Depot: Stirling
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Stirling | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6351 | 06/1920 | ROD | on | 19/08/1924 | 29B | on | 22/07/1943 | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6370 | 08/1921 | ROD | on | 20/08/1924 | 29B | on | 27/10/1939 | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | 9132 | m/e | 11/1935 | STG | on | 01/01/1948 | STG | Stirling | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 17328 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 29B | on | 01/01/1948 | 28A | Motherwell | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13109 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 29B | on | 01/01/1948 | 30D | Ayr | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 16343 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 31B | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | Stirling | ||||
Steam | 19 | 0-4-4T | 55117 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | on | 19/06/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 19 | 0-4-4T | 15122 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | on | 17/01/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 92 | 0-4-4T | 15126 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 63B | Stirling | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 15212 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | w/e | 01/04/1950 | 63A | Perth South | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 15222 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 63B | Stirling | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 17232 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | on | 15/05/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 17233 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | on | 02/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 17246 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | on | 02/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 17243 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | on | 17/06/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 17252 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | on | 22/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 17257 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | on | 02/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 17264 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | on | 02/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | 57402 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | m/e | 08/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | 57422 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | on | 05/06/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | 17423 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | on | 09/03/1953 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | 17424 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 63E | Oban | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | 17425 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | on | 06/11/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | 57466 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | m/e | 04/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | 17468 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | on | 04/02/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | 17460 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | on | 07/01/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4283 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 66A | Polmadie | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4330 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | 4w/e | 12/06/1954 | 67B | Hurlford | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4331 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 67B | Hurlford | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 56254 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | on | 16/04/1958 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 56343 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 31B | Stirling | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | m/e | 01/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 56365 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | on | 15/05/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 56366 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | on | 02/11/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 43 | 4-4-0 | 14455 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 32B | Aviemore | ||||
Steam | 113 | 4-4-0 | 14466 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | w/e | 01/01/1949 | 60B | Aviemore | ||||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | 14485 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 30D | Ayr | ||||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | 14491 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 32A | Inverness | ||||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | 14496 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 32A | Inverness | ||||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | 7462 | on | 01/01/1948 | STG | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 64E | Polmont | ||||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 2209 | on | 01/01/1948 | STG | on | 11/11/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D33 | 4-4-0 | 2461 | on | 01/01/1948 | STG | on | 06/06/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4461 | on | 01/01/1948 | STG | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 68E | Carlisle Canal | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4471 | on | 01/01/1948 | STG | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 68E | Carlisle Canal | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4497 | on | 01/01/1948 | STG | 4w/e | 11/04/1959 | 64C | Dalry Road | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4501 | on | 01/01/1948 | STG | 4w/e | 11/04/1959 | 64C | Dalry Road | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4520 | on | 01/01/1948 | STG | 8w/e | 17/04/1954 | 65D | Dawsholm | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4525 | on | 01/01/1948 | STG | w/e | 15/01/1949 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 5281 | on | 01/01/1948 | STG | w/e | 15/01/1949 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 5307 | on | 01/01/1948 | STG | w/e | 15/01/1949 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 5322 | on | 01/01/1948 | STG | w/e | 15/01/1949 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 5346 | on | 01/01/1948 | STG | w/e | 01/10/1949 | BGT | Bathgate | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4542 | on | 01/01/1948 | STG | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4544 | on | 01/01/1948 | STG | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4556 | on | 01/01/1948 | STG | w/e | 15/01/1949 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4569 | on | 01/01/1948 | STG | 4w/e | 11/04/1959 | 64C | Dalry Road | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4585 | on | 01/01/1948 | STG | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | 8342 | on | 01/01/1948 | STG | w/e | 22/05/1948 | STM | St Margarets | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | 8346 | m/e | 11/1935 | STG | Stirling | on | 01/01/1948 | STG | w/e | 15/01/1949 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper |
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | 8354 | on | 01/01/1948 | STG | m/e | 09/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 7618 | on | 01/01/1948 | STG | w/e | 12/02/1949 | EFD | Eastfield | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 7650 | on | 01/01/1948 | STG | 4w/e | 14/03/1959 | 65C | Parkhead | ||||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 2153 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 29C | Dundee West | w/e | 20/03/1948 | 31B | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 20F | Skipton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45358 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 31B | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45359 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 31B | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | 66B | Motherwell |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 40924 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 32B | Aviemore | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 31B | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 63A | Perth South |
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 7675 | on | 25/01/1948 | PKS | Parkeston Quay | w/e | 25/12/1948 | STG | ||||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | 62426 | on | 01/01/1948 | PTH | Perth (LNER) | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 63B | on | 25/06/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 879 | 0-4-4T | 55145 | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 63A | Perth South | w/e | 01/04/1950 | 63B | w/e | 18/04/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43884 | on | 01/01/1948 | 28A | Motherwell | on | 01/10/1950 | 63B | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 63B | Stirling |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43884 | on | 01/10/1950 | 63B | Stirling | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 63B | 4w/e | 05/07/1958 | 66A | Polmadie |
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 57339 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 63A | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 63B | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 63B | Stirling | |
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 57339 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 63B | Stirling | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 63B | on | 30/06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 40921 | on | 01/01/1948 | 29A | Perth South | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 63B | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 63A | Perth South |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62714 | on | 01/01/1948 | PTH | Perth (LNER) | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 63B | on | 26/08/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | 57450 | 4w/e | 04/11/1951 | 63C | Forfar | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 63B | m/e | 02/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 40923 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 29A | Perth South | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 63B | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 63A | Perth South |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45084 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 63B | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | 67A | Corkerhill |
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 55212 | w/e | 01/04/1950 | 63A | Perth South | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 63B | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 99I | |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 40938 | on | 01/01/1948 | 29A | Perth South | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 63B | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 63C | Forfar |
Steam | 92 | 0-4-4T | 55126 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | Stirling | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 63B | 4w/e | 22/11/1958 | 63D | Oban |
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 55222 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31B | Stirling | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 63B | on | 14/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | 54502 | on | 01/01/1948 | 29A | Perth South | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 63B | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 68B | Dumfries |
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | 67454 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 65A | Eastfield | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 63B | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 65A | Eastfield |
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 57324 | on | 01/01/1948 | 29D | Forfar | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 63B | on | 15/05/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | 57396 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31C | Oban | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 63B | on | 06/05/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | 57441 | on | 01/01/1948 | 29D | Forfar | 4w/e | 11/07/1953 | 63B | 4w/e | 05/07/1958 | 63C | Forfar |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44318 | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 63C | Forfar | 4w/e | 11/07/1953 | 63B | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 63C | Forfar |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 40938 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 63C | Forfar | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 63B | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 63A | Perth South |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62725 | on | 01/01/1948 | PTH | Perth (LNER) | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 63B | on | 10/11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44318 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 63C | Forfar | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 63B | 4w/e | 23/11/1957 | 63C | Forfar |
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | 54504 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30B | Hurlford | 4w/e | 30/10/1954 | 63B | on | 20/10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 55195 | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 63E | Oban | 4w/e | 14/05/1955 | 63B | on | 27/06/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 55176 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 63C | Forfar | 8w/e | 09/07/1955 | 63B | on | 10/10/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44314 | 8w/e | 16/04/1955 | 63C | Forfar | 8w/e | 09/07/1955 | 63B | 4w/e | 06/08/1955 | 63A | Perth South |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45213 | on | 01/01/1948 | 29A | Perth South | 4w/e | 06/08/1955 | 63B | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | 67C | Ayr |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45357 | on | 01/01/1948 | 29A | Perth South | 4w/e | 06/08/1955 | 63B | 5w/e | 30/04/1966 | 67A | Corkerhill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45119 | 4w/e | 25/12/1954 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | 4w/e | 01/10/1955 | 63B | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45214 | 4w/e | 25/12/1954 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | 4w/e | 01/10/1955 | 63B | 5w/e | 30/04/1966 | 67A | Corkerhill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45396 | 4w/e | 25/12/1954 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | 4w/e | 01/10/1955 | 63B | w/e | 01/02/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45400 | 4w/e | 25/12/1954 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | 4w/e | 01/10/1955 | 63B | on | 04/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45423 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | 4w/e | 01/10/1955 | 63B | 4w/e | 28/08/1965 | 67C | Ayr |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80125 | on | 06/10/1955 (New) | 63B | 07/07/1964 | Withdrawn | ||||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45049 | 4w/e | 27/11/1954 | 63A | Perth South | 4w/e | 01/09/1956 | 63B | on | 29/08/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 56375 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31D | Grangemouth | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 63B | on | 07/08/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 56281 | w/e | 19/03/1949 | 66A | Polmadie | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 63B | on | 13/11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45389 | on | 01/01/1948 | 29A | Perth South | 4w/e | 11/05/1957 | 63B | on | 08/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44318 | 4w/e | 23/11/1957 | 63C | Forfar | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 63B | 4w/e | 05/07/1958 | 66A | Polmadie |
Steam | 113 | 4-4-0 | 54476 | on | 01/01/1948 | 29A | Perth South | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 63B | on | 15/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3535 | on | 11/07/1958 (New) | 63B | 4w/e | 22/11/1958 | 63A | Perth South | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3536 | on | 08/08/1958 (New) | 63B | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 65A | Eastfield | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3537 | on | 08/08/1958 (New) | 63B | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 65F | Grangemouth | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3538 | on | 15/08/1958 (New) | 63B | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 65F | Grangemouth | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3539 | on | 15/08/1958 (New) | 63B | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 65F | Grangemouth | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3540 | on | 22/08/1958 (New) | 63B | 4w/e | 22/10/1960 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45125 | on | 01/01/1948 | 29A | Perth South | 4w/e | 25/10/1958 | 63B | 4w/e | 20/12/1958 | 68C | Stranraer |
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 57276 | 4w/e | 06/08/1955 | 63D | Oban | 4w/e | 22/11/1958 | 63B | on | 20/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | D2739 | on | 11/12/1958 (New) | 63B | 4w/e | 22/08/1964 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | D2740 | on | 16/12/1958 (New) | 63B | 4w/e | 22/08/1964 | 65A | Eastfield | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | D2741 | on | 16/01/1959 (New) | 63B | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 65F | Grangemouth | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | D2742 | on | 30/01/1959 (New) | 63B | 4w/e | 22/08/1964 | 65A | Eastfield | ||||
Steam | 652 | 0-6-0 | 57642 | on | 01/01/1948 | 29D | Forfar | 4w/e | 14/03/1959 | 63B | w/e | 16/07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42690 | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 4w/e | 14/03/1959 | 63B | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42693 | 4w/e | 25/12/1954 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 4w/e | 14/03/1959 | 63B | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | 68D | Beattock |
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 57576 | 4w/e | 02/09/1955 | 64C | Dalry Road | 4w/e | 11/04/1959 | 63B | on | 02/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | 57681 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 64C | Dalry Road | 4w/e | 11/04/1959 | 63B | m/e | 11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 431 | 0-4-4T | 55238 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31D | Grangemouth | 4w/e | 13/02/1960 | 63B | on | 13/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80060 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 26A | Newton Heath | on | 29/02/1960 | 63B | on | 31/07/1964 | 64A | St Margarets |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80062 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | 63B | 4w/e | 22/08/1964 | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80063 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | 63B | 4w/e | 22/08/1964 | 67A | Corkerhill |
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 65304 | 4w/e | 26/08/1961 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 65J | w/e | 08/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 65310 | 4w/e | 29/07/1961 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 65J | w/e | 16/07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 57261 | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 65B | 4w/e | 22/12/1962 | 65J | on | 29/11/1963 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78053 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 65J | w/e | 30/07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45320 | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | 66A | Polmadie | 5w/e | 07/09/1963 | 65J | on | 28/10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46403 | 2w/e | 03/08/1963 | 66B | Motherwell | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 65J | on | 29/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45361 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 67A | Corkerhill | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 65J | on | 13/02/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3533 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 65F | Grangemouth | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 65J | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | 65F | Grangemouth |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80062 | 4w/e | 22/08/1964 | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | 4w/e | 22/08/1964 | 65J | on | 12/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73007 | 4w/e | 25/07/1964 | 65F | Grangemouth | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 65J | on | 03/03/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73105 | 4w/e | 26/12/1964 | 65F | Grangemouth | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 65J | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | 67A | Corkerhill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45362 | on | 29/10/1965 | Withdrawn | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 (R) | 65J | |||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73154 | m/e | 06/1957 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) (New) | 4w/e | 25/12/1965 | 65J | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | 66B | Motherwell |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73149 | m/e | 03/1957 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) (New) | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 65J | w/e | 10/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73150 | m/e | 04/1957 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) (New) | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 65J | w/e | 10/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73153 | m/e | 05/1957 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) (New) | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 65J | w/e | 10/12/1966 | Withdrawn |