Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 274 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2181 Week
» 20963 Month
» 269256 Year
» 1153637 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Southampton Docks


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Southampton Docks Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam USA 0-6-0T 61       01/01/1948 SOT w/e 20/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam USA 0-6-0T 62       01/01/1948 SOT w/e 01/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam USA 0-6-0T 63       01/01/1948 SOT w/e 02/06/1962 Withdrawn
Steam USA 0-6-0T 64       01/01/1948 SOT 4w/e 24/06/1963 71A Eastleigh
Steam USA 0-6-0T 65       01/01/1948 SOT w/e 06/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam USA 0-6-0T 66       01/01/1948 SOT 30/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam USA 0-6-0T 67       01/01/1948 SOT 4w/e 24/06/1963 71A Eastleigh
Steam USA 0-6-0T 68       01/01/1948 SOT 4w/e 24/06/1963 71A Eastleigh
Steam USA 0-6-0T 69       01/01/1948 SOT 4w/e 24/06/1963 71A Eastleigh
Steam USA 0-6-0T 70       01/01/1948 SOT w/e 06/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam USA 0-6-0T 71       01/01/1948 SOT 4w/e 24/06/1963 71A Eastleigh
Steam USA 0-6-0T 72       01/01/1948 SOT 5w/e 04/03/1963 70C Guildford
Steam USA 0-6-0T 73       01/01/1948 SOT 4w/e 24/06/1963 71A Eastleigh
Steam USA 0-6-0T 74       01/01/1948 SOT m/e 03/1963 Withdrawn
Steam B4 0-4-0T 81       01/01/1948 SOT m/e 02/1949 Withdrawn
Steam B4 0-4-0T 85       01/01/1948 SOT m/e 02/1949 Withdrawn
Steam B4 0-4-0T 89       01/01/1948 SOT 4w/e 19/03/1952 72D Plymouth Friary
Steam B4 0-4-0T 97       01/01/1948 SOT m/e 03/1949 Withdrawn
Steam B4 0-4-0T 98       01/01/1948 SOT m/e 02/1949 Withdrawn
Steam B4 0-4-0T 101       01/01/1948 SOT m/e 11/1948 Withdrawn
Steam B4 0-4-0T 147       01/01/1948 SOT m/e 02/1949 Withdrawn
Steam B4 0-4-0T 176       01/01/1948 SOT m/e 06/1948 Withdrawn
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2112       01/01/1948 SOT m/e 12/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2156       01/01/1948 SOT m/e 05/1951 Withdrawn
Steam E1-1 0-6-0T 2162       01/01/1948 SOT m/e 11/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2689       01/01/1948 SOT 6w/e 20/03/1951 71I Southampton Docks
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 32128 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 20/03/1951 71I 4w/e 11/04/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 32133 01/01/1948 ELH Eastleigh 6w/e 20/03/1951 71I 4w/e 12/05/1951 71I Southampton Docks
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 32689 01/01/1948 SOT Southampton Docks 6w/e 20/03/1951 71I 4w/e 12/05/1951 71I Southampton Docks
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 32133 6w/e 20/03/1951 71I Southampton Docks 4w/e 12/05/1951 71I 4w/e 19/03/1952 71I Southampton Docks
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 32138 01/01/1948 TON Tonbridge 4w/e 12/05/1951 71I 4w/e 19/03/1952 71I Southampton Docks
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 32689 6w/e 20/03/1951 71I Southampton Docks 4w/e 12/05/1951 71I m/e 02/1960 Withdrawn
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 32133 4w/e 12/05/1951 71I Southampton Docks 4w/e 19/03/1952 71I m/e 12/1952 Withdrawn
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 32138 4w/e 12/05/1951 71I Southampton Docks 4w/e 19/03/1952 71I 8w/e 07/10/1952 71D Fratton
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 32113 5w/e 14/02/1953 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 10/10/1955 71I m/e 09/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 32694 01/01/1948 FRA Fratton 6w/e 15/06/1956 71I 4w/e 11/07/1956 70F Fratton
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 32694 4w/e 11/07/1956 70F Fratton 7w/e 27/08/1956 71I 3w/e 17/11/1956 70F Fratton
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 32151 4w/e 05/02/1951 71A Eastleigh 3w/e 17/11/1956 71I m/e 01/1960 Withdrawn
Steam E2 0-6-0T 32101 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 6w/e 25/01/1957 71I w/e 15/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam E2 0-6-0T 32108 4w/e 17/12/1956 71A Eastleigh 6w/e 25/01/1957 71I m/e 06/1961 Withdrawn
Steam E2 0-6-0T 32109 4w/e 17/12/1956 71A Eastleigh 6w/e 25/01/1957 71I m/e 04/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 32694 3w/e 17/11/1956 70F Fratton 5w/e 26/11/1959 71I 5w/e 31/12/1959 71I Southampton Docks
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 32694 5w/e 26/11/1959 71I Southampton Docks 5w/e 31/12/1959 71I m/e 07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam E2 0-6-0T 32107 6w/e 22/10/1959 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 10/03/1960 71I m/e 02/1961 Withdrawn
Steam E2 0-6-0T 32100 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 3w/e 26/05/1961 71I w/e 11/11/1961 Withdrawn
Steam E2 0-6-0T 32102 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 3w/e 26/05/1961 71I m/e 10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam E2 0-6-0T 32103 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 3w/e 26/05/1961 71I w/e 06/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam E2 0-6-0T 32106 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 3w/e 26/05/1961 71I w/e 06/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam E2 0-6-0T 32105 8w/e 17/01/1961 71A Eastleigh m/e 08/12/1961 71I w/e 15/09/1962 Withdrawn
Diesel 07 0-6-0 D2986       16/06/1962 (New) 71I 4w/e 07/02/1966 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 07 0-6-0 D2987       16/06/1962 (New) 71I 4w/e 07/02/1966 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 07 0-6-0 D2988       16/06/1962 (New) 71I 4w/e 07/02/1966 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 07 0-6-0 D2985       27/06/1962 (New) 71I m/e 20/07/1964 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 07 0-6-0 D2989       27/06/1962 (New) 71I 4w/e 07/02/1966 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 07 0-6-0 D2990       13/07/1962 (New) 71I 4w/e 07/02/1966 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 07 0-6-0 D2991       21/07/1962 (New) 71I 4w/e 07/02/1966 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 07 0-6-0 D2992       28/07/1962 (New) 71I 4w/e 07/02/1966 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 07 0-6-0 D2993       21/08/1962 (New) 71I 4w/e 07/02/1966 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 07 0-6-0 D2994       05/09/1962 (New) 71I 4w/e 07/02/1966 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 07 0-6-0 D2995       22/09/1962 (New) 71I 4w/e 07/02/1966 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 07 0-6-0 D2996       06/10/1962 (New) 71I 4w/e 07/02/1966 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 07 0-6-0 D2997       20/10/1962 (New) 71I 4w/e 07/02/1966 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 07 0-6-0 D2998       10/11/1962 (New) 71I m/e 20/07/1964 70D Eastleigh