Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 711 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2435 Week
» 12570 Month
» 328801 Year
» 839903 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: St Leonards


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to St Leonards Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam Schools 4-4-0 900       01/01/1948 STL q/e 06/06/1958 75A Brighton
Steam Schools 4-4-0 901       01/01/1948 STL q/e 06/06/1958 75A Brighton
Steam Schools 4-4-0 902       01/01/1948 STL q/e 06/06/1958 70A Nine Elms
Steam Schools 4-4-0 903       01/01/1948 STL 9w/e 12/06/1957 70A Nine Elms
Steam Schools 4-4-0 904       01/01/1948 STL 9w/e 12/06/1957 70A Nine Elms
Steam Schools 4-4-0 905       01/01/1948 STL 9w/e 12/06/1957 70A Nine Elms
Steam Schools 4-4-0 906       01/01/1948 STL 4w/e 17/06/1950 74E St Leonards
Steam Schools 4-4-0 907       01/01/1948 STL 9w/e 12/06/1957 70A Nine Elms
Steam Schools 4-4-0 908       01/01/1948 STL 4w/e 08/12/1950 74E St Leonards
Steam Schools 4-4-0 909       01/01/1948 STL 4w/e 07/10/1950 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Schools 4-4-0 910       01/01/1948 STL 4w/e 12/05/1951 74B Ramsgate
Steam C 0-6-0 1037       01/01/1948 STL 5w/e 11/12/1952 74D Tonbridge
Steam C 0-6-0 1038       01/01/1948 STL 9w/e 30/06/1952 74D Tonbridge
Steam O1 0-6-0 1041       01/01/1948 STL m/e 05/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 1075       01/01/1948 STL 4w/e 20/08/1954 70C Guildford
Steam R1 0-6-0T 1174       01/01/1948 STL 7w/e 08/10/1957 74C Dover Marine
Steam R1 0-6-0T 1335       01/01/1948 STL m/e 07/1955 Withdrawn
Steam O1 0-6-0 1432       01/01/1948 STL m/e 06/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 1737       01/01/1948 STL 4w/e 08/12/1950 74B Ramsgate
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 1738       01/01/1948 STL m/e 10/1950 Withdrawn
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 1740       01/01/1948 STL m/e 03/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 1744       01/01/1948 STL m/e 05/1953 Withdrawn
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 1766       01/01/1948 STL 9w/e 30/06/1952 74D Tonbridge
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 1767       01/01/1948 STL 4w/e 17/06/1950 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 1768       01/01/1948 STL 7w/e 19/12/1955 73E Faversham
Steam N1 2-6-0 1822       01/01/1948 STL 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge
Steam N1 2-6-0 1876       01/01/1948 STL 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge
Steam N1 2-6-0 1877       01/01/1948 STL 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2371       01/01/1948 STL m/e 10/1948 Withdrawn
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2379       01/01/1948 STL 4w/e 09/09/1950 75D Horsham
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2383       01/01/1948 STL m/e 12/1948 Withdrawn
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2394       01/01/1948 STL 6w/e 20/03/1951 74E St Leonards
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30906 01/01/1948 STL St Leonards 4w/e 17/06/1950 74E 9w/e 12/06/1957 70A Nine Elms
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32678 01/01/1948 KESR Kent and East Sussex Railway 4w/e 09/09/1950 74E 4w/e 13/11/1950 74A Ashford
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30922 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 07/10/1950 74E 4w/e 05/02/1951 74C Dover Marine
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30923 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 07/10/1950 74E 4w/e 05/02/1951 74C Dover Marine
Steam R1 0-4-4T 31706 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 07/10/1950 74E 4w/e 13/11/1950 74D Tonbridge
Steam H 0-4-4T 31164 01/01/1948 RAM Ramsgate 4w/e 13/11/1950 74E 4w/e 06/10/1951 74D Tonbridge
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30908 01/01/1948 STL St Leonards 4w/e 08/12/1950 74E 9w/e 12/06/1957 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 32390 01/01/1948 TWW Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 08/12/1950 74E 5w/e 14/02/1953 75A Brighton
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30909 4w/e 07/10/1950 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 05/02/1951 74E 9w/e 12/06/1957 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 31496 01/01/1948 FAV Faversham 4w/e 05/02/1951 74E 4w/e 26/05/1953 70E Reading (S.R.)
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 31767 4w/e 08/12/1950 74C Dover Marine 4w/e 05/02/1951 74E 7w/e 19/12/1955 73E Faversham
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30911 4w/e 17/06/1950 74B Ramsgate 6w/e 20/03/1951 74E 4w/e 11/04/1951 74E St Leonards
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30912 01/01/1948 RAM Ramsgate 6w/e 20/03/1951 74E 4w/e 11/04/1951 74E St Leonards
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 32393 01/01/1948 TWW Tunbridge Wells West 6w/e 20/03/1951 74E 4w/e 12/05/1951 74E St Leonards
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 32394 01/01/1948 STL St Leonards 6w/e 20/03/1951 74E 4w/e 12/05/1951 74E St Leonards
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30911 6w/e 20/03/1951 74E St Leonards 4w/e 11/04/1951 74E 4w/e 19/03/1952 74E St Leonards
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30912 6w/e 20/03/1951 74E St Leonards 4w/e 11/04/1951 74E 4w/e 06/10/1951 74E St Leonards
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 32393 6w/e 20/03/1951 74E St Leonards 4w/e 12/05/1951 74E m/e 10/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 32394 6w/e 20/03/1951 74E St Leonards 4w/e 12/05/1951 74E m/e 12/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30910 4w/e 12/05/1951 74B Ramsgate 4w/e 06/10/1951 74E 4w/e 19/03/1952 74E St Leonards
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30912 4w/e 11/04/1951 74E St Leonards 4w/e 06/10/1951 74E 4w/e 19/03/1952 74E St Leonards
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 32388 4w/e 12/05/1951 75G Eastbourne 4w/e 06/10/1951 74E m/e 12/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 32386 01/01/1948 BTN Brighton 4w/e 21/01/1952 74E m/e 06/1952 Withdrawn
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30910 4w/e 06/10/1951 74E St Leonards 4w/e 19/03/1952 74E 9w/e 12/06/1957 74B Ramsgate
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30911 4w/e 11/04/1951 74E St Leonards 4w/e 19/03/1952 74E 9w/e 30/06/1952 74B Ramsgate
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30912 4w/e 06/10/1951 74E St Leonards 4w/e 19/03/1952 74E 9w/e 30/06/1952 74B Ramsgate
Steam H 0-4-4T 31518 01/01/1948 TON Tonbridge 4w/e 19/03/1952 74E 5w/e 14/02/1953 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam H 0-4-4T 31279 4w/e 12/05/1951 74A Ashford 9w/e 30/06/1952 74E q/e 06/06/1958 74D Tonbridge
Steam H 0-4-4T 31519 01/01/1948 TON Tonbridge 9w/e 30/06/1952 74E 5w/e 14/02/1953 74D Tonbridge
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32640 9w/e 30/06/1952 71D Fratton 6w/e 13/08/1952 74E 8w/e 07/10/1952 75A Brighton
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 32384 4w/e 06/10/1951 75G Eastbourne 8w/e 07/10/1952 74E m/e 11/1953 Withdrawn
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 32385 01/01/1948 BTN Brighton 8w/e 07/10/1952 74E 4w/e 26/05/1953 74A Ashford
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30919 4w/e 12/05/1951 74G   5w/e 11/12/1952 74E 9w/e 12/06/1957 74B Ramsgate
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30920 4w/e 12/05/1951 74G   5w/e 11/12/1952 74E 6w/e 20/04/1955 74E St Leonards
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30923 4w/e 19/03/1952 74C Dover Marine 5w/e 11/12/1952 74E 4w/e 08/01/1953 74C Dover Marine
Steam H 0-4-4T 31274 01/01/1948 AFD Ashford 5w/e 11/12/1952 74E m/e 11/1957 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 31721 9w/e 30/06/1952 74A Ashford 5w/e 11/12/1952 74E 4w/e 17/12/1956 73C Hither Green
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 31769 9w/e 30/06/1952 74A Ashford 5w/e 11/12/1952 74E 4w/e 10/10/1955 74B Ramsgate
Steam H 0-4-4T 31162 7w/e 27/06/1951 73E Faversham 5w/e 14/02/1953 74E q/e 06/06/1958 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam H 0-4-4T 31161 5w/e 14/02/1953 73D Gillingham (Kent) 8w/e 20/07/1953 74E 4w/e 20/08/1954 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam H 0-4-4T 31295 9w/e 30/06/1952 73D Gillingham (Kent) 8w/e 20/07/1953 74E q/e 06/06/1958 74D Tonbridge
Steam H 0-4-4T 31519 6w/e 27/03/1953 73E Faversham 8w/e 20/07/1953 74E q/e 06/06/1958 74A Ashford
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32662 01/01/1948 FRA Fratton 4w/e 01/10/1953 74E 4w/e 30/12/1953 75A Brighton
Steam H 0-4-4T 31158 4w/e 05/02/1951 74A Ashford 4w/e 29/10/1953 74E 4w/e 10/12/1953 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam H 0-4-4T 31269 4w/e 12/05/1951 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 29/10/1953 74E q/e 06/06/1958 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32655 4w/e 26/05/1953 74A Ashford 4w/e 08/02/1954 74E 3w/e 01/11/1955 75A Brighton
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32678 4w/e 13/11/1950 74A Ashford 4w/e 08/02/1954 74E q/e 06/06/1958 70F Fratton
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32670 01/01/1948 KESR Kent and East Sussex Railway 4w/e 20/08/1954 74E 4w/e 14/01/1958 75A Brighton
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 31764 4w/e 05/02/1951 74D Tonbridge 4w/e 06/11/1954 74E 4w/e 10/10/1955 74B Ramsgate
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32578 8w/e 20/07/1953 74D Tonbridge 4w/e 11/12/1954 74E 9w/e 08/02/1955 74D Tonbridge
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30920 5w/e 11/12/1952 74E St Leonards 6w/e 20/04/1955 74E 9w/e 12/06/1957 74B Ramsgate
Steam H 0-4-4T 31520 4w/e 12/05/1951 75F Tunbridge Wells West 6w/e 21/06/1955 74E q/e 06/06/1958 74A Ashford
Steam R1 0-6-0T 31010 01/01/1948 AFD Ashford 5w/e 12/08/1955 74E 7w/e 08/10/1957 74C Dover Marine
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30930 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 01/11/1955 74E 9w/e 12/06/1957 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32636 5w/e 24/08/1953 75A Brighton 3w/e 01/11/1955 74E q/e 06/06/1958 74A Ashford
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30923 4w/e 08/01/1953 74C Dover Marine 3w/e 17/11/1956 74E 9w/e 12/06/1957 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam C 0-6-0 31498 4w/e 08/02/1954 73C Hither Green 6w/e 25/01/1957 74E q/e 06/06/1958 73C Hither Green
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 31773 8w/e 07/10/1952 74D Tonbridge 9w/e 12/06/1957 74E q/e 06/06/1958 74D Tonbridge
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 31774 5w/e 11/12/1952 74A Ashford 9w/e 12/06/1957 74E q/e 06/06/1958 74D Tonbridge
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 31775 5w/e 11/12/1952 74A Ashford 9w/e 12/06/1957 74E q/e 06/06/1958 74B Ramsgate
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6586 02/02/1962 73C Hither Green (New) 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D w/e 20/10/1967 73C Hither Green
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6587 09/02/1962 73C Hither Green (New) 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D w/e 20/10/1967 73C Hither Green
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6588 16/02/1962 73C Hither Green (New) 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D w/e 20/10/1967 73C Hither Green
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6589 23/02/1962 73C Hither Green (New) 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D w/e 20/10/1967 73C Hither Green
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6590 23/02/1962 73C Hither Green (New) 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D w/e 20/10/1967 73C Hither Green
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6591 09/03/1962 73C Hither Green (New) 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D w/e 20/10/1967 73C Hither Green
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6592 16/03/1962 73C Hither Green (New) 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D w/e 20/10/1967 73C Hither Green
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6593 23/03/1962 73C Hither Green (New) 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D w/e 20/10/1967 73C Hither Green
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6594 30/03/1962 73C Hither Green (New) 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D w/e 20/10/1967 73C Hither Green
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6595 13/04/1962 73C Hither Green (New) 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D w/e 20/10/1967 73C Hither Green
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6596 27/04/1962 73C Hither Green (New) 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D w/e 20/10/1967 73C Hither Green
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6597 11/05/1962 73C Hither Green (New) 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D w/e 20/10/1967 73C Hither Green