Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 711 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2435 Week
» 12570 Month
» 328801 Year
» 839903 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Radyr


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Radyr Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6634       4w/e 31/12/1949 RYR 3w/e 19/05/1951 86G Pontypool Road
Steam 45 0-6-2T 433       4w/e 31/12/1949 RYR m/e 02/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 3400 31/12/1955 88B Cardiff East Dock (New) 4w/e 25/01/1958 88A 4w/e 01/11/1958 84G Shrewsbury
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 3401 31/01/1956 88B Cardiff East Dock (New) 4w/e 25/01/1958 88A m/e 11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 3402 29/02/1956 88B Cardiff East Dock (New) 4w/e 25/01/1958 88A m/e 11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 3403 29/02/1956 88B Cardiff East Dock (New) 4w/e 25/01/1958 88A m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 3404 31/03/1956 88B Cardiff East Dock (New) 4w/e 25/01/1958 88A m/e 07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 3405 30/04/1956 88B Cardiff East Dock (New) 4w/e 25/01/1958 88A 4w/e 29/11/1958 88C Barry
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 3406 31/05/1956 88B Cardiff East Dock (New) 4w/e 25/01/1958 88A 4w/e 29/11/1958 88C Barry
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 3407 31/08/1956 88B Cardiff East Dock (New) 4w/e 25/01/1958 88A 05/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 3408 31/08/1956 88B Cardiff East Dock (New) 4w/e 25/01/1958 88A m/e 09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 3409 31/10/1956 88B Cardiff East Dock (New) 4w/e 25/01/1958 88A m/e 10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3727 8w/e 20/04/1957 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 25/01/1958 88A 4w/e 16/05/1959 88C Barry
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5648 4w/e 30/11/1957 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 25/01/1958 88A m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5684       4w/e 25/01/1958 88A 4w/e 12/06/1958 88F Treherbert
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5687 8w/e 20/04/1957 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 25/01/1958 88A 4w/e 12/06/1958 88F Treherbert
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6704       4w/e 25/01/1958 88A m/e 03/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6707       4w/e 25/01/1958 88A 4w/e 14/06/1958 86B Newport Pill
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 5527 4w/e 03/10/1953 88C Barry 4w/e 22/02/1958 88A 4w/e 12/06/1958 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6635 4w/e 25/01/1958 84C Banbury 4w/e 22/03/1958 88A m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82032 4w/e 06/10/1956 88F Treherbert 4w/e 22/03/1958 88A 4w/e 17/05/1958 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82033 4w/e 06/10/1956 88F Treherbert 4w/e 22/03/1958 88A 4w/e 17/05/1958 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82034 4w/e 06/10/1956 88F Treherbert 4w/e 22/03/1958 88A 4w/e 17/05/1958 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82036 01/04/1955 88C Barry (New) 4w/e 22/03/1958 88A 4w/e 17/05/1958 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 6416 4w/e 23/02/1957 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 19/04/1958 88A 4w/e 09/08/1958 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6744 4w/e 01/12/1945 48 Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 19/04/1958 88A m/e 07/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6751       4w/e 19/04/1958 88A 4w/e 19/04/1958 88C Barry
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82037 4w/e 14/07/1956 88C Barry 4w/e 19/04/1958 88A 4w/e 17/05/1958 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4143 4w/e 31/12/1951 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 17/05/1958 88A 4w/e 03/12/1960 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4152 4w/e 31/12/1951 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 17/05/1958 88A 4w/e 06/09/1958 85A Worcester
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4160 4w/e 03/10/1953 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 17/05/1958 88A 4w/e 06/04/1963 88B Radyr
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4163 4w/e 03/10/1953 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 17/05/1958 88A 4w/e 21/02/1959 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4164 4w/e 03/10/1953 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 17/05/1958 88A 4w/e 04/10/1958 86E Severn Tunnel Junction
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6699 8w/e 26/03/1955 82C Swindon 4w/e 17/05/1958 88A m/e 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4616 3w/e 17/05/1952 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 12/06/1958 88A 4w/e 29/11/1958 88C Barry
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 7751 4w/e 25/01/1958 88E Abercynon 4w/e 12/06/1958 88A 4w/e 27/12/1958 88C Barry
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8419 4w/e 08/10/1955 88F Treherbert 4w/e 12/06/1958 88A 4w/e 21/02/1959 88C Barry
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8420 4w/e 21/03/1953 88F Treherbert 4w/e 12/06/1958 88A 4w/e 16/06/1962 81A Old Oak Common
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8438 4w/e 30/11/1957 88F Treherbert 4w/e 12/06/1958 88A 05/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8460 4w/e 21/03/1953 88F Treherbert 4w/e 12/06/1958 88A 4w/e 03/10/1959 85A Worcester
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9425 4w/e 08/10/1955 88F Treherbert 4w/e 12/06/1958 88A 4w/e 21/03/1959 88C Barry
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 6411       4w/e 06/09/1958 88A m/e 03/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8455 4w/e 16/07/1955 88F Treherbert 4w/e 06/09/1958 88A m/e 01/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5615 4w/e 04/12/1954 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 04/10/1958 88A 4w/e 29/11/1958 88C Barry
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5669 4w/e 04/10/1958 88F Treherbert 4w/e 01/11/1958 88A 4w/e 09/02/1963 88F Treherbert
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 7717       4w/e 01/11/1958 88A 4w/e 27/12/1958 88C Barry
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 7766       4w/e 01/11/1958 88A 4w/e 27/12/1958 88C Barry
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 3405 4w/e 29/11/1958 88C Barry 4w/e 27/12/1958 88A m/e 11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 3406 4w/e 29/11/1958 88C Barry 4w/e 27/12/1958 88A m/e 11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5692 4w/e 12/06/1958 88F Treherbert 4w/e 27/12/1958 88A 4w/e 08/10/1960 87F Llanelly
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5640 4w/e 01/12/1945 58 Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 24/01/1959 88A 4w/e 08/10/1960 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5663 4w/e 25/01/1958 88F Treherbert 4w/e 24/01/1959 88A 4w/e 03/10/1959 88A Radyr
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5675 4w/e 17/05/1958 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 24/01/1959 88A 4w/e 03/10/1959 87D Swansea East Dock
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5615 4w/e 29/11/1958 88C Barry 4w/e 18/04/1959 88A 4w/e 09/09/1961 88E Abercynon
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8780 4w/e 21/02/1959 88C Barry 4w/e 16/05/1959 88A m/e 07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7252 8w/e 26/03/1955 88C Barry 4w/e 05/09/1959 88A 4w/e 27/07/1963 87B Duffryn Yard
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4210 8w/e 26/03/1955 88C Barry 4w/e 05/09/1959 88A 4w/e 27/07/1963 87B Duffryn Yard
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4163 4w/e 21/02/1959 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 03/10/1959 88A 4w/e 28/01/1961 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5618       4w/e 03/10/1959 88A 4w/e 13/08/1960 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5663 4w/e 24/01/1959 88A Radyr 4w/e 03/10/1959 88A m/e 08/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6657 4w/e 26/03/1960 88C Barry 4w/e 23/04/1960 88A 4w/e 04/05/1963 88H Tondu
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5697 4w/e 21/05/1960 81E Didcot 4w/e 16/07/1960 88A m/e 04/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6108 4w/e 16/07/1960 87H Neyland 4w/e 08/10/1960 88B 6w/e 12/10/1964 81F Oxford
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6639 4w/e 03/12/1955 82C Swindon 4w/e 05/11/1960 88B 4w/e 25/03/1961 88G Llantrisant
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5635 4w/e 31/10/1950 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961 88B m/e 05/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1447 4w/e 05/09/1959 81B Slough 4w/e 20/05/1961 88B 4w/e 04/11/1961 89B Croes Newydd
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 6430 4w/e 21/03/1959 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 09/09/1961 88B 4w/e 19/05/1962 83D Laira
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6688 4w/e 17/06/1961 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 09/09/1961 88B 4w/e 09/02/1963 86G Pontypool Road
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 6438 4w/e 09/09/1961 88H Tondu 4w/e 07/10/1961 88B 4w/e 19/05/1962 83D Laira
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4166 4w/e 16/07/1955 82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 02/12/1961 88B m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6637       4w/e 02/12/1961 88B m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 3400 4w/e 01/11/1958 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 19/05/1962 88B m/e 11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9711 4w/e 12/08/1961 88H Tondu 4w/e 19/05/1962 88B 4w/e 09/02/1963 88J Aberdare
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7250 4w/e 24/02/1962 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 11/08/1962 88B m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4219 4w/e 24/02/1962 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 11/08/1962 88B m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4637       4w/e 11/08/1962 88B m/e 05/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6621 8w/e 20/04/1957 86H Aberbeeg 4w/e 11/08/1962 88B 4w/e 29/06/1963 88F Treherbert
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6656 4w/e 19/05/1962 88C Barry 4w/e 08/09/1962 88B 4w/e 27/07/1963 84F Stourbridge Junction
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6669 4w/e 14/06/1958 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 08/09/1962 88B 05/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7239 8w/e 11/07/1953 81F Oxford 4w/e 06/10/1962 88B 2w/e 17/11/1962 87F Llanelly
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 5274 8w/e 11/07/1953 81F Oxford 4w/e 06/10/1962 88B 2w/e 17/11/1962 87F Llanelly
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7209 4w/e 16/07/1960 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 03/11/1962 88B 4w/e 15/12/1962 88J Aberdare
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 5284 4w/e 16/07/1960 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 03/11/1962 88B 4w/e 15/12/1962 88J Aberdare
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8479 4w/e 02/12/1961 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 03/11/1962 88B m/e 10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9480 4w/e 27/02/1960 83C Exeter 4w/e 03/11/1962 88B 3w/e 04/05/1964 87D Swansea East Dock
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3716 4w/e 21/04/1956 86J Aberdare 2w/e 17/11/1962 88B 4w/e 09/03/1963 88J Aberdare
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5625 4w/e 27/03/1954 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 15/12/1962 88B m/e 10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5651 4w/e 30/01/1960 84J Croes Newydd 4w/e 15/12/1962 88B 4w/e 01/06/1963 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5672 4w/e 28/01/1961 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 15/12/1962 88B m/e 09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8466 4w/e 08/09/1962 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 09/02/1963 88B m/e 07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8497 4w/e 18/06/1960 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 09/02/1963 88B m/e 07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9472 4w/e 15/12/1962 88C Barry 4w/e 09/02/1963 88B 3w/e 04/05/1964 87D Swansea East Dock
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4160 4w/e 17/05/1958 88A Radyr 4w/e 06/04/1963 88B 6w/e 12/10/1964 86E Severn Tunnel Junction
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6116 4w/e 14/07/1962 87J Fishguard Goodwick 4w/e 04/05/1963 88B m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6638 4w/e 04/12/1954 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 04/05/1963 88B m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7231 4w/e 06/10/1962 88C Barry 4w/e 29/06/1963 88B 4w/e 27/07/1963 87F Llanelly
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 5266 4w/e 06/10/1962 88C Barry 4w/e 29/06/1963 88B 4w/e 27/07/1963 87F Llanelly
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7217 4w/e 12/01/1963 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 29/06/1963 88B 4w/e 27/07/1963 87F Llanelly
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 5292 4w/e 12/01/1963 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 29/06/1963 88B 4w/e 27/07/1963 87F Llanelly
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7219 4w/e 31/10/1953 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 29/06/1963 88B m/e 01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 5294 4w/e 31/10/1953 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 29/06/1963 88B m/e 01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9456       4w/e 27/07/1963 88B m/e 04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9457 4w/e 05/09/1953 87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 27/07/1963 88B m/e 07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9466 4w/e 14/07/1962 88H Tondu 4w/e 27/07/1963 88B m/e 07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5633 4w/e 13/07/1957 86J Aberdare 4w/e 28/09/1963 88B m/e 05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5673 4w/e 17/06/1961 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 28/09/1963 88B m/e 03/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 81xx 2-6-2T 8103 4w/e 28/09/1963 88G Llantrisant 4w/e 02/11/1963 88B 28/11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6605       4w/e 02/11/1963 88B m/e 01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6695 4w/e 17/06/1961 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 02/11/1963 88B m/e 07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4143 4w/e 12/08/1961 83B Taunton 4w/e 30/11/1963 88B m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6113 4w/e 12/08/1961 83B Taunton 4w/e 30/11/1963 88B 6w/e 12/10/1964 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5623 4w/e 05/11/1960 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 28/12/1963 88B m/e 02/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5624 4w/e 02/11/1963 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 28/12/1963 88B m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6672 4w/e 14/07/1956 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 28/12/1963 88B m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6680 4w/e 09/03/1963 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 28/12/1963 88B m/e 04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6606 4w/e 03/11/1956 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 25/01/1964 88B m/e 01/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7245 4w/e 09/02/1963 86F Aberbeeg 4w/e 22/02/1964 88B m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4205 4w/e 09/02/1963 86F Aberbeeg 4w/e 22/02/1964 88B m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5694 m/e 16/06/1956 88F Treherbert 6w/e 13/04/1964 88B m/e 11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5692 4w/e 27/07/1963 88H Tondu 3w/e 04/05/1964 88B m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6124 4w/e 04/05/1963 81A Old Oak Common 3w/e 04/05/1964 88B m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6169 4w/e 05/11/1960 81A Old Oak Common 3w/e 04/05/1964 88B 7w/e 22/06/1964 85A Worcester
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6657 4w/e 04/05/1963 88H Tondu 3w/e 04/05/1964 88B m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6661 4w/e 03/10/1953 86J Aberdare 3w/e 04/05/1964 88B 2w/e 10/01/1965 88B Radyr
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6690 4w/e 19/05/1962 88J Aberdare 3w/e 04/05/1964 88B m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5669 4w/e 09/02/1963 88F Treherbert 7w/e 22/06/1964 88B m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5676       7w/e 22/06/1964 88B w/e 12/09/1964 6C Croes Newydd
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6681 4w/e 27/07/1963 88F Treherbert 7w/e 22/06/1964 88B w/e 12/09/1964 2A Tyseley
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9711 4w/e 09/02/1963 88J Aberdare 7w/e 22/06/1964 88B 6w/e 12/10/1964 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4132 m/e 07/1964 Withdrawn 4w/e 20/07/1964 (R) 88B      
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4169 4w/e 01/01/1955 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 20/07/1964 88B m/e 05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5602 4w/e 30/11/1963 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 20/07/1964 88B m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6621 7w/e 22/06/1964 88C Barry 4w/e 20/07/1964 88B m/e 12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6697 4w/e 23/04/1960 88C Barry 4w/e 20/07/1964 88B w/e 12/09/1964 2L Leamington
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8475 7w/e 22/06/1964 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 20/07/1964 88B m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8495 4w/e 11/07/1959 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 20/07/1964 88B m/e 11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9480 7w/e 22/06/1964 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 20/07/1964 88B m/e 04/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9488 4w/e 30/11/1963 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 20/07/1964 88B m/e 04/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3644       6w/e 12/10/1964 88B m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3738 3w/e 04/05/1964 88G Llantrisant 6w/e 12/10/1964 88B 5w/e 16/05/1965 88A Cardiff East Dock
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3784 4w/e 02/11/1963 88C Barry 6w/e 12/10/1964 88B m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7245 m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn 6w/e 12/10/1964 (R) 88B      
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4205 m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn 6w/e 12/10/1964 (R) 88B      
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7252 6w/e 13/04/1964 87A Neath (Court Sart) 6w/e 12/10/1964 88B 2w/e 10/01/1965 86E Severn Tunnel Junction
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4210 6w/e 13/04/1964 87A Neath (Court Sart) 6w/e 12/10/1964 88B 2w/e 10/01/1965 86E Severn Tunnel Junction
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4268 4w/e 30/01/1954 86D Llantrisant 6w/e 12/10/1964 88B w/e 08/11/1964 88J Aberdare
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4620       6w/e 12/10/1964 88B 5w/e 16/05/1965 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4662 m/e 16/06/1956 86D Llantrisant 6w/e 12/10/1964 88B 4w/e 08/08/1965 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4674 4w/e 01/12/1945 16 Longsight 6w/e 12/10/1964 88B m/e 11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5660 m/e 10/1964 Withdrawn 6w/e 12/10/1964 (R) 88B      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5689 4w/e 09/02/1963 88C Barry 6w/e 12/10/1964 88B m/e 05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6650 4w/e 09/03/1963 88C Barry 6w/e 12/10/1964 88B m/e 05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9426 4w/e 02/11/1963 88C Barry 6w/e 12/10/1964 88B m/e 05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9430 4w/e 15/07/1961 85D Bromsgrove 6w/e 12/10/1964 88B w/e 22/11/1964 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9461 4w/e 02/11/1963 88C Barry 6w/e 12/10/1964 88B m/e 05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9778 4w/e 24/03/1962 88G Llantrisant 6w/e 12/10/1964 88B m/e 11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT 1612 4w/e 31/10/1959 88E Abercynon w/e 08/11/1964 88B m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT 1613 4w/e 28/12/1963 86C Hereford w/e 08/11/1964 88B m/e 03/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3728       w/e 08/11/1964 88B m/e 04/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4110 4w/e 01/06/1963 87A Neath (Court Sart) w/e 08/11/1964 88B 5w/e 16/05/1965 86E Severn Tunnel Junction
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4623 4w/e 12/01/1963 86C Hereford w/e 08/11/1964 88B 5w/e 16/05/1965 88A Cardiff East Dock
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4650 4w/e 15/07/1961 86F Aberbeeg w/e 08/11/1964 88B m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4679 6w/e 12/10/1964 88E Abercynon w/e 08/11/1964 88B m/e 05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5691 4w/e 09/03/1963 88E Abercynon w/e 08/11/1964 88B m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5699 m/e 11/1964 Withdrawn w/e 08/11/1964 (R) 88B      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6654 6w/e 12/10/1964 88E Abercynon w/e 08/11/1964 88B m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8484 4w/e 08/09/1962 88L Cardiff East Dock w/e 08/11/1964 88B m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9437 4w/e 28/12/1963 88A Cardiff East Dock w/e 08/11/1964 88B m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9611 4w/e 08/09/1962 88E Abercynon w/e 08/11/1964 88B m/e 04/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9622 4w/e 29/11/1958 88E Abercynon w/e 08/11/1964 88B m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9667 3w/e 04/05/1964 88E Abercynon w/e 08/11/1964 88B m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9682 4w/e 16/07/1960 86H Aberbeeg w/e 08/11/1964 88B m/e 08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6661 3w/e 04/05/1964 88B Radyr 2w/e 10/01/1965 88B m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Grange 4-6-0 6876 7w/e 22/06/1964 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 2w/e 10/01/1965 88B 2w/e 07/03/1965 88A Cardiff East Dock
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9780 7w/e 22/06/1964 87A Neath (Court Sart) 2w/e 23/01/1965 88B m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9446 7w/e 22/06/1964 87A Neath (Court Sart) 2w/e 07/02/1965 88B m/e 05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9464 6w/e 13/04/1964 87A Neath (Court Sart) 2w/e 07/02/1965 88B m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9475 6w/e 13/04/1964 87A Neath (Court Sart) 2w/e 07/02/1965 88B m/e 05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT 1655 31/01/1955 87F Llanelly (New) 3w/e 28/03/1965 88B m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9615 2w/e 23/01/1965 88J Aberdare 3w/e 28/03/1965 88B m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3717       5w/e 16/05/1965 88B m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9644 4w/e 30/11/1963 86G Pontypool Road 5w/e 16/05/1965 88B m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9656 6w/e 13/04/1964 87A Neath (Court Sart) 5w/e 16/05/1965 88B 4w/e 08/08/1965 86E Severn Tunnel Junction
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9675 7w/e 22/06/1964 87A Neath (Court Sart) 5w/e 16/05/1965 88B 4w/e 08/08/1965 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport)