Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 404 Today
» 962 Yesterday
» 1366 Week
» 18166 Month
» 334397 Year
» 845499 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Saltley


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Saltley Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1266 m/e 12/1880 20 Buxton (MR) m/e 04/1892 3 m/e 01/1899 29 Manningham
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1267 m/e 12/1880 25 Sheffield Grimesthorpe m/e 04/1892 3 m/e 01/1899 13 Wellingborough
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1268 m/e 12/1880 25 Sheffield Grimesthorpe m/e 04/1892 3 m/e 01/1899 13 Wellingborough
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1269 m/e 12/1880 25 Sheffield Grimesthorpe m/e 04/1892 3 m/e 01/1899 3W Walsall Pleck
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1270 m/e 12/1880 3W Walsall Pleck m/e 04/1892 3 m/e 01/1899 3W Walsall Pleck
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1271 m/e 12/1880 3W Walsall Pleck m/e 04/1892 3 m/e 01/1899 3W Walsall Pleck
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1272 m/e 12/1880 3W Walsall Pleck m/e 04/1892 3 m/e 01/1899 3B Bournville
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1273 m/e 12/1880 3W Walsall Pleck m/e 04/1892 3 m/e 01/1899 3W Walsall Pleck
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1274 m/e 12/1880 8 Bristol Barrow Road m/e 04/1892 3 m/e 01/1899 3W Walsall Pleck
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1280 m/e 12/1880 3W Walsall Pleck m/e 04/1892 3 m/e 01/1899 3B Bournville
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1281 m/e 12/1880 3W Walsall Pleck m/e 04/1892 3 m/e 01/1899 3B Bournville
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1275 m/e 12/1880 8 Bristol Barrow Road m/e 04/1892 3 m/e 01/1899 3W Walsall Pleck
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1276 m/e 12/1880 8 Bristol Barrow Road m/e 04/1892 3 m/e 01/1899 3W Walsall Pleck
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1277 m/e 12/1880 8 Bristol Barrow Road m/e 04/1892 3 m/e 01/1899 3W Walsall Pleck
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1278 m/e 12/1880 8 Bristol Barrow Road m/e 04/1892 3 m/e 01/1899 3W Walsall Pleck
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1279 m/e 12/1880 8B Bath Green Park (S&D) m/e 04/1892 3 m/e 01/1899 3B Bournville
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1730 m/e 03/1886 8 Bristol Barrow Road (New) m/e 04/1892 3 m/e 01/1899 3B Bournville
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1733 m/e 04/1886 MR3B (New) m/e 04/1892 3 m/e 01/1899 3B Bournville
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 2255       m/e 02/1895 (New) 3 m/e 01/1899 3 Saltley
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 2237       m/e 02/1895 (New) 3 m/e 01/1899 8 Bristol Barrow Road
Steam 6 0-4-4T 147   04/1892 16 Kentish Town   01/1899 3   12/1902 3 Saltley
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 2255 m/e 02/1895 3 Saltley (New) m/e 01/1899 3 m/e 12/1902 3 Saltley
Steam 6 0-4-4T 147   01/1899 3 Saltley   12/1902 3   05/1908 3 Saltley
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 2255 m/e 01/1899 3 Saltley m/e 12/1902 3 m/e 05/1908 3 Saltley
Steam 6 0-4-4T 1235   12/1902 3 Saltley   05/1908 3   04/1914 18 Nottingham
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1243 m/e 12/1902 3W Walsall Pleck m/e 05/1908 3 m/e 04/1914 18 Nottingham
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1244 m/e 12/1902 3W Walsall Pleck m/e 05/1908 3 m/e 04/1914 28 Holbeck (MR)
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1245 m/e 12/1902 3W Walsall Pleck m/e 05/1908 3 m/e 04/1914 28 Holbeck (MR)
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1246 m/e 12/1902 3B Bournville m/e 05/1908 3 m/e 04/1914 18 Nottingham
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1247 m/e 12/1902 3W Walsall Pleck m/e 05/1908 3 m/e 04/1914 3 Saltley
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1248 m/e 12/1902 3W Walsall Pleck m/e 05/1908 3 m/e 04/1914 3 Saltley
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1254 m/e 12/1902 3B Bournville m/e 05/1908 3 m/e 04/1914 15 Cricklewood East
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1255 m/e 12/1902 3B Bournville m/e 05/1908 3 m/e 04/1914 25 Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1249 m/e 12/1902 3W Walsall Pleck m/e 05/1908 3 m/e 04/1914 3 Saltley
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1250 m/e 12/1902 3W Walsall Pleck m/e 05/1908 3 m/e 04/1914 25 Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1251 m/e 12/1902 3W Walsall Pleck m/e 05/1908 3 m/e 04/1914 3 Saltley
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1252 m/e 12/1902 3W Walsall Pleck m/e 05/1908 3 m/e 04/1914 14 Bedford
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1253 m/e 12/1902 3B Bournville m/e 05/1908 3 m/e 04/1914 3 Saltley
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1322 m/e 12/1902 3B Bournville m/e 05/1908 3 m/e 04/1914 3 Saltley
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1323 m/e 12/1902 3B Bournville m/e 05/1908 3 m/e 04/1914 3 Saltley
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1324 m/e 12/1902 3B Bournville m/e 05/1908 3 m/e 04/1914 3 Saltley
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1325 m/e 12/1902 3B Bournville m/e 05/1908 3 m/e 04/1914 18 Nottingham
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1326 m/e 12/1902 3B Bournville m/e 05/1908 3 m/e 04/1914 23 Hasland
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1327 m/e 12/1902 3R Redditch m/e 05/1908 3 m/e 04/1914 3 Saltley
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1328 m/e 12/1902 3W Walsall Pleck m/e 05/1908 3 m/e 04/1914 3 Saltley
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1386 m/e 12/1902 3 Saltley m/e 05/1908 3 m/e 04/1914 3 Saltley
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1387 m/e 02/1895 5 Brecon (New) m/e 05/1908 3 m/e 04/1914 3 Saltley
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1247 m/e 05/1908 3 Saltley m/e 04/1914 3 m/e 12/1921 3 Saltley
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1248 m/e 05/1908 3 Saltley m/e 04/1914 3 m/e 12/1921 2 Burton
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1249 m/e 05/1908 3 Saltley m/e 04/1914 3 m/e 12/1921 2 Burton
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1251 m/e 05/1908 3 Saltley m/e 04/1914 3 m/e 12/1921 4 Worcester (MR)
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1253 m/e 05/1908 3 Saltley m/e 04/1914 3 m/e 12/1921 3 Saltley
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1322 m/e 05/1908 3 Saltley m/e 04/1914 3 m/e 12/1921 4 Worcester (MR)
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1323 m/e 05/1908 3 Saltley m/e 04/1914 3 m/e 12/1921 3 Saltley
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1324 m/e 05/1908 3 Saltley m/e 04/1914 3 m/e 12/1921 3 Saltley
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1327 m/e 05/1908 3 Saltley m/e 04/1914 3 m/e 12/1921 3 Saltley
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1328 m/e 05/1908 3 Saltley m/e 04/1914 3 m/e 12/1921 3 Saltley
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1386 m/e 05/1908 3 Saltley m/e 04/1914 3 m/e 12/1921 3 Saltley
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1387 m/e 05/1908 3 Saltley m/e 04/1914 3 m/e 12/1921 3 Saltley
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1391 m/e 05/1908 25 Sheffield Grimesthorpe m/e 04/1914 3 m/e 12/1921 3 Saltley
Steam 6 0-4-4T 1226   04/1914 4 Worcester (MR)   12/1921 3   03/1930 32 Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1247 m/e 04/1914 3 Saltley m/e 12/1921 3 m/e 03/1930 20 Buxton (MR)
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1253 m/e 04/1914 3 Saltley m/e 12/1921 3 m/e 03/1930 WD LNWR Western Division
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1323 m/e 04/1914 3 Saltley m/e 12/1921 3 4w/e 12/07/1925 Withdrawn
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1324 m/e 04/1914 3 Saltley m/e 12/1921 3 m/e 03/1930 7 Gloucester Barnwood
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1327 m/e 04/1914 3 Saltley m/e 12/1921 3 m/e 03/1930 20 Buxton (MR)
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1328 m/e 04/1914 3 Saltley m/e 12/1921 3 m/e 03/1930 8 Bristol Barrow Road
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1335 m/e 04/1914 8 Bristol Barrow Road m/e 12/1921 3 4w/e 12/07/1925 Withdrawn
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1386 m/e 04/1914 3 Saltley m/e 12/1921 3 m/e 03/1930 7 Gloucester Barnwood
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1387 m/e 04/1914 3 Saltley m/e 12/1921 3 m/e 03/1930 8 Bristol Barrow Road
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1391 m/e 04/1914 3 Saltley m/e 12/1921 3 m/e 03/1930 8 Bristol Barrow Road
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1348 m/e 03/1930 M18 Nottingham m/e 09/1933 3 m/e 11/1945 22C Bath Green Park (S&D)
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1361 m/e 03/1930 7 Gloucester Barnwood m/e 09/1933 3 m/e 11/1945 17A Derby
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1338 m/e 09/1933 8 Bristol Barrow Road m/e 11/1945 21A 4w/e 05/10/1947 Withdrawn
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1367 m/e 09/1933 M10 Leicester Midland m/e 11/1945 21A 5w/e 21/01/1956 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1411 m/e 09/1933 30 Skipton m/e 11/1945 21A 4w/e 28/11/1953 19B Sheffield Millhouses
Diesel 11 0-6-0 7126       01/01/1948 21A w/e 01/10/1966 99C Crewe Works
Diesel 11 0-6-0 7127       01/01/1948 21A w/e 01/10/1966 5A Crewe Diesel
Diesel 11 0-6-0 7128       01/01/1948 21A 19/10/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 7129       01/01/1948 21A 19/10/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2754       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 19/05/1951 17B Burton
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2758       01/01/1948 21A w/e 17/06/1961 9G Gorton
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2764       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 08/09/1956 15B Kettering
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2784       01/01/1948 21A 5w/e 24/12/1949 20G Hellifield
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2790       01/01/1948 21A 8w/e 11/07/1953 15B Kettering
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2793       01/01/1948 21A w/e 29/12/1962 9G Gorton
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2799       01/01/1948 21A w/e 30/05/1959 9G Gorton
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2818       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 11/09/1954 17B Burton
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2822       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 11/09/1954 17B Burton
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2824       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 21/02/1953 21B Bournville
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2825       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 21/02/1953 21B Bournville
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2826       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 17/07/1954 15B Kettering
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2827       01/01/1948 21A w/e 20/06/1964 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2829       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 11/09/1954 17B Burton
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2850       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 26/09/1959 66A Polmadie
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2857       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 06/09/1952 15B Kettering
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2890       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 19/05/1951 17B Burton
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2900       01/01/1948 21A 8w/e 16/07/1955 15B Kettering
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2903       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 14/08/1954 15B Kettering
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 97       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 31/12/1951 86K Abergavenny
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 115 4w/e 22/06/1946 14B Kentish Town 01/01/1948 21A w/e 28/03/1959 16C Mansfield
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 117       01/01/1948 21A w/e 31/01/1959 56A Wakefield
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 175       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 03/10/1953 16D Mansfield
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7273       01/01/1948 21A 5w/e 24/12/1949 15A Wellingborough
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7276       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 31/12/1950 21C Bromsgrove
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7638       01/01/1948 21A w/e 10/01/1959 16D Annesley
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7639       01/01/1948 21A 5w/e 24/12/1949 20H Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3843       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 04/12/1954 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3845       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 11/08/1956 18A Toton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3858       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 02/01/1954 17B Burton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3879       01/01/1948 21A 8w/e 19/06/1954 17A Derby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3891       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 31/10/1953 18C Hasland
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3911       01/01/1948 21A w/e 19/11/1960 17B Burton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3912       01/01/1948 21A 16/02/1957 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3940       01/01/1948 21A w/e 17/03/1962 18C Hasland
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3941       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 11/08/1956 18A Toton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3946       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 11/08/1956 18A Toton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3949       01/01/1948 21A w/e 22/08/1964 5D Stoke
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3951       01/01/1948 21A w/e 12/01/1963 16A Nottingham
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3986       01/01/1948 21A w/e 12/11/1960 15D Coalville
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4026       01/01/1948 21A w/e 19/11/1960 17B Burton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4049       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 04/12/1954 17A Derby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4084       01/01/1948 21A m/e 12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4088       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 31/10/1953 18A Toton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4092       01/01/1948 21A w/e 25/04/1964 9D Newton Heath
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4108       01/01/1948 21A m/e 12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4137       01/01/1948 21A w/e 12/09/1964 5D Stoke
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4139       01/01/1948 21A 5w/e 24/12/1949 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4145       01/01/1948 21A m/e 02/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4176       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 11/08/1956 17A Derby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4184       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 04/12/1954 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4185       01/01/1948 21A w/e 25/04/1964 9G Gorton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4186       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 21/02/1953 2E Northampton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4190       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 31/10/1953 18A Toton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4200       01/01/1948 21A w/e 02/11/1963 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4203       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 28/12/1957 21B Bournville
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4207       01/01/1948 21A w/e 24/01/1959 55B Stourton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4213       01/01/1948 21A w/e 10/02/1962 18A Toton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4224       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 04/12/1954 17A Derby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4248       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 28/12/1957 15A Wellingborough
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4304       01/01/1948 21A 5w/e 24/12/1949 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4317       01/01/1948 21A 8w/e 29/11/1952 22A Bristol Barrow Road
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4406       01/01/1948 21A m/e 03/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4413       01/01/1948 21A w/e 16/05/1959 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4427       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 13/08/1955 18A Toton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4475       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 29/12/1951 20C Royston
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4515       01/01/1948 21A m/e 03/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4516       01/01/1948 21A w/e 22/11/1958 21B Bournville
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4520       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 12/07/1952 21A Saltley
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4524       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 31/12/1950 21D Stratford upon Avon
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4525       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 26/01/1952 21D Stratford upon Avon
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4538       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 02/01/1954 17B Burton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4545       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 19/05/1951 17A Derby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4567       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 26/01/1952 21D Stratford upon Avon
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4571       01/01/1948 21A w/e 22/11/1958 21B Bournville
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4580       01/01/1948 21A m/e 11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4583       01/01/1948 21A 5w/e 24/12/1949 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4584       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 24/02/1951 20B Stourton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4591       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 02/01/1954 17B Burton
Steam Compound 4-4-0 928       01/01/1948 21A 2w/e 17/06/1950 21A Saltley
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1046       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 11/08/1951 21B Bournville
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2326       01/01/1948 21A 8w/e 05/10/1957 17A Derby
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2337       01/01/1948 21A w/e 20/08/1960 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1029       01/01/1948 21A 05/06/1948 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1035       01/01/1948 21A 3w/e 11/12/1948 15D Bedford
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 1699       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 31/03/1951 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 1777       01/01/1948 21A 5w/e 24/12/1949 21A Saltley
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 1856       01/01/1948 21A m/e 06/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 1879       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 26/03/1955 22A Bristol Barrow Road
Steam 2P 4-4-0 385       01/01/1948 21A m/e 08/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 463       01/01/1948 21A 5w/e 16/07/1949 21B Bournville
Steam 2P 4-4-0 486       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 12/07/1952 22A Bristol Barrow Road
Steam 2P 4-4-0 493       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 23/02/1952 16A Nottingham
Steam 2P 4-4-0 511       01/01/1948 21A w/e 23/04/1960 18A Toton
Steam 2P 4-4-0 512       01/01/1948 21A m/e 01/1950 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8010       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 19/05/1956 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8093 4w/e 22/06/1946 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 01/01/1948 21A w/e 27/06/1959 56D Mirfield
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8336 4w/e 22/06/1946 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 01/01/1948 21A w/e 13/10/1962 15B Kettering
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8337 4w/e 22/06/1946 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 09/09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8351       01/01/1948 21A w/e 11/03/1967 5B Crewe South
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8389       01/01/1948 21A w/e 26/11/1960 9D Buxton (LNWR)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8400       01/01/1948 21A 8w/e 20/04/1957 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8401       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 31/12/1950 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8402       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 06/10/1951 19C Canklow
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8403       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 06/10/1956 17A Derby
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8405       01/01/1948 21A w/e 09/04/1960 16B Kirkby in Ashfield
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8417       01/01/1948 21A m/e 16/06/1956 86G Pontypool Road
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8420       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 21/02/1953 21B Bournville
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8424       01/01/1948 21A m/e 16/06/1956 86G Pontypool Road
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8669       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 21/02/1953 21B Bournville
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8687       01/01/1948 21A w/e 19/11/1960 15D Coalville
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3812       01/01/1948 21A 17/06/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 4-4-0 715       01/01/1948 21A 17/01/1948 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 4-4-0 745       01/01/1948 21A m/e 03/1950 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3201       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 26/05/1953 71J Highbridge
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3203       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 08/03/1958 41B Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3210       01/01/1948 21A 08/08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3223       01/01/1948 21A 13/06/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3225       01/01/1948 21A 8w/e 14/06/1952 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3284       01/01/1948 21A 03/06/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3321       01/01/1948 21A 2w/e 17/06/1950 21A Saltley
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3336       01/01/1948 21A 23/08/1952 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3339       01/01/1948 21A 22/08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3374       01/01/1948 21A w/e 28/03/1959 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3433       01/01/1948 21A 05/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3435       01/01/1948 21A w/e 11/04/1959 17A Derby
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3441       01/01/1948 21A 29/11/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3443       01/01/1948 21A 14/12/1957 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3484       01/01/1948 21A 30/07/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3490       01/01/1948 21A 19/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3491       01/01/1948 21A 3w/e 17/05/1952 84G Shrewsbury
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3531       01/01/1948 21A 8w/e 14/06/1952 15A Wellingborough
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3540       01/01/1948 21A 21/02/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3544       01/01/1948 21A 03/12/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3594       01/01/1948 21A 29/10/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3620       01/01/1948 21A w/e 07/04/1962 17A Derby
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3621       01/01/1948 21A 3w/e 17/05/1952 84G Shrewsbury
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3624       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 25/02/1956 15A Wellingborough
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3627       01/01/1948 21A 18/06/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3644       01/01/1948 21A 15/10/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3667       01/01/1948 21A 03/04/1954 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3673       01/01/1948 21A 26/08/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3674       01/01/1948 21A 22/08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3680       01/01/1948 21A w/e 04/08/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3684       01/01/1948 21A 25/05/1957 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3686       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 24/03/1951 20A Holbeck (MR)
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3690       01/01/1948 21A 24/08/1957 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3698       01/01/1948 21A 01/09/1956 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9377       01/01/1948 21A 2w/e 17/06/1950 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9360       01/01/1948 21A m/e 05/1949 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9329       01/01/1948 21A m/e 03/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2685       01/01/1948 21A 2w/e 17/06/1950 20E Manningham
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4805       01/01/1948 21A w/e 03/04/1965 2B Oxley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4806       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 29/12/1956 14B Kentish Town
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4810       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 30/11/1957 14B Kentish Town
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4811       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 26/03/1955 17B Burton
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4813       01/01/1948 21A w/e 18/04/1964 1F Rugby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4814       01/01/1948 21A 2w/e 17/06/1950 21A Saltley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4840       01/01/1948 21A 8w/e 14/06/1952 5B Crewe South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4842       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 04/10/1958 15E Leicester (G.C.)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4852       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 11/08/1951 21A Saltley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4919       01/01/1948 21A w/e 03/04/1965 2B Oxley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4920       01/01/1948 21A w/e 18/05/1963 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4966       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 01/12/1956 22A Bristol Barrow Road
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5186       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 28/11/1953 17A Derby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5265       01/01/1948 21A w/e 19/05/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5268       01/01/1948 21A w/e 18/04/1964 5D Stoke
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5269       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 21/02/1953 21B Bournville
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5273       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 06/11/1954 22A Bristol Barrow Road
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5274       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 11/08/1951 21A Saltley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5447       01/01/1948 21A 4w/e 16/05/1953 21A Saltley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8539 01/01/1948 18D Staveley (Barrow Hill) 3w/e 11/12/1948 21A w/e 07/12/1963 9D Newton Heath
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48612 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 3w/e 11/12/1948 21A w/e 27/06/1964 9D Newton Heath
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8741 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South 3w/e 11/12/1948 21A 8w/e 11/07/1953 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8743 01/01/1948 4A Shrewsbury 3w/e 11/12/1948 21A 4w/e 09/08/1952 5B Crewe South
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48748 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South 3w/e 11/12/1948 21A 4w/e 31/10/1953 16A Nottingham
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12061       30/11/1949 (New) 21A w/e 07/10/1967 8C Speke Junction
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 41777 01/01/1948 21A Saltley 5w/e 24/12/1949 21A m/e 03/1956 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12062       31/12/1949 (New) 21A w/e 03/10/1964 2A Tyseley
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3855 01/01/1948 20B Stourton 3w/e 14/01/1950 21A 4w/e 11/08/1956 17A Derby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4179 5w/e 24/12/1949 20B Stourton 3w/e 14/01/1950 21A w/e 28/12/1963 2F Bescot
Steam Compound 4-4-0 40928 01/01/1948 21A Saltley 2w/e 17/06/1950 21A 4w/e 21/02/1953 21B Bournville
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3321 01/01/1948 21A Saltley 2w/e 17/06/1950 21A 8w/e 11/07/1953 20C Royston
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44814 01/01/1948 21A Saltley 2w/e 17/06/1950 21A w/e 18/04/1964 1F Rugby
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12074       30/09/1950 (New) 21A 4w/e 10/08/1957 1A Willesden
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12075       30/09/1950 (New) 21A 4w/e 10/08/1957 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42053       06/10/1950 (New) 21A 4w/e 10/08/1957 17D Rowsley
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42685 2w/e 17/06/1950 20E Manningham 4w/e 07/10/1950 21A 4w/e 24/03/1951 14B Kentish Town
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45040 01/01/1948 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 07/10/1950 21A 4w/e 01/12/1956 22A Bristol Barrow Road
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42054       16/10/1950 (New) 21A w/e 02/05/1959 16A Nottingham
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12076       31/10/1950 (New) 21A 4w/e 10/08/1957 1A Willesden
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12077       31/10/1950 (New) 21A 4w/e 28/01/1956 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44201 01/01/1948 20H Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 04/11/1950 21A m/e 09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43985 01/01/1948 19E Belle Vue 4w/e 31/12/1950 21A w/e 31/03/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44888 01/01/1948 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 31/12/1950 21A w/e 22/08/1959 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48401 4w/e 31/12/1950 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 24/02/1951 21A 4w/e 16/06/1951 20A Holbeck (MR)
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43381 01/01/1948 21D Stratford upon Avon 4w/e 24/02/1951 21A 27/06/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43523 01/01/1948 21D Stratford upon Avon 4w/e 24/02/1951 21A 4w/e 28/12/1957 21B Bournville
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43693 01/01/1948 21D Stratford upon Avon 4w/e 24/02/1951 21A 26/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43027 4w/e 02/12/1950 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 24/03/1951 21A 8w/e 14/06/1952 17A Derby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43938 01/01/1948 17B Burton 4w/e 19/05/1951 21A w/e 07/04/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44226 01/01/1948 17B Burton 4w/e 19/05/1951 21A m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48391 4w/e 02/12/1950 15B Kettering 4w/e 19/05/1951 21A 4w/e 16/06/1951 19C Canklow
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42685 4w/e 24/03/1951 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 19/05/1951 21A 4w/e 29/12/1951 21B Bournville
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43862 4w/e 02/12/1950 17A Derby 4w/e 16/06/1951 21A 08/05/1954 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44112 4w/e 19/05/1951 17B Burton 4w/e 16/06/1951 21A w/e 11/04/1961 21A Saltley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44852 01/01/1948 21A Saltley 4w/e 11/08/1951 21A 4w/e 28/11/1953 20A Holbeck (MR)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45274 01/01/1948 21A Saltley 4w/e 11/08/1951 21A 4w/e 06/11/1954 22A Bristol Barrow Road
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41180 01/01/1948 28C Carstairs 4w/e 06/10/1951 21A m/e 03/1957 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42342 01/01/1948 21B Bournville 4w/e 06/10/1951 21A 4w/e 22/03/1952 17A Derby
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40168 01/01/1948 21B Bournville 4w/e 29/12/1951 21A 4w/e 08/08/1953 16D Mansfield
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43875 01/01/1948 22C Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 26/01/1952 21A 05/05/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44204 01/01/1948 21D Stratford upon Avon 4w/e 26/01/1952 21A 4w/e 25/02/1956 18B Westhouses
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44235 01/01/1948 22B Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 26/01/1952 21A w/e 14/02/1959 14B Kentish Town
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44535 01/01/1948 22C Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 26/01/1952 21A 4w/e 23/02/1952 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42685 4w/e 29/12/1951 21B Bournville 4w/e 26/01/1952 21A 4w/e 21/02/1953 21B Bournville
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43878 01/01/1948 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 22/03/1952 21A 05/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43963 01/01/1948 20B Stourton 4w/e 22/03/1952 21A w/e 25/04/1964 12D Workington
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43865 01/01/1948 17C Coalville 4w/e 19/04/1952 21A 4w/e 11/08/1956 18A Toton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44227 01/01/1948 17C Coalville 4w/e 19/04/1952 21A m/e 12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43909 4w/e 31/12/1950 14B Kentish Town 8w/e 14/06/1952 21A 06/08/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44004 4w/e 22/03/1952 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe 8w/e 14/06/1952 21A w/e 22/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44211 01/01/1948 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe 8w/e 14/06/1952 21A w/e 25/04/1964 10A Carnforth
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42327 01/01/1948 21B Bournville 8w/e 14/06/1952 21A 8w/e 19/06/1954 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43013 4w/e 23/02/1952 17A Derby 8w/e 14/06/1952 21A w/e 22/09/1962 15A Wellingborough
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44138 01/01/1948 21B Bournville 4w/e 12/07/1952 21A w/e 09/05/1959 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44520 01/01/1948 21A Saltley 4w/e 12/07/1952 21A 4w/e 21/02/1953 21B Bournville
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42857 4w/e 06/09/1952 15B Kettering 4w/e 04/10/1952 21A w/e 17/06/1961 9G Gorton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48216 01/01/1948 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe 4w/e 04/10/1952 21A 3w/e 24/01/1953 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48284 01/01/1948 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe 4w/e 04/10/1952 21A 3w/e 24/01/1953 18A Toton
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40099 01/01/1948 14B Kentish Town 8w/e 29/11/1952 21A 4w/e 21/02/1953 21B Bournville
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43046       8w/e 29/11/1952 21A w/e 22/09/1962 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44821 01/01/1948 20A Holbeck (MR) 8w/e 29/11/1952 21A 4w/e 21/02/1953 21B Bournville
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44855 2w/e 17/06/1950 91S To Southern Region 8w/e 29/11/1952 21A 8w/e 29/11/1952 22A Bristol Barrow Road
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44855 8w/e 29/11/1952 22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 21/03/1953 21A 4w/e 16/05/1953 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42824 4w/e 21/02/1953 21B Bournville 4w/e 18/04/1953 21A 4w/e 29/01/1955 17B Burton
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42825 4w/e 21/02/1953 21B Bournville 4w/e 18/04/1953 21A 4w/e 11/09/1954 17B Burton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44520 4w/e 21/02/1953 21B Bournville 4w/e 18/04/1953 21A m/e 01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48420 4w/e 21/02/1953 21B Bournville 4w/e 18/04/1953 21A 4w/e 17/07/1954 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48669 4w/e 21/02/1953 21B Bournville 4w/e 18/04/1953 21A w/e 07/05/1966 2A Tyseley
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40099 4w/e 21/02/1953 21B Bournville 4w/e 16/05/1953 21A 4w/e 14/08/1954 24E Blackpool Central
Steam Compound 4-4-0 40928 4w/e 21/02/1953 21B Bournville 4w/e 16/05/1953 21A m/e 03/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43246 4w/e 21/02/1953 21B Bournville 4w/e 16/05/1953 21A 27/10/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42685 4w/e 21/02/1953 21B Bournville 4w/e 16/05/1953 21A 4w/e 27/02/1954 20E Manningham
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45269 4w/e 21/02/1953 21B Bournville 4w/e 16/05/1953 21A w/e 14/05/1960 27F Brunswick
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45447 01/01/1948 21A Saltley 4w/e 16/05/1953 21A 4w/e 17/07/1954 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80063       19/05/1953 (New) 21A 4w/e 06/11/1954 14B Kentish Town
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41140 4w/e 12/07/1952 22B Gloucester Barnwood 8w/e 11/07/1953 21A m/e 05/1957 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43017 5w/e 24/12/1949 22C Bath Green Park (S&D) 8w/e 11/07/1953 21A w/e 28/11/1964 1E Bletchley
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43036       8w/e 11/07/1953 21A 4w/e 08/08/1953 22A Bristol Barrow Road
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43047       8w/e 11/07/1953 21A w/e 22/09/1962 15A Wellingborough
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42790 8w/e 11/07/1953 15B Kettering 4w/e 08/08/1953 21A 27/07/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43932 01/01/1948 22B Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 08/08/1953 21A 4w/e 03/10/1953 22A Bristol Barrow Road
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43520 4w/e 21/02/1953 21B Bournville 4w/e 05/09/1953 21A 4w/e 03/12/1955 22B Gloucester Barnwood
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43568 4w/e 21/02/1953 21B Bournville 4w/e 05/09/1953 21A 21/05/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44603 01/01/1948 20D Normanton 4w/e 03/10/1953 21A 4w/e 31/10/1953 18C Hasland
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43036 4w/e 08/08/1953 22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 03/10/1953 21A w/e 10/09/1960 14D Neasden
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44804 4w/e 05/09/1953 22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 03/10/1953 21A w/e 19/08/1961 27F Brunswick
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43798 01/01/1948 18A Toton 4w/e 31/10/1953 21A 28/06/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43803 01/01/1948 18A Toton 4w/e 31/10/1953 21A 10/09/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43817 01/01/1948 18A Toton 4w/e 31/10/1953 21A 10/09/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43219 01/01/1948 18C Hasland 4w/e 31/10/1953 21A 28/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43599 01/01/1948 18A Toton 4w/e 31/10/1953 21A w/e 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43771 01/01/1948 18C Hasland 4w/e 31/10/1953 21A m/e 02/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47225 01/01/1948 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 31/10/1953 21A w/e 10/01/1959 27E Walton on the Hill
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43444 01/01/1948 22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 28/11/1953 21A 4w/e 09/10/1954 22A Bristol Barrow Road
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44775 01/01/1948 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 28/11/1953 21A w/e 08/08/1959 27F Brunswick
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44776 4w/e 03/10/1953 17A Derby 4w/e 28/11/1953 21A w/e 13/10/1962 17A Derby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44463 01/01/1948 16C Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 30/01/1954 21A 4w/e 07/09/1957 21A Saltley
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43344 01/01/1948 22B Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 30/01/1954 21A 4w/e 09/10/1954 22A Bristol Barrow Road
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43012       4w/e 30/01/1954 21A 4w/e 27/03/1954 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40149 4w/e 12/07/1952 20E Manningham 4w/e 27/02/1954 21A w/e 23/04/1960 18A Toton
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43041       4w/e 27/03/1954 21A 8w/e 19/06/1954 17A Derby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44664 4w/e 16/07/1949 18A Toton (New) 4w/e 27/03/1954 21A 4w/e 04/10/1958 15E Leicester (G.C.)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44964 01/01/1948 19B Sheffield Millhouses 4w/e 27/03/1954 21A 8w/e 19/06/1954 21A Saltley
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42816 01/01/1948 20B Stourton 4w/e 24/04/1954 21A w/e 05/12/1959 9G Gorton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44160 01/01/1948 15A Wellingborough 8w/e 19/06/1954 21A w/e 25/04/1964 9G Gorton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44583 5w/e 24/12/1949 15C Leicester Midland 8w/e 19/06/1954 21A w/e 28/12/1963 5B Crewe South
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48138 01/01/1948 20A Holbeck (MR) 8w/e 19/06/1954 21A 4w/e 01/01/1955 19C Canklow
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44964 4w/e 27/03/1954 21A Saltley 8w/e 19/06/1954 21A w/e 15/08/1959 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48319 8w/e 19/06/1954 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 17/07/1954 21A 4w/e 14/08/1954 18A Toton
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43482 01/01/1948 17A Derby 4w/e 17/07/1954 21A 01/04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43598 01/01/1948 17A Derby 4w/e 17/07/1954 21A 4w/e 09/10/1954 17A Derby
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40164 01/01/1948 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 14/08/1954 21A 4w/e 11/09/1954 24E Blackpool Central
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42327 8w/e 19/06/1954 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 14/08/1954 21A w/e 20/08/1960 5C Stafford
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12045       4w/e 11/09/1954 21A 4w/e 04/12/1954 18A Toton
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42754 4w/e 19/05/1951 17B Burton 4w/e 11/09/1954 21A 4w/e 18/05/1957 17D Rowsley
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42761 3w/e 14/01/1950 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe 4w/e 11/09/1954 21A w/e 17/06/1961 9G Gorton
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42791 8w/e 29/11/1952 17B Burton 4w/e 11/09/1954 21A 4w/e 05/11/1955 20E Manningham
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42846 4w/e 27/03/1954 17B Burton 4w/e 11/09/1954 21A w/e 17/06/1961 9G Gorton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13082       09/10/1954 (New) 21A w/e 19/09/1970 16F Burton
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42903 4w/e 14/08/1954 15B Kettering 4w/e 09/10/1954 21A 8w/e 16/07/1955 15B Kettering
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42383 01/01/1948 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 06/11/1954 21A w/e 23/04/1960 18A Toton
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44821 4w/e 16/05/1953 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 04/12/1954 21A 4w/e 30/11/1957 14B Kentish Town
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44859 4w/e 06/10/1951 16A Nottingham 4w/e 04/12/1954 21A w/e 18/04/1964 2J Aston
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44945 4w/e 19/05/1951 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 04/12/1954 21A w/e 18/04/1964 2J Aston
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44963 4w/e 03/10/1953 17A Derby 4w/e 04/12/1954 21A w/e 18/04/1964 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44965 4w/e 04/10/1952 17A Derby 4w/e 04/12/1954 21A w/e 02/10/1965 2B Oxley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45186 4w/e 06/11/1954 19B Sheffield Millhouses 4w/e 04/12/1954 21A 4w/e 14/06/1958 15E Leicester (G.C.)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45272 4w/e 11/08/1951 19B Sheffield Millhouses 4w/e 04/12/1954 21A w/e 18/04/1964 6D Shrewsbury
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45280 01/01/1948 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 04/12/1954 21A 4w/e 01/12/1956 22A Bristol Barrow Road
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45342 01/01/1948 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 04/12/1954 21A 4w/e 28/01/1956 15D Bedford
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45407 4w/e 06/11/1954 17A Derby 4w/e 04/12/1954 21A 4w/e 24/03/1956 17A Derby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44171 4w/e 18/04/1953 20D Normanton 4w/e 01/01/1955 21A w/e 16/12/1961 14E Bedford
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44230 4w/e 30/01/1954 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 01/01/1955 21A m/e 12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42890 4w/e 08/08/1953 17B Burton 4w/e 29/01/1955 21A w/e 17/06/1961 9G Gorton
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42900 8w/e 16/07/1955 15B Kettering 4w/e 13/08/1955 21A w/e 20/06/1964 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42903 8w/e 16/07/1955 15B Kettering 4w/e 13/08/1955 21A 18/08/1962 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13167       24/08/1955 (New) 21A 3w/e 04/01/1976 DR Doncaster
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13168       26/08/1955 (New) 21A 25/09/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13180 18/10/1955 17A Derby (New) 4w/e 03/12/1955 21A 4w/e 24/03/1956 17A Derby
Steam 1142 0-6-0 58168       4w/e 03/12/1955 21A w/e 20/02/1960 3B Bushbury
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42791 4w/e 05/11/1955 20E Manningham 4w/e 31/12/1955 21A w/e 17/06/1961 9G Gorton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43869 4w/e 14/08/1954 17C Coalville 4w/e 31/12/1955 21A 4w/e 25/02/1956 18D Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12066 2w/e 17/06/1950 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 28/01/1956 21A w/e 03/10/1964 2A Tyseley
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42823 01/01/1948 16A Nottingham 4w/e 28/01/1956 21A 22/02/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48035 4w/e 21/04/1956 15A Wellingborough m/e 16/06/1956 21A 4w/e 16/06/1957 2A Rugby
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48152 4w/e 25/02/1956 15A Wellingborough m/e 16/06/1956 21A 4w/e 18/05/1957 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48269 m/e 16/06/1956 18A Toton 4w/e 11/08/1956 21A 4w/e 18/05/1957 2E Northampton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48338 m/e 16/06/1956 18A Toton 4w/e 11/08/1956 21A 4w/e 22/03/1958 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48668 m/e 16/06/1956 18A Toton 4w/e 11/08/1956 21A 4w/e 10/08/1957 2A Rugby
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48692 m/e 16/06/1956 18A Toton 4w/e 11/08/1956 21A 4w/e 20/04/1957 2E Northampton
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43010       4w/e 11/08/1956 21A w/e 10/10/1959 14D Neasden
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43049 25/11/1949 17A Derby (New) 4w/e 11/08/1956 21A w/e 22/09/1962 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42764 4w/e 08/09/1956 15B Kettering 4w/e 06/10/1956 21A w/e 20/01/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48700 4w/e 03/11/1956 17B Burton 4w/e 01/12/1956 21A w/e 22/09/1962 16D Annesley
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43558 2w/e 17/06/1950 16A Nottingham 4w/e 29/12/1956 21A w/e 10/01/1959 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48280 01/01/1948 18B Westhouses 4w/e 26/01/1957 21A 4w/e 18/05/1957 8A Edge Hill
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92109 20/10/1956 18A Toton (New) 4w/e 23/03/1957 21A 4w/e 16/06/1957 15A Wellingborough
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92121 28/02/1957 15A Wellingborough (New) 4w/e 23/03/1957 21A 4w/e 16/06/1957 15A Wellingborough
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40332 01/01/1948 10C Patricroft 4w/e 23/03/1957 21A 4w/e 18/05/1957 22A Bristol Barrow Road
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40413 4w/e 04/10/1952 5A Crewe North 4w/e 23/03/1957 21A 4w/e 10/08/1957 14B Kentish Town
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40443 01/01/1948 5C Stafford 4w/e 23/03/1957 21A w/e 23/04/1960 18A Toton
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44966 4w/e 01/12/1956 22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 20/04/1957 21A w/e 18/04/1964 2J Aston
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45040 4w/e 01/12/1956 22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 20/04/1957 21A w/e 03/04/1965 2B Oxley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45280 4w/e 01/12/1956 22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 20/04/1957 21A 4w/e 17/05/1958 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92129       30/04/1957 (New) 21A 4w/e 16/06/1957 18A Toton
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92130       30/04/1957 (New) 21A 4w/e 16/06/1957 18A Toton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43965 01/01/1948 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 18/05/1957 21A 4w/e 07/09/1957 21A Saltley
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41078 4w/e 25/02/1956 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 18/05/1957 21A m/e 09/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92131       31/05/1957 (New) 21A 4w/e 16/06/1957 18A Toton
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92132       31/05/1957 (New) 21A 4w/e 28/12/1957 15A Wellingborough
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92008 31/03/1954 15A Wellingborough (New) 4w/e 16/06/1957 21A w/e 21/11/1959 17C Rowsley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92009 31/03/1954 15A Wellingborough (New) 4w/e 16/06/1957 21A 8w/e 05/10/1957 17B Burton
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92048 4w/e 25/02/1956 18A Toton 4w/e 16/06/1957 21A w/e 21/11/1959 17C Rowsley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92049 4w/e 25/02/1956 18A Toton 4w/e 16/06/1957 21A w/e 21/11/1959 17C Rowsley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92051 4w/e 31/12/1955 18A Toton 4w/e 16/06/1957 21A w/e 21/11/1959 17C Rowsley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92133       30/06/1957 (New) 21A 4w/e 28/12/1957 15A Wellingborough
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92134       30/06/1957 (New) 21A 4w/e 28/12/1957 15A Wellingborough
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92135       30/06/1957 (New) 21A w/e 28/05/1966 6C Croes Newydd
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92136       31/07/1957 (New) 21A m/e 10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92137       31/07/1957 (New) 21A w/e 06/08/1966 6C Croes Newydd
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92138       31/07/1957 (New) 21A w/e 20/08/1966 8C Speke Junction
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92139       31/07/1957 (New) 21A w/e 10/12/1966 8C Speke Junction
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12033 4w/e 06/11/1954 1A Willesden 4w/e 10/08/1957 21A 4w/e 25/01/1958 17A Derby
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12034 4w/e 06/11/1954 1A Willesden 4w/e 10/08/1957 21A 4w/e 09/08/1958 17A Derby
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12035 4w/e 06/11/1954 1A Willesden 4w/e 10/08/1957 21A w/e 04/02/1961 15A Wellingborough
Diesel 11 0-6-0 7122 4w/e 06/11/1954 1A Willesden 4w/e 10/08/1957 21A w/e 04/02/1961 15A Wellingborough
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76085 04/1957 15C Leicester Midland (New) 4w/e 10/08/1957 21A w/e 10/01/1959 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76087 05/1957 17F Trafford Park (LMS) (New) 4w/e 10/08/1957 21A w/e 10/01/1959 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43965 4w/e 18/05/1957 21A Saltley 4w/e 07/09/1957 21A 05/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44463 4w/e 30/01/1954 21A Saltley 4w/e 07/09/1957 21A w/e 20/06/1959 21B Bournville
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41165 01/01/1948 2A Rugby 4w/e 07/09/1957 21A 4w/e 22/03/1958 21B Bournville
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13248 4w/e 23/03/1957 17A Derby 8w/e 05/10/1957 21A w/e 20/05/1972 30A Stratford
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12077 4w/e 23/03/1957 17A Derby 8w/e 05/10/1957 21A w/e 03/10/1964 2A Tyseley
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41066 01/01/1948 19G Trafford Park (LMS) 8w/e 05/10/1957 21A m/e 05/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92151       31/10/1957 (New) 21A w/e 12/11/1966 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92152       31/10/1957 (New) 21A w/e 12/11/1966 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92155       30/11/1957 (New) 21A w/e 20/08/1966 8C Speke Junction
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92015 30/09/1954 15A Wellingborough (New) 4w/e 28/12/1957 21A 4w/e 12/07/1958 26A Newton Heath
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92016 31/10/1954 15A Wellingborough (New) 4w/e 28/12/1957 21A 4w/e 12/07/1958 26A Newton Heath
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92017 31/10/1954 15A Wellingborough (New) 4w/e 28/12/1957 21A 4w/e 12/07/1958 26A Newton Heath
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92009 8w/e 05/10/1957 17B Burton 4w/e 22/03/1958 21A w/e 25/10/1958 16D Annesley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92053 8w/e 05/10/1957 17B Burton 4w/e 22/03/1958 21A w/e 21/11/1959 15A Wellingborough
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40012 4w/e 16/06/1957 17F Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 22/03/1958 21A w/e 12/09/1959 14E Bedford
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92165       30/04/1958 (New) 21A w/e 23/06/1962 6F Bidston
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92166       31/05/1958 (New) 21A 4w/e 06/09/1958 99R  
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92167       31/05/1958 (New) 21A w/e 12/05/1962 52H Tyne Dock
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48000 4w/e 17/05/1958 18A Toton 4w/e 14/06/1958 21A 4w/e 04/10/1958 16A Nottingham
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45280 4w/e 17/05/1958 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 14/06/1958 21A w/e 19/06/1965 6J Holyhead
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41165 4w/e 22/03/1958 21B Bournville 4w/e 12/07/1958 21A w/e 10/01/1959 21B Bournville
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42340 8w/e 16/07/1955 21B Bournville 4w/e 12/07/1958 21A w/e 20/08/1960 8E Northwich
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48261 4w/e 22/03/1952 11E Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 12/07/1958 21A 4w/e 04/10/1958 16A Nottingham
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48286 4w/e 22/03/1952 11E Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 12/07/1958 21A 4w/e 04/10/1958 16A Nottingham
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48342 4w/e 02/01/1954 11E Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 12/07/1958 21A w/e 07/01/1961 16B Kirkby in Ashfield
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13250 25/05/1955 17A Derby (New) 4w/e 09/08/1958 21A 15/03/1981 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44013 4w/e 20/04/1957 17D Rowsley 4w/e 06/09/1958 21A w/e 05/08/1961 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44184 4w/e 04/12/1954 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 06/09/1958 21A w/e 12/01/1963 16A Nottingham
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44143 4w/e 29/01/1955 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 04/10/1958 21A w/e 13/10/1962 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3582       16/10/1958 (New) 21A w/e 15/08/1959 18A Toton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3583       03/11/1958 (New) 21A w/e 28/02/1959 5B Crewe South
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3584       07/11/1958 (New) 21A w/e 28/02/1959 5B Crewe South
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41121 4w/e 23/02/1957 11E Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 08/11/1958 21A w/e 10/01/1959 17A Derby
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41173 4w/e 09/08/1958 24J Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 08/11/1958 21A w/e 10/01/1959 17A Derby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44841 4w/e 04/10/1958 15E Leicester (G.C.) w/e 08/11/1958 21A w/e 03/04/1965 2B Oxley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92009 w/e 25/10/1958 16D Annesley w/e 22/11/1958 21A w/e 21/11/1959 17C Rowsley
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43932 4w/e 09/10/1954 21B Bournville w/e 22/11/1958 21A w/e 16/12/1961 9G Gorton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44203 4w/e 28/12/1957 21B Bournville w/e 22/11/1958 21A w/e 30/12/1961 17C Rowsley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44842 4w/e 04/10/1958 15E Leicester (G.C.) w/e 29/11/1958 21A w/e 04/04/1959 27F Brunswick
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92120 w/e 29/11/1958 18B Westhouses w/e 06/12/1958 21A w/e 21/11/1959 15A Wellingborough
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44091 4w/e 06/09/1958 18A Toton w/e 06/12/1958 21A w/e 16/12/1961 16B Kirkby in Ashfield
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44589 4w/e 06/10/1956 17A Derby w/e 06/12/1958 21A w/e 10/01/1959 27F Brunswick
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44664 4w/e 04/10/1958 15E Leicester (G.C.) w/e 06/12/1958 21A w/e 30/05/1959 16A Nottingham
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45186 4w/e 14/06/1958 15E Leicester (G.C.) w/e 03/01/1959 21A w/e 17/09/1960 17A Derby
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42775 4w/e 27/01/1951 9F Heaton Mersey w/e 10/01/1959 21A w/e 05/12/1959 9G Gorton
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42788 4w/e 27/01/1951 9F Heaton Mersey w/e 10/01/1959 21A w/e 05/12/1959 9G Gorton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48220 4w/e 04/10/1958 16D Annesley w/e 10/01/1959 21A w/e 22/09/1962 16D Annesley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48315 4w/e 04/10/1958 16D Annesley w/e 10/01/1959 21A w/e 08/07/1961 15D Coalville
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43242 4w/e 07/10/1950 16C Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 10/01/1959 21A w/e 04/08/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43355 01/01/1948 21B Bournville w/e 10/01/1959 21A 02/05/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43379 4w/e 11/08/1951 17A Derby w/e 10/01/1959 21A 28/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43468 01/01/1948 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe w/e 10/01/1959 21A 27/05/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43041 8w/e 19/06/1954 17A Derby w/e 10/01/1959 21A w/e 22/09/1962 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92150 31/10/1957 18B Westhouses (New) w/e 07/02/1959 21A w/e 23/05/1964 2A Tyseley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92157 30/11/1957 18A Toton (New) w/e 07/02/1959 21A w/e 18/04/1964 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48105 4w/e 12/07/1958 18A Toton w/e 07/02/1959 21A w/e 07/01/1961 16B Kirkby in Ashfield
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43253 3w/e 11/12/1948 18B Westhouses w/e 07/02/1959 21A 02/05/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48101 01/01/1948 16C Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 14/02/1959 21A w/e 14/03/1964 2F Bescot
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48002 w/e 10/01/1959 21B Bournville w/e 07/03/1959 21A w/e 11/04/1959 17A Derby
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48523 4w/e 08/09/1951 18D Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 07/03/1959 21A w/e 11/02/1961 18A Toton
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42813 4w/e 03/10/1953 5B Crewe South w/e 14/03/1959 21A w/e 05/12/1959 9G Gorton
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43052 4w/e 21/07/1951 50C Selby w/e 16/05/1959 21A w/e 11/07/1959 24J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43103 09/03/1951 53A Hull Dairycoates (New) w/e 16/05/1959 21A w/e 23/04/1960 12D Kirkby Stephen
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43122 3w/e 16/06/1956 53A Hull Dairycoates w/e 16/05/1959 21A w/e 28/11/1964 1E Bletchley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92166 4w/e 06/09/1958 99R   w/e 30/05/1959 21A w/e 29/08/1959 86C Cardiff Canton
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43027 w/e 10/01/1959 21B Bournville w/e 20/06/1959 21A w/e 23/04/1960 12D Kirkby Stephen
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43040 w/e 10/01/1959 21B Bournville w/e 20/06/1959 21A w/e 22/09/1962 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44981 4w/e 26/03/1955 21B Bournville w/e 20/06/1959 21A w/e 19/06/1965 6J Holyhead
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43389 w/e 14/02/1959 2F Woodford Halse w/e 18/07/1959 21A w/e 04/08/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43523 4w/e 28/12/1957 21B Bournville w/e 05/09/1959 21A 20/08/1960 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92248 31/12/1958 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) w/e 12/09/1959 21A 4w/e 10/09/1960 82E Bristol Barrow Road
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44888 w/e 22/08/1959 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 26/09/1959 21A w/e 18/05/1963 15C Leicester Midland
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3582 w/e 15/08/1959 18A Toton w/e 10/10/1959 21A 29/11/1981 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44775 w/e 08/08/1959 27F Brunswick w/e 10/10/1959 21A w/e 19/06/1965 6B Mold Junction
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92050 4w/e 18/05/1957 18A Toton w/e 07/11/1959 21A w/e 21/11/1959 17C Rowsley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92081 w/e 02/05/1959 18A Toton w/e 07/11/1959 21A w/e 21/11/1959 15A Wellingborough
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43855 4w/e 23/02/1957 21B Bournville w/e 07/11/1959 21A w/e 16/12/1961 9G Gorton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43948 01/01/1948 16A Nottingham w/e 07/11/1959 21A 08/04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44168 w/e 10/01/1959 17B Burton w/e 07/11/1959 21A w/e 12/01/1963 16A Nottingham
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43263 4w/e 12/07/1952 21B Bournville w/e 07/11/1959 21A w/e 02/06/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43309 4w/e 19/05/1951 18A Toton w/e 07/11/1959 21A 01/04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43359 01/01/1948 21B Bournville w/e 07/11/1959 21A 20/08/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43453 01/01/1948 18A Toton w/e 07/11/1959 21A w/e 22/09/1962 14E Bedford
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45649 01/01/1948 14B Kentish Town w/e 21/11/1959 21A w/e 21/11/1959 17A Derby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44663 4w/e 07/09/1957 14B Kentish Town w/e 21/11/1959 21A w/e 02/10/1965 2A Tyseley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44810 4w/e 30/11/1957 14B Kentish Town w/e 21/11/1959 21A w/e 06/03/1965 5D Stoke
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44812 4w/e 29/12/1956 14B Kentish Town w/e 21/11/1959 21A w/e 03/04/1965 2B Oxley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44818 01/01/1948 17A Derby w/e 21/11/1959 21A w/e 07/04/1962 17B Burton
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44825 4w/e 04/10/1952 14B Kentish Town w/e 21/11/1959 21A w/e 07/04/1962 17A Derby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44839 w/e 15/11/1958 17A Derby w/e 21/11/1959 21A w/e 07/04/1962 17A Derby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44856 4w/e 08/08/1953 17A Derby w/e 21/11/1959 21A w/e 12/03/1960 16A Nottingham
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44858 4w/e 17/05/1958 16A Nottingham w/e 21/11/1959 21A w/e 07/04/1962 17A Derby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44944 4w/e 17/05/1958 16A Nottingham w/e 21/11/1959 21A w/e 02/10/1965 2B Oxley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45088 4w/e 28/11/1953 16A Nottingham w/e 21/11/1959 21A w/e 10/08/1963 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45253 4w/e 30/11/1957 16A Nottingham w/e 21/11/1959 21A w/e 13/10/1962 17A Derby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45263 4w/e 22/02/1958 16A Nottingham w/e 21/11/1959 21A w/e 03/04/1965 2B Oxley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45447 4w/e 19/05/1956 14B Kentish Town w/e 21/11/1959 21A w/e 19/06/1965 6J Holyhead
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43321 4w/e 31/12/1955 20D Normanton w/e 05/12/1959 21A 18/02/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43639 01/01/1948 20D Normanton w/e 05/12/1959 21A 20/08/1960 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12049 4w/e 10/08/1957 16A Nottingham w/e 09/01/1960 21A w/e 18/04/1964 2H Monument Lane
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43975 8w/e 05/10/1957 17C Coalville w/e 09/01/1960 21A w/e 20/01/1962 16A Nottingham
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43583 01/01/1948 21B Bournville w/e 09/01/1960 21A w/e 04/08/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92166 4w/e 03/10/1959 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) w/e 20/02/1960 21A w/e 23/06/1962 6F Bidston
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44463 w/e 20/06/1959 21B Bournville w/e 20/02/1960 21A w/e 16/12/1961 18C Hasland
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44516 w/e 22/11/1958 21B Bournville w/e 20/02/1960 21A w/e 16/12/1961 17C Rowsley
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44571 w/e 22/11/1958 21B Bournville w/e 20/02/1960 21A w/e 25/07/1964 5B Crewe South
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40439 01/01/1948 21B Bournville w/e 20/02/1960 21A w/e 23/04/1960 18A Toton
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43521 4w/e 12/07/1952 21B Bournville w/e 20/02/1960 21A w/e 22/09/1962 14E Bedford
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43668 01/01/1948 21B Bournville w/e 20/02/1960 21A w/e 04/08/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43687 01/01/1948 21B Bournville w/e 20/02/1960 21A w/e 04/08/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 1142 0-6-0 58138       w/e 20/02/1960 21A w/e 18/11/1961 18A Toton
Steam 1142 0-6-0 58143       w/e 20/02/1960 21A w/e 18/11/1961 18A Toton
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43012 w/e 10/01/1959 21B Bournville w/e 20/02/1960 21A w/e 22/09/1962 15A Wellingborough
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43033 w/e 10/01/1959 21B Bournville w/e 20/02/1960 21A w/e 22/09/1962 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48000 4w/e 04/10/1958 16A Nottingham w/e 12/03/1960 21A w/e 17/09/1960 16A Nottingham
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92014 4w/e 16/02/1957 38B Annesley w/e 09/04/1960 21A w/e 17/09/1960 18A Toton
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92070 4w/e 16/03/1957 38B Annesley w/e 09/04/1960 21A w/e 17/09/1960 18A Toton
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42446 4w/e 05/11/1955 2F Market Harborough w/e 30/04/1960 21A w/e 13/06/1960 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42160 4w/e 03/12/1955 15C Leicester Midland w/e 30/04/1960 21A w/e 20/08/1960 5D Stoke
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42137 w/e 26/03/1960 27F Brunswick w/e 07/05/1960 21A w/e 20/08/1960 9A Longsight
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42182       w/e 21/05/1960 21A w/e 20/08/1960 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48183 4w/e 02/01/1954 18A Toton w/e 18/06/1960 21A w/e 13/10/1962 15B Kettering
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45269 w/e 14/05/1960 27F Brunswick w/e 16/07/1960 21A w/e 18/05/1963 16A Nottingham
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42754 w/e 28/11/1959 9G Gorton w/e 30/07/1960 21A w/e 19/11/1960 9G Gorton
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42398 01/01/1948 9A Longsight w/e 20/08/1960 21A w/e 03/12/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42400 4w/e 06/09/1958 5C Stafford w/e 20/08/1960 21A w/e 16/05/1964 5C Stafford
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42415 w/e 07/11/1959 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 20/08/1960 21A w/e 21/01/1961 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42416 w/e 18/06/1960 6H Bangor w/e 20/08/1960 21A w/e 16/05/1964 5C Stafford
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42417 w/e 09/01/1960 6A Chester (MR) w/e 20/08/1960 21A 11/04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42421 4w/e 20/04/1957 5D Stoke w/e 20/08/1960 21A w/e 20/06/1964 5C Stafford
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42422 w/e 30/07/1960 8E Northwich w/e 20/08/1960 21A w/e 22/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43529 4w/e 11/09/1954 15D Bedford w/e 27/08/1960 21A 26/08/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42419 4w/e 19/05/1956 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 05/11/1960 21A m/e 11/1963 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3576 w/e 01/11/1958 18A Toton w/e 19/11/1960 21A 23/02/1988 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3577 w/e 01/11/1958 18A Toton w/e 19/11/1960 21A w/e 09/12/1967 16A Toton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3865 19/12/1959 17A Derby (New) w/e 19/11/1960 21A w/e 20/05/1972 30A Stratford
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43036 w/e 10/09/1960 14D Neasden w/e 26/11/1960 21A w/e 22/09/1962 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12035 w/e 04/02/1961 15A Wellingborough w/e 11/02/1961 21A w/e 07/10/1967 8C Speke Junction
Diesel 11 0-6-0 7122 w/e 04/02/1961 15A Wellingborough w/e 11/02/1961 21A w/e 07/10/1967 8C Speke Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48330 4w/e 05/09/1959 87F Llanelly w/e 11/02/1961 21A 4w/e 09/09/1961 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48415 w/e 11/04/1959 84E Tyseley w/e 11/02/1961 21A w/e 18/03/1961 84F Stourbridge Junction
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45579 4w/e 06/09/1952 14B Kentish Town w/e 04/03/1961 21A w/e 18/11/1961 17B Burton
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45648 4w/e 30/11/1957 17A Derby w/e 04/03/1961 21A w/e 18/11/1961 17B Burton
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45649 w/e 21/11/1959 17A Derby w/e 04/03/1961 21A w/e 18/11/1961 17B Burton
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45006 w/e 18/06/1960 17A Derby w/e 04/03/1961 21A w/e 03/04/1965 2B Oxley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45186 w/e 17/09/1960 17A Derby w/e 04/03/1961 21A w/e 03/04/1965 2B Oxley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45221 w/e 17/09/1960 17A Derby w/e 04/03/1961 21A w/e 06/04/1963 16A Nottingham
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45260 w/e 18/06/1960 17A Derby w/e 04/03/1961 21A w/e 10/08/1963 17A Derby
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92026 18/06/1955 15A Wellingborough (New) w/e 11/04/1961 21A w/e 29/04/1961 15A Wellingborough
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44112 4w/e 16/06/1951 21A Saltley w/e 11/04/1961 21A w/e 19/01/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48635 01/01/1948 16A Nottingham w/e 11/04/1961 21A w/e 17/06/1961 18A Toton
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92052 4w/e 22/03/1958 15A Wellingborough w/e 03/06/1961 21A w/e 17/06/1961 18A Toton
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46103 w/e 29/11/1958 14B Kentish Town w/e 17/06/1961 21A w/e 30/06/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46122 w/e 17/12/1960 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 17/06/1961 21A w/e 30/06/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46123 w/e 26/09/1959 14B Kentish Town w/e 17/06/1961 21A w/e 30/06/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46141 w/e 31/12/1960 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 17/06/1961 21A w/e 07/07/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46157 4w/e 04/10/1958 5A Crewe North w/e 17/06/1961 21A w/e 30/06/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46160 w/e 19/09/1959 14B Kentish Town w/e 17/06/1961 21A w/e 30/06/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46162 w/e 07/11/1959 14B Kentish Town w/e 17/06/1961 21A w/e 30/06/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45532 w/e 28/11/1959 16A Nottingham w/e 17/06/1961 21A w/e 07/04/1962 17A Derby
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45540 w/e 14/01/1961 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 17/06/1961 21A w/e 07/04/1962 17A Derby
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43435 w/e 11/04/1961 14E Bedford w/e 15/07/1961 21A w/e 21/04/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46118 w/e 26/08/1961 16A Nottingham w/e 26/08/1961 21A w/e 19/05/1962 15E Leicester (G.C.)
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46106 w/e 02/09/1961 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 02/09/1961 21A w/e 12/05/1962 15E Leicester (G.C.)
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46137 w/e 02/09/1961 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 02/09/1961 21A w/e 30/06/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44804 w/e 19/08/1961 27F Brunswick w/e 09/09/1961 21A w/e 18/05/1963 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46132 w/e 19/09/1959 14B Kentish Town w/e 14/10/1961 21A w/e 30/06/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46443       w/e 18/11/1961 21A w/e 15/10/1966 9D Newton Heath
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46454 w/e 24/09/1960 17A Derby w/e 18/11/1961 21A m/e 10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92107 30/09/1956 15A Wellingborough (New) w/e 09/12/1961 21A w/e 30/11/1963 2D Banbury
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92129 w/e 07/10/1961 16D Annesley w/e 09/12/1961 21A w/e 18/07/1964 2D Banbury
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48007 w/e 16/09/1961 18A Toton w/e 09/12/1961 21A w/e 13/10/1962 16D Annesley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48109 w/e 23/05/1959 18A Toton w/e 09/12/1961 21A w/e 22/01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48127 w/e 03/10/1959 18A Toton w/e 09/12/1961 21A w/e 06/10/1962 15B Kettering
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48177 w/e 25/07/1959 16B Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 09/12/1961 21A w/e 23/06/1962 18B Westhouses
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48523 w/e 11/02/1961 18A Toton w/e 09/12/1961 21A w/e 14/07/1962 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42053 w/e 12/03/1960 14D Neasden w/e 09/12/1961 21A w/e 22/12/1962 17C Rowsley
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42082 w/e 05/12/1959 14D Neasden w/e 09/12/1961 21A w/e 13/10/1962 17B Burton
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42225 5w/e 24/04/1954 34E Neasden w/e 09/12/1961 21A w/e 22/09/1962 17C Rowsley
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42230 5w/e 23/04/1955 34E Neasden w/e 09/12/1961 21A w/e 22/09/1962 17C Rowsley
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42284 4w/e 14/06/1958 14D Neasden w/e 09/12/1961 21A w/e 22/12/1962 17C Rowsley
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44516 w/e 16/12/1961 17C Rowsley w/e 30/12/1961 21A w/e 04/01/1964 2F Bescot
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48133 w/e 15/07/1961 14A Cricklewood East w/e 13/01/1962 21A w/e 12/05/1962 16A Nottingham
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92118 w/e 07/11/1959 15A Wellingborough w/e 20/01/1962 21A w/e 18/07/1964 2D Banbury
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43063 3w/e 16/06/1956 38E Woodford Halse w/e 24/03/1962 21A w/e 15/09/1962 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92056 w/e 24/09/1960 18A Toton w/e 31/03/1962 21A w/e 12/05/1962 15A Wellingborough
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43106 m/e 21/07/1956 38E Woodford Halse w/e 31/03/1962 21A w/e 23/06/1962 15A Wellingborough
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43958 w/e 18/11/1961 17A Derby w/e 07/04/1962 21A 05/09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44047 w/e 10/03/1962 17A Derby w/e 07/04/1962 21A w/e 12/01/1963 16A Nottingham
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44131 w/e 18/11/1961 18B Westhouses w/e 07/04/1962 21A w/e 25/04/1964 9M Bury
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44218 w/e 10/02/1962 17A Derby w/e 07/04/1962 21A w/e 28/12/1963 5B Crewe South
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44289 w/e 07/10/1961 17A Derby w/e 07/04/1962 21A w/e 15/09/1962 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44394 w/e 18/11/1961 17A Derby w/e 07/04/1962 21A w/e 15/09/1962 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43979 w/e 16/01/1960 15D Coalville w/e 14/04/1962 21A w/e 25/04/1964 9D Newton Heath
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44180 01/01/1948 16A Nottingham w/e 14/04/1962 21A m/e 04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48625 w/e 18/06/1960 14A Cricklewood East w/e 28/04/1962 21A w/e 23/06/1962 18B Westhouses
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43940 w/e 17/03/1962 18C Hasland w/e 19/05/1962 21A w/e 28/12/1963 2F Bescot
Diesel Peak 1Co-Co1 D6 w/e 14/04/1962 17A Derby w/e 26/05/1962 21A w/e 28/07/1962 18A Toton
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92008 w/e 03/03/1962 17C Rowsley w/e 23/06/1962 21A w/e 13/07/1963 17C Rowsley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92009 w/e 21/11/1959 17C Rowsley w/e 23/06/1962 21A w/e 07/07/1962 18B Westhouses
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44413 w/e 09/01/1960 17C Rowsley w/e 23/06/1962 21A w/e 02/03/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44419 w/e 04/03/1961 17C Rowsley w/e 23/06/1962 21A m/e 09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92128 4w/e 22/03/1958 15C Leicester Midland w/e 30/06/1962 21A w/e 18/07/1964 2D Banbury
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92164 30/04/1958 15C Leicester Midland (New) w/e 30/06/1962 21A m/e 07/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46106 w/e 12/05/1962 15E Leicester (G.C.) w/e 30/06/1962 21A w/e 30/06/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46118 w/e 19/05/1962 15E Leicester (G.C.) w/e 30/06/1962 21A w/e 30/06/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42784 w/e 18/11/1961 16A Nottingham w/e 21/07/1962 21A w/e 22/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42707 w/e 09/01/1960 24F Fleetwood w/e 01/09/1962 21A w/e 20/06/1964 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92028 w/e 17/12/1960 15B Kettering w/e 13/10/1962 21A w/e 30/11/1963 81H  
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92029 w/e 17/12/1960 15B Kettering w/e 13/10/1962 21A w/e 30/11/1963 81H  
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92085 w/e 17/12/1960 15B Kettering w/e 13/10/1962 21A w/e 30/11/1963 2A Tyseley
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44038 4w/e 07/10/1950 27E Walton on the Hill w/e 13/10/1962 21A w/e 10/08/1963 18A Toton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44040 4w/e 03/12/1955 27E Walton on the Hill w/e 13/10/1962 21A w/e 22/06/1963 16B Kirkby in Ashfield
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44605 4w/e 23/03/1957 27E Walton on the Hill w/e 13/10/1962 21A m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48220 w/e 22/09/1962 16D Annesley w/e 15/12/1962 21A w/e 07/11/1964 2B Oxley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48167 w/e 12/01/1963 16D Annesley w/e 26/01/1963 21A w/e 12/10/1963 16A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48010 w/e 26/03/1960 15A Wellingborough w/e 09/02/1963 21A w/e 16/02/1963 2F Woodford Halse
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92082 w/e 09/02/1963 16D Annesley w/e 23/02/1963 21A w/e 30/11/1963 81H  
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45584 4w/e 04/10/1952 24E Blackpool Central w/e 09/03/1963 21A w/e 30/11/1963 1A Willesden
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45617 w/e 23/06/1962 5A Crewe North w/e 09/03/1963 21A w/e 30/11/1963 1A Willesden
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45631 w/e 10/06/1961 5A Crewe North w/e 09/03/1963 21A w/e 15/08/1964 5A Crewe North
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45647 w/e 23/06/1962 5A Crewe North w/e 09/03/1963 21A w/e 22/02/1964 5A Crewe North
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45653 01/01/1948 24E Blackpool Central w/e 09/03/1963 21A w/e 02/05/1964 10B Blackpool Central
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45674 01/01/1948 5A Crewe North w/e 09/03/1963 21A w/e 10/10/1964 5A Crewe North
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45676 w/e 18/06/1960 5A Crewe North w/e 09/03/1963 21A w/e 30/11/1963 1A Willesden
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45709 w/e 23/06/1962 5A Crewe North w/e 09/03/1963 21A w/e 06/07/1963 17A Derby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45253 w/e 13/10/1962 17A Derby w/e 09/03/1963 21A w/e 16/03/1963 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48000 w/e 17/09/1960 16A Nottingham w/e 06/04/1963 21A w/e 22/06/1963 17B Burton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48095 w/e 22/09/1962 18A Toton w/e 06/04/1963 21A w/e 20/02/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48133 w/e 12/05/1962 16A Nottingham w/e 06/04/1963 21A w/e 03/12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44815 w/e 10/01/1959 15C Leicester Midland w/e 18/05/1963 21A w/e 22/06/1963 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44856 w/e 12/03/1960 16A Nottingham w/e 18/05/1963 21A w/e 03/04/1965 2B Oxley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45264 w/e 10/01/1959 15C Leicester Midland w/e 18/05/1963 21A w/e 19/06/1965 2B Oxley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45333 w/e 12/12/1959 15C Leicester Midland w/e 18/05/1963 21A w/e 22/06/1963 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44776 w/e 09/03/1963 15C Leicester Midland w/e 22/06/1963 21A w/e 02/10/1965 2A Tyseley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44843 w/e 10/01/1959 15C Leicester Midland w/e 13/07/1963 21A w/e 19/06/1965 2B Oxley
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45709 w/e 06/07/1963 17A Derby w/e 14/09/1963 2E w/e 16/11/1963 5A Crewe North
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5390 04/06/1962 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 05/10/1963 2E w/e 16/11/1963 14B Cricklewood West
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44829 w/e 22/06/1963 6J Holyhead w/e 05/10/1963 2E w/e 19/06/1965 5B Crewe South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45369 w/e 11/05/1963 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 05/10/1963 2E w/e 19/06/1965 6B Mold Junction
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76047 w/e 28/09/1963 5D Stoke w/e 12/10/1963 2E w/e 27/03/1965 2F Bescot
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76052 w/e 07/07/1962 2F Woodford Halse w/e 12/10/1963 2E w/e 29/05/1965 2B Oxley
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76085 w/e 28/09/1963 5D Stoke w/e 12/10/1963 2E w/e 23/01/1965 5D Stoke
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76086 w/e 21/09/1963 5D Stoke w/e 12/10/1963 2E w/e 27/03/1965 2F Bescot
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76087 w/e 22/09/1962 2F Woodford Halse w/e 12/10/1963 2E w/e 27/03/1965 2F Bescot
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76088 w/e 21/09/1963 5D Stoke w/e 12/10/1963 2E w/e 27/03/1965 2F Bescot
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92057 w/e 13/04/1963 18A Toton w/e 12/10/1963 2E w/e 18/04/1964 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45250 4w/e 04/10/1958 5A Crewe North w/e 12/10/1963 2E w/e 18/04/1964 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44691 w/e 10/08/1963 15E Leicester (G.C.) w/e 02/11/1963 2E w/e 03/04/1965 2B Oxley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44777 w/e 03/08/1963 15E Leicester (G.C.) w/e 02/11/1963 2E w/e 02/10/1965 2A Tyseley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92125 w/e 17/12/1960 15B Kettering w/e 23/11/1963 2E w/e 07/12/1963 2E Saltley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48085 w/e 05/10/1963 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 30/11/1963 2E w/e 03/12/1966 5D Stoke
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48430 4w/e 25/03/1961 84F Stourbridge Junction w/e 30/11/1963 2E w/e 24/04/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48629 w/e 12/10/1963 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 30/11/1963 2E m/e 09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48646 w/e 05/10/1963 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 30/11/1963 2E w/e 04/02/1967 10D Lostock Hall
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48724 4w/e 08/09/1962 84F Stourbridge Junction w/e 30/11/1963 2E w/e 14/03/1964 2F Bescot
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92125 w/e 23/11/1963 2E Saltley w/e 07/12/1963 2E w/e 28/05/1966 6C Croes Newydd
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46448 w/e 24/03/1962 21C Bushbury w/e 07/12/1963 2E w/e 15/10/1966 9D Newton Heath
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46505 w/e 25/05/1963 6A Chester (MR) w/e 07/12/1963 2E w/e 24/10/1964 2L Leamington
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46526 w/e 30/03/1963 1C Watford w/e 07/12/1963 2E m/e 07/1966 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5187 22/03/1963 18A Toton (New) w/e 04/01/1964 2E w/e 03/10/1964 16A Toton
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5183 w/e 15/02/1964 16A Toton w/e 11/04/1964 2E 18/04/1966 D02 Birmingham Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5183 w/e 15/02/1964 16A Toton w/e 11/04/1964 2E 18/04/1966 D05 Stoke Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5188 23/03/1963 18A Toton (New) w/e 11/04/1964 2E w/e 06/06/1964 16C Derby
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5197 w/e 18/01/1964 16D Nottingham w/e 11/04/1964 2E 18/04/1966 D02 Birmingham Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5232 06/11/1963 16A Toton (New) w/e 11/04/1964 2E 18/04/1966 D02 Birmingham Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5233 w/e 11/01/1964 16C Derby w/e 11/04/1964 2E w/e 23/04/1966 ML Line Power Controller, Derby
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5234 w/e 28/12/1963 16D Nottingham w/e 11/04/1964 2E 18/04/1966 D02 Birmingham Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5236 w/e 11/01/1964 16C Derby w/e 11/04/1964 2E 18/04/1966 D02 Birmingham Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7570 04/10/1963 16A Toton (New) w/e 11/04/1964 2E 18/04/1966 D02 Birmingham Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7582 07/01/1964 16A Toton (New) w/e 11/04/1964 2E 18/04/1966 D02 Birmingham Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7587 09/03/1964 16A Toton (New) w/e 11/04/1964 2E 18/04/1966 D02 Birmingham Division
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92028 w/e 30/11/1963 81H   w/e 18/04/1964 2E w/e 06/03/1965 2D Banbury
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92029 w/e 30/11/1963 81H   w/e 18/04/1964 2E w/e 28/05/1966 6C Croes Newydd
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43940 w/e 28/12/1963 2F Bescot w/e 18/04/1964 2E 24/10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44179 w/e 28/12/1963 2F Bescot w/e 18/04/1964 2E w/e 15/08/1964 5D Stoke
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44516 w/e 04/01/1964 2F Bescot w/e 18/04/1964 2E m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5226 w/e 07/03/1964 16C Derby w/e 06/06/1964 2E 18/04/1966 D02 Birmingham Division
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92150 w/e 23/05/1964 2A Tyseley w/e 20/06/1964 2E w/e 29/10/1966 56A Wakefield
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42416 w/e 16/05/1964 5C Stafford w/e 20/06/1964 2E 27/06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76048 w/e 22/09/1962 14A Cricklewood East w/e 25/07/1964 2E w/e 10/09/1966 6C Croes Newydd
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76040 w/e 30/06/1962 14A Cricklewood East w/e 01/08/1964 2E w/e 30/01/1965 2J Aston
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76042 w/e 14/07/1962 14A Cricklewood East w/e 01/08/1964 2E w/e 27/03/1965 2F Bescot
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76043 w/e 07/07/1962 14A Cricklewood East w/e 01/08/1964 2E w/e 18/06/1966 6F Machynlleth
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76036 w/e 30/06/1962 14A Cricklewood East w/e 08/08/1964 2E w/e 27/03/1965 2F Bescot
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76038 w/e 30/06/1962 14A Cricklewood East w/e 08/08/1964 2E w/e 18/06/1966 6F Machynlleth
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44945 w/e 18/04/1964 2J Aston w/e 19/09/1964 2E w/e 02/10/1965 2B Oxley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44966 w/e 18/04/1964 2J Aston w/e 19/09/1964 2E w/e 19/06/1965 6J Holyhead
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3973 4w/e 02/12/1961 84E Tyseley w/e 03/10/1964 2E      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3974 4w/e 13/08/1960 84E Tyseley w/e 03/10/1964 2E 31/08/2005 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3975 4w/e 13/08/1960 84E Tyseley w/e 03/10/1964 2E 28/02/2007 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44137 w/e 12/09/1964 5D Stoke w/e 17/10/1964 2E w/e 05/12/1964 99C Crewe Works
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43949 w/e 22/08/1964 5D Stoke w/e 24/10/1964 2E 26/12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44179 w/e 15/08/1964 5D Stoke w/e 24/10/1964 2E m/e 12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48718 8w/e 05/10/1957 3D Aston w/e 07/11/1964 2E w/e 24/04/1965 5E Nuneaton
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45272 w/e 18/07/1964 6B Mold Junction w/e 07/11/1964 2E w/e 03/04/1965 2B Oxley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45283 w/e 19/09/1964 6B Mold Junction w/e 07/11/1964 2E w/e 03/04/1965 2B Oxley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45422 w/e 19/09/1964 6B Mold Junction w/e 07/11/1964 2E w/e 06/03/1965 5D Stoke
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44580 w/e 07/11/1964 2F Bescot w/e 21/11/1964 2E      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44859 w/e 18/04/1964 2J Aston w/e 16/01/1965 2E w/e 06/03/1965 2J Aston
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45052 w/e 02/07/1960 21D Aston w/e 16/01/1965 2E w/e 06/03/1965 2J Aston
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45058 01/01/1948 3D Aston w/e 16/01/1965 2E w/e 06/03/1965 2J Aston
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5239 16/01/1965 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 30/01/1965 2E 18/04/1966 D02 Birmingham Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5245 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 30/01/1965 2E 18/04/1966 D02 Birmingham Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5266 16/01/1965 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 30/01/1965 2E 18/04/1966 D02 Birmingham Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7508 05/11/1964 16A Toton (New) w/e 30/01/1965 2E 18/04/1966 D02 Birmingham Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7518 12/12/1964 16A Toton (New) w/e 30/01/1965 2E 18/04/1966 D02 Birmingham Division
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3106 w/e 30/01/1965 2B Oxley w/e 27/02/1965 2E w/e 01/05/1965 2D Banbury
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48220 w/e 07/11/1964 2B Oxley w/e 27/02/1965 2E w/e 11/03/1967 5B Crewe South
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 D43 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 06/03/1965 2E w/e 08/05/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 D67 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 06/03/1965 2E w/e 08/05/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 D69 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 06/03/1965 2E w/e 08/05/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 D134 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 06/03/1965 2E w/e 08/05/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5298 w/e 24/10/1964 16D Nottingham w/e 06/03/1965 2E 18/04/1966 D02 Birmingham Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7519 06/01/1965 D16 (New) w/e 06/03/1965 2E w/e 13/03/1965 D16 Nottingham Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7520 22/12/1964 16A Toton (New) w/e 06/03/1965 2E 18/04/1966 D02 Birmingham Division
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5811 w/e 05/10/1963 41f Wath w/e 20/03/1965 2E w/e 27/03/1965 41C Wath
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5851 w/e 02/05/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 03/04/1965 2E w/e 10/04/1965 41A Tinsley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44873 4w/e 14/06/1958 3A Bescot w/e 03/04/1965 2E w/e 19/06/1965 5B Crewe South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44910 w/e 02/09/1961 21B Bescot w/e 03/04/1965 2E w/e 19/06/1965 5B Crewe South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45180 w/e 25/06/1960 21B Bescot w/e 03/04/1965 2E w/e 19/06/1965 5B Crewe South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45410 w/e 15/04/1961 21B Bescot w/e 03/04/1965 2E w/e 19/06/1965 2F Bescot
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1834 31/03/1965 D16 Nottingham Division (New) w/e 10/04/1965 2E 18/04/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5242 16/01/1965 D14 London (Midland) w/e 10/04/1965 2E w/e 07/08/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5243 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 10/04/1965 2E 18/04/1966 D02 Birmingham Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5246 16/01/1965 D14 London (Midland) w/e 10/04/1965 2E 18/04/1966 D02 Birmingham Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5247 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 10/04/1965 2E 18/04/1966 D02 Birmingham Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5281 16/01/1965 D14 London (Midland) w/e 10/04/1965 2E 18/04/1966 D02 Birmingham Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5284 16/01/1965 D14 London (Midland) w/e 10/04/1965 2E 18/04/1966 D02 Birmingham Division
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5683 w/e 02/05/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 01/05/1965 2E w/e 15/05/1965 41A Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1814 25/02/1965 D16 Nottingham Division (New) w/e 08/05/1965 2E 18/04/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR)
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5828 w/e 03/04/1965 41C Wath w/e 15/05/1965 2E w/e 29/05/1965 41C Wath
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5538 w/e 05/10/1963 41f Wath w/e 05/06/1965 2E w/e 12/06/1965 41C Wath
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5830 w/e 18/01/1964 41C Wath w/e 12/06/1965 2E w/e 03/07/1965 41C Wath
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1813 w/e 27/02/1965 5A Crewe North w/e 19/06/1965 2E 18/04/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR)
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1815 w/e 27/02/1965 5A Crewe North w/e 19/06/1965 2E 18/04/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5193 16/01/1965 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 19/06/1965 2E 18/04/1966 D02 Birmingham Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5202 16/01/1965 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 19/06/1965 2E 18/04/1966 D02 Birmingham Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5223 w/e 06/02/1965 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 19/06/1965 2E 18/04/1966 D02 Birmingham Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7585 w/e 10/10/1964 16C Derby w/e 19/06/1965 2E 18/04/1966 D02 Birmingham Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7596 w/e 24/10/1964 16C Derby w/e 19/06/1965 2E 18/04/1966 D02 Birmingham Division
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48016 w/e 09/01/1965 2B Oxley w/e 19/06/1965 2E w/e 27/11/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48755 w/e 09/01/1965 2B Oxley w/e 19/06/1965 2E m/e 09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48762 w/e 14/11/1964 2C Stourbridge Junction w/e 19/06/1965 2E w/e 26/02/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46505 w/e 24/10/1964 2L Leamington w/e 19/06/1965 2E w/e 06/08/1966 9D Newton Heath
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5839 w/e 07/03/1964 41C Wath w/e 17/07/1965 2E w/e 24/07/1965 41C Wath
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7519 w/e 13/03/1965 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 17/07/1965 2E 18/04/1966 D02 Birmingham Division
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76052 w/e 29/05/1965 2B Oxley w/e 17/07/1965 2E w/e 07/08/1965 6A Chester (MR)
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92028 w/e 06/03/1965 2D Banbury w/e 17/07/1965 2E m/e 10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44057 w/e 05/12/1964 2F Bescot w/e 17/07/1965 2E w/e 13/11/1965 2F Bescot
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5843 w/e 02/05/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 24/07/1965 2E w/e 21/08/1965 41A Tinsley
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5856 w/e 21/08/1965 91M To London Midland Region w/e 28/08/1965 2E w/e 18/09/1965 41A Tinsley
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5827 w/e 05/10/1963 41f Wath w/e 02/10/1965 2E w/e 09/10/1965 91M To London Midland Region
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48385 w/e 15/05/1965 1H Northampton w/e 02/10/1965 2E w/e 17/09/1966 6C Croes Newydd
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48603 01/01/1948 1A Willesden w/e 02/10/1965 2E w/e 11/03/1967 6A Chester (MR)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3020 18/04/1953 3D Aston (New) w/e 16/10/1965 2E 3w/e 06/10/1973 To Store
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3107 w/e 01/05/1965 2J Aston w/e 16/10/1965 2E w/e 14/11/1970 1A Willesden
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3774 w/e 05/11/1960 21D Aston w/e 16/10/1965 2E w/e 16/10/1971 36A Doncaster
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3775 w/e 26/11/1960 21D Aston w/e 16/10/1965 2E w/e 16/10/1971 36A Doncaster
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3838 w/e 05/11/1960 21D Aston w/e 16/10/1965 2E w/e 20/05/1972 30A Stratford
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76040 w/e 30/01/1965 2J Aston w/e 16/10/1965 2E w/e 10/09/1966 6C Croes Newydd
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46492 12/1951 3D Aston (New) w/e 16/10/1965 2E w/e 15/10/1966 9L Buxton (LNWR)
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92074 w/e 19/06/1965 2D Banbury w/e 03/01/1966 2E w/e 28/05/1966 6C Croes Newydd
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48101 w/e 14/03/1964 2F Bescot w/e 03/01/1966 2E m/e 09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48375 2w/e 17/06/1950 3A Bescot w/e 03/01/1966 2E w/e 03/12/1966 5D Stoke
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48522 w/e 23/06/1962 21B Bescot w/e 03/01/1966 2E w/e 03/12/1966 5D Stoke
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48725 4w/e 08/09/1951 3A Bescot w/e 03/01/1966 2E w/e 11/03/1967 5B Crewe South
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48729 w/e 19/09/1964 2F Bescot w/e 03/01/1966 2E w/e 11/03/1967 5D Stoke
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76086 w/e 27/03/1965 2F Bescot w/e 26/03/1966 2E w/e 18/06/1966 6F Machynlleth
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48336 w/e 02/10/1965 2F Bescot w/e 26/03/1966 2E w/e 11/03/1967 5B Crewe South
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48517 w/e 02/10/1965 2F Bescot w/e 26/03/1966 2E w/e 04/02/1967 10D Lostock Hall
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48529 w/e 06/01/1962 21B Bescot w/e 26/03/1966 2E w/e 04/03/1967 8A Edge Hill
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48556 4w/e 08/09/1956 3A Bescot w/e 26/03/1966 2E w/e 18/03/1967 10D Lostock Hall
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48659 w/e 19/09/1964 2F Bescot w/e 26/03/1966 2E w/e 21/05/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46421 w/e 11/08/1962 21B Bescot w/e 26/03/1966 2E m/e 10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46429 w/e 28/04/1962 21B Bescot w/e 26/03/1966 2E m/e 07/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46445 w/e 25/05/1963 21B Bescot w/e 26/03/1966 2E m/e 07/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46490       w/e 26/03/1966 2E w/e 06/08/1966 9D Newton Heath
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45067 w/e 19/09/1964 2F Bescot w/e 26/03/1966 2E w/e 28/05/1966 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45410 w/e 19/06/1965 2F Bescot w/e 26/03/1966 2E m/e 09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92029 w/e 28/05/1966 6C Croes Newydd w/e 06/08/1966 2E w/e 10/12/1966 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92013 w/e 12/06/1965 2D Banbury w/e 10/09/1966 2E m/e 10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92128 w/e 18/07/1964 2D Banbury w/e 10/09/1966 2E w/e 12/11/1966 10A Carnforth
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48153 01/01/1948 31E Dawsholm w/e 17/09/1966 2E w/e 04/02/1967 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92030 w/e 12/06/1965 2D Banbury w/e 08/10/1966 2E w/e 29/10/1966 56A Wakefield
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92234 w/e 19/09/1964 2D Banbury w/e 08/10/1966 2E w/e 10/12/1966 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3049 7w/e 19/06/1966 86A Cardiff Canton w/e 15/10/1966 2E w/e 10/12/1966 6D Shrewsbury
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92002 w/e 07/11/1964 2A Tyseley w/e 12/11/1966 2E w/e 10/12/1966 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92223 w/e 23/05/1964 2A Tyseley w/e 12/11/1966 2E w/e 10/12/1966 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48073 w/e 22/10/1966 16B Colwick w/e 10/12/1966 2E w/e 11/03/1967 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48128 w/e 18/06/1966 16E Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 10/12/1966 2E w/e 11/03/1967 5D Stoke
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48645 w/e 18/12/1965 40E Colwick w/e 10/12/1966 2E w/e 11/03/1967 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48538 w/e 22/10/1966 16B Colwick w/e 04/02/1967 2E w/e 11/03/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48690 w/e 22/10/1966 16B Colwick w/e 04/02/1967 2E w/e 11/03/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48728 w/e 24/09/1966 16B Colwick w/e 04/02/1967 2E w/e 11/03/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3027 w/e 22/04/1967 2F Bescot w/e 07/10/1967 2E w/e 09/01/1971 1A Willesden
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3985 13/08/1960 84E Tyseley (New) w/e 07/10/1967 2E w/e 30/10/1971 64B Haymarket
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12112 w/e 19/08/1967 2F Bescot w/e 02/11/1968 2E 31/10/1969 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4132 w/e 14/07/1962 14A Cricklewood East w/e 07/12/1968 2E w/e 04/01/1969 1A Willesden
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4133 w/e 14/07/1962 14A Cricklewood East w/e 07/12/1968 2E w/e 04/01/1969 1A Willesden
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3221 4w/e 09/07/1967 70B Feltham w/e 04/01/1969 2E w/e 01/02/1969 5A Crewe Diesel
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3511 9w/e 18/03/1968 91M To London Midland Region w/e 17/05/1969 2E w/e 24/04/1971 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3864 19/12/1959 17A Derby (New) w/e 17/05/1969 2E w/e 06/09/1969 15A Leicester Midland
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4149 w/e 30/10/1965 15A Leicester Midland w/e 06/09/1969 2E 30/09/2008 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4138 w/e 27/09/1969 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 01/11/1969 2E m/e 30/11/1979 WN Willesden
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3102 5w/e 27/09/1969 82C Swindon w/e 06/12/1969 2E w/e 24/01/1970 8J Allerton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3103 7w/e 27/07/1968 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) w/e 06/12/1969 2E w/e 14/02/1970 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4150 22/10/1962 17B Burton (New) w/e 12/09/1970 2E      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3112 w/e 20/09/1969 2A Tyseley w/e 08/05/1971 2E w/e 20/05/1972 30A Stratford
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3864 w/e 06/09/1969 15A Leicester Midland w/e 18/12/1971 2E 2w/e 01/01/1972 15A Leicester Midland
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3951 4w/e 18/06/1960 84E Tyseley w/e 08/01/1972 2E 3w/e 03/05/1975 BS Bescot
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3510 w/e 19/06/1971 5A Crewe Diesel w/e 15/04/1972 2E 27/07/1988 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4006 7w/e 29/05/1970 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) w/e 15/07/1972 2E w/e 13/10/1973 AN Allerton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3700 2w/e 23/12/1972 1A Willesden w/e 27/01/1973 2E      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3764 w/e 08/05/1971 5A Crewe Diesel w/e 03/02/1973 2E      
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6773 w/e 09/10/1971 31B March w/e 23/06/1973 SY w/e 21/07/1973 MC March
Diesel 37 Co-Co 37078 w/e 31/03/1973 31B March w/e 21/07/1973 SY w/e 27/10/1973 MR March
Diesel 37 Co-Co 37120 w/e 07/10/1972 31B March w/e 27/10/1973 SY w/e 15/12/1973 MR March
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3426 w/e 18/04/1970 16C Derby w/e 24/11/1973 SY w/e 12/01/1974 BS Bescot
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3908 w/e 01/07/1972 2A Tyseley w/e 09/02/1974 SY 31/08/2005 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3908 5w/e 01/07/1972 91M To London Midland Region w/e 09/02/1974 SY 31/08/2005 Withdrawn
Diesel 37 Co-Co 37127 w/e 08/05/1971 41A Tinsley w/e 23/02/1974 SY w/e 09/03/1974 TI Tinsley
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08134 w/e 30/06/1973 KM Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 06/07/1974 SY 20/08/1981 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08647 2w/e 08/02/1975 91M To London Midland Region 3w/e 03/05/1975 SY 02/04/1997 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08647 w/e 08/02/1975 BS Bescot 3w/e 03/05/1975 SY 02/04/1997 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08893 4w/e 24/01/1970 82A Bristol Bath Road w/e 14/06/1975 SY 26/06/1998 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08928 w/e 15/03/1975 BS Bescot 2w/e 24/01/1976 SY 29/05/1988 AF Ashford Chart Leacon
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08635 w/e 24/11/1973 CD Cricklewood East m/e 30/11/1979 SY 28/02/2007 Withdrawn