Depot: Sheffield Millhouses
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Sheffield Millhouses | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 96 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 19B | on | 01/01/1948 | 14B | Kentish Town | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5637 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 19B | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5639 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 19B | on | 01/01/1948 | 17A | Derby | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5640 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 19B | on | 01/01/1948 | 16A | Nottingham | ||||
Steam | 1P | 0-4-4T | 1322 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 19B | m/e | 03/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1343 | m/e | 09/1933 | C6 | Wakefield | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 19B | 4w/e | 22/05/1937 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1286 | m/e | 09/1933 | 29 | Manningham | m/e | 11/1945 | 19B | 4w/e | 10/08/1946 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1295 | m/e | 09/1933 | 29 | Manningham | m/e | 11/1945 | 19B | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 15A | Wellingborough |
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1342 | m/e | 09/1933 | M18 | Nottingham | m/e | 11/1945 | 19B | 4w/e | 12/06/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1396 | m/e | 09/1933 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 11/1945 | 19B | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1403 | m/e | 09/1933 | M18 | Nottingham | m/e | 11/1945 | 19B | 4w/e | 02/11/1946 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4963 | on | 22/06/1946 (New) | 19B | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 17A | Derby | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5609 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 19B | on | 01/01/1948 | 14B | Kentish Town | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3463 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | 1249 | m/e | 11/1945 | 16A | Nottingham | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 75 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 14B | Kentish Town | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 82 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 20C | Royston |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 139 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 16D | Mansfield | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 20C | Royston |
Steam | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1014 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 17A | Derby | ||||
Steam | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1016 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | w/e | 27/10/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1021 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 16A | Nottingham | ||||
Steam | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1024 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | on | 02/10/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1026 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | on | 21/08/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4P | 4-4-0 | 1037 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | w/e | 24/03/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1062 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 21B | Bournville | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1063 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | w/e | 12/08/1950 | 15B | Kettering | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1072 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | w/e | 29/10/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1075 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1079 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 15D | Bedford | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 487 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 16D | Mansfield | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 518 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | w/e | 21/04/1951 | 16D | Mansfield | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 544 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 18A | Toton | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 545 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||||
Steam | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 731 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | on | 25/12/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4859 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 16A | Nottingham | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4964 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 21A | Saltley | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4965 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 17A | Derby | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4971 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5263 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5590 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 16A | Nottingham | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5594 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5607 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5621 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 67A | Corkerhill | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5626 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5679 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5683 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5696 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 17A | Derby | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5683 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 19B | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4986 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 19B | w/e | 28/07/1951 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 1P | 0-4-4T | 1423 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 19B | w/e | 29/04/1950 | Highbridge | |||||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1423 | m/e | 11/1945 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 19B | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5088 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 19B | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40401 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 19B | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 16B | Spital Bridge |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 503 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16D | Mansfield | w/e | 18/09/1948 | 19B | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 18C | Hasland |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45260 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 18/09/1948 | 19B | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5725 | w/e | 11/09/1948 | 14B | Kentish Town | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 19B | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1198 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | Accrington | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 19B | w/e | 01/01/1949 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1198 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | w/e | 01/01/1949 | 19B | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 15D | Bedford |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43341 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16D | Mansfield | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 19B | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 58086 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 19B | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44971 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 19B | w/e | 14/05/1949 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 493 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 05/02/1949 | 19B | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 16A | Nottingham |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 502 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 05/02/1949 | 19B | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 18A | Toton |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 58086 | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 19B | w/e | 16/07/1949 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41095 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20H | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 23/04/1949 | 19B | w/e | 30/07/1949 | 15B | Kettering |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45264 | w/e | 19/03/1949 | 14B | Kentish Town | w/e | 14/05/1949 | 19B | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44971 | w/e | 14/05/1949 | 14B | Kentish Town | w/e | 11/06/1949 | 19B | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 58086 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | w/e | 16/07/1949 | 19B | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 58086 | w/e | 16/07/1949 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 19B | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44962 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 19B | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44664 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 18A | Toton (New) | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 19B | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44665 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe (New) | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 19B | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 17F | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 1P | 0-4-4T | 58058 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 19B | w/e | 01/04/1950 | 17A | Derby | ||||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 58086 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 19B | w/e | 22/04/1950 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44862 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 19B | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40183 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20G | Hellifield | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 19B | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 24D | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40549 | on | 01/01/1948 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 19B | m/e | 05/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44862 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 19B | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 1P | 0-4-4T | 58068 | w/e | 07/05/1949 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 01/04/1950 | 19B | w/e | 17/10/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 58086 | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | w/e | 22/04/1950 | 19B | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 22E | Highbridge |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45297 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 19B | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41063 | w/e | 12/08/1950 | 15B | Kettering | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 19B | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45609 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14B | Kentish Town | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 19B | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45654 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14B | Kentish Town | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 19B | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41063 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 19B | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 20E | Manningham |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45609 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 19B | on | 02/09/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45654 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 19B | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45297 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 19B | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40538 | on | 01/01/1948 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 19B | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44945 | on | 01/01/1948 | 22C | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 19B | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44945 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 19B | 3w/e | 05/05/1951 | 91M | To London Midland Region |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40120 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 21/04/1951 | 19B | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40120 | w/e | 21/04/1951 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 19B | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45590 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 17A | Derby | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 19B | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45272 | w/e | 28/07/1951 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 19B | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45272 | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 19B | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45656 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 19B | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73016 | m/e | 09/1951 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe (New) | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 19B | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44986 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 17A | Derby | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 19B | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41190 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 19B | w/e | 11/01/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41191 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 19B | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45576 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 19B | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43032 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 19B | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 40E | Colwick | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45576 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 19B | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41070 | on | 01/01/1948 | 15D | Bedford | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 19B | w/e | 19/11/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41071 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 15D | Bedford | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 19B | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73000 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 17A | Derby | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 19B | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73016 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 17A | Derby | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 19B | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41058 | on | 01/01/1948 | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 19B | w/e | 10/02/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 40907 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 17A | Derby | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 19B | m/e | 10/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44776 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 17A | Derby | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 19B | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44963 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 17A | Derby | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 19B | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41209 | on | 01/01/1948 | 15D | Bedford | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 19B | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73011 | m/e | 08/1951 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) (New) | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 19B | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44830 | on | 01/01/1948 | 22C | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 19B | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 14D | Neasden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44848 | 8w/e | 05/09/1953 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 19B | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44851 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 66A | Polmadie | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 19B | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 58077 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 17B | Burton | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 19B | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 16A | Nottingham |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 58080 | m/e | 11/1945 | 21A | Saltley | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 19B | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 15A | Wellingborough |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58216 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 19B | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 20C | Royston | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45056 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 19B | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45407 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 19B | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78022 | m/e | 05/1954 (New) | 19B | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 36A | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78023 | m/e | 05/1954 (New) | 19B | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 36A | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78024 | m/e | 05/1954 (New) | 19B | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 36A | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45264 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 17A | Derby | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 19B | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45297 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 17A | Derby | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 19B | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45186 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 17A | Derby | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 19B | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78025 | m/e | 06/1954 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe (New) | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 19B | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47623 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 20B | Stourton | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 19B | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47563 | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 19B | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44661 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 19B | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 6J | Holyhead | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44847 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 17A | Derby | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 19B | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 14D | Neasden |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73074 | 6w/e | 20/04/1955 | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 19B | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73074 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 19B | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 41B | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46400 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 19B | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 31A | Cambridge |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46494 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 19B | w/e | 01/04/1961 | 31A | Cambridge |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44819 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17A | Derby | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 19B | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45260 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 17A | Derby | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 19B | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40148 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 19B | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 55D | Royston |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41199 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 15A | Wellingborough | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 19B | w/e | 04/01/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40433 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 19B | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40482 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 19B | m/e | 07/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44839 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 17A | Derby | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 19B | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45260 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 17A | Derby | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 19B | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45570 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 17A | Derby | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 19B | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45602 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 17A | Derby | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 19B | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41159 | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 19B | on | 01/04/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73004 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 41C | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73046 | m/e | 11/1953 | 15C | Leicester Midland (New) | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 41C | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73067 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 41C | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73073 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 41C | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73155 | m/e | 12/1956 | 34E | Neasden (New) | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 41C | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73156 | m/e | 12/1956 | 34E | Neasden (New) | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 41C | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 41B | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73002 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 41D | Canklow | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 41C | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45514 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 41C | on | 27/05/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45536 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 41C | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46131 | w/e | 18/10/1958 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 41C | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46147 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 41C | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46148 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 41C | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46151 | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 41C | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43037 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 19C | Canklow | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 41C | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45627 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 41C | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46450 | w/e | 01/04/1961 | 41C | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46451 | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 41C | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 91X | To Scottish Region | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61820 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 41F | Mexborough | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 41C | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61822 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 41F | Mexborough | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 41C | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61989 | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 41F | Mexborough | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 41C | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61959 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 41F | Mexborough | w/e | 29/07/1961 | 41C | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) |