Depot: Royston
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Royston | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4003 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 20C | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | Royston | ||||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 22951 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 20D | Normanton | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 20C | on | 14/07/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 2988 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 20D | Normanton | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 20C | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2895 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 20C | on | 01/01/1948 | 20H | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1368 | m/e | 09/1933 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 11/1945 | 20C | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 20G | Hellifield |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1395 | m/e | 09/1933 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 11/1945 | 20C | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1428 | m/e | 09/1933 | M1 | Derby | m/e | 11/1945 | 20C | 4w/e | 28/12/1946 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3942 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | on | 28/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4003 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 20C | Royston | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 55B | Stourton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8062 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8078 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 20C | Royston |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8079 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8080 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 20B | Stourton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8085 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8095 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 18C | Hasland | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8103 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8113 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | on | 02/10/1967 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8161 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 20H | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8162 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 56F | Low Moor | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8169 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 56D | Mirfield | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8376 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 20B | Stourton | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8377 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 18A | Toton | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8412 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 18A | Toton | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8419 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 18A | Toton | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8431 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8439 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | on | 04/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8443 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 20B | Stourton | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8532 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 8A | Edge Hill | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8540 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | on | 04/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8542 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 55C | Farnley Junction | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8545 | m/e | 02/1945 | STM | St Margarets | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8546 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8547 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 20B | Stourton | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8700 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | w/e | 05/03/1949 | 21A | Saltley | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3789 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 17B | Burton | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3233 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | m/e | 11/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3250 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 17C | Rowsley | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3332 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3446 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | on | 17/04/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3509 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 20E | Manningham | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3553 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 20E | Manningham | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4141 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | on | 03/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4161 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 18A | Toton | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4446 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | on | 11/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12108 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12252 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 24F | Fleetwood | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 25C | Goole |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12258 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 27B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12559 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 20E | Manningham | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7421 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7448 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7462 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 50D | Starbeck | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7581 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7634 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 50D | Starbeck | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 169 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 181 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | w/e | 17/02/1962 | 55E | Normanton | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 362 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 444 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 480 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | w/e | 06/02/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 514 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | w/e | 22/04/1950 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 74 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 20C | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 20E | Manningham |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12559 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 20E | Manningham | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 20C | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8321 | on | 01/01/1948 | 28B | Dalry Road | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 20C | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43765 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16D | Mansfield | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 20C | on | 19/05/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52095 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | Normanton | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 20C | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48078 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | Royston | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 20C | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 1P | 0-4-4T | 1429 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 17B | Burton | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 20C | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 23A | Skipton |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40147 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 20C | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 20D | Normanton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8157 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 20C | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48703 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 20C | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48093 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 20C | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48337 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 20C | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58188 | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 20C | on | 25/04/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40521 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 22/04/1950 | 20C | w/e | 24/03/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41273 | m/e | 09/1950 (New) | 20C | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 20F | Skipton | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41274 | m/e | 09/1950 (New) | 20C | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 56F | Low Moor | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44290 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 19C | Canklow | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 20C | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 20C | Royston |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44290 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 20C | Royston | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 20C | on | 11/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48080 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 20B | Stourton | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 20C | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 20C | Royston |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44241 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 19C | Canklow | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 20C | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 20C | Royston |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48080 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 20C | Royston | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 20C | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44241 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 20C | Royston | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 20C | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 20B | Stourton |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58154 | w/e | 01/04/1950 | 20E | Manningham | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 20C | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 20C | Royston |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58154 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 20C | Royston | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 20C | on | 16/06/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40514 | w/e | 22/04/1950 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 20C | w/e | 26/01/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44501 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 20C | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 20C | Royston |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44501 | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 20C | Royston | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 20C | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 1P | 0-4-4T | 58060 | w/e | 18/09/1948 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 20C | m/e | 07/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 58060 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 20C | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48053 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 20C | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 20C | Royston |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48053 | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 20C | Royston | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 20C | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 15A | Wellingborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63772 | w/e | 19/05/1951 | 53E | Cudworth | on | 12/08/1951 | 20C | on | 02/09/1951 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63751 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | CUD | Cudworth | on | 12/08/1951 | 20C | on | 02/09/1951 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63754 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 53E | Cudworth | on | 12/08/1951 | 20C | on | 02/09/1951 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63845 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 53E | Cudworth | on | 12/08/1951 | 20C | on | 02/09/1951 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63849 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | CUD | Cudworth | on | 12/08/1951 | 20C | on | 02/09/1951 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63857 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 53E | Cudworth | on | 12/08/1951 | 20C | on | 02/09/1951 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40139 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 20C | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 20C | Royston |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40140 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 20C | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 20C | Royston |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48436 | w/e | 08/07/1950 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 20C | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 20C | Royston |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48466 | w/e | 08/07/1950 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 20C | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 20C | Royston |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48469 | w/e | 08/07/1950 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 20C | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 20C | Royston |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48473 | w/e | 22/04/1950 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 20C | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 20C | Royston |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48664 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 20C | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 20C | Royston |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48689 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 20C | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 20C | Royston |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48710 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 20C | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 20C | Royston |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40139 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 20C | Royston | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 20C | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 20E | Manningham |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40140 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 20C | Royston | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 20C | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48436 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 20C | Royston | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 20C | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48466 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 20C | Royston | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 20C | on | 08/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48469 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 20C | Royston | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 20C | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48473 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 20C | Royston | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 20C | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 55B | Stourton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48664 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 20C | Royston | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 20C | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 55C | Farnley Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48689 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 20C | Royston | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 20C | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 55C | Farnley Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48710 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 20C | Royston | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 20C | on | 17/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43686 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 20C | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 20E | Manningham |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44475 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 20C | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40147 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 20C | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 20D | Normanton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48459 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 6B | Mold Junction | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 20C | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 20C | Royston |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43906 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19C | Canklow | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 20C | on | 11/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48459 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 20C | Royston | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 20C | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47438 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16A | Nottingham | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 20C | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 50D | Starbeck |
Steam | 1P | 0-4-4T | 58040 | w/e | 23/09/1950 | 23A | Skipton | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 20C | w/e | 19/03/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 58040 | w/e | 23/09/1950 | 23A | Skipton | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 20C | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 15D | Bedford |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48608 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 20G | Hellifield | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 20C | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43267 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20B | Stourton | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 20C | on | 22/04/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43476 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20B | Stourton | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 20C | on | 18/05/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43705 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20B | Stourton | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 20C | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58212 | w/e | 22/04/1950 | 20B | Stourton | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 20C | w/e | 24/03/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40082 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 20C | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43321 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 20D | Normanton | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 20C | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 20D | Normanton |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84009 | on | 03/09/1953 (New) | 20C | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 20F | Skipton | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43914 | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 20C | on | 08/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44550 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 20C | on | 02/03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48146 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | Normanton | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 20C | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 55B | Stourton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48670 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | Normanton | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 20C | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 55B | Stourton |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58135 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 16A | Nottingham | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 20C | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 58066 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 20F | Skipton | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 20C | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40082 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 20C | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48070 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 20C | on | 04/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48750 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 20C | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 14A | Cricklewood East |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50646 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 20C | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 15D | Bedford |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44107 | on | 01/01/1948 | 18C | Hasland | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 20C | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 55B | Stourton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44274 | on | 01/01/1948 | 18C | Hasland | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 20C | w/e | 09/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50650 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 20C | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 15A | Wellingborough |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84009 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 20F | Skipton | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 20C | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43983 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 16A | Nottingham | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 20C | on | 09/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44408 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 16A | Nottingham | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 20C | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 20D | Normanton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48222 | on | 01/01/1948 | 15A | Wellingborough | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 20C | on | 04/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48265 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 15A | Wellingborough | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 20C | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48281 | on | 01/01/1948 | 15A | Wellingborough | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 20C | on | 06/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44582 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 20C | w/e | 18/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41281 | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 20C | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41282 | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 20C | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40520 | w/e | 15/02/1947 | 17D | Rowsley | w/e | 07/04/1956 | 20C | on | 18/10/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58216 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 20C | on | 16/05/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58191 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 55D | m/e | 10/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58197 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 33A | Plaistow | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 55D | on | 09/11/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3458 | on | 12/06/1957 (New) | 55D | w/e | 02/10/1971 | 55C | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3375 | on | 22/08/1957 (New) | 55D | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3376 | on | 23/08/1957 (New) | 55D | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3377 | on | 30/08/1957 (New) | 55D | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 55C | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3378 | on | 30/08/1957 (New) | 55D | w/e | 02/10/1971 | 55C | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3379 | on | 05/09/1957 (New) | 55D | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 56A | Knottingley | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3380 | on | 06/09/1957 (New) | 55D | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 55E | Normanton | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48123 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 55D | on | 12/03/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48130 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 55D | w/e | 24/01/1959 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40581 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 25G | Farnley Junction | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 55D | on | 04/10/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2262 | on | 21/11/1957 (New) | 55D | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2263 | on | 21/11/1957 (New) | 55D | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2266 | on | 09/01/1958 (New) | 55D | 4w/e | 12/08/1967 | 56A | Knottingley | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2267 | on | 20/01/1958 (New) | 55D | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2268 | on | 13/02/1958 (New) | 55D | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 55D | Royston | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2269 | on | 13/02/1958 (New) | 55D | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 55D | Royston | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2268 | on | 13/02/1958 | 55D | Royston (New) | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 55D | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2269 | on | 13/02/1958 | 55D | Royston (New) | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 55D | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48130 | w/e | 24/01/1959 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 55D | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 55B | Stourton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48162 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 55B | Stourton | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 55D | on | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48537 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 20B | Stourton | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 55D | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 55B | Stourton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90611 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 55D | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90488 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 55D | on | 07/12/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90661 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51G | Haverton Hill | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 55D | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90336 | 2w/e | 14/01/1950 | 25G | Farnley Junction | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 55D | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90243 | w/e | 25/04/1959 | 55C | Farnley Junction | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 55D | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40148 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 55D | on | 25/08/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90605 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 55D | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90664 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 56D | Mirfield | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 55D | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48093 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 56D | Mirfield | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 55D | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 55B | Stourton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48169 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 56D | Mirfield | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 55D | on | 04/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42408 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 55D | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 55C | Farnley Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90395 | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 55D | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 55E | Normanton | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90511 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 55D | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43681 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20B | Stourton | w/e | 13/02/1960 | 55D | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 55F | Manningham |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43737 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20B | Stourton | w/e | 13/02/1960 | 55D | on | 18/02/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3937 | on | 04/03/1960 (New) | 55D | w/e | 02/10/1971 | 55B | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3941 | on | 19/03/1960 (New) | 55D | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90650 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 25G | Farnley Junction | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 55D | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90610 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 55E | Normanton | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 55D | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40193 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 55D | on | 25/08/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44087 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 55D | on | 27/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48067 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 55D | on | 18/10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48159 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 55D | w/e | 27/03/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48443 | w/e | 24/01/1959 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 55D | m/e | 11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90127 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 25G | Farnley Junction | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 55D | on | 26/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90407 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 55D | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 56A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90684 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 55D | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 56A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44098 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | Normanton | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 55D | on | 05/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44099 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | Normanton | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 55D | on | 15/02/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90591 | w/e | 18/02/1961 | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 55D | on | 12/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42762 | w/e | 27/01/1962 | 55E | Normanton | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 55D | on | 23/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42770 | w/e | 27/01/1962 | 55E | Normanton | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 55D | on | 23/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42795 | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 55E | Normanton | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 55D | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 67B | Hurlford |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48076 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 56D | Mirfield | w/e | 25/08/1962 | 55D | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 55C | Farnley Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90254 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 55E | Normanton | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 55D | w/e | 13/07/1963 | 55C | Farnley Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73166 | w/e | 14/04/1962 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 55D | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26F | Patricroft |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73170 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 55D | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73171 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 55D | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90377 | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 55D | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48075 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 55B | Stourton | w/e | 13/07/1963 | 55D | on | 24/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48080 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 55B | Stourton | w/e | 13/07/1963 | 55D | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 55C | Farnley Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48352 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 55B | Stourton | w/e | 13/07/1963 | 55D | on | 04/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90345 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 91M | To London Midland Region | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 55D | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44912 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 56F | Low Moor | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 55D | 4w/e | 18/06/1966 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45207 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 56F | Low Moor | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 55D | on | 11/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45219 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 56F | Low Moor | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 55D | 4w/e | 18/06/1966 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90254 | w/e | 13/07/1963 | 55C | Farnley Junction | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 55D | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90645 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 55D | on | 21/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90503 | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 55C | Farnley Junction | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 55D | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90699 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 55D | w/e | 11/04/1964 | 55E | Normanton | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43968 | w/e | 13/04/1963 | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 55D | on | 11/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3381 | on | 12/09/1957 | 55E | Normanton (New) | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 55D | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48274 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 55B | Stourton | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 55D | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 55B | Stourton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3375 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 55D | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90377 | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 55E | Normanton | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 55D | on | 13/02/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90650 | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 55E | Normanton | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 55D | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44056 | w/e | 26/03/1949 | 25D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 55D | on | 11/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90318 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 55E | Normanton | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 55D | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90337 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 55E | Normanton | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 55D | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43076 | on | 04/10/1950 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates (New) | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 55D | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43077 | 4w/e | 14/08/1965 | 50D | Goole | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 55D | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 55F | Manningham |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43078 | on | 19/10/1950 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates (New) | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 55D | on | 05/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43079 | on | 20/10/1950 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates (New) | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 55D | m/e | 12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90481 | 4w/e | 06/11/1965 | 55E | Normanton | 4w/e | 18/06/1966 | 55D | on | 02/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90054 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 55D | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90615 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 55D | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55E | Normanton | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90642 | 4w/e | 11/09/1965 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 55D | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90721 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 55D | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48160 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 55B | Stourton | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 55D | on | 31/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48394 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 55B | Stourton | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 55D | on | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48537 | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 55B | Stourton | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 55D | on | 30/10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48721 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 20B | Stourton | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 55D | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48146 | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 55B | Stourton | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 55D | on | 06/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48473 | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 55B | Stourton | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 55D | on | 04/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48076 | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 55C | Farnley Junction | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 55D | on | 04/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48664 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 55C | Farnley Junction | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 55D | on | 04/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2246 | 4w/e | 10/09/1966 | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55D | 4w/e | 12/08/1967 | 56A | Knottingley |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2263 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55D | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48084 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 55B | Stourton | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55D | on | 04/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48093 | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 55B | Stourton | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55D | on | 04/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48126 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 20B | Stourton | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55D | on | 24/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48130 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 55B | Stourton | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55D | on | 05/02/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48622 | w/e | 25/09/1948 | 20B | Stourton | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55D | on | 04/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48703 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 20B | Stourton | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55D | on | 25/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90649 | on | 21/01/1967 | Withdrawn | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 (R) | 55D | |||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90680 | on | 21/01/1967 | Withdrawn | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 (R) | 55D | |||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90694 | on | 21/01/1967 | Withdrawn | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 (R) | 55D | |||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42689 | 4w/e | 14/08/1965 | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55D | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42141 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55D | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 56F | Low Moor |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12113 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 55E | Normanton | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 55D | on | 14/03/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2271 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 55D | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 55F | Bradford Hammerton Street |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2272 | on | 28/03/1958 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) (New) | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 55D | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 55F | Bradford Hammerton Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48055 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 55D | on | 04/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48276 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 55D | on | 04/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48454 | on | 05/07/1967 | Withdrawn | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 (R) | 55D | |||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3294 | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 55D | w/e | 13/03/1971 | 55F | Bradford Hammerton Street |