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3445 | on | 09/10/1934 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 30/05/1948 | NEV | w/e | 05/06/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1017 | on | 30/05/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 05/06/1948 | NEV | on | 06/02/1949 | SKN | Stockton |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1018 | on | 30/05/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 05/06/1948 | NEV | on | 06/02/1949 | SKN | Stockton |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7266 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | w/e | 05/06/1948 | NEV | on | 06/12/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3443 | on | 30/05/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 05/06/1948 | NEV | on | 06/02/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3445 | on | 30/05/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 05/06/1948 | NEV | on | 06/02/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7262 | on | 01/01/1948 | WBY | Whitby | w/e | 12/06/1948 | NEV | on | 04/12/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7308 | on | 01/01/1948 | WBY | Whitby | w/e | 12/06/1948 | NEV | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 50Fs1 | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3285 | on | 05/10/1947 | MID | Middlesbrough | on | 13/06/1948 | NEV | w/e | 19/06/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3285 | on | 13/06/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 19/06/1948 | NEV | on | 10/07/1949 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3278 | on | 27/07/1947 | DAR | Darlington | on | 11/07/1948 | NEV | w/e | 17/07/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3278 | on | 11/07/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 17/07/1948 | NEV | on | 10/07/1949 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61337 | on | 12/08/1948 (New) | NEV | on | 29/08/1948 | STM | St Margarets | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61338 | on | 20/08/1948 (New) | NEV | on | 19/11/1950 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2739 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | Gateshead | w/e | 21/08/1948 | NEV | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 50E | Scarborough |
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 9376 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 21/08/1948 | NEV | w/e | 23/10/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 9398 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 21/08/1948 | NEV | w/e | 23/10/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63056 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | CLK | Colwick | on | 29/08/1948 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63068 | on | 23/05/1948 | CLK | Colwick | on | 29/08/1948 | NEV | on | 07/08/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3255 | on | 05/10/1947 | DAR | Darlington | on | 29/08/1948 | NEV | w/e | 04/09/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63069 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 04/09/1948 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63027 | w/e | 17/04/1948 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 04/09/1948 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 3100 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3255 | on | 29/08/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 04/09/1948 | NEV | on | 06/02/1949 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61339 | on | 08/09/1948 (New) | NEV | on | 02/09/1951 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5037 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 23/10/1948 | NEV | w/e | 09/04/1949 | AUK | West Auckland |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63362 | on | 05/10/1947 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 07/11/1948 | NEV | w/e | 13/11/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63167 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63197 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5062 | on | 01/01/1948 | BLA | Blaydon | w/e | 13/11/1948 | NEV | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63362 | on | 07/11/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 13/11/1948 | NEV | on | 03/12/1950 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7302 | on | 01/01/1948 | WBY | Whitby | w/e | 01/01/1949 | NEV | w/e | 05/02/1949 | WBY | Whitby |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67293 | on | 01/01/1948 | WBY | Whitby | w/e | 05/02/1949 | NEV | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60086 | on | 30/11/1944 | GHD | Gateshead | on | 06/02/1949 | NEV | w/e | 12/02/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60036 | on | 09/09/1947 | GHD | Gateshead | on | 06/02/1949 | NEV | w/e | 12/02/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60074 | on | 03/11/1945 | GHD | Gateshead | on | 06/02/1949 | NEV | on | 27/11/1950 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60081 | on | 03/11/1945 | GHD | Gateshead | on | 06/02/1949 | NEV | on | 01/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63280 | on | 12/06/1939 | SEL | Selby | on | 06/02/1949 | NEV | w/e | 12/02/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63450 | on | 05/10/1947 | SEL | Selby | on | 06/02/1949 | NEV | w/e | 12/02/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63103 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60086 | on | 06/02/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 12/02/1949 | NEV | on | 18/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60036 | on | 06/02/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 12/02/1949 | NEV | on | 11/06/1961 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65072 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 12/02/1949 | NEV | m/e | 02/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63280 | on | 06/02/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 12/02/1949 | NEV | on | 10/07/1949 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63450 | on | 06/02/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 12/02/1949 | NEV | on | 27/01/1952 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65083 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | AUK | West Auckland | w/e | 09/04/1949 | NEV | m/e | 04/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77055 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 16/04/1949 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63014 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 16/04/1949 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77248 | w/e | 16/04/1949 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NWE | New England | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 78601 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 16/04/1949 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 78614 | w/e | 16/04/1949 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65060 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 16/07/1949 | NEV | m/e | 08/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65108 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 16/07/1949 | NEV | m/e | 10/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65120 | w/e | 01/05/1948 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 30/07/1949 | NEV | on | 06/02/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61400 | on | 25/10/1947 | YK | York (North) | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61401 | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61402 | on | 31/08/1947 | YK | York (North) | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61408 | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61409 | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61410 | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1411 | on | 02/11/1929 | YK | York (North) | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1412 | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61413 | on | 24/08/1947 | YK | York (North) | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61414 | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61415 | on | 27/07/1947 | YK | York (North) | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1416 | on | 29/06/1936 | YK | York (North) | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1427 | on | 30/09/1937 | YK | York (North) | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61428 | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1429 | on | 27/05/1939 | YK | York (North) | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61430 | on | 27/07/1947 | YK | York (North) | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1431 | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61432 | on | 31/08/1947 | YK | York (North) | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61440 | on | 30/05/1940 | YK | York (North) | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61441 | on | 12/03/1923 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61442 | on | 23/06/1931 | YK | York (North) | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1445 | on | 19/01/1934 | YK | York (North) | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61446 | on | 27/07/1947 | YK | York (North) | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61447 | on | 29/05/1923 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61400 | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | on | 25/09/1955 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61401 | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | on | 23/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61402 | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | on | 05/09/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61408 | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61409 | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | on | 01/05/1955 | 50D | Starbeck |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61410 | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | on | 25/09/1955 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1411 | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | on | 11/12/1960 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1412 | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | on | 11/12/1960 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61413 | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | on | 25/09/1955 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61414 | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | on | 25/09/1955 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61415 | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | on | 25/09/1955 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1416 | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1427 | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | on | 07/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61428 | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | on | 31/10/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1429 | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | on | 25/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61430 | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1431 | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | on | 14/02/1960 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61432 | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | on | 03/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61440 | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | on | 25/09/1955 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61441 | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61442 | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | on | 07/06/1953 | 50D | Starbeck |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1445 | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | on | 01/07/1951 | 50E | Scarborough |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61446 | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | on | 17/01/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61447 | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | on | 25/09/1955 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1425 | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | on | 28/08/1949 | NEV | w/e | 03/09/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1433 | on | 05/07/1940 | YK | York (North) | on | 28/08/1949 | NEV | w/e | 03/09/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1425 | on | 28/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 03/09/1949 | NEV | on | 14/02/1960 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1433 | on | 28/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 03/09/1949 | NEV | on | 23/09/1956 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60084 | on | 03/11/1945 | GHD | Gateshead | on | 04/09/1949 | NEV | w/e | 10/09/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60084 | on | 04/09/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 10/09/1949 | NEV | on | 08/12/1963 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68677 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 12/11/1949 | NEV | m/e | 12/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68677 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | m/e | 12/1949 | NEV | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64791 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | DAR | Darlington | on | 29/01/1950 | NEV | w/e | 04/02/1950 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64850 | on | 28/03/1943 | DAR | Darlington | on | 29/01/1950 | NEV | w/e | 04/02/1950 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64921 | on | 23/07/1945 | DAR | Darlington | on | 29/01/1950 | NEV | w/e | 04/02/1950 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64943 | on | 01/03/1947 | DAR | Darlington | on | 29/01/1950 | NEV | w/e | 04/02/1950 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64791 | on | 29/01/1950 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 04/02/1950 | NEV | on | 15/09/1957 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64850 | on | 29/01/1950 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 04/02/1950 | NEV | on | 26/09/1954 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64921 | on | 29/01/1950 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 04/02/1950 | NEV | on | 01/07/1951 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64943 | on | 29/01/1950 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 04/02/1950 | NEV | on | 22/01/1959 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64863 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | HTN | Heaton | on | 12/02/1950 | 50B | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64920 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | HTN | Heaton | on | 12/02/1950 | 50B | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4934 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | HTN | Heaton | on | 12/02/1950 | 50B | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64863 | on | 12/02/1950 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 50B | on | 31/01/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64920 | on | 12/02/1950 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 50B | on | 16/11/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4934 | on | 12/02/1950 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 50B | on | 17/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67290 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | SBX | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 50B | on | 27/03/1956 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65122 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | SBH | Blyth (South) | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 50B | on | 29/08/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65067 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 30/04/1950 | 50B | w/e | 03/09/1950 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65118 | w/e | 02/07/1949 | MAL | Malton | on | 13/05/1950 | 50B | w/e | 11/02/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65076 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 23/07/1950 | 50B | m/e | 06/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64949 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 20/08/1950 | 50B | on | 13/06/1954 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4819 | on | 25/06/1950 | 51A | Darlington | on | 27/08/1950 | 50B | on | 13/06/1954 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64710 | on | 25/06/1950 | 51A | Darlington | on | 03/09/1950 | 50B | on | 01/07/1951 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65041 | w/e | 03/09/1950 | 51J | Northallerton | w/e | 10/09/1950 | 50B | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64933 | on | 23/07/1945 | DAR | Darlington | on | 10/09/1950 | 50B | on | 12/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65041 | w/e | 10/09/1950 | 50B | Neville Hill | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 50B | on | 01/02/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62742 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50B | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64919 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | SCA | Scarborough | on | 01/10/1950 | 50B | on | 01/07/1951 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64922 | on | 05/07/1943 | SBK | Starbeck | on | 01/10/1950 | 50B | on | 26/09/1954 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62742 | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50B | Neville Hill | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50B | on | 12/11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69882 | on | 01/10/1950 | 50G | Whitby | on | 19/11/1950 | 50B | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 60501 | on | 27/11/1949 | YK | York (North) | on | 27/11/1950 | 50B | on | 17/12/1950 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 60503 | on | 27/11/1949 | YK | York (North) | on | 27/11/1950 | 50B | on | 17/12/1950 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69882 | on | 19/11/1950 | 50B | Neville Hill | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 50B | on | 19/07/1953 | 50G | Whitby |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60074 | on | 27/11/1950 | 50A | York (North) | on | 17/12/1950 | 50B | w/e | 08/04/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61065 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 52B | Heaton | on | 01/01/1951 | 50B | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61338 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 52B | Heaton | on | 01/01/1951 | 50B | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64935 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | SCA | Scarborough | on | 07/01/1951 | 50B | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61065 | on | 01/01/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 50B | on | 15/09/1957 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61338 | on | 01/01/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 50B | on | 02/09/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64935 | on | 07/01/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 50B | on | 17/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61473 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61474 | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61416 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1419 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61422 | m/e | 12/1920 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61424 | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61426 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61436 | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61441 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61443 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61451 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61452 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61456 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61458 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61459 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61460 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61462 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61465 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61466 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61473 | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | on | 15/11/1953 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61474 | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | on | 15/11/1953 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61416 | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | on | 21/10/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1419 | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | on | 17/02/1952 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61422 | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | on | 07/06/1953 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61424 | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | on | 15/11/1953 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61426 | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | on | 21/10/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61436 | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | on | 17/02/1952 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61441 | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | on | 21/10/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61443 | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | on | 17/02/1952 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61451 | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | on | 04/11/1951 | 50E | Scarborough |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61452 | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | on | 15/11/1953 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61456 | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | on | 21/10/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61458 | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | on | 15/11/1953 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61459 | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | on | 21/10/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61460 | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | on | 17/02/1952 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61462 | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | on | 15/11/1953 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61465 | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | on | 15/11/1953 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61466 | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | on | 15/11/1953 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64867 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 20/05/1951 | 50B | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64867 | on | 20/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 50B | on | 10/06/1951 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69877 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 50C | Selby | on | 01/07/1951 | 50B | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43052 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 50B | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 50C | Selby | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62764 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | SCA | Scarborough | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 50B | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69877 | on | 01/07/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 50B | on | 21/10/1951 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62764 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 50B | on | 13/11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67289 | on | 01/01/1948 | SBK | Starbeck | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 50B | 4w/e | 18/08/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67289 | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | 4w/e | 18/08/1951 | 50B | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64835 | on | 30/07/1945 | DON | Doncaster | on | 02/09/1951 | 50B | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64886 | on | 04/06/1950 | 40A | Lincoln | on | 02/09/1951 | 50B | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64835 | on | 02/09/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 50B | on | 13/12/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64886 | on | 02/09/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 50B | on | 15/09/1957 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64730 | on | 02/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | on | 17/11/1951 | 50B | on | 26/09/1954 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61086 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | DON | Doncaster | on | 27/01/1952 | 50B | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61086 | on | 27/01/1952 | 50B | Neville Hill | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 50B | on | 25/01/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69877 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 50C | Selby | on | 11/05/1952 | 50B | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69877 | on | 11/05/1952 | 50B | Neville Hill | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 50B | on | 07/06/1953 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64758 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 51A | Darlington | on | 06/07/1952 | 50B | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62389 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 50C | Selby | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 50B | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62397 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50C | Selby | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 50B | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64758 | on | 06/07/1952 | 50B | Neville Hill | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 50B | on | 01/11/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62389 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 50B | Neville Hill | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 50B | on | 06/09/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62397 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 50B | Neville Hill | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 50B | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 53D | Bridlington |
Steam | N13 | 0-6-2T | 69113 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLS | Hull Springhead | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 50B | w/e | 04/05/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63348 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | SEL | Selby | on | 25/01/1953 | 50B | on | 16/06/1957 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63436 | on | 05/10/1947 | SEL | Selby | on | 25/01/1953 | 50B | on | 16/06/1957 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76021 | m/e | 12/1952 | 50A | York (North) (New) | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 50B | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | N13 | 0-6-2T | 69116 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLS | Hull Springhead | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 50B | on | 20/12/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61017 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | SKN | Stockton | on | 23/08/1953 | 50B | on | 20/11/1955 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69882 | on | 19/07/1953 | 50G | Whitby | on | 20/09/1953 | 50B | on | 06/06/1954 | 50G | Whitby |
Steam | N13 | 0-6-2T | 69119 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLS | Hull Springhead | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 50B | on | 05/07/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61015 | on | 21/06/1953 | 50A | York (North) | on | 15/11/1953 | 50B | on | 21/02/1954 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61020 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | YK | York (North) | on | 15/11/1953 | 50B | on | 21/02/1954 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61473 | on | 15/11/1953 | 50A | York (North) | on | 14/03/1954 | 50B | on | 18/07/1954 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61474 | on | 15/11/1953 | 50A | York (North) | on | 14/03/1954 | 50B | on | 18/07/1954 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61424 | on | 15/11/1953 | 50A | York (North) | on | 14/03/1954 | 50B | on | 18/07/1954 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61452 | on | 15/11/1953 | 50A | York (North) | on | 14/03/1954 | 50B | on | 18/07/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61458 | on | 15/11/1953 | 50A | York (North) | on | 14/03/1954 | 50B | on | 18/07/1954 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61462 | on | 15/11/1953 | 50A | York (North) | on | 14/03/1954 | 50B | on | 18/07/1954 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61465 | on | 15/11/1953 | 50A | York (North) | on | 14/03/1954 | 50B | on | 18/07/1954 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61466 | on | 15/11/1953 | 50A | York (North) | on | 14/03/1954 | 50B | on | 18/07/1954 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67293 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 50C | Selby | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 50B | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64860 | on | 28/03/1943 | SBK | Starbeck | on | 13/06/1954 | 50B | on | 07/08/1955 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69858 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | WBY | Whitby | on | 29/06/1954 | 50B | on | 10/06/1956 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69882 | on | 06/06/1954 | 50G | Whitby | on | 19/09/1954 | 50B | on | 10/06/1956 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 69098 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 22/01/1955 | 50B | on | 24/09/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61442 | on | 07/06/1953 | 50D | Starbeck | on | 01/05/1955 | 50B | on | 01/02/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65650 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 50A | York (North) | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 50B | on | 30/09/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65654 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 50A | York (North) | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 50B | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64870 | on | 04/01/1953 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 26/06/1955 | 50B | on | 13/12/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64922 | on | 26/09/1954 | 50C | Selby | on | 26/06/1955 | 50B | on | 23/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62359 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 51J | Northallerton | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 50B | on | 26/10/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62372 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 50B | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 53D | Bridlington |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65683 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 50C | Selby | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 50B | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65714 | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 50A | York (North) | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 50B | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64850 | on | 26/09/1954 | 50C | Selby | on | 07/08/1955 | 50B | on | 01/11/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90082 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 50B | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90467 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 50B | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90663 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 50B | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62749 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | SBK | Starbeck | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 50B | on | 02/07/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65656 | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 50A | York (North) | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 50B | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65648 | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 50B | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50G | Whitby |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61414 | on | 13/05/1956 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 10/06/1956 | 50B | on | 11/12/1960 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61415 | on | 25/09/1955 | 52B | Heaton | on | 10/06/1956 | 50B | on | 25/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61447 | on | 25/09/1955 | 52B | Heaton | on | 10/06/1956 | 50B | on | 11/12/1960 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40045 | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 50B | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40059 | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 50B | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62755 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | SBK | Starbeck | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 50B | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62772 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | SBK | Starbeck | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 50B | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62740 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50D | Starbeck | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 50B | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62761 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50D | Starbeck | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 50B | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 50C | Selby |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 11212 | on | 26/10/1956 (New) | 50B | on | 31/12/1969 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 11213 | on | 26/10/1956 (New) | 50B | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 11214 | on | 12/11/1956 (New) | 50B | w/e | 01/11/1969 | 55F | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 11215 | on | 12/11/1956 (New) | 50B | on | 14/06/1959 | 50C | Selby | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 11216 | on | 06/12/1956 (New) | 50B | 4w/e | 10/09/1966 | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69881 | on | 29/05/1955 | 50E | Scarborough | on | 09/12/1956 | 50B | on | 16/06/1957 | 50E | Scarborough |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69885 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 50E | Scarborough | on | 09/12/1956 | 50B | on | 16/06/1957 | 50E | Scarborough |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61016 | on | 16/01/1947 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 05/05/1957 | 50B | on | 15/01/1961 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61038 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | YK | York (North) | on | 05/05/1957 | 50B | on | 15/01/1961 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90045 | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 54B | Tyne Dock | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50B | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90026 | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 54B | Tyne Dock | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50B | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43096 | on | 30/12/1950 | 50C | Selby (New) | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50B | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62773 | on | 01/01/1948 | SBK | Starbeck | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50B | on | 05/08/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62774 | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 50D | Starbeck | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50B | on | 13/11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67325 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 50F | Malton | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50B | on | 10/10/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69877 | on | 03/03/1957 | 50F | Malton | on | 15/09/1957 | 50B | on | 08/04/1958 | 50E | Scarborough |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69885 | on | 16/06/1957 | 50E | Scarborough | on | 15/09/1957 | 50B | on | 08/06/1958 | 50E | Scarborough |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64725 | on | 10/10/1954 | 50C | Selby | on | 15/09/1957 | 50B | on | 26/07/1959 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64730 | on | 26/09/1954 | 50C | Selby | on | 15/09/1957 | 50B | on | 01/11/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90230 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 50B | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80116 | 4w/e | 25/05/1956 | 50G | Whitby | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80117 | on | 19/05/1954 | 50G | Whitby (New) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50B | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 67E | Dumfries |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80118 | on | 15/06/1955 | 50G | Whitby (New) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50B | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 66E | Carstairs |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80119 | 4w/e | 25/05/1956 | 50G | Whitby | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50B | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 66E | Carstairs |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80120 | on | 06/07/1955 | 50G | Whitby (New) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50B | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 66E | Carstairs |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65663 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50B | w/e | 14/03/1959 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65685 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50B | w/e | 14/03/1959 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65726 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50B | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 50D | Starbeck |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62702 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 13/09/1958 | 50B | on | 12/11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42411 | 4w/e | 16/08/1958 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 50B | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42477 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 50B | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 50D | Starbeck |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42553 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 50B | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 50D | Starbeck |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42639 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 50B | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 50D | Starbeck |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42073 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 50B | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41247 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 20E | Manningham | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 50B | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43051 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 50C | Selby | w/e | 14/03/1959 | 50B | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43054 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 50C | Selby | w/e | 14/03/1959 | 50B | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77004 | 3w/e | 04/10/1958 | 50G | Whitby | on | 06/04/1959 | 50B | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77013 | 3w/e | 08/10/1955 | 50G | Whitby | on | 06/04/1959 | 50B | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43051 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 50C | Selby | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 50B | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 55B | Stourton |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43054 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 50C | Selby | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 50B | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 55F | Manningham |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41252 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 50B | on | 23/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41281 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 20C | Royston | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 50B | w/e | 18/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41282 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 20C | Royston | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 50B | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 55C | Farnley Junction |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43057 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 50B | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43071 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 50B | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43096 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 50B | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63348 | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) | on | 06/12/1959 | 50B | on | 17/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63436 | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) | on | 06/12/1959 | 50B | on | 13/10/1963 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63449 | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) | on | 06/12/1959 | 50B | on | 15/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64944 | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) | on | 13/12/1959 | 50B | on | 12/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41259 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 25G | Farnley Junction | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 55H | on | 19/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64910 | on | 10/06/1956 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | on | 11/09/1960 | 55H | on | 15/01/1961 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64947 | on | 08/06/1958 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | on | 11/09/1960 | 55H | w/e | 23/05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42188 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | Low Moor | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 55H | w/e | 02/02/1963 | 55F | Manningham |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D301 | on | 04/11/1960 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 55H | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 1B | Camden |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D11 | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 55H | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D302 | on | 07/11/1960 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 55H | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D11 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 55H | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 17A | Derby |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D12 | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 55H | w/e | 28/07/1962 | 17A | Derby |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D14 | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 55H | w/e | 02/09/1961 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D15 | w/e | 18/02/1961 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 55H | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D16 | w/e | 18/02/1961 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 55H | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D13 | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | w/e | 01/04/1961 | 55H | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 17A | Derby |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D17 | on | 23/12/1960 | 17A | Derby (New) | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 55H | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D18 | on | 31/12/1960 | 17A | Derby (New) | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 55H | w/e | 02/09/1961 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D345 | on | 17/05/1961 (New) | 55H | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D346 | on | 24/05/1961 (New) | 55H | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D347 | on | 31/05/1961 (New) | 55H | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D348 | on | 07/06/1961 (New) | 55H | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61030 | on | 20/09/1959 | 51A | Darlington | on | 11/06/1961 | 55H | on | 25/11/1962 | 56B | Ardsley |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D19 | on | 31/12/1960 | 17A | Derby (New) | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 55H | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D20 | on | 24/02/1961 | 17A | Derby (New) | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 55H | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D26 | on | 22/04/1961 | 17A | Derby (New) | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 55H | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D29 | on | 13/05/1961 | 17A | Derby (New) | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 55H | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D30 | on | 20/05/1961 | 17A | Derby (New) | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 55H | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D31 | on | 03/06/1961 | 17A | Derby (New) | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 55H | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73162 | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 55H | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73169 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 55H | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 56A | Wakefield |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D21 | on | 03/03/1961 | 17A | Derby (New) | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 55H | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D25 | on | 15/04/1961 | 17A | Derby (New) | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 55H | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D27 | on | 29/04/1961 | 17A | Derby (New) | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 55H | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D23 | on | 08/04/1961 | 17A | Derby (New) | w/e | 02/09/1961 | 55H | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D28 | on | 04/05/1961 | 17A | Derby (New) | w/e | 02/09/1961 | 55H | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D14 | w/e | 02/09/1961 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 55H | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D18 | w/e | 02/09/1961 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 55H | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D32 | on | 12/06/1961 | 17A | Derby (New) | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 55H | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73168 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 55H | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64861 | on | 13/12/1959 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 26/11/1961 | 55H | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D144 | on | 09/12/1961 | 17A | Derby (New) | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 55H | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 17A | Derby |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D151 | on | 17/01/1962 | 17A | Derby (New) | w/e | 03/02/1962 | 55H | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44170 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 20D | Normanton | w/e | 14/04/1962 | 55H | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64857 | on | 22/11/1959 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 17/06/1962 | 55H | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D22 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 55H | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D24 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 55H | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D28 | w/e | 02/09/1961 | 55H | Neville Hill | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 55H | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D30 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 55H | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73161 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 55E | Normanton | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 55H | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63370 | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 11/11/1962 | 55H | on | 01/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63424 | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 11/11/1962 | 55H | on | 13/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63420 | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 02/12/1962 | 55H | on | 12/06/1966 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63426 | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 02/12/1962 | 55H | on | 12/06/1966 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63417 | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 16/12/1962 | 55H | on | 13/02/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63445 | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 16/12/1962 | 55H | on | 13/10/1963 | 52G | Sunderland |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2150 | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 55H | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1515 | on | 29/03/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park (New) | w/e | 13/04/1963 | 55H | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60038 | on | 21/02/1960 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | on | 16/06/1963 | 55H | on | 18/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60070 | on | 10/09/1961 | 56B | Ardsley | on | 16/06/1963 | 55H | on | 08/12/1963 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60080 | on | 11/06/1961 | 56B | Ardsley | on | 16/06/1963 | 55H | on | 08/12/1963 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61224 | on | 25/09/1955 | 51A | Darlington | on | 16/06/1963 | 55H | on | 07/06/1964 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61338 | on | 25/09/1955 | 51A | Darlington | on | 16/06/1963 | 55H | on | 07/06/1964 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61353 | on | 02/09/1951 | 51A | Darlington | on | 16/06/1963 | 55H | on | 07/06/1964 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60118 | on | 04/11/1962 | 56B | Ardsley | on | 28/07/1963 | 55H | on | 04/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60131 | on | 01/04/1962 | 56B | Ardsley | on | 28/07/1963 | 55H | on | 04/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60134 | on | 01/04/1962 | 56B | Ardsley | on | 28/07/1963 | 55H | on | 04/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60146 | on | 04/06/1950 | 50A | York (North) | on | 28/07/1963 | 55H | on | 13/10/1963 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60154 | on | 20/11/1960 | 50A | York (North) | on | 28/07/1963 | 55H | on | 04/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42689 | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | 68B | Dumfries | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 55H | 4w/e | 14/08/1965 | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42699 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 68B | Dumfries | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 55H | 4w/e | 18/06/1966 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2196 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 67B | Hurlford | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 55H | 4w/e | 18/06/1966 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42196 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 67B | Hurlford | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 55H | 4w/e | 18/06/1966 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42123 | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | 67D | Ardrossan | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 55H | on | 28/02/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1549 | on | 26/10/1963 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 55H | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7578 | w/e | 04/01/1964 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 55H | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43043 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 55H | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43075 | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 55B | Stourton | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 55H | on | 29/04/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45063 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 25G | Farnley Junction | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 55H | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45204 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 25G | Farnley Junction | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 55H | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42618 | on | 12/03/1964 | 16B | Annesley | on | 22/03/1964 | 55H | on | 07/06/1964 | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63344 | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 07/06/1964 | 55H | on | 12/06/1966 | 55E | Normanton |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2267 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 55H | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62007 | on | 25/08/1963 | 50A | York (North) | on | 28/06/1964 | 55H | on | 03/10/1965 | 52G | Sunderland |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2247 | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 55H | w/e | 14/12/1968 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3375 | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 55D | Royston | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 55H | w/e | 14/08/1971 | 55G | Knottingley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3657 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 55F | Manningham | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 55H | w/e | 14/08/1971 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42184 | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 16C | Derby | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 55H | 4w/e | 18/06/1966 | 56F | Low Moor |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1766 | on | 22/09/1964 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | 4w/e | 27/02/1965 | 55H | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2065 | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 55F | Manningham | 4w/e | 19/06/1965 | 55H | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63387 | on | 24/02/1963 | 52G | Sunderland | on | 03/10/1965 | 55H | on | 12/06/1966 | 55E | Normanton |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D241 | on | 26/10/1959 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 55H | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D249 | on | 30/11/1959 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 55H | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D250 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 55H | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D270 | on | 11/04/1960 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 55H | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D280 | on | 17/06/1960 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 55H | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D286 | on | 25/07/1960 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 55H | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2101 | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55H | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2263 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55D | Royston | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 55H | on | 06/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2264 | on | 28/12/1957 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street (New) | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 55H | on | 31/12/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2045 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | 55H | w/e | 07/12/1968 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3365 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | 5w/e | 30/03/1968 | 55H | w/e | 07/12/1968 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2112 | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 50D | Goole | w/e | 23/11/1968 | 55H | w/e | 18/10/1969 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2170 | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 23/11/1968 | 55H | w/e | 30/08/1969 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3916 | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 55C | Healey Mills | w/e | 07/12/1968 | 55H | on | 21/01/1994 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2248 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | w/e | 14/12/1968 | 55H | w/e | 01/11/1969 | 55F | Bradford Hammerton Street |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3001 | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 14/06/1969 | 55H | w/e | 25/10/1969 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4042 | on | 26/04/1964 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 05/07/1969 | 55H | on | 14/02/1992 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4043 | on | 26/04/1964 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 05/07/1969 | 55H | on | 03/05/1991 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3704 | w/e | 08/03/1969 | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | w/e | 14/08/1971 | 55H | 2w/e | 25/01/1976 | YK | York (North) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08243 | w/e | 14/10/1972 | 55C | Healey Mills | 2w/e | 25/01/1976 | NL | on | 18/02/1986 | Withdrawn |