Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 707 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2431 Week
» 12566 Month
» 328797 Year
» 839899 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Shirebrook


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Shirebrook Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3476 w/e 19/06/1965 40A Lincoln w/e 02/04/1966 41J w/e 03/09/1966 16A Toton
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3615 w/e 19/06/1965 40A Lincoln w/e 02/04/1966 41J w/e 29/10/1966 34E New England
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3616 w/e 19/06/1965 40A Lincoln w/e 02/04/1966 41J w/e 29/10/1966 34E New England
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3617 w/e 19/06/1965 40A Lincoln w/e 02/04/1966 41J w/e 29/10/1966 34E New England
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3618 w/e 19/06/1965 40A Lincoln w/e 02/04/1966 41J 4w/e 31/10/1966 41J Shirebrook
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D4074 w/e 25/12/1965 40A Lincoln w/e 02/04/1966 41J 4w/e 31/10/1966 41J Shirebrook
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4039 w/e 02/05/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 29/10/1966 41J w/e 01/06/1968 41A Tinsley
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3325 w/e 15/12/1962 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 31/10/1966 41J 07/10/1984 Withdrawn
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3618 w/e 02/04/1966 41J Shirebrook 4w/e 31/10/1966 41J w/e 22/07/1967 40B Immingham
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D4053 w/e 15/12/1962 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 31/10/1966 41J w/e 26/07/1969 40B Immingham
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D4057 w/e 15/12/1962 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 31/10/1966 41J w/e 23/08/1969 41A Tinsley
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D4060 w/e 15/12/1962 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 31/10/1966 41J w/e 26/07/1969 36A Doncaster
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D4061 w/e 15/12/1962 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 31/10/1966 41J w/e 26/07/1969 40A Lincoln
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D4066 w/e 15/12/1962 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 31/10/1966 41J w/e 10/07/1971 40B Immingham
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D4067 w/e 15/12/1962 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 31/10/1966 41J 13/12/1970 Withdrawn
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D4068 w/e 11/12/1965 40B Immingham 4w/e 31/10/1966 41J 11/06/1972 Withdrawn
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D4074 w/e 02/04/1966 41J Shirebrook 4w/e 31/10/1966 41J w/e 06/07/1968 34E New England
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D4085 w/e 02/03/1963 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 31/10/1966 41J 30/06/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3030 w/e 22/11/1964 81A Old Oak Common w/e 22/07/1967 41J 17/03/1985 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3727 w/e 11/05/1968 41A Tinsley w/e 18/05/1968 41J 31/05/1981 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3685 w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 06/07/1968 41J      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3946 4w/e 09/09/1967 91E To Eastern Region w/e 16/11/1968 41J w/e 25/01/1975 WS Worcester
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3333 w/e 07/03/1964 41C Wath w/e 26/07/1969 41J 31/03/1984 Withdrawn
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D4056 w/e 02/03/1968 40B Immingham w/e 27/12/1969 41J w/e 29/01/1972 40B Immingham
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D4070 w/e 13/09/1969 40B Immingham w/e 27/12/1969 41J 23/04/1972 Withdrawn
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D4057 w/e 23/08/1969 41A Tinsley w/e 26/12/1970 41J 21/01/1972 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3702 w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 10/07/1971 41J w/e 24/11/1973 TI Tinsley
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4031 w/e 07/03/1964 41C Wath w/e 08/01/1972 41J w/e 26/01/1974 SF Stratford
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3196 w/e 08/01/1972 41A Tinsley w/e 29/01/1972 41J 06/08/1980 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3267 w/e 08/01/1972 41A Tinsley w/e 29/01/1972 41J 25/04/1982 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3355 w/e 08/01/1972 41A Tinsley w/e 29/01/1972 41J 12/09/1988 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3357 w/e 08/01/1972 41A Tinsley w/e 29/01/1972 41J 27/02/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3308 w/e 22/02/1969 41A Tinsley w/e 21/10/1972 41J 2w/e 05/06/1976 LA Laira
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3950 w/e 06/05/1972 41A Tinsley w/e 21/10/1972 41J      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3544 w/e 24/10/1970 40A Lincoln w/e 31/03/1973 41J 01/10/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4037 2w/e 08/04/1972 41C Wath w/e 31/03/1973 41J 1997 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3284 w/e 09/06/1973 TI Tinsley w/e 24/11/1973 SB 19/02/1984 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4035 w/e 02/05/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 24/11/1973 SB 31/08/2005 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08015 w/e 24/06/1972 30A Stratford w/e 26/01/1974 SB 21/09/1980 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08008 w/e 22/07/1972 41A Tinsley 2w/e 31/08/1974 SB 2w/e 04/12/1976 TI Tinsley
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08889 2w/e 13/01/1973 85A Worcester w/e 25/01/1975 SB 06/03/1992 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08331 4w/e 20/07/1968 91E To Eastern Region 3w/e 10/05/1975 SB m/e 31/10/1979 DR Doncaster
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08824 w/e 08/05/1976 LA Laira w/e 23/05/1976 SB 2w/e 05/06/1976 91E To Eastern Region