Depot: Stockton
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Stockton | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1729 | m/e | 06/1902 (New) | SKN | on | 15/12/1930 | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1128 | m/e | 10/1903 (New) | SKN | on | 07/02/1925 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 660 | m/e | 06/1907 (New) | SKN | on | 25/06/1930 | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1179 | m/e | 02/1911 (New) | SKN | on | 18/02/1927 | TSK | Thirsk | ||||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1190 | m/e | 04/1911 (New) | SKN | on | 26/02/1926 | ARD | Ardsley | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2235 | m/e | 10/1918 (New) | SKN | on | 09/06/1930 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2248 | m/e | 06/1919 (New) | SKN | on | 27/11/1930 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2253 | m/e | 11/1919 (New) | SKN | on | 03/05/1923 | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2274 | m/e | 05/1920 (New) | SKN | on | 09/06/1930 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2284 | m/e | 07/1920 (New) | SKN | on | 03/07/1930 | SEL | Selby | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2285 | m/e | 07/1920 (New) | SKN | on | 05/05/1931 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2286 | m/e | 07/1920 (New) | SKN | on | 03/07/1930 | SEL | Selby | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2253 | on | 03/05/1923 | THJ | Thornton Junction | on | 31/10/1923 | SKN | on | 09/06/1930 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2265 | on | 08/03/1924 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 19/09/1924 | SKN | on | 09/06/1930 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2225 | m/e | 08/1917 | TDK | Tyne Dock (New) | on | 20/12/1924 | SKN | on | 03/07/1930 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2255 | m/e | 12/1919 | TDK | Tyne Dock (New) | on | 24/12/1924 | SKN | on | 27/11/1930 | HLS | Hull Springhead |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2245 | m/e | 05/1919 | TDK | Tyne Dock (New) | m/e | 1925 | SKN | on | 03/07/1930 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1173 | m/e | 05/1904 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates (New) | on | 07/02/1925 | SKN | on | 25/06/1930 | HAV | Haverton Hill |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1190 | on | 26/02/1926 | ARD | Ardsley | on | 01/09/1926 | SKN | on | 21/10/1926 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 738 | m/e | 06/1908 | TWD | Tweedmouth (New) | on | 04/02/1927 | SKN | on | 19/07/1928 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 739 | m/e | 06/1908 | TWD | Tweedmouth (New) | on | 04/02/1927 | SKN | on | 05/05/1930 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 630 | on | 16/04/1924 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates (New) | on | 24/05/1928 | SKN | on | 27/11/1930 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 624 | on | 27/02/1925 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 19/07/1928 | SKN | on | 27/11/1930 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 625 | on | 18/03/1924 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates (New) | on | 19/07/1928 | SKN | on | 03/04/1930 | HAV | Haverton Hill |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 626 | on | 01/04/1924 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates (New) | on | 19/07/1928 | SKN | on | 27/11/1930 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 628 | on | 03/04/1924 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates (New) | on | 19/07/1928 | SKN | on | 27/11/1930 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 901 | on | 19/07/1928 | HAV | Haverton Hill | on | 05/05/1931 | SKN | on | 19/03/1937 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 904 | on | 19/07/1928 | HAV | Haverton Hill | on | 05/05/1931 | SKN | on | 18/01/1936 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 905 | on | 19/07/1928 | HAV | Haverton Hill | on | 05/05/1931 | SKN | on | 13/08/1934 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 1330 | on | 24/05/1934 | MID | Middlesbrough | on | 29/05/1934 | SKN | on | 11/09/1942 | SALT | Saltburn |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 1328 | on | 21/07/1926 | HTN | Heaton | on | 29/05/1934 | SKN | on | 25/08/1942 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 1522 | m/e | 05/1922 | BLA | Blaydon (New) | on | 29/05/1934 | SKN | on | 27/06/1935 | GHD | Gateshead |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 2157 | on | 21/08/1929 | GHD | Gateshead | on | 27/06/1935 | SKN | on | 28/02/1942 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1586 | on | 22/04/1937 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 19/05/1937 | SKN | on | 10/01/1938 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 2145 | on | 26/06/1930 | HTN | Heaton | on | 04/07/1938 | SKN | on | 28/02/1940 | SBK | Starbeck |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 2160 | on | 14/07/1936 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 04/07/1938 | SKN | on | 12/10/1938 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 2156 | H | 12/1935 | GHD | Gateshead | on | 16/07/1938 | SKN | on | 10/06/1940 | AUK | West Auckland |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 1517 | on | 23/09/1936 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 27/05/1939 | SKN | on | 27/05/1940 | AUK | West Auckland |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1181 | on | 27/05/1937 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 16/10/1939 | SKN | on | 15/02/1953 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1731 | m/e | 06/1903 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) (New) | on | 16/10/1939 | SKN | on | 01/02/1943 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1177 | on | 20/09/1934 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 16/10/1939 | SKN | on | 01/02/1943 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 642 | on | 07/01/1935 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 16/10/1939 | SKN | on | 01/02/1943 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2223 | on | 26/11/1938 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 16/10/1939 | SKN | on | 04/06/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2235 | on | 17/11/1936 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 16/10/1939 | SKN | on | 01/04/1940 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2254 | on | 29/03/1939 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 16/10/1939 | SKN | on | 01/04/1940 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1551 | on | 16/03/1938 | MID | Middlesbrough (New) | on | 01/01/1940 | SKN | on | 19/06/1943 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1192 | m/e | 05/1911 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 01/04/1940 | SKN | on | 15/02/1953 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1468 | on | 05/11/1938 | DAR | Darlington | on | 16/07/1940 | SKN | on | 21/06/1943 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1490 | on | 07/11/1938 | DAR | Darlington | on | 16/07/1940 | SKN | on | 21/06/1943 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1470 | on | 20/11/1940 | DAR | Darlington | on | 30/12/1940 | SKN | on | 23/06/1943 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2271 | on | 26/11/1931 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 14/06/1941 | SKN | on | 05/10/1947 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2281 | on | 01/07/1924 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 14/06/1941 | SKN | on | 23/09/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | 690 | on | 01/01/1940 | AUK | West Auckland | on | 02/12/1941 | SKN | on | 18/05/1942 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1247 | on | 19/08/1939 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 01/02/1943 | SKN | on | 05/10/1947 | HAV | Haverton Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2256 | on | 19/06/1939 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 01/02/1943 | SKN | on | 05/10/1947 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2284 | on | 19/06/1939 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 01/02/1943 | SKN | on | 05/10/1947 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1487 | on | 22/10/1937 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 28/03/1943 | SKN | on | 21/06/1943 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1508 | on | 16/12/1937 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | SKN | on | 21/06/1943 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1509 | on | 25/01/1938 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | SKN | on | 19/06/1943 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1335 | m/e | 07/1913 | BOR | Borough Gardens (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | SKN | on | 20/09/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2222 | on | 14/06/1941 | DAR | Darlington | on | 28/03/1943 | SKN | on | 22/09/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2236 | m/e | 10/1918 | BOR | Borough Gardens (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | SKN | on | 04/06/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2269 | on | 14/06/1941 | DAR | Darlington | on | 28/03/1943 | SKN | on | 13/04/1947 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2250 | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 19/06/1943 | SKN | on | 06/02/1949 | HAV | Haverton Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2274 | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 19/06/1943 | SKN | on | 20/09/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1261 | m/e | 04/1913 | NEV | Neville Hill (New) | on | 21/06/1943 | SKN | on | 23/09/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2213 | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 21/06/1943 | SKN | on | 13/04/1947 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2239 | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 21/06/1943 | SKN | on | 20/09/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2217 | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 23/06/1943 | SKN | on | 05/10/1947 | HAV | Haverton Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2280 | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 23/06/1943 | SKN | on | 05/10/1947 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1280 | on | 10/06/1939 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 04/12/1943 | SKN | on | 05/10/1947 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2232 | on | 28/03/1943 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 04/12/1943 | SKN | on | 13/04/1947 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2233 | on | 22/02/1936 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 04/12/1943 | SKN | on | 05/10/1947 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2259 | on | 03/09/1942 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 04/12/1943 | SKN | on | 05/10/1947 | HAV | Haverton Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 840 | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | on | 06/05/1946 | SKN | on | 25/10/1947 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 842 | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | on | 06/05/1946 | SKN | on | 31/08/1947 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 911 | on | 16/10/1934 | YK | York (North) | on | 06/05/1946 | SKN | on | 24/08/1947 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 936 | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | on | 06/05/1946 | SKN | on | 27/07/1947 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 942 | on | 30/05/1940 | YK | York (North) | on | 06/05/1946 | SKN | on | 31/08/1947 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3307 | on | 01/02/1943 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 20/01/1947 | SKN | on | 02/11/1947 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3330 | on | 25/01/1935 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 20/01/1947 | SKN | on | 02/11/1947 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1030 | on | 26/06/1947 (New) | SKN | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1214 | on | 16/07/1947 (New) | SKN | on | 23/09/1956 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1220 | on | 06/08/1947 (New) | SKN | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1032 | on | 07/08/1947 (New) | SKN | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1189 | on | 08/08/1947 (New) | SKN | on | 23/09/1956 | 56B | Ardsley | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3367 | on | 05/03/1945 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 02/11/1947 | SKN | on | 06/02/1949 | HAV | Haverton Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3369 | on | 23/07/1945 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 02/11/1947 | SKN | on | 25/06/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 2365 | on | 01/01/1948 | SKN | w/e | 28/05/1949 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62390 | on | 01/01/1948 | SKN | on | 29/11/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7254 | on | 01/01/1948 | SKN | w/e | 24/09/1949 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7272 | on | 01/01/1948 | SKN | m/e | 12/1949 | DAR | Darlington | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7288 | on | 01/01/1948 | SKN | w/e | 20/08/1950 | 54B | Tyne Dock | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7294 | on | 01/01/1948 | SKN | w/e | 21/01/1950 | AUK | West Auckland | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7318 | on | 01/01/1948 | SKN | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 51F | West Auckland | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5052 | on | 01/01/1948 | SKN | m/e | 08/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5057 | on | 01/01/1948 | SKN | on | 25/01/1948 | AUK | West Auckland | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5089 | on | 01/01/1948 | SKN | on | 25/01/1948 | AUK | West Auckland | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5092 | on | 01/01/1948 | SKN | on | 25/01/1948 | AUK | West Auckland | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5788 | on | 01/01/1948 | SKN | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5800 | on | 01/01/1948 | SKN | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5805 | on | 01/01/1948 | SKN | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5807 | on | 01/01/1948 | SKN | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5837 | on | 01/01/1948 | SKN | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 50G | Whitby | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5860 | on | 01/01/1948 | SKN | w/e | 18/02/1951 | 51B | Newport (Teeside) | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5870 | on | 01/01/1948 | SKN | w/e | 06/03/1948 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5887 | on | 01/01/1948 | SKN | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 50G | Whitby | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8305 | on | 01/01/1948 | SKN | on | 24/11/1958 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 9918 | on | 01/01/1948 | SKN | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 8144 | on | 01/01/1948 | SKN | w/e | 22/11/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | 5696 | m/e | 07/1930 | Withdrawn | on | 25/01/1948 (R) | SKN | w/e | 14/02/1948 | AUK | West Auckland | |
Steam | D7 | 4-4-0 | 5683 | m/e | 04/1937 | Withdrawn | on | 25/01/1948 (R) | SKN | w/e | 14/02/1948 | AUK | West Auckland | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5675 | on | 01/01/1948 | AUK | West Auckland | on | 25/01/1948 | SKN | w/e | 14/02/1948 | AUK | West Auckland |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3349 | on | 23/09/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 07/02/1948 | SKN | on | 25/06/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3446 | m/e | 09/1920 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) (New) | on | 07/02/1948 | SKN | on | 06/02/1949 | HAV | Haverton Hill |
Steam | D7 | 4-4-0 | 5689 | m/e | 02/1936 | Withdrawn | w/e | 14/02/1948 (R) | SKN | |||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65715 | on | 01/01/1948 | AUK | West Auckland | w/e | 14/02/1948 | SKN | m/e | 03/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5718 | on | 01/01/1948 | AUK | West Auckland | w/e | 14/02/1948 | SKN | on | 22/05/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3459 | on | 28/03/1943 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 01/03/1948 | SKN | w/e | 06/03/1948 | SKN | Stockton |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3459 | on | 01/03/1948 | SKN | Stockton | w/e | 06/03/1948 | SKN | on | 25/06/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1037 | on | 28/11/1947 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 22/08/1948 | SKN | w/e | 28/08/1948 | SKN | Stockton |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1037 | on | 22/08/1948 | SKN | Stockton | w/e | 28/08/1948 | SKN | on | 08/06/1958 | 51G | Haverton Hill |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1290 | on | 20/02/1948 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 14/11/1948 | SKN | w/e | 20/11/1948 | SKN | Stockton |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1303 | on | 26/03/1948 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 14/11/1948 | SKN | w/e | 20/11/1948 | SKN | Stockton |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1290 | on | 14/11/1948 | SKN | Stockton | w/e | 20/11/1948 | SKN | on | 20/09/1953 | 68E | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1303 | on | 14/11/1948 | SKN | Stockton | w/e | 20/11/1948 | SKN | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62347 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWD | Tweedmouth | w/e | 08/01/1949 | SKN | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 51J | Northallerton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63067 | on | 13/04/1947 | HTN | Heaton | on | 06/02/1949 | SKN | on | 14/08/1955 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61017 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 06/02/1949 | SKN | w/e | 12/02/1949 | SKN | Stockton |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61018 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 06/02/1949 | SKN | w/e | 12/02/1949 | SKN | Stockton |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1034 | on | 29/11/1947 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 06/02/1949 | SKN | w/e | 12/02/1949 | SKN | Stockton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63048 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | SKN | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63012 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | SKN | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63082 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | SKN | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63086 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | SKN | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 51G | Haverton Hill | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63092 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | SKN | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61017 | on | 06/02/1949 | SKN | Stockton | w/e | 12/02/1949 | SKN | on | 23/08/1953 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61018 | on | 06/02/1949 | SKN | Stockton | w/e | 12/02/1949 | SKN | on | 08/06/1958 | 51G | Haverton Hill |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1034 | on | 06/02/1949 | SKN | Stockton | w/e | 12/02/1949 | SKN | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67317 | on | 01/01/1948 | AUK | West Auckland | w/e | 26/02/1949 | SKN | on | 28/08/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62379 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | w/e | 28/05/1949 | SKN | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67305 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | w/e | 24/09/1949 | SKN | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67278 | w/e | 06/03/1948 | DAR | Darlington | m/e | 12/1949 | SKN | w/e | 10/12/1949 | SKN | Stockton |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67278 | m/e | 12/1949 | SKN | Stockton | w/e | 10/12/1949 | SKN | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67242 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | AUK | West Auckland | w/e | 21/01/1950 | SKN | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62041 | on | 05/10/1949 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 12/02/1950 | 51E | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62042 | on | 07/10/1949 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 12/02/1950 | 51E | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62043 | on | 10/10/1949 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 12/02/1950 | 51E | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62041 | on | 12/02/1950 | 51E | Stockton | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 51E | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62042 | on | 12/02/1950 | 51E | Stockton | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 51E | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62043 | on | 12/02/1950 | 51E | Stockton | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 51E | on | 16/06/1957 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65868 | on | 01/01/1948 | SALT | Saltburn | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 51E | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67682 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | Gateshead | w/e | 31/05/1950 | 51E | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62001 | on | 30/05/1949 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 04/06/1950 | 51E | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62060 | on | 20/12/1949 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 04/06/1950 | 51E | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69883 | on | 22/03/1939 | SALT | Saltburn | on | 11/06/1950 | 51E | on | 05/10/1952 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62063 | m/e | 01/1950 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 25/06/1950 | 51E | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62064 | m/e | 01/1950 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 25/06/1950 | 51E | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62065 | m/e | 01/1950 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 25/06/1950 | 51E | on | 14/06/1959 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | D31 | 4-4-0 | 62065 | on | 20/04/1949 | Withdrawn | m/e | 30/06/1950 (R) | 51E | |||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62001 | on | 04/06/1950 | 51E | Stockton | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 51E | on | 04/11/1951 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62060 | on | 04/06/1950 | 51E | Stockton | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 51E | on | 08/06/1958 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62063 | on | 25/06/1950 | 51E | Stockton | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 51E | on | 04/11/1951 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62064 | on | 25/06/1950 | 51E | Stockton | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 51E | on | 08/06/1958 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67682 | w/e | 31/05/1950 | 51E | Stockton | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 51E | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65788 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 51A | Darlington | w/e | 11/02/1951 | 51E | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65788 | w/e | 11/02/1951 | 51E | Stockton | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 51E | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65739 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | w/e | 18/02/1951 | 51E | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65739 | w/e | 18/02/1951 | 51E | Stockton | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 51E | on | 04/02/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67345 | on | 01/01/1948 | AUK | West Auckland | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 51E | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67345 | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 51E | Stockton | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 51E | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65654 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 54A | Sunderland | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 51E | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67647 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 51E | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67647 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 51E | Stockton | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 51E | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61173 | on | 13/06/1947 | DAR | Darlington | on | 04/11/1951 | 51E | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61275 | on | 12/01/1948 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 04/11/1951 | 51E | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61173 | on | 04/11/1951 | 51E | Stockton | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 51E | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61275 | on | 04/11/1951 | 51E | Stockton | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 51E | on | 07/11/1954 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67242 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 51F | West Auckland | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 51E | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67242 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 51E | Stockton | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 51E | w/e | 09/02/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67288 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 51A | Darlington | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 51E | on | 28/06/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65764 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 51E | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65771 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 51E | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65764 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 51E | Stockton | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 51E | on | 04/03/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65771 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 51E | Stockton | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 51E | on | 15/01/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69852 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 51C | West Hartlepool | on | 06/07/1952 | 51E | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69862 | on | 26/11/1945 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 06/07/1952 | 51E | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69852 | on | 06/07/1952 | 51E | Stockton | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 51E | on | 05/10/1952 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69862 | on | 06/07/1952 | 51E | Stockton | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 51E | on | 05/10/1952 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67305 | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 51A | Darlington | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 51E | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 69912 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 51E | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 69919 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 51E | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 69912 | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 51E | Stockton | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 51E | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 69919 | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 51E | Stockton | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 51E | on | 21/02/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67278 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 51F | West Auckland | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 51E | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67278 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 51E | Stockton | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 51E | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69883 | on | 01/03/1953 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 07/06/1953 | 51E | on | 20/09/1953 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69859 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 21/06/1953 | 51E | on | 20/09/1953 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69862 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 21/06/1953 | 51E | on | 20/09/1953 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67343 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 51A | Darlington | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 51E | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69830 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 51A | Darlington | on | 13/06/1954 | 51E | on | 19/09/1954 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69834 | w/e | 19/02/1949 | SAL | Salisbury | on | 13/06/1954 | 51E | on | 19/09/1954 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69839 | w/e | 19/05/1951 | 51A | Darlington | on | 13/06/1954 | 51E | on | 19/09/1954 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69841 | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 51A | Darlington | on | 13/06/1954 | 51E | on | 19/09/1954 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69842 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 51A | Darlington | on | 19/06/1954 | 51E | on | 15/09/1957 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67271 | on | 01/01/1948 | WHL | West Hartlepool | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 51E | on | 07/02/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67346 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 51E | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67281 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 51E | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 68142 | w/e | 24/11/1951 | 51A | Darlington | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 51E | on | 27/05/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69831 | on | 13/06/1954 | 51A | Darlington | on | 13/02/1955 | 51E | on | 25/09/1955 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69834 | on | 19/09/1954 | 51A | Darlington | on | 13/02/1955 | 51E | on | 25/09/1955 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67312 | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 51A | Darlington | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 51E | on | 09/04/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 69914 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 54B | Tyne Dock | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 51E | on | 15/08/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68242 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 51E | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69838 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 51A | Darlington | on | 19/06/1955 | 51E | on | 05/11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68696 | on | 01/01/1948 | AUK | West Auckland | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 51E | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65868 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 51E | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65884 | 4w/e | 21/08/1954 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 51E | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 69921 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 4w/e | 17/09/1955 | 51E | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | 68438 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 51A | Darlington | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 51E | on | 24/02/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46478 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 51A | Darlington | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 51E | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69835 | on | 13/06/1954 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 16/06/1957 | 51E | on | 26/11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62058 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 51G | Haverton Hill | on | 16/06/1957 | 51E | on | 08/06/1958 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90082 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 50B | Neville Hill | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 51E | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65099 | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 51E | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | 68410 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 51E | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68892 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 56F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 51E | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63361 | on | 11/05/1958 | 54B | Tyne Dock | on | 08/06/1958 | 51E | on | 12/10/1958 | 51G | Haverton Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63382 | on | 04/12/1943 | SEL | Selby | on | 08/06/1958 | 51E | on | 12/10/1958 | 51G | Haverton Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63432 | on | 27/10/1957 | 50C | Selby | on | 08/06/1958 | 51E | on | 12/10/1958 | 51G | Haverton Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63440 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 50C | Selby | on | 08/06/1958 | 51E | on | 14/09/1958 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90430 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51E | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68909 | on | 01/01/1948 | ARD | Ardsley | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51E | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67754 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 51E | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67766 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 51E | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62001 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 51A | Darlington | on | 14/09/1958 | 51E | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62003 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 51A | Darlington | on | 14/09/1958 | 51E | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | 68435 | on | 08/10/1958 | Withdrawn | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 (R) | 51E | |||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68049 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 51E | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65787 | on | 01/01/1948 | HAV | Haverton Hill | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 51E | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65833 | on | 01/01/1948 | HAV | Haverton Hill | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 51E | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62047 | on | 14/09/1958 | 51A | Darlington | on | 23/11/1958 | 51E | on | 14/06/1959 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68260 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 27/12/1958 | 51E | on | 07/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65773 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 51E | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43073 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 51E | w/e | 16/05/1959 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65747 | on | 01/01/1948 | WHL | West Hartlepool | w/e | 16/05/1959 | 51E | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |