Depot: Old Oak Common
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Old Oak Common | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2912 | on | 31/07/1907 (New) | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2913 | on | 31/07/1907 (New) | PDN | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2914 | on | 31/07/1907 (New) | PDN | m/e | 01/1946 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2915 | on | 05/08/1907 (New) | PDN | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2917 | on | 13/08/1907 (New) | PDN | m/e | 10/1934 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2924 | on | 16/09/1907 (New) | PDN | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | SRD | Stafford Road | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2926 | on | 26/09/1907 (New) | PDN | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | CHR | Chester West | ||||
Steam | Great Bear | 4-6-2 | 111 | m/e | 02/1908 (New) | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4037 | m/e | 12/1913 | EXE | Exeter | on | 16/08/1915 | PDN | on | 01/07/1919 | OXF | Oxford |
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4032 | on | 03/11/1910 | LA | Laira (New) | on | 23/06/1917 | PDN | on | 14/01/1925 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4037 | on | 01/07/1919 | OXF | Oxford | on | 25/07/1919 | PDN | m/e | 12/1919 | OXF | Oxford |
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4037 | m/e | 12/1919 | OXF | Oxford | on | 06/10/1920 | PDN | on | 02/07/1926 | SRD | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4073 | on | 11/08/1923 (New) | PDN | m/e | 08/1924 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4075 | m/e | 01/1924 | n/a | Unallocated (New) | on | 04/02/1924 | PDN | on | 15/04/1926 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4076 | on | 07/02/1924 (New) | PDN | on | 30/11/1932 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4077 | on | 10/02/1924 (New) | PDN | on | 08/10/1929 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4078 | on | 24/02/1924 (New) | PDN | on | 23/04/1931 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4079 | on | 04/03/1924 (New) | PDN | on | 17/05/1925 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4080 | on | 23/03/1924 (New) | PDN | on | 02/09/1926 | LA | Laira | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4074 | m/e | 12/1923 | n/a | Unallocated (New) | m/e | 04/1924 | PDN | m/e | 12/1931 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4081 | m/e | 03/1924 | n/a | Unallocated (New) | on | 06/04/1924 | PDN | on | 05/03/1929 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4082 | on | 12/04/1924 (New) | PDN | on | 25/05/1928 | NA | Newton Abbot | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4073 | on | 11/08/1923 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | m/e | 08/1924 | PDN | on | 06/11/1924 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4073 | m/e | 08/1924 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 06/11/1924 | PDN | on | 04/03/1934 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4083 | on | 09/05/1925 (New) | PDN | on | 05/06/1932 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4079 | on | 04/03/1924 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 17/05/1925 | PDN | on | 13/04/1926 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4089 | on | 08/07/1925 (New) | PDN | on | 15/06/1928 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4091 | on | 01/08/1925 (New) | PDN | on | 30/06/1930 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4092 | on | 06/08/1925 (New) | PDN | on | 26/05/1926 | SRD | Stafford Road | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4090 | on | 15/08/1925 (New) | PDN | on | 20/06/1931 | LA | Laira | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4016 | on | 27/02/1926 | PDN | on | 01/04/1926 | SRD | Stafford Road | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4009 | on | 09/06/1923 | LA | Laira | on | 10/04/1926 | PDN | on | 25/06/1926 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4016 | on | 01/04/1926 | SRD | Stafford Road | on | 25/05/1926 | PDN | on | 16/08/1926 | SRD | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4093 | on | 26/05/1926 (New) | PDN | on | 15/10/1932 | TYS | Tyseley | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4094 | on | 05/06/1926 (New) | PDN | on | 22/12/1929 | LA | Laira | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4079 | on | 13/04/1926 | LA | Laira | on | 25/06/1926 | PDN | on | 11/09/1931 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4097 | on | 30/06/1926 (New) | PDN | on | 02/08/1929 | WOS | Worcester | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4098 | on | 29/07/1926 (New) | PDN | on | 02/12/1929 | NA | Newton Abbot | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4099 | on | 03/08/1926 (New) | PDN | on | 02/03/1931 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5001 | on | 21/08/1926 (New) | PDN | on | 26/08/1931 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4037 | on | 02/07/1926 | SRD | Stafford Road | on | 27/08/1926 | PDN | on | 12/11/1926 | SRD | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5000 | on | 28/08/1926 (New) | PDN | m/e | 02/1933 | LA | Laira | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5002 | on | 28/08/1926 (New) | PDN | on | 18/06/1929 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4092 | on | 26/05/1926 | SRD | Stafford Road | on | 05/09/1926 | PDN | on | 28/04/1931 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5003 | on | 28/05/1927 (New) | PDN | on | 09/06/1934 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5005 | on | 11/06/1927 (New) | PDN | on | 09/07/1930 | TN | Taunton | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5006 | on | 11/06/1927 (New) | PDN | m/e | 06/1933 | LA | Laira | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5010 | on | 26/07/1927 (New) | PDN | on | 26/07/1930 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4081 | on | 05/03/1929 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | on | 15/03/1929 | PDN | on | 09/01/1931 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4089 | on | 15/06/1928 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 17/09/1929 | PDN | on | 20/12/1932 | SRD | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5009 | m/e | 09/1927 | NA | Newton Abbot | on | 19/09/1929 | PDN | on | 08/07/1932 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4037 | on | 09/08/1929 | SRD | Stafford Road | on | 27/01/1930 | PDN | m/e | 03/1933 | CARM | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4085 | on | 10/06/1925 | LA | Laira (New) | on | 01/04/1930 | PDN | on | 12/02/1932 | CARM | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5008 | on | 30/06/1927 | LA | Laira (New) | on | 20/12/1930 | PDN | on | 23/12/1930 | CARM | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4097 | on | 11/09/1929 | CARM | Carmarthen | on | 23/12/1930 | PDN | on | 06/01/1931 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4000 | on | 16/12/1930 | NA | Newton Abbot | on | 01/08/1931 | PDN | on | 22/06/1934 | SALOP | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4082 | on | 13/05/1929 | LA | Laira | on | 23/08/1931 | PDN | on | 16/12/1932 | SRD | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5001 | on | 26/08/1931 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 20/09/1931 | PDN | on | 14/04/1935 | SRD | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5012 | on | 13/09/1929 | CARM | Carmarthen | on | 10/10/1931 | PDN | on | 15/06/1932 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4032 | on | 27/03/1929 | NA | Newton Abbot | on | 19/03/1932 | PDN | on | 01/04/1933 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5005 | m/e | 01/1931 | LA | Laira | on | 21/05/1932 | PDN | on | 21/12/1945 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5012 | on | 15/06/1932 | NA | Newton Abbot | on | 04/07/1932 | PDN | m/e | 01/1933 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5016 | on | 09/07/1932 (New) | PDN | m/e | 12/1933 | NA | Newton Abbot | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5018 | on | 28/07/1932 (New) | PDN | on | 23/01/1936 | NA | Newton Abbot | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5022 | on | 30/08/1932 (New) | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4075 | on | 20/11/1931 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 17/09/1932 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5007 | on | 30/06/1927 | LA | Laira (New) | on | 15/10/1932 | PDN | on | 08/03/1935 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4093 | on | 15/10/1932 | TYS | Tyseley | on | 24/10/1932 | PDN | m/e | 12/1933 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4078 | on | 23/04/1931 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 17/12/1932 | PDN | on | 10/07/1935 | 4A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4076 | on | 30/11/1932 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 04/01/1933 | PDN | on | 20/01/1933 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4082 | on | 16/12/1932 | SRD | Stafford Road | on | 22/02/1933 | PDN | on | 25/08/1935 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4098 | on | 12/11/1930 | NA | Newton Abbot | m/e | 06/1933 | PDN | on | 29/05/1934 | TN | Taunton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5008 | on | 09/03/1932 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 06/1933 | PDN | on | 06/12/1938 | WOS | Worcester |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4083 | on | 05/06/1932 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 07/1933 | PDN | on | 28/12/1934 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4087 | on | 29/07/1932 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 07/1933 | PDN | on | 21/02/1936 | EXE | Exeter |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5017 | on | 09/11/1932 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 11/1933 | PDN | on | 29/12/1934 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4009 | m/e | 05/1933 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 20/04/1934 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5025 | on | 01/05/1934 (New) | PDN | on | 07/03/1936 | EXE | Exeter | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5023 | on | 02/05/1934 (New) | PDN | on | 22/04/1936 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5027 | on | 12/05/1934 (New) | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4037 | on | 19/12/1933 | CARM | Carmarthen | on | 18/05/1934 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5029 | on | 28/05/1934 (New) | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4099 | m/e | 07/1933 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 16/06/1934 | PDN | on | 17/10/1936 | EXE | Exeter |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4086 | on | 14/07/1934 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 20/10/1934 | PDN | m/e | 11/1934 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4073 | on | 02/10/1934 | LDR | Landore | on | 06/04/1935 | PDN | m/e | 02/1939 | OXF | Oxford |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5037 | on | 08/06/1935 (New) | PDN | on | 04/02/1936 | TYS | Tyseley | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5038 | on | 21/06/1935 (New) | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5039 | on | 25/06/1935 (New) | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5040 | on | 01/07/1935 (New) | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4084 | m/e | 10/1934 | LDR | Landore | on | 03/07/1935 | PDN | on | 21/03/1938 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5042 | on | 11/07/1935 (New) | PDN | on | 09/09/1935 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6137 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6144 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7731 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | PDN | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | SLO | Slough | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4090 | m/e | 04/1935 | PZ | Penzance | on | 30/11/1935 | PDN | on | 22/03/1937 | LA | Laira |
Steam | 2361 | 0-6-0 | 2376 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | PDN | m/e | 12/1938 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2818 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4021 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | PDN | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | OXF | Oxford | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4938 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | OXF | Oxford | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5010 | on | 24/04/1934 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 14/12/1935 | PDN | on | 31/12/1935 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5006 | on | 29/06/1934 | LDR | Landore | on | 17/12/1935 | PDN | on | 24/04/1938 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5014 | m/e | 04/1934 | NA | Newton Abbot | on | 19/12/1935 | PDN | on | 16/07/1938 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5004 | on | 04/04/1934 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 21/12/1935 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4961 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | OXF | Oxford | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5931 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5939 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6146 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | SLO | Slough | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6151 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | SLO | Slough | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5037 | on | 04/02/1936 | TYS | Tyseley | m/e | 03/1936 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6164 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | SLO | Slough | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5043 | on | 13/03/1936 (New) | PDN | m/e | 12/1941 | SDN | Swindon | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5042 | on | 09/09/1935 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 21/03/1936 | PDN | on | 24/05/1936 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5044 | on | 29/03/1936 (New) | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5045 | on | 03/04/1936 (New) | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4089 | on | 02/11/1935 | LDR | Landore | on | 05/04/1936 | PDN | m/e | 30/04/1936 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5009 | on | 06/03/1936 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | on | 05/04/1936 | PDN | m/e | 05/1936 | EXE | Exeter |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5018 | on | 23/01/1936 | NA | Newton Abbot | on | 07/04/1936 | PDN | m/e | 02/1945 | SRD | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5000 | m/e | 02/1933 | LA | Laira | on | 19/04/1936 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5054 | on | 13/06/1936 (New) | PDN | on | 01/04/1938 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5055 | on | 14/06/1936 (New) | PDN | m/e | 05/1939 | OXF | Oxford | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5056 | on | 28/06/1936 (New) | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5042 | on | 24/05/1936 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 16/10/1936 | PDN | on | 10/11/1936 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5036 | m/e | 01/1936 | SRD | Stafford Road | on | 28/02/1937 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4088 | on | 03/08/1935 | LA | Laira | on | 03/03/1937 | PDN | m/e | 02/1939 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4074 | on | 16/09/1934 | EXE | Exeter | on | 28/03/1937 | PDN | on | 29/08/1937 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4085 | on | 17/07/1934 | EXE | Exeter | on | 02/05/1937 | PDN | m/e | 01/1939 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5066 | on | 16/07/1937 (New) | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5067 | on | 21/07/1937 (New) | PDN | on | 20/03/1943 | SDN | Swindon | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5023 | on | 22/04/1936 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 18/11/1937 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5001 | on | 13/12/1935 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/12/1937 | PDN | on | 17/08/1939 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4082 | on | 25/08/1935 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 13/03/1938 | PDN | m/e | 02/1941 | 85 | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5069 | on | 21/06/1938 (New) | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5070 | on | 03/07/1938 (New) | PDN | m/e | 01/1939 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5074 | on | 31/07/1938 (New) | PDN | m/e | 01/1939 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5077 | on | 23/08/1938 (New) | PDN | on | 07/02/1939 | TN | Taunton | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5008 | on | 06/12/1938 | WOS | Worcester | m/e | 01/1939 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5019 | on | 13/12/1937 | LA | Laira | on | 05/02/1939 | PDN | on | 17/06/1940 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4073 | m/e | 02/1939 | OXF | Oxford | m/e | 03/1939 | PDN | on | 21/04/1943 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5079 | on | 19/05/1939 (New) | PDN | on | 13/11/1940 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5080 | on | 25/05/1939 (New) | PDN | m/e | 08/1940 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5093 | on | 25/06/1939 (New) | PDN | m/e | 08/1940 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5055 | m/e | 05/1939 | OXF | Oxford | m/e | 07/1939 | PDN | on | 15/06/1942 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5085 | on | 13/07/1939 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4091 | m/e | 10/1938 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 19/09/1939 | PDN | on | 05/08/1941 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5035 | on | 14/12/1935 | SRD | Stafford Road | on | 20/04/1940 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5015 | on | 11/12/1938 | 4A | Shrewsbury | on | 28/06/1940 | PDN | on | 23/05/1942 | 4A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5087 | on | 03/12/1940 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4074 | on | 08/04/1940 | LDR | Landore | on | 26/04/1941 | PDN | on | 01/11/1941 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4091 | on | 05/08/1941 | SDN | Swindon | on | 01/11/1941 | PDN | on | 21/03/1946 | WOS | Worcester |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5043 | m/e | 12/1941 | SDN | Swindon | on | 04/04/1942 | PDN | on | 23/05/1947 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4076 | on | 17/06/1940 | 4A | Shrewsbury | on | 24/07/1942 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5055 | on | 15/06/1942 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | m/e | 10/1942 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5014 | m/e | 10/1942 | 142 | m/e | 12/1942 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4073 | on | 21/04/1943 | SDN | Swindon | m/e | 07/1943 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5046 | on | 08/04/1936 | CDF | Cardiff Canton (New) | on | 09/09/1943 | PDN | on | 24/10/1943 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5065 | on | 03/08/1939 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 22/12/1944 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5081 | on | 03/06/1939 | SRD | Stafford Road (New) | on | 17/01/1945 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4698 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4699 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6103 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | OXF | Oxford | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | PDN | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | OXF | Oxford |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8757 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7791 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | SLO | Slough | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8738 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5099 | on | 25/05/1946 (New) | PDN | on | 24/02/1947 | SDN | Swindon | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6102 | 4w/e | 07/09/1946 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | SHL | Southall | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6962 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 07/09/1946 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4091 | on | 21/03/1946 | WOS | Worcester | on | 03/10/1946 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5099 | on | 24/02/1947 | SDN | Swindon | m/e | 05/1947 | PDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 111 | m/e | 02/1908 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 24/05/1950 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1000 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 83D | Laira | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1003 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 83D | Laira | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1008 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 84K | Chester West | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1010 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 83D | Laira | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1012 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 83D | Laira | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1015 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 83D | Laira | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1021 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 83D | Laira | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1026 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 83D | Laira | ||||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1912 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | SHL | Southall | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | OXF | Oxford |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2276 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2282 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 05/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2826 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2827 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 84C | Banbury | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2840 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | SHL | Southall | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2843 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2850 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | LLY | Llanelli | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2855 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | LLY | Llanelli | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2856 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | LA | Laira | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2868 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4800 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 107 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2875 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | LA | Laira | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2881 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4900 | on | 17/09/1907 | NA | Newton Abbot (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3600 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | NA | Newton Abbot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3618 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 14/10/1948 | OXF | Oxford | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3619 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | CHR | Chester West | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3635 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | SBZ | St Blazey | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3644 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 31/05/1948 | LTS | Llantrisant | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3646 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | TYS | Tyseley | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3648 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3658 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | TYS | Tyseley | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3659 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 14/10/1948 | OXF | Oxford | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3669 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | TN | Taunton | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3672 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3685 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3688 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3710 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3723 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3734 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | RYR | Radyr | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3738 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | SLO | Slough | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3754 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 14/07/1963 | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3766 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 30/06/1948 | SLO | Slough | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3832 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | LA | Laira | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4854 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | BAN | Banbury | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4853 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | WOS | Worcester | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3851 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | NEA | Neath (Court Sart) | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3852 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 30/06/1948 | BAN | Banbury | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3853 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 100A1 | on | 20/04/1934 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 01/03/1950 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4037 | on | 18/05/1934 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 16/06/1956 | 83G | Penzance |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4073 | m/e | 07/1943 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 15/07/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4075 | on | 17/09/1932 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 06/11/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4076 | on | 24/07/1942 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 08/1948 | SRD | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4091 | on | 03/10/1946 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 11/06/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4606 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | SHL | Southall | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4609 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4615 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 10/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4642 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4644 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4665 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 31/03/1948 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4666 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 87C | Danygraig | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4667 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | RYR | Radyr | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4680 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | OXF | Oxford | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4691 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | SLO | Slough | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4698 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4699 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 87H | Neyland |
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4700 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 81C | Southall | ||||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4701 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81C | Southall | ||||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4702 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 81C | Southall | ||||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4705 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 83D | Laira | ||||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4707 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 114 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 81C | Southall | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 3903 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4935 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | DID | Didcot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4943 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | NA | Newton Abbot | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4951 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4958 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 82C | Swindon | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4961 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4962 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 31/03/1948 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4978 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | SHL | Southall | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4985 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4998 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5000 | on | 19/04/1936 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 10/1948 | CARM | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5004 | on | 21/12/1935 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 06/1956 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5008 | m/e | 01/1939 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 21/10/1949 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5014 | m/e | 12/1942 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 14/06/1964 | 2A | Tyseley |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5022 | on | 30/08/1932 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 16/10/1947 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5023 | on | 18/11/1937 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 28/02/1950 | To Store | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5027 | on | 12/05/1934 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 04/11/1950 | 84K | Chester West |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5029 | on | 28/05/1934 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 20/03/1958 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5035 | on | 20/04/1940 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 06/09/1960 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5036 | on | 28/02/1937 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 03/1950 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5037 | m/e | 03/1936 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 07/07/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5038 | on | 21/06/1935 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 20/03/1958 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5039 | on | 25/06/1935 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 06/1952 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5040 | on | 01/07/1935 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 04/09/1961 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5043 | on | 23/05/1947 | SDN | Swindon | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 16/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5044 | on | 29/03/1936 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 04/07/1960 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5045 | on | 03/04/1936 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 28/09/1950 | 98Ss | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5055 | m/e | 10/1942 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 20/03/1958 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5056 | on | 28/06/1936 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 23/10/1950 | To Store | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5065 | on | 22/12/1944 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 26/10/1949 | To Store | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5066 | on | 16/07/1937 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 17/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5069 | on | 21/06/1938 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 30/09/1947 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5081 | on | 17/01/1945 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 13/01/1949 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5085 | on | 13/07/1939 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 10/1952 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5087 | on | 03/12/1940 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 10/02/1949 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5099 | m/e | 05/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 05/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5717 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | SLO | Slough | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5764 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 05/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5922 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | SDN | Swindon | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5931 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 87H | Neyland |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5932 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | SDN | Swindon | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5936 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5937 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 87G | Carmarthen | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5938 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 87G | Carmarthen | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5939 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5940 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | DID | Didcot | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5941 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5950 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 84C | Banbury | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5952 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 81C | Southall | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5962 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 3954 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5987 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 81E | Didcot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5996 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 81C | Southall | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6001 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 84A | Stafford Road | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6003 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 06/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6009 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6013 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 83D | Laira | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6014 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 84A | Stafford Road | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6015 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 84A | Stafford Road | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6021 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 83D | Laira | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6025 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | LA | Laira | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6007 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 83D | Laira | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6111 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 14/10/1948 | DID | Didcot | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6112 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 14/10/1948 | DID | Didcot | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6117 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | rdg | Basingstoke (GWR) | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6120 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 81E | Didcot | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6121 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6129 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6132 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | DID | Didcot | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6134 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | DID | Didcot | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6135 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6137 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6141 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 81C | Southall | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6142 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 81C | Southall | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6144 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6149 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 81C | Southall | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6155 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6158 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6159 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 81C | Southall | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6166 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6168 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 14/10/1948 | DID | Didcot | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6865 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6869 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | SHL | Southall | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6900 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6910 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 81E | Didcot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 3952 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | EXE | Exeter | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6959 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 81C | Southall | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6960 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6961 | m/e | 09/1944 | HFD | Hereford | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | SHL | Southall |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6962 | 4w/e | 07/09/1946 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7713 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | DID | Didcot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7734 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 04/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7738 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | RYR | Radyr | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7754 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | WLN | Wellington | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7760 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | OXF | Oxford | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7791 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 12/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9700 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8707 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8735 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | CV.BRY | Barry | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8738 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | LLY | Llanelli |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8750 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 81C | Southall | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8751 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8753 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 02/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8754 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 11/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8756 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 22/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8757 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8759 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8760 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8761 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 81C | Southall | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8762 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 08/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8763 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 08/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8765 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8767 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 14/07/1963 | 84B | Oxley | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8768 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8769 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 81C | Southall | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8770 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 81B | Slough | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8771 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 07/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8772 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8773 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 22/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8780 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | RYR | Radyr | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9302 | on | 01/01/1934 | 121 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 81C | Southall | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9306 | on | 01/01/1934 | 101 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9308 | on | 01/01/1934 | 101 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9310 | on | 01/01/1934 | 101 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | SHL | Southall | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9401 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9402 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9403 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 81F | Oxford | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9404 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9405 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9406 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 81B | Slough | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9407 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 81C | Southall | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9409 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 81C | Southall | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9658 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 14/07/1963 | 84A | Stafford Road | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9659 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 81C | Southall | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9661 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 14/07/1963 | 84A | Stafford Road | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9701 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 01/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9702 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 05/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9703 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 12/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9704 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9705 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 10/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9706 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 11/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9707 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 81C | Southall | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9708 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 01/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9709 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 05/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9710 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 10/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9725 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 12/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9726 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 81C | Southall | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9751 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 06/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9754 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 82C | Swindon | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9758 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9784 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | m/e | 05/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8477 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77005 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77015 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77130 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77184 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 78632 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 79234 | on | 26/03/1947 | WD | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | 23/01/1950 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5043 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 16/06/1947 | PDN | on | 17/02/1951 | To Store | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5069 | on | 30/09/1947 | SDN | Swindon | m/e | 11/1947 | PDN | on | 22/10/1952 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | D3/10 | 0-6-0 | 2 | on | 01/01/1948 | PDN | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 87C | Danygraig | ||||
Steam | 3901 | 2-6-2T | 3901 | on | 05/1934 | Withdrawn | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 (R) | PDN | |||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2843 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | PDN | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | SHL | Southall |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6117 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | PDN | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6121 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | PDN | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5022 | on | 16/10/1947 | NA | Newton Abbot | on | 02/03/1948 | PDN | m/e | 09/1948 | SRD | Stafford Road |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 3152 | on | 22/03/1948 | PDN | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 38A | Colwick | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7001 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 09/04/1948 | PDN | m/e | 31/05/1948 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2076 | on | 15/06/1947 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | m/e | 30/04/1948 | PDN | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | SHL | Southall |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5397 | on | 15/06/1947 | DID | Didcot | m/e | 31/05/1948 | PDN | on | 14/10/1948 | DID | Didcot |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6990 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | PDN | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 81F | Oxford | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7001 | on | 09/04/1948 | PDN | Old Oak Common | m/e | 31/05/1948 | PDN | on | 11/07/1953 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3803 | on | 15/06/1947 | BAN | Banbury | m/e | 30/06/1948 | PDN | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77000 | on | 16/07/1947 | WD | m/e | 30/06/1948 | PDN | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5089 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | m/e | 07/1948 | PDN | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6988 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | PDN | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5089 | m/e | 07/1948 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | PDN | on | 31/03/1949 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6017 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | PDN | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7007 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road | m/e | 09/1948 | PDN | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3803 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | PDN | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | SHL | Southall |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7007 | m/e | 09/1948 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | PDN | m/e | 02/1950 | WOS | Worcester |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6970 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | PDN | m/e | 06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7017 | m/e | 09/1948 | SDN | Swindon (New) | m/e | 11/1948 | PDN | m/e | 12/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4923 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | PDN | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5918 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | PDN | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5920 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | PDN | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5947 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | PDN | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6932 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | PDN | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86B | Newport Pill |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6985 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | PDN | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6028 | on | 15/06/1947 | NA | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | PDN | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7004 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 01/1949 | PDN | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7004 | m/e | 01/1949 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | PDN | on | 05/07/1960 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5000 | on | 14/10/1948 | CARM | Carmarthen | m/e | 02/1949 | PDN | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5081 | on | 13/01/1949 | NA | Newton Abbot | m/e | 02/1949 | PDN | on | 10/12/1954 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5087 | on | 10/02/1949 | SDN | Swindon | on | 24/02/1949 | PDN | on | 04/04/1949 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5000 | m/e | 02/1949 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | PDN | m/e | 07/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5087 | on | 04/04/1949 | SDN | Swindon | on | 02/05/1949 | PDN | on | 11/01/1962 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 15xx | 0-6-0PT | 1500 | on | 24/06/1949 (New) | PDN | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7024 | m/e | 07/1949 (New) | PDN | on | 18/08/1961 | 84A | Stafford Road | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9304 | on | 15/06/1947 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | PDN | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9305 | on | 15/06/1947 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | PDN | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6168 | on | 14/10/1948 | DID | Didcot | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | PDN | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9309 | on | 15/06/1947 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | PDN | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9315 | on | 15/06/1947 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | PDN | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6944 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | PDN | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 79234 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 23/01/1950 | PDN | on | 21/05/1950 | PDN | Old Oak Common | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4907 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 81A | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8764 | on | 15/06/1947 | SHL | Southall | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 81A | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 79234 | 23/01/1950 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 21/05/1950 | PDN | on | 24/08/1951 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7030 | on | 05/06/1950 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7030 | on | 05/06/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 81A | on | 13/02/1962 | To Store | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9418 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 81A | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 81C | Southall | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9419 | on | 30/06/1950 (New) | 81A | m/e | 03/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4016 | on | 15/06/1947 | NA | Newton Abbot | m/e | 07/1950 | 81A | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7032 | on | 05/07/1950 | 82C | Swindon (New) | on | 10/07/1950 | 81A | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4016 | m/e | 07/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 81A | on | 24/09/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6018 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 81A | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6019 | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 81A | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 88A | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7032 | on | 10/07/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 81A | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7033 | m/e | 07/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 81A | on | 27/03/1952 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7911 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 81A | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 81F | Oxford | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5065 | on | 14/04/1950 | 98S | m/e | 08/1950 | 81A | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2895 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 84K | Chester West | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 81A | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3813 | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | BAN | Banbury | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 81A | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3852 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 81A | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6002 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | SRD | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 81A | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6926 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 81A | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9422 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 81A | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2895 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 81A | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3813 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 81A | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3852 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 81A | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6002 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 81A | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6926 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 81A | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9422 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 81A | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7036 | m/e | 09/1950 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7036 | m/e | 09/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 81A | on | 14/07/1962 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5717 | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | SLO | Slough | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 81A | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5717 | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 81A | m/e | 05/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5056 | on | 23/10/1950 | 98S | on | 04/11/1950 | 81A | on | 26/07/1963 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5026 | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | LA | Laira | on | 07/11/1950 | 81A | on | 02/12/1950 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5034 | on | 09/10/1950 | 98S | on | 11/11/1950 | 81A | m/e | 12/1950 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5994 | on | 15/06/1947 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 81A | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5994 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 81A | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5060 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | LA | Laira | on | 13/01/1951 | 81A | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4089 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | LA | Laira | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 81A | on | 20/07/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4097 | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 83D | Laira | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 81A | on | 02/10/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5057 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 81A | on | 01/03/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5060 | on | 13/01/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 81A | on | 22/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5095 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 81A | on | 16/02/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7027 | m/e | 11/1949 | LA | Laira | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 81A | on | 17/10/1951 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5076 | m/e | 04/1948 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 07/02/1951 | 81A | on | 17/02/1951 | To Store | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5095 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common | on | 16/02/1951 | 81A | on | 18/01/1957 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3715 | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 81B | Slough | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 81A | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5057 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common | on | 01/03/1951 | 81A | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3715 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 81A | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2858 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 81A | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5076 | on | 17/02/1951 | 98S | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 81A | m/e | 06/1951 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2858 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 81A | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4978 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | SHL | Southall | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 81A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9410 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 81A | m/e | 07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9411 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 81A | m/e | 06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9412 | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 81A | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9414 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 81B | Slough | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 81A | m/e | 08/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9420 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 81A | m/e | 03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70017 | on | 02/06/1951 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6954 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 81A | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70017 | on | 02/06/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 81A | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4089 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common | on | 20/07/1951 | 81A | on | 18/01/1952 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6954 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 81A | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70020 | on | 31/07/1951 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6932 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86B | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 81A | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70020 | on | 31/07/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 81A | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6932 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 81A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9423 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 81A | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70018 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 81A | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70023 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 81A | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90585 | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 81A | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9423 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 81A | m/e | 03/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70018 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 81A | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70023 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 81A | on | 10/09/1961 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90585 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 81A | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4097 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common | on | 02/10/1951 | 81A | m/e | 06/1957 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4704 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 81A | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7027 | on | 17/10/1951 | 82C | Swindon | on | 09/11/1951 | 81A | on | 25/04/1960 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6990 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 81A | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6990 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 81A | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Diesel | GT2 | Co-Co | 18100 | on | 03/1952 (New) | 81A | ||||||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4908 | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 81A | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4941 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 81A | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5906 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 81A | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6821 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 81A | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6834 | on | 14/10/1948 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 81A | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6874 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 81A | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6927 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 81A | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6932 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 81A | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6961 | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | SHL | Southall | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 81A | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6996 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 81A | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7033 | on | 27/03/1952 | 82C | Swindon | on | 28/04/1952 | 81A | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2243 | on | 15/06/1947 | HFD | Hereford | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 81A | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4908 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 81A | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4941 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 81A | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5906 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 81A | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6821 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 81A | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6834 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 81A | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6874 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 81A | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6927 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 81A | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6932 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 81A | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6961 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 81A | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6996 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 81A | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5093 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | m/e | 06/1952 | 81A | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5093 | m/e | 06/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 81A | m/e | 09/1953 | 83C | Exeter |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5932 | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 81A | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7010 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | OXF | Oxford | m/e | 10/1952 | 81A | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1024 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 81A | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 84K | Chester West |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6000 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 81A | on | 04/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4090 | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 83G | Penzance | m/e | 11/1952 | 81A | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4708 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 81A | on | 22/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5082 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 07/11/1952 | 81A | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4090 | m/e | 11/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 81A | on | 03/07/1953 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5082 | on | 07/11/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 81A | on | 02/07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7010 | m/e | 10/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 81A | on | 27/01/1964 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2222 | on | 15/06/1947 | DID | Didcot | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 81A | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4967 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 81A | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 15101 | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 81A | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2208 | on | 15/06/1947 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 81A | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8432 | on | 28/02/1953 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 81F | Oxford | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8434 | on | 28/02/1953 (New) | 81A | m/e | 06/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4986 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 81A | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8433 | on | 31/03/1953 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 82C | Swindon | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4943 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 81A | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4945 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 81F | Oxford | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 81A | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4962 | m/e | 31/03/1948 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 81A | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6110 | on | 15/06/1947 | SHL | Southall | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 81A | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7001 | on | 11/07/1953 | 83D | Laira | on | 13/07/1953 | 81A | on | 18/08/1961 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70015 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 30A | Stratford | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 81A | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13030 | on | 03/10/1953 (New) | 81A | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4962 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 87G | Carmarthen | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 81A | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13031 | on | 31/10/1953 (New) | 81A | w/e | 22/07/1967 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13032 | on | 31/10/1953 (New) | 81A | w/e | 22/07/1967 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13033 | on | 31/10/1953 (New) | 81A | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6109 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 81A | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6121 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 81A | m/e | 07/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 15103 | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 81A | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5034 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | m/e | 12/1953 | 81A | on | 21/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5093 | m/e | 09/1953 | 83C | Exeter | m/e | 12/1953 | 81A | on | 07/01/1961 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7013 | on | 08/02/1952 | 82C | Swindon | on | 05/01/1954 | 81A | on | 22/10/1962 | To Store | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4908 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 81A | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4089 | m/e | 02/1952 | 83D | Laira | m/e | 06/1954 | 81A | on | 02/12/1958 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5006 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 06/1954 | 81A | on | 20/03/1958 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4939 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 81A | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7017 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 09/07/1954 | 81A | on | 12/11/1962 | To Store | |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6012 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 81A | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6024 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 81A | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 88A | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6016 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 84A | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 81A | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5092 | on | 15/06/1947 | WOS | Worcester | on | 27/01/1955 | 81A | m/e | 02/1958 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4907 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 85C | Hereford | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 81A | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5084 | on | 02/11/1952 | 82C | Swindon | on | 15/07/1955 | 81A | on | 01/09/1955 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2237 | on | 15/06/1947 | WOS | Worcester | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 81A | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6022 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 81A | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4090 | on | 03/07/1953 | 84A | Stafford Road | m/e | 12/1955 | 81A | on | 11/08/1959 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4091 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 12/1955 | 81A | on | 19/01/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9400 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 81A | m/e | 12/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9416 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 81A | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6132 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 81A | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8755 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 81A | m/e | 12/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5039 | m/e | 12/1955 | 87G | Carmarthen | m/e | 02/1956 | 81A | m/e | 03/1956 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5043 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 87G | Carmarthen | m/e | 02/1956 | 81A | on | 21/04/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6023 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | LA | Laira | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 81A | m/e | 06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9405 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 81A | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4919 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 81A | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4965 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 81A | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13105 | on | 23/02/1955 | 84C | Banbury (New) | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 81A | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4900 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 81A | m/e | 04/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4977 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 81A | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5945 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 81A | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5954 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 81A | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5084 | on | 01/09/1955 | 82C | Swindon | on | 19/10/1956 | 81A | on | 02/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5008 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 84A | Stafford Road | m/e | 11/1956 | 81A | on | 30/12/1956 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5099 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 20/11/1956 | 81A | on | 12/06/1958 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5074 | on | 05/07/1956 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 12/1956 | 81A | on | 16/06/1960 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4925 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 81A | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4928 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 81A | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7020 | on | 08/11/1956 | 82C | Swindon | on | 21/12/1956 | 81A | on | 13/02/1962 | To Store | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5052 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/01/1957 | 81A | on | 06/09/1960 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6978 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 81A | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5008 | on | 30/12/1956 | 87G | Carmarthen | on | 30/01/1957 | 81A | on | 07/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5007 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 18/02/1957 | 81A | on | 02/02/1959 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4082 | on | 25/04/1952 | 85A | Worcester | m/e | 09/1957 | 81A | on | 06/05/1960 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6113 | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 81A | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5001 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 22/01/1958 | 81A | on | 26/09/1958 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7722 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 81A | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7006 | on | 28/05/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | on | 26/02/1958 | 81A | m/e | 03/1958 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4096 | m/e | 11/1948 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 20/03/1958 | 81A | on | 14/07/1962 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5005 | m/e | 12/1956 | 83A | Newton Abbot | on | 20/03/1958 | 81A | on | 26/09/1958 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5010 | on | 14/05/1953 | 84A | Stafford Road | on | 20/03/1958 | 81A | on | 10/01/1959 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5027 | m/e | 06/1954 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | on | 20/03/1958 | 81A | on | 05/07/1961 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5923 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 81A | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6920 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 81A | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6145 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 81A | on | 16/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6966 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 81A | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7927 | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 81A | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 88A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3599 | on | 10/10/1958 (New) | 81A | 2w/e | 06/12/1976 | LE | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3600 | on | 20/10/1958 (New) | 81A | w/e | 30/12/1972 | 82C | Swindon | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3601 | on | 24/10/1958 (New) | 81A | w/e | 30/12/1972 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3602 | on | 29/10/1958 (New) | 81A | w/e | 30/12/1972 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3603 | on | 31/10/1958 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3597 | on | 26/09/1958 | 83G | Penzance (New) | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 81A | w/e | 09/11/1968 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3598 | on | 03/10/1958 | 83C | Exeter (New) | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 81A | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4915 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 81A | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5929 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 81A | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5958 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 81A | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5977 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 81A | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6942 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 81A | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92229 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 81A | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92230 | on | 31/08/1958 | 84C | Banbury (New) | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 81A | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3604 | on | 07/11/1958 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3605 | on | 14/11/1958 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3606 | on | 19/11/1958 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3607 | on | 26/11/1958 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9479 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 81A | m/e | 07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92240 | on | 31/10/1958 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 81A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92241 | on | 31/10/1958 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 81A | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 88A | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92244 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 81A | on | 30/11/1958 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92245 | on | 30/11/1958 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92238 | on | 30/09/1958 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 81A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92239 | on | 30/09/1958 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 81A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92246 | on | 31/12/1958 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92247 | on | 31/12/1958 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5931 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 87H | Neyland | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 81A | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5976 | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | EXE | Exeter | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 81A | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8459 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 88C | Barry | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 81A | m/e | 06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6010 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 81A | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 88A | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9469 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 81A | m/e | 03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9405 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 81A | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6025 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 81A | on | 18/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6029 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 81A | m/e | 07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4074 | m/e | 06/1957 | 87E | Landore | on | 13/07/1959 | 81A | on | 12/08/1959 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6973 | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 81A | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92211 | on | 30/09/1959 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 82D | Westbury | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6004 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 81A | m/e | 06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6021 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 81A | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6125 | on | 15/06/1947 | SHL | Southall | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 81A | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4075 | on | 26/02/1953 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | on | 04/11/1959 | 81A | on | 03/11/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5054 | on | 10/04/1957 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | on | 04/11/1959 | 81A | on | 31/10/1960 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6027 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 81A | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6108 | on | 15/06/1947 | SLO | Slough | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 81A | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 87H | Neyland |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6157 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 81A | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4903 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXF | Oxford | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 81A | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4921 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXF | Oxford | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 81A | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5907 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 81A | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6973 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 81A | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3604 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 81A | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3761 | on | 13/11/1959 | 87C | Danygraig (New) | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 81A | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 81C | Southall |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3762 | on | 25/11/1959 | 87C | Danygraig (New) | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 81A | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4644 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 81A | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6163 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 81A | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48410 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 81A | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48412 | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 81A | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 84D | Leamington |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48431 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 81A | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3196 | on | 02/12/1955 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) (New) | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 81A | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 81C | Southall |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3406 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 81A | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3758 | on | 21/10/1959 | 87C | Danygraig (New) | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 81A | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | DG | Danygraig |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3759 | on | 27/10/1959 | 87C | Danygraig (New) | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 81A | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 81C | Southall |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3760 | on | 12/11/1959 | 87C | Danygraig (New) | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 81A | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | DG | Danygraig |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6026 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 81A | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5032 | on | 20/03/1958 | 83A | Newton Abbot | on | 04/03/1960 | 81A | on | 07/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5057 | on | 04/11/1959 | 84C | Banbury | on | 24/03/1960 | 81A | on | 10/03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3512 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 81A | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6013 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 81A | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3947 | on | 02/04/1960 (New) | 81A | 6w/e | 13/05/1978 | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4078 | on | 04/11/1959 | 84C | Banbury | on | 04/04/1960 | 81A | on | 13/06/1961 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5042 | on | 02/02/1959 | 85A | Worcester | on | 07/04/1960 | 81A | on | 11/08/1962 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3950 | on | 08/04/1960 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 84E | Tyseley | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3949 | on | 09/04/1960 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 81C | Southall | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3951 | on | 09/04/1960 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 84E | Tyseley | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3948 | on | 18/04/1960 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3952 | on | 23/04/1960 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 84E | Tyseley | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3953 | on | 23/04/1960 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3955 | on | 23/04/1960 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 81C | Southall | ||||
Steam | 15xx | 0-6-0PT | 1507 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | PILL | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 81A | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3954 | on | 29/04/1960 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 81C | Southall | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3957 | on | 30/04/1960 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 84E | Tyseley | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3956 | on | 07/05/1960 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 84E | Tyseley | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3959 | on | 07/05/1960 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 81F | Oxford | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3960 | on | 07/05/1960 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 81F | Oxford | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3958 | on | 14/05/1960 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 84E | Tyseley | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3196 | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 81A | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3961 | on | 21/05/1960 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 81C | Southall | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3962 | on | 21/05/1960 (New) | 81A | on | 13/11/1992 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3963 | on | 21/05/1960 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 81F | Oxford | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3964 | on | 21/05/1960 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 81F | Oxford | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5037 | m/e | 06/1954 | 85A | Worcester | on | 25/05/1960 | 81A | on | 13/06/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3965 | on | 28/05/1960 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 84E | Tyseley | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3598 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 81A | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4089 | on | 02/12/1958 | 85A | Worcester | on | 05/07/1960 | 81A | on | 22/10/1962 | To Store | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3754 | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 81A | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 81C | Southall |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3967 | on | 04/06/1960 | 83E | St Blazey (New) | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 81A | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 81F | Oxford |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3970 | on | 11/06/1960 | 83E | St Blazey (New) | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 81A | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 89A | Shrewsbury |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3971 | on | 18/06/1960 | 83E | St Blazey (New) | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 81A | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 81F | Oxford |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3972 | on | 18/06/1960 | 83E | St Blazey (New) | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 81A | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5001 | on | 26/09/1958 | 84G | Shrewsbury | on | 02/08/1960 | 81A | on | 14/09/1962 | To Store | |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6110 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 81A | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4085 | on | 18/02/1960 | 85A | Worcester | on | 18/08/1960 | 81A | on | 02/05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7037 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 82C | Swindon | on | 06/09/1960 | 81A | on | 04/03/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8761 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 81A | m/e | 05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9407 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 81E | Didcot | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 81A | m/e | 07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5050 | m/e | 09/1948 | 4A | Shrewsbury | on | 16/09/1960 | 81A | on | 08/08/1961 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7921 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 81A | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92203 | on | 30/04/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 81A | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5090 | on | 20/03/1958 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | on | 19/10/1960 | 81A | on | 31/05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7012 | on | 22/09/1959 | 87G | Carmarthen | on | 31/10/1960 | 81A | on | 13/06/1961 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3114 | on | 19/04/1955 | 84G | Shrewsbury (New) | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 81A | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4945 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 81A | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4983 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 81A | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5967 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 81A | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6141 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 81A | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6164 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 81E | Didcot | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 81A | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6169 | on | 15/06/1947 | SHL | Southall | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 81A | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8435 | on | 30/04/1953 | 81E | Didcot (New) | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 81A | m/e | 02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8458 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 81E | Didcot | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 81A | m/e | 08/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92204 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 81A | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 84C | Banbury |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4003 | on | 12/11/1960 (New) | 81A | w/e | 01/12/1973 | OX | Oxford | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4004 | on | 12/11/1960 (New) | 81A | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 84A | Laira | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4005 | on | 26/11/1960 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 83D | Laira | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4006 | on | 03/12/1960 (New) | 81A | 7w/e | 29/05/1970 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9477 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 81A | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9640 | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 81A | on | 14/07/1963 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5011 | on | 03/05/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | on | 09/12/1960 | 81A | on | 04/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4007 | on | 10/12/1960 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 83E | St Blazey | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4008 | on | 17/12/1960 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 83E | St Blazey | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5036 | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | on | 29/12/1960 | 81A | on | 04/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4000 | on | 29/10/1960 | 84E | Tyseley (New) | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 81A | 2w/e | 05/08/1972 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6963 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 81A | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5015 | on | 16/06/1960 | 87E | Landore | on | 25/01/1961 | 81A | on | 04/10/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5093 | on | 07/01/1961 | 87F | Llanelli | on | 27/01/1961 | 81A | on | 30/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6998 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 81A | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4982 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 81A | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3646 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 81A | m/e | 06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3196 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 81A | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 81C | Southall |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3406 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 81A | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 91N | To North Eastern Region |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7009 | on | 27/06/1961 | 87G | Carmarthen | on | 05/07/1961 | 81A | on | 24/02/1962 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7014 | on | 03/10/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | on | 08/08/1961 | 81A | on | 15/06/1962 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3750 | on | 15/06/1947 | SHL | Southall | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 81A | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6168 | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 81A | m/e | 03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7018 | on | 16/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | on | 09/10/1961 | 81A | on | 17/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92226 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 81A | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7006 | on | 05/07/1960 | 85A | Worcester | on | 19/03/1962 | 81A | on | 16/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92000 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 81A | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6125 | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 87H | Neyland | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 81A | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9755 | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 81E | Didcot | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 81A | m/e | 05/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7030 | on | 13/02/1962 | 98S | on | 01/05/1962 | 81A | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 15xx | 0-6-0PT | 1506 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 81A | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8436 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 81A | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6018 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 81A | on | 18/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8420 | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 88A | Radyr | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 81A | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5041 | on | 17/04/1962 | 98S | on | 02/07/1962 | 81A | on | 14/12/1962 | To Store | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7029 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 83A | Newton Abbot | on | 02/07/1962 | 81A | on | 05/10/1964 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3666 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 81A | on | 12/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4098 | on | 14/03/1962 | 98S | on | 14/07/1962 | 81A | on | 07/09/1962 | To Store | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4930 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 81A | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4970 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 81A | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6028 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 81A | on | 20/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9440 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 81A | m/e | 07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9495 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 81B | Slough | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 81A | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80070 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 33B | Tilbury | on | 15/07/1962 | 81A | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 89A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80098 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 33B | Tilbury | on | 15/07/1962 | 81A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 89A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80102 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 33B | Tilbury | on | 15/07/1962 | 81A | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 89A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80104 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 33B | Tilbury | on | 15/07/1962 | 81A | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 89B | Croes Newydd |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80131 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 33B | Tilbury | on | 15/07/1962 | 81A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 89A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80132 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 33B | Tilbury | on | 15/07/1962 | 81A | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 89A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8487 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 81A | m/e | 11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1040 | on | 20/09/1962 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1009 | on | 24/09/1962 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | 84A | Laira | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1007 | on | 01/08/1962 | 83D | Laira (New) | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81A | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1008 | on | 04/09/1962 | 83D | Laira (New) | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81A | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3711 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81A | m/e | 05/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6005 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81A | on | 20/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6011 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81A | on | 18/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7015 | on | 07/09/1962 | 98S | on | 06/10/1962 | 81A | on | 05/04/1963 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7036 | on | 07/09/1962 | 98S | on | 06/10/1962 | 81A | on | 09/09/1963 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92220 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81A | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92230 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81A | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1041 | on | 10/10/1962 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1010 | on | 15/10/1962 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 84A | Laira | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1042 | on | 19/10/1962 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1043 | on | 26/10/1962 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1011 | on | 27/10/1962 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1000 | on | 29/12/1961 | 83D | Laira (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81A | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1001 | on | 12/02/1962 | 83D | Laira (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1002 | on | 19/03/1962 | 83D | Laira (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1003 | on | 14/04/1962 | 83D | Laira (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1004 | on | 12/05/1962 | 83D | Laira (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1005 | on | 18/06/1962 | 83D | Laira (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1006 | on | 06/07/1962 | 83D | Laira (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81A | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1035 | on | 27/07/1962 | 83D | Laira (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81A | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1036 | on | 29/08/1962 | 83D | Laira (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81A | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1037 | on | 31/08/1962 | 83D | Laira (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81A | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1038 | on | 07/09/1962 | 83D | Laira (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81A | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1039 | on | 07/09/1962 | 83D | Laira (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81A | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4903 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81A | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5900 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81A | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5919 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81A | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5984 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81A | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5988 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81A | on | 15/06/1963 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8472 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81A | m/e | 03/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9455 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81A | m/e | 04/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4701 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81C | Southall | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 81A | m/e | 09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4703 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81C | Southall | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 81A | m/e | 05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4704 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81C | Southall | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 81A | m/e | 05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5070 | on | 07/09/1962 | 98S | on | 17/11/1962 | 81A | on | 20/03/1964 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92243 | on | 31/10/1958 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 81A | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4074 | on | 19/05/1962 | 81E | Didcot | on | 17/12/1962 | 81A | on | 03/05/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4096 | on | 14/07/1962 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | on | 17/12/1962 | 81A | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7009 | on | 03/11/1962 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | on | 17/12/1962 | 81A | on | 22/03/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3965 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 81A | on | 12/11/1990 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3966 | on | 28/05/1960 | 84E | Tyseley (New) | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 81A | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5001 | on | 14/09/1962 | 98S | on | 04/02/1963 | 81A | on | 25/02/1963 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9700 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 81A | m/e | 10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1053 | on | 11/02/1963 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7035 | on | 12/11/1962 | 81F | Oxford | on | 04/03/1963 | 81A | on | 01/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1049 | on | 14/12/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 81A | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | 84A | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7008 | m/e | 01/1955 | 81F | Oxford | on | 09/03/1963 | 81A | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8433 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 81A | m/e | 06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8481 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 88C | Barry | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 81A | m/e | 06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1018 | on | 02/04/1963 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1013 | on | 13/12/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 81A | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1014 | on | 24/12/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 81A | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1015 | on | 21/01/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 81A | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1035 | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 81A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 84A | Laira |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5971 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 81A | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5985 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 81A | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6978 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 81A | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 81C | Southall |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1060 | on | 11/04/1963 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1061 | on | 19/04/1963 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1019 | on | 02/05/1963 (New) | 81A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 84A | Laira | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7076 | on | 03/05/1963 (New) | 81A | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7078 | on | 03/05/1963 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7048 | on | 26/09/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 81A | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3763 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 81E | Didcot | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 81A | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4606 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 81E | Didcot | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 81A | m/e | 02/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5039 | on | 09/02/1963 | 87F | Llanelli | on | 04/05/1963 | 81A | on | 27/07/1963 | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5076 | on | 31/03/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | on | 04/05/1963 | 81A | on | 29/06/1964 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6124 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 81A | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8768 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 81A | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1062 | on | 06/05/1963 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5098 | on | 09/02/1963 | 87F | Llanelli | on | 06/05/1963 | 81A | on | 13/04/1964 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1063 | on | 17/05/1963 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1020 | on | 21/05/1963 (New) | 81A | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1021 | on | 17/06/1963 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1065 | on | 18/06/1963 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 84A | Laira | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7056 | on | 13/11/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 81A | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7057 | on | 22/11/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 81A | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7059 | on | 28/11/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 81A | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7060 | on | 19/12/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 81A | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7061 | on | 29/12/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 81A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7065 | on | 28/01/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 81A | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7067 | on | 06/02/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 81A | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1068 | on | 12/07/1963 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 84A | Laira | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8464 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 84B | Oxley | on | 14/07/1963 | 81A | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8498 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 84A | Stafford Road | on | 14/07/1963 | 81A | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9435 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 84A | Stafford Road | on | 14/07/1963 | 81A | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9463 | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 84G | Shrewsbury | on | 14/07/1963 | 81A | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9470 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 84A | Stafford Road | on | 14/07/1963 | 81A | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9498 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 84G | Shrewsbury | on | 14/07/1963 | 81A | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1022 | on | 16/07/1963 (New) | 81A | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7062 | on | 31/01/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 81A | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7063 | on | 28/12/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 81A | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7064 | on | 29/01/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 81A | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5919 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 81A | m/e | 08/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3618 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | SHL | Southall | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 81A | m/e | 06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4609 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 81A | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9763 | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 81A | m/e | 09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9789 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 81A | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 81F | Oxford |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1015 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 81A | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1041 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 81A | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1043 | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 81A | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1051 | on | 21/01/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 81A | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6326 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 81A | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7058 | on | 28/11/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 81A | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3608 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 81B | Slough | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 81A | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3715 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 81A | m/e | 03/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4638 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 81B | Slough | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 81A | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4706 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 81A | m/e | 02/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4962 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 81A | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4082 | m/e | 08/1963 | 98S | on | 28/09/1963 | 81A | on | 24/08/1964 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1682 | on | 31/10/1963 (New) | 81A | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 2B | Oxley | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1683 | on | 31/10/1963 (New) | 81A | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 2B | Oxley | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1053 | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 81A | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4705 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 81A | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4707 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 81A | m/e | 05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1071 | on | 07/11/1963 (New) | 81A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1072 | on | 07/11/1963 (New) | 81A | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 84A | Laira | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1684 | on | 11/11/1963 (New) | 81A | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 2B | Oxley | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4670 | on | 15/06/1947 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 81A | m/e | 10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7910 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 81A | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9406 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 81A | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9415 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 81A | m/e | 06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9422 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 81A | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1073 | on | 03/12/1963 (New) | 81A | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 84A | Laira | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1030 | on | 05/12/1963 (New) | 81A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1694 | on | 11/12/1963 (New) | 81A | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1031 | on | 20/12/1963 (New) | 81A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1026 | on | 24/12/1963 (New) | 81A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1699 | on | 28/12/1963 (New) | 81A | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7026 | on | 26/03/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 81A | on | 06/10/1974 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4611 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 81A | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6974 | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 81A | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7020 | on | 13/02/1962 | 98S | on | 28/12/1963 | 81A | on | 13/04/1964 | 81C | Southall | |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1032 | on | 31/12/1963 (New) | 81A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1701 | on | 11/01/1964 (New) | 81A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1707 | on | 11/01/1964 (New) | 81A | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1698 | on | 13/01/1964 (New) | 81A | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1700 | on | 13/01/1964 (New) | 81A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1033 | on | 17/01/1964 (New) | 81A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1708 | on | 18/01/1964 (New) | 81A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1710 | on | 20/01/1964 (New) | 81A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1711 | on | 20/01/1964 (New) | 81A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1015 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 84A | Laira | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 81A | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | 84A | Laira |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8743 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 81A | m/e | 06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1714 | on | 01/02/1964 (New) | 81A | w/e | 18/06/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1715 | on | 08/02/1964 (New) | 81A | m/e | 28/02/1964 | 2B | Oxley | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1717 | on | 28/02/1964 (New) | 81A | w/e | 18/06/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1715 | m/e | 28/02/1964 | 2B | Oxley | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 81A | w/e | 18/06/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1716 | on | 18/02/1964 | 2B | Oxley (New) | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 81A | w/e | 18/06/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1727 | on | 09/04/1964 (New) | 81A | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4080 | on | 07/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | on | 13/04/1964 | 81A | on | 22/06/1964 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7013 | on | 22/10/1962 | 98S | on | 13/04/1964 | 81A | on | 20/06/1964 | 2A | Tyseley | |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7904 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 81A | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1034 | on | 15/04/1964 (New) | 81A | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 84A | Laira | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7027 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 84A | Laira | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 81A | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7073 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 84A | Laira | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 81A | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1695 | w/e | 04/01/1964 | 2B | Oxley | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 81A | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1696 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 2B | Oxley | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 81A | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1709 | on | 17/01/1964 | 2B | Oxley (New) | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 81A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1733 | on | 12/06/1964 (New) | 81A | 2w/e | 14/05/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1740 | on | 12/06/1964 (New) | 81A | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1743 | on | 19/06/1964 (New) | 81A | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6343 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 83D | Laira | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 81A | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9726 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 81C | Southall | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 81A | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 81E | Didcot |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1745 | on | 01/07/1964 (New) | 81A | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1748 | on | 01/07/1964 (New) | 81A | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1746 | on | 03/07/1964 (New) | 81A | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1747 | on | 03/07/1964 (New) | 81A | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6110 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 81A | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6156 | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 81A | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6165 | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 81A | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3620 | on | 15/06/1947 | SHL | Southall | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 81A | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3622 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 81C | Southall | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 81A | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8420 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 81A | m/e | 06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8486 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 81F | Oxford | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 81A | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9404 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 81A | m/e | 06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9405 | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 81A | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9642 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 81C | Southall | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 81A | m/e | 11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6335 | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 81A | on | 14/09/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6351 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 81A | m/e | 01/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6352 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 81A | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6354 | on | 02/08/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 81A | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6357 | on | 13/11/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 81A | on | 21/12/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7081 | on | 12/12/1963 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 81A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6961 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 81C | Southall | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 81A | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6978 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 81C | Southall | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 81A | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7923 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 81C | Southall | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 81A | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6355 | on | 24/08/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 2w/e | 01/11/1964 | 81A | on | 14/09/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6356 | on | 27/09/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 2w/e | 01/11/1964 | 81A | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6353 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 81A | on | 23/09/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9521 | on | 20/11/1964 (New) | 81A | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3030 | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | w/e | 22/11/1964 | 81A | w/e | 22/07/1967 | 41J | Shirebrook |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9522 | on | 25/11/1964 (New) | 81A | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9523 | on | 01/12/1964 (New) | 81A | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9524 | on | 11/12/1964 (New) | 81A | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7072 | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 84A | Laira | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 81A | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3955 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 81C | Southall | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 81A | on | 08/12/1980 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3511 | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 81A | w/e | 03/02/1968 | 16A | Toton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7071 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 81A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7085 | on | 24/06/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 81A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3186 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 87B | Margam | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 81A | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 81C | Southall |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3756 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 81C | Southall | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 81A | 7w/e | 29/05/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3804 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 81F | Oxford | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 81A | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3762 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 81A | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 81C | Southall |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3954 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 81A | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 81C | Southall |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7066 | on | 31/01/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 81A | 3w/e | 29/11/1971 | To Store | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7080 | on | 14/12/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 81A | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7082 | on | 05/06/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 81A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6347 | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 81A | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6348 | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 81A | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6349 | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 81A | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6350 | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 81A | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7034 | on | 23/05/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 81A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7035 | on | 04/06/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 81A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7036 | on | 05/06/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 81A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3186 | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 81C | Southall | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 81A | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6342 | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 81A | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6344 | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 81A | on | 14/09/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6345 | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 81A | on | 14/09/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6346 | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 81A | on | 03/05/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6347 | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 81A | on | 31/03/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6348 | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 81A | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6349 | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 81A | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6350 | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 81A | on | 14/09/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1606 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 12/1965 | 81A | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1583 | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1584 | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | 4w/e | 28/08/1966 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1587 | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | Landore | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1600 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 87E | Landore | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1601 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 87E | Landore | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1602 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | m/e | 30/04/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1604 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | m/e | 30/04/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1605 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1607 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1608 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1609 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1610 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1614 | on | 25/08/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1615 | on | 29/08/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1694 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1744 | on | 19/06/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3352 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 87B | Margam | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | m/e | 30/04/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6327 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6328 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | 7w/e | 02/01/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6332 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | q/e | 22/05/1971 | To Store | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1694 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 81A | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1592 | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1593 | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1594 | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | m/e | 28/02/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1595 | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1596 | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1609 | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1610 | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1614 | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1615 | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1751 | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6340 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | m/e | 28/02/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6341 | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1585 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 81A | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1636 | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 81A | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1637 | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 81A | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1638 | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 87E | Landore | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 81A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1639 | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 87E | Landore | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 81A | 2w/e | 23/12/1972 | D02 | Birmingham Division |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1640 | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 87E | Landore | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 81A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1648 | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 81A | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7088 | on | 29/10/1963 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 81A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1670 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 81A | w/e | 11/10/1975 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3754 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 81C | Southall | 2w/e | 15/01/1967 | 81A | 7w/e | 29/05/1970 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1641 | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | m/e | 28/02/1967 | 81A | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7027 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 81A | 3w/e | 29/11/1971 | To Store | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1642 | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 87E | Landore | m/e | 30/04/1967 | 81A | w/e | 29/06/1974 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1649 | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 30/04/1967 | 81A | w/e | 23/02/1974 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1650 | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 30/04/1967 | 81A | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D846 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 83A | Newton Abbot | on | 01/07/1967 | 81A | w/e | 05/07/1967 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D846 | on | 01/07/1967 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 05/07/1967 | 81A | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4026 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 3w/e | 22/07/1967 | 81A | w/e | 16/11/1974 | DY | Derby |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D833 | w/e | 05/07/1967 | 83A | Newton Abbot | w/e | 31/07/1967 | 81A | m/e | 03/1969 | To Store | |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D843 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 83A | Newton Abbot | m/e | 08/1967 | 81A | m/e | 10/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D846 | w/e | 05/07/1967 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 81A | m/e | 06/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D836 | m/e | 08/1961 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 2w/e | 14/08/1967 | 81A | on | 14/08/1967 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D836 | 2w/e | 14/08/1967 | 81A | Old Oak Common | on | 14/08/1967 | 81A | m/e | 09/1967 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D834 | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 81A | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D835 | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 81A | 2w/e | 27/12/1969 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D840 | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 81A | on | 26/04/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D842 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 81A | m/e | 04/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D847 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 81A | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3196 | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 81A | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6340 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 81A | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6341 | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 81A | on | 30/11/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D836 | on | 14/08/1967 | 81A | Old Oak Common | m/e | 09/1967 | 81A | m/e | 02/1968 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D837 | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 81A | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D839 | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 81A | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D845 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 81A | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D850 | m/e | 06/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | m/e | 10/1967 | 81A | m/e | 03/1969 | To Store | |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D838 | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 81A | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D841 | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 81A | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D844 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 81A | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D848 | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 81A | on | 26/03/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D849 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 81A | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D851 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 81A | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D852 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 81A | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D853 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 81A | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D854 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 81A | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D855 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 81A | m/e | 04/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3961 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 81C | Southall | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 81A | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3963 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 81C | Southall | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 81A | w/e | 28/09/1974 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D839 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 81A | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D851 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 81A | 5w/e | 27/09/1969 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7028 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 81A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7029 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 84A | Laira | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 81A | on | 01/01/1975 | To Store | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7030 | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 81A | on | 06/05/1973 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1648 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 81A | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1680 | on | 11/05/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 81A | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1681 | on | 08/05/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 81A | w/e | 09/06/1973 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3936 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 41C | Wath | w/e | 09/11/1968 | 81A | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3999 | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 82C | Swindon | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 81A | w/e | 23/03/1974 | EH | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6348 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 81A | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7045 | on | 10/08/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 81A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7046 | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 81A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5535 | w/e | 10/08/1968 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 30/11/1968 | 81A | on | 11/03/1987 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5530 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 31B | March | w/e | 28/12/1968 | 81A | 2w/e | 02/06/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5539 | w/e | 18/06/1966 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 28/12/1968 | 81A | on | 01/09/1988 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D837 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 81A | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D838 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 81A | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D854 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 81A | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D856 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 81A | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1583 | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 81A | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1587 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 81A | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1594 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 81A | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1650 | m/e | 30/04/1967 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 81A | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1679 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 87E | Landore | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 81A | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3761 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 81C | Southall | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 81A | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 81F | Oxford |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3762 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 81C | Southall | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 81A | 7w/e | 02/01/1971 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3936 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 81A | w/e | 13/06/1970 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3954 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 81C | Southall | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 81A | 3w/e | 25/02/1978 | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3972 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 81C | Southall | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 81A | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6336 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 81A | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1596 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 81A | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1636 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 81A | w/e | 30/03/1974 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1637 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 81A | on | 01/05/1977 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1648 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 81A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1652 | 2w/e | 14/05/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 81A | w/e | 12/05/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1653 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 81A | w/e | 12/05/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1678 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 81A | w/e | 06/10/1973 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3001 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 81A | w/e | 14/06/1969 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7100 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 81A | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5528 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 31B | March | w/e | 29/03/1969 | 81A | w/e | 10/03/1973 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D850 | m/e | 03/1969 | 98S | 5w/e | 05/1969 | 81A | m/e | 10/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D841 | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | 81A | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | To Store | |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D855 | m/e | 04/1969 | Withdrawn | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 (R) | 81A | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3605 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 87E | Landore | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | 81A | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | To Store | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5536 | w/e | 10/08/1968 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 24/05/1969 | 81A | on | 04/10/1987 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1674 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 81A | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1675 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 81A | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7050 | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 81A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D833 | m/e | 06/1969 | 98S | 5w/e | 27/09/1969 | 81A | m/e | 10/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D852 | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | 81A | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D854 | 5w/e | 27/09/1969 | 98S | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | 81A | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4166 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | 81A | w/e | 14/06/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1650 | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 87E | Landore | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 81A | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3961 | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 81A | on | 04/10/1987 | HA | Haymarket |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6356 | 5w/e | 27/09/1969 | 98S | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 81A | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 84A | Laira | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7051 | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 81A | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3518 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | 1A | Willesden | 3w/e | 21/05/1970 | 81A | w/e | 26/06/1971 | 14A | Cricklewood East |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3269 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | 1A | Willesden | 7w/e | 29/05/1970 | 81A | 2w/e | 02/12/1972 | 14A | Cricklewood East |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4179 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 7w/e | 29/05/1970 | 81A | on | 08/12/1980 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D841 | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | 98S | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 81A | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D851 | 5w/e | 27/09/1969 | 83A | Newton Abbot | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 81A | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D853 | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 81A | Old Oak Common | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 81A | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4177 | on | 28/08/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 81A | on | 28/02/2007 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1659 | on | 06/02/1965 | 87E | Landore (New) | m/e | 10/1970 | 81A | w/e | 12/05/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1647 | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 81A | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1651 | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 81A | w/e | 22/06/1974 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1654 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 87E | Landore | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 81A | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1655 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 87E | Landore | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 81A | w/e | 10/08/1974 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1656 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 87E | Landore | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 81A | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1657 | on | 01/02/1965 | 87E | Landore (New) | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 81A | w/e | 12/05/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1658 | on | 12/02/1965 | 87E | Landore (New) | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 81A | w/e | 28/04/1973 | 5A | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1660 | on | 13/02/1965 | 87E | Landore (New) | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 81A | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7031 | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 81A | on | 11/05/1973 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7032 | m/e | 31/01/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 81A | on | 06/05/1973 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7033 | m/e | 31/01/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 81A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7037 | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 81A | on | 15/09/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7100 | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 8w/e | 27/02/1971 | 81A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7048 | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 81A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7049 | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 81A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7051 | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 81A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7052 | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 81A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7053 | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 81A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7044 | on | 18/08/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | m/e | 10/1971 | 81A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7011 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 81A | on | 01/01/1975 | To Store | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7016 | on | 03/01/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 81A | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7017 | on | 08/01/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 81A | on | 11/05/1973 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7022 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 81A | on | 03/02/1975 | To Store | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7024 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 81A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7019 | on | 14/02/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | m/e | 11/1971 | 81A | on | 08/07/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7018 | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 8w/e | 01/01/1972 | 81A | on | 16/03/1975 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7000 | m/e | 08/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | on | 02/01/1972 | 81A | on | 30/07/1973 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7001 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | on | 02/01/1972 | 81A | on | 16/03/1974 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1583 | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1599 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5554 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | w/e | 06/10/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5655 | w/e | 07/06/1969 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | w/e | 06/10/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5668 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 31B | March | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | w/e | 06/10/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5682 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 31B | March | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | w/e | 06/03/1976 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5688 | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | 2w/e | 18/09/1976 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5803 | w/e | 17/05/1969 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5809 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5812 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | on | 01/05/1997 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5814 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5818 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7015 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | on | 07/06/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7023 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | on | 09/06/1973 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7082 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | 2w/e | 19/04/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7084 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | w/e | 09/09/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7085 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | 5w/e | 08/05/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7087 | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | 5w/e | 08/05/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7089 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | 5w/e | 08/05/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7036 | on | 19/04/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 3w/e | 13/05/1972 | 81A | on | 09/06/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7054 | w/e | 01/05/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 2w/e | 13/05/1972 | 81A | on | 08/07/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5686 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 08/07/1972 | 81A | 3w/e | 26/11/1977 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5687 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 91E | To Eastern Region | w/e | 08/07/1972 | 81A | on | 02/03/1989 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5689 | w/e | 17/05/1969 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 08/07/1972 | 81A | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5690 | w/e | 17/07/1965 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 08/07/1972 | 81A | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3953 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 2w/e | 02/09/1972 | 81A | on | 02/08/1981 | SW | Swindon |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7019 | on | 08/07/1972 | Withdrawn | on | 08/09/1972 (R) | 81A | on | 15/09/1972 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7054 | on | 08/07/1972 | Withdrawn | on | 15/09/1972 (R) | 81A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7085 | on | 08/07/1972 | Withdrawn | on | 15/09/1972 (R) | 81A | on | 11/10/1972 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4180 | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 3w/e | 30/09/1972 | 81A | m/e | 08/1977 | WS | Worcester |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5684 | on | 26/04/1964 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 28/10/1972 | 81A | w/e | 27/04/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5685 | w/e | 05/02/1972 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 28/10/1972 | 81A | w/e | 27/04/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1641 | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 87A | Landore | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 81A | w/e | 10/02/1973 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1644 | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 87A | Landore | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 81A | w/e | 12/05/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5617 | w/e | 08/07/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 81A | w/e | 24/03/1973 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5692 | w/e | 04/12/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 81A | on | 15/05/1988 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5695 | w/e | 04/12/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 81A | m/e | 05/1977 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1664 | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 87E | Landore | w/e | 16/12/1972 | 81A | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7028 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 30/12/1972 | 81A | on | 06/10/1974 | To Store | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5842 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 10/03/1973 | 81A | m/e | 09/1977 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7044 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 10/03/1973 | 81A | on | 06/05/1973 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5814 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 24/03/1973 | 81A | m/e | 09/1977 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7017 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 81A | Old Oak Common | on | 11/05/1973 | OC | on | 05/06/1973 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1739 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 12/05/1973 | OC | w/e | 07/07/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1740 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 12/05/1973 | OC | w/e | 07/07/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1741 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 12/05/1973 | OC | w/e | 07/07/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5617 | w/e | 24/03/1973 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 12/05/1973 | OC | w/e | 07/07/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5803 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 12/05/1973 | OC | on | 12/04/2001 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5809 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 12/05/1973 | OC | w/e | 09/03/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5824 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 2w/e | 02/06/1973 | OC | on | 01/07/1995 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1647 | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 07/07/1973 | OC | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1653 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 07/07/1973 | OC | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47073 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 07/07/1973 | OC | w/e | 01/06/1974 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1672 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 07/07/1973 | OC | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7093 | on | 06/05/1973 | Withdrawn | on | 01/08/1973 (R) | OC | on | 19/10/1974 | To Store | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1673 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 06/10/1973 | OC | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1676 | w/e | 27/01/1973 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 06/10/1973 | OC | w/e | 10/11/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5668 | w/e | 06/10/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 10/11/1973 | OC | on | 14/03/1982 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4178 | 7w/e | 29/05/1970 | 81F | Oxford | w/e | 01/12/1973 | OC | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47068 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 02/03/1974 | OC | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3048 | 6w/e | 16/11/1972 | 70D | Eastleigh | w/e | 23/03/1974 | OC | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47081 | 2w/e | 02/12/1972 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 30/03/1974 | OC | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31291 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 27/04/1974 | OC | w/e | 11/10/1975 | MR | March |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31295 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 27/04/1974 | OC | w/e | 11/10/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50050 | w/e | 21/10/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 11/05/1974 | OC | 2w/e | 10/04/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50001 | w/e | 08/07/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 11/05/1974 | OC | 2w/e | 10/04/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50002 | w/e | 10/11/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 11/05/1974 | OC | 2w/e | 10/04/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50004 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 11/05/1974 | OC | 2w/e | 10/04/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | D405 | w/e | 09/03/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 11/05/1974 | OC | 2w/e | 10/04/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31279 | w/e | 09/03/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 11/05/1974 | OC | w/e | 11/10/1975 | MR | March |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47075 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 01/06/1974 | OC | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47055 | 2w/e | 23/12/1972 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 22/06/1974 | OC | w/e | 10/01/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47080 | w/e | 17/02/1973 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 29/06/1974 | OC | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47090 | w/e | 10/11/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 06/07/1974 | OC | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47064 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | 2w/e | 10/08/1974 | OC | w/e | 11/10/1975 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47056 | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | BS | Bescot | w/e | 21/09/1974 | OC | 2w/e | 08/02/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08678 | w/e | 12/01/1974 | LA | Laira | w/e | 21/09/1974 | OC | on | 30/10/1988 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7028 | on | 06/10/1974 | 98S | on | 19/10/1974 | OC | on | 26/11/1974 | To Store | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08108 | w/e | 18/03/1972 | 16C | Derby | w/e | 16/11/1974 | OC | w/e | 10/01/1976 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47060 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 07/12/1974 | OC | w/e | 10/07/1976 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47061 | w/e | 08/09/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 07/12/1974 | OC | w/e | 10/07/1976 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31257 | w/e | 27/04/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 11/01/1975 | OC | on | 10/09/1990 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7029 | on | 01/01/1975 | 98S | on | 03/02/1975 | OC | on | 28/02/1975 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31229 | w/e | 06/10/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | OC | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31293 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | OC | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31309 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | OC | w/e | 11/10/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31230 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 12/04/1975 | OC | on | 15/05/1988 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31231 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 12/04/1975 | OC | on | 15/05/1988 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31256 | w/e | 27/04/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | OC | on | 15/05/1988 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31304 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | OC | on | 15/05/1988 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08081 | w/e | 27/01/1973 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 14/06/1975 | OC | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08109 | w/e | 22/06/1974 | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | OC | on | 31/12/1980 | 98Ss | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47056 | 2w/e | 08/02/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 11/10/1975 | OC | w/e | 10/01/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31419 | w/e | 29/12/1973 | CW | Cricklewood East | w/e | 11/10/1975 | OC | m/e | 10/1977 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31136 | w/e | 06/10/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | OC | w/e | 06/03/1976 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31286 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | OC | on | 15/05/1988 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08364 | w/e | 17/03/1973 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 10/01/1976 | OC | on | 08/12/1980 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31421 | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | CW | Cricklewood East | w/e | 28/02/1976 | OC | w/e | 06/03/1976 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31421 | w/e | 28/02/1976 | OC | Old Oak Common | w/e | 06/03/1976 | OC | m/e | 08/1977 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08596 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | RG | Reading (W.R.) | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | OC | m/e | 12/1976 | To Store | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31123 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | YK | York (North) | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | OC | on | 04/10/1987 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31163 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | YK | York (North) | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | OC | on | 19/01/1999 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08936 | w/e | 14/06/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 12/1976 | OC | on | 04/10/1987 | NC | Norwich Thorpe |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08656 | m/e | 12/1976 | RG | Reading (W.R.) | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | OC | on | 05/02/1993 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31209 | w/e | 08/05/1976 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 07/1977 | OC | on | 15/05/2003 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31265 | m/e | 05/1977 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 07/1977 | OC | on | 15/05/1988 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08483 | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | m/e | 08/1977 | OC | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31165 | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 08/1977 | OC | on | 04/10/1987 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31213 | w/e | 08/05/1976 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 09/1977 | OC | on | 15/05/1988 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31296 | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 09/1977 | OC | on | 01/12/1993 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31124 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 10/1977 | OC | on | 25/05/1990 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31136 | w/e | 06/03/1976 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 10/1977 | OC | on | 24/08/1980 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31254 | w/e | 06/03/1976 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 10/1977 | OC | on | 01/12/1979 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31260 | 2w/e | 18/09/1976 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 10/1977 | OC | on | 15/05/1988 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31132 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | on | 09/01/1978 | OC | on | 16/06/2000 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31131 | m/e | 07/1977 | TI | Tinsley | on | 19/02/1978 | OC | on | 15/05/1988 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47500 | 3w/e | 26/11/1977 | LE | Landore | m/e | 03/1978 | OC | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47507 | w/e | 23/06/1973 | LE | Landore | m/e | 03/1978 | OC | on | 04/10/1987 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47508 | m/e | 10/1977 | LE | Landore | m/e | 03/1978 | OC | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47509 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | Landore | m/e | 03/1978 | OC | on | 15/05/1988 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47510 | w/e | 17/02/1973 | 87A | Landore | m/e | 03/1978 | OC | on | 04/10/1987 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47513 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | LE | Landore | m/e | 03/1978 | OC | on | 28/02/2004 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08480 | m/e | 10/1977 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | 6w/e | 13/05/1978 | OC | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47511 | w/e | 17/03/1973 | 87A | Landore | m/e | 11/1978 | OC | on | 04/10/1987 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50036 | w/e | 08/05/1976 | LA | Laira | on | 04/10/1987 | OC | on | 12/04/1991 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50037 | m/e | 05/1977 | LA | Laira | on | 04/10/1987 | OC | on | 09/09/1991 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50038 | m/e | 11/1978 | LA | Laira | on | 04/10/1987 | OC | on | 27/09/1988 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50039 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | on | 04/10/1987 | OC | on | 04/06/1989 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50040 | 2w/e | 10/04/1976 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | on | 04/10/1987 | OC | on | 03/08/1990 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47582 | w/e | 16/05/1976 | IM | Immingham | on | 04/10/1987 | OC | on | 01/02/2004 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47583 | m/e | 10/1977 | IM | Immingham | on | 04/10/1987 | OC | on | 01/02/2004 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47473 | on | 04/10/1987 | CD | Crewe Diesel | on | 15/05/1988 | OC | on | 01/06/1998 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47547 | w/e | 12/10/1974 | YK | York (North) | on | 15/05/1988 | OC | on | 01/03/1996 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47540 | on | 01/05/1977 | CD | Crewe Diesel | on | 15/05/1988 | OC | on | 01/05/1998 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47587 | on | 04/10/1987 | IS | Inverness | on | 15/05/1988 | OC | on | 01/08/2003 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08819 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | Landore | on | 12/06/1988 | OC | on | 30/06/2008 | Withdrawn |