Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 707 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2431 Week
» 12566 Month
» 328797 Year
» 839899 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Perth South


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Perth South Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4960       05/1946 (New) 29A 4w/e 22/12/1962 63B Fort William
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4975       05/1946 (New) 29A 4w/e 27/11/1954 63D Fort William
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4976       05/1946 (New) 29A 4w/e 27/11/1954 63D Fort William
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4961       15/06/1946 (New) 29A m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4977       15/06/1946 (New) 29A 4w/e 27/11/1954 63D Fort William
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2738       4w/e 22/06/1946 29A 01/01/1948 29D Forfar
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2800       4w/e 22/06/1946 29A 01/01/1948 29D Forfar
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2801       4w/e 22/06/1946 29A 01/01/1948 29D Forfar
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5009       4w/e 22/06/1946 29A 01/01/1948 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4193       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 20/12/1958 66A Polmadie
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4196       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 19/01/1957 66C Hamilton (West)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4251       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 20/12/1958 66A Polmadie
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4258       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 23/09/1961 60A Inverness
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4314       01/01/1948 29A 8w/e 16/04/1955 63C Forfar
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4322       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 05/07/1958 66A Polmadie
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4328       01/01/1948 29A 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 921       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 06/10/1951 63B Stirling
Steam Compound 4-4-0 922       01/01/1948 29A m/e 12/1952 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 923       01/01/1948 29A 8w/e 19/04/1952 63B Stirling
Steam Compound 4-4-0 924       01/01/1948 29A 3w/e 11/12/1948 32B Aviemore
Steam Compound 4-4-0 938       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 14/06/1952 63B Stirling
Steam Compound 4-4-0 939       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 14/06/1952 63C Forfar
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1099       01/01/1948 29A m/e 11/1953 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1125       01/01/1948 29A m/e 01/1953 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 17397       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 17/06/1950 68B Dumfries
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 57449       01/01/1948 29A m/e 11/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 17473       01/01/1948 29A m/e 06/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 0-4-4T 15144       01/01/1948 29A m/e 08/1952 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 15171       01/01/1948 29A m/e 10/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 15175       01/01/1948 29A m/e 02/1953 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 55176       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 26/12/1953 63C Forfar
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 15208       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 14/05/1955 63D Oban
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 15209       01/01/1948 29A m/e 09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 15213       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 08/06/1957 63D Oban
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 15216       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 12/07/1952 60A Inverness
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 15218       01/01/1948 29A m/e 01/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 16246       01/01/1948 29A m/e 04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56290       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 15/05/1954 63C Forfar
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56328       01/01/1948 29A m/e 09/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56331       01/01/1948 29A m/e 06/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56347       01/01/1948 29A w/e 16/07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56352       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 14/03/1959 67D Ardrossan
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56353       01/01/1948 29A m/e 06/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 113 4-4-0 14467       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 26/11/1955 63C Forfar
Steam 113 4-4-0 14469       01/01/1948 29A m/e 11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 113 4-4-0 14476       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 12/04/1958 63B Stirling
Steam Dunalastair IV 4-4-0 54447       01/01/1948 29A m/e 06/1953 Withdrawn
Steam Dunalastair IV 4-4-0 54448       01/01/1948 29A m/e 03/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 72 4-4-0 14489       01/01/1948 29A 04/12/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 72 4-4-0 14499       01/01/1948 29A m/e 05/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 72 4-4-0 14500       01/01/1948 29A 12/03/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 72 4-4-0 14501       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 31/10/1953 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Steam 72 4-4-0 14502       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 27/12/1952 63B Stirling
Steam 72 4-4-0 14503       01/01/1948 29A m/e 10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4768       01/01/1948 29A m/e 06/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4769       01/01/1948 29A m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4770       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 24/02/1951 2A Rugby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4796       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 26/12/1964 66A Polmadie
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4797       01/01/1948 29A m/e 09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4885       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 04/06/1960 68B Dumfries
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4924       01/01/1948 29A m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4925       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 25/09/1965 64C Dalry Road
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4958       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 09/08/1952 68A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4959       01/01/1948 29A m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4972       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 27/11/1954 63D Fort William
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4973       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 04/09/1954 63D Fort William
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4974       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 27/11/1954 63D Fort William
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5010       01/01/1948 29A 5w/e 24/03/1951 67A Corkerhill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5011       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 29/12/1951 68A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5036       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 25/11/1950 64C Dalry Road
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5085       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 25/11/1950 64C Dalry Road
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5086       01/01/1948 29A 8w/e 09/09/1951 64D Carstairs
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5087       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 16/07/1949 60A Inverness
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5125       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 25/10/1958 63B Stirling
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5161       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 16/07/1949 60A Inverness
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5162       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 11/07/1953 66A Polmadie
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5163       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 17/05/1952 68A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5164       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 11/07/1953 66A Polmadie
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5165       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 21/10/1961 66C Hamilton (West)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5166       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 18/02/1956 64D Carstairs
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5167       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 04/08/1956 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5170       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 21/10/1961 64C Dalry Road
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5171       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 01/07/1961 67A Corkerhill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5172       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 04/06/1960 66A Polmadie
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5173       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 24/01/1953 66A Polmadie
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5174       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 04/08/1956 64D Carstairs
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5175       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 07/08/1954 67A Corkerhill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5213       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 06/08/1955 63B Stirling
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5357       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 06/08/1955 63B Stirling
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5365       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 02/07/1960 67A Corkerhill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5366       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 01/07/1961 67A Corkerhill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5389       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 11/05/1957 63B Stirling
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5452       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 04/07/1959 67A Corkerhill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5456       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 14/03/1959 67D Ardrossan
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5457       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 14/03/1959 67D Ardrossan
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5458       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 05/07/1958 60A Inverness
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5459       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 05/07/1958 60A Inverness
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5460       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 26/10/1957 60A Inverness
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5463       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 03/06/1961 67B Hurlford
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5464       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 23/03/1957 24E Blackpool Central
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5465       01/01/1948 29A m/e 02/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5466       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 09/08/1952 68A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5467       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 02/07/1960 67A Corkerhill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5469       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 06/08/1955 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5470       01/01/1948 29A 4w/e 18/11/1961 60A Inverness
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5472       01/01/1948 29A m/e 09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5473       01/01/1948 29A 5w/e 30/04/1966 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5474       01/01/1948 29A 5w/e 31/07/1965 67C Ayr
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5475       01/01/1948 29A m/e 09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40159 01/01/1948 28A Motherwell 4w/e 04/11/1950 63A 4w/e 22/01/1955 65D Dawsholm
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40200 01/01/1948 28A Motherwell 4w/e 04/11/1950 63A 4w/e 25/12/1954 65D Dawsholm
Steam 72 4-4-0 54486 01/01/1948 29D Forfar 4w/e 23/12/1950 63A 4w/e 22/11/1958 63A Perth South
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73005       06/1951 (New) 63A 4w/e 19/01/1963 67A Corkerhill
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73006       06/1951 (New) 63A 4w/e 19/01/1963 67A Corkerhill
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73007       07/1951 (New) 63A 4w/e 25/07/1964 65F Grangemouth
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73008       07/1951 (New) 63A 4w/e 08/09/1951 99R  
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73009       07/1951 (New) 63A 4w/e 19/01/1963 67A Corkerhill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45030 01/01/1948 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 8w/e 09/09/1951 63A 4w/e 24/01/1953 66A Polmadie
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45043 2w/e 17/06/1950 28A Blackpool Central 8w/e 09/09/1951 63A 4w/e 17/05/1952 68A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45099 01/01/1948 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 8w/e 09/09/1951 63A m/e 09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44720       4w/e 29/12/1951 63A 5w/e 24/09/1966 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44721       4w/e 29/12/1951 63A 4w/e 26/12/1964 66A Polmadie
Steam Compound 4-4-0 40921 4w/e 06/10/1951 63B Stirling 4w/e 23/02/1952 63A m/e 11/1955 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73008 4w/e 08/09/1951 99R   8w/e 19/04/1952 63A 4w/e 22/08/1964 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45117 4w/e 06/10/1951 64A St Margarets 8w/e 19/04/1952 63A 4w/e 26/10/1957 60A Inverness
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45334 8w/e 09/09/1951 64A St Margarets 8w/e 19/04/1952 63A 4w/e 17/05/1952 68A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam 2P 0-4-4T 55136 3w/e 11/12/1948 29C Dundee West 4w/e 06/09/1952 63A m/e 12/1952 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42216 01/01/1948 27A Polmadie 4w/e 06/09/1952 63A 4w/e 01/11/1952 66A Polmadie
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45657 01/01/1948 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 04/10/1952 63A 8w/e 21/03/1953 68A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45718 4w/e 17/07/1951 9A Longsight 4w/e 04/10/1952 63A 8w/e 21/03/1953 68A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Compound 4-4-0 40924 3w/e 11/12/1948 32B Aviemore 4w/e 29/11/1952 63A m/e 03/1955 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 40923 8w/e 19/04/1952 63B Stirling 4w/e 24/01/1953 63A m/e 10/1954 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45673 4w/e 04/10/1952 68A Carlisle Kingmoor 8w/e 21/03/1953 63A 4w/e 04/06/1960 67A Corkerhill
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45727 01/01/1948 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 8w/e 21/03/1953 63A 4w/e 04/06/1960 67A Corkerhill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45053 01/01/1948 32A Inverness 8w/e 21/03/1953 63A 4w/e 04/07/1959 67A Corkerhill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45168 01/01/1948 30A Corkerhill 8w/e 21/03/1953 63A 4w/e 04/06/1960 66A Polmadie
Steam Compound 4-4-0 40913 3w/e 11/12/1948 32B Aviemore 4w/e 16/05/1953 63A 4w/e 07/08/1954 67A Corkerhill
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 55212 4w/e 17/05/1952 63B Stirling 4w/e 16/05/1953 63A m/e 12/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 55226 01/01/1948 29C Dundee West 4w/e 11/07/1953 63A 8w/e 05/09/1953 63E Oban
Steam Glen 4-4-0 62484 01/01/1948 STM St Margarets 8w/e 05/09/1953 63A 4w/e 19/11/1960 62A Thornton Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44908 4w/e 14/06/1952 65A Eastfield 8w/e 05/09/1953 63A 4w/e 28/11/1953 65A Eastfield
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45173 4w/e 24/01/1953 66A Polmadie 8w/e 05/09/1953 63A 4w/e 26/12/1953 66A Polmadie
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 55226 8w/e 05/09/1953 63E Oban 4w/e 03/10/1953 63A 4w/e 27/09/1958 63C Forfar
Steam Glen 4-4-0 62470 01/01/1948 FW Fort William 4w/e 31/10/1953 63A m/e 05/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 77008       23/04/1954 (New) 29A 4w/e 27/11/1954 66A Polmadie
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 77009       05/06/1954 (New) 29A 3w/e 25/12/1954 66A Polmadie
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45692 01/01/1948 27A Polmadie 4w/e 04/09/1954 63A 4w/e 04/06/1960 67A Corkerhill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45164 4w/e 11/07/1953 66A Polmadie 4w/e 02/10/1954 63A 4w/e 19/02/1955 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45367 4w/e 04/09/1954 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 02/10/1954 63A 4w/e 22/10/1960 64C Dalry Road
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 55194 01/01/1948 29D Forfar 4w/e 27/11/1954 63A m/e 03/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42168       4w/e 27/11/1954 63A 4w/e 09/04/1960 60B Aviemore
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44820 4w/e 12/06/1954 63D Fort William 4w/e 27/11/1954 63A 4w/e 02/07/1960 66B Motherwell
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44921 4w/e 12/06/1954 63D Fort William 4w/e 27/11/1954 63A m/e 02/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45047 4w/e 12/06/1954 63D Fort William 4w/e 27/11/1954 63A 4w/e 25/09/1965 64C Dalry Road
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45049 4w/e 07/08/1954 63D Fort William 4w/e 27/11/1954 63A 4w/e 01/09/1956 63B Stirling
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45245 4w/e 12/06/1954 63D Fort William 4w/e 27/11/1954 63A 4w/e 08/06/1957 64A St Margarets
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45487 4w/e 12/06/1954 63D Fort William 4w/e 27/11/1954 63A 4w/e 21/04/1956 2A Rugby
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42169       4w/e 25/12/1954 63A 4w/e 09/04/1960 66B Motherwell
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42277 01/01/1948 30A Corkerhill 4w/e 22/01/1955 63A m/e 08/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 40939 4w/e 14/06/1952 63C Forfar 8w/e 16/04/1955 63A m/e 12/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43136 31/12/1951 65A Eastfield (New) 8w/e 16/04/1955 63A 4w/e 14/05/1955 65A Eastfield
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42800 01/01/1948 29D Forfar 4w/e 06/08/1955 63A 8w/e 27/10/1956 63C Forfar
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44314 8w/e 09/07/1955 63B Stirling 4w/e 06/08/1955 63A m/e 09/06/1956 63C Forfar
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80126       20/10/1955 (New) 63A 19/11/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73120       01/1956 (New) 63A 4w/e 19/01/1963 67A Corkerhill
Steam Compound 4-4-0 40938 4w/e 31/10/1953 63B Stirling 4w/e 18/02/1956 63A m/e 07/1956 Withdrawn
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42800 8w/e 27/10/1956 63C Forfar 4w/e 11/05/1957 63A 4w/e 23/11/1957 63C Forfar
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 57368 8w/e 22/12/1956 63C Forfar 4w/e 11/05/1957 63A m/e 12/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73106 4w/e 06/07/1957 60A Inverness 4w/e 26/10/1957 63A 4w/e 25/07/1964 67A Corkerhill
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73107 4w/e 06/07/1957 60A Inverness 4w/e 26/10/1957 63A 4w/e 25/07/1964 66B Motherwell
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 55200 4w/e 19/01/1957 63C Forfar 4w/e 12/04/1958 63A m/e 08/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42800 4w/e 23/11/1957 63C Forfar 4w/e 05/07/1958 63A 4w/e 04/07/1959 67A Corkerhill
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3541       22/08/1958 (New) 63A 5w/e 01/08/1970 62B Dundee West
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3542       29/08/1958 (New) 63A 4w/e 28/12/1968 64B Haymarket
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3543       29/08/1958 (New) 63A 5w/e 01/08/1970 62B Dundee West
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3544       05/09/1958 (New) 63A 5w/e 01/03/1969 64B Haymarket
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3545       05/09/1958 (New) 63A 5w/e 01/08/1970 62B Dundee West
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 55230 4w/e 23/02/1952 63C Forfar 4w/e 27/09/1958 63A 4w/e 13/02/1960 63C Oban
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45458 4w/e 05/07/1958 60A Inverness 4w/e 25/10/1958 63A 4w/e 22/11/1958 66A Polmadie
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45459 4w/e 05/07/1958 60A Inverness 4w/e 25/10/1958 63A 4w/e 22/11/1958 66A Polmadie
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3535 11/07/1958 63B Stirling (New) 4w/e 22/11/1958 63A 4w/e 14/07/1962 60B Aviemore
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42801 01/01/1948 29D Forfar 4w/e 22/11/1958 63A 4w/e 04/07/1959 67A Corkerhill
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44314 m/e 09/06/1956 63C Forfar 4w/e 22/11/1958 63A w/e 16/07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 57424 4w/e 01/10/1955 63C Forfar 4w/e 22/11/1958 63A m/e 12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56290 4w/e 15/05/1954 63C Forfar 4w/e 22/11/1958 63A m/e 06/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 113 4-4-0 54467 4w/e 26/11/1955 63C Forfar 4w/e 22/11/1958 63A m/e 10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 72 4-4-0 54486 4w/e 23/12/1950 63A Perth South 4w/e 22/11/1958 63A 12/03/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42271 01/01/1948 28B Dalry Road 4w/e 17/01/1959 63A 4w/e 01/08/1959 67A Corkerhill
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45677 4w/e 04/09/1954 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 29/08/1959 63A 4w/e 04/06/1960 67A Corkerhill
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45621 4w/e 04/10/1952 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 24/10/1959 63A 4w/e 07/05/1960 67A Corkerhill
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45720 4w/e 04/10/1952 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 24/10/1959 63A 4w/e 19/12/1959 66A Polmadie
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 55217 4w/e 17/03/1956 62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 19/12/1959 63A 4w/e 21/10/1961 63C Oban
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 55226 4w/e 22/11/1958 60A Inverness 4w/e 19/12/1959 63A m/e 09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 55224 01/01/1948 27A Polmadie 4w/e 16/01/1960 63A 4w/e 13/02/1960 63C Oban
Steam 431 0-4-4T 55239 4w/e 25/12/1954 66A Polmadie 4w/e 12/03/1960 63A m/e 07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45090 01/01/1948 32A Inverness 4w/e 12/03/1960 63A 4w/e 21/10/1961 66C Hamilton (West)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45478 01/01/1948 32A Inverness 4w/e 12/03/1960 63A 4w/e 04/06/1960 66A Polmadie
Steam A2 4-6-2 60527 26/06/1949 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 04/04/1960 63A 28/05/1960 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6130 w/e 07/11/1959 65A Eastfield 4w/e 09/04/1960 63A w/e 30/04/1960 65A Eastfield
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80092 4w/e 30/11/1957 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 09/04/1960 63A 26/09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80093 4w/e 30/11/1957 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 09/04/1960 63A 26/09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam A2 4-6-2 60528 26/06/1949 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 02/05/1960 63A 28/05/1960 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6145 15/04/1960 61A Kittybrewster (New) 4w/e 04/06/1960 63A 4w/e 02/07/1960 61A Kittybrewster
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 55173 4w/e 18/02/1956 60B Aviemore 4w/e 04/06/1960 63A 4w/e 26/08/1961 63C Oban
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44788 01/01/1948 5A Crewe North 4w/e 30/07/1960 63A 4w/e 24/11/1962 65F Grangemouth
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45192 01/01/1948 32A Inverness 4w/e 30/07/1960 63A 4w/e 06/05/1961 67A Corkerhill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45461 01/01/1948 28A Motherwell 4w/e 30/07/1960 63A m/e 08/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44722 4w/e 04/10/1952 60A Inverness 4w/e 27/08/1960 63A 5w/e 30/04/1966 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44724 4w/e 01/11/1952 60A Inverness 4w/e 27/08/1960 63A 5w/e 31/07/1965 67C Ayr
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44799 01/01/1948 32A Inverness 4w/e 27/08/1960 63A m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45136 4w/e 01/11/1952 60B Aviemore 4w/e 27/08/1960 63A m/e 10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45179 01/01/1948 31A St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 27/08/1960 63A 4w/e 21/10/1961 66C Hamilton (West)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45319 01/01/1948 32A Inverness 4w/e 27/08/1960 63A 4w/e 21/10/1961 65F Grangemouth
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45360 01/01/1948 32A Inverness 4w/e 27/08/1960 63A 4w/e 22/10/1960 64C Dalry Road
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45361 01/01/1948 32A Inverness 4w/e 27/08/1960 63A 4w/e 01/07/1961 67A Corkerhill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45453 4w/e 17/06/1950 60A Inverness 4w/e 27/08/1960 63A 4w/e 16/06/1962 68B Dumfries
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45476 01/01/1948 32A Inverness 4w/e 27/08/1960 63A 4w/e 21/10/1961 64C Dalry Road
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45477 01/01/1948 32A Inverness 4w/e 27/08/1960 63A 4w/e 01/07/1961 64C Dalry Road
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45479 01/01/1948 32A Inverness 4w/e 27/08/1960 63A 4w/e 18/11/1961 60A Inverness
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 55167 01/01/1948 27A Polmadie 4w/e 24/09/1960 63A m/e 07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 55204 4w/e 08/06/1957 65F Grangemouth 4w/e 22/10/1960 63A 4w/e 11/03/1961 63C Oban
Steam 2P 0-4-4T 55124 01/01/1948 31A St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 14/01/1961 63A 4w/e 11/03/1961 63C Oban
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 55202 01/01/1948 28B Dalry Road 4w/e 14/01/1961 63A m/e 08/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 0-4-4T 55260 4w/e 17/05/1952 68D Beattock 4w/e 14/01/1961 63A 4w/e 11/03/1961 63C Oban
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46468 w/e 25/03/1961 63C Oban 4w/e 03/06/1961 63A 4w/e 01/07/1961 63C Oban
Steam 2P 0-4-4T 55124 4w/e 11/03/1961 63C Oban 4w/e 26/08/1961 63A m/e 09/1961 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4097       08/09/1961 (New) 63A 4w/e 18/11/1961 63B Fort William
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4098       11/09/1961 (New) 63A 4w/e 14/07/1962 63B Fort William
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 55233 m/e 09/1961 Withdrawn 4w/e 23/09/1961 (R) 63A      
Steam 113 4-4-0 54463 3w/e 11/12/1948 32A Inverness 4w/e 21/04/1962 63A 4w/e 19/05/1962 66A Polmadie
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 55204 4w/e 11/03/1961 63C Oban 4w/e 14/07/1962 63A 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 0-4-4T 55260 4w/e 11/03/1961 63C Oban 4w/e 14/07/1962 63A 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46468 4w/e 01/07/1961 63C Oban 4w/e 14/07/1962 63A 4w/e 30/11/1963 65F Grangemouth
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT 1646 4w/e 16/02/1957 60C Helmsdale 4w/e 11/08/1962 63A 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78052 4w/e 22/11/1958 60B Aviemore 4w/e 11/08/1962 63A 4w/e 30/11/1963 64F Bathgate
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40150 m/e 09/06/1956 60D Wick 4w/e 11/08/1962 63A 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3535 4w/e 14/07/1962 60B Aviemore 4w/e 24/11/1962 63A 5w/e 29/04/1967 62B Dundee West
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46460 4w/e 26/08/1961 63C Oban 4w/e 11/05/1963 63A 4w/e 30/11/1963 65F Grangemouth
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44960 4w/e 22/12/1962 63B Fort William 4w/e 11/05/1963 63A m/e 01/1966 Withdrawn
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2411 31/07/1958 60A Inverness (New) 4w/e 05/10/1963 63A 4w/e 04/12/1965 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2412 18/09/1958 60A Inverness (New) 4w/e 05/10/1963 63A 4w/e 04/12/1965 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80028 4w/e 06/07/1963 67F Stranraer 4w/e 30/11/1963 63A 26/09/1966 Withdrawn
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2444 4w/e 24/11/1962 60A Inverness 4w/e 25/01/1964 63A 4w/e 04/12/1965 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3737 08/05/1959 64C Dalry Road (New) 5w/e 30/10/1965 63A 4w/e 25/11/1967 62A Thornton Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3275 8w/e 22/12/1956 62A Thornton Junction 5w/e 29/01/1966 63A 5w/e 31/08/1968 66A Polmadie
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44722 5w/e 30/04/1966 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 9w/e 26/11/1966 63A m/e 04/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44879 5w/e 30/04/1966 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 9w/e 26/11/1966 63A m/e 04/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44794 4w/e 02/10/1954 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 31/12/1966 63A m/e 04/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3886 4w/e 25/02/1967 64H Leith Central 5w/e 30/03/1968 63A 5w/e 31/08/1968 66A Polmadie
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3887 4w/e 25/02/1967 64H Leith Central 5w/e 30/03/1968 63A 4w/e 27/04/1968 60A Inverness
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4097 4w/e 18/11/1961 63B Fort William 5w/e 01/06/1968 63A 4w/e 27/12/1969 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3411 5w/e 31/08/1968 62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 28/12/1968 63A 5w/e 01/03/1969 62A Thornton Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4095 4w/e 18/11/1961 60A Inverness 4w/e 25/01/1969 63A 5w/e 01/03/1969 65A Eastfield
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3904 9w/e 26/11/1966 65A Eastfield 5w/e 01/03/1969 63A 5w/e 01/08/1970 62B Dundee West
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3411 5w/e 01/03/1969 62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 28/06/1969 63A 5w/e 01/08/1970 62B Dundee West
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3560 5w/e 01/03/1969 62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 27/09/1969 63A 5w/e 01/08/1970 62B Dundee West
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3214 4w/e 28/06/1969 60A Inverness 4w/e 27/12/1969 63A 4w/e 28/02/1970 65F Grangemouth
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3929 4w/e 27/02/1965 67C Ayr 7w/e 27/03/1971 63A 4w/e 29/04/1972 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill