Depot: Stafford Road
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Stafford Road | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 4600 | 4-4-2T | 4600 | on | 05/02/1914 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 11/05/1914 | SRD | 4w/e | 13/06/1914 | TYS | Tyseley |
Steam | 4600 | 4-4-2T | 4600 | 4w/e | 13/06/1914 | TYS | Tyseley | on | 20/05/1915 | SRD | on | 28/01/1919 | PDK | Pembroke Dock |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4016 | on | 27/02/1926 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 01/04/1926 | SRD | on | 25/05/1926 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4092 | on | 06/08/1925 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 26/05/1926 | SRD | on | 05/09/1926 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4037 | on | 06/10/1920 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 02/07/1926 | SRD | on | 27/08/1926 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4016 | on | 25/05/1926 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 16/08/1926 | SRD | on | 03/10/1928 | OXY | Oxley |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4037 | on | 27/08/1926 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 12/11/1926 | SRD | on | 27/07/1929 | TYS | Tyseley |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4016 | on | 03/10/1928 | OXY | Oxley | on | 17/04/1929 | SRD | m/e | 02/1933 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4037 | on | 27/07/1929 | TYS | Tyseley | on | 09/08/1929 | SRD | on | 27/01/1930 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4088 | on | 14/01/1929 | NA | Newton Abbot | on | 30/12/1929 | SRD | m/e | 01/1933 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4079 | on | 11/09/1931 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 01/12/1932 | SRD | on | 14/12/1935 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4082 | on | 23/08/1931 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 16/12/1932 | SRD | on | 22/02/1933 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4089 | on | 17/09/1929 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 20/12/1932 | SRD | on | 02/11/1935 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4096 | on | 04/04/1931 | NA | Newton Abbot | m/e | 02/1933 | SRD | on | 03/06/1934 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4097 | on | 06/01/1931 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 07/1933 | SRD | on | 24/07/1934 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5031 | on | 02/06/1934 (New) | SRD | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5001 | on | 20/09/1931 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 14/04/1935 | SRD | on | 13/12/1935 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5033 | on | 17/05/1935 (New) | SRD | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5007 | on | 08/03/1935 | LA | Laira | on | 27/06/1935 | SRD | on | 05/05/1938 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5035 | on | 29/05/1935 | CDF | Cardiff Canton (New) | on | 14/12/1935 | SRD | on | 20/04/1940 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5036 | on | 04/06/1935 | CDF | Cardiff Canton (New) | m/e | 01/1936 | SRD | on | 28/02/1937 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2102 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | LMTN | Leamington | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | SRD | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | LMTN | Leamington |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7703 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | SRD | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | BAN | Banbury | ||||
Steam | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1803 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | OXY | Oxley | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | SRD | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2262 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | SRD | on | 15/06/1947 | CHR | Chester West | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2926 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | CHR | Chester West | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | SRD | on | 15/06/1947 | CHR | Chester West |
Steam | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3258 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | WLN | Wellington | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | SRD | m/e | 02/1938 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4018 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | SRD | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4105 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | SRD | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6403 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | LMTN | Leamington | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | SRD | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4087 | on | 21/02/1936 | EXE | Exeter | on | 07/05/1937 | SRD | on | 08/07/1937 | TR | Truro |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4000 | on | 22/06/1934 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | on | 11/05/1937 | SRD | m/e | 03/1938 | TYS | Tyseley |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5060 | on | 10/06/1937 (New) | SRD | on | 28/01/1939 | NA | Newton Abbot | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5062 | on | 23/06/1937 (New) | SRD | m/e | 09/1937 | NA | Newton Abbot | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5064 | on | 08/07/1937 | NA | Newton Abbot (New) | m/e | 09/1937 | SRD | m/e | 10/1937 | 4A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5053 | on | 06/06/1936 | 4A | Shrewsbury (New) | on | 25/10/1937 | SRD | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5086 | on | 11/12/1937 | SRD | m/e | 02/1938 | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5075 | on | 16/08/1938 (New) | SRD | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5061 | on | 11/06/1937 | 4A | Shrewsbury (New) | m/e | 10/1938 | SRD | m/e | 11/1938 | 4A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5073 | on | 13/07/1938 | LA | Laira (New) | m/e | 12/1938 | SRD | m/e | 02/1939 | 4A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4000 | m/e | 04/1938 | 4A | Shrewsbury | on | 04/05/1939 | SRD | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5081 | on | 03/06/1939 (New) | SRD | on | 17/01/1945 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5086 | m/e | 02/1938 | 4A | Shrewsbury | on | 29/11/1939 | SRD | on | 03/08/1942 | 4A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5070 | m/e | 01/1939 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 18/03/1940 | SRD | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5010 | m/e | 10/1938 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 26/04/1940 | SRD | m/e | 12/1940 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5021 | on | 17/12/1938 | 4A | Shrewsbury | on | 25/11/1940 | SRD | on | 05/04/1941 | 4A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5097 | on | 17/07/1939 | 4A | Shrewsbury (New) | on | 01/02/1941 | SRD | m/e | 03/1941 | 4A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5088 | on | 07/03/1939 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | on | 08/03/1942 | SRD | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5021 | on | 05/04/1941 | 4A | Shrewsbury | on | 20/05/1942 | SRD | on | 08/09/1945 | 4A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5061 | m/e | 11/1938 | 4A | Shrewsbury | on | 16/04/1943 | SRD | on | 22/04/1943 | 4A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5018 | on | 07/04/1936 | PDN | Old Oak Common | m/e | 02/1945 | SRD | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5015 | on | 23/05/1942 | 4A | Shrewsbury | on | 16/10/1945 | SRD | on | 27/01/1947 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6011 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | SRD | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4814 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | SRD | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2924 | on | 16/09/1907 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | SRD | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | HFD | Hereford |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7007 | on | 01/07/1946 (New) | SRD | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5015 | on | 27/01/1947 | SDN | Swindon | on | 03/04/1947 | SRD | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1016 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 83D | Laira | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1017 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1024 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1025 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1029 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 87H | Neyland | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2061 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2067 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | WLN | Wellington | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2095 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | m/e | 04/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2109 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | SRD | Stafford Road | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2110 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | m/e | 07/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2156 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | SRD | Stafford Road | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2231 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2232 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | CNYD | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2791 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | m/e | 04/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 5111 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | m/e | 10/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 5143 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | m/e | 12/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3160 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | m/e | 07/1953 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3615 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 88C | Barry | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3756 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3760 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | WLN | Wellington | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3778 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | m/e | 03/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4000 | on | 04/05/1939 | SRD | Stafford Road | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | on | 05/01/1955 | 84K | Chester West |
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4018 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | SRD | Stafford Road | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | m/e | 04/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4025 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | m/e | 08/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4031 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | m/e | 06/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4053 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | m/e | 07/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4060 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4101 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | TYS | Tyseley | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4103 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 84E | Tyseley | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4105 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | SRD | Stafford Road | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4108 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | BAN | Banbury | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4110 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | TYS | Tyseley | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4115 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 84K | Chester West | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4960 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 84C | Banbury | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5015 | on | 03/04/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | on | 20/03/1958 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5018 | m/e | 02/1945 | SRD | Stafford Road | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | on | 07/07/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5031 | on | 02/06/1934 | SRD | Stafford Road (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | on | 14/09/1950 | To Store | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5033 | on | 17/05/1935 | SRD | Stafford Road (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | on | 25/07/1947 | CHR | Chester West |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5053 | on | 25/10/1937 | SRD | Stafford Road | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | on | 08/12/1954 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5070 | on | 18/03/1940 | SRD | Stafford Road | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | on | 10/02/1960 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5075 | on | 16/08/1938 | SRD | Stafford Road (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | CHR | Chester West |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5088 | on | 08/03/1942 | SRD | Stafford Road | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | on | 29/11/1961 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5151 | 4w/e | 15/02/1930 | TYS | Tyseley | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5739 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 84K | Chester West | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5909 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | TYS | Tyseley | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5919 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5927 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | TYS | Tyseley | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5942 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 84B | Oxley | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5944 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 84B | Oxley | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5995 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 84B | Oxley | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6005 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6006 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | on | 15/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6008 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 83D | Laira | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6011 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | SRD | Stafford Road | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6321 | on | 01/01/1934 | 54 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 84E | Tyseley | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6391 | on | 01/01/1934 | 101 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6418 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 84C | Banbury | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6422 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6844 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6848 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 84B | Oxley | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6856 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 84C | Banbury | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6901 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 84C | Banbury | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6908 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | SDN | Swindon | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6924 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 84D | Leamington | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6964 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 84B | Oxley | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7007 | on | 01/07/1946 | SRD | Stafford Road (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | m/e | 09/1948 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7315 | on | 01/01/1934 | 194 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 84C | Banbury | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8705 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8726 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | m/e | 30/06/1948 | KDR | Kidderminster | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8734 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9621 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 1863 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | m/e | 09/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5033 | on | 25/07/1947 | CHR | Chester West | on | 13/02/1948 | SRD | m/e | 31/03/1948 | SRD | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5033 | on | 13/02/1948 | SRD | Stafford Road | m/e | 31/03/1948 | SRD | m/e | 31/05/1948 | CHR | Chester West |
Steam | 31xx | 2-6-2T | 3104 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | m/e | 31/05/1948 | SRD | m/e | 06/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8726 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | KDR | Kidderminster | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | SRD | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4076 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | m/e | 08/1948 | SRD | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | SRD | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5022 | on | 02/03/1948 | PDN | Old Oak Common | m/e | 09/1948 | SRD | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | SRD | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4076 | m/e | 08/1948 | SRD | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | SRD | on | 25/12/1948 | CHR | Chester West |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5022 | m/e | 09/1948 | SRD | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | SRD | on | 17/06/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5386 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | on | 14/10/1948 | SRD | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6002 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | SRD | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6004 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | SRD | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6020 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | SRD | m/e | 07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2854 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | SRD | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | LMTN | Leamington |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2156 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | SRD | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4337 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | SRD | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5103 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | SRD | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5075 | on | 28/03/1949 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | SRD | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | CHR | Chester West |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4121 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | SRD | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | PPRD | Pontypool Road |
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4058 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | SRD | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | SRD | Stafford Road |
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4058 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | SRD | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | SRD | m/e | 04/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7026 | m/e | 08/1949 | n/a | Unallocated | m/e | 11/1949 | SRD | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | SRD | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7026 | m/e | 11/1949 | SRD | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | SRD | on | 07/09/1962 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2109 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | SRD | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3762 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHR | Chester West | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 84A | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 84K | Chester West |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3760 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | WLN | Wellington | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 84A | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 84H | Wellington |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5010 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | LDR | Landore | on | 08/05/1950 | 84A | on | 23/05/1950 | To Store | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5780 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 84A | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5008 | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 81F | Oxford | m/e | 07/1950 | 84A | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1410 | on | 15/06/1947 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 84A | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5010 | on | 23/05/1950 | 98S | on | 26/07/1950 | 84A | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 84A | Stafford Road | |
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4049 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXF | Oxford | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 84A | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5008 | m/e | 07/1950 | 84A | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 84A | m/e | 11/1956 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5010 | on | 26/07/1950 | 84A | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 84A | on | 04/03/1953 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7915 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 84A | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 84A | Stafford Road | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8462 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 84A | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 84A | Stafford Road | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4049 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 84A | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 84A | m/e | 07/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7915 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 84A | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 84A | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8462 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 84A | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 84A | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5061 | on | 07/03/1950 | 98S | m/e | 11/1950 | 84A | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 84A | Stafford Road | |
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4061 | on | 15/06/1947 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 84A | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6942 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 84A | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5045 | on | 28/09/1950 | 98Ss | on | 06/11/1950 | 84A | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 84A | Stafford Road | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4092 | on | 15/06/1947 | WOS | Worcester | on | 07/11/1950 | 84A | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5031 | on | 14/09/1950 | 98S | on | 07/11/1950 | 84A | on | 01/02/1955 | 84K | Chester West | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4083 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 84G | Shrewsbury | on | 16/11/1950 | 84A | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4061 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 84A | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 84A | m/e | 03/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6942 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 84A | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 84A | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4092 | on | 07/11/1950 | 84A | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 84A | on | 20/03/1958 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5045 | on | 06/11/1950 | 84A | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 84A | on | 21/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6956 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 84A | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4083 | on | 16/11/1950 | 84A | Stafford Road | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 84A | on | 24/03/1958 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1410 | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 84A | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6956 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 84A | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 84A | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8423 | on | 31/10/1950 | 84K | Chester West (New) | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 84A | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9428 | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | NYA | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 84A | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 84A | Stafford Road | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1410 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 84A | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 84A | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 84J | Croes Newydd |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5061 | m/e | 11/1950 | 84A | Stafford Road | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 84A | m/e | 05/1951 | 84K | Chester West |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8423 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 84A | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 84A | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9428 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 84A | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 84A | m/e | 06/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9435 | on | 31/01/1951 (New) | 84A | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 84A | Stafford Road | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9435 | on | 31/01/1951 | 84A | Stafford Road (New) | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 84A | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 84H | Wellington |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5151 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 84A | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5701 | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | WLN | Wellington | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 84A | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3658 | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | TYS | Tyseley | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 84A | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4605 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 84A | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 84H | Wellington |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5151 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 84E | Tyseley | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 84A | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 84G | Kidderminster |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3664 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 84A | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3664 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 84A | Stafford Road | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 84A | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 86F | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1426 | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 84A | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6418 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 84A | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1426 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 84A | Stafford Road | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 84A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 84J | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6418 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 84A | Stafford Road | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 84A | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6940 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 83D | Laira | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 84A | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6966 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 83D | Laira | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 84A | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5032 | on | 15/06/1947 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | m/e | 11/1951 | 84A | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1004 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 83G | Penzance | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 84A | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5027 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 84K | Chester West | on | 06/11/1951 | 84A | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5027 | on | 06/11/1951 | 84A | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 84A | m/e | 06/1954 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5032 | m/e | 11/1951 | 84A | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 84A | on | 20/03/1958 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2061 | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 84A | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 84H | Wellington |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5187 | m/e | 31/03/1948 | TYS | Tyseley | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 84A | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6014 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 84A | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6016 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 84A | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9798 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 84A | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4918 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 84A | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4960 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 84A | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4991 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 84A | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5738 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 84A | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5944 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 84A | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7735 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 84A | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4918 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 84A | Stafford Road | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 84A | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4960 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 84A | Stafford Road | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 84A | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4991 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 84A | Stafford Road | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 84A | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5738 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 84A | Stafford Road | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 84A | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5944 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 84A | Stafford Road | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 84A | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7735 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 84A | Stafford Road | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 84A | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4079 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 84A | on | 29/06/1953 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4147 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 84A | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5188 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 84A | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5190 | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 84A | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5106 | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 84A | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1018 | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 84A | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1019 | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 84A | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1004 | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 84A | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5010 | on | 04/03/1953 | 83D | Laira | on | 14/05/1953 | 84A | on | 20/03/1958 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3792 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 84A | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 84B | St Blazey |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3793 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 84A | m/e | 09/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7309 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 84A | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8798 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 84A | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4079 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 84A | Stafford Road | on | 29/06/1953 | 84A | on | 13/06/1957 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4090 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common | on | 03/07/1953 | 84A | m/e | 12/1955 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 5112 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 84A | m/e | 10/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8462 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 84A | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4103 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 84A | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 84D | Leamington |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6964 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 84A | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9435 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 84H | Wellington | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 84A | on | 14/07/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4997 | on | 15/06/1947 | NEY | Neyland | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 84A | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5634 | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 84A | 4w/e | 18/06/1955 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6949 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 84A | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4912 | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 84A | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7220 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 84A | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6014 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 84A | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6956 | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 84A | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5391 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 84A | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4094 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 07/1954 | 84A | m/e | 06/1957 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4926 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 84A | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6975 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 84A | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 84B | Oxley | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9312 | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 84A | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4140 | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 84A | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6001 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 84A | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5047 | on | 27/04/1948 | NA | Newton Abbot | on | 03/11/1954 | 84A | on | 21/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9496 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 84A | m/e | 12/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6404 | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 84A | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 84J | Croes Newydd |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4000 | on | 05/01/1955 | 84K | Chester West | m/e | 31/01/1955 | 84A | m/e | 09/1956 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5031 | on | 01/02/1955 | 84K | Chester West | m/e | 03/1955 | 84A | on | 09/09/1963 | 2B | Oxley |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5188 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 87G | Carmarthen | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 84A | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3769 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 84A | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5075 | on | 15/07/1949 | CHR | Chester West | m/e | 05/1956 | 84A | m/e | 04/1958 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4986 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 84B | Oxley | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 84A | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4990 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 83G | Penzance | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 84A | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5926 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 83E | St Blazey | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 84A | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4901 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 87G | Carmarthen | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 84A | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5026 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 81F | Oxford | on | 20/03/1958 | 84A | on | 19/12/1960 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5046 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 20/03/1958 | 84A | on | 21/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5072 | on | 24/01/1957 | 83D | Laira | on | 20/03/1958 | 84A | on | 11/10/1960 | 88A | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6867 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 84A | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5059 | m/e | 05/1953 | 83A | Newton Abbot | on | 02/04/1958 | 84A | on | 17/05/1960 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5063 | on | 01/06/1954 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | on | 16/04/1958 | 84A | on | 09/09/1963 | 2B | Oxley |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5019 | m/e | 05/1948 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 08/05/1958 | 84A | on | 21/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5089 | m/e | 04/1956 | 83D | Laira | on | 20/05/1958 | 84A | on | 09/09/1963 | 2B | Oxley |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6926 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 84A | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2841 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 84A | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8796 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 84A | m/e | 04/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4161 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 84A | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8425 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 84A | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8426 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 84A | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8462 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 84A | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6016 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 84A | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6027 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 84A | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6975 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 84A | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6008 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 84A | m/e | 06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6017 | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 84A | m/e | 07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7015 | m/e | 11/1955 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | on | 28/05/1959 | 84A | on | 04/11/1959 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4918 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 84A | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 88A | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6926 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 84A | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4078 | on | 08/11/1958 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | on | 11/07/1959 | 84A | on | 04/11/1959 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6022 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 84A | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6007 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 84A | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8461 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 84A | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4938 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXF | Oxford | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 84A | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4954 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 84A | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4986 | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 84A | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6930 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 84A | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6987 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 84A | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6027 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 84A | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3715 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 84A | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6933 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 83G | Penzance | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 84A | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6945 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 83G | Penzance | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 84A | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8452 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 84A | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8498 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 84A | on | 14/07/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6934 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 84A | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 89A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9470 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 84A | on | 14/07/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4923 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 87G | Carmarthen | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 84A | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5983 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 84A | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6931 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 83E | St Blazey | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 84A | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5072 | on | 11/10/1960 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | on | 31/10/1960 | 84A | on | 30/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2201 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 81E | Didcot | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 84A | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 89B | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4179 | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 84A | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 84B | Oxley | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5183 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 84A | m/e | 05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5026 | on | 19/12/1960 | 84E | Tyseley | on | 19/05/1961 | 84A | on | 09/09/1963 | 2B | Oxley |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6013 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 84A | m/e | 06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7012 | on | 31/10/1960 | 81A | Old Oak Common | on | 13/06/1961 | 84A | on | 09/09/1963 | 2B | Oxley |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8426 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 84A | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7001 | on | 13/07/1953 | 81A | Old Oak Common | on | 18/08/1961 | 84A | on | 09/09/1963 | 2B | Oxley |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7024 | m/e | 07/1949 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 18/08/1961 | 84A | on | 09/09/1963 | 2B | Oxley |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5152 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 84A | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5199 | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 84A | m/e | 03/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7019 | m/e | 06/1949 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road (New) | on | 09/11/1961 | 84A | on | 09/09/1963 | 2B | Oxley |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4086 | on | 10/05/1961 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | on | 11/12/1961 | 84A | on | 19/01/1962 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5088 | on | 29/11/1961 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | on | 02/01/1962 | 84A | on | 21/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6019 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 84A | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6027 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 84A | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 84A | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78008 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 84A | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6012 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 84A | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4120 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 84H | Wellington | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 84A | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 84E | Tyseley |
Diesel | LION | Co-Co | D0260 | on | 28/05/1962 (New) | 84A | on | 09/09/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7014 | on | 08/08/1961 | 81A | Old Oak Common | on | 15/06/1962 | 84A | on | 09/09/1963 | 2B | Oxley |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4165 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 84A | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6015 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 84A | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4964 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 84A | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6002 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 84A | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6016 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 84A | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7036 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common | on | 14/07/1962 | 84A | on | 07/09/1962 | To Store | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4148 | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 84A | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7026 | on | 07/09/1962 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | on | 12/11/1962 | 84A | on | 09/09/1963 | 2B | Oxley |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9640 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 81A | Old Oak Common | on | 14/07/1963 | 84A | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9658 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 14/07/1963 | 84A | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9661 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 14/07/1963 | 84A | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 84B | Oxley |