Depot: Severn Tunnel Junction
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Severn Tunnel Junction | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4319 | on | 01/01/1934 | 66 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | STJ | m/e | 05/1938 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 1870 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | STJ | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||||
Steam | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2649 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | STJ | on | 08/08/1946 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4342 | on | 01/01/1934 | 114 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | STJ | m/e | 05/1938 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5347 | on | 01/01/1934 | 167 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | STJ | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6370 | on | 01/01/1934 | 215 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | STJ | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7230 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | STJ | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7231 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | STJ | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2434 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | STJ | on | 10/1940 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2866 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | STJ | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3818 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | STJ | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2839 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | STJ | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2849 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | STJ | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2849 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | STJ | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2852 | 4w/e | 07/09/1946 | STJ | on | 15/06/1947 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2414 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2460 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 136 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 04/1954 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2635 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | on | 30/08/1947 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2637 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | OXF | Oxford | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | on | 15/09/1947 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2804 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2815 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2819 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2824 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 87F | Llanelli | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2829 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2838 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 08/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4803 | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | TYS | Tyseley |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4801 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 136 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | SRD | Stafford Road | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2884 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2887 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2892 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3150 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 09/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3154 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 10/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3157 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 10/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3159 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 11/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3161 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 12/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3163 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3165 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 07/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3167 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 08/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3168 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 09/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3170 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3172 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 10/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3174 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 03/1958 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3176 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 11/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3177 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 10/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3178 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | LA | Laira | ||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3182 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 08/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3183 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 10/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3184 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 07/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3185 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 02/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3188 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 11/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3189 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 09/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3190 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 03/1958 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3571 | 0-4-2T | 3575 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 10/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3806 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3808 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3831 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | BAN | Banbury | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4851 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 136 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | BAN | Banbury | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4119 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4130 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4137 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4144 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 86F | Tondu | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4148 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7246 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 136 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 81F | Oxford | |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7251 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4262 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4979 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 81C | Southall | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5183 | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | CV.BRY | Barry |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7223 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 136 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7224 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7229 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7239 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | BAN | Banbury | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7202 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 136 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 30/04/1948 | RYR | Radyr | |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7209 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7210 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7216 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5362 | on | 01/01/1934 | 213 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | w/e | 06/09/1952 | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5620 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5625 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5626 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 81E | Didcot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5645 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5706 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 86B | Newport Pill | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5714 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | PILL | Newport Pill | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5729 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5953 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 81C | Southall | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6317 | on | 01/01/1934 | 76 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6377 | on | 01/01/1934 | 174 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 84E | Tyseley | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6386 | on | 01/01/1934 | 126 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6639 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6666 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 07/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6673 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86F | Tondu | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6676 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86F | Tondu | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6689 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6815 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 30/06/1948 | TN | Taunton | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6834 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 30/06/1948 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6871 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6873 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 31/05/1948 | OXY | Oxley | ||||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7429 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7764 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 05/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8799 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9745 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9778 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 88G | Llantrisant | ||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 1752 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 1870 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | TDU | Tondu |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8466 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8467 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | Unclassified | 0-6-2T | 21 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 06/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Unclassified | 0-6-2T | 332 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | m/e | 12/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77106 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4082 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | on | 13/01/1948 | STJ | on | 09/03/1948 | 85 | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3850 | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | m/e | 31/03/1948 | STJ | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77027 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | STJ | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4277 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | m/e | 30/06/1948 | STJ | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4286 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | m/e | 30/06/1948 | STJ | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3175 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | STJ | m/e | 03/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3811 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | STJ | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2861 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXF | Oxford | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | STJ | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2881 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | STJ | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2809 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | TN | Taunton | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | STJ | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4282 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | STJ | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5228 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | LTS | Llantrisant | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | STJ | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5253 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | STJ | m/e | 04/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3843 | on | 15/06/1947 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | STJ | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3844 | on | 15/06/1947 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | STJ | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5214 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | STJ | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 86F | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3838 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXF | Oxford | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | STJ | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4243 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | STJ | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7212 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | STJ | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7230 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | STJ | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7232 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | STJ | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 15xx | 0-6-0PT | 1508 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | PILL | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | STJ | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6679 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | STJ | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 86F | Tondu |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77288 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | Exeter | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 86E | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90201 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 86E | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90201 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 86E | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4908 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 87H | Neyland | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 86E | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8450 | on | 31/08/1949 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 86E | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4908 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 86E | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8450 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 86E | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8401 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 86E | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8401 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 86E | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5169 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 86E | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6872 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | TR | Truro | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 86E | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5169 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86E | m/e | 09/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5201 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86E | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6872 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86E | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7789 | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | PILL | Newport Pill | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86E | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5201 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 86E | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7789 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 86E | m/e | 11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2809 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86E | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2839 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86E | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2844 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86E | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2859 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86E | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2873 | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86E | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3832 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86E | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3849 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | BAN | Banbury | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86E | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6926 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86E | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4275 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 86E | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4970 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 86E | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6909 | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 86E | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2809 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86E | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2839 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86E | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2844 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86E | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2859 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86E | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2873 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86E | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3832 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86E | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3849 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86E | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4151 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86E | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5923 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 84D | Leamington | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86E | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6926 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86E | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4142 | on | 14/10/1948 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 86E | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4142 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 86E | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2811 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 86E | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2882 | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | CHR | Chester West | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 86E | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4990 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 86E | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3866 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXF | Oxford | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 86E | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5948 | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 86E | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2811 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 86E | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2882 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 86E | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4990 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 86E | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2414 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86E | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3852 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86E | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3853 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86E | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4952 | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86E | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90179 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86E | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3866 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 86E | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5948 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 86E | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2414 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86E | m/e | 03/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2895 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86E | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3813 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86E | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3852 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86E | m/e | 04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3853 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86E | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4952 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86E | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90573 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86E | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90179 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86E | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3853 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 86E | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5318 | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 86E | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3853 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 86E | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5318 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 86E | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5902 | on | 15/06/1947 | TN | Taunton | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 86E | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6812 | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 84B | Oxley | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 86E | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7237 | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | LMTN | Leamington | w/e | 06/09/1952 | 86E | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2862 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 86J | Aberdare | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86E | m/e | 04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2893 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86E | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6654 | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86E | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2888 | on | 14/10/1948 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 86E | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4121 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 86E | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 86F | Tondu |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4298 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 86E | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7208 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 86E | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5155 | on | 15/06/1947 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 86E | m/e | 01/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90323 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 86E | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2803 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 81F | Oxford | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 86E | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2815 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 81F | Oxford | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 86E | m/e | 12/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2866 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 86E | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3847 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXF | Oxford | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 86E | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4289 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 86E | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 88J | Aberdare |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2860 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 86E | m/e | 04/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2883 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86B | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 86E | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4941 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 86E | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6672 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 86E | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86F | Tondu |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6102 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 86E | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6114 | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 86E | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6375 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 86E | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4137 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 86E | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4145 | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 86E | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4156 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 86E | m/e | 06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5212 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 86E | m/e | 05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6369 | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 86E | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6386 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 86E | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 88J | Aberdare |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5224 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 86E | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2864 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 86E | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2806 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 86E | m/e | 03/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2808 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | Aberdare | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 86E | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2231 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 86E | m/e | 02/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3806 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 86E | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3808 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 86E | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2292 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86E | m/e | 06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2813 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86E | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2872 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86E | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4142 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86E | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13102 | on | 11/02/1955 (New) | 86E | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13103 | on | 16/02/1955 (New) | 86E | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13104 | on | 23/02/1955 (New) | 86E | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2826 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 86E | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2832 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 86E | m/e | 11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2869 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 86E | m/e | 06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2896 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 86E | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3812 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 86E | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4106 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87E | Landore | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 86E | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4114 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 85D | Kidderminster | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 86E | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 85D | Kidderminster |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4130 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 86B | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 18/06/1955 | 86E | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7426 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 18/06/1955 | 86E | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 85C | Hereford |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2879 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 86E | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2889 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 86E | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3823 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 86E | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5236 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 86E | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5620 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 86E | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5750 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 86E | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5205 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 86B | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 86E | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86B | Newport Pill |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6132 | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 81B | Slough | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 86E | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6642 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 86E | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6155 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 86E | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4215 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 86E | m/e | 10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6119 | on | 15/06/1947 | SLO | Slough | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 86E | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3652 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 86B | Newport Pill | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86E | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 86B | Newport Pill |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6384 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86E | m/e | 06/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2873 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 86E | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5205 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86B | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 86E | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6672 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86F | Tondu | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 86E | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5260 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 86E | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13258 | on | 20/06/1956 | 87F | Llanelli (New) | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 86E | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6119 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 86E | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4217 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 86F | Tondu | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 86E | m/e | 07/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2859 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 86E | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5989 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 86E | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6928 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 86E | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4125 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86E | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4127 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86E | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5166 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86E | m/e | 05/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5181 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86E | m/e | 08/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5382 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86E | m/e | 04/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6166 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86E | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6325 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86E | m/e | 11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6338 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86E | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6362 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86E | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 88J | Aberdare |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7322 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86E | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 88J | Aberdare |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9306 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86E | m/e | 04/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5191 | on | 15/06/1947 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 86E | m/e | 06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5727 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 86E | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2816 | on | 15/06/1947 | BAN | Banbury | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86E | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2847 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | BAN | Banbury | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86E | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4119 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86E | m/e | 09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6102 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86E | m/e | 08/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6114 | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86E | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6134 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 84D | Leamington | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86E | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4130 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 86E | m/e | 07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6118 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 86E | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9619 | on | 15/06/1947 | HFD | Hereford | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 86E | m/e | 07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2826 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 86E | m/e | 09/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4164 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 88A | Radyr | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 86E | m/e | 01/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6338 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 86E | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2821 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 86E | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2847 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 86E | m/e | 03/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2861 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 86E | on | 01/03/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2837 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 86E | m/e | 05/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92231 | on | 31/08/1958 | 86G | Pontypool Road (New) | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 86E | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92232 | on | 31/08/1958 | 86G | Pontypool Road (New) | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 86E | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92233 | on | 31/08/1958 | 86G | Pontypool Road (New) | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 86E | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92234 | on | 31/08/1958 | 86G | Pontypool Road (New) | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 86E | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92235 | on | 31/08/1958 | 86G | Pontypool Road (New) | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 86E | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2867 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86E | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2892 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86E | on | 13/05/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2893 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86E | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7230 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 88C | Barry | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86E | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5336 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86E | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5679 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86E | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6430 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 86E | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5339 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 86E | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3801 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 86E | m/e | 08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3847 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 86E | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 88J | Aberdare |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7206 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 86E | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4927 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 86E | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4988 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 86E | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5381 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 86E | m/e | 09/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5972 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 86E | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5980 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 86E | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4241 | on | 15/06/1947 | TDU | Tondu | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86E | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4297 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86E | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3800 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86E | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3863 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86E | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6905 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86E | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6912 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86E | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4229 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86E | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6363 | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86E | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6140 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 86E | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6424 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 86E | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3856 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 86E | m/e | 10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2895 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 86E | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7308 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 86E | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7793 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 87C | Danygraig | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 86E | m/e | 04/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5110 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 86E | m/e | 12/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4152 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 86E | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2807 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 86E | on | 18/03/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2858 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 86E | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3786 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 86E | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 84J | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3841 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 86E | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3864 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 86E | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2854 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86E | on | 03/10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2865 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86E | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2883 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86E | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3803 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86E | m/e | 07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3822 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86E | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 88J | Aberdare |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3835 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86E | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3848 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86E | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3786 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 86E | m/e | 03/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5243 | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 86E | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 88H | Tondu |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3834 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 86E | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7403 | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 86E | m/e | 01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7212 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 86E | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 86F | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3857 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 86E | m/e | 03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4145 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 86E | on | 18/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3843 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 86E | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 88J | Aberdare |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7217 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 86E | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4131 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 86E | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6125 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 87G | Carmarthen | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 86E | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 87H | Neyland |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7427 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 86E | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6158 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 86E | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 88J | Aberdare |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2857 | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 86E | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 88J | Aberdare |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6362 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 88J | Aberdare | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 86E | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6386 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 88J | Aberdare | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 86E | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7228 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 86E | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6320 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 86E | m/e | 11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6373 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 86E | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3845 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 86E | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 88J | Aberdare |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7250 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 86E | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4248 | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 86E | m/e | 05/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6114 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87H | Neyland | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 86E | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3212 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 86E | m/e | 10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4146 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 86E | m/e | 08/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4159 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 87H | Neyland | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 86E | m/e | 06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4271 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 86E | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 86B | Newport Pill |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4150 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 86E | m/e | 06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4137 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 86E | m/e | 10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4151 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 86E | on | 15/06/1963 | 84D | Leamington |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7325 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 86E | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4128 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 86E | m/e | 06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6633 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 88F | Treherbert | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 86E | on | 01/12/1963 | 2A | Tyseley |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2872 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 86E | on | 26/08/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3859 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 86E | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2884 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 86E | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4144 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 86F | Tondu | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 86E | m/e | 06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4115 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 85C | Hereford | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 86E | m/e | 06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5306 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 86E | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6114 | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 87G | Carmarthen | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 86E | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3838 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 86E | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3700 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 86E | m/e | 02/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3802 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 86E | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5213 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 86E | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2885 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 86E | m/e | 01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5264 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 86H | Aberbeeg | on | 17/06/1963 | 86E | on | 26/07/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4254 | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 86B | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 86E | 4w/e | 27/12/1964 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4277 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 86E | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 86F | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7233 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 86E | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6346 | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 86E | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3843 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 88J | Aberdare | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86E | m/e | 10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3853 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88J | Aberdare | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86E | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4132 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 87H | Neyland | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86E | m/e | 07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4983 | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 87H | Neyland | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86E | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7203 | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86E | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6984 | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 87H | Neyland | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86E | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7917 | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 87H | Neyland | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86E | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5256 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86E | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 88J | Aberdare |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2283 | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 86E | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2836 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 81E | Didcot | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 86E | m/e | 06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3859 | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 86E | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5624 | 4w/e | 18/06/1955 | 86J | Aberdare | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 86E | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5214 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 86E | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 86F | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5235 | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 86E | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6380 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 89A | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 86E | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7310 | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 86E | m/e | 06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7312 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 86E | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2287 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 87H | Neyland | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 86E | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | 86C | Hereford |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3842 | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 86E | m/e | 07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7226 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 86E | m/e | 11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7306 | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 87G | Carmarthen | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 86E | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7339 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 89B | Croes Newydd | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 86E | m/e | 06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2890 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | 86E | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5208 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 86F | Tondu | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 86E | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5243 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 88H | Tondu | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 86E | m/e | 11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7225 | m/e | 05/1964 | Withdrawn | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 (R) | 86E | |||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7211 | m/e | 05/1964 | Withdrawn | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 (R) | 86E | |||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6114 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 86E | m/e | 10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6115 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 86E | m/e | 11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6357 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 86E | m/e | 07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6850 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 86E | m/e | 12/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6872 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 86E | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6876 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 86E | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7320 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 86E | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92214 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86E | m/e | 09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92226 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86E | 2w/e | 01/11/1964 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92250 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86E | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3826 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 86E | m/e | 01/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4978 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 83C | Westbury | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 86E | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5932 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 83C | Westbury | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 86E | 2w/e | 11/04/1965 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5974 | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 86E | m/e | 12/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6955 | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 86E | m/e | 02/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4160 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 88B | Radyr | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 86E | m/e | 06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4671 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 86E | on | 18/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4989 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 83B | Taunton | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 86E | m/e | 11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9616 | on | 15/06/1947 | LTS | Llantrisant | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 86E | m/e | 08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92242 | on | 31/10/1958 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) | 2w/e | 01/11/1964 | 86E | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3823 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 86E | m/e | 07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4107 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86C | Hereford | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 86E | m/e | 06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4157 | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 86G | Pontypool Road | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 86E | m/e | 06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4932 | m/e | 11/1964 | Withdrawn | w/e | 08/11/1964 (R) | 86E | |||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5961 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 86E | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6932 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 86E | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6973 | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 86E | 2w/e | 11/04/1965 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6984 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 86E | 2w/e | 11/04/1965 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7913 | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 86E | m/e | 03/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92236 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 86E | m/e | 03/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92237 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 86E | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92243 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 86E | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3816 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 86E | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7252 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 88B | Radyr | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 86E | m/e | 06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4992 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 86E | m/e | 04/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4993 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 86E | m/e | 02/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6999 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 82D | Westbury | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 86E | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3699 | m/e | 02/1965 | Withdrawn | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 (R) | 86E | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3796 | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 88J | Aberdare | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 86E | m/e | 03/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6978 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 86E | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3686 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 86F | Aberbeeg | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86E | m/e | 07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4258 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 88J | Aberdare | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86E | m/e | 04/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4621 | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 88F | Treherbert | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86E | m/e | 07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5226 | m/e | 03/1965 | Withdrawn | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 (R) | 86E | |||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6971 | on | 18/03/1965 (New) | 86E | w/e | 02/02/1974 | LE | Landore | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7253 | m/e | 04/1965 | Withdrawn | 2w/e | 11/04/1965 (R) | 86E | |||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3816 | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 86E | m/e | 07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4110 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 88B | Radyr | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 86E | m/e | 06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7205 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 86E | m/e | 06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4115 | m/e | 06/1965 | Withdrawn | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 (R) | 86E | |||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92226 | 2w/e | 01/11/1964 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 86E | on | 10/09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9547 | on | 20/07/1965 (New) | 86E | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6815 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 86E | on | 18/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6859 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 86E | on | 18/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7804 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 86E | m/e | 09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9656 | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 88B | Radyr | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 86E | on | 18/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92007 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 86E | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92009 | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 86E | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92238 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 86E | on | 10/09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6944 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 86E | on | 18/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92216 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 81C | Southall | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 86E | m/e | 10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92246 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 81C | Southall | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 86E | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |