Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 98 Today
» 1103 Yesterday
» 5735 Week
» 18839 Month
» 18839 Year
» 1240404 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Rhyl


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Rhyl Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1246 m/e 12/1921 18 Nottingham m/e 03/1930 W38R m/e 09/1933 M13 Wellingborough
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1249 m/e 12/1921 2 Burton m/e 03/1930 W38R m/e 09/1933 M18 Nottingham
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1252 m/e 12/1921 13 Wellingborough m/e 03/1930 W38R m/e 09/1933 M18 Nottingham
Steam 2P 4-4-0 629       01/01/1948 7D 4w/e 04/12/1954 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 2P 4-4-0 646       01/01/1948 7D 4w/e 23/02/1952 5C Stafford
Steam 2P 4-4-0 494       01/01/1948 7D 18/12/1948 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3396       01/01/1948 7D 17/08/1957 Withdrawn
Steam 27 0-6-0 12125       01/01/1948 7D 4w/e 08/09/1951 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam 27 0-6-0 12167       01/01/1948 7D m/e 03/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 27 0-6-0 12338       01/01/1948 7D 4w/e 11/08/1951 10C Patricroft
Steam 27 0-6-0 12356       01/01/1948 7D m/e 04/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 6632       01/01/1948 7D m/e 06/1950 Withdrawn
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 6658       01/01/1948 7D m/e 12/1950 Withdrawn
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 6687       01/01/1948 7D m/e 12/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 6691       01/01/1948 7D 27/03/1948 Withdrawn
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 6701       01/01/1948 7D 4w/e 12/07/1952 6H Bangor
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 6712       01/01/1948 7D 4w/e 29/12/1951 2A Rugby
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 6727       01/01/1948 7D 4w/e 31/12/1950 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam Cauliflowers 0-6-0 28505       3w/e 11/12/1948 7D m/e 02/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40433 5w/e 16/07/1949 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) 2w/e 17/06/1950 7D 4w/e 17/07/1951 2B Nuneaton
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40515 01/01/1948 2A Rugby 2w/e 17/06/1950 7D m/e 08/1950 Withdrawn
Steam Coal Tank 0-6-2T 58932       4w/e 09/09/1950 7D 4w/e 02/12/1950 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41276       10/1950 (New) 7D w/e 22/12/1962 75A Brighton
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41277       10/1950 (New) 7D 4w/e 11/08/1951 15A Wellingborough
Steam Coal Tank 0-6-2T 58911 4w/e 07/10/1950 4A Bletchley 4w/e 04/11/1950 7D 7w/e 31/08/1952 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50687 01/01/1948 23C Southport 4w/e 04/11/1950 7D 4w/e 02/12/1950 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam 28 0-6-0 52608 3w/e 14/01/1950 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 02/12/1950 7D m/e 02/1955 Withdrawn
Steam Coal Tank 0-6-2T 58921 3w/e 11/12/1948 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 31/12/1950 7D 4w/e 29/02/1952 86K Abergavenny
Steam Cauliflowers 0-6-0 58362       4w/e 24/03/1951 7D m/e 03/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40580 01/01/1948 26E Bacup 4w/e 19/05/1951 7D 4w/e 08/10/1955 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41287 4w/e 31/12/1950 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 17/07/1951 7D 4w/e 06/10/1951 7B Bangor
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46430 4w/e 24/03/1951 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 17/07/1951 7D 4w/e 06/10/1951 7B Bangor
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41244       4w/e 11/08/1951 7D 4w/e 23/04/1955 6E Wrexham Rhosddu
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41230       4w/e 06/10/1951 7D 4w/e 19/04/1952 6H Bangor
Steam 27 0-6-0 52107 01/01/1948 2D Nuneaton 4w/e 26/01/1952 7D 8w/e 14/06/1952 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40589 4w/e 26/01/1952 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 23/02/1952 7D 4w/e 08/10/1955 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41224       4w/e 19/04/1952 6K 4w/e 26/02/1955 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40143 4w/e 26/01/1952 5D Stoke 8w/e 14/06/1952 6K 4w/e 12/07/1952 5D Stoke
Steam 28 0-6-0 52619 01/01/1948 10B Preston 8w/e 14/06/1952 6K m/e 12/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41211 4w/e 07/10/1950 10D Plodder Lane 4w/e 12/07/1952 6K 4w/e 04/10/1952 10D Plodder Lane
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41320 8w/e 14/06/1952 5A Crewe North 4w/e 12/07/1952 6K 4w/e 04/10/1952 5A Crewe North
Steam Cauliflowers 0-6-0 58426 4w/e 24/02/1951 7A Llandudno Junction 4w/e 12/07/1952 6K 4w/e 09/08/1952 5A Crewe North
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 46643 4w/e 11/08/1951 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 12/07/1952 6K m/e 01/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46420       4w/e 12/07/1952 6K 4w/e 04/10/1952 8D Widnes
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46430 4w/e 29/12/1951 10B Preston 4w/e 12/07/1952 6K 8w/e 29/11/1952 10B Preston
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40324 4w/e 12/07/1952 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 04/10/1952 6K m/e 01/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40396 01/01/1948 7A Llandudno Junction 4w/e 04/10/1952 6K 4w/e 17/07/1954 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam 27 0-6-0 52162 8w/e 14/06/1952 6H Bangor 4w/e 18/04/1953 6K m/e 04/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40126 8w/e 29/11/1952 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 8w/e 11/07/1953 6K 4w/e 28/11/1953 2C Warwick
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44367 01/01/1948 6B Mold Junction 8w/e 11/07/1953 6K w/e 06/10/1962 12E Barrow in Furness
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41285 4w/e 31/12/1950 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 8w/e 11/07/1953 6K 4w/e 03/10/1953 2C Warwick
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41324 4w/e 09/08/1952 6H Bangor 8w/e 11/07/1953 6K 4w/e 27/03/1954 6H Bangor
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46425 04/12/1948 3A Bescot (New) 8w/e 11/07/1953 6K 4w/e 08/08/1953 3A Bescot
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46434 4w/e 07/10/1950 8D Widnes 8w/e 11/07/1953 6K 4w/e 31/10/1953 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46424 4w/e 21/03/1953 1A Willesden 4w/e 08/08/1953 6K 4w/e 03/10/1953 8D Widnes
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41287 4w/e 06/10/1951 7B Bangor 4w/e 27/03/1954 6K 4w/e 09/10/1954 10C Patricroft
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40118 4w/e 04/10/1952 8E Brunswick 8w/e 19/06/1954 6K 4w/e 09/10/1954 3E Monument Lane
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46422 4w/e 27/03/1954 8D Widnes 8w/e 19/06/1954 6K 4w/e 09/10/1954 8D Widnes
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46428 4w/e 19/04/1952 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 8w/e 19/06/1954 6K 4w/e 09/10/1954 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78032       09/1954 (New) 6K 4w/e 19/05/1956 8D Widnes
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78033       09/1954 (New) 6K 4w/e 26/02/1955 5A Crewe North
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78034       10/1954 (New) 6K 4w/e 19/05/1956 8D Widnes
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78035       06/11/1954 (New) 6K 4w/e 19/05/1956 8D Widnes
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47350 8w/e 19/06/1954 12D Workington 4w/e 06/11/1954 6K w/e 09/02/1963 6B Mold Junction
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78039       27/11/1954 (New) 6K 4w/e 19/05/1956 8D Widnes
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41233       4w/e 26/02/1955 6K 8w/e 16/07/1955 6H Bangor
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78033 4w/e 26/02/1955 5A Crewe North 4w/e 26/03/1955 6K 4w/e 19/05/1956 8D Widnes
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40084 4w/e 30/01/1954 3B Bushbury 4w/e 21/05/1955 6K 4w/e 08/10/1955 9A Longsight
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40101 01/01/1948 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 21/05/1955 6K 4w/e 08/10/1955 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40001 4w/e 05/09/1953 1A Willesden 4w/e 21/05/1955 6K 4w/e 08/10/1955 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41321 4w/e 26/02/1955 6H Bangor 8w/e 16/07/1955 6K 4w/e 05/11/1955 6D Chester Northgate
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41216 4w/e 03/10/1953 6D Chester Northgate 4w/e 05/11/1955 6K w/e 30/09/1961 91W To Western Region / GWR
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46423 8w/e 11/07/1953 8D Widnes 4w/e 19/05/1956 6K 4w/e 22/03/1958 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46426 04/12/1948 3A Bescot (New) 4w/e 19/05/1956 6K 4w/e 06/10/1956 11E Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46432 4w/e 12/07/1952 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 19/05/1956 6K 4w/e 26/01/1957 12C Workington
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46433       4w/e 19/05/1956 6K 8w/e 05/10/1957 5D Stoke
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46445       4w/e 19/05/1956 6K 4w/e 30/11/1957 5D Stoke
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40589 4w/e 08/10/1955 6A Chester (MR) m/e 16/06/1956 6K m/e 11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40420 8w/e 19/06/1954 10B Preston 4w/e 03/11/1956 6K 4w/e 28/12/1957 14B Kentish Town
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78057 09/1956 6D Chester Northgate (New) 4w/e 26/01/1957 6K 4w/e 10/08/1957 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40060 4w/e 01/12/1956 2A Rugby 4w/e 23/03/1957 6K 4w/e 10/08/1957 1A Willesden
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43378 01/01/1948 16A Nottingham 4w/e 18/05/1957 6K 19/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75033 4w/e 06/10/1956 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 10/08/1957 6K 8w/e 05/10/1957 6A Chester (MR)
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75034 4w/e 11/08/1956 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 10/08/1957 6K 8w/e 05/10/1957 6H Bangor
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44348 5w/e 24/12/1949 1D   4w/e 10/08/1957 6K 8w/e 05/10/1957 1C Watford
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58287 4w/e 24/02/1951 11B Barrow in Furness 4w/e 30/11/1957 6K w/e 16/01/1960 11A Barrow in Furness
Steam 27 0-6-0 52119 01/01/1948 4A Shrewsbury 4w/e 30/11/1957 6K w/e 13/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46433 8w/e 05/10/1957 5D Stoke 4w/e 30/11/1957 6K 4w/e 14/06/1958 12C Carlisle Canal
Steam 1142 0-6-0 58171 4w/e 18/05/1957 11B Barrow in Furness 4w/e 28/12/1957 6K 4w/e 17/05/1958 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46445 4w/e 30/11/1957 5D Stoke 4w/e 28/12/1957 6K w/e 20/06/1959 2A Rugby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43981 4w/e 04/12/1954 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 25/01/1958 6K w/e 06/10/1962 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78038 4w/e 06/10/1956 6D Chester Northgate 4w/e 22/03/1958 6K w/e 28/11/1959 8E Northwich
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43618 4w/e 30/11/1957 11B Barrow in Furness 4w/e 19/04/1958 6K w/e 24/03/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58293 4w/e 30/11/1957 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 17/05/1958 6K w/e 05/12/1959 11A Barrow in Furness
Steam 27 0-6-0 52432 4w/e 08/08/1953 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 17/05/1958 6K m/e 11/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75053 01/1957 6A Chester (MR) (New) 4w/e 14/06/1958 6K 4w/e 04/10/1958 6A Chester (MR)
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75054 01/1957 6A Chester (MR) (New) 4w/e 14/06/1958 6K 4w/e 04/10/1958 6A Chester (MR)
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75051 11/1956 6A Chester (MR) (New) 4w/e 12/07/1958 6K 4w/e 04/10/1958 6A Chester (MR)
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78056 08/1956 6D Chester Northgate (New) w/e 11/04/1959 6K w/e 28/04/1962 5D Stoke
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75028 4w/e 06/09/1958 6E Chester West w/e 20/06/1959 6K w/e 12/09/1959 6E Chester West
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75033 8w/e 05/10/1957 6A Chester (MR) w/e 20/06/1959 6K w/e 12/09/1959 6E Chester West
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78031 4w/e 06/10/1956 6D Chester Northgate w/e 20/06/1959 6K w/e 07/04/1962 5B Crewe South
Steam 27 0-6-0 52438 01/01/1948 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) w/e 05/09/1959 6K w/e 14/04/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78055 w/e 20/06/1959 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 07/11/1959 6K w/e 17/09/1960 8E Northwich
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75053 4w/e 04/10/1958 6A Chester (MR) w/e 18/06/1960 6K w/e 17/09/1960 6B Mold Junction
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75054 4w/e 04/10/1958 6A Chester (MR) w/e 18/06/1960 6K w/e 17/09/1960 6B Mold Junction
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75028 w/e 11/06/1960 6B Mold Junction w/e 10/06/1961 6K w/e 09/09/1961 6B Mold Junction
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75031 w/e 09/04/1960 6B Mold Junction w/e 10/06/1961 6K w/e 09/09/1961 1A Willesden
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75034 4w/e 04/10/1958 6A Chester (MR) w/e 10/06/1961 6K w/e 09/09/1961 6B Mold Junction
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78017 w/e 30/04/1960 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 10/06/1961 6K w/e 04/11/1961 8D Widnes
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41226 w/e 10/10/1959 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 09/09/1961 6K w/e 16/09/1961 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84003 4w/e 11/08/1956 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 16/09/1961 6K w/e 09/02/1963 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78017 w/e 04/11/1961 8D Widnes w/e 10/03/1962 6K w/e 28/04/1962 5D Stoke
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47507 01/01/1948 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 28/04/1962 6K w/e 09/02/1963 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75033 w/e 11/06/1960 6B Mold Junction w/e 05/05/1962 6K w/e 22/09/1962 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75034 w/e 09/09/1961 6B Mold Junction w/e 05/05/1962 6K w/e 15/09/1962 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47669 w/e 10/02/1962 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 05/05/1962 6K w/e 09/02/1963 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75035 4w/e 04/10/1958 6A Chester (MR) w/e 23/06/1962 6K w/e 15/09/1962 6G Llandudno Junction