Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 540 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4139 Week
» 10273 Month
» 238157 Year
» 1459722 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Plaistow


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Plaistow Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1290 m/e 09/1933 29 Manningham m/e 11/1945 13A 4w/e 22/06/1946 13E Upminster
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1360 m/e 09/1933 M18 Nottingham m/e 11/1945 13A 4w/e 24/03/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2522       4w/e 22/06/1946 13A 01/01/1948 13A Plaistow
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7300       4w/e 22/06/1946 13A 01/01/1948 13A Plaistow
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2136       4w/e 22/06/1946 13A 01/01/1948 13A Plaistow
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2137       4w/e 22/06/1946 13A 01/01/1948 13C Tilbury
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2139       4w/e 22/06/1946 13A 01/01/1948 13A Plaistow
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2146       4w/e 22/06/1946 13A 01/01/1948 13C Tilbury
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2147       4w/e 22/06/1946 13A 01/01/1948 13C Tilbury
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2149       4w/e 22/06/1946 13A 01/01/1948 13D Northwich
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2150       4w/e 22/06/1946 13A 01/01/1948 13D Northwich
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2151       4w/e 22/06/1946 13A 01/01/1948 13A Plaistow
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2153       4w/e 22/06/1946 13A 01/01/1948 13D Northwich
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1324 m/e 11/1945 22C Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 22/06/1946 13A 4w/e 21/02/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2522 4w/e 22/06/1946 13A Plaistow 01/01/1948 13A 18/06/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2523       01/01/1948 13A 18/06/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2524       01/01/1948 13A 29/09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2525       01/01/1948 13A 18/06/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2526       01/01/1948 13A 18/06/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2527       01/01/1948 13A 18/06/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2528       01/01/1948 13A 18/06/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2529       01/01/1948 13A 18/06/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2530       01/01/1948 13A 8w/e 09/09/1951 66D Greenock Ladyburn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2531       01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 21/07/1951 33C Shoeburyness
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2532       01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 15/12/1956 33C Shoeburyness
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2533       01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 15/12/1956 33C Shoeburyness
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2534       01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 15/12/1956 33C Shoeburyness
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2535       01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 14/07/1951 91X To Scottish Region
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2536       01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 15/12/1956 33C Shoeburyness
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7300 4w/e 22/06/1946 13A Plaistow 01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 21/07/1951 33B Tilbury
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7311       01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 15/12/1956 35C Spital Bridge
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7328       01/01/1948 13A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7351       01/01/1948 13A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7458       01/01/1948 13A 5w/e 17/12/1955 35A New England
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7484       01/01/1948 13A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7512       01/01/1948 13A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3905       01/01/1948 13A 22/07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4228       01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 24/03/1951 14B Kentish Town
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4297       01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 22/03/1952 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4530       01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 24/03/1951 14B Kentish Town
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 1981       01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 21/07/1951 33B Tilbury
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 1982       01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 19/04/1952 33B Tilbury
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 1983       01/01/1948 13A 19/02/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 1984       01/01/1948 13A 19/02/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 1985       01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 21/07/1951 33C Shoeburyness
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 1986       01/01/1948 13A 19/02/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 1987       01/01/1948 13A 5w/e 16/07/1949 24B Rose Grove
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 1988       01/01/1948 13A 09/04/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 1989       01/01/1948 13A 09/04/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 1990       01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 19/04/1952 33C Shoeburyness
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 1993       01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 19/04/1952 33B Tilbury
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2112       01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 21/07/1951 33B Tilbury
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2113 4w/e 22/06/1946 13C Tilbury 01/01/1948 13A w/e 10/03/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2114       01/01/1948 13A 01/09/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2117       01/01/1948 13A 28/09/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2124       01/01/1948 13A 19/12/1956 Withdrawn
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2126       01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 21/07/1951 33B Tilbury
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2127       01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 21/07/1951 33B Tilbury
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2130       01/01/1948 13A 17/02/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2131       01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 20/10/1951 33B Tilbury
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2132 4w/e 22/06/1946 13C Tilbury 01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 19/04/1952 33B Tilbury
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2133 4w/e 22/06/1946 13C Tilbury 01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 21/07/1951 33B Tilbury
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2134       01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 19/12/1953 30A Stratford
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2136 4w/e 22/06/1946 13A Plaistow 01/01/1948 13A 25/08/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2139 4w/e 22/06/1946 13A Plaistow 01/01/1948 13A 28/09/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2141       01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 21/07/1951 33C Shoeburyness
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2145       01/01/1948 13A 21/02/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2151 4w/e 22/06/1946 13A Plaistow 01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 21/07/1951 33B Tilbury
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2152       01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 21/07/1951 33B Tilbury
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2156       01/01/1948 13A w/e 12/02/1955 Withdrawn
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2157       01/01/1948 13A 5w/e 17/01/1953 33B Tilbury
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2158       01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 20/02/1954 30A Stratford
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1261 m/e 11/1945 13E Upminster 01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 19/06/1954 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2225       01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 19/04/1952 33B Tilbury
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2226       01/01/1948 13A w/e 07/11/1959 33C Shoeburyness
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2227       01/01/1948 13A w/e 07/11/1959 33C Shoeburyness
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2248       01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 19/03/1955 34E Neasden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2249       01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 19/03/1955 34E Neasden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2250       01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 22/01/1955 34E Neasden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2251       01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 22/01/1955 34E Neasden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2252       01/01/1948 13A 5w/e 23/04/1955 34E Neasden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2253       01/01/1948 13A 4w/e 20/08/1955 34E Neasden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2254       01/01/1948 13A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2255       01/01/1948 13A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2256       01/01/1948 13A 3w/e 14/05/1955 34E Neasden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2257       01/01/1948 13A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42681 01/01/1948 14C St Albans 3w/e 11/12/1948 13A m/e 30/11/1949 PLS Plaistow
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42231 3w/e 11/12/1948 14C St Albans m/e 30/11/1949 PLS 4w/e 19/02/1955 34E Neasden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42232 3w/e 11/12/1948 14C St Albans m/e 30/11/1949 PLS 5w/e 23/04/1955 34E Neasden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42681 3w/e 11/12/1948 13A Plaistow m/e 30/11/1949 PLS 5w/e 24/12/1949 91E To Eastern Region
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42684 01/01/1948 14C St Albans m/e 30/11/1949 PLS 5w/e 24/12/1949 91E To Eastern Region
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42687 01/01/1948 14B Kentish Town m/e 30/11/1949 PLS 4w/e 15/12/1956 33C Shoeburyness
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 58045 4w/e 09/09/1950 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 25/11/1950 33A 4w/e 23/12/1950 33A Plaistow
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 58045 4w/e 25/11/1950 33A Plaistow 4w/e 23/12/1950 33A 4w/e 19/05/1951 15A Wellingborough
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58200 4w/e 31/12/1950 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 17/02/1951 33A 5w/e 24/03/1951 33A Plaistow
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47262 01/01/1948 14B Kentish Town 5w/e 24/03/1951 33A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47282 01/01/1948 14B Kentish Town 5w/e 24/03/1951 33A 5w/e 17/12/1955 35C Spital Bridge
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47306 01/01/1948 13B Devons Road (Bow) 5w/e 24/03/1951 33A 5w/e 17/12/1955 35C Spital Bridge
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47312 01/01/1948 13B Devons Road (Bow) 5w/e 24/03/1951 33A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47429 01/01/1948 14B Kentish Town 5w/e 24/03/1951 33A 5w/e 17/12/1955 35A New England
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47555 01/01/1948 18A Toton 5w/e 24/03/1951 33A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58200 4w/e 17/02/1951 33A Plaistow 5w/e 24/03/1951 33A 17/06/1954 Withdrawn
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 41980 01/01/1948 13C Tilbury 4w/e 21/07/1951 33A 02/05/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 41992 01/01/1948 13D Northwich 4w/e 21/07/1951 33A 19/02/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 41934 01/01/1948 13D Northwich 4w/e 21/07/1951 33A m/e 09/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 41953 01/01/1948 13C Tilbury 4w/e 21/07/1951 33A 25/08/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42190       4w/e 18/08/1951 33A 8w/e 19/04/1952 67A Corkerhill
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42191       5w/e 22/09/1951 33A 8w/e 19/04/1952 67A Corkerhill
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42530 8w/e 09/09/1951 66D Greenock Ladyburn 5w/e 16/02/1952 33A 4w/e 22/03/1952 33A Plaistow
Steam J17 0-6-0 65533 4w/e 20/10/1951 31A Cambridge 5w/e 16/02/1952 33A 3w/e 14/05/1955 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42530 5w/e 16/02/1952 33A Plaistow 4w/e 22/03/1952 33A 4w/e 19/04/1952 33C Shoeburyness
Steam J17 0-6-0 65545 5w/e 22/09/1951 31A Cambridge 4w/e 22/03/1952 33A 4w/e 19/04/1952 33C Shoeburyness
Steam J17 0-6-0 65566 5w/e 16/02/1952 30A Stratford 4w/e 22/03/1952 33A 5w/e 18/06/1955 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J17 0-6-0 65588 4w/e 20/01/1951 31A Cambridge 4w/e 22/03/1952 33A 5w/e 18/06/1955 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47300 4w/e 21/07/1951 33B Tilbury 4w/e 19/04/1952 33A 4w/e 25/05/1956 35B Grantham
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 41981 4w/e 21/07/1951 33B Tilbury 4w/e 19/04/1952 33A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 41991 01/01/1948 13D Northwich 4w/e 19/04/1952 33A 19/02/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 41930 4w/e 21/07/1951 33B Tilbury 4w/e 19/04/1952 33A w/e 23/08/1952 Withdrawn
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 41951 4w/e 21/07/1951 33B Tilbury 4w/e 19/04/1952 33A 4w/e 20/02/1954 30A Stratford
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 41978 4w/e 21/07/1951 33B Tilbury 4w/e 19/04/1952 33A 17/02/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 1142 0-6-0 58129       4w/e 19/04/1952 33A 25/02/1955 Withdrawn
Steam J17 0-6-0 65552 5w/e 16/02/1952 30A Stratford 4w/e 19/04/1952 33A 4w/e 23/01/1954 30A Stratford
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42535 8w/e 09/09/1951 66D Greenock Ladyburn 5w/e 21/06/1952 33A 4w/e 15/12/1956 33C Shoeburyness
Steam J69 0-6-0T 8568 4w/e 17/05/1952 32A Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 21/06/1952 33A 4w/e 25/07/1953 30A Stratford
Steam J68 0-6-0T 68648 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 5w/e 21/06/1952 33A 4w/e 16/05/1953 30A Stratford
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42230 01/01/1948 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 15/11/1952 33A 5w/e 23/04/1955 34E Neasden
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80069       30/09/1953 (New) 33A 4w/e 23/01/1954 33B Tilbury
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80070       09/10/1953 (New) 33A 4w/e 23/01/1954 33B Tilbury
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80071       21/10/1953 (New) 33A 4w/e 23/01/1954 33B Tilbury
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80072       03/11/1953 (New) 33A 4w/e 23/01/1954 33B Tilbury
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80073       13/11/1953 (New) 33A 4w/e 23/01/1954 33B Tilbury
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80074       27/11/1953 (New) 33A 4w/e 15/12/1956 33B Tilbury
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80075       10/12/1953 (New) 33A 4w/e 15/12/1956 33B Tilbury
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80076       23/12/1953 (New) 33A 4w/e 15/12/1956 33B Tilbury
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80077       12/01/1954 (New) 33A 4w/e 15/12/1956 33B Tilbury
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 41950 4w/e 19/04/1952 33B Tilbury 4w/e 23/01/1954 33A 17/02/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 41969 4w/e 21/07/1951 33B Tilbury 4w/e 23/01/1954 33A 4w/e 15/12/1956 33C Shoeburyness
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80078       02/02/1954 (New) 33A 4w/e 15/12/1956 33B Tilbury
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80079       05/03/1954 (New) 33A 5w/e 24/04/1954 33B Tilbury
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80080       18/03/1954 (New) 33A 4w/e 22/05/1954 33B Tilbury
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42221 01/01/1948 13C Tilbury 4w/e 19/06/1954 33A 5w/e 15/11/1958 33C Shoeburyness
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 58087 4w/e 30/01/1954 16A Nottingham 5w/e 24/07/1954 33A 4w/e 16/07/1955 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80096       23/11/1954 (New) 33A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80097       09/12/1954 (New) 33A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80098       22/12/1954 (New) 33A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 58091 4w/e 03/10/1953 15A Wellingborough 6w/e 25/12/1954 33A 4w/e 22/09/1956 33B Tilbury
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80099       17/01/1955 (New) 33A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80100       31/01/1955 (New) 33A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80101       07/02/1955 (New) 33A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11110 14/03/1953 30F Parkeston Quay (New) 4w/e 19/02/1955 33A 4w/e 20/08/1955 30A Stratford
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80102       01/03/1955 (New) 33A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80103       16/03/1955 (New) 33A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11101 5w/e 23/08/1952 31B March 4w/e 19/03/1955 33A 5w/e 23/04/1955 31B March
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58197       4w/e 19/03/1955 33A 4w/e 18/05/1957 55D Royston
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90526 4w/e 19/02/1955 30A Stratford 4w/e 19/03/1955 33A 3w/e 14/05/1955 33A Plaistow
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90443 4w/e 19/02/1955 30A Stratford 4w/e 19/03/1955 33A 3w/e 14/05/1955 40B Immingham
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90668 4w/e 19/02/1955 30A Stratford 4w/e 19/03/1955 33A 3w/e 14/05/1955 40B Immingham
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90709 4w/e 17/02/1951 36B Mexborough 4w/e 19/03/1955 33A 5w/e 23/07/1955 35A New England
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80104       31/03/1955 (New) 33A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80105       19/04/1955 (New) 33A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90526 4w/e 19/03/1955 33A Plaistow 3w/e 14/05/1955 33A 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90196       3w/e 14/05/1955 33A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90442 4w/e 24/10/1953 40B Immingham 3w/e 14/05/1955 33A 5w/e 15/11/1958 33B Tilbury
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90653 4w/e 17/02/1951 36B Mexborough 3w/e 14/05/1955 33A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90256       5w/e 23/07/1955 33A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam N7 0-6-2T 69691 4w/e 23/10/1954 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 5w/e 21/01/1956 33A 4w/e 22/09/1956 33B Tilbury
Steam N7 0-6-2T 69695 4w/e 23/10/1954 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 5w/e 21/01/1956 33A 4w/e 22/09/1956 33B Tilbury
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80131       02/03/1956 (New) 33A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80132       15/03/1956 (New) 33A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80133       28/03/1956 (New) 33A w/e 07/11/1959 33C Shoeburyness
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80134       20/04/1956 (New) 33A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80135       30/04/1956 (New) 33A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80136       11/05/1956 (New) 33A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 41982 4w/e 19/04/1952 33B Tilbury 4w/e 15/12/1956 33A 19/02/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 41990 4w/e 19/04/1952 33C Shoeburyness 4w/e 15/12/1956 33A 19/02/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 41993 4w/e 19/04/1952 33B Tilbury 4w/e 15/12/1956 33A 19/02/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 41945 4w/e 21/07/1951 33B Tilbury 4w/e 15/12/1956 33A 16/02/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 41946 01/01/1948 13C Tilbury 4w/e 15/12/1956 33A 17/02/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42218 01/01/1948 13C Tilbury 4w/e 15/12/1956 33A 5w/e 15/11/1958 33C Shoeburyness
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42219 01/01/1948 13C Tilbury 4w/e 15/12/1956 33A 5w/e 15/11/1958 33C Shoeburyness
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42220 01/01/1948 13C Tilbury 4w/e 15/12/1956 33A 5w/e 15/11/1958 33C Shoeburyness
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42223 01/01/1948 13D Northwich 4w/e 15/12/1956 33A 5w/e 15/11/1958 33C Shoeburyness
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42224 01/01/1948 13D Northwich 4w/e 15/12/1956 33A 5w/e 15/11/1958 33C Shoeburyness
Steam J39 0-6-0 64883 12/10/1952 35C Spital Bridge 07/04/1957 33A 26/05/1957 36A Doncaster
Steam J39 0-6-0 64891 12/04/1953 35C Spital Bridge 07/04/1957 33A 26/05/1957 32B Ipswich
Steam J39 0-6-0 64896 28/12/1952 35C Spital Bridge 07/04/1957 33A 26/05/1957 30F Parkeston Quay
Steam J39 0-6-0 64901 12/10/1952 35C Spital Bridge 07/04/1957 33A 26/05/1957 35C Spital Bridge
Steam J39 0-6-0 64951 12/10/1952 35C Spital Bridge 07/04/1957 33A 31/10/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam J39 0-6-0 64981 12/04/1953 35C Spital Bridge 07/04/1957 33A 02/06/1957 36A Doncaster
Steam J39 0-6-0 64953 18/01/1948 PKS Parkeston Quay 26/05/1957 33A 30/10/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam J39 0-6-0 64954 12/10/1952 35C Spital Bridge 26/05/1957 33A 31/10/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam J39 0-6-0 64956 17/08/1952 36A Doncaster 26/05/1957 33A 31/10/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam J39 0-6-0 64957 07/11/1946 IPS Ipswich 26/05/1957 33A 31/10/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam J39 0-6-0 64952 22/09/1946 DON Doncaster 02/06/1957 33A 31/10/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam J39 0-6-0 64958 25/09/1955 31A Cambridge 08/06/1958 33A 31/10/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam J39 0-6-0 64962 19/05/1957 30A Stratford 08/06/1958 33A 31/10/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam J39 0-6-0 64968 28/07/1957 32A Norwich Thorpe 08/06/1958 33A 31/10/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam J39 0-6-0 64965 12/10/1952 35C Spital Bridge 29/06/1958 33A 31/10/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 41969 4w/e 15/12/1956 33C Shoeburyness 5w/e 15/11/1958 33A w/e 31/01/1959 31F Spital Bridge
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90106 w/e 27/06/1959 31B March w/e 10/10/1959 33A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90244 w/e 04/07/1959 31B March w/e 10/10/1959 33A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90093 w/e 27/06/1959 31B March w/e 10/10/1959 33A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90514 w/e 27/06/1959 31B March w/e 10/10/1959 33A w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury