Depot: Selby
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Selby | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 647 | m/e | 12/1907 (New) | SEL | on | 28/03/1938 | MAL | Malton | ||||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1136 | m/e | 12/1910 (New) | SEL | on | 16/05/1925 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 661 | m/e | 07/1911 (New) | SEL | on | 25/04/1938 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1248 | m/e | 02/1913 (New) | SEL | on | 25/10/1925 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1276 | m/e | 05/1913 (New) | SEL | on | 02/04/1924 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1283 | m/e | 05/1913 (New) | SEL | on | 08/11/1925 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1288 | m/e | 06/1913 (New) | SEL | on | 16/08/1939 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1292 | m/e | 06/1913 (New) | SEL | on | 27/08/1924 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1362 | m/e | 08/1913 (New) | SEL | on | 18/11/1929 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2214 | m/e | 05/1917 (New) | SEL | on | 05/07/1934 | SUN | Sunderland | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2219 | m/e | 06/1917 (New) | SEL | on | 07/08/1939 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2224 | m/e | 08/1917 (New) | SEL | on | 18/11/1929 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2226 | m/e | 09/1917 (New) | SEL | on | 18/11/1929 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2228 | m/e | 10/1917 (New) | SEL | on | 17/02/1925 | SCA | Scarborough | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2251 | m/e | 07/1919 (New) | SEL | on | 18/11/1929 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2273 | m/e | 05/1920 (New) | SEL | on | 18/11/1929 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2283 | m/e | 06/1920 (New) | SEL | on | 18/11/1929 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 915 | m/e | 09/1920 | YK | York (North) (New) | m/e | 05/1923 | SEL | on | 19/03/1924 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2368 | on | 19/02/1923 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 30/05/1923 | SEL | on | 01/09/1923 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 1211 | y/e | 1924 | SEL | on | 11/03/1935 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 1212 | y/e | 1924 | SEL | on | 26/04/1934 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 578 | m/e | 06/1907 | HLS | Hull Springhead (New) | on | 22/03/1924 | SEL | on | 05/02/1938 | GHD | Gateshead |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1032 | on | 06/09/1922 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 22/03/1924 | SEL | on | 18/08/1925 | HLS | Hull Springhead |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1271 | m/e | 04/1913 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 01/07/1924 | SEL | on | 01/09/1925 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2256 | m/e | 1924 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | m/e | 1925 | SEL | on | 19/06/1939 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1149 | on | 01/10/1924 | SCA | Scarborough | on | 17/02/1925 | SEL | on | 13/08/1934 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | 2113 | on | 07/02/1925 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 07/07/1925 | SEL | on | 28/09/1925 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1250 | on | 12/01/1923 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 25/10/1925 | SEL | on | 19/06/1939 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1280 | on | 22/05/1924 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 08/11/1925 | SEL | on | 10/06/1939 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2499 | m/e | 03/1907 | HLS | Hull Springhead (New) | on | 18/11/1929 | SEL | on | 02/01/1931 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2504 | m/e | 05/1907 | HLS | Hull Springhead (New) | on | 18/11/1929 | SEL | on | 01/01/1931 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2505 | m/e | 05/1907 | HLS | Hull Springhead (New) | on | 18/11/1929 | SEL | on | 01/01/1931 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2506 | m/e | 06/1907 | HLS | Hull Springhead (New) | on | 18/11/1929 | SEL | on | 01/01/1931 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2507 | m/e | 06/1907 | HLS | Hull Springhead (New) | on | 18/11/1929 | SEL | on | 01/01/1931 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2508 | on | 31/01/1925 | CUD | Cudworth | on | 18/11/1929 | SEL | on | 02/01/1931 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2509 | m/e | 10/1907 | HLS | Hull Springhead (New) | on | 18/11/1929 | SEL | on | 10/08/1931 | MAR | March |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2511 | m/e | 10/1907 | HLS | Hull Springhead (New) | on | 18/11/1929 | SEL | on | 29/12/1930 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2225 | on | 20/12/1924 | SKN | Stockton | on | 03/07/1930 | SEL | on | 07/06/1934 | AFP | Annfield Plain |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2245 | m/e | 1925 | SKN | Stockton | on | 03/07/1930 | SEL | on | 19/06/1939 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2284 | m/e | 07/1920 | SKN | Stockton (New) | on | 03/07/1930 | SEL | on | 19/06/1939 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2286 | m/e | 07/1920 | SKN | Stockton (New) | on | 03/07/1930 | SEL | on | 17/08/1939 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 624 | on | 19/07/1928 | SKN | Stockton | on | 27/11/1930 | SEL | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 626 | on | 19/07/1928 | SKN | Stockton | on | 27/11/1930 | SEL | on | 06/09/1941 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 628 | on | 19/07/1928 | SKN | Stockton | on | 27/11/1930 | SEL | on | 03/09/1932 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 630 | on | 24/05/1928 | SKN | Stockton | on | 27/11/1930 | SEL | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2503 | on | 07/04/1930 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 29/12/1930 | SEL | on | 08/08/1931 | MAR | March |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2505 | on | 01/01/1931 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 30/07/1931 | SEL | on | 06/08/1931 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2499 | on | 02/01/1931 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 31/07/1931 | SEL | on | 06/08/1931 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2506 | on | 01/01/1931 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 06/08/1931 | SEL | on | 13/08/1931 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2507 | on | 06/01/1931 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 10/08/1931 | SEL | on | 13/08/1931 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2509 | on | 10/08/1931 | MAR | March | on | 21/09/1931 | SEL | on | 01/10/1931 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2503 | on | 08/08/1931 | MAR | March | on | 22/10/1931 | SEL | on | 30/10/1931 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2504 | on | 15/07/1931 | MAR | March | on | 22/10/1931 | SEL | on | 30/10/1931 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2508 | on | 14/09/1931 | MAR | March | on | 23/10/1931 | SEL | on | 30/10/1931 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 905 | on | 05/05/1931 | SKN | Stockton | on | 13/08/1934 | SEL | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2249 | m/e | 1934 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 02/10/1935 | SEL | on | 07/12/1935 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 1028 | H | 12/1935 | SEL | on | 01/01/1948 | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | 4347 | S | 01/1936 | SEL | on | 01/01/1948 | IMM | Immingham | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | 4447 | S | 01/1936 | YK | York (North) | on | 17/06/1936 | SEL | on | 29/08/1936 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 797 | on | 09/03/1924 | YK | York (North) | on | 08/09/1936 | SEL | on | 25/11/1937 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 631 | on | 29/05/1933 | GHD | Gateshead | on | 10/02/1938 | SEL | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 647 | on | 28/03/1938 | MAL | Malton | on | 29/05/1939 | SEL | on | 21/11/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1534 | on | 12/10/1938 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 12/06/1939 | SEL | on | 21/10/1939 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 650 | m/e | 06/1903 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) (New) | on | 12/06/1939 | SEL | on | 06/02/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1110 | on | 07/11/1938 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 16/06/1939 | SEL | on | 14/11/1948 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 646 | on | 12/06/1934 | DAR | Darlington | on | 24/06/1939 | SEL | on | 22/08/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1186 | on | 07/11/1938 | DAR | Darlington | on | 26/06/1939 | SEL | on | 14/02/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 769 | on | 22/04/1939 | DAR | Darlington | on | 27/06/1939 | SEL | on | 21/12/1946 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1696 | on | 07/11/1938 | DAR | Darlington | on | 29/06/1939 | SEL | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1215 | on | 13/05/1939 | DAR | Darlington | on | 13/07/1939 | SEL | on | 28/03/1943 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1031 | on | 07/01/1935 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 15/07/1939 | SEL | on | 28/03/1943 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1477 | on | 29/10/1934 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) (New) | on | 31/07/1939 | SEL | on | 23/10/1939 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 443 | on | 07/11/1938 | DAR | Darlington | on | 02/08/1939 | SEL | on | 28/03/1943 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2221 | m/e | 06/1917 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates (New) | on | 07/10/1939 | SEL | on | 14/11/1948 | 20D | Normanton |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2249 | on | 01/07/1939 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 07/10/1939 | SEL | on | 16/06/1957 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 1212 | on | 26/04/1934 | YK | York (North) | on | 23/10/1939 | SEL | on | 10/07/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1477 | on | 23/10/1939 | YK | York (North) | on | 27/02/1940 | SEL | on | 20/07/1940 | SBK | Starbeck |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2735 | on | 22/11/1939 | YK | York (North) | on | 29/02/1940 | SEL | on | 01/10/1940 | CAR | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1534 | on | 21/10/1939 | YK | York (North) | on | 29/02/1940 | SEL | on | 28/03/1943 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1535 | on | 11/02/1938 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 29/02/1940 | SEL | on | 20/07/1940 | SBK | Starbeck |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1560 | on | 07/04/1938 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 29/02/1940 | SEL | on | 20/07/1940 | SBK | Starbeck |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1835 | on | 08/04/1938 | CAR | Carlisle Canal (New) | on | 01/01/1941 | SEL | on | 28/03/1943 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2230 | on | 17/04/1939 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 06/09/1941 | SEL | on | 17/08/1952 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 1526 | on | 20/05/1936 | SCA | Scarborough | on | 06/10/1941 | SEL | on | 08/07/1942 | SBK | Starbeck |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 1526 | on | 08/07/1942 | SBK | Starbeck | on | 01/08/1942 | SEL | on | 12/03/1945 | SCA | Scarborough |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 1530 | H | 12/1935 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 19/10/1942 | SEL | on | 12/03/1945 | SCA | Scarborough |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2290 | on | 28/03/1928 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 28/03/1943 | SEL | on | 06/02/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2292 | m/e | 10/1920 | BOR | Borough Gardens (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | SEL | on | 11/09/1944 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2225 | on | 28/03/1943 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 04/12/1943 | SEL | on | 08/06/1958 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | 5044 | on | 06/05/1944 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 17/09/1944 | SEL | on | 13/12/1944 | GHD | Gateshead |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 644 | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton | on | 22/10/1944 | SEL | on | 11/06/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1696 | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 23/07/1945 | SEL | on | 20/02/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3262 | on | 28/03/1943 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 20/07/1947 | SEL | on | 22/08/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3408 | on | 29/09/1946 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 05/10/1947 | SEL | on | 27/01/1952 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3429 | on | 12/09/1944 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 05/10/1947 | SEL | on | 13/09/1959 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3436 | on | 02/09/1944 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 05/10/1947 | SEL | on | 25/01/1953 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3440 | on | 24/08/1944 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 05/10/1947 | SEL | on | 12/10/1952 | 50G | Whitby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3449 | on | 11/09/1944 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 05/10/1947 | SEL | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3450 | on | 12/09/1944 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 05/10/1947 | SEL | on | 06/02/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3451 | on | 12/09/1944 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 05/10/1947 | SEL | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3456 | on | 08/09/1944 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 05/10/1947 | SEL | on | 27/01/1952 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 2340 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | on | 27/02/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 2341 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | on | 07/03/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 2348 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | on | 27/02/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 2372 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | w/e | 20/11/1948 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 2374 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | on | 14/10/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 2376 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | m/e | 02/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 2378 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | on | 05/11/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 2381 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62386 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | on | 19/10/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5042 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 52CREED | |||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5043 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | w/e | 20/11/1948 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5066 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | on | 21/11/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5072 | H | 12/1935 | DAR | Darlington | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | w/e | 12/02/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5075 | H | 12/1935 | AUK | West Auckland | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5093 | H | 12/1935 | DAR | Darlington | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | w/e | 01/05/1948 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5105 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 52CREED | |||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5120 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | w/e | 01/05/1948 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5827 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5854 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 50F | Malton | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5855 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5858 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 50F | Malton | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5859 | H | 12/1935 | WBY | Whitby | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5874 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | w/e | 25/02/1951 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5875 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5881 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5882 | m/e | 11/1935 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5890 | m/e | 11/1935 | ARD | Ardsley | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | w/e | 16/07/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5891 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8285 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | on | 04/10/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8313 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | w/e | 19/06/1948 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | J73 | 0-6-0T | 8356 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | on | 18/08/1958 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J73 | 0-6-0T | 8357 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | on | 08/01/1958 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J73 | 0-6-0T | 8362 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | on | 09/09/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 8039 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | w/e | 20/11/1948 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 8040 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | w/e | 20/11/1948 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 9914 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 68143 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | on | 17/05/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 8156 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | on | 03/06/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 8158 | H | 12/1935 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | w/e | 24/12/1949 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 68161 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 50F | Malton | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 2384 | on | 01/01/1948 | WHL | West Hartlepool | w/e | 10/01/1948 | SEL | w/e | 15/01/1949 | SBK | Starbeck |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3286 | on | 28/03/1943 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 15/02/1948 | SEL | w/e | 21/02/1948 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3286 | on | 15/02/1948 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 21/02/1948 | SEL | on | 11/04/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7250 | on | 01/01/1948 | DAR | Darlington | w/e | 06/03/1948 | SEL | on | 16/09/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8268 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 19/06/1948 | SEL | on | 26/05/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3294 | on | 28/03/1943 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 27/06/1948 | SEL | w/e | 03/07/1948 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3294 | on | 27/06/1948 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 03/07/1948 | SEL | on | 03/11/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 2366 | on | 01/01/1948 | SBK | Starbeck | w/e | 21/08/1948 | SEL | on | 13/03/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7286 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | SBK | Starbeck | w/e | 18/09/1948 | SEL | on | 08/10/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62387 | on | 01/01/1948 | WHL | West Hartlepool | w/e | 02/10/1948 | SEL | w/e | 20/11/1948 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3336 | on | 28/03/1943 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 14/11/1948 | SEL | w/e | 20/11/1948 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | 68433 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | SEL | on | 05/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5068 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 20/11/1948 | SEL | w/e | 09/04/1949 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3336 | on | 14/11/1948 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 20/11/1948 | SEL | on | 16/10/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3378 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | NMN | on | 26/12/1948 | SEL | w/e | 01/01/1949 | SEL | Selby | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3378 | on | 26/12/1948 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 01/01/1949 | SEL | on | 03/05/1953 | 50G | Whitby |
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | 69933 | on | 13/12/1944 | GHD | Gateshead | on | 06/02/1949 | SEL | w/e | 12/02/1949 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | 69931 | on | 13/12/1944 | GHD | Gateshead | on | 06/02/1949 | SEL | w/e | 12/02/1949 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63255 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 06/02/1949 | SEL | w/e | 12/02/1949 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | 69933 | on | 06/02/1949 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 12/02/1949 | SEL | on | 11/12/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | 69931 | on | 06/02/1949 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 12/02/1949 | SEL | on | 26/11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63255 | on | 06/02/1949 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 12/02/1949 | SEL | on | 03/11/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5793 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | Sunderland | w/e | 26/03/1949 | SEL | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65094 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | DAR | Darlington | w/e | 09/04/1949 | SEL | m/e | 02/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 2384 | w/e | 15/01/1949 | SBK | Starbeck | w/e | 28/05/1949 | SEL | w/e | 23/07/1949 | SBK | Starbeck |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63278 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 10/07/1949 | SEL | w/e | 16/07/1949 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63280 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 10/07/1949 | SEL | w/e | 16/07/1949 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63285 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 10/07/1949 | SEL | w/e | 16/07/1949 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63278 | on | 10/07/1949 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 16/07/1949 | SEL | on | 30/08/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63280 | on | 10/07/1949 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 16/07/1949 | SEL | on | 25/10/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63285 | on | 10/07/1949 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 16/07/1949 | SEL | on | 27/09/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 9867 | on | 12/10/1938 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 17/07/1949 | SEL | w/e | 23/07/1949 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69879 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 17/07/1949 | SEL | w/e | 23/07/1949 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 9867 | on | 17/07/1949 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 23/07/1949 | SEL | on | 01/07/1951 | 50E | Scarborough |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69879 | on | 17/07/1949 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 23/07/1949 | SEL | on | 01/07/1951 | 50E | Scarborough |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63319 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | DAR | Darlington | on | 20/11/1949 | SEL | w/e | 26/11/1949 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63348 | w/e | 10/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 20/11/1949 | SEL | w/e | 26/11/1949 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63431 | w/e | 10/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 20/11/1949 | SEL | w/e | 26/11/1949 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63448 | w/e | 10/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 24/11/1949 | SEL | w/e | 26/11/1949 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63319 | on | 20/11/1949 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 26/11/1949 | SEL | on | 18/04/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63348 | on | 20/11/1949 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 26/11/1949 | SEL | on | 25/01/1953 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63431 | on | 20/11/1949 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 26/11/1949 | SEL | on | 27/01/1952 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63448 | on | 24/11/1949 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 26/11/1949 | SEL | on | 13/09/1959 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62363 | on | 01/01/1948 | SBK | Starbeck | m/e | 12/1949 | SEL | w/e | 24/12/1949 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63395 | w/e | 10/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 01/12/1949 | SEL | w/e | 03/12/1949 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63395 | on | 01/12/1949 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 03/12/1949 | SEL | on | 14/06/1959 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62363 | m/e | 12/1949 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 24/12/1949 | SEL | on | 20/03/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 8158 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 24/12/1949 | SEL | on | 26/09/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63290 | w/e | 30/04/1949 | MID | Middlesbrough | on | 15/01/1950 | SEL | w/e | 21/01/1950 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63290 | on | 15/01/1950 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 21/01/1950 | SEL | on | 25/07/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65039 | w/e | 03/09/1949 | MAL | Malton | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 50C | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 2395 | on | 01/01/1948 | SBK | Starbeck | w/e | 30/04/1950 | 50C | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63423 | w/e | 19/02/1949 | HAV | Haverton Hill | on | 24/09/1950 | 50C | on | 14/06/1959 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63425 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | HAV | Haverton Hill | on | 24/09/1950 | 50C | on | 16/06/1957 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63453 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | HAV | Haverton Hill | on | 24/09/1950 | 50C | on | 17/08/1952 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62343 | on | 01/01/1948 | SBK | Starbeck | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50C | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62384 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | SBK | Starbeck | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50C | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62397 | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50C | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62342 | on | 01/01/1948 | SBK | Starbeck | w/e | 15/10/1950 | 50C | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62343 | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50C | Selby | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50C | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 50FPICK | |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62384 | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50C | Selby | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50C | on | 15/08/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62397 | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50C | Selby | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50C | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69877 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 50E | Scarborough | on | 19/11/1950 | 50C | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62342 | w/e | 15/10/1950 | 50C | Selby | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 50C | on | 13/03/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63363 | on | 05/10/1947 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 26/11/1950 | 50C | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69877 | on | 19/11/1950 | 50C | Selby | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 50C | on | 01/07/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63363 | on | 26/11/1950 | 50C | Selby | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 50C | on | 27/09/1953 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63362 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 03/12/1950 | 50C | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43096 | on | 30/12/1950 (New) | 50C | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50B | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63362 | on | 03/12/1950 | 50C | Selby | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 50C | on | 13/06/1954 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43097 | m/e | 01/1951 (New) | 50C | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62345 | w/e | 14/01/1950 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 50C | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43098 | on | 31/01/1951 (New) | 50C | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43099 | on | 31/01/1951 (New) | 50C | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62345 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 50C | Selby | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 50C | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65647 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 50C | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5663 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 50C | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65698 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 53E | Cudworth | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 50C | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65647 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 50C | Selby | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 50C | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 50G | Whitby |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5663 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 50C | Selby | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 50C | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 50G | Whitby |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65698 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 50C | Selby | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 50C | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62389 | on | 01/01/1948 | SBK | Starbeck | w/e | 16/06/1951 | 50C | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62392 | on | 01/01/1948 | SBK | Starbeck | w/e | 16/06/1951 | 50C | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62389 | w/e | 16/06/1951 | 50C | Selby | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 50C | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62392 | w/e | 16/06/1951 | 50C | Selby | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 50C | w/e | 31/05/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67293 | w/e | 05/02/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 50C | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43052 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 50C | w/e | 16/05/1959 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67293 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 50C | Selby | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 50C | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43123 | on | 28/08/1951 (New) | 50C | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69861 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 50G | Whitby | on | 21/10/1951 | 50C | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69867 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 50E | Scarborough | on | 21/10/1951 | 50C | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69877 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 21/10/1951 | 50C | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69885 | on | 12/03/1945 | SCA | Scarborough | on | 21/10/1951 | 50C | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69861 | on | 21/10/1951 | 50C | Selby | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 50C | on | 11/05/1952 | 50G | Whitby |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69867 | on | 21/10/1951 | 50C | Selby | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 50C | on | 08/06/1952 | 50E | Scarborough |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69877 | on | 21/10/1951 | 50C | Selby | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 50C | on | 11/05/1952 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69885 | on | 21/10/1951 | 50C | Selby | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 50C | on | 08/06/1952 | 50E | Scarborough |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63450 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 27/01/1952 | 50C | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63450 | on | 27/01/1952 | 50C | Selby | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 50C | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42083 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 50C | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 50E | Scarborough |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65675 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 50C | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 50G | Whitby |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65683 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 50C | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65837 | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 50G | Whitby | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 50C | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65888 | 4w/e | 18/08/1951 | 50G | Whitby | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 50C | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65857 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 50G | Whitby | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 50C | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65888 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 50C | Selby | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 50C | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | 68438 | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 50C | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63440 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 50G | Whitby | on | 21/12/1952 | 50C | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63440 | on | 21/12/1952 | 50C | Selby | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 50C | on | 08/06/1958 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76021 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 50B | Neville Hill | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 50C | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61422 | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 07/06/1953 | 50C | on | 29/05/1955 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90424 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | YK | York (North) | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 50C | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63378 | on | 03/05/1953 | 50G | Whitby | on | 01/11/1953 | 50C | on | 16/06/1957 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76021 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 50F | Malton | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 50C | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | 68413 | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 50C | on | 11/05/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90670 | w/e | 20/08/1950 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 50C | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43125 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 52B | Heaton | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 50C | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65861 | on | 30/04/1950 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 50C | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65885 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 50C | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 68150 | on | 01/01/1948 | MAL | Malton | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 50C | on | 04/05/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 68180 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | Gateshead | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 50C | on | 21/05/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64730 | on | 17/11/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 26/09/1954 | 50C | on | 15/09/1957 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64850 | w/e | 04/02/1950 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 26/09/1954 | 50C | on | 07/08/1955 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64922 | on | 01/10/1950 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 26/09/1954 | 50C | on | 26/06/1955 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64725 | on | 02/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | on | 10/10/1954 | 50C | on | 15/09/1957 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64904 | on | 13/06/1954 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | on | 10/10/1954 | 50C | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | 68429 | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 50C | on | 23/01/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62343 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 50C | on | 08/10/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61474 | on | 18/07/1954 | 50A | York (North) | on | 29/05/1955 | 50C | on | 20/01/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62349 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 52C | Blaydon | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 50C | on | 02/02/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62387 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 52B | Heaton | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 50C | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 52D | Tweedmouth |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62396 | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 50C | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64860 | on | 13/06/1954 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 07/08/1955 | 50C | on | 30/08/1959 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67273 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 50C | on | 05/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62345 | 4w/e | 18/08/1951 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 50C | on | 11/10/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68275 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | York (North) | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 50C | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43125 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 51F | West Auckland | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 50C | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 53E | Goole |
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 68182 | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 50C | on | 27/01/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 69915 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 50A | York (North) | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 50C | on | 16/03/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61433 | w/e | 03/09/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 23/09/1956 | 50C | on | 14/06/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62755 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 50B | Neville Hill | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 50C | on | 12/11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62761 | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 50B | Neville Hill | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 50C | on | 06/12/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62772 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 50B | Neville Hill | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 50C | on | 24/09/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62775 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 50C | on | 04/12/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 69912 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 51E | Stockton | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 50C | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67311 | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 53D | Bridlington | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 50C | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63348 | on | 25/01/1953 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 16/06/1957 | 50C | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63436 | on | 25/01/1953 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 16/06/1957 | 50C | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61419 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 50A | York (North) | on | 30/06/1957 | 50C | on | 15/09/1957 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61459 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 50A | York (North) | on | 30/06/1957 | 50C | on | 14/06/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62731 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 50A | York (North) | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50C | on | 03/04/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43096 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50B | Neville Hill | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 50C | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65793 | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 50C | on | 16/04/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63432 | on | 15/09/1957 | 51B | Newport (Teeside) | on | 27/10/1957 | 50C | on | 08/06/1958 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61466 | on | 18/07/1954 | 50A | York (North) | on | 09/02/1958 | 50C | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68686 | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 50C | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61469 | on | 08/07/1956 | 52B | Heaton | on | 08/06/1958 | 50C | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61456 | on | 20/11/1955 | 52B | Heaton | on | 08/06/1958 | 50C | on | 14/06/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61458 | on | 20/11/1955 | 52B | Heaton | on | 08/06/1958 | 50C | on | 14/06/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47634 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 50D | Starbeck | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50C | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 53E | Goole |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62730 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 13/09/1958 | 50C | on | 11/12/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43051 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 55B | Stourton | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 50C | w/e | 14/03/1959 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43054 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 50C | w/e | 14/03/1959 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43057 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 50C | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43071 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 50C | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 69910 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 50C | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68948 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 50C | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 69921 | 5w/e | 24/08/1957 | 53E | Goole | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 50C | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65663 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 14/03/1959 | 50C | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65685 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 14/03/1959 | 50C | on | 15/09/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43051 | w/e | 14/03/1959 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 50C | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43054 | w/e | 14/03/1959 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 50C | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77004 | on | 06/04/1959 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 50C | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77013 | on | 06/04/1959 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 50C | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2245 | on | 12/11/1956 | 50B | Neville Hill (New) | on | 14/06/1959 | 50C | on | 05/07/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64818 | on | 14/07/1943 | SBK | Starbeck | on | 14/06/1959 | 50C | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64847 | on | 27/09/1953 | 50D | Starbeck | on | 14/06/1959 | 50C | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64938 | on | 18/04/1954 | 50F | Malton | on | 14/06/1959 | 50C | on | 30/08/1959 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62740 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 50C | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62765 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | SBK | Starbeck | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 50C | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62770 | w/e | 01/05/1948 | SCA | Scarborough | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 50C | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68892 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 51E | Stockton | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 50C | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68941 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51C | West Hartlepool | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 50C | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 56B | Ardsley |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2062 | on | 03/07/1959 (New) | 50C | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64725 | on | 15/09/1957 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 26/07/1959 | 50C | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) |