Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 226 Today
» 1292 Yesterday
» 2744 Week
» 22389 Month
» 57031 Year
» 1278596 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Barry


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Barry Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 3100/5100 2-6-2T 5128       4w/e 30/10/1948 BRY m/e 11/1948 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5667       4w/e 30/10/1948 BRY w/e 14/09/1963 6C Croes Newydd
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5614       4w/e 05/11/1949 BRY 4w/e 07/10/1961 85A Worcester
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8451       4w/e 05/11/1949 BRY 4w/e 03/10/1953 83A Newton Abbot
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT 1615       12/12/1949 (New) BRY 4w/e 26/01/1957 87F Llanelly
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8735       4w/e 31/12/1949 BRY 4w/e 29/11/1958 88E Abercynon
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9776       4w/e 31/12/1949 BRY 4w/e 31/01/1951 88B Cardiff East Dock
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4692       4w/e 20/05/1950 88C 4w/e 29/11/1958 88E Abercynon
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5751       4w/e 20/05/1950 88C 4w/e 03/10/1953 83B Taunton
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5665       4w/e 31/08/1950 88C 4w/e 08/10/1955 88F Treherbert
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4177 22/11/1949 THT Treherbert (New) 4w/e 31/10/1950 88C 4w/e 08/10/1955 88A Cardiff Cathays
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5619       4w/e 31/10/1950 88C m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6774       14/11/1950 (New) 88C m/e 16/06/1956 88B Cardiff East Dock
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6775       21/11/1950 (New) 88C m/e 16/06/1956 88B Cardiff East Dock
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6664       4w/e 28/02/1951 88C 3w/e 19/05/1951 88A Cardiff Cathays
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8470       31/05/1951 (New) 88C 4w/e 01/11/1952 88A Cardiff Cathays
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6602 3w/e 19/05/1951 86C Cardiff Canton m/e 31/07/1951 88C 3w/e 17/05/1952 86C Cardiff Canton
Steam A 0-6-2T 375 6w/e 30/06/1951 88E Abercynon 4w/e 31/12/1951 88C 22/11/1954 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8465 6w/e 30/06/1951 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 29/02/1952 88C 4w/e 21/03/1953 88F Treherbert
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4267 m/e 31/07/1951 86C Cardiff Canton 3w/e 17/05/1952 88C 4w/e 28/01/1956 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8478       31/05/1952 (New) 88C 2w/e 12/07/1952 88B Cardiff East Dock
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8484 31/05/1952 88B Cardiff East Dock (New) 2w/e 12/07/1952 88C 7w/e 31/08/1952 88A Cardiff Cathays
Steam O4 0-6-2T 236       w/e 06/09/1952 88C m/e 01/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 7726 3w/e 17/05/1952 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 04/10/1952 88C 4w/e 26/12/1953 88A Cardiff Cathays
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 7779       4w/e 04/10/1952 88C 4w/e 25/11/1953 88A Cardiff Cathays
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8495       31/10/1952 (New) 88C 4w/e 27/12/1952 88F Treherbert
Steam A 0-6-2T 357       4w/e 24/01/1953 88C 02/01/1956 Withdrawn
Steam O4 0-6-2T 210 4w/e 04/10/1952 88F Treherbert 4w/e 21/03/1953 88C 4w/e 26/12/1953 88B Cardiff East Dock
Steam O4 0-6-2T 285       4w/e 21/03/1953 88C m/e 08/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6620 4w/e 21/03/1953 86H Aberbeeg 4w/e 18/04/1953 88C 4w/e 03/10/1953 84E Tyseley
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 5183 4w/e 31/10/1950 88F Treherbert 4w/e 08/08/1953 88C 4w/e 08/09/1956 83A Newton Abbot
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82000 04/04/1952 84E Tyseley (New) 4w/e 08/08/1953 88C 4w/e 03/10/1953 88F Treherbert
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4224       4w/e 05/09/1953 88C 4w/e 23/04/1955 88A Cardiff Cathays
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4578 8w/e 23/03/1946 GLO Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 03/10/1953 88C 4w/e 25/01/1958 88F Treherbert
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 5527       4w/e 03/10/1953 88C 4w/e 22/02/1958 88A Radyr
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 5529       4w/e 03/10/1953 88C 4w/e 22/02/1958 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 5534 4w/e 21/03/1953 82C Swindon 4w/e 03/10/1953 88C 4w/e 31/10/1953 88A Cardiff Cathays
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82001 4w/e 16/05/1953 84E Tyseley 4w/e 03/10/1953 88C 4w/e 16/07/1955 83A Newton Abbot
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82002 4w/e 16/05/1953 84E Tyseley 4w/e 03/10/1953 88C 4w/e 16/07/1955 83A Newton Abbot
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82003 4w/e 16/05/1953 84E Tyseley 4w/e 03/10/1953 88C 4w/e 22/03/1958 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82004 14/05/1952 84E Tyseley (New) 4w/e 03/10/1953 88C 4w/e 23/04/1955 83A Newton Abbot
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82005 16/05/1952 84E Tyseley (New) 4w/e 03/10/1953 88C 4w/e 16/07/1955 83A Newton Abbot
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82006 27/05/1952 84E Tyseley (New) 4w/e 03/10/1953 88C 4w/e 16/07/1955 83A Newton Abbot
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82007 30/05/1952 84E Tyseley (New) 4w/e 03/10/1953 88C 4w/e 16/07/1955 88F Treherbert
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82008 05/06/1952 84E Tyseley (New) 4w/e 03/10/1953 88C 4w/e 10/09/1955 85D Kidderminster
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82009 13/06/1952 84E Tyseley (New) 4w/e 03/10/1953 88C 4w/e 23/04/1955 83A Newton Abbot
Steam A 0-6-2T 303       4w/e 03/10/1953 88C 05/05/1956 Withdrawn
Steam A 0-6-2T 393 4w/e 29/02/1952 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 03/10/1953 88C 4w/e 11/08/1956 88E Abercynon
Steam A 0-6-2T 399       4w/e 03/10/1953 88C 4w/e 25/11/1953 88B Cardiff East Dock
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8455 4w/e 27/12/1952 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 25/11/1953 88C 4w/e 16/07/1955 88F Treherbert
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9470 4w/e 03/10/1953 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 25/11/1953 88C 8w/e 26/03/1955 88B Cardiff East Dock
Steam A 0-6-2T 390       4w/e 25/11/1953 88C 4w/e 11/08/1956 88E Abercynon
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82030       21/12/1954 (New) 88C 4w/e 21/05/1955 84G Shrewsbury
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82031       30/12/1954 (New) 88C 4w/e 29/01/1955 83D Laira
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82032       01/01/1955 (New) 88C 4w/e 16/07/1955 83A Newton Abbot
Steam A 0-6-2T 349 4w/e 17/07/1954 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 01/01/1955 88C 4w/e 08/09/1956 88E Abercynon
Steam A 0-6-2T 376 4w/e 19/06/1954 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 01/01/1955 88C 4w/e 06/10/1956 88A Cardiff Cathays
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82035       03/03/1955 (New) 88C 4w/e 17/05/1958 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7252 4w/e 04/12/1954 88A Cardiff Cathays 8w/e 26/03/1955 88C 4w/e 05/09/1959 88A Radyr
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4210 4w/e 04/12/1954 88A Cardiff Cathays 8w/e 26/03/1955 88C 4w/e 05/09/1959 88A Radyr
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82036       01/04/1955 (New) 88C 4w/e 22/03/1958 88A Radyr
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82039       10/05/1955 (New) 88C 4w/e 17/05/1958 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82040       19/05/1955 (New) 88C 4w/e 12/06/1958 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82041       17/06/1955 (New) 88C 4w/e 12/06/1958 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82042       20/06/1955 (New) 88C 4w/e 09/08/1958 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82043       27/06/1955 (New) 88C 4w/e 12/06/1958 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9622       4w/e 16/07/1955 88C 4w/e 29/11/1958 88E Abercynon
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82037 20/04/1955 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (New) 4w/e 16/07/1955 88C m/e 16/06/1956 88E Abercynon
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82044       12/08/1955 (New) 88C 4w/e 12/06/1958 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7241 4w/e 23/04/1955 87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 28/01/1956 88C 26/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4220 4w/e 23/04/1955 87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 28/01/1956 88C 26/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7230       4w/e 28/01/1956 88C 4w/e 21/02/1959 86E Severn Tunnel Junction
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 5265       4w/e 28/01/1956 88C 4w/e 21/02/1959 86E Severn Tunnel Junction
Steam A 0-6-2T 377 4w/e 28/01/1956 88E Abercynon 4w/e 25/02/1956 88C 14/05/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8450 4w/e 30/09/1950 86E Severn Tunnel Junction m/e 16/06/1956 88C m/e 06/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8457       m/e 16/06/1956 88C 4w/e 06/10/1956 88B Cardiff East Dock
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8459 4w/e 13/08/1955 88B Cardiff East Dock m/e 16/06/1956 88C 4w/e 24/01/1959 81A Old Oak Common
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82037 m/e 16/06/1956 88E Abercynon 4w/e 14/07/1956 88C 4w/e 19/04/1958 88A Radyr
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6619 4w/e 08/09/1956 88F Treherbert 4w/e 06/10/1956 88C m/e 03/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8446 4w/e 05/11/1955 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 06/10/1956 88C m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8465 4w/e 14/08/1954 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 06/10/1956 88C 4w/e 27/12/1958 82C Swindon
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9453 4w/e 31/08/1951 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 06/10/1956 88C 4w/e 24/01/1959 86C Cardiff Canton
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4610       4w/e 26/01/1957 88C w/e 11/03/1959 73H Dover Marine
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5769       4w/e 15/06/1957 88C 4w/e 22/03/1958 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6770 4w/e 30/11/1950 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 07/09/1957 88C 4w/e 21/02/1959 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6771 4w/e 30/11/1950 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 07/09/1957 88C m/e 03/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8437 4w/e 10/09/1955 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 05/10/1957 88C 4w/e 21/02/1959 86H Aberbeeg
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5622 4w/e 26/01/1957 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 25/01/1958 88C 4w/e 18/04/1959 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 6408       4w/e 25/01/1958 88C 4w/e 22/03/1958 82D Westbury
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6765       4w/e 22/02/1958 88C 4w/e 13/08/1960 87D Swansea East Dock
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6769 m/e 16/06/1956 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 22/02/1958 88C 4w/e 21/02/1959 82C Swindon
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6767       4w/e 22/03/1958 88C 4w/e 21/02/1959 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6773 03/11/1950 88B Cardiff East Dock (New) 4w/e 22/03/1958 88C 4w/e 11/07/1959 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6775 m/e 16/06/1956 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 22/03/1958 88C 4w/e 16/07/1960 86B Newport Pill
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7227 4w/e 29/11/1952 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 19/04/1958 88C 4w/e 01/11/1958 86C Cardiff Canton
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 5262 4w/e 29/11/1952 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 19/04/1958 88C 4w/e 01/11/1958 86C Cardiff Canton
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6751 4w/e 19/04/1958 88A Radyr 4w/e 19/04/1958 88C 4w/e 01/11/1958 86B Newport Pill
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 5527 4w/e 12/06/1958 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 14/06/1958 88C 4w/e 04/10/1958 87H Neyland
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 5534 4w/e 12/06/1958 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 14/06/1958 88C 4w/e 21/03/1959 86F Tondu
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 5568 4w/e 12/06/1958 86H Aberbeeg 4w/e 14/06/1958 88C 4w/e 05/11/1960 83D Laira
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 7726 4w/e 26/12/1953 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 09/08/1958 88C 4w/e 29/11/1958 88E Abercynon
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13258 4w/e 10/08/1957 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 29/11/1958 88C 4w/e 27/12/1958 88B Cardiff East Dock
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13267 4w/e 02/11/1957 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 29/11/1958 88C 4w/e 27/12/1958 88B Cardiff East Dock
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13366 31/05/1957 88B Cardiff East Dock (New) 4w/e 29/11/1958 88C 4w/e 27/12/1958 88B Cardiff East Dock
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3406 19/12/1957 88B Cardiff East Dock (New) 4w/e 29/11/1958 88C 4w/e 27/12/1958 88B Cardiff East Dock
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3419 16/11/1957 88B Cardiff East Dock (New) 4w/e 29/11/1958 88C 4w/e 27/12/1958 88B Cardiff East Dock
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3424 05/02/1958 88B Cardiff East Dock (New) 4w/e 29/11/1958 88C 4w/e 27/12/1958 88B Cardiff East Dock
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3426 26/03/1958 88B Cardiff East Dock (New) 4w/e 29/11/1958 88C 4w/e 27/12/1958 88B Cardiff East Dock
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3527 4w/e 09/08/1958 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 29/11/1958 88C 4w/e 27/12/1958 88B Cardiff East Dock
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3593 4w/e 01/11/1958 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 29/11/1958 88C 4w/e 27/12/1958 88B Cardiff East Dock
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 3405 4w/e 25/01/1958 88A Radyr 4w/e 29/11/1958 88C 4w/e 27/12/1958 88A Radyr
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 3406 4w/e 25/01/1958 88A Radyr 4w/e 29/11/1958 88C 4w/e 27/12/1958 88A Radyr
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4616 4w/e 12/06/1958 88A Radyr 4w/e 29/11/1958 88C w/e 11/03/1959 73H Dover Marine
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4632       4w/e 29/11/1958 88C 4w/e 18/04/1959 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4634 4w/e 05/11/1955 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 29/11/1958 88C w/e 11/03/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5615 4w/e 04/10/1958 88A Radyr 4w/e 29/11/1958 88C 4w/e 18/04/1959 88A Radyr
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4618 4w/e 31/12/1950 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 27/12/1958 88C 4w/e 09/03/1963 88L Cardiff East Dock
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4667       4w/e 27/12/1958 88C m/e 04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 7717 4w/e 01/11/1958 88A Radyr 4w/e 27/12/1958 88C m/e 03/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 7751 4w/e 12/06/1958 88A Radyr 4w/e 27/12/1958 88C m/e 10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 7766 4w/e 01/11/1958 88A Radyr 4w/e 27/12/1958 88C 09/11/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8419 4w/e 12/06/1958 88A Radyr 4w/e 21/02/1959 88C m/e 01/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8780       4w/e 21/02/1959 88C 4w/e 16/05/1959 88A Radyr
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9425 4w/e 12/06/1958 88A Radyr 4w/e 21/03/1959 88C 4w/e 09/03/1963 88C Barry
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3727 4w/e 25/01/1958 88A Radyr 4w/e 16/05/1959 88C 4w/e 28/12/1963 88C Barry
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8481 31/03/1952 88A Cardiff Cathays (New) 4w/e 30/01/1960 88C 4w/e 09/03/1963 81A Old Oak Common
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5637 4w/e 10/09/1955 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 27/02/1960 88C m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5636 4w/e 24/01/1959 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 26/03/1960 88C 4w/e 28/01/1961 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6655 4w/e 03/10/1959 81B Slough 4w/e 26/03/1960 88C 4w/e 27/07/1963 88F Treherbert
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6657       4w/e 26/03/1960 88C 4w/e 23/04/1960 88A Radyr
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8764       4w/e 26/03/1960 88C m/e 05/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6697       4w/e 23/04/1960 88C 4w/e 20/07/1964 88B Radyr
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5634 4w/e 18/06/1955 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 21/05/1960 88C 4w/e 07/10/1961 87F Llanelly
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5639 4w/e 03/10/1953 81E Didcot 4w/e 16/07/1960 88C m/e 05/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3710 4w/e 30/09/1950 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 10/09/1960 88C m/e 05/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5685 4w/e 22/03/1958 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 03/12/1960 88C 4w/e 12/08/1961 88C Barry
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5643       4w/e 17/06/1961 88C m/e 07/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5668 4w/e 31/08/1951 88F Treherbert 4w/e 17/06/1961 88C m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5685 4w/e 03/12/1960 88C Barry 4w/e 12/08/1961 88C 4w/e 09/09/1961 88A Cardiff Canton
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9780       4w/e 12/08/1961 88C 4w/e 09/02/1963 88H Tondu
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5634 4w/e 07/10/1961 87F Llanelly 4w/e 02/12/1961 88C 4w/e 06/10/1962 87H Neyland
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6696 4w/e 25/02/1961 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 30/12/1961 88C m/e 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3690 4w/e 31/12/1951 87F Llanelly 4w/e 19/05/1962 88C 4w/e 30/11/1963 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6656 4w/e 11/07/1959 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 19/05/1962 88C 4w/e 08/09/1962 88B Radyr
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3668       4w/e 16/06/1962 88C m/e 07/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5653 4w/e 25/01/1958 88F Treherbert 4w/e 14/07/1962 88C m/e 01/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3663 4w/e 30/12/1961 88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 08/09/1962 88C 18/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3748 4w/e 09/09/1961 88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 08/09/1962 88C 4w/e 09/02/1963 88L Cardiff East Dock
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8425 4w/e 13/08/1960 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 08/09/1962 88C 4w/e 06/10/1962 88L Cardiff East Dock
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8728       4w/e 08/09/1962 88C 4w/e 09/02/1963 88L Cardiff East Dock
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8776 4w/e 30/04/1952 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 08/09/1962 88C 18/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9437 4w/e 25/01/1958 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 08/09/1962 88C 4w/e 06/10/1962 88L Cardiff East Dock
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9603 4w/e 06/11/1954 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 08/09/1962 88C 4w/e 09/02/1963 88L Cardiff East Dock
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9648 25/05/1946 CDF Cardiff Canton (New) 4w/e 08/09/1962 88C 4w/e 09/02/1963 88L Cardiff East Dock
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9681 4w/e 31/12/1960 88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 08/09/1962 88C 4w/e 09/02/1963 88L Cardiff East Dock
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9713       4w/e 08/09/1962 88C 4w/e 09/02/1963 88L Cardiff East Dock
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9727 4w/e 22/04/1961 88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 08/09/1962 88C 09/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9775 4w/e 30/01/1960 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 08/09/1962 88C 05/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9794 4w/e 18/06/1960 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 08/09/1962 88C 4w/e 09/02/1963 88L Cardiff East Dock
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7221       4w/e 06/10/1962 88C w/e 07/12/1963 2D Banbury
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 5256       4w/e 06/10/1962 88C w/e 07/12/1963 2D Banbury
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7228 4w/e 07/10/1961 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 06/10/1962 88C m/e 07/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 5263 4w/e 07/10/1961 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 06/10/1962 88C m/e 07/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7231       4w/e 06/10/1962 88C 4w/e 29/06/1963 88B Radyr
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 5266       4w/e 06/10/1962 88C 4w/e 29/06/1963 88B Radyr
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7202 4w/e 01/12/1945 136 Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 06/10/1962 88C m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 5277 4w/e 01/12/1945 136 Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 06/10/1962 88C m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7208 4w/e 09/09/1961 88J Aberdare 4w/e 06/10/1962 88C m/e 04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 5283 4w/e 09/09/1961 88J Aberdare 4w/e 06/10/1962 88C m/e 04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9442 31/03/1951 87A Neath (Court Sart) (New) 4w/e 03/11/1962 88C 2w/e 17/11/1962 87A Neath (Court Sart)
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3615       2w/e 17/11/1962 88C 3w/e 04/05/1964 87D Swansea East Dock
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3689 4w/e 24/01/1959 84J Croes Newydd 4w/e 15/12/1962 88C 4w/e 09/02/1963 88L Cardiff East Dock
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9472 4w/e 23/02/1957 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 15/12/1962 88C 4w/e 09/02/1963 88B Radyr
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5679 4w/e 21/04/1962 89B Croes Newydd 4w/e 12/01/1963 88C 4w/e 09/02/1963 89B Croes Newydd
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5689       4w/e 09/02/1963 88C 6w/e 12/10/1964 88B Radyr
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6650 4w/e 17/06/1961 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 09/03/1963 88C 6w/e 12/10/1964 88B Radyr
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9425 4w/e 21/03/1959 88C Barry 4w/e 09/03/1963 88C 5w/e 31/08/1963 86F Aberbeeg
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4618 4w/e 09/03/1963 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 04/05/1963 88C m/e 10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7232 4w/e 24/01/1959 87F Llanelly 4w/e 29/06/1963 88C 4w/e 30/11/1963 87F Llanelly
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 5267 4w/e 24/01/1959 87F Llanelly 4w/e 29/06/1963 88C 4w/e 30/11/1963 87F Llanelly
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7238 4w/e 27/01/1962 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 29/06/1963 88C m/e 04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 5273 4w/e 27/01/1962 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 29/06/1963 88C m/e 04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7223 4w/e 04/11/1961 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 27/07/1963 88C 4w/e 30/11/1963 87F Llanelly
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 5258 4w/e 04/11/1961 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 27/07/1963 88C 4w/e 30/11/1963 87F Llanelly
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6670 4w/e 08/09/1962 88G Llantrisant 4w/e 27/07/1963 88C m/e 10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3689 4w/e 09/02/1963 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 02/11/1963 88C m/e 05/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3784 4w/e 08/09/1962 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 02/11/1963 88C 6w/e 12/10/1964 88B Radyr
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9426 4w/e 09/02/1963 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 02/11/1963 88C 6w/e 12/10/1964 88B Radyr
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9437 4w/e 09/02/1963 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 02/11/1963 88C 4w/e 28/12/1963 88A Cardiff East Dock
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9461 4w/e 08/09/1962 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 02/11/1963 88C 6w/e 12/10/1964 88B Radyr
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9603 4w/e 09/02/1963 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 02/11/1963 88C m/e 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9794 4w/e 09/02/1963 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 02/11/1963 88C m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3727 4w/e 16/05/1959 88C Barry 4w/e 28/12/1963 88C m/e 04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9798 4w/e 12/01/1963 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 28/12/1963 88C m/e 10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4273 4w/e 19/05/1962 88H Tondu 3w/e 04/05/1964 88C m/e 10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4283 4w/e 04/05/1963 88H Tondu 3w/e 04/05/1964 88C m/e 10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4675       3w/e 04/05/1964 88C 6w/e 12/10/1964 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3615 3w/e 04/05/1964 87D Swansea East Dock 7w/e 22/06/1964 88C 6w/e 12/10/1964 87A Neath (Court Sart)
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7209 4w/e 15/12/1962 88J Aberdare 7w/e 22/06/1964 88C m/e 07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 5284 4w/e 15/12/1962 88J Aberdare 7w/e 22/06/1964 88C m/e 07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6621 4w/e 29/06/1963 88F Treherbert 7w/e 22/06/1964 88C 4w/e 20/07/1964 88B Radyr
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6654 2w/e 17/11/1962 88F Treherbert 7w/e 22/06/1964 88C 6w/e 12/10/1964 88E Abercynon