Depot: Spital Bridge
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Spital Bridge | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1430 | m/e | 12/1902 | 10B | Bourne | m/e | 05/1908 | 9 | m/e | 04/1914 | 5 | Brecon |
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | 1257 | m/e | 04/1914 | 14 | Bedford | m/e | 12/1921 | 9 | m/e | 03/1930 | M13 | Wellingborough |
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1304 | m/e | 04/1914 | 18 | Nottingham | m/e | 12/1921 | 9 | m/e | 03/1930 | 28 | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1331 | m/e | 12/1921 | 5 | Brecon | m/e | 03/1930 | 9 | 4w/e | 28/11/1931 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1422 | m/e | 12/1921 | 5 | Brecon | m/e | 03/1930 | 9 | m/e | 09/1933 | 9 | Spital Bridge |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1423 | m/e | 12/1921 | 5 | Brecon | m/e | 03/1930 | 9 | m/e | 09/1933 | 9 | Spital Bridge |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1424 | m/e | 12/1921 | 6 | Swansea (Upper Bank) | m/e | 03/1930 | 9 | m/e | 09/1933 | 9 | Spital Bridge |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1422 | m/e | 03/1930 | 9 | Spital Bridge | m/e | 09/1933 | 9 | m/e | 11/1945 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1423 | m/e | 03/1930 | 9 | Spital Bridge | m/e | 09/1933 | 9 | m/e | 11/1945 | 16A | Nottingham |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1424 | m/e | 03/1930 | 9 | Spital Bridge | m/e | 09/1933 | 9 | m/e | 11/1945 | 17B | Burton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4152 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 16B | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | Spital Bridge | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4218 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 16B | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | Spital Bridge | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3854 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3859 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 18A | Toton | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3864 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 8E | Brunswick | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3898 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 15A | Wellingborough | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3920 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3957 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 2E | Northampton | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3980 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 8E | Brunswick | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3981 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3253 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 18B | Westhouses | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3317 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 16A | Nottingham | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 18B | Westhouses |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3319 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | on | 09/12/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3371 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 16A | Nottingham | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3651 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 9G | Northwich | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3652 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | w/e | 11/03/1950 | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4097 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 41B | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4152 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 16B | Spital Bridge | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 31B | March |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4155 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 9G | Northwich | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4218 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 16B | Spital Bridge | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4238 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 20B | Stourton | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4239 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 2E | Northampton | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4273 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 31B | March | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4293 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4296 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4458 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 20D | Normanton | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4476 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4509 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 31B | March | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4518 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 41B | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4519 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4521 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 31B | March | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4522 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 2E | Northampton | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7269 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7270 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7566 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 8E | Brunswick | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7622 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 2A | Rugby | ||||
Steam | 1121 | 0-6-0T | 1846 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 16A | Nottingham | ||||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 7202 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 14B | Kentish Town | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 180 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | on | 24/07/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 408 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | on | 25/12/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 410 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 10B | Preston | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 497 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | w/e | 13/10/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 532 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | on | 04/01/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 533 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | w/e | 28/01/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 552 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | w/e | 05/08/1950 | 16A | Nottingham | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 558 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | w/e | 08/03/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8074 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 16B | on | 13/08/1950 | 12B | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8323 | on | 01/01/1948 | 18A | Toton | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 16B | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 12B | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8544 | on | 01/01/1948 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 16B | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 12B | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4110 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19D | Heaton Mersey | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 16B | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 16B | Spital Bridge |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4117 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19D | Heaton Mersey | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 16B | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 16B | Spital Bridge |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47659 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 16B | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 10B | Preston | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4110 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 16B | Spital Bridge | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 16B | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 2E | Northampton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4117 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 16B | Spital Bridge | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 16B | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 9G | Northwich |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40559 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 08/01/1949 | 16B | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47621 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 16B | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 10C | Patricroft |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44554 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20H | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 16B | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 17C | Coalville |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44572 | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 20H | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 16B | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 17C | Coalville |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42761 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 16B | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 16B | Spital Bridge |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42872 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 16B | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 16B | Spital Bridge |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44242 | on | 01/01/1948 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 16B | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 16B | Spital Bridge |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44250 | on | 01/01/1948 | 18A | Toton | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 16B | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 16B | Spital Bridge |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44242 | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 16B | Spital Bridge | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 16B | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 15A | Wellingborough |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44250 | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 16B | Spital Bridge | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 16B | w/e | 06/08/1949 | 18A | Toton |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42761 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 16B | Spital Bridge | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 16B | w/e | 30/07/1949 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42872 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 16B | Spital Bridge | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 16B | w/e | 30/07/1949 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47263 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14B | Kentish Town | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 16B | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 16B | Spital Bridge |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47263 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 16B | Spital Bridge | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 16B | w/e | 22/04/1950 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40482 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 16B | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40401 | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 16B | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 16B | Spital Bridge |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43863 | on | 01/01/1948 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 16B | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43918 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17D | Rowsley | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 16B | w/e | 29/07/1950 | 17D | Rowsley |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44053 | on | 01/01/1948 | 18C | Hasland | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 16B | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 18C | Hasland |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44163 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17D | Rowsley | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 16B | w/e | 29/07/1950 | 17D | Rowsley |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40401 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 16B | Spital Bridge | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 16B | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42761 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | w/e | 08/07/1950 | 16B | w/e | 12/08/1950 | 17B | Burton |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42769 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | w/e | 08/07/1950 | 16B | w/e | 12/08/1950 | 17B | Burton |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41083 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 22/07/1950 | 16B | on | 25/10/1950 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 40934 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 22/07/1950 | 16B | on | 25/10/1950 | 17C | Coalville |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90063 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | CAR | Carlisle Canal | on | 13/08/1950 | 35C | on | 31/01/1960 | 31B | March |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90447 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | CAR | Carlisle Canal | on | 13/08/1950 | 35C | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 31B | March |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90501 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | CAR | Carlisle Canal | on | 13/08/1950 | 35C | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 31B | March |
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 67362 | on | 01/01/1948 | NWE | New England | w/e | 20/08/1950 | 35C | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 35B | Grantham |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43064 | on | 17/11/1950 | 35A | New England (New) | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 35C | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 35A | New England |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43538 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16A | Nottingham | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 35C | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 35C | Spital Bridge |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43538 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 35C | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 9G | Northwich |
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 62590 | on | 01/01/1948 | IPS | Ipswich | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 35C | w/e | 21/04/1951 | 32B | Ipswich |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41100 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 35C | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 35C | Spital Bridge |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41101 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 35C | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 35C | Spital Bridge |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41102 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 35C | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 35C | Spital Bridge |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41103 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26C | Bolton | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 35C | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 35C | Spital Bridge |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42896 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 17B | Burton | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 35C | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 17B | Burton |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42904 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 35C | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41100 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 35C | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41101 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 35C | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41102 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 35C | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41103 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 35C | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41160 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 35C | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41167 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 35C | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40504 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 35C | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 16A | Nottingham |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40567 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20E | Manningham | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 35C | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40567 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40536 | on | 01/01/1948 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 35C | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40548 | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 18C | Hasland | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40548 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 35C | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42792 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 17D | Rowsley | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 17D | Rowsley |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42815 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41055 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41098 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41104 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41188 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41189 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 27C | Southport | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 27C | Southport |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 40926 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 5A | Crewe North | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 62562 | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 31A | Cambridge | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 31A | Cambridge |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64719 | on | 30/03/1947 | CLK | Colwick | on | 05/10/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64902 | on | 30/07/1945 | DON | Doncaster | on | 05/10/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64789 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 40A | Lincoln | on | 12/10/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64883 | on | 01/07/1945 | LIN | Lincoln | on | 12/10/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64901 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 9G | Northwich | on | 12/10/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64951 | on | 14/09/1946 | DON | Doncaster | on | 12/10/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64954 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 9G | Northwich | on | 12/10/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64965 | on | 26/03/1950 | 38A | Colwick | on | 12/10/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64723 | on | 12/10/1952 | 38A | Colwick | on | 13/10/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge |
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 62532 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 31A | Cambridge | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge |
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 62535 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 31A | Cambridge | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge |
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 62587 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 31A | Cambridge | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge |
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 62599 | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 31A | Cambridge | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge |
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 62609 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 31A | Cambridge | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64288 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 9G | Northwich | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64338 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 62532 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 31A | Cambridge |
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 62535 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 40A | Lincoln |
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 62536 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 31A | Cambridge | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge |
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 62568 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 31D | South Lynn | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge |
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 62587 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | on | 17/12/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 62599 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 40A | Lincoln |
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 62609 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 31A | Cambridge |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64288 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64338 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | 6w/e | 25/12/1954 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64719 | on | 05/10/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | on | 07/12/1958 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64723 | on | 13/10/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | on | 07/12/1958 | 40A | Lincoln |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64789 | on | 12/10/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | on | 31/01/1960 | 31B | March |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64883 | on | 12/10/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | on | 07/04/1957 | 33A | Plaistow |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64901 | on | 12/10/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | on | 07/04/1957 | 33A | Plaistow |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64902 | on | 05/10/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | on | 25/11/1956 | 36D | Barnsley |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64951 | on | 12/10/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | on | 07/04/1957 | 33A | Plaistow |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64954 | on | 12/10/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | on | 26/05/1957 | 33A | Plaistow |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64965 | on | 12/10/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | on | 29/06/1958 | 33A | Plaistow |
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 62536 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 35C | on | 25/07/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 62568 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 35C | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 40A | Lincoln |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64896 | on | 07/09/1943 | ARD | Ardsley | on | 28/12/1952 | 35C | on | 07/04/1957 | 33A | Plaistow |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64397 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 35C | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 35A | New England | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 68809 | on | 01/01/1948 | KX | Kings Cross | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 35C | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 35A | New England |
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 68831 | on | 01/01/1948 | KX | Kings Cross | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 35C | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 35B | Grantham |
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 68889 | on | 01/01/1948 | KX | Kings Cross | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 35C | w/e | 30/05/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 68759 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 36A | Doncaster | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 35C | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 35A | New England |
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 68783 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 35C | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 35A | New England |
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 68797 | on | 01/01/1948 | KX | Kings Cross | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 35C | on | 03/11/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 67366 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 35A | New England | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 35C | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64891 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 38A | Colwick | on | 12/04/1953 | 35C | on | 07/04/1957 | 33A | Plaistow |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64981 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 38A | Colwick | on | 12/04/1953 | 35C | on | 07/04/1957 | 33A | Plaistow |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64738 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 39A | Gorton | on | 21/06/1953 | 35C | on | 13/09/1953 | 35A | New England |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64765 | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | STR | Stratford | on | 21/06/1953 | 35C | on | 30/08/1953 | 30A | Stratford |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64833 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 37A | Ardsley | on | 21/06/1953 | 35C | on | 13/09/1953 | 35A | New England |
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 67368 | on | 01/01/1948 | NWE | New England | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 35C | on | 26/10/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44247 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 40A | Lincoln | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 35C | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 2E | Northampton |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41060 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 40A | Lincoln | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 35C | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40419 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 40A | Lincoln | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 35C | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90156 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NWE | New England | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 35C | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 35A | New England |
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 62609 | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 31A | Cambridge | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 35C | on | 04/02/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 62551 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 31A | Cambridge | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 35C | on | 16/07/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43080 | on | 26/10/1950 | 35A | New England (New) | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 35C | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 35A | New England |
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 67380 | on | 01/01/1948 | GRA | Grantham | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 35C | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 35A | New England |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43127 | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 35A | New England | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 35C | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 34E | New England |
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 68817 | on | 01/01/1948 | NWE | New England | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 35C | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 35A | New England |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64736 | on | 22/06/1935 | LIN | Lincoln | on | 10/07/1955 | 35C | on | 07/12/1958 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 61538 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | GRA | Grantham | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 35C | on | 01/01/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 61565 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | GRA | Grantham | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 35C | on | 01/01/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64783 | on | 18/06/1950 | 30A | Stratford | on | 24/07/1955 | 35C | on | 04/09/1955 | 30A | Stratford |
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 67379 | on | 01/01/1948 | LTH | Louth | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 35C | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 35A | New England |
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 68817 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 35A | New England | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 35C | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 35A | New England |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61047 | on | 25/10/1953 | 35A | New England | on | 27/11/1955 | 35C | on | 14/12/1958 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47282 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 33A | Plaistow | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 35C | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 35A | New England |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47306 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 33A | Plaistow | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 35C | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 35A | New England |
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 67352 | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 35A | New England | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 35C | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 35B | Grantham |
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 61554 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | GRA | Grantham | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 35C | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 31A | Cambridge |
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 61567 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 35B | Grantham | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 35C | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 31A | Cambridge |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47311 | on | 01/01/1948 | 13A | Plaistow | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 35C | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 35A | New England |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61006 | on | 07/10/1956 | 35A | New England | on | 06/01/1957 | 35C | on | 16/06/1957 | 30A | Stratford |
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 61558 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 30E | Colchester | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 35C | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 31A | Cambridge |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61001 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 34E | Neasden | on | 20/01/1957 | 35C | on | 03/03/1957 | 32B | Ipswich |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61083 | on | 16/06/1947 | NEA | Neasden | on | 20/01/1957 | 35C | on | 14/12/1958 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61005 | on | 07/10/1956 | 35A | New England | on | 03/02/1957 | 35C | on | 16/06/1957 | 30A | Stratford |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61323 | on | 27/05/1948 | KIT | Kittybrewster (New) | on | 25/02/1957 | 35C | on | 31/01/1960 | 31B | March |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61348 | on | 09/06/1949 | 61A | Kittybrewster (New) | on | 25/02/1957 | 35C | on | 31/01/1960 | 31B | March |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61095 | on | 17/05/1953 | 35A | New England | on | 03/03/1957 | 35C | on | 31/01/1960 | 31B | March |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64985 | on | 28/10/1956 | 35A | New England | on | 14/04/1957 | 35C | on | 08/06/1958 | 31A | Cambridge |
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 67367 | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 31A | Cambridge | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 35C | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 35B | Grantham |
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 67397 | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 31A | Cambridge | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 35C | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 35B | Grantham |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64901 | on | 07/04/1957 | 33A | Plaistow | on | 26/05/1957 | 35C | on | 31/01/1960 | 31B | March |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61204 | on | 20/09/1953 | 35A | New England | on | 16/06/1957 | 35C | on | 31/01/1960 | 31B | March |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61205 | on | 20/09/1953 | 35A | New England | on | 16/06/1957 | 35C | on | 31/01/1960 | 31B | March |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47300 | 4w/e | 25/05/1956 | 35B | Grantham | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 35C | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 31B | March |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47429 | 4w/e | 25/05/1956 | 35B | Grantham | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 35C | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 35A | New England |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47458 | 4w/e | 25/05/1956 | 35B | Grantham | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 35C | 5w/e | 24/08/1957 | 35A | New England |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47306 | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 35A | New England | 5w/e | 24/08/1957 | 35C | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 30A | Stratford |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61156 | on | 13/06/1954 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | on | 29/09/1957 | 35C | on | 31/01/1960 | 31B | March |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47311 | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 35A | New England | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 35C | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 30A | Stratford |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90528 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 35A | New England | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 35C | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 31B | March |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47282 | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 35A | New England | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 35C | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 11156 | on | 24/04/1956 | 35A | New England (New) | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 35C | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 31B | March |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 11157 | on | 10/05/1956 | 35A | New England (New) | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 35C | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 31B | March |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 11158 | on | 18/05/1956 | 35A | New England (New) | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 35C | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 31B | March |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 11159 | on | 03/06/1956 | 35A | New England (New) | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 35C | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 31B | March |
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 41949 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 30A | Stratford | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 35C | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 31C | Kings Lynn |
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 41975 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 30A | Stratford | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 35C | on | 26/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 11156 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 31B | March | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 31F | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 31B | March |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61096 | on | 21/09/1958 | 31A | Cambridge | on | 14/12/1958 | 31F | on | 31/01/1960 | 31B | March |
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 41969 | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 33A | Plaistow | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 31F | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 31C | Kings Lynn |
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 62597 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 31F | on | 04/01/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 62612 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 32B | Ipswich | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 31F | on | 24/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 62613 | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 31F | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 31B | March |
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 41949 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 31B | March | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 31F | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 31B | March |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90023 | w/e | 26/12/1959 | 31F | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 33B | Tilbury |