Depot: Reading (S.R.)
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Reading (S.R.) | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | G6 | 0-6-0T | 258 | on | 01/01/1948 | RDG | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | BAS | Basingstoke | ||||
Steam | G6 | 0-6-0T | 260 | on | 01/01/1948 | RDG | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | BM | Bournemouth | ||||
Steam | Jumbos | 4-4-0 | 1042 | on | 01/01/1948 | RDG | m/e | 02/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Jumbos | 4-4-0 | 1078 | on | 01/01/1948 | RDG | m/e | 03/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Flying Bedsteads | 4-4-0 | 1217 | on | 01/01/1948 | RDG | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | ||||
Steam | Flying Bedsteads | 4-4-0 | 1446 | on | 01/01/1948 | RDG | P | 02/01/1948 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | ||||
Steam | Flying Bedsteads | 4-4-0 | 1459 | on | 01/01/1948 | RDG | m/e | 02/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 1610 | on | 01/01/1948 | RDG | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 75B | Redhill | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 1611 | on | 01/01/1948 | RDG | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 75B | Redhill | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 1615 | on | 01/01/1948 | RDG | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 75B | Redhill | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 1620 | on | 01/01/1948 | RDG | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | GFD | Guildford | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 1628 | on | 01/01/1948 | RDG | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 1807 | on | 01/01/1948 | RDG | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | GFD | Guildford | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1850 | on | 01/01/1948 | RDG | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | FAV | Faversham | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1854 | on | 01/01/1948 | RDG | P | 02/01/1948 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1857 | on | 01/01/1948 | RDG | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 73C | Hither Green | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1860 | on | 01/01/1948 | RDG | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1861 | q/e | 12/1935 | HIT | Hither Green | on | 01/01/1948 | RDG | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1868 | on | 01/01/1948 | RDG | P | 02/01/1948 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | ||||
Steam | Flying Bedsteads | 4-4-0 | 1446 | on | 01/01/1948 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | P | 02/01/1948 | RDG | on | 30/07/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1854 | on | 01/01/1948 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | P | 02/01/1948 | RDG | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | FAV | Faversham |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1868 | on | 01/01/1948 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | P | 02/01/1948 | RDG | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 73E | Faversham |
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | 1696 | P | 02/01/1948 | FEL | Feltham | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | RDG | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | FAV | Faversham |
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | 1698 | P | 02/01/1948 | FEL | Feltham | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | RDG | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | FAV | Faversham |
Steam | Jumbos | 4-4-0 | 1028 | on | 01/01/1948 | HIT | Hither Green | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | RDG | m/e | 05/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Jumbos | 4-4-0 | 1031 | on | 01/01/1948 | HIT | Hither Green | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | RDG | m/e | 05/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Jumbos | 4-4-0 | 1151 | on | 01/01/1948 | RAM | Ramsgate | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | RDG | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Flying Bedsteads | 4-4-0 | 1455 | on | 01/01/1948 | HIT | Hither Green | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | RDG | m/e | 06/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Flying Bedsteads | 4-4-0 | 1457 | on | 01/01/1948 | HIT | Hither Green | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | RDG | m/e | 02/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77291 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | RDG | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||||
Steam | Jumbos | 4-4-0 | 1105 | on | 01/01/1948 | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | RDG | m/e | 02/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Flying Bedsteads | 4-4-0 | 1440 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | Faversham | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | RDG | m/e | 11/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Flying Bedsteads | 4-4-0 | 1453 | on | 01/01/1948 | RAM | Ramsgate | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | RDG | m/e | 10/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Flying Bedsteads | 4-4-0 | 1454 | on | 01/01/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | RDG | m/e | 11/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2487 | on | 01/01/1948 | GFD | Guildford | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | RDG | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | FRA | Fratton |
Steam | Flying Bedsteads | 4-4-0 | 1013 | on | 01/01/1948 | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | RDG | m/e | 09/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Jumbos | 4-4-0 | 1231 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | Faversham | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | RDG | m/e | 03/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Flying Bedsteads | 4-4-0 | 1449 | on | 01/01/1948 | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | RDG | m/e | 03/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31797 | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | BAS | Basingstoke | 8w/e | 08/01/1949 | RDG | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Flying Bedsteads | 4-4-0 | 31217 | on | 01/01/1948 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | RDG | m/e | 06/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Flying Bedsteads | 4-4-0 | 31443 | on | 01/01/1948 | DOV | Dover Marine | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | RDG | m/e | 03/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Flying Bedsteads | 4-4-0 | 31448 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | Faversham | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | RDG | m/e | 06/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Flying Bedsteads | 4-4-0 | 31451 | on | 01/01/1948 | RAM | Ramsgate | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | RDG | m/e | 12/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 1075 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | TON | Tonbridge | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | RDG | 4w/e | 20/08/1954 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 31057 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | TON | Tonbridge | 6w/e | 26/09/1949 | RDG | w/e | 07/04/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 31515 | on | 01/01/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | RDG | w/e | 21/07/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | T | 0-6-0T | 31602 | on | 01/01/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | RDG | m/e | 07/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | T | 0-6-0T | 1604 | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | RDG | m/e | 12/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31794 | on | 01/01/1948 | YEO | Yeovil Town | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 70E | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 72C | Yeovil Town |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31796 | P | 02/01/1948 | BM | Bournemouth | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 70E | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 31744 | on | 01/01/1948 | STL | St Leonards | on | 24/06/1950 | 70E | m/e | 05/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G6 | 0-6-0T | 238 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | SAL | Salisbury | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 70E | 4w/e | 13/11/1950 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 31750 | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | TON | Tonbridge | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 70E | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31793 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 70E | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31795 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 71B | Bournemouth | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 70E | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32582 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 70E | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) |
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 31750 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 70E | w/e | 07/02/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31793 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 70E | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 72C | Yeovil Town |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32582 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 70E | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | G6 | 0-6-0T | 30270 | on | 01/01/1948 | GFD | Guildford | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 70E | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) |
Steam | G6 | 0-6-0T | 30270 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 70E | 4w/e | 29/10/1953 | 72B | Salisbury |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31612 | 3w/e | 30/11/1950 | 71D | Fratton | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 70E | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31613 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 70E | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 31746 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 74D | Tonbridge | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 70E | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31616 | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 70E | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31617 | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 70E | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) |
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 31737 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73E | Faversham | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 70E | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31616 | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 70E | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31617 | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 70E | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 31737 | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 70E | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 74D | Tonbridge |
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 31746 | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 70E | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32502 | 8w/e | 05/02/1951 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 70E | 9w/e | 08/02/1955 | 70D | Basingstoke |
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 31491 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 70E | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32501 | 8w/e | 05/02/1951 | 70A | Nine Elms | 6w/e | 05/09/1951 | 70E | m/e | 08/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31618 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 70E | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31618 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 70E | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 71C | Dorchester |
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 31488 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 70E | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | G6 | 0-6-0T | 30160 | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 70D | Basingstoke | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 70E | 4w/e | 17/12/1956 | 70D | Basingstoke |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31618 | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 71C | Dorchester | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 70E | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 71C | Dorchester |
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 31496 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 74E | St Leonards | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 70E | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 31586 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 75B | Redhill | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 70E | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31619 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 70E | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 32168 | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 29/10/1953 | 70E | w/e | 28/01/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30667 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 72B | Salisbury | 4w/e | 10/12/1953 | 70E | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30374 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 4w/e | 10/12/1953 | 70E | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30104 | on | 01/01/1948 | BM | Bournemouth | 4w/e | 10/12/1953 | 70E | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30022 | 4w/e | 10/12/1953 | 75B | Redhill | 4w/e | 30/12/1953 | 70E | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31612 | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 75B | Redhill | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 70E | 4w/e | 17/12/1956 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 32170 | 6w/e | 20/04/1955 | 75D | Horsham | 6w/e | 27/01/1956 | 70E | 6w/e | 01/04/1957 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | G6 | 0-6-0T | 30277 | 4w/e | 10/12/1953 | 70C | Guildford | 6w/e | 01/04/1957 | 70E | 3w/e | 01/05/1959 | 70C | Guildford |