Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 711 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2435 Week
» 12570 Month
» 328801 Year
» 839903 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Reddish


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Reddish Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Electric EM1 Bo+Bo 26001 m/e 04/1952 30A Southend Victoria m/e 01/06/1954 39a 21/07/1967 To Store
Electric EM1 Bo+Bo 26002 m/e 12/1953 39A Gorton m/e 01/06/1954 39a 21/07/1968 To Store
Electric EM1 Bo+Bo 26003 m/e 03/1954 36b Wath m/e 01/06/1954 39a 22/08/1980 To Store
Electric EM2 Co-Co 27000 28/12/1953 36b Wath (New) 01/06/1954 39a 05/10/1968 Withdrawn
Electric EM2 Co-Co 27003       05/08/1954 (New) 39a 05/10/1968 Withdrawn
Electric EM2 Co-Co 27004       18/09/1954 (New) 39a 05/10/1968 Withdrawn
Electric EM2 Co-Co 27005       11/12/1954 (New) 39a 05/10/1968 Withdrawn
Electric EM2 Co-Co 27006       31/12/1954 (New) 39a 05/10/1968 Withdrawn
Electric EM1 Bo+Bo 26001 21/07/1967 98S     09/1967 9C 02/11/1980 Withdrawn
Electric EM1 Bo+Bo 26002 21/07/1968 98S   m/e 09/1968 9C m/e 07/1977 To Store