Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 537 Today
» 1315 Yesterday
» 537 Week
» 30035 Month
» 366881 Year
» 1588446 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Newport (Teeside)


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Newport (Teeside) Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam Q5 0-8-0 2117       m/e 09/1901 (New) NPT on 28/03/1943 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q5 0-8-0 2120       m/e 10/1901 (New) NPT on 06/02/1937 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q5 0-8-0 2121       m/e 10/1901 (New) NPT on 09/01/1926 SHI Shildon
Steam Q5 0-8-0 2122       m/e 11/1901 (New) NPT on 15/12/1933 MEX Mexborough
Steam Q5 0-8-0 2123       m/e 12/1901 (New) NPT on 28/03/1943 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q5 0-8-0 527       m/e 03/1902 (New) NPT on 28/03/1943 TDK Tyne Dock
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1320       m/e 03/1902 (New) NPT on 07/11/1938 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1700       m/e 04/1902 (New) NPT on 05/05/1931 HAV Haverton Hill
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1704       m/e 04/1902 (New) NPT on 06/02/1937 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1684       m/e 12/1902 (New) NPT on 28/03/1943 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1685       m/e 12/1902 (New) NPT on 21/07/1932 DAR Darlington
Steam Q5 0-8-0 410       m/e 04/1903 (New) NPT on 09/01/1926 SHI Shildon
Steam Q5 0-8-0 474       m/e 04/1903 (New) NPT on 14/03/1933 DAR Darlington
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1186       m/e 05/1903 (New) NPT on 18/11/1931 SHI Shildon
Steam Q5 0-8-0 650       m/e 06/1903 (New) NPT on 12/06/1939 SEL Selby
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1009       m/e 06/1903 (New) NPT on 28/03/1943 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1731       m/e 06/1903 (New) NPT on 16/10/1939 SKN Stockton
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1757       m/e 06/1903 (New) NPT on 28/03/1943 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q5 0-8-0 792       m/e 10/1903 (New) NPT on 28/03/1943 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1218       m/e 11/1903 (New) NPT on 28/03/1943 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1110       m/e 12/1903 (New) NPT on 10/10/1924 HLS Hull Springhead
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1669       m/e 12/1903 (New) NPT on 06/02/1937 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q5 0-8-0 430       m/e 02/1904 (New) NPT on 21/01/1931 SBK Starbeck
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1150       m/e 04/1904 (New) NPT on 28/03/1943 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1178       m/e 10/1907 (New) NPT on 06/02/1937 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q5 0-8-0 648       m/e 03/1908 (New) NPT on 18/07/1932 FER Ferryhill (Co. Durham)
Steam Q5 0-8-0 659       m/e 06/1911 (New) NPT on 28/03/1943 TDK Tyne Dock
Steam Q5 0-8-0 789       m/e 11/1911 (New) NPT on 07/11/1938 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q5 0-8-0 794       m/e 11/1911 (New) NPT on 06/02/1937 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1252       m/e 03/1913 (New) NPT on 09/04/1931 SBK Starbeck
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2216       m/e 06/1917 (New) NPT on 04/12/1943 HAV Haverton Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2289       m/e 09/1920 (New) NPT on 07/02/1948 SKN Stockton
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2296       m/e 12/1920 (New) NPT on 08/07/1939 BLA Blaydon
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1250 m/e 02/1913 BOR Borough Gardens (New) on 12/01/1923 NPT on 25/10/1925 SEL Selby
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2256 m/e 02/1920 DAR Darlington (New) m/e 1924 NPT m/e 1925 SEL Selby
Steam Q5 0-8-0 646 m/e 12/1907 SHI Shildon (New) on 30/01/1924 NPT on 21/12/1932 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q5 0-8-0 658 y/e 1911 SHI Shildon (New) on 30/01/1924 NPT on 29/05/1931 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q5 0-8-0 772 m/e 09/1911 SHI Shildon (New) on 30/01/1924 NPT on 05/05/1931 HAV Haverton Hill
Steam Q5 0-8-0 653 m/e 03/1908 SHI Shildon (New) on 08/02/1924 NPT on 07/11/1938 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1280 m/e 05/1913 HLS Hull Springhead (New) on 22/05/1924 NPT on 08/11/1925 SEL Selby
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2299 m/e 01/1921 HLS Hull Springhead (New) on 22/05/1924 NPT on 08/09/1944 NEV Neville Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1249 m/e 02/1913 HLS Hull Springhead (New) on 23/05/1924 NPT on 04/12/1943 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2237 m/e 11/1918 HLS Hull Springhead (New) on 26/05/1924 NPT on 04/12/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam O2 2-8-0 3501       on 07/06/1924 (New) NPT on 28/02/1925 NWE New England
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1062 m/e 10/1907 HLD Hull Dairycoates (New) on 19/06/1924 NPT on 28/07/1945 BLA Blaydon
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1271 on 01/07/1924 SEL Selby on 01/09/1925 NPT on 04/12/1943 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1248 m/e 02/1913 SEL Selby (New) on 25/10/1925 NPT on 10/06/1956 51G Haverton Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1283 m/e 05/1913 SEL Selby (New) on 08/11/1925 NPT on 04/12/1943 CON Consett
Steam J39 0-6-0 1448       on 28/09/1926 (New) NPT on 07/04/1930 MID Middlesbrough
Steam J39 0-6-0 1449       on 05/10/1926 (New) NPT on 07/04/1930 MID Middlesbrough
Steam J39 0-6-0 1450       on 14/10/1926 (New) NPT on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 1455       on 21/10/1926 (New) NPT on 26/06/1939 SBK Starbeck
Steam J39 0-6-0 1456       on 28/10/1926 (New) NPT on 16/07/1934 DAR Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 1457       on 04/11/1926 (New) NPT on 16/07/1934 DAR Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 1270       on 11/03/1927 (New) NPT on 13/12/1927 ? New Holland
Steam J39 0-6-0 1270 on 13/12/1927 ? New Holland on 06/02/1928 NPT on 10/02/1928 IMM Immingham
Steam J39 0-6-0 1489       on 30/01/1930 (New) NPT on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 1491       on 31/01/1930 (New) NPT on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2235 m/e 10/1918 SKN Stockton (New) on 09/06/1930 NPT on 17/11/1936 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2253 on 31/10/1923 SKN Stockton on 09/06/1930 NPT on 09/04/1931 SBK Starbeck
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2265 on 19/09/1924 SKN Stockton on 09/06/1930 NPT on 11/09/1944 NEV Neville Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2274 m/e 05/1920 SKN Stockton (New) on 09/06/1930 NPT on 09/05/1941 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1708 m/e 05/1902 SBK Starbeck (New) on 09/04/1931 NPT on 05/05/1931 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1717 m/e 06/1902 SBK Starbeck (New) on 09/04/1931 NPT on 05/05/1931 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1279 on 23/04/1931 HAV Haverton Hill on 05/05/1931 NPT on 05/04/1948 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2285 m/e 07/1920 SKN Stockton (New) on 05/05/1931 NPT on 15/05/1948 MID Middlesbrough
Steam J39 0-6-0 1412       on 15/03/1934 (New) NPT on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 1468       on 17/03/1934 (New) NPT on 05/11/1938 DAR Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 1463       on 19/03/1934 (New) NPT on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 1467       on 22/03/1934 (New) NPT on 19/06/1939 TWD Tweedmouth
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1149 on 17/02/1925 SEL Selby on 13/08/1934 NPT on 07/11/1938 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1177 on 05/02/1932 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 20/09/1934 NPT on 16/10/1939 SKN Stockton
Steam Q5 0-8-0 652 on 05/02/1932 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 20/09/1934 NPT on 03/03/1941 AUK West Auckland
Steam Q5 0-8-0 656 on 05/02/1932 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 20/09/1934 NPT on 06/02/1937 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q5 0-8-0 771 on 05/02/1932 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 20/09/1934 NPT on 08/01/1944 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2288 m/e 09/1920 BOR Borough Gardens (New) on 09/10/1934 NPT on 30/05/1948 NEV Neville Hill
Steam J39 0-6-0 1475       on 19/10/1934 (New) NPT on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 1476       on 24/10/1934 (New) NPT on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 1477       on 29/10/1934 (New) NPT on 31/07/1939 SEL Selby
Steam J39 0-6-0 1478       on 14/11/1934 (New) NPT on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 1479       on 07/12/1934 (New) NPT on 23/01/1936 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q5 0-8-0 2119 m/e 10/1901 SHI Shildon (New) on 07/01/1935 NPT on 06/02/1937 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q5 0-8-0 939 m/e 06/1907 SHI Shildon (New) on 07/01/1935 NPT on 23/07/1945 BLA Blaydon
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1031 on 05/06/1929 SHI Shildon on 07/01/1935 NPT on 15/07/1939 SEL Selby
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1054 on 05/06/1929 SHI Shildon on 07/01/1935 NPT on 08/01/1944 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q5 0-8-0 642 m/e 06/1911 SHI Shildon (New) on 07/01/1935 NPT on 16/10/1939 SKN Stockton
Steam Q5 0-8-0 657 m/e 06/1911 SHI Shildon (New) on 07/01/1935 NPT on 08/01/1944 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1694 on 19/03/1928 HAV Haverton Hill on 25/01/1935 NPT on 06/02/1937 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q5 0-8-0 770 on 23/04/1931 HAV Haverton Hill on 25/01/1935 NPT on 20/01/1947 SKN Stockton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1486       on 05/12/1935 (New) NPT on 23/01/1936 MID Middlesbrough
Steam J39 0-6-0 1448 on 07/04/1930 MID Middlesbrough on 23/01/1936 NPT on 23/03/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 1449 on 07/04/1930 MID Middlesbrough on 23/01/1936 NPT on 23/03/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2233 m/e 03/1926 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 22/02/1936 NPT on 04/12/1943 SKN Stockton
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1247 on 21/02/1927 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 18/04/1936 NPT on 29/07/1939 TDK Tyne Dock
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2224 on 18/11/1929 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 18/04/1936 NPT on 29/09/1944 DAR Darlington
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2273 on 18/11/1929 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 21/05/1936 NPT on 05/12/1948 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam J39 0-6-0 1532 on 14/10/1936 GOR Gorton (New) on 08/11/1936 NPT on 06/02/1937 MID Middlesbrough
Steam J39 0-6-0 1534 on 21/10/1936 GOR Gorton (New) on 11/11/1936 NPT on 04/07/1938 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam J39 0-6-0 1533 on 12/11/1936 NEV Neville Hill on 19/11/1936 NPT on 06/02/1937 MID Middlesbrough
Steam J39 0-6-0 1536 on 18/11/1936 NEV Neville Hill on 19/11/1936 NPT on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 1544 on 12/11/1936 NEV Neville Hill on 19/11/1936 NPT on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 1539 on 28/10/1936 GOR Gorton (New) on 24/11/1936 NPT on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 1543 on 04/11/1936 GOR Gorton (New) on 30/11/1936 NPT on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2249 on 28/06/1936 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 05/05/1937 NPT on 27/05/1937 HAV Haverton Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2223 on 18/12/1933 MEX Mexborough on 06/05/1937 NPT on 27/05/1937 HAV Haverton Hill
Steam Q5 0-8-0 2122 on 05/12/1936 MEX Mexborough on 08/05/1937 NPT on 07/11/1938 MID Middlesbrough
Steam A7 4-6-2T 1181 m/e 03/1911 WHL West Hartlepool (New) on 27/05/1937 NPT on 16/10/1939 SKN Stockton
Steam A7 4-6-2T 1191 m/e 05/1911 WHL West Hartlepool (New) on 27/05/1937 NPT on 27/09/1938 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam J39 0-6-0 1537       on 16/02/1938 (New) NPT on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 1538       on 18/02/1938 (New) NPT on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 1541       on 24/02/1938 (New) NPT on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 1542       on 02/03/1938 (New) NPT on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 1546       on 04/03/1938 (New) NPT on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 1548       on 09/03/1938 (New) NPT on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam Q5 0-8-0 793 m/e 11/1911 NBH Blyth (North) (New) on 23/03/1938 NPT on 01/10/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Q5 0-8-0 785 on 24/06/1937 TDK Tyne Dock on 29/03/1938 NPT on 28/03/1943 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q5 0-8-0 661 m/e 07/1911 SEL Selby (New) on 25/04/1938 NPT on 28/03/1943 TDK Tyne Dock
Steam J39 0-6-0 1534 on 04/07/1938 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 12/10/1938 NPT on 12/06/1939 SEL Selby
Steam Q5 0-8-0 2120 on 06/02/1937 MID Middlesbrough on 07/11/1938 NPT on 28/03/1943 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1708 on 05/05/1931 MID Middlesbrough on 07/11/1938 NPT on 05/06/1939 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1110 on 29/03/1938 MID Middlesbrough on 07/11/1938 NPT on 16/06/1939 SEL Selby
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1178 on 06/02/1937 MID Middlesbrough on 07/11/1938 NPT on 03/01/1944 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q5 0-8-0 794 on 06/02/1937 MID Middlesbrough on 07/11/1938 NPT on 08/01/1944 MID Middlesbrough
Steam A7 4-6-2T 1176 on 27/09/1938 WHL West Hartlepool on 10/04/1939 NPT on 24/06/1939 YK York (North)
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1251 m/e 02/1913 BOR Borough Gardens (New) on 12/04/1939 NPT on 10/06/1956 51G Haverton Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1254 on 20/06/1928 BOR Borough Gardens on 12/04/1939 NPT on 08/09/1944 NEV Neville Hill
Steam Q5 0-8-0 83 on 07/11/1938 DAR Darlington on 15/04/1939 NPT on 28/03/1943 TDK Tyne Dock
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1280 on 08/11/1925 SEL Selby on 10/06/1939 NPT on 04/12/1943 SKN Stockton
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1250 on 25/10/1925 SEL Selby on 19/06/1939 NPT on 10/06/1956 51G Haverton Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2245 on 03/07/1930 SEL Selby on 19/06/1939 NPT on 14/01/1946 TDK Tyne Dock
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2256 m/e 1925 SEL Selby on 19/06/1939 NPT on 01/02/1943 SKN Stockton
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2284 on 03/07/1930 SEL Selby on 19/06/1939 NPT on 01/02/1943 SKN Stockton
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2248 on 04/12/1930 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 24/06/1939 NPT on 27/06/1948 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1288 m/e 06/1913 SEL Selby (New) on 16/08/1939 NPT on 01/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2286 on 03/07/1930 SEL Selby on 17/08/1939 NPT on 30/05/1948 NEV Neville Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1247 on 29/07/1939 TDK Tyne Dock on 19/08/1939 NPT on 01/02/1943 SKN Stockton
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2294 on 01/02/1927 BOR Borough Gardens on 09/05/1941 NPT on 12/09/1944 NEV Neville Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2235 on 01/04/1940 WHL West Hartlepool on 03/09/1942 NPT on 04/12/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2259 on 23/03/1939 WHL West Hartlepool on 03/09/1942 NPT on 04/12/1943 SKN Stockton
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2262 on 17/04/1939 WHL West Hartlepool on 03/09/1942 NPT on 12/05/1948 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam Q7 0-8-0 626 on 06/09/1941 WHL West Hartlepool on 03/09/1942 NPT on 14/09/1942 DAR Darlington
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2252 on 14/05/1941 DAR Darlington on 14/09/1942 NPT on 15/05/1948 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1731 on 16/10/1939 SKN Stockton on 01/02/1943 NPT on 28/03/1943 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1177 on 16/10/1939 SKN Stockton on 01/02/1943 NPT on 20/01/1947 SKN Stockton
Steam Q5 0-8-0 642 on 16/10/1939 SKN Stockton on 01/02/1943 NPT on 28/03/1943 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1311 on 29/03/1941 BLA Blaydon on 28/03/1943 NPT on 09/09/1944 NEV Neville Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1363 m/e 09/1913 TDK Tyne Dock (New) on 28/03/1943 NPT on 08/09/1944 NEV Neville Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2214 on 15/02/1941 BLA Blaydon on 28/03/1943 NPT on 01/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2218 on 09/10/1934 BLA Blaydon on 28/03/1943 NPT on 25/05/1948 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2225 on 15/07/1939 BLA Blaydon on 28/03/1943 NPT on 04/12/1943 SEL Selby
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2232 on 02/05/1941 TDK Tyne Dock on 28/03/1943 NPT on 04/12/1943 SKN Stockton
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2238 m/e 12/1918 BLA Blaydon (New) on 28/03/1943 NPT on 04/12/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2240 m/e 03/1926 BLA Blaydon on 28/03/1943 NPT on 12/05/1948 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2242 on 08/03/1937 BLA Blaydon on 28/03/1943 NPT on 04/12/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2247 on 15/02/1941 BLA Blaydon on 28/03/1943 NPT on 14/01/1946 CON Consett
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2258 on 14/09/1942 NLN Northallerton on 28/03/1943 NPT on 27/06/1948 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2260 on 26/11/1931 BLA Blaydon on 28/03/1943 NPT on 07/11/1948 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2263 on 03/05/1923 TDK Tyne Dock on 28/03/1943 NPT on 07/11/1948 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2266 m/e 03/1920 BLA Blaydon (New) on 28/03/1943 NPT on 13/02/1949 HAV Haverton Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2268 on 10/04/1940 TDK Tyne Dock on 28/03/1943 NPT on 12/05/1948 HAV Haverton Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2272 on 15/02/1941 BLA Blaydon on 28/03/1943 NPT on 12/09/1944 NEV Neville Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2279 on 29/03/1941 BLA Blaydon on 28/03/1943 NPT on 02/09/1944 NEV Neville Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2293 m/e 11/1920 TDK Tyne Dock (New) on 28/03/1943 NPT on 12/09/1944 NEV Neville Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2296 on 08/07/1939 BLA Blaydon on 28/03/1943 NPT on 11/07/1948 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2300 on 29/03/1941 BLA Blaydon on 28/03/1943 NPT on 29/09/1944 DAR Darlington
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2301 on 10/05/1940 TDK Tyne Dock on 28/03/1943 NPT on 16/03/1948 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2302 on 01/03/1940 TDK Tyne Dock on 28/03/1943 NPT on 01/03/1948 SKN Stockton
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1669 on 06/02/1937 MID Middlesbrough on 20/09/1944 NPT on 02/11/1947 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q5 0-8-0 658 on 29/05/1931 MID Middlesbrough on 20/09/1944 NPT on 02/11/1947 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1252 on 19/06/1943 HAV Haverton Hill on 20/09/1944 NPT on 10/06/1956 51G Haverton Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1284 on 10/07/1943 DAR Darlington on 20/09/1944 NPT on 04/09/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1335 on 28/03/1943 SKN Stockton on 20/09/1944 NPT on 15/02/1948 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2239 on 21/06/1943 SKN Stockton on 20/09/1944 NPT on 01/06/1948 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2274 on 19/06/1943 SKN Stockton on 20/09/1944 NPT on 05/12/1948 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1704 on 06/02/1937 MID Middlesbrough on 22/09/1944 NPT on 26/04/1947 Withdrawn
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1694 on 06/02/1937 MID Middlesbrough on 22/09/1944 NPT on 02/11/1947 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q5 0-8-0 653 on 07/11/1938 MID Middlesbrough on 22/09/1944 NPT on 02/11/1947 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2222 on 28/03/1943 SKN Stockton on 22/09/1944 NPT on 14/01/1946 TDK Tyne Dock
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1261 on 21/06/1943 SKN Stockton on 23/09/1944 NPT on 07/02/1948 SKN Stockton
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2281 on 14/06/1941 SKN Stockton on 23/09/1944 NPT on 12/12/1948 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1253 on 19/06/1943 HAV Haverton Hill on 29/09/1944 NPT on 14/01/1946 TDK Tyne Dock
Steam O4 2-8-0 5404 on 02/09/1942 WHL West Hartlepool on 05/10/1944 NPT on 18/10/1944 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam O4 2-8-0 6352 on 13/03/1944 WHL West Hartlepool on 05/10/1944 NPT on 18/10/1944 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam O4 2-8-0 6606 on 20/01/1944 WHL West Hartlepool on 05/10/1944 NPT on 18/10/1944 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam O4 2-8-0 5008 on 03/09/1942 WHL West Hartlepool on 05/10/1944 NPT on 18/10/1944 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam O4 2-8-0 6616 on 10/05/1940 WHL West Hartlepool on 05/10/1944 NPT on 18/10/1944 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2216 on 04/12/1943 HAV Haverton Hill on 18/10/1944 NPT on 13/11/1949 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2227 on 19/06/1943 HAV Haverton Hill on 18/10/1944 NPT on 15/02/1948 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2229 on 19/06/1943 HAV Haverton Hill on 18/10/1944 NPT on 15/02/1948 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2244 on 19/06/1943 HAV Haverton Hill on 18/10/1944 NPT on 05/12/1948 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2254 on 19/06/1943 HAV Haverton Hill on 18/10/1944 NPT on 07/11/1948 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1254 on 08/09/1944 NEV Neville Hill on 23/07/1945 NPT on 10/06/1956 51G Haverton Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1262 on 24/08/1944 NEV Neville Hill on 23/07/1945 NPT on 13/02/1948 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1278 on 09/09/1944 NEV Neville Hill on 23/07/1945 NPT on 06/03/1948 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q6 0-8-0 3370 on 21/06/1943 SKN Stockton on 13/04/1947 NPT on 01/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam Q6 0-8-0 3389 on 04/12/1943 SKN Stockton on 13/04/1947 NPT on 01/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam Q6 0-8-0 3426 on 28/03/1943 SKN Stockton on 13/04/1947 NPT on 01/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam Q6 0-8-0 3422 on 11/09/1944 NEV Neville Hill on 04/05/1947 NPT on 07/09/1947 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam Q5 0-8-0 3317 on 28/03/1943 BLA Blaydon on 20/07/1947 NPT on 02/11/1947 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q5 0-8-0 3327 on 28/03/1943 WHL West Hartlepool on 07/09/1947 NPT on 22/11/1948 Withdrawn
Steam J26 0-6-0 5730       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5731       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 22/10/1955 51F West Auckland
Steam J26 0-6-0 5734       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5735       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 22/10/1955 51F West Auckland
Steam J26 0-6-0 5736       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5737       on 01/01/1948 NPT 4w/e 19/01/1952 51D Middlesbrough
Steam J26 0-6-0 5738       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5739       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 24/03/1951 51E Stockton
Steam J26 0-6-0 5740       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5742       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5743       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5744       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5745       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5746       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5749       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5753       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5754       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5755       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5763       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5765       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5766       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5767       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5768       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5769       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5750       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5751       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5752       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5756       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5757       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5758       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5759       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5760       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5762       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5770       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5772       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5773       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5774       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5777       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J26 0-6-0 5778       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8007       on 01/01/1948 NPT 4w/e 17/11/1956 51A Darlington
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8011       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8023       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8041       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 23/06/1951 54A Sunderland
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8060       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8062       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam T1 4-8-0T 9910       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 22/10/1955 50A York (North)
Steam T1 4-8-0T 9911       on 01/01/1948 NPT on 19/03/1957 Withdrawn
Steam T1 4-8-0T 9913       on 01/01/1948 NPT 4w/e 17/11/1956 50A York (North)
Steam T1 4-8-0T 9916       on 01/01/1948 NPT 5w/e 22/10/1955 50A York (North)
Steam T1 4-8-0T 9917       on 01/01/1948 NPT 3w/e 16/06/1956 54D Consett
Steam T1 4-8-0T 9919       on 01/01/1948 NPT 4w/e 21/07/1951 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam T1 4-8-0T 9921       on 01/01/1948 NPT 4w/e 17/09/1955 51E Stockton
Steam Q5 0-8-0 3300 on 05/04/1948 NEV Neville Hill on 30/05/1948 NPT on 16/05/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Q5 0-8-0 3293 on 20/07/1947 WHL West Hartlepool on 05/12/1948 NPT on 24/04/1949 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63431 on 05/12/1948 WHL West Hartlepool on 12/12/1948 NPT on 04/09/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam Q5 0-8-0 63256 on 27/06/1948 BOR Borough Gardens on 06/02/1949 NPT on 22/01/1950 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q5 0-8-0 63274 on 28/03/1943 TDK Tyne Dock on 06/02/1949 NPT on 18/09/1950 Withdrawn
Steam Q5 0-8-0 63281 on 28/03/1943 WHL West Hartlepool on 06/02/1949 NPT on 01/05/1949 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q5 0-8-0 63290 on 14/11/1948 WHL West Hartlepool on 06/02/1949 NPT on 24/04/1949 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q5 0-8-0 63311 on 14/11/1948 WHL West Hartlepool on 06/02/1949 NPT on 01/05/1949 HAV Haverton Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63388 on 28/03/1943 BOR Borough Gardens on 06/02/1949 NPT on 01/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam Q6 0-8-0 3443 on 30/05/1948 NEV Neville Hill on 06/02/1949 NPT on 13/02/1949 HAV Haverton Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 3445 on 30/05/1948 NEV Neville Hill on 06/02/1949 NPT on 01/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63447 on 28/03/1943 SEL Selby on 06/02/1949 NPT on 01/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63430 on 05/12/1948 WHL West Hartlepool on 13/11/1949 NPT on 01/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90044       4w/e 23/09/1950 51B 5w/e 24/07/1954 50A York (North)
Steam J27 0-6-0 65860 on 01/01/1948 SKN Stockton 5w/e 24/03/1951 51B 4w/e 17/11/1956 51A Darlington
Steam T1 4-8-0T 69915 on 01/01/1948 HLD Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 21/07/1951 51B 5w/e 22/10/1955 50A York (North)
Steam J21 0-6-0 65038 on 01/01/1948 DAR Darlington 4w/e 19/01/1952 51B 4w/e 17/05/1952 51J Northallerton
Steam J26 0-6-0 65733 on 01/01/1948 MID Middlesbrough 4w/e 19/01/1952 51B 5w/e 22/10/1955 51F West Auckland
Steam T1 4-8-0T 69922 on 01/01/1948 HLD Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 20/09/1952 51B 5w/e 22/10/1955 50A York (North)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90435 4w/e 25/11/1950 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 15/11/1952 51B 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Diesel 10 0-6-0 13144       on 21/06/1955 (New) 51B 5w/e 21/01/1956 51A Darlington
Diesel 10 0-6-0 13145       on 22/06/1955 (New) 51B 5w/e 21/01/1956 51A Darlington
Diesel 10 0-6-0 13146       on 07/07/1955 (New) 51B 5w/e 21/01/1956 51A Darlington
Diesel 10 0-6-0 13147       on 12/07/1955 (New) 51B 5w/e 21/01/1956 51A Darlington
Diesel 10 0-6-0 13148       on 15/07/1955 (New) 51B 5w/e 21/01/1956 51A Darlington
Diesel 10 0-6-0 13149       on 21/07/1955 (New) 51B 5w/e 21/01/1956 51A Darlington
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90475 4w/e 14/05/1955 51A Darlington 5w/e 23/07/1955 51B 5w/e 20/07/1957 50A York (North)
Diesel 10 0-6-0 13150       on 28/07/1955 (New) 51B 5w/e 21/01/1956 51A Darlington
Diesel 10 0-6-0 13151       on 08/08/1955 (New) 51B 5w/e 21/01/1956 51A Darlington
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13227       on 13/12/1955 (New) 51B 5w/e 21/01/1956 51A Darlington
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90424 4w/e 19/06/1954 50A York (North) 3w/e 16/06/1956 51B 5w/e 20/07/1957 50A York (North)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90603 5w/e 24/07/1954 50A York (North) 3w/e 16/06/1956 51B 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90409 5w/e 17/12/1955 50A York (North) 3w/e 16/06/1956 51B 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90500 4w/e 20/06/1953 50A York (North) 3w/e 16/06/1956 51B 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90517 5w/e 24/07/1954 50A York (North) 3w/e 16/06/1956 51B 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45045 4w/e 17/07/1951 7C Holyhead 4w/e 06/10/1956 51B w/e 31/12/1960 5A Crewe North
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63432 on 27/07/1947 BLA Blaydon on 15/09/1957 51B on 27/10/1957 50C Selby
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63353 on 01/07/1956 52F Blyth (North) on 29/09/1957 51B on 01/06/1958 51F West Auckland
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63398 on 01/07/1956 52F Blyth (North) on 29/09/1957 51B on 01/06/1958 51F West Auckland
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63403 on 01/07/1956 52F Blyth (North) on 29/09/1957 51B on 01/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63428 on 01/07/1956 52F Blyth (North) on 29/09/1957 51B on 01/06/1958 51L Thornaby
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90240       4w/e 14/12/1957 51B 5w/e 14/06/1958 51L Thornaby