Depot: Aberdare
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Aberdare | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5245 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | ABDR | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | Aberdare | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2484 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | ABDR | 4w/e | 22/07/1939 | 66 | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3605 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | ABDR | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | Aberdare | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6410 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | ABDR | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | Aberdare |
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 282 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 284 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | m/e | 11/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 311 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 314 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | m/e | 12/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2117 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2801 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | m/e | 30/06/1948 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2806 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2808 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2810 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | CHR | Chester West | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2811 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | PPRD | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2822 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | SDN | Swindon | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2823 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 81F | Oxford | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2828 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | m/e | 01/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2831 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | m/e | 01/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2836 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 81F | Oxford | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2841 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | SDN | Swindon | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2870 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | m/e | 06/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2880 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 81C | Southall | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3605 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | ABDR | Aberdare | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3610 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3655 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | on | 18/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3747 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3753 | m/e | 11/1937 | 26 | (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | m/e | 01/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7242 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4228 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 88H | Tondu | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4257 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4264 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4285 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | m/e | 30/06/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4297 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 83E | St Blazey | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5237 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5245 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | ABDR | Aberdare | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 85C | Hereford |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7221 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 88C | Barry | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7205 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | m/e | 30/04/1948 | RYR | Radyr | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7213 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 84B | Oxley | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5520 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | m/e | 30/04/1948 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5770 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5787 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5796 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6410 | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | ABDR | Aberdare | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6413 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 14D | Neasden | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6437 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6605 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 88B | Radyr | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6628 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 88E | Abercynon | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6652 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6692 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6693 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7423 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | m/e | 07/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7748 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86B | Newport Pill | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7773 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | m/e | 12/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9607 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | m/e | 03/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9609 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 86F | Tondu | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9712 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 1769 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | m/e | 04/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5258 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | on | 19/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5263 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | A1 | 0-6-2T | 65 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 362 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 374 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7720 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | m/e | 30/04/1948 | ABDR | m/e | 05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6622 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 31/05/1948 | ABDR | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | SED | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5649 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | ABDR | m/e | 03/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6651 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | ABDR | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6622 | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | OXF | Oxford | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | ABDR | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2159 | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 86J | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8786 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 86J | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2159 | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 86J | Aberdare | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 86J | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 86B | Newport Pill |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5638 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | PILL | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86J | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5638 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86J | Aberdare | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86J | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6654 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 86J | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6654 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 86J | Aberdare | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 86J | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 357 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 86J | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4290 | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 86J | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4296 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | SED | Swansea East Dock | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 86J | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4272 | on | 15/06/1947 | NEA | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86J | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7216 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86J | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6685 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86J | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4266 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86J | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4272 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86J | Aberdare | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86J | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7216 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86J | Aberdare | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86J | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6685 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86J | Aberdare | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86J | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6692 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 86J | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 371 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 86J | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 385 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 86J | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6692 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 86J | Aberdare | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 86J | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 371 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 86J | Aberdare | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 86J | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 385 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 86J | Aberdare | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 86J | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 88E | Abercynon |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2862 | on | 14/10/1948 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 86J | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2863 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86B | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 86J | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2862 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 86J | Aberdare | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 86J | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2863 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 86J | Aberdare | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 86J | m/e | 06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3647 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 86J | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5741 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 86J | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 86B | Newport Pill |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90323 | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86J | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90573 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86J | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 208 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 86J | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3695 | on | 15/06/1947 | TDU | Tondu | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 86J | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88E | Abercynon |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4297 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 83E | St Blazey | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 86J | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3699 | on | 15/06/1947 | TDU | Tondu | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 86J | m/e | 02/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5797 | on | 15/06/1947 | TDU | Tondu | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 86J | m/e | 09/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 282 | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 86J | m/e | 06/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6687 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 86J | m/e | 05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9731 | w/e | 06/09/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 86J | m/e | 05/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2876 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 86J | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3680 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 86J | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 86D | Llantrisant |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2810 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | CHR | Chester West | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 86J | m/e | 09/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5644 | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.AYN | Abercynon | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 86J | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 88E | Abercynon |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5698 | m/e | 30/04/1948 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 86J | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6649 | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 86F | Tondu | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 86J | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6661 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | CV.AYN | Abercynon | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 86J | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6417 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 86J | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8724 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 86J | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 87C | Danygraig |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8444 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 86J | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8445 | m/e | 06/1954 | 86F | Tondu (New) | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 86J | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4263 | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 86B | Newport Pill | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 86J | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 86F | Tondu |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5624 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86F | Tondu | 4w/e | 18/06/1955 | 86J | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3716 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 86J | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4255 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86J | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6361 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86J | m/e | 05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5264 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86J | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6431 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 86J | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5633 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 86J | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4262 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86J | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88H | Tondu |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7214 | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 86J | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6431 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 86J | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 88H | Tondu |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3603 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | Exeter | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 86J | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2813 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 86J | on | 30/11/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2833 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 86J | m/e | 03/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3850 | m/e | 31/03/1948 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86J | on | 01/12/1963 | 2D | Banbury |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3866 | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 86J | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5249 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 86J | m/e | 10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5642 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 86J | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7237 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86J | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6750 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 86B | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86J | m/e | 01/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2873 | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86J | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7224 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 86J | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 83C | Exeter |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7203 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 86J | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3627 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 86J | m/e | 02/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2886 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 86J | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5240 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 88J | m/e | 02/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6664 | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 81E | Didcot | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 88J | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2874 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 88J | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6362 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 88J | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6386 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 88J | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7322 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 88J | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4257 | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 88J | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4225 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 88J | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4289 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 88J | on | 05/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7208 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 88J | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4236 | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | TDU | Tondu | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 88J | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2857 | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 88J | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6673 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86F | Tondu | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 88J | m/e | 03/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4688 | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 88J | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6690 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 88J | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4272 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 88J | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3853 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88J | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3860 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88J | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3816 | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 88J | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3822 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 88J | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3839 | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 88J | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3843 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 88J | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3845 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 88J | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3847 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 88J | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5647 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 88E | Abercynon | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 88J | m/e | 03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5680 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 88E | Abercynon | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 88J | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4252 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88J | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4257 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88J | m/e | 10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9600 | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88J | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7247 | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 88J | m/e | 03/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4279 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 88J | m/e | 01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7234 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 88J | m/e | 10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7209 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88B | Radyr | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 88J | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7214 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 88J | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9747 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 88J | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8723 | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 88J | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9711 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 88B | Radyr | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 88J | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3716 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 88B | Radyr | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 88J | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9671 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 88J | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7204 | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 88J | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5620 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 88J | m/e | 07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6627 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 87H | Neyland | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 88J | m/e | 11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8723 | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 88J | m/e | 07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6649 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 88J | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 88E | Abercynon |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7251 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 88J | m/e | 01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4278 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 88J | m/e | 07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3616 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | TDU | Tondu | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 88J | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4122 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 88G | Llantrisant | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 88J | m/e | 06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4124 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 88J | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4237 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 88J | m/e | 04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5252 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 86F | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 88J | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7212 | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 86F | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 88J | m/e | 02/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6158 | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 88J | m/e | 06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4136 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 87H | Neyland | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 88J | m/e | 06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7435 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 88J | m/e | 07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2895 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 88J | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3634 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 88J | m/e | 07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5211 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 88J | m/e | 05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7222 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 88J | m/e | 01/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6144 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 88J | m/e | 06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5200 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 88J | m/e | 03/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5256 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 88J | m/e | 03/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7253 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | 88J | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5210 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | 88J | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9678 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 88J | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4121 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 86F | Tondu | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 88J | m/e | 06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5230 | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 87F | Llanelli | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 88J | m/e | 07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3610 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 88J | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | 88J | Aberdare |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3796 | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 88J | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5226 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 88J | m/e | 03/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5242 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 88J | m/e | 12/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4258 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 88J | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5223 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 88J | m/e | 03/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4268 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 88B | Radyr | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 88J | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7226 | m/e | 11/1964 | Withdrawn | w/e | 08/11/1964 (R) | 88J | |||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7205 | m/e | 30/04/1948 | RYR | Radyr | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 88J | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3610 | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 88J | Aberdare | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | 88J | m/e | 02/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9615 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | 88J | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 88B | Radyr |