Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 160 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 6549 Week
» 26991 Month
» 363837 Year
» 1585402 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Tonbridge


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Tonbridge Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam O1 0-6-0 1048       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 07/10/1950 74A Ashford
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 1057       on 01/01/1948 TON w/e 07/04/1951 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 1063       on 01/01/1948 TON 7w/e 27/06/1951 73C Hither Green
Steam C 0-6-0 1086       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 12/05/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam C 0-6-0 1150       on 01/01/1948 TON 7w/e 27/06/1951 74C Dover Marine
Steam H 0-4-4T 1193       on 01/01/1948 TON w/e 25/03/1961 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 1219       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 08/02/1954 74A Ashford
Steam C 0-6-0 1221       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 08/02/1954 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam C 0-6-0 1225       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 06/10/1951 73C Hither Green
Steam C 0-6-0 1227       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 12/05/1951 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam C 0-6-0 1272       on 01/01/1948 TON w/e 08/08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 1320       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 11/04/1951 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam H 0-4-4T 1327       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 12/05/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam O1 0-6-0 1370       on 01/01/1948 TON 3w/e 13/10/1958 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam O1 0-6-0 1380       on 01/01/1948 TON m/e 11/1949 Withdrawn
Steam O1 0-6-0 1396       on 01/01/1948 TON m/e 08/1948 Withdrawn
Steam O1 0-6-0 1437       on 01/01/1948 TON m/e 10/1948 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 1461       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 27/07/1951 73E Faversham
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 1488       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 08/12/1950 75B Redhill
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 1490       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 08/12/1950 75B Redhill
Steam H 0-4-4T 1503       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 27/07/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam C 0-6-0 1513       on 01/01/1948 TON m/e 03/1955 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 1518       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 19/03/1952 74E St Leonards
Steam H 0-4-4T 1519       on 01/01/1948 TON 9w/e 30/06/1952 74E St Leonards
Steam H 0-4-4T 1540       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 12/05/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam H 0-4-4T 1543       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 08/12/1950 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam C 0-6-0 1580       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 27/07/1951 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 1586       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 08/12/1950 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam C 0-6-0 1590       on 01/01/1948 TON w/e 11/02/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 1591       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 08/12/1950 74A Ashford
Steam C 0-6-0 1593       on 01/01/1948 TON 6w/e 05/09/1951 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T 1670       on 01/01/1948 TON w/e 14/04/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T 1671       on 01/01/1948 TON 5w/e 14/02/1953 73E Faversham
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T 1672       on 01/01/1948 TON m/e 12/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T 1675       on 01/01/1948 TON m/e 12/1952 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 1686       on 01/01/1948 TON 6w/e 05/09/1951 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam R1 0-4-4T 1700       on 01/01/1948 TON m/e 10/1952 Withdrawn
Steam R1 0-4-4T 1703       on 01/01/1948 TON m/e 03/1954 Withdrawn
Steam R1 0-4-4T 1704       on 01/01/1948 TON 5w/e 14/02/1953 73E Faversham
Steam R1 0-4-4T 1707       on 01/01/1948 TON m/e 02/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 1731       on 01/01/1948 TON m/e 06/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 1732       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 05/02/1951 74D Tonbridge
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 1733       on 01/01/1948 TON m/e 12/1953 Withdrawn
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 1734       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 12/05/1951 74D Tonbridge
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 1761       on 01/01/1948 TON w/e 01/12/1956 Withdrawn
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 1762       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 08/12/1950 74A Ashford
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 1763       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 05/02/1951 74D Tonbridge
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1830       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 09/09/1950 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1859       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 08/12/1950 74C Dover Marine
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1862       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 27/07/1951 73C Hither Green
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2113       on 01/01/1948 TON 5w/e 14/02/1953 71A Eastleigh
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2129       on 01/01/1948 TON w/e 09/06/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2138       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 12/05/1951 71I Southampton Docks
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2145       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 08/12/1950 75A Brighton
Steam E1-1 0-6-0T 2164       on 01/01/1948 TON m/e 06/1948 Withdrawn
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2367       on 01/01/1948 TON m/e 02/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2370       on 01/01/1948 TON m/e 09/1948 Withdrawn
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2374       on 01/01/1948 TON m/e 02/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2378       on 01/01/1948 TON 6w/e 20/03/1951 75A Brighton
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 2488       on 01/01/1948 TON w/e 08/06/1957 Withdrawn
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 2503       on 01/01/1948 TON 5w/e 16/09/1955 75A Brighton
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 2580       on 01/01/1948 TON 6w/e 22/10/1959 75A Brighton
Steam Q1 0-6-0 C26       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 08/12/1950 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam Q1 0-6-0 C27       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 12/05/1951 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam Q1 0-6-0 C28       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 12/05/1951 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam Q1 0-6-0 C29       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 28/05/1962 70B Feltham
Steam Q1 0-6-0 C30       on 01/01/1948 TON 4w/e 28/05/1962 70A Nine Elms
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 31760 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 09/09/1950 74D 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam R1 0-4-4T 31706 4w/e 07/10/1950 74E St Leonards 4w/e 13/11/1950 74D 4w/e 08/12/1950 74D Tonbridge
Steam H 0-4-4T 31265 on 01/01/1948 RAM Ramsgate 4w/e 08/12/1950 74D 4w/e 12/05/1951 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 1574 on 01/01/1948 AFD Ashford 4w/e 08/12/1950 74D 4w/e 05/02/1951 74A Ashford
Steam R1 0-4-4T 31706 4w/e 13/11/1950 74D Tonbridge 4w/e 08/12/1950 74D m/e 12/1952 Withdrawn
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 31746 on 01/01/1948 GIL Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 08/12/1950 74D 6w/e 20/03/1951 70E Reading (S.R.)
Steam Small Radials 0-6-2T 32455 on 01/01/1948 NORW Norwood Junction 4w/e 08/12/1950 74D 4w/e 05/02/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam D1 4-4-0 31545 on 01/01/1948 DOV Dover Marine 4w/e 05/02/1951 74D 4w/e 11/04/1951 73E Faversham
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 31729 4w/e 09/09/1950 73D Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 05/02/1951 74D 9w/e 30/06/1952 74D Tonbridge
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 31732 on 01/01/1948 TON Tonbridge 4w/e 05/02/1951 74D m/e 09/1951 Withdrawn
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 31762 4w/e 08/12/1950 74A Ashford 4w/e 05/02/1951 74D 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 31763 on 01/01/1948 TON Tonbridge 4w/e 05/02/1951 74D 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 31764 4w/e 08/12/1950 74A Ashford 4w/e 05/02/1951 74D 4w/e 06/11/1954 74E St Leonards
Steam H 0-4-4T 31177 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 11/04/1951 74D w/e 07/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam D1 4-4-0 31727 on 01/01/1948 DOV Dover Marine 4w/e 11/04/1951 74D 5w/e 11/12/1952 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam D1 4-4-0 31735 4w/e 05/02/1951 73D Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 11/04/1951 74D 4w/e 19/03/1952 74A Ashford
Steam H 0-4-4T 31184 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 12/05/1951 74D w/e 08/03/1958 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31239 on 01/01/1948 AFD Ashford 4w/e 12/05/1951 74D w/e 09/01/1960 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31259 4w/e 08/12/1950 73E Faversham 4w/e 12/05/1951 74D m/e 11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 31270 on 01/01/1948 HIT Hither Green 4w/e 12/05/1951 74D w/e 20/06/1959 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 1271 on 01/01/1948 AFD Ashford 4w/e 12/05/1951 74D 9w/e 30/06/1952 74B Ramsgate
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T 31665 on 01/01/1948 GIL Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 12/05/1951 74D m/e 10/1952 Withdrawn
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T 31666 on 01/01/1948 GIL Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 12/05/1951 74D w/e 24/12/1955 Withdrawn
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 31734 on 01/01/1948 TON Tonbridge 4w/e 12/05/1951 74D m/e 11/1955 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 31260 on 01/01/1948 FAV Faversham 4w/e 27/07/1951 74D 4w/e 06/10/1951 73E Faversham
Steam C 0-6-0 31589 on 01/01/1948 AFD Ashford 4w/e 27/07/1951 74D 8w/e 20/07/1953 74A Ashford
Steam C 0-6-0 31716 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 27/07/1951 74D w/e 21/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 31717 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 27/07/1951 74D 4w/e 17/12/1956 75C Norwood Junction
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33026 4w/e 08/12/1950 73D Gillingham (Kent) 6w/e 05/09/1951 74D 4w/e 01/10/1953 70B Feltham
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33027 4w/e 12/05/1951 73D Gillingham (Kent) 6w/e 05/09/1951 74D 4w/e 01/10/1953 70B Feltham
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33028 4w/e 12/05/1951 73D Gillingham (Kent) 6w/e 05/09/1951 74D 4w/e 28/05/1962 70B Feltham
Steam H 0-4-4T 31164 4w/e 13/11/1950 74E St Leonards 4w/e 06/10/1951 74D w/e 24/10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 31585 on 01/01/1948 GIL Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 06/10/1951 74D w/e 14/02/1959 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 31588 on 01/01/1948 GIL Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 06/10/1951 74D m/e 09/11/1961 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon
Steam D1 4-4-0 31739 4w/e 12/05/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 06/10/1951 74D 5w/e 11/12/1952 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam C 0-6-0 31038 on 01/01/1948 STL St Leonards 9w/e 30/06/1952 74D m/e 03/1954 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31554 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 9w/e 30/06/1952 74D 6w/e 01/04/1957 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 31729 4w/e 05/02/1951 74D Tonbridge 9w/e 30/06/1952 74D m/e 05/1954 Withdrawn
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 31731 m/e 06/1951 Withdrawn 9w/e 30/06/1952 (R) 74D      
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 31766 on 01/01/1948 STL St Leonards 9w/e 30/06/1952 74D 7w/e 19/12/1955 73E Faversham
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 31770 9w/e 30/06/1952 74A Ashford 8w/e 07/10/1952 74D 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 31771 9w/e 30/06/1952 74A Ashford 8w/e 07/10/1952 74D 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 31773 9w/e 30/06/1952 74A Ashford 8w/e 07/10/1952 74D 9w/e 12/06/1957 74E St Leonards
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33036 4w/e 27/07/1951 73A Stewarts Lane 8w/e 07/10/1952 74D 3w/e 26/05/1961 70C Guildford
Steam C 0-6-0 31037 on 01/01/1948 STL St Leonards 5w/e 11/12/1952 74D 4w/e 08/02/1954 74A Ashford
Steam H 0-4-4T 31519 9w/e 30/06/1952 74E St Leonards 5w/e 14/02/1953 74D 6w/e 27/03/1953 73E Faversham
Steam R1 0-4-4T 31698 on 01/01/1948 FEL Feltham 5w/e 14/02/1953 74D w/e 15/10/1955 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 31244 5w/e 14/02/1953 74B Ramsgate 6w/e 27/03/1953 74D w/e 21/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam R1 0-4-4T 31704 5w/e 14/02/1953 73E Faversham 6w/e 27/03/1953 74D w/e 14/04/1956 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31261 on 01/01/1948 AFD Ashford 8w/e 20/07/1953 74D 6w/e 18/06/1954 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam H 0-4-4T 31530 on 01/01/1948 DOV Dover Marine 8w/e 20/07/1953 74D 6w/e 15/06/1956 75E Three Bridges
Steam Small Radials 0-6-2T 32454 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 8w/e 20/07/1953 74D 6w/e 01/04/1957 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32578 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 8w/e 20/07/1953 74D 4w/e 11/12/1954 74E St Leonards
Steam H 0-4-4T 31552 on 01/01/1948 9E Nine Elms 4w/e 01/10/1953 74D 6w/e 18/06/1954 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam H 0-4-4T 31553 5w/e 11/12/1952 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 01/10/1953 74D 4w/e 29/10/1953 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam E 4-4-0 31166 4w/e 19/03/1952 73E Faversham 4w/e 29/10/1953 74D w/e 21/05/1955 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31543 4w/e 12/05/1951 74A Ashford 4w/e 29/10/1953 74D 6w/e 14/06/1959 75A Brighton
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33024 on 01/01/1948 ELH Eastleigh 4w/e 29/10/1953 74D m/e 10/02/1961 70B Feltham
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 31737 4w/e 11/04/1951 70E Reading (S.R.) 8w/e 13/05/1954 74D 7w/e 19/12/1955 70C Guildford
Steam H 0-4-4T 31544 4w/e 17/06/1950 73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 18/06/1954 74D 6w/e 15/06/1956 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31909 9w/e 30/06/1952 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 20/08/1954 74D m/e 10/02/1961 71A Eastleigh
Steam Z 0-8-0T 30950 6w/e 27/03/1953 75A Brighton 4w/e 06/11/1954 74D 3w/e 01/11/1955 74A Ashford
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31908 6w/e 18/06/1954 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 06/11/1954 74D m/e 10/02/1961 71A Eastleigh
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31910 4w/e 20/08/1954 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 06/11/1954 74D m/e 10/02/1961 71A Eastleigh
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32578 4w/e 11/12/1954 74E St Leonards 9w/e 08/02/1955 74D 7w/e 23/08/1960 75A Brighton
Steam H 0-4-4T 31517 4w/e 06/10/1951 75F Tunbridge Wells West 6w/e 21/06/1955 74D m/e 05/1961 Withdrawn
Steam D1 4-4-0 31246 4w/e 05/02/1951 74C Dover Marine 4w/e 10/10/1955 74D 3w/e 17/11/1956 74A Ashford
Steam C 0-6-0 31583 4w/e 27/07/1951 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 10/10/1955 74D 6w/e 01/04/1957 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam D1 4-4-0 31470 4w/e 01/10/1953 73E Faversham 7w/e 19/12/1955 74D m/e 06/1959 Withdrawn
Steam D1 4-4-0 31487 4w/e 05/02/1951 73E Faversham 7w/e 19/12/1955 74D 4w/e 08/07/1960 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam D1 4-4-0 31489 on 01/01/1948 FAV Faversham 7w/e 19/12/1955 74D 4w/e 08/07/1960 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam D1 4-4-0 31492 4w/e 05/02/1951 73E Faversham 7w/e 19/12/1955 74D w/e 23/01/1960 Withdrawn
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32443 4w/e 27/07/1951 75C Norwood Junction 6w/e 25/01/1957 74D 7w/e 08/10/1957 75E Three Bridges
Steam C 0-6-0 31280 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 01/04/1957 74D 6w/e 05/10/1960 75C Norwood Junction
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31894 6w/e 21/06/1955 73A Stewarts Lane 6w/e 01/04/1957 74D 9w/e 12/06/1957 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31896 3w/e 09/05/1955 73A Stewarts Lane 6w/e 01/04/1957 74D 6w/e 14/06/1959 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 31772 9w/e 30/06/1952 74A Ashford 9w/e 12/06/1957 74D w/e 21/02/1959 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31266 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane q/e 06/06/1958 74D 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam H 0-4-4T 31279 9w/e 30/06/1952 74E St Leonards q/e 06/06/1958 74D 6w/e 14/06/1959 75A Brighton
Steam H 0-4-4T 31295 8w/e 20/07/1953 74E St Leonards q/e 06/06/1958 74D w/e 30/05/1959 Withdrawn
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 31773 9w/e 12/06/1957 74E St Leonards q/e 06/06/1958 74D 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 31774 9w/e 12/06/1957 74E St Leonards q/e 06/06/1958 74D w/e 06/12/1958 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31319 7w/e 20/04/1956 74A Ashford 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J w/e 30/01/1960 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31322 6w/e 21/06/1955 73D Gillingham (Kent) 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J 4w/e 06/05/1960 75A Brighton
Steam H 0-4-4T 31512 7w/e 19/12/1955 73D Gillingham (Kent) 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J w/e 10/06/1961 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31518 5w/e 14/02/1953 73D Gillingham (Kent) 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J 4w/e 28/05/1962 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam H 0-4-4T 31519 q/e 06/06/1958 74A Ashford 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J m/e 02/1961 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31520 q/e 06/06/1958 74A Ashford 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J m/e 08/1960 Withdrawn
Steam N1 2-6-0 31822 on 01/01/1948 STL St Leonards 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D Stewarts Lane
Steam N1 2-6-0 31876 on 01/01/1948 STL St Leonards 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D Stewarts Lane
Steam N1 2-6-0 31877 on 01/01/1948 STL St Leonards 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D Stewarts Lane
Steam N1 2-6-0 31878 on 01/01/1948 HIT Hither Green 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D Stewarts Lane
Steam N1 2-6-0 31879 on 01/01/1948 HIT Hither Green 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D Stewarts Lane
Steam N1 2-6-0 31880 on 01/01/1948 HIT Hither Green 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D Stewarts Lane
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31901 6w/e 21/06/1955 73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J 3w/e 26/05/1961 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31902 6w/e 21/06/1955 73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J 3w/e 26/05/1961 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31903 6w/e 21/06/1955 73E Faversham 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J 3w/e 26/05/1961 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31904 7w/e 27/06/1951 73A Stewarts Lane 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J 3w/e 26/05/1961 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31905 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J 3w/e 26/05/1961 70A Nine Elms
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31906 4w/e 11/12/1954 73A Stewarts Lane 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J 3w/e 26/05/1961 70A Nine Elms
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31907 4w/e 11/12/1954 73A Stewarts Lane 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J 3w/e 26/05/1961 70A Nine Elms
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33001 on 01/01/1948 GFD Guildford 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J m/e 10/02/1961 70B Feltham
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33002 6w/e 27/03/1953 70C Guildford 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J m/e 10/02/1961 70B Feltham
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33003 on 01/01/1948 GFD Guildford 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J m/e 10/02/1961 70B Feltham
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33004 8w/e 20/07/1953 70C Guildford 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J m/e 10/02/1961 70B Feltham
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33014 4w/e 27/07/1951 73C Hither Green 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J m/e 10/02/1961 70B Feltham
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33037 4w/e 06/11/1954 73C Hither Green 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J 3w/e 26/05/1961 71A Eastleigh
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33039 5w/e 19/07/1957 73C Hither Green 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J 3w/e 26/05/1961 71A Eastleigh
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33040 5w/e 19/07/1957 73C Hither Green 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J 3w/e 26/05/1961 70B Feltham
Steam C 0-6-0 31684 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 6w/e 22/10/1959 73J w/e 21/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31500 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 5w/e 26/11/1959 73J w/e 10/06/1961 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 31061 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 6w/e 09/02/1960 73J 4w/e 08/07/1960 70B Feltham
Steam H 0-4-4T 31324 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 6w/e 09/02/1960 73J 4w/e 05/04/1960 73F Ashford
Steam H 0-4-4T 31553 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 6w/e 09/02/1960 73J 3w/e 26/05/1961 75E Three Bridges
Steam C 0-6-0 31592 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 6w/e 09/02/1960 73J m/e 09/11/1961 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon
Steam L1 4-4-0 31756 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 6w/e 09/02/1960 73J 4w/e 08/07/1960 70A Nine Elms
Steam L1 4-4-0 31783 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 6w/e 09/02/1960 73J 4w/e 08/07/1960 70A Nine Elms
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30328 6w/e 15/06/1956 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 10/03/1960 73J 7w/e 23/08/1960 75A Brighton
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30379 7w/e 19/12/1955 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 10/03/1960 73J 7w/e 23/08/1960 75A Brighton
Steam H 0-4-4T 31263 6w/e 15/06/1956 74A Ashford 4w/e 05/04/1960 73J 4w/e 01/02/1962 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon
Steam H 0-4-4T 31533 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 06/05/1960 73J 3w/e 26/05/1961 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31892 6w/e 14/06/1959 70B Feltham 4w/e 08/07/1960 73J 3w/e 26/05/1961 75E Three Bridges
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31893 6w/e 14/06/1959 70B Feltham 4w/e 08/07/1960 73J 3w/e 26/05/1961 75E Three Bridges
Steam H 0-4-4T 31543 6w/e 14/06/1959 75A Brighton 6w/e 05/10/1960 73J 4w/e 24/11/1960 73J Tonbridge
Steam H 0-4-4T 31551 8w/e 13/05/1954 73A Stewarts Lane 6w/e 05/10/1960 73J 3w/e 26/05/1961 75E Three Bridges
Steam H 0-4-4T 31543 6w/e 05/10/1960 73J Tonbridge 4w/e 24/11/1960 73J 3w/e 26/05/1961 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam H 0-4-4T 31276 6w/e 14/06/1959 75A Brighton m/e 10/02/1961 73J w/e 25/02/1961 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31308 6w/e 14/06/1959 75A Brighton m/e 10/02/1961 73J 4w/e 28/05/1962 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam H 0-4-4T 31322 4w/e 06/05/1960 75A Brighton m/e 10/02/1961 73J w/e 22/04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31324 4w/e 05/04/1960 73F Ashford m/e 10/02/1961 73J 4w/e 28/05/1962 75E Three Bridges
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31402 on 01/01/1948 AFD Ashford m/e 10/02/1961 73J 3w/e 26/05/1961 70C Guildford
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31403 on 01/01/1948 AFD Ashford m/e 10/02/1961 73J 3w/e 26/05/1961 70C Guildford
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31404 on 01/01/1948 AFD Ashford m/e 10/02/1961 73J 3w/e 26/05/1961 72B Salisbury
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31405 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane m/e 10/02/1961 73J 3w/e 26/05/1961 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31406 8w/e 20/07/1953 74A Ashford m/e 10/02/1961 73J 3w/e 26/05/1961 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31407 4w/e 10/10/1955 74A Ashford m/e 10/02/1961 73J 3w/e 26/05/1961 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31818 4w/e 27/07/1951 74C Dover Marine m/e 10/02/1961 73J 3w/e 26/05/1961 71A Eastleigh
Steam H 0-4-4T 31530 m/e 10/02/1961 75F Tunbridge Wells West 5w/e 18/03/1961 73J m/e 08/12/1961 75E Three Bridges
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80037 5w/e 31/12/1959 73F Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961 73J 4w/e 28/05/1962 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80038 5w/e 31/12/1959 73F Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961 73J 5w/e 02/07/1962 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80039 5w/e 31/12/1959 73F Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961 73J 5w/e 02/07/1962 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80040 5w/e 31/12/1959 73F Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961 73J 5w/e 02/07/1962 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80041 5w/e 31/12/1959 73F Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961 73J 5w/e 02/07/1962 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80042 5w/e 31/12/1959 73F Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961 73J 5w/e 02/07/1962 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80043 4w/e 05/04/1960 73F Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961 73J 5w/e 02/07/1962 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80059 4w/e 05/04/1960 73F Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961 73J 5w/e 02/07/1962 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80064 4w/e 05/04/1960 73F Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961 73J 5w/e 02/07/1962 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80065 4w/e 05/04/1960 73F Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961 73J 5w/e 02/07/1962 71A Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80066 4w/e 05/04/1960 73F Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961 73J 5w/e 02/07/1962 71A Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80085 m/e 10/02/1961 73F Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961 73J 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D Stewarts Lane