Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 98 Today
» 1103 Yesterday
» 5735 Week
» 18839 Month
» 18839 Year
» 1240404 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Rhymney


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Rhymney Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5640       4w/e 03/11/1945 108 4w/e 01/12/1945 58 Cardiff Cathays
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6660       4w/e 03/11/1945 108 4w/e 01/12/1945 58 Cardiff Cathays
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5605       4w/e 31/12/1949 RHY 4w/e 28/01/1961 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5601 4w/e 02/11/1957 88E Abercynon w/e 08/11/1964 88D m/e 01/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5605 7w/e 22/06/1964 88E Abercynon w/e 08/11/1964 88D w/e 01/05/1965 2A Tyseley
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5677 4w/e 15/12/1962 88D Merthyr Tydfil w/e 08/11/1964 88D w/e 01/05/1965 6C Croes Newydd
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5686       w/e 08/11/1964 88D m/e 03/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5688 4w/e 04/05/1963 88E Abercynon w/e 08/11/1964 88D m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6649 6w/e 12/10/1964 88E Abercynon w/e 08/11/1964 88D m/e 02/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6658 4w/e 06/10/1962 88D Merthyr Tydfil w/e 15/11/1964 88D 4w/e 27/12/1964 86G Pontypool Road