Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 712 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2436 Week
» 12571 Month
» 328802 Year
» 839904 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Thornton Junction


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Thornton Junction Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2263 03/1920 TDK Tyne Dock (New) 14/03/1923 THJ 03/05/1923 TDK Tyne Dock
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2253 11/1919 SKN Stockton (New) 03/05/1923 THJ 31/10/1923 SKN Stockton
Steam O4 2-8-0 1185 13/08/1912 MEX Mexborough 06/06/1923 THJ 02/11/1923 MEX Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 6346   08/1921 ROD   18/07/1924 THJ 27/09/1941 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 6288       18/07/1924 THJ 29/07/1943 DFU Dunfermline Upper
Steam O4 2-8-0 6352 09/08/1924 DFU Dunfermline Upper 22/08/1924 THJ 01/10/1943 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 6290   08/1921 ROD   22/08/1924 THJ 28/07/1943 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O4 2-8-0 6550       02/12/1928 THJ 12/09/1943 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O4 2-8-0 6543       23/03/1929 THJ 03/10/1943 MEX Mexborough
Steam Z4 0-4-2T 6844 08/1915 KIT Kittybrewster (New) 03/1942 THJ 04/1942 KIT Kittybrewster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6524 12/01/1943 WFD Woodford Halse 25/01/1943 THJ 01/10/1943 MEX Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 6633 12/01/1943 WFD Woodford Halse 25/01/1943 THJ 02/10/1943 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 5393 31/01/1943 GOR Gorton 10/02/1943 THJ 02/10/1943 ANN Annesley
Steam O1 2-8-0 5385 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster 20/08/1944 THJ 23/01/1949 ANN Annesley
Steam O1 2-8-0 6601 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster 30/08/1944 THJ 23/01/1949 ANN Annesley
Steam K1 2-6-0 3445 05/07/1946 STM St Margarets 06/07/1946 THJ 24/08/1946 EFD Eastfield
Steam J39 0-6-0 4784 05/03/1945 CAR Carlisle Canal 15/07/1946 THJ 04/11/1946 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam K1 2-6-0 3445 24/08/1946 EFD Eastfield 01/09/1946 THJ 30/09/1946 STM St Margarets
Steam B1 4-6-0 1103       04/12/1946 (New) THJ 14/07/1966 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 1118       17/01/1947 (New) THJ 23/07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 1262       01/12/1947 (New) THJ 18/04/1960 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam D29 4-4-0 62401       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 11/1949 Withdrawn
Steam D29 4-4-0 62406       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 10/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Scott 4-4-0 2419       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 09/1957 Withdrawn
Steam Scott 4-4-0 2429       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 08/1957 Withdrawn
Steam Scott 4-4-0 2430       01/01/1948 THJ 07/01/1957 Withdrawn
Steam Scott 4-4-0 2431       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 10/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Scott 4-4-0 2436       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 06/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Scott 4-4-0 2442       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 07/1958 Withdrawn
Steam D32 4-4-0 62446       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 09/1948 Withdrawn
Steam Glen 4-4-0 2467       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 08/1960 Withdrawn
Steam Glen 4-4-0 2468       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 09/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Glen 4-4-0 2475       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 06/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Glen 4-4-0 2478       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Glen 4-4-0 2492       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 06/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J69 0-6-0T 8504       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 01/1956 Withdrawn
Steam J69 0-6-0T 8535       01/01/1948 THJ 4w/e 07/08/1954 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam J69 0-6-0T 8550       01/01/1948 THJ 5w/e 16/02/1952 30A Stratford
Steam J67 0-6-0T 8555       01/01/1948 THJ 4w/e 22/03/1952 32B Ipswich
Steam C15 4-4-2T 7452       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 02/1956 Withdrawn
Steam C15 4-4-2T 7476       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 09/1954 Withdrawn
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 2704       01/01/1948 THJ 18/08/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 2708       01/01/1948 THJ 04/05/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 2716       01/01/1948 THJ 4w/e 07/05/1960 64A St Margarets
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 2717       01/01/1948 THJ 4w/e 20/01/1951 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 2729       01/01/1948 THJ 4w/e 09/04/1960 64A St Margarets
Steam J35 0-6-0 4464       01/01/1948 THJ 4w/e 16/02/1957 66A Polmadie
Steam J35 0-6-0 4466       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 07/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J35 0-6-0 4474       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J35 0-6-0 4477       01/01/1948 THJ 4w/e 16/02/1957 66A Polmadie
Steam J35 0-6-0 4488       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J35 0-6-0 4495       01/01/1948 THJ 4w/e 27/12/1952 64C Dalry Road
Steam J35 0-6-0 4500       01/01/1948 THJ 4w/e 27/12/1952 64C Dalry Road
Steam J35 0-6-0 4514       01/01/1948 THJ 4w/e 26/01/1952 65C Parkhead
Steam J35 0-6-0 4516       01/01/1948 THJ 8w/e 22/12/1956 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam J35 0-6-0 4521       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 04/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J35 0-6-0 4522       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 01/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J36 0-6-0 5218       01/01/1948 THJ 4w/e 02/07/1960 65A Eastfield
Steam J36 0-6-0 5291       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 11/1950 Withdrawn
Steam J36 0-6-0 5345       01/01/1948 THJ 5w/e 29/01/1966 64F Bathgate
Steam J37 0-6-0 4546       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 05/1964 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 4549       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 4550       01/01/1948 THJ 4w/e 22/12/1962 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam J37 0-6-0 4553       01/01/1948 THJ 8w/e 19/04/1952 64F Bathgate
Steam J37 0-6-0 4564       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 4565       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 4596       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 4597       01/01/1948 THJ 4w/e 01/11/1952 64A St Margarets
Steam J37 0-6-0 4598       01/01/1948 THJ 4w/e 17/06/1950 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam J37 0-6-0 4600       01/01/1948 THJ 4w/e 29/08/1959 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam J37 0-6-0 4602       01/01/1948 THJ 4w/e 29/08/1959 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam J37 0-6-0 4612       01/01/1948 THJ 4w/e 01/10/1955 64D Carstairs
Steam J37 0-6-0 4616       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 4618       01/01/1948 THJ 19/11/1966 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 4629       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 4635       01/01/1948 THJ 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J38 0-6-0 5901       01/01/1948 THJ 22/04/1967 Withdrawn
Steam J38 0-6-0 5902       01/01/1948 THJ 28/12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam J38 0-6-0 5903       01/01/1948 THJ 4w/e 11/02/1961 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam J38 0-6-0 5904       01/01/1948 THJ 23/07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam J38 0-6-0 5907       01/01/1948 THJ 22/08/1966 Withdrawn
Steam J38 0-6-0 5908       01/01/1948 THJ 17/09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam J38 0-6-0 5910       01/01/1948 THJ 14/07/1966 Withdrawn
Steam J38 0-6-0 5911       01/01/1948 THJ 01/03/1967 Withdrawn
Steam J38 0-6-0 5913       01/01/1948 THJ 06/08/1964 Withdrawn
Steam J38 0-6-0 5921       01/01/1948 THJ 4w/e 28/12/1963 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam J38 0-6-0 5925       01/01/1948 THJ 21/11/1966 Withdrawn
Steam J38 0-6-0 5931       01/01/1948 THJ 4w/e 24/03/1962 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam J38 0-6-0 5932       01/01/1948 THJ 4w/e 06/07/1963 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam J83 0-6-0T 8451       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 02/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J83 0-6-0T 8453       01/01/1948 THJ 4w/e 29/08/1959 64A St Margarets
Steam J83 0-6-0T 8456       01/01/1948 THJ 4w/e 29/08/1959 64E Polmont
Steam J83 0-6-0T 8458       01/01/1948 THJ 4w/e 13/02/1960 67A Corkerhill
Steam J83 0-6-0T 8459       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 05/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J83 0-6-0T 8467       01/01/1948 THJ 8w/e 27/10/1956 64E Polmont
Steam J88 0-6-0T 8321       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 06/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J88 0-6-0T 8322       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 12/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J88 0-6-0T 8323       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 10/1956 Withdrawn
Steam J88 0-6-0T 8332       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 08/1960 Withdrawn
Steam J88 0-6-0T 8335       01/01/1948 THJ 4w/e 19/12/1959 64B Haymarket
Steam J88 0-6-0T 8337       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 11/1955 Withdrawn
Steam J88 0-6-0T 8341       01/01/1948 THJ 4w/e 23/12/1950 LOAN  
Steam J88 0-6-0T 8351       01/01/1948 THJ w/e 12/02/1962 Withdrawn
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9132       01/01/1948 THJ 4w/e 19/12/1959 66B Motherwell
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9150       01/01/1948 THJ 8w/e 31/08/1957 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9153       01/01/1948 THJ m/e 09/1958 Withdrawn
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9211       01/01/1948 THJ 4w/e 14/03/1959 64B Haymarket
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9223       01/01/1948 THJ 4w/e 19/12/1959 66B Motherwell
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9224       01/01/1948 THJ 8w/e 31/08/1957 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam B1 4-6-0 1292       25/02/1948 (New) THJ 28/03/1948 HAY Haymarket
Steam B1 4-6-0 1072 21/09/1946 HAY Haymarket 28/03/1948 THJ 25/08/1958 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam B1 4-6-0 61146 22/04/1947 KIT Kittybrewster (New) 03/07/1949 THJ 05/09/1960 64C Dalry Road
Steam B1 4-6-0 61148 11/09/1949 EFD Eastfield 29/01/1950 THJ 20/05/1953 91S To Southern Region
Steam Scott 4-4-0 62418 01/01/1948 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 17/06/1950 62A m/e 08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 62713 01/01/1948 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 25/11/1950 62A 09/09/1957 Withdrawn
Steam J36 0-6-0 65252 01/01/1948 DFU Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 20/01/1951 62A m/e 05/1960 Withdrawn
Steam J88 0-6-0T 8341 4w/e 23/12/1950 LOAN   4w/e 17/02/1951 62A 19/11/1954 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61147 03/07/1949 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 14/10/1951 62A 04/04/1965 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam K2 2-6-0 61741 28/01/1951 65A Eastfield 23/12/1951 62A 05/03/1957 61A Kittybrewster
Steam K2 2-6-0 61770 14/01/1951 65A Eastfield 01/01/1952 62A 28/09/1952 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam K2 2-6-0 61755 11/02/1951 65A Eastfield 09/01/1952 62A 19/02/1957 61A Kittybrewster
Steam N15 0-6-2T 69143 01/01/1948 PKD Parkhead 4w/e 26/01/1952 62A 4w/e 19/12/1959 66B Motherwell
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90441       4w/e 23/02/1952 62A m/e 10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam J72 0-6-0T 69012 3w/e 31/05/1950 32B Ipswich 4w/e 23/02/1952 62A m/e 02/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J72 0-6-0T 69013 3w/e 31/05/1950 32B Ipswich 4w/e 23/02/1952 62A 4w/e 21/12/1957 64A St Margarets
Steam C15 4-4-2T 67461 01/01/1948 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 04/10/1952 62A m/e 12/1954 Withdrawn
Steam C15 4-4-2T 67471 01/01/1948 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 04/10/1952 62A m/e 12/1952 Withdrawn
Steam K2 2-6-0 61734 10/02/1952 62C Dunfermline Upper 16/11/1952 62A 10/05/1953 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill
Steam K2 2-6-0 61739 20/05/1951 40B Immingham 25/01/1953 62A 25/03/1953 40B Immingham
Steam K2 2-6-0 61766 29/06/1952 40F Boston 25/01/1953 62A 25/03/1953 40F Boston
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42708 01/01/1948 26A Newton Heath 8w/e 21/03/1953 62A 4w/e 18/04/1953 26A Newton Heath
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42871 01/01/1948 26A Newton Heath 8w/e 21/03/1953 62A 4w/e 18/04/1953 26A Newton Heath
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42878 01/01/1948 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 8w/e 21/03/1953 62A 4w/e 18/04/1953 26A Newton Heath
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90020 4w/e 23/02/1952 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 16/05/1953 62A m/e 06/1967 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61148 20/05/1953 91S To Southern Region 21/06/1953 62A 02/09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42733 4w/e 21/02/1953 27B Aintree 4w/e 28/11/1953 62A 4w/e 26/12/1953 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42866 01/01/1948 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 28/11/1953 62A 4w/e 26/12/1953 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90199       4w/e 07/08/1954 62A 4w/e 29/10/1955 65F Grangemouth
Steam J88 0-6-0T 68334 01/01/1948 STM St Margarets 4w/e 25/12/1954 62A m/e 06/1959 Withdrawn
Steam C16 4-4-2T 67493 01/01/1948 STM St Margarets 4w/e 22/01/1955 62A m/e 04/1956 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61403 02/07/1950 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 07/03/1955 62A 09/04/1960 65A Eastfield
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90513 4w/e 16/07/1949 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 24/12/1955 62A w/e 16/07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61134 22/02/1953 65A Eastfield 21/01/1956 62A 18/04/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13210       16/02/1956 (New) 62A 4w/e 11/05/1957 65A Eastfield
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13211       24/02/1956 (New) 62A 4w/e 11/05/1957 65A Eastfield
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 55217 01/01/1948 29C Dundee West 4w/e 17/03/1956 62A 4w/e 19/12/1959 63A Perth South
Steam B1 4-6-0 61401 12/04/1950 61A Kittybrewster (New) 15/10/1956 62A 13/04/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13275 22/10/1956 65A Eastfield (New) 8w/e 22/12/1956 62A 5w/e 29/01/1966 63A Perth South
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90117       8w/e 22/12/1956 62A m/e 01/1967 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90705       8w/e 22/12/1956 62A 4w/e 16/01/1960 66A Polmadie
Steam J38 0-6-0 65900 01/01/1948 DFU Dunfermline Upper 8w/e 22/12/1956 62A 25/11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam J38 0-6-0 65905 01/01/1948 DFU Dunfermline Upper 8w/e 22/12/1956 62A 25/05/1966 Withdrawn
Steam J88 0-6-0T 68331 4w/e 19/02/1955 65E Kipps 8w/e 22/12/1956 62A m/e 03/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 62728 01/01/1948 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 16/03/1957 62A 29/10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 62744 8w/e 19/04/1952 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 16/03/1957 62A 4w/e 09/04/1960 64G Hawick
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13337       20/03/1957 (New) 62A 5w/e 31/08/1968 91E To Eastern Region
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13338       23/03/1957 (New) 62A 5w/e 31/08/1968 91E To Eastern Region
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13339       29/03/1957 (New) 62A 5w/e 31/08/1968 91E To Eastern Region
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13340       30/03/1957 (New) 62A w/e 09/03/1968 16C Derby
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13341       05/04/1957 (New) 62A 5w/e 01/08/1970 62C Dunfermline Townhill
Steam B1 4-6-0 61330 27/02/1956 64A St Margarets 02/05/1957 62A 19/11/1966 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61358 18/10/1949 64A St Margarets (New) 02/05/1957 62A 25/12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61277 18/03/1951 65A Eastfield 04/05/1957 62A 18/04/1960 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 62677 01/01/1948 HAY Haymarket 4w/e 11/05/1957 62A 4w/e 04/07/1959 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 62678 01/01/1948 HAY Haymarket 4w/e 11/05/1957 62A m/e 03/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 62679 01/01/1948 HAY Haymarket 4w/e 11/05/1957 62A m/e 09/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 62706 01/01/1948 HAY Haymarket 4w/e 11/05/1957 62A 03/02/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76109       08/1957 (New) 62A 4w/e 16/01/1960 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76110       08/1957 (New) 62A 4w/e 07/05/1960 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76111       08/1957 (New) 62A 4w/e 07/05/1960 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 62712 01/01/1948 HAY Haymarket 4w/e 15/02/1958 62A 4w/e 09/04/1960 64G Hawick
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 62733 01/01/1948 HAY Haymarket 4w/e 15/02/1958 62A 4w/e 07/05/1960 64A St Margarets
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2576       30/07/1958 (New) 62A 08/06/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2577       30/07/1958 (New) 62A 24/06/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2578       18/11/1958 (New) 62A 07/07/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2579       25/11/1958 (New) 62A 08/06/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2580       01/12/1958 (New) 62A 08/06/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2581       09/12/1958 (New) 62A 08/06/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2582       30/01/1959 (New) 62A 08/06/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2583       30/01/1959 (New) 62A 08/06/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2584       28/02/1959 (New) 62A 4w/e 25/12/1965 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam B1 4-6-0 61343 16/05/1949 61A Kittybrewster 24/03/1959 62A 03/03/1966 Withdrawn
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2585       13/04/1959 (New) 62A 5w/e 29/05/1965 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam K4 2-6-0 61993 01/01/1948 EFD Eastfield 4w/e 09/05/1959 62A 02/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam K4 2-6-0 61996 4w/e 12/06/1954 65A Eastfield 4w/e 09/05/1959 62A 02/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64790 28/09/1947 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 17/08/1959 62A 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64792 18/08/1943 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 17/08/1959 62A 04/01/1962 Withdrawn
Steam N15 0-6-2T 69136 8w/e 31/08/1957 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 19/12/1959 62A m/e 05/1961 Withdrawn
Steam N15 0-6-2T 69204 8w/e 31/08/1957 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 19/12/1959 62A w/e 16/07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61132 14/01/1951 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 11/01/1960 62A 02/09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61146 05/09/1960 64C Dalry Road 02/11/1960 62A 12/03/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Glen 4-4-0 62484 8w/e 05/09/1953 63A Perth South 4w/e 19/11/1960 62A 4w/e 19/11/1960 64G Hawick
Steam J35 0-6-0 64478 01/01/1948 CAR Carlisle Canal w/e 04/02/1961 62A m/e 08/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J35 0-6-0 64491 01/01/1948 BGT Bathgate 4w/e 11/02/1961 62A 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J38 0-6-0 65916 4w/e 27/11/1954 64A St Margarets 4w/e 06/05/1961 62A 30/10/1965 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5347       30/06/1961 (New) 62A 4w/e 29/07/1961 65A Eastfield
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5348       17/07/1961 (New) 62A 4w/e 29/07/1961 65A Eastfield
Steam B1 4-6-0 61340 30/01/1961 65F Grangemouth 16/10/1961 62A 12/11/1961 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam B1 4-6-0 61401 03/01/1961 65F Grangemouth 16/10/1961 62A 17/04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64794 11/08/1958 64C Dalry Road 18/12/1961 62A w/e 13/08/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64986 11/08/1958 64C Dalry Road 18/12/1961 62A 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90004 4w/e 04/06/1960 66A Polmadie 4w/e 24/02/1962 62A m/e 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76111 4w/e 07/05/1960 62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 24/03/1962 62A 4w/e 28/11/1964 64F Bathgate
Steam J36 0-6-0 65307 01/01/1948 STG Stirling 4w/e 14/07/1962 62A 4w/e 03/08/1963 64F Bathgate
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90193 4w/e 14/07/1951 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 11/08/1962 62A m/e 08/1963 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61332 13/09/1953 64A St Margarets 12/11/1962 62A 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61346 19/06/1961 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 26/12/1962 62A 08/06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 64557 01/01/1948 STM St Margarets 4w/e 19/01/1963 62A 4w/e 19/01/1963 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam J37 0-6-0 64576 01/01/1948 STM St Margarets 4w/e 19/01/1963 62A 4w/e 19/01/1963 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam J37 0-6-0 64577 01/01/1948 STM St Margarets 4w/e 19/01/1963 62A 4w/e 19/01/1963 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam J37 0-6-0 64586 01/01/1948 STM St Margarets 4w/e 19/01/1963 62A m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 64588 4w/e 08/09/1962 64A St Margarets 4w/e 19/01/1963 62A m/e 06/1966 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 64603 01/01/1948 STM St Margarets 4w/e 19/01/1963 62A 4w/e 19/01/1963 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam J37 0-6-0 64605 01/01/1948 STM St Margarets 4w/e 19/01/1963 62A 4w/e 19/01/1963 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam J38 0-6-0 65918 01/01/1948 STM St Margarets 4w/e 19/01/1963 62A 4w/e 19/01/1963 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam J38 0-6-0 65934 4w/e 27/11/1954 64A St Margarets 4w/e 19/01/1963 62A 4w/e 19/01/1963 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90444       4w/e 06/07/1963 62A m/e 01/1967 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90468 4w/e 27/09/1958 66B Motherwell 5w/e 07/09/1963 62A m/e 04/1967 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90319 4w/e 08/09/1962 67C Ayr 4w/e 30/11/1963 62A m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90727 4w/e 19/01/1963 67C Ayr 4w/e 30/11/1963 62A m/e 08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 64595 01/01/1948 STM St Margarets 4w/e 30/11/1963 62A m/e 03/1966 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90705 4w/e 05/10/1963 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 28/12/1963 62A m/e 07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam J38 0-6-0 65932 4w/e 06/07/1963 62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 28/12/1963 62A 03/03/1966 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61221 18/11/1963 64A St Margarets 20/01/1964 62A 10/01/1965 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90628 5w/e 07/09/1963 62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 27/06/1964 62A m/e 01/1967 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 64625 4w/e 25/04/1964 62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 27/06/1964 62A m/e 09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61261 11/03/1963 67C Ayr 31/07/1964 62A 23/09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 64632 4w/e 28/12/1963 65A Eastfield 4w/e 22/08/1964 62A m/e 12/1965 Withdrawn
Steam J38 0-6-0 65909 5w/e 30/05/1964 65F Grangemouth 4w/e 22/08/1964 62A 19/11/1966 Withdrawn
Steam J38 0-6-0 65917 5w/e 30/05/1964 65F Grangemouth 4w/e 22/08/1964 62A 5w/e 26/09/1964 62C Dunfermline Upper
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13342 12/04/1957 62C Dunfermline Upper (New) 5w/e 26/09/1964 62A w/e 21/12/1968 31B March
Steam J37 0-6-0 64572 m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn 5w/e 26/09/1964 (R) 62A      
Steam J37 0-6-0 64591 4w/e 27/09/1958 64A St Margarets 5w/e 26/09/1964 62A m/e 10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam J38 0-6-0 65922 4w/e 27/11/1954 64A St Margarets 5w/e 26/09/1964 62A 19/10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61400 09/08/1964 64C Dalry Road 05/10/1964 62A 17/12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 64570 5w/e 30/05/1964 65F Grangemouth 5w/e 31/10/1964 62A 19/11/1966 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 64569 4w/e 27/01/1962 64F Bathgate 4w/e 28/11/1964 62A 9w/e 26/11/1966 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam J37 0-6-0 64606 5w/e 29/02/1964 64F Bathgate 4w/e 28/11/1964 62A m/e 07/1966 Withdrawn
Steam J38 0-6-0 65914 01/01/1948 STM St Margarets 4w/e 28/11/1964 62A 19/11/1966 Withdrawn
Steam J38 0-6-0 65920 5w/e 31/10/1964 64C Dalry Road 4w/e 27/03/1965 62A 19/11/1966 Withdrawn
Steam J38 0-6-0 65915 01/01/1948 STM St Margarets 4w/e 24/04/1965 62A 19/11/1966 Withdrawn
Steam J36 0-6-0 65327 4w/e 28/12/1963 62C Dunfermline Upper 5w/e 29/05/1965 62A 13/11/1965 Withdrawn
Steam J38 0-6-0 65921 4w/e 28/12/1963 62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 04/12/1965 62A 19/11/1966 Withdrawn
Steam J38 0-6-0 65930 01/01/1948 DFU Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 04/12/1965 62A 4w/e 25/12/1965 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90600 4w/e 04/12/1965 62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 25/12/1965 62A m/e 08/1966 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61029 13/09/1953 64A St Margarets 03/04/1966 62A 06/11/1966 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam B1 4-6-0 61308 04/10/1965 64A St Margarets 03/04/1966 62A 19/11/1966 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61099 09/01/1966 64F Bathgate 24/04/1966 62A 02/09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61307 09/01/1966 64F Bathgate 24/04/1966 62A 28/08/1966 64A St Margarets
Steam B1 4-6-0 61344 13/08/1962 64A St Margarets 24/04/1966 62A 23/09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61347 04/10/1965 64A St Margarets 24/04/1966 62A 04/04/1967 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61349 22/08/1957 64A St Margarets 24/04/1966 62A 17/08/1966 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61354 25/06/1953 64A St Margarets 24/04/1966 62A 13/11/1966 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90596 5w/e 07/09/1963 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 30/04/1966 62A m/e 04/1967 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90640 3w/e 29/09/1962 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 30/04/1966 62A m/e 08/1966 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61407 30/01/1956 64C Dalry Road 14/08/1966 62A 22/04/1967 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 64602 4w/e 29/08/1959 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 20/08/1966 62A 9w/e 26/11/1966 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8072 4w/e 21/10/1961 65A Eastfield 5w/e 31/12/1966 62A 4w/e 25/03/1967 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8075 26/07/1961 65A Eastfield (New) 5w/e 31/12/1966 62A 4w/e 25/03/1967 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8076 26/07/1961 65A Eastfield (New) 5w/e 31/12/1966 62A 4w/e 25/03/1967 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8077 28/07/1961 65A Eastfield (New) 5w/e 31/12/1966 62A 4w/e 25/03/1967 65A Eastfield
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8106 12/12/1961 65A Eastfield (New) 5w/e 31/12/1966 62A 4w/e 25/03/1967 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8110 10/01/1962 65A Eastfield (New) 5w/e 31/12/1966 62A 4w/e 25/03/1967 66A Polmadie
Steam J36 0-6-0 65345 5w/e 29/01/1966 64F Bathgate 5w/e 31/12/1966 62A m/e 06/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2575 30/07/1958 68C Stranraer (New) 4w/e 25/02/1967 62A 4w/e 25/03/1967 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2574 4w/e 27/02/1965 67C Ayr 4w/e 25/03/1967 62A 4w/e 25/03/1967 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12107 w/e 13/05/1967 64B Haymarket 4w/e 27/05/1967 62A 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2585 5w/e 29/05/1965 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 26/08/1967 62A 08/06/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2589 4w/e 27/05/1967 64H Leith Central 4w/e 26/08/1967 62A 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3737 5w/e 30/10/1965 63A Perth South 4w/e 25/11/1967 62A 5w/e 01/08/1970 62C Dunfermline Townhill
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2595 4w/e 27/05/1967 64H Leith Central 4w/e 27/01/1968 62A 08/06/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3733 4w/e 25/02/1967 64H Leith Central 4w/e 24/02/1968 62A 4w/e 29/11/1969 67A Corkerhill
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3734 5w/e 30/12/1967 64H Leith Central 4w/e 24/02/1968 62A 5w/e 01/08/1970 62C Dunfermline Townhill
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2426 4w/e 24/02/1968 65A Eastfield 4w/e 27/04/1968 62A m/e 02/1969 Withdrawn
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2430 4w/e 16/03/1963 66C Hamilton (West) 4w/e 27/04/1968 62A 15/06/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2437 11/05/1960 67C Ayr (New) 4w/e 27/04/1968 62A 5w/e 01/08/1970 62C Dunfermline Townhill
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2439 4w/e 26/08/1967 65A Eastfield 4w/e 27/04/1968 62A 5w/e 01/08/1970 62C Dunfermline Townhill
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2440 4w/e 26/08/1967 65A Eastfield 4w/e 27/04/1968 62A 5w/e 01/08/1970 62C Dunfermline Townhill
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2438 4w/e 11/05/1963 67A Corkerhill 5w/e 01/06/1968 62A 5w/e 01/08/1970 62C Dunfermline Townhill
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2442 4w/e 21/10/1961 67A Corkerhill 5w/e 01/06/1968 62A 5w/e 01/08/1970 62C Dunfermline Townhill
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3411 5w/e 30/05/1964 66A Polmadie 5w/e 31/08/1968 62A 4w/e 28/12/1968 63A Perth South
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3549 5w/e 30/09/1967 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 31/08/1968 62A w/e 29/03/1969 36C Frodingham
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3549 5w/e 30/09/1967 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 31/08/1968 62A 4w/e 29/03/1969 91E To Eastern Region
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3554 3w/e 29/06/1968 66A Polmadie 5w/e 31/08/1968 62A w/e 14/06/1969 36A Doncaster
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3892 4w/e 25/02/1967 64H Leith Central 5w/e 31/08/1968 62A 5w/e 01/08/1970 62C Dunfermline Townhill
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3182 3w/e 27/07/1968 67C Ayr 5w/e 30/11/1968 62A 4w/e 28/12/1968 65F Grangemouth
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3891 4w/e 25/02/1967 64H Leith Central 4w/e 28/12/1968 62A 5w/e 01/08/1970 62C Dunfermline Townhill
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3211 4w/e 26/10/1968 66C Hamilton (West) 4w/e 25/01/1969 62A 4w/e 28/02/1970 65F Grangemouth
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3411 4w/e 28/12/1968 63A Perth South 5w/e 01/03/1969 62A 4w/e 28/06/1969 63A Perth South
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3560 3w/e 29/06/1968 62C Dunfermline Upper 5w/e 01/03/1969 62A 4w/e 27/09/1969 63A Perth South
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3547 4w/e 28/10/1967 65A Eastfield 4w/e 29/03/1969 62A 5w/e 31/05/1969 62A Thornton Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3547 4w/e 29/03/1969 62A Thornton Junction 5w/e 31/05/1969 62A 4w/e 29/11/1969 64H Leith Central