Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 711 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2435 Week
» 12570 Month
» 328801 Year
» 839903 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Southall


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Southall Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 9316       01/01/1934 131 4w/e 19/06/1954 84B Oxley
Steam 54xx 0-6-0PT 5420 4w/e 03/11/1945 172 Westbury 4w/e 01/12/1945 131 4w/e 25/01/1958 84C Banbury
Steam 54xx 0-6-0PT 5411       4w/e 29/12/1945 SHL 3w/e 19/05/1951 83B Taunton
Steam 54xx 0-6-0PT 5418       8w/e 23/03/1946 SHL 4w/e 29/01/1955 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3618       4w/e 30/10/1948 SHL 5w/e 31/08/1963 81A Old Oak Common
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3659       4w/e 30/10/1948 SHL 4w/e 24/03/1962 83C Exeter
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4917       4w/e 03/12/1949 SHL 3w/e 19/05/1951 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4944       4w/e 03/12/1949 SHL 4w/e 25/01/1958 83D Laira
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4999       4w/e 03/12/1949 SHL 4w/e 29/02/1952 83G Penzance
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5983       4w/e 03/12/1949 SHL 4w/e 25/01/1958 83D Laira
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5989       4w/e 03/12/1949 SHL 4w/e 13/07/1957 86C Cardiff Canton
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 7910       4w/e 20/05/1950 81C 4w/e 30/11/1963 81A Old Oak Common
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9726       4w/e 31/08/1950 81C 7w/e 22/06/1964 81A Old Oak Common
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5952       4w/e 31/10/1950 81C 4w/e 01/01/1955 83G Penzance
Steam 15xx 0-6-0PT 1501       4w/e 30/11/1950 81C m/e 01/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4956       4w/e 31/12/1950 81C m/e 16/06/1956 82D Westbury
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5918       4w/e 31/12/1950 81C 4w/e 31/10/1959 81E Didcot
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 7309 01/01/1934 162 Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 31/12/1950 81C 4w/e 28/02/1951 82D Westbury
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4931       4w/e 28/02/1951 81C 4w/e 01/01/1955 83G Penzance
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9409       4w/e 28/02/1951 81C 4w/e 03/12/1955 81E Didcot
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4939       4w/e 31/03/1951 81C 4w/e 19/06/1954 81A Old Oak Common
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 9309 01/01/1934 101 Old Oak Common 4w/e 31/03/1951 81C 4w/e 21/05/1955 81D Reading (W.R.)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 77380 4w/e 31/01/1951 86B Newport Pill 4w/e 30/04/1951 81C 4w/e 11/07/1959 84C Banbury
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90207       m/e 31/07/1951 81C 4w/e 22/03/1958 87G Carmarthen
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 9302 01/01/1934 121 Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 31/08/1951 81C 4w/e 01/11/1952 81E Didcot
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 9304 01/01/1934 41 Didcot 4w/e 31/08/1951 81C 4w/e 19/06/1954 86C Cardiff Canton
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 77408       4w/e 31/08/1951 81C 4w/e 30/09/1951 85A Worcester
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2880       4w/e 30/09/1951 81C 4w/e 22/03/1958 81F Oxford
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1474       4w/e 30/09/1951 81C 3w/e 13/10/1958 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1426 4w/e 30/09/1951 84J Croes Newydd 4w/e 31/12/1951 81C 4w/e 04/10/1958 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2899       3w/e 17/05/1952 81C 4w/e 21/02/1959 83D Laira
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6300 01/01/1934 24 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 3w/e 17/05/1952 81C 4w/e 21/02/1953 83E St Blazey
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90174       6w/e 30/06/1952 81C 12/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2845 4w/e 30/11/1950 81D Reading (W.R.) 2w/e 12/07/1952 81C 4w/e 21/02/1953 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 4381 01/01/1934 Sw Wks Swindon Works 7w/e 31/08/1952 81C m/e 05/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2821 4w/e 30/09/1951 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 04/10/1952 81C 4w/e 21/03/1953 86G Pontypool Road
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 3845       4w/e 04/10/1952 81C 4w/e 16/05/1953 81E Didcot
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4908 3w/e 17/05/1952 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 04/10/1952 81C 4w/e 27/02/1954 81A Old Oak Common
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90485 4w/e 31/01/1952 84C Banbury 4w/e 01/11/1952 81C 8w/e 20/04/1957 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2858 2w/e 12/07/1952 84B Oxley 4w/e 29/11/1952 81C 4w/e 24/04/1954 84C Banbury
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1462 4w/e 01/11/1952 81F Oxford 4w/e 29/11/1952 81C 4w/e 05/11/1955 82C Swindon
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8750       4w/e 27/12/1952 81C 4w/e 21/05/1960 87D Swansea East Dock
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 9300 4w/e 01/11/1952 81E Didcot 4w/e 21/02/1953 81C 4w/e 17/07/1954 86C Cardiff Canton
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 9301 4w/e 01/11/1952 81E Didcot 4w/e 21/02/1953 81C 4w/e 08/10/1955 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4979       4w/e 21/03/1953 81C 4w/e 08/10/1955 81E Didcot
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5953       4w/e 21/03/1953 81C 4w/e 30/11/1957 87F Llanelly
Steam Hall 4-6-0 6934       4w/e 18/04/1953 81C 4w/e 01/01/1955 83G Penzance
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6655       4w/e 03/10/1953 81C 4w/e 14/06/1958 81D Reading (W.R.)
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6664 3w/e 19/05/1951 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 03/10/1953 81C 4w/e 24/04/1954 81B Slough
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6654 4w/e 31/10/1953 81E Didcot 4w/e 30/01/1954 81C 4w/e 14/06/1958 81D Reading (W.R.)
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1410 m/e 31/07/1951 84J Croes Newydd 4w/e 27/03/1954 81C 4w/e 13/08/1955 82C Swindon
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90313 4w/e 29/02/1952 84C Banbury 4w/e 24/04/1954 81C 4w/e 19/04/1958 84C Banbury
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4908 4w/e 27/02/1954 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 19/06/1954 81C 4w/e 01/01/1955 83G Penzance
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 6991 23/11/1948 WES Westbury (New) 4w/e 09/10/1954 81C 4w/e 04/05/1963 81D Reading (W.R.)
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 9305 4w/e 19/06/1954 87H Neyland 4w/e 09/10/1954 81C 4w/e 09/08/1958 84E Tyseley
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 9313 4w/e 19/06/1954 87H Neyland 4w/e 09/10/1954 81C 4w/e 08/10/1955 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 9315 4w/e 19/06/1954 87H Neyland 4w/e 09/10/1954 81C 4w/e 08/10/1955 82C Swindon
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90284 4w/e 03/10/1953 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 04/12/1954 81C 8w/e 26/03/1955 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1402       4w/e 29/01/1955 81C 4w/e 21/05/1955 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1415 8w/e 23/03/1946 BRD Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 21/05/1955 81C m/e 02/1957 Withdrawn
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1446       4w/e 16/07/1955 81C m/e 09/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2890       4w/e 08/10/1955 81C 4w/e 01/11/1958 84C Banbury
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 3836 4w/e 13/08/1955 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 08/10/1955 81C 4w/e 13/06/1959 86C Cardiff Canton
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 3814 4w/e 16/07/1955 81E Didcot 4w/e 05/11/1955 81C 4w/e 22/03/1958 81F Oxford
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1436 4w/e 03/12/1949 SDN Swindon 4w/e 05/11/1955 81C m/e 10/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 47xx 2-8-0 4707 4w/e 01/12/1945 114 Oxley 4w/e 03/12/1955 81C 4w/e 02/11/1963 81A Old Oak Common
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9413       4w/e 03/12/1955 81C m/e 11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9417       4w/e 03/12/1955 81C m/e 06/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9409 4w/e 03/12/1955 81E Didcot 4w/e 28/01/1956 81C m/e 05/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5990       4w/e 24/03/1956 81C 4w/e 21/04/1956 83G Penzance
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9789       4w/e 24/03/1956 81C 4w/e 27/01/1962 81D Reading (W.R.)
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6109 4w/e 31/10/1953 81A Old Oak Common m/e 16/06/1956 81C 4w/e 23/02/1957 81B Slough
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9469 4w/e 30/04/1952 87F Llanelly m/e 16/06/1956 81C 4w/e 16/05/1959 81A Old Oak Common
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90529       m/e 16/06/1956 81C 4w/e 22/03/1958 87G Carmarthen
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90355 4w/e 08/10/1955 86C Cardiff Canton m/e 16/06/1956 81C 12/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90630 4w/e 31/08/1951 86C Cardiff Canton m/e 16/06/1956 81C 12/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2853 3w/e 17/05/1952 84J Croes Newydd 4w/e 11/08/1956 81C 4w/e 04/10/1958 84C Banbury
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6119 4w/e 24/03/1956 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 11/08/1956 81C 4w/e 01/12/1956 86E Severn Tunnel Junction
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6313 4w/e 16/05/1953 81E Didcot 4w/e 03/11/1956 81C 4w/e 14/06/1958 81D Reading (W.R.)
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8413       4w/e 26/01/1957 81C m/e 01/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9405 4w/e 11/08/1956 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 26/01/1957 81C 4w/e 13/06/1959 81A Old Oak Common
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1406 4w/e 04/10/1952 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 23/02/1957 81C m/e 03/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5996       8w/e 20/04/1957 81C 4w/e 28/11/1959 85A Worcester
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9479 31/07/1952 87F Llanelly (New) 8w/e 20/04/1957 81C 4w/e 29/11/1958 81A Old Oak Common
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2835 4w/e 29/12/1956 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 13/07/1957 81C 4w/e 22/03/1958 82C Swindon
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5727 4w/e 13/07/1957 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 10/08/1957 81C 4w/e 02/11/1957 86C Cardiff Canton
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1438       4w/e 30/11/1957 81C 4w/e 04/10/1958 82C Swindon
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1458 4w/e 31/12/1950 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 25/01/1958 81C 4w/e 04/10/1958 84J Croes Newydd
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90356 4w/e 31/10/1953 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 25/01/1958 81C 12/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4934 4w/e 22/05/1954 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 22/02/1958 81C 4w/e 16/07/1960 83A Newton Abbot
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5933       4w/e 22/02/1958 81C 4w/e 27/02/1960 81F Oxford
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4907 4w/e 21/05/1955 81F Oxford 4w/e 22/03/1958 81C 4w/e 28/11/1959 85A Worcester
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1431       4w/e 19/04/1958 81C 4w/e 30/01/1960 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4925 4w/e 01/12/1956 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 19/04/1958 81C m/e 08/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 3823 4w/e 13/08/1955 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 17/05/1958 81C 4w/e 06/09/1958 81F Oxford
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1420 4w/e 05/09/1953 81F Oxford 4w/e 04/10/1958 81C 4w/e 08/08/1959 83D Laira
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6157 4w/e 25/01/1958 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 04/10/1958 81C 4w/e 28/11/1959 81A Old Oak Common
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 6967 4w/e 23/02/1957 82C Swindon 4w/e 04/10/1958 81C 4w/e 30/11/1963 81F Oxford
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 7923 4w/e 31/10/1950 82C Swindon 4w/e 04/10/1958 81C 6w/e 12/10/1964 81A Old Oak Common
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4996 4w/e 24/03/1956 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 01/11/1958 81C 4w/e 28/11/1959 85A Worcester
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5925 4w/e 31/03/1951 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 01/11/1958 81C 4w/e 06/10/1962 82D Westbury
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8456       4w/e 29/11/1958 81C m/e 10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9422 4w/e 31/08/1950 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 29/11/1958 81C 4w/e 02/12/1961 81B Slough
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3715 4w/e 24/01/1959 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 21/02/1959 81C 4w/e 27/02/1960 84A Stafford Road
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90466 4w/e 16/07/1955 84C Banbury 4w/e 21/02/1959 81C w/e 25/08/1962 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9642 4w/e 14/06/1958 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 18/04/1959 81C 5w/e 24/08/1964 81A Old Oak Common
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8451 4w/e 01/11/1958 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 16/05/1959 81C m/e 11/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8761       4w/e 16/05/1959 81C 4w/e 27/02/1960 81F Oxford
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8769       4w/e 16/05/1959 81C m/e 04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90572 2w/e 12/07/1952 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 11/07/1959 81C 4w/e 08/08/1959 86C Cardiff Canton
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6149       4w/e 28/11/1959 81C 4w/e 17/06/1961 81F Oxford
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6159       4w/e 28/11/1959 81C 4w/e 13/08/1960 81E Didcot
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9791       4w/e 28/11/1959 81C 4w/e 24/02/1962 81E Didcot
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6110 8w/e 11/07/1953 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 26/12/1959 81C 4w/e 13/08/1960 81A Old Oak Common
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9490 28/02/1954 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) 4w/e 26/12/1959 81C 4w/e 26/03/1960 85A Worcester
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT 1669 4w/e 01/11/1958 84K Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 30/01/1960 81C 4w/e 13/08/1960 87H Neyland
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6133 4w/e 28/11/1959 81F Oxford 4w/e 30/01/1960 81C m/e 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6144       4w/e 30/01/1960 81C 4w/e 13/08/1960 85D Kidderminster
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90485 4w/e 28/11/1959 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 30/01/1960 81C 4w/e 27/02/1960 86C Cardiff Canton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3761 4w/e 30/01/1960 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 27/02/1960 81C 9w/e 25/01/1969 81A Old Oak Common
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3762 4w/e 30/01/1960 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 27/02/1960 81C 4w/e 13/06/1965 81A Old Oak Common
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1407       4w/e 27/02/1960 81C m/e 06/1960 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4995 4w/e 12/06/1958 81F Oxford 4w/e 27/02/1960 81C m/e 06/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92004 4w/e 03/10/1959 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 27/02/1960 81C 4w/e 05/11/1960 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92207 30/06/1959 82B St Philips Marsh (New) 4w/e 27/02/1960 81C w/e 22/11/1964 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6141       4w/e 26/03/1960 81C 4w/e 05/11/1960 81A Old Oak Common
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92208 30/06/1959 83D Laira (New) 4w/e 26/03/1960 81C 4w/e 02/12/1961 88A Cardiff Canton
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90312 4w/e 06/10/1956 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 26/03/1960 81C 4w/e 25/03/1961 81E Didcot
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3196 4w/e 27/02/1960 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 23/04/1960 81C 4w/e 21/05/1960 81A Old Oak Common
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3753 07/09/1959 87C Danygraig (New) 4w/e 23/04/1960 81C 9w/e 09/11/1968 86A Cardiff Canton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3754 14/09/1959 87C Danygraig (New) 4w/e 23/04/1960 81C 4w/e 16/07/1960 81A Old Oak Common
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3598 4w/e 01/11/1958 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 21/05/1960 81C 4w/e 18/06/1960 81A Old Oak Common
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1474 4w/e 23/04/1960 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 21/05/1960 81C 4w/e 28/01/1961 81B Slough
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3756 4w/e 21/05/1960 81B Slough 4w/e 16/07/1960 81C 3w/e 28/03/1965 81A Old Oak Common
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92224 4w/e 11/07/1959 83D Laira 4w/e 16/07/1960 81C 4w/e 03/11/1962 81F Oxford
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92226 30/06/1958 84C Banbury (New) 4w/e 16/07/1960 81C 4w/e 05/11/1960 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3754 4w/e 16/07/1960 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 13/08/1960 81C 2w/e 15/01/1967 81A Old Oak Common
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3949 09/04/1960 81A Old Oak Common (New) 4w/e 13/08/1960 81C 4w/e 14/07/1962 81F Oxford
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3955 23/04/1960 81A Old Oak Common (New) 4w/e 13/08/1960 81C 2w/e 07/02/1965 81A Old Oak Common
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92238 4w/e 27/12/1958 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 10/09/1960 81C 4w/e 30/12/1961 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92239 4w/e 27/12/1958 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 10/09/1960 81C 4w/e 15/07/1961 82D Westbury
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92240 4w/e 29/11/1958 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 10/09/1960 81C m/e 09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92204 30/04/1959 82B St Philips Marsh (New) 4w/e 08/10/1960 81C 4w/e 05/11/1960 81A Old Oak Common
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6110 4w/e 13/08/1960 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 05/11/1960 81C 4w/e 20/07/1964 81A Old Oak Common
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6132 4w/e 31/12/1955 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 05/11/1960 81C 6w/e 19/09/1965 81F Oxford
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90685 4w/e 18/06/1960 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 05/11/1960 81C w/e 08/12/1962 36A Doncaster
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3961 21/05/1960 81A Old Oak Common (New) 4w/e 03/12/1960 81C 9w/e 18/03/1968 81A Old Oak Common
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3622       4w/e 03/12/1960 81C 5w/e 24/08/1964 81A Old Oak Common
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6112 4w/e 03/10/1959 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 03/12/1960 81C 4w/e 24/02/1962 81E Didcot
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8731 4w/e 08/10/1955 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 03/12/1960 81C m/e 07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90565 4w/e 16/07/1960 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 03/12/1960 81C 4w/e 25/03/1961 81E Didcot
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4009       23/12/1960 (New) 81C 4w/e 25/02/1961 83E St Blazey
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6162       4w/e 25/02/1961 81C m/e 03/1962 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3512 4w/e 26/03/1960 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 25/03/1961 81C 7w/e 19/06/1966 85A Worcester
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4945 4w/e 05/11/1960 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 25/03/1961 81C m/e 11/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4986 4w/e 31/12/1960 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 25/03/1961 81C m/e 05/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5914 4w/e 25/01/1958 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 25/03/1961 81C 4w/e 14/07/1962 81D Reading (W.R.)
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5945 4w/e 11/07/1959 82C Swindon 4w/e 25/03/1961 81C 4w/e 06/10/1962 81F Oxford
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8770 4w/e 13/08/1960 81B Slough 4w/e 25/03/1961 81C 12/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8422 4w/e 30/04/1951 83D Laira 4w/e 20/05/1961 81C m/e 07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1474 4w/e 28/01/1961 81B Slough 4w/e 17/06/1961 81C 4w/e 16/06/1962 81B Slough
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3196 4w/e 22/04/1961 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 15/07/1961 81C 4w/e 31/08/1967 81A Old Oak Common
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3759 4w/e 27/02/1960 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 12/08/1961 81C 5w/e 01/05/1966 86A Cardiff Canton
Steam 47xx 2-8-0 4700       4w/e 07/10/1961 81C 23/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 47xx 2-8-0 4702       4w/e 07/10/1961 81C m/e 06/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4987 4w/e 09/08/1958 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 07/10/1961 81C m/e 04/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5901       4w/e 07/10/1961 81C 4w/e 21/04/1962 81D Reading (W.R.)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90565 4w/e 22/04/1961 84C Banbury 4w/e 07/10/1961 81C 12/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90693 4w/e 28/01/1961 84C Banbury 4w/e 07/10/1961 81C 12/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4969 4w/e 21/02/1959 81E Didcot 4w/e 02/12/1961 81C m/e 09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9495 31/10/1954 82B St Philips Marsh (New) 4w/e 02/12/1961 81C 4w/e 19/05/1962 81B Slough
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 6974       4w/e 30/12/1961 81C 4w/e 28/12/1963 81A Old Oak Common
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4989 4w/e 28/11/1959 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 27/01/1962 81C 4w/e 29/06/1963 86G Pontypool Road
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 6994 4w/e 04/11/1961 83C Exeter 4w/e 24/02/1962 81C w/e 30/03/1963 89A Shrewsbury
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4976 4w/e 08/10/1960 81E Didcot 4w/e 21/04/1962 81C 4w/e 06/04/1963 81F Oxford
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 6977 4w/e 23/04/1960 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 16/06/1962 81C 4w/e 06/10/1962 82D Westbury
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4956 4w/e 24/02/1962 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 14/07/1962 81C 4w/e 06/10/1962 82D Westbury
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5917 4w/e 16/06/1962 83C Exeter 4w/e 14/07/1962 81C m/e 09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT 1654 31/12/1954 87F Llanelly (New) 4w/e 11/08/1962 81C 4w/e 09/02/1963 81B Slough
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4944 4w/e 14/07/1962 89A Shrewsbury 4w/e 11/08/1962 81C m/e 09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8465 4w/e 27/12/1958 82C Swindon 4w/e 11/08/1962 81C m/e 11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9415       4w/e 11/08/1962 81C 4w/e 30/11/1963 81A Old Oak Common
Diesel D3/10 0-6-0 15100 4w/e 30/01/1960 82C Swindon 4w/e 06/10/1962 81C 5w/e 31/08/1963 82C Swindon
Steam 47xx 2-8-0 4703 4w/e 08/08/1953 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 06/10/1962 81C 2w/e 17/11/1962 81A Old Oak Common
Steam 47xx 2-8-0 4705 4w/e 17/06/1961 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 06/10/1962 81C 4w/e 02/11/1963 81A Old Oak Common
Steam 47xx 2-8-0 4706 4w/e 03/10/1953 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 06/10/1962 81C 4w/e 28/09/1963 81A Old Oak Common
Steam Grange 4-6-0 6809 4w/e 22/02/1958 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 06/10/1962 81C m/e 07/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Grange 4-6-0 6834 4w/e 06/10/1956 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 06/10/1962 81C 4w/e 06/04/1963 81D Reading (W.R.)
Steam Grange 4-6-0 6841 4w/e 14/06/1958 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 06/10/1962 81C 4w/e 20/07/1964 81F Oxford
Steam Grange 4-6-0 6869 4w/e 21/04/1962 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 06/10/1962 81C 4w/e 20/07/1964 88A Cardiff East Dock
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90069 4w/e 31/10/1959 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 06/10/1962 81C w/e 08/12/1962 36A Doncaster
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90572 4w/e 08/08/1959 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 06/10/1962 81C w/e 08/12/1962 41F Mexborough
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90573 4w/e 04/10/1958 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 06/10/1962 81C w/e 08/12/1962 36C Frodingham
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90579 4w/e 13/08/1955 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 06/10/1962 81C w/e 08/12/1962 41F Mexborough
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90149 4w/e 31/10/1959 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 06/10/1962 81C w/e 08/12/1962 41F Mexborough
Steam 47xx 2-8-0 4701       4w/e 03/11/1962 81C 2w/e 17/11/1962 81A Old Oak Common
Steam 47xx 2-8-0 4704       4w/e 03/11/1962 81C 2w/e 17/11/1962 81A Old Oak Common
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92245 4w/e 06/10/1962 81F Oxford 4w/e 03/11/1962 81C m/e 12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90544 4w/e 31/12/1951 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 03/11/1962 81C w/e 08/12/1962 36C Frodingham
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5929 4w/e 14/07/1962 82D Westbury 2w/e 17/11/1962 81C 4w/e 29/06/1963 86G Pontypool Road
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2873 4w/e 03/10/1959 86J Aberdare 4w/e 15/12/1962 81C m/e 12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2899 4w/e 21/02/1959 83D Laira 4w/e 15/12/1962 81C m/e 03/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 3834 4w/e 13/08/1960 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 15/12/1962 81C 4w/e 29/06/1963 83B Taunton
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 3854 4w/e 14/07/1962 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 15/12/1962 81C m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5971 4w/e 08/08/1959 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 15/12/1962 81C 4w/e 06/04/1963 81A Old Oak Common
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5985 4w/e 19/04/1958 84B Oxley 4w/e 15/12/1962 81C 4w/e 06/04/1963 81A Old Oak Common
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 6986 4w/e 08/09/1962 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 15/12/1962 81C 3w/e 28/03/1965 81E Didcot
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 7922 4w/e 08/09/1962 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 15/12/1962 81C 4w/e 08/08/1965 81F Oxford
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8426 4w/e 17/06/1961 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 12/01/1963 81C m/e 11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3665 4w/e 14/07/1962 81B Slough 4w/e 09/02/1963 81C m/e 01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2841 4w/e 03/10/1959 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 06/04/1963 81C m/e 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2851 4w/e 14/07/1962 84C Banbury 4w/e 06/04/1963 81C m/e 06/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2856 4w/e 07/10/1961 84B Oxley 4w/e 06/04/1963 81C m/e 04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2875 2w/e 17/11/1962 84C Banbury 4w/e 06/04/1963 81C 4w/e 30/11/1963 88A Cardiff East Dock
Steam Grange 4-6-0 6875 4w/e 06/10/1962 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 29/06/1963 81C 4w/e 22/02/1964 82B St Philips Marsh
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3954 29/04/1960 81A Old Oak Common (New) 4w/e 28/09/1963 81C 4w/e 13/06/1965 81A Old Oak Common
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4903 4w/e 29/06/1963 83B Taunton 4w/e 28/09/1963 81C m/e 10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9406 3w/e 19/05/1951 81B Slough 4w/e 28/09/1963 81C 4w/e 30/11/1963 81A Old Oak Common
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9422 4w/e 02/12/1961 81B Slough 4w/e 28/09/1963 81C 4w/e 30/11/1963 81A Old Oak Common
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 6961 3w/e 17/05/1952 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 02/11/1963 81C 6w/e 12/10/1964 81A Old Oak Common
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 6978 4w/e 06/04/1963 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 02/11/1963 81C 6w/e 12/10/1964 81A Old Oak Common
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 5508 4w/e 06/10/1962 87H Neyland 4w/e 30/11/1963 81C m/e 12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 5531 4w/e 28/09/1963 84A Laira 4w/e 30/11/1963 81C m/e 12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 5545 4w/e 06/10/1962 87H Neyland 4w/e 30/11/1963 81C 7w/e 22/06/1964 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 5564 4w/e 09/02/1963 82C Swindon 4w/e 30/11/1963 81C m/e 12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 5569 4w/e 09/02/1963 82C Swindon 4w/e 30/11/1963 81C m/e 12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 5570 4w/e 09/09/1961 82C Swindon 4w/e 30/11/1963 81C m/e 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 5571 4w/e 24/03/1962 87H Neyland 4w/e 30/11/1963 81C m/e 10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9707       4w/e 30/11/1963 81C 5w/e 24/08/1964 83B Taunton
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92229 4w/e 30/01/1960 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 30/11/1963 81C 7w/e 22/06/1964 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92241 4w/e 08/09/1962 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 30/11/1963 81C m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92246 4w/e 08/09/1962 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 30/11/1963 81C 6w/e 19/09/1965 86E Severn Tunnel Junction
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92250 4w/e 28/11/1959 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 30/11/1963 81C 7w/e 22/06/1964 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2879 4w/e 04/05/1963 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 28/12/1963 81C m/e 08/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 5573 4w/e 04/05/1963 82D Westbury 4w/e 28/12/1963 81C m/e 01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92210 4w/e 08/09/1962 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 28/12/1963 81C 7w/e 22/06/1964 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4622 4w/e 27/01/1962 83B Taunton 4w/e 25/01/1964 81C m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4919 4w/e 02/11/1963 82C Swindon 4w/e 25/01/1964 81C m/e 10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6139 4w/e 26/03/1960 81E Didcot 4w/e 25/01/1964 81C m/e 11/1964 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3804 4w/e 18/04/1959 82C Swindon 4w/e 22/02/1964 81C 6w/e 13/04/1964 81F Oxford
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6117 4w/e 09/08/1958 81B Slough 4w/e 22/02/1964 81C m/e 09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Castle 4-6-0 7020 28/12/1963 81A Old Oak Common 13/04/1964 81C m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 3848 4w/e 18/06/1960 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 3w/e 04/05/1964 81C m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Castle 4-6-0 4080 13/04/1964 81A Old Oak Common 22/06/1964 81C 10/08/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4697 m/e 16/06/1956 82C Swindon 7w/e 22/06/1964 81C 5w/e 24/08/1964 83C Westbury
Steam Castle 4-6-0 5002 13/04/1964 81D Reading (W.R.) 22/06/1964 81C 01/09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5971 4w/e 06/04/1963 81A Old Oak Common 7w/e 22/06/1964 81C 6w/e 12/10/1964 81D Reading (W.R.)
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6143       7w/e 22/06/1964 81C 7w/e 07/11/1965 81F Oxford
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6160 4w/e 07/09/1957 81B Slough 7w/e 22/06/1964 81C 4w/e 08/08/1965 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6167       7w/e 22/06/1964 81C m/e 10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 6959       7w/e 22/06/1964 81C 6w/e 19/09/1965 81F Oxford
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 6998 4w/e 28/01/1961 81A Old Oak Common 7w/e 22/06/1964 81C 6w/e 19/09/1965 81F Oxford
Steam Castle 4-6-0 5076 04/05/1963 81A Old Oak Common 29/06/1964 81C 16/09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Castle 4-6-0 7005 25/06/1946 WOS Worcester (New) 08/1964 81C 07/09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 3810 4w/e 28/09/1963 87A Neath (Court Sart) 5w/e 24/08/1964 81C m/e 11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6110 4w/e 20/07/1964 81A Old Oak Common 5w/e 24/08/1964 81C 3w/e 28/03/1965 81F Oxford
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6125 4w/e 21/04/1962 81A Old Oak Common 5w/e 24/08/1964 81C m/e 01/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6141 4w/e 05/11/1960 81A Old Oak Common 5w/e 24/08/1964 81C 7w/e 07/11/1965 82E Bristol Barrow Road
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6142       5w/e 24/08/1964 81C m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6156 4w/e 20/07/1964 81A Old Oak Common 5w/e 24/08/1964 81C 6w/e 12/10/1964 81E Didcot
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6163 4w/e 30/01/1960 81A Old Oak Common 5w/e 24/08/1964 81C m/e 10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6165 4w/e 20/07/1964 81A Old Oak Common 5w/e 24/08/1964 81C 7w/e 07/11/1965 85A Worcester
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2859 5w/e 24/08/1964 88A Cardiff East Dock 6w/e 12/10/1964 81C m/e 12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 3838 7w/e 22/06/1964 81E Didcot 6w/e 12/10/1964 81C m/e 11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 3859 7w/e 22/06/1964 81E Didcot 6w/e 12/10/1964 81C m/e 05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92216 4w/e 02/11/1963 87A Neath (Court Sart) 6w/e 12/10/1964 81C 6w/e 19/09/1965 86E Severn Tunnel Junction
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92222 4w/e 30/11/1963 87A Neath (Court Sart) 6w/e 12/10/1964 81C m/e 03/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6128 3w/e 04/05/1964 85B Gloucester Horton Road w/e 08/11/1964 81C 2w/e 10/01/1965 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 3866 3w/e 04/05/1964 87A Neath (Court Sart) w/e 29/11/1964 81C m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6112 4w/e 24/02/1962 81E Didcot 4w/e 27/12/1964 81C m/e 09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 3820 4w/e 25/02/1961 81E Didcot 2w/e 10/01/1965 81C m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 3851 7w/e 22/06/1964 81E Didcot 2w/e 10/01/1965 81C m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6106 w/e 08/11/1964 81E Didcot 2w/e 10/01/1965 81C 6w/e 19/09/1965 81F Oxford
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6134 4w/e 22/03/1958 81D Reading (W.R.) 2w/e 10/01/1965 81C 6w/e 19/09/1965 81F Oxford
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6135 6w/e 12/10/1964 81D Reading (W.R.) 2w/e 10/01/1965 81C 6w/e 19/09/1965 81F Oxford
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6161 3w/e 17/05/1952 81D Reading (W.R.) 2w/e 10/01/1965 81C 6w/e 19/09/1965 81F Oxford
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9726 4w/e 20/07/1964 81E Didcot 2w/e 10/01/1965 81C m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3608 4w/e 28/09/1963 81A Old Oak Common 3w/e 28/03/1965 81C m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3620 5w/e 24/08/1964 81A Old Oak Common 3w/e 28/03/1965 81C m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3763 4w/e 04/05/1963 81A Old Oak Common 3w/e 28/03/1965 81C m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 3812 4w/e 27/07/1963 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 3w/e 28/03/1965 81C m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 3818 6w/e 12/10/1964 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 3w/e 28/03/1965 81C m/e 05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4609 5w/e 31/08/1963 81A Old Oak Common 3w/e 28/03/1965 81C m/e 05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4611 4w/e 28/12/1963 81A Old Oak Common 3w/e 28/03/1965 81C m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4638 4w/e 28/09/1963 81A Old Oak Common 3w/e 28/03/1965 81C m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8498 w/e 20/07/1963 81A Old Oak Common 3w/e 28/03/1965 81C m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9418       3w/e 28/03/1965 81C m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9463 w/e 20/07/1963 81A Old Oak Common 3w/e 28/03/1965 81C m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9477 4w/e 03/12/1960 81A Old Oak Common 3w/e 28/03/1965 81C m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9495 4w/e 14/07/1962 81A Old Oak Common 3w/e 28/03/1965 81C m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9659       3w/e 28/03/1965 81C m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6156 6w/e 12/10/1964 81E Didcot 5w/e 16/05/1965 81C 7w/e 07/11/1965 81F Oxford
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92209 4w/e 28/09/1963 88A Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 13/06/1965 81C 4w/e 11/07/1965 88A Cardiff East Dock
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3762 4w/e 13/06/1965 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 11/07/1965 81C 9w/e 25/01/1969 81A Old Oak Common
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3954 4w/e 13/06/1965 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 11/07/1965 81C 9w/e 25/01/1969 81A Old Oak Common
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3963 4w/e 27/07/1963 81F Oxford 4w/e 11/07/1965 81C 9w/e 18/03/1968 81A Old Oak Common
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3972 4w/e 27/07/1963 81F Oxford 4w/e 11/07/1965 81C 9w/e 25/01/1969 81A Old Oak Common
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13186 3w/e 28/03/1965 81A Old Oak Common 6w/e 19/09/1965 81C 7w/e 07/11/1965 81A Old Oak Common
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3354 7w/e 22/06/1964 87E Landore 6w/e 19/09/1965 81C 4w/e 31/08/1967 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3527 w/e 29/11/1964 86A Cardiff Canton 6w/e 19/09/1965 81C 5w/e 01/05/1966 86A Cardiff Canton