Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1350 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19153 Week
» 72169 Month
» 191696 Year
» 3218549 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Toton
Type |
Class |
Wheels |
Number |
|
Date to Previous Shed |
Code |
Previous Shed |
|
Date to Toton |
Code |
|
Date to Next Shed |
Code |
Next Shed |
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
1237 |
m/e |
12/1921 |
28 |
Holbeck (MR) |
m/e |
03/1930 |
M17 |
4w/e |
29/11/1930 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8009 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
02/11/1935 |
18A |
on |
01/01/1948 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8010 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
02/11/1935 |
18A |
on |
01/01/1948 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4111 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
02/11/1935 |
18A |
on |
01/01/1948 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
2992 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
02/11/1935 |
18A |
4w/e |
21/04/1956 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
2000 |
0-6-4T |
2008 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
02/11/1935 |
18A |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
3892 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
18A |
on |
01/01/1948 |
17B |
Burton |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4140 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
18A |
on |
01/01/1948 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
3003 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
18A |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
18C |
Hasland |
Steam |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
8732 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
18A |
m/e |
03/1937 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
8760 |
4w/e |
02/11/1935 |
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
18A |
m/e |
03/1936 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
8761 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
18A |
m/e |
05/1937 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
8762 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
18A |
m/e |
03/1936 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
8857 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
18A |
m/e |
08/1936 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
8858 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
18A |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
19" Goods |
4-6-0 |
8859 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
18A |
m/e |
01/1940 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3773 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
18A |
on |
01/01/1948 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12117 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
18A |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12130 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
18A |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12132 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
18A |
on |
01/01/1948 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12207 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
18A |
4w/e |
11/04/1936 |
26D |
Bury |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12245 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
18A |
4w/e |
11/04/1936 |
26D |
Bury |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12246 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
18A |
4w/e |
11/04/1936 |
26C |
Bolton |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12247 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
18A |
4w/e |
11/04/1936 |
26D |
Bury |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12273 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
18A |
4w/e |
11/04/1936 |
25C |
Goole |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12280 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
18A |
4w/e |
11/04/1936 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12294 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
18A |
4w/e |
11/04/1936 |
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12306 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
18A |
4w/e |
11/04/1936 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12326 |
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
26D |
Bury |
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
18A |
4w/e |
11/04/1936 |
26D |
Bury |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12376 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
18A |
4w/e |
11/04/1936 |
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam |
2000 |
0-6-4T |
2013 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
18A |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2000 |
0-6-4T |
2032 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
18A |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0 |
3071 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
11/04/1936 |
18A |
4w/e |
27/03/1954 |
17A |
Derby |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12136 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
11/04/1936 |
18A |
on |
01/01/1948 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
22963 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
11/04/1936 |
18A |
4w/e |
08/03/1958 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8076 |
|
|
|
|
m/e |
12/1936 (New) |
18A |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8078 |
|
|
|
|
m/e |
12/1936 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
22/06/1946 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8079 |
|
|
|
|
m/e |
12/1936 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
22/06/1946 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8080 |
|
|
|
|
m/e |
12/1936 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
22/06/1946 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
7083 |
|
|
|
|
on |
27/05/1939 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
18/07/1959 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
416 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
22/06/1946 |
18A |
on |
01/01/1948 |
17A |
Derby |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
7125 |
|
|
|
|
w/e |
30/11/1946 |
18A |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
7084 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
07/01/1950 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
7085 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
7089 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
3885 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
14/02/1948 |
18C |
Hasland |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
3900 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
14/10/1950 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
3914 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
3923 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
13/03/1948 |
15D |
Bedford |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
3939 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
3943 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
on |
29/09/1956 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
3961 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
07/04/1951 |
17A |
Derby |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
3970 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
18C |
Hasland |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
3974 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
3975 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
3979 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
3988 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
3990 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
on |
05/12/1959 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
3995 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4012 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
09/11/1963 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8002 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8004 |
4w/e |
11/04/1936 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
20B |
Stourton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8033 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8037 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8070 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
07/02/1948 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8075 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
23/04/1955 |
19C |
Canklow |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8112 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8117 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
23/04/1955 |
16A |
Nottingham |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8119 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8133 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
20B |
Stourton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8142 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8144 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8168 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8178 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8182 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
07/03/1959 |
17B |
Burton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8194 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
21/04/1962 |
17B |
Burton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8196 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8197 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8199 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
17/07/1954 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8200 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
16/08/1958 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8201 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8202 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
20D |
Normanton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8203 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8204 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8205 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
18C |
Hasland |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8221 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
27/06/1964 |
15C |
Kettering |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8304 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8311 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
24/01/1948 |
20B |
Stourton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8313 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8323 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
16B |
Spital Bridge |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8324 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8350 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
27/06/1964 |
15C |
Kettering |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8361 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
26/12/1964 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8362 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
16A |
Nottingham |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8367 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8370 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
16A |
Nottingham |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8384 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
22/02/1964 |
16G |
Westhouses |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8387 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8388 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8418 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8490 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
07/01/1961 |
16A |
Nottingham |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8606 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
25/04/1964 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8607 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
07/01/1961 |
15B |
Kettering |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8611 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
10/12/1949 |
15B |
Kettering |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8615 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8618 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
16/08/1958 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8636 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
12/05/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8637 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
27/06/1964 |
15C |
Kettering |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8638 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8655 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8662 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
17B |
Burton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8672 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
25/04/1964 |
15E |
Coalville |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8681 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
07/08/1965 |
16F |
Burton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8685 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
17/04/1965 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8690 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
27/10/1951 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8703 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
07/02/1948 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3778 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
17B |
Burton |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3787 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3793 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3795 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
on |
06/04/1957 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3798 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3799 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3803 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3804 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
on |
20/12/1952 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3805 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
on |
03/06/1950 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3810 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
on |
23/04/1955 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3817 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3818 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
on |
13/05/1950 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3819 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
on |
20/02/1954 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3820 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
on |
28/06/1952 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3821 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
on |
10/04/1954 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3823 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
on |
15/03/1958 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3824 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
on |
18/05/1951 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3825 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3826 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
9G |
Gorton |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3827 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
on |
16/12/1950 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3828 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
08/03/1958 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3831 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
on |
08/05/1948 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3832 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3833 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
on |
05/09/1953 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3259 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
17A |
Derby |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3287 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3305 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3327 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
16D |
Mansfield |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3405 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
07/02/1959 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3453 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3499 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
15B |
Kettering |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3599 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3631 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
18C |
Hasland |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3633 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3650 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
7998 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
25/08/1956 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
7999 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
28/01/1956 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
7967 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
08/09/1956 |
18C |
Hasland |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
7969 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
18C |
Hasland |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
7970 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
02/07/1955 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
7972 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
24/03/1956 |
18C |
Hasland |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
7974 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
7975 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
02/07/1955 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
7976 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
on |
21/04/1956 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
7977 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
7978 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
18C |
Hasland |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
7979 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
08/09/1956 |
18C |
Hasland |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
7981 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
on |
03/11/1956 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
7982 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
7985 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
11/06/1955 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
7986 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
02/01/1954 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
7987 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
20/04/1957 |
18C |
Hasland |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
7988 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
02/01/1954 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
7989 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
12/11/1955 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
7991 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
31/12/1955 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
7994 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
7995 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
7996 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
16/06/1956 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4043 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
21D |
Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4089 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
07/01/1950 |
19C |
Canklow |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4091 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4106 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
15/02/1964 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4133 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
18C |
Hasland |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4150 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4157 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4187 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4233 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4241 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
19C |
Canklow |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4250 |
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
09/07/1949 |
16B |
Spital Bridge |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4376 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
08/08/1964 |
16F |
Burton |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4470 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4547 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
17/07/1948 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4552 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
7436 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
21/04/1951 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
7454 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
20F |
Skipton |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
7551 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
23/02/1963 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
7555 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
5w/e |
24/03/1951 |
33A |
Plaistow |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
7623 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
16A |
Nottingham |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
7630 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
7247 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
17/03/1951 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
7249 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4829 |
4w/e |
22/06/1946 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
5B |
Crewe South |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8110 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
w/e |
07/02/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
19E |
Belle Vue |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8176 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
w/e |
07/02/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8187 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
28A |
Motherwell |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
18C |
Hasland |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8273 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5B |
Crewe South |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8400 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
21A |
Saltley |
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
18A |
8w/e |
20/04/1957 |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
3985 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
19E |
Belle Vue |
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4371 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
19E |
Belle Vue |
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
09/08/1952 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3226 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
20G |
Hellifield |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
17A |
Derby |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8622 |
w/e |
24/01/1948 |
20B |
Stourton |
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
25/09/1948 |
20B |
Stourton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8652 |
w/e |
24/01/1948 |
20B |
Stourton |
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
25/09/1948 |
20B |
Stourton |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
3994 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
16A |
Nottingham |
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
08/08/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48004 |
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
20B |
Stourton |
w/e |
25/09/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
08/07/1950 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48133 |
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
20B |
Stourton |
w/e |
25/09/1948 |
18A |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
3859 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
16B |
Spital Bridge |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
18A |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
17A |
Derby |
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
359 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
24/09/1949 |
18C |
Hasland |
Steam |
1808 |
4-4-0 |
391 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
20E |
Manningham |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
18A |
m/e |
08/1949 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
544 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
18A |
m/e |
10/1949 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
548 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
18C |
Hasland |
Steam |
2P |
4-4-2T |
2097 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
13C |
Tilbury |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
18A |
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
13A |
Plaistow |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8303 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
28C |
Carstairs |
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
18A |
w/e |
05/05/1962 |
17B |
Burton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8331 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
28C |
Carstairs |
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
18A |
w/e |
27/10/1951 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48007 |
w/e |
30/04/1949 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
18A |
4w/e |
26/03/1955 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48409 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
18A |
w/e |
11/06/1949 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48442 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
18A |
w/e |
11/06/1949 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44664 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
16/07/1949 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
20/08/1949 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8461 |
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
24A |
Accrington |
w/e |
23/07/1949 |
18A |
4w/e |
21/04/1956 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8463 |
w/e |
13/03/1948 |
24A |
Accrington |
w/e |
23/07/1949 |
18A |
8w/e |
20/04/1957 |
85C |
Hereford |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44250 |
5w/e |
16/07/1949 |
16B |
Spital Bridge |
w/e |
06/08/1949 |
18A |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
17D |
Rowsley |
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
40506 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18C |
Hasland |
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
18A |
m/e |
11/1949 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
40556 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18C |
Hasland |
w/e |
24/09/1949 |
18A |
w/e |
26/08/1950 |
18C |
Hasland |
Steam |
2P |
4-4-2T |
41911 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
16A |
Nottingham |
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
18A |
m/e |
09/1953 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47545 |
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
21A |
Saltley |
w/e |
17/12/1949 |
18A |
5w/e |
24/12/1949 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
2998 |
|
|
|
|
5w/e |
24/12/1949 |
18A |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47545 |
w/e |
17/12/1949 |
18A |
Toton |
5w/e |
24/12/1949 |
18A |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
16A |
Nottingham |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43240 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
18A |
w/e |
21/01/1950 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43242 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
18A |
w/e |
21/01/1950 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43240 |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
21/01/1950 |
18A |
w/e |
08/07/1950 |
16A |
Nottingham |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43242 |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
21/01/1950 |
18A |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0 |
58197 |
|
|
|
|
w/e |
11/02/1950 |
18A |
4w/e |
19/03/1955 |
33A |
Plaistow |
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0 |
58268 |
|
|
|
|
w/e |
11/02/1950 |
18A |
w/e |
06/10/1951 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0 |
58192 |
|
|
|
|
w/e |
18/02/1950 |
18A |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3186 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
20G |
Hellifield |
w/e |
10/06/1950 |
18A |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
21C |
Bromsgrove |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43251 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
20F |
Skipton |
w/e |
10/06/1950 |
18A |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43251 |
w/e |
10/06/1950 |
18A |
Toton |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
18A |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
16D |
Mansfield |
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
40370 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18C |
Hasland |
w/e |
26/08/1950 |
18A |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
18A |
Toton |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12071 |
|
|
|
|
on |
31/08/1950 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
30/04/1951 |
84E |
Tyseley |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12072 |
|
|
|
|
on |
31/08/1950 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
30/04/1951 |
84E |
Tyseley |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47630 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
Toton |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
18A |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
16A |
Nottingham |
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
40370 |
w/e |
26/08/1950 |
18A |
Toton |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
18A |
w/e |
06/01/1951 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12073 |
|
|
|
|
on |
30/09/1950 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
01/01/1955 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48053 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
18A |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48131 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
20D |
Normanton |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
18A |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48152 |
w/e |
16/04/1949 |
18B |
Westhouses |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
18A |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48184 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
18B |
Westhouses |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
18A |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48185 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
18B |
Westhouses |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
18A |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48195 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
18A |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48538 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
18A |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43847 |
w/e |
12/08/1950 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
18A |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
17A |
Derby |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43969 |
w/e |
12/08/1950 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
18A |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48002 |
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
18A |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
17B |
Burton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48033 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
18A |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
17B |
Burton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48053 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
18A |
Toton |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
18A |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
17B |
Burton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48131 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
18A |
Toton |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
18A |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48152 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
18A |
Toton |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
18A |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48184 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
18A |
Toton |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
18A |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48185 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
18A |
Toton |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
18A |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
16A |
Nottingham |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48186 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
18B |
Westhouses |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
18A |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48195 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
18A |
Toton |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
18A |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48538 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
18A |
Toton |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
18A |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43862 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
w/e |
14/10/1950 |
18A |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43862 |
w/e |
14/10/1950 |
18A |
Toton |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
18A |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
17A |
Derby |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
47997 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18C |
Hasland |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
18A |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
47997 |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
18A |
Toton |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
18A |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
18C |
Hasland |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43767 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
21D |
Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
18A |
on |
03/10/1953 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48121 |
w/e |
21/02/1948 |
17A |
Derby |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
18A |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
17A |
Derby |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48159 |
w/e |
07/02/1948 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
18A |
4w/e |
16/06/1951 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48201 |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
18A |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48203 |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
18A |
4w/e |
16/06/1951 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
40502 |
w/e |
05/02/1949 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
18A |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48201 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
18A |
Toton |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
18A |
w/e |
26/12/1964 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
40502 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
18A |
Toton |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
18A |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
18C |
Hasland |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43251 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
16D |
Mansfield |
w/e |
10/03/1951 |
18A |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48204 |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
18A |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48332 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
18A |
w/e |
05/05/1962 |
17B |
Burton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48677 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
17A |
Derby |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
18A |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
17A |
Derby |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43251 |
w/e |
10/03/1951 |
18A |
Toton |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
18A |
on |
19/12/1959 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43917 |
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
20F |
Skipton |
w/e |
28/04/1951 |
18A |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43933 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
20H |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
w/e |
28/04/1951 |
18A |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43309 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
w/e |
28/04/1951 |
18A |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43751 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
w/e |
28/04/1951 |
18A |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
18A |
Toton |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12070 |
|
|
|
|
w/e |
05/05/1951 |
18A |
w/e |
29/11/1952 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48033 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
17B |
Burton |
w/e |
12/05/1951 |
18A |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
47234 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
21C |
Bromsgrove |
w/e |
12/05/1951 |
18A |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43917 |
w/e |
28/04/1951 |
18A |
Toton |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
18A |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
16A |
Nottingham |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43933 |
w/e |
28/04/1951 |
18A |
Toton |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
18A |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
17C |
Coalville |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48033 |
w/e |
12/05/1951 |
18A |
Toton |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
18A |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43309 |
w/e |
28/04/1951 |
18A |
Toton |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
18A |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43751 |
w/e |
28/04/1951 |
18A |
Toton |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
18A |
on |
30/11/1958 |
41B |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
47234 |
w/e |
12/05/1951 |
18A |
Toton |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
18A |
w/e |
08/02/1958 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44145 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
21A |
Saltley |
w/e |
27/10/1951 |
18A |
w/e |
21/02/1959 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44200 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
21A |
Saltley |
w/e |
27/10/1951 |
18A |
w/e |
02/11/1963 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48219 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
18A |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48271 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
20D |
Normanton |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
18A |
w/e |
06/04/1963 |
17B |
Burton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48640 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
17A |
Derby |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
18A |
4w/e |
17/07/1954 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46499 |
|
|
|
|
m/e |
03/1952 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
18C |
Hasland |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46500 |
|
|
|
|
m/e |
03/1952 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
1357 |
0-6-0 |
58241 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
18A |
3w/e |
17/05/1952 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46500 |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
18B |
Westhouses |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
18A |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46500 |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
18A |
Toton |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
18A |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
18C |
Hasland |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44154 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
4w/e |
09/08/1952 |
18A |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
27F |
Brunswick |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12070 |
w/e |
05/05/1951 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
29/11/1952 |
18A |
w/e |
09/01/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48543 |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
18A |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44037 |
w/e |
21/02/1948 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
18A |
3w/e |
24/01/1953 |
19C |
Canklow |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12071 |
4w/e |
30/04/1951 |
84E |
Tyseley |
5w/e |
03/01/1953 |
18A |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12072 |
4w/e |
30/04/1951 |
84E |
Tyseley |
3w/e |
24/01/1953 |
18A |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48216 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
21A |
Saltley |
3w/e |
24/01/1953 |
18A |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48284 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
21A |
Saltley |
3w/e |
24/01/1953 |
18A |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
18C |
Hasland |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48128 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
15B |
Kettering |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
18A |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44047 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
17B |
Burton |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
18A |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
17B |
Burton |
Steam |
79 |
4-4-2T |
41966 |
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
18A |
m/e |
06/1956 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48203 |
4w/e |
16/06/1951 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
18A |
4w/e |
07/09/1957 |
9G |
Northwich |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48377 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
20C |
Royston |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
18A |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
16A |
Nottingham |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48412 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
20C |
Royston |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
18A |
4w/e |
16/07/1955 |
84C |
Banbury |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48419 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
20C |
Royston |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
18A |
4w/e |
16/07/1955 |
84C |
Banbury |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48507 |
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
20D |
Normanton |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
18A |
4w/e |
26/03/1955 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44161 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
20C |
Royston |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
18A |
w/e |
12/12/1959 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
70043 |
on |
04/06/1953 |
9A |
Longsight (New) |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
18A |
4w/e |
02/01/1954 |
9A |
Longsight |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43961 |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
17A |
Derby |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
18A |
4w/e |
12/07/1958 |
17C |
Rowsley |
Steam |
L1 |
2-6-4T |
67729 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
24/10/1953 |
18A |
4w/e |
21/11/1953 |
30A |
Stratford |
Steam |
L1 |
2-6-4T |
67737 |
4w/e |
22/01/1949 |
STR |
Stratford |
4w/e |
24/10/1953 |
18A |
4w/e |
21/11/1953 |
30A |
Stratford |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44020 |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
18A |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
17A |
Derby |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44088 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
21A |
Saltley |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
18A |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44190 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
21A |
Saltley |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
18A |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
17C |
Coalville |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44289 |
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
21A |
Saltley |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
18A |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44362 |
w/e |
16/04/1949 |
21A |
Saltley |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
18A |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48037 |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
18B |
Westhouses |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
18A |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48128 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
18B |
Westhouses |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
18A |
w/e |
11/07/1959 |
17C |
Rowsley |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48139 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
18A |
4w/e |
14/08/1954 |
20D |
Normanton |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
47993 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18C |
Hasland |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
18A |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
18C |
Hasland |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48183 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
4w/e |
02/01/1954 |
18A |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48772 |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
4w/e |
02/01/1954 |
18A |
4w/e |
16/08/1958 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43292 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
4w/e |
02/01/1954 |
18A |
8w/e |
16/07/1955 |
17C |
Coalville |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12057 |
|
|
|
|
w/e |
09/01/1954 |
18A |
w/e |
27/03/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12070 |
w/e |
29/11/1952 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
09/01/1954 |
18A |
w/e |
27/03/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48061 |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
15B |
Kettering |
4w/e |
30/01/1954 |
18A |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12057 |
w/e |
09/01/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
27/03/1954 |
18A |
w/e |
31/07/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12070 |
w/e |
09/01/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
27/03/1954 |
18A |
w/e |
30/10/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43923 |
w/e |
13/03/1948 |
15D |
Bedford |
4w/e |
27/03/1954 |
18A |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
17C |
Coalville |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48107 |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
4w/e |
27/03/1954 |
18A |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48145 |
4w/e |
30/01/1954 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
18A |
w/e |
15/12/1962 |
17C |
Rowsley |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
47971 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18C |
Hasland |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
18A |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
18C |
Hasland |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
47984 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18C |
Hasland |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
18A |
w/e |
25/02/1956 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
47990 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18C |
Hasland |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
18A |
w/e |
28/05/1955 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
47988 |
4w/e |
02/01/1954 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
18A |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
18C |
Hasland |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47619 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
22B |
Gloucester Barnwood |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
18A |
4w/e |
01/01/1955 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12047 |
|
|
|
|
w/e |
03/07/1954 |
18A |
w/e |
31/07/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12047 |
w/e |
03/07/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
31/07/1954 |
18A |
w/e |
27/08/1955 |
18A |
Toton |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12057 |
w/e |
27/03/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
31/07/1954 |
18A |
w/e |
21/08/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
13056 |
|
|
|
|
on |
14/08/1954 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
08/09/1956 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48319 |
4w/e |
17/07/1954 |
21A |
Saltley |
4w/e |
14/08/1954 |
18A |
w/e |
09/02/1963 |
16A |
Nottingham |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12045 |
|
|
|
|
w/e |
21/08/1954 |
18A |
w/e |
18/11/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12048 |
|
|
|
|
w/e |
21/08/1954 |
18A |
w/e |
02/10/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12057 |
w/e |
31/07/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
21/08/1954 |
18A |
w/e |
18/12/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12046 |
|
|
|
|
w/e |
02/10/1954 |
18A |
w/e |
23/10/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12048 |
w/e |
21/08/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
02/10/1954 |
18A |
w/e |
03/09/1955 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
47997 |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
18C |
Hasland |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
18A |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
18C |
Hasland |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12046 |
w/e |
02/10/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
23/10/1954 |
18A |
w/e |
20/08/1955 |
18A |
Toton |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12070 |
w/e |
27/03/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
30/10/1954 |
18A |
w/e |
04/12/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44217 |
4w/e |
14/08/1954 |
15D |
Bedford |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
18A |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
18C |
Hasland |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12045 |
w/e |
21/08/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
18/11/1954 |
18A |
w/e |
30/07/1955 |
18A |
Toton |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12056 |
|
|
|
|
w/e |
04/12/1954 |
18A |
w/e |
18/12/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12070 |
w/e |
30/10/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
04/12/1954 |
18A |
w/e |
23/07/1955 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
47974 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
18A |
w/e |
16/06/1956 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
47977 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
18A |
4w/e |
01/01/1955 |
18C |
Hasland |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
47982 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
18A |
4w/e |
01/01/1955 |
18C |
Hasland |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
47994 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
18A |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
18C |
Hasland |
Steam |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
47995 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
18A |
4w/e |
20/04/1957 |
18C |
Hasland |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12056 |
w/e |
04/12/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
18/12/1954 |
18A |
w/e |
09/04/1955 |
18A |
Toton |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12057 |
w/e |
21/08/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
18/12/1954 |
18A |
w/e |
01/01/1955 |
18A |
Toton |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12057 |
w/e |
18/12/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
01/01/1955 |
18A |
w/e |
12/03/1955 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
47247 |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
4w/e |
01/01/1955 |
18A |
m/e |
06/1959 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12057 |
w/e |
01/01/1955 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
12/03/1955 |
18A |
w/e |
09/04/1955 |
18A |
Toton |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12072 |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
4w/e |
26/03/1955 |
18A |
8w/e |
16/07/1955 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12073 |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
4w/e |
26/03/1955 |
18A |
4w/e |
10/09/1955 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12056 |
w/e |
18/12/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
09/04/1955 |
18A |
w/e |
14/05/1955 |
18A |
Toton |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12057 |
w/e |
12/03/1955 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
09/04/1955 |
18A |
w/e |
17/09/1955 |
18A |
Toton |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12056 |
w/e |
09/04/1955 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
14/05/1955 |
18A |
w/e |
13/08/1955 |
18A |
Toton |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43723 |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
18C |
Hasland |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
18A |
on |
03/09/1955 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
D3/3 |
0-6-0 |
13117 |
|
|
|
|
on |
03/06/1955 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
18A |
Toton |
Diesel |
D3/3 |
0-6-0 |
13118 |
|
|
|
|
on |
10/06/1955 (New) |
18A |
on |
08/07/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
D3/3 |
0-6-0 |
13119 |
|
|
|
|
on |
16/06/1955 (New) |
18A |
on |
08/07/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
D3/3 |
0-6-0 |
13120 |
|
|
|
|
on |
08/07/1955 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
24/03/1956 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12071 |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
8w/e |
16/07/1955 |
18A |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
2E |
Northampton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48082 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
8w/e |
16/07/1955 |
18A |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48125 |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
8w/e |
16/07/1955 |
18A |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12070 |
w/e |
04/12/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
23/07/1955 |
18A |
w/e |
13/08/1955 |
18A |
Toton |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12045 |
w/e |
18/11/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
30/07/1955 |
18A |
w/e |
10/12/1955 |
2A |
Rugby |
Diesel |
D3/3 |
0-6-0 |
13121 |
|
|
|
|
on |
05/08/1955 (New) |
18A |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12056 |
w/e |
14/05/1955 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
13/08/1955 |
18A |
w/e |
10/09/1955 |
18A |
Toton |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12070 |
w/e |
23/07/1955 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
13/08/1955 |
18A |
w/e |
17/09/1955 |
18A |
Toton |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12072 |
8w/e |
16/07/1955 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
18A |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44150 |
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
21A |
Saltley |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
18A |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44427 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
21A |
Saltley |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
18A |
w/e |
05/03/1960 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12046 |
w/e |
23/10/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
20/08/1955 |
18A |
w/e |
10/12/1955 |
2A |
Rugby |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92050 |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
|
|
on |
20/08/1955 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
26/11/1955 |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12047 |
w/e |
31/07/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
27/08/1955 |
18A |
w/e |
10/12/1955 |
2A |
Rugby |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92051 |
|
|
|
|
on |
27/08/1955 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92052 |
|
|
|
|
on |
27/08/1955 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Diesel |
D3/3 |
0-6-0 |
13122 |
|
|
|
|
on |
03/09/1955 (New) |
18A |
on |
12/11/1966 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
D3/3 |
0-6-0 |
13123 |
|
|
|
|
on |
03/09/1955 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
Diesel |
D3/3 |
0-6-0 |
13124 |
|
|
|
|
on |
03/09/1955 (New) |
18A |
on |
12/11/1966 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12048 |
w/e |
02/10/1954 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
03/09/1955 |
18A |
w/e |
10/12/1955 |
2A |
Rugby |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12056 |
w/e |
13/08/1955 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
10/09/1955 |
18A |
w/e |
10/12/1955 |
2A |
Rugby |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12057 |
w/e |
09/04/1955 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
17/09/1955 |
18A |
w/e |
10/12/1955 |
2A |
Rugby |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12070 |
w/e |
13/08/1955 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
17/09/1955 |
18A |
w/e |
10/12/1955 |
2A |
Rugby |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92053 |
|
|
|
|
on |
17/09/1955 (New) |
18A |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
17B |
Burton |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92054 |
|
|
|
|
on |
24/09/1955 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92055 |
|
|
|
|
on |
24/09/1955 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12073 |
4w/e |
10/09/1955 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
18A |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92056 |
|
|
|
|
on |
31/10/1955 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92057 |
|
|
|
|
on |
31/10/1955 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
30/01/1960 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92058 |
|
|
|
|
on |
31/10/1955 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92059 |
|
|
|
|
on |
31/10/1955 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12072 |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
18A |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48313 |
4w/e |
27/02/1954 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
18A |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
15B |
Kettering |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12072 |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
18A |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12073 |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
18A |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92050 |
4w/e |
26/11/1955 |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
18A |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92051 |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
18A |
4w/e |
16/06/1957 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48186 |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
18A |
w/e |
02/05/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48273 |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
18A |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48314 |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
20B |
Stourton |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
18A |
w/e |
07/08/1965 |
16F |
Burton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48530 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
18A |
w/e |
12/05/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44082 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
18A |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44140 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
18A |
w/e |
12/12/1959 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44205 |
4w/e |
17/07/1954 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
18A |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44224 |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
18A |
w/e |
03/02/1962 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12073 |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
18A |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92045 |
on |
05/02/1955 |
15A |
Wellingborough (New) |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
18A |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
6F |
Bidston |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92046 |
on |
12/02/1955 |
15A |
Wellingborough (New) |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
18A |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
6F |
Bidston |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92048 |
on |
26/02/1955 |
15A |
Wellingborough (New) |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
18A |
4w/e |
16/06/1957 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92049 |
on |
12/03/1955 |
15A |
Wellingborough (New) |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
18A |
4w/e |
16/06/1957 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92064 |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
18A |
4w/e |
25/05/1956 |
54B |
Tyne Dock |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92065 |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
18A |
4w/e |
25/05/1956 |
54B |
Tyne Dock |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92066 |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
18A |
4w/e |
25/05/1956 |
54B |
Tyne Dock |
Steam |
79 |
4-4-2T |
41947 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
16D |
Mansfield |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
18A |
w/e |
03/12/1960 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12072 |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
4w/e |
24/03/1956 |
18A |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48037 |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
4w/e |
24/03/1956 |
18A |
4w/e |
21/04/1956 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48112 |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
4w/e |
24/03/1956 |
18A |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92077 |
|
|
|
|
on |
31/03/1956 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
17/08/1963 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92078 |
|
|
|
|
on |
31/03/1956 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
13/03/1965 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
58165 |
4w/e |
02/11/1935 |
18A |
Toton |
4w/e |
21/04/1956 |
18A |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
22B |
Gloucester Barnwood |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92079 |
|
|
|
|
on |
30/04/1956 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
21C |
Bromsgrove |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92080 |
|
|
|
|
on |
30/04/1956 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48142 |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
18A |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
15B |
Kettering |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48673 |
4w/e |
27/02/1954 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
18A |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
47223 |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
15D |
Bedford |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
18A |
w/e |
30/05/1959 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92081 |
|
|
|
|
on |
31/05/1956 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
13/12/1958 |
16D |
Annesley |
Diesel |
D3/3 |
0-6-0 |
13123 |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
18A |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48269 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
18A |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48338 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
18A |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48668 |
w/e |
11/03/1950 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
18A |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48692 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
18A |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
58153 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
18C |
Hasland |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
18A |
on |
11/08/1960 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
58176 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
18C |
Hasland |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
18A |
on |
14/07/1956 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
D3/3 |
0-6-0 |
13121 |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
18A |
on |
15/04/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43845 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
21A |
Saltley |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
18A |
on |
20/07/1963 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43865 |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
21A |
Saltley |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
18A |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
16G |
Westhouses |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43941 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
21A |
Saltley |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
18A |
on |
07/09/1957 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43946 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
21A |
Saltley |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
18A |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48178 |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
18A |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
58166 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
18A |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
15D |
Coalville |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92100 |
|
|
|
|
on |
31/08/1956 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92101 |
|
|
|
|
on |
31/08/1956 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92102 |
|
|
|
|
on |
31/08/1956 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92103 |
|
|
|
|
on |
31/08/1956 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92104 |
|
|
|
|
on |
31/08/1956 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12073 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
18A |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
1A |
Willesden |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48395 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
18A |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92109 |
|
|
|
|
on |
20/10/1956 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92110 |
|
|
|
|
on |
27/10/1956 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46440 |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
17A |
Derby |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
18A |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
17A |
Derby |
Diesel |
D3/3 |
0-6-0 |
13123 |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
18A |
on |
12/11/1966 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48219 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
18A |
w/e |
07/03/1959 |
17B |
Burton |
Diesel |
D3/3 |
0-6-0 |
13120 |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
18A |
on |
08/07/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
D3/3 |
0-6-0 |
13117 |
on |
03/06/1955 |
18A |
Toton (New) |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
18A |
on |
24/06/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48125 |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
18B |
Westhouses |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
18A |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
18C |
Hasland |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
13289 |
on |
10/12/1956 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe (New) |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
18A |
4w/e |
11/10/1958 |
41B |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
13292 |
on |
27/12/1956 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe (New) |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
18A |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
13293 |
on |
28/12/1956 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe (New) |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
18A |
4w/e |
11/10/1958 |
41B |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46440 |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
17A |
Derby |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
18A |
4w/e |
20/04/1957 |
17A |
Derby |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92128 |
|
|
|
|
on |
30/04/1957 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92050 |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
|
|
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
18A |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92129 |
on |
30/04/1957 |
21A |
Saltley (New) |
4w/e |
16/06/1957 |
18A |
w/e |
25/07/1959 |
15B |
Kettering |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92130 |
on |
30/04/1957 |
21A |
Saltley (New) |
4w/e |
16/06/1957 |
18A |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92131 |
on |
31/05/1957 |
21A |
Saltley (New) |
4w/e |
16/06/1957 |
18A |
w/e |
30/01/1960 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Diesel |
D3/3 |
0-6-0 |
13125 |
|
|
|
|
on |
21/06/1957 (New) |
18A |
on |
08/07/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12055 |
w/e |
13/11/1954 |
1A |
Willesden |
w/e |
22/06/1957 |
18A |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
Diesel |
D3/3 |
0-6-0 |
13126 |
|
|
|
|
on |
29/06/1957 (New) |
18A |
on |
12/11/1966 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48613 |
w/e |
12/08/1950 |
9G |
Northwich |
4w/e |
07/09/1957 |
18A |
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48363 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
18A |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
16B |
Annesley |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92153 |
|
|
|
|
on |
31/10/1957 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
12/10/1963 |
16G |
Westhouses |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92156 |
|
|
|
|
on |
30/11/1957 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
13/03/1965 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92157 |
|
|
|
|
on |
30/11/1957 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
07/02/1959 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92158 |
|
|
|
|
on |
30/11/1957 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
21/09/1963 |
16G |
Westhouses |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48033 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
18A |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48167 |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
18A |
w/e |
07/03/1959 |
17B |
Burton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48306 |
w/e |
07/02/1948 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
18A |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48338 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
21A |
Saltley |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
18A |
w/e |
12/11/1960 |
15B |
Kettering |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48507 |
4w/e |
26/03/1955 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
18A |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48517 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
18A |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48728 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
18A |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
17B |
Burton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48000 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
18A |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48382 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
18A |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48105 |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
20G |
Hellifield |
4w/e |
12/07/1958 |
18A |
w/e |
07/02/1959 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48616 |
w/e |
24/01/1948 |
20G |
Hellifield |
4w/e |
12/07/1958 |
18A |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44178 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
17C |
Rowsley |
4w/e |
12/07/1958 |
18A |
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
16G |
Westhouses |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3574 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/08/1958 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
11/10/1958 |
41B |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48099 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
18A |
w/e |
07/01/1961 |
16A |
Nottingham |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48545 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
18A |
w/e |
07/01/1961 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48604 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
18A |
w/e |
12/11/1960 |
15B |
Kettering |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48640 |
4w/e |
17/07/1954 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
18A |
w/e |
07/01/1961 |
16A |
Nottingham |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3575 |
|
|
|
|
on |
13/08/1958 (New) |
18A |
4w/e |
11/10/1958 |
41B |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43921 |
4w/e |
20/04/1957 |
17F |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
18A |
on |
03/06/1961 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48698 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
19G |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
18A |
w/e |
17/04/1965 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44091 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18A |
Toton |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
18A |
w/e |
06/12/1958 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48115 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18B |
Westhouses |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
18A |
w/e |
25/10/1958 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48118 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18B |
Westhouses |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
18A |
w/e |
07/03/1959 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48620 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18B |
Westhouses |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
18A |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44284 |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
18B |
Westhouses |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
18A |
w/e |
13/08/1960 |
9G |
Gorton |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3576 |
on |
20/08/1958 |
8A |
Edge Hill (New) |
w/e |
01/11/1958 |
18A |
w/e |
19/11/1960 |
21A |
Saltley |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3577 |
on |
28/08/1958 |
5B |
Crewe South (New) |
w/e |
01/11/1958 |
18A |
w/e |
19/11/1960 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92094 |
5w/e |
20/04/1957 |
38B |
Annesley |
w/e |
13/12/1958 |
18A |
w/e |
02/05/1959 |
16D |
Annesley |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43860 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18B |
Westhouses |
w/e |
07/03/1959 |
18A |
on |
26/09/1959 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48118 |
w/e |
07/03/1959 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
w/e |
21/03/1959 |
18A |
w/e |
07/04/1962 |
8E |
Northwich |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92081 |
w/e |
13/12/1958 |
16D |
Annesley |
w/e |
02/05/1959 |
18A |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
21A |
Saltley |
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5008 |
w/e |
25/04/1959 |
5B |
Crewe South |
w/e |
09/05/1959 |
18A |
w/e |
26/09/1959 |
17A |
Derby |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48033 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
18A |
w/e |
23/01/1960 |
15B |
Kettering |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48062 |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
18A |
w/e |
29/10/1960 |
2A |
Rugby |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48109 |
w/e |
14/02/1948 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
18A |
w/e |
09/12/1961 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48132 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
18A |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
15B |
Kettering |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48163 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
18A |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
15B |
Kettering |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48167 |
w/e |
07/03/1959 |
17B |
Burton |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
18A |
w/e |
12/01/1963 |
16D |
Annesley |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48219 |
w/e |
07/03/1959 |
17B |
Burton |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
18A |
w/e |
11/07/1959 |
16C |
Mansfield |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48401 |
5w/e |
03/01/1953 |
17B |
Burton |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
18A |
w/e |
07/01/1961 |
16A |
Nottingham |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48414 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
18A |
w/e |
17/04/1965 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48638 |
w/e |
20/12/1958 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
18A |
w/e |
07/01/1961 |
16A |
Nottingham |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48750 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
15B |
Kettering |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
18A |
w/e |
18/02/1961 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43235 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18B |
Westhouses |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
18A |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
9G |
Gorton |
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
12006 |
on |
27/05/1939 |
18A |
Toton (New) |
w/e |
18/07/1959 |
18A |
w/e |
15/08/1959 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12082 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
18/07/1959 |
18A |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3582 |
on |
16/10/1958 |
21A |
Saltley (New) |
w/e |
15/08/1959 |
18A |
w/e |
10/10/1959 |
21A |
Saltley |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3773 |
w/e |
29/08/1959 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
19/09/1959 |
18A |
w/e |
10/10/1959 |
17A |
Derby |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48060 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18B |
Westhouses |
w/e |
03/10/1959 |
18A |
w/e |
20/01/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48127 |
4w/e |
22/02/1958 |
18B |
Westhouses |
w/e |
03/10/1959 |
18A |
w/e |
09/12/1961 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48333 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18B |
Westhouses |
w/e |
03/10/1959 |
18A |
w/e |
03/02/1962 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44133 |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
18C |
Hasland |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
18A |
w/e |
09/11/1963 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44162 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18C |
Hasland |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
18A |
w/e |
14/12/1963 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48128 |
w/e |
11/07/1959 |
17C |
Rowsley |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
18A |
w/e |
05/05/1962 |
17B |
Burton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48770 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
17C |
Rowsley |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
18A |
w/e |
21/01/1961 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44295 |
w/e |
25/04/1959 |
17B |
Burton |
w/e |
28/11/1959 |
18A |
w/e |
01/02/1964 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92100 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
w/e |
12/12/1959 |
18A |
w/e |
30/01/1960 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48538 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
12/12/1959 |
18A |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43971 |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
14C |
St Albans |
w/e |
16/01/1960 |
18A |
on |
28/03/1964 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48650 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18B |
Westhouses |
w/e |
16/01/1960 |
18A |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
16A |
Nottingham |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48661 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18B |
Westhouses |
w/e |
16/01/1960 |
18A |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
16B |
Annesley |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44043 |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
14C |
St Albans |
w/e |
16/01/1960 |
18A |
w/e |
01/08/1964 |
15E |
Coalville |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44270 |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
w/e |
16/01/1960 |
18A |
w/e |
09/11/1963 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44409 |
w/e |
25/04/1959 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
w/e |
16/01/1960 |
18A |
w/e |
09/12/1961 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48057 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18B |
Westhouses |
w/e |
30/01/1960 |
18A |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48204 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
18B |
Westhouses |
w/e |
30/01/1960 |
18A |
w/e |
12/01/1963 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48353 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
18B |
Westhouses |
w/e |
30/01/1960 |
18A |
w/e |
02/07/1960 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92129 |
w/e |
25/07/1959 |
15B |
Kettering |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
18A |
w/e |
07/05/1960 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
58175 |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
16A |
Nottingham |
w/e |
05/03/1960 |
18A |
w/e |
16/12/1961 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48033 |
w/e |
23/01/1960 |
15B |
Kettering |
w/e |
19/03/1960 |
18A |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
47231 |
w/e |
04/04/1959 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
w/e |
16/04/1960 |
18A |
w/e |
17/08/1963 |
16A |
Nottingham |
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
40149 |
4w/e |
27/02/1954 |
21A |
Saltley |
w/e |
23/04/1960 |
18A |
on |
28/10/1961 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42383 |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
21A |
Saltley |
w/e |
23/04/1960 |
18A |
m/e |
10/1961 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
40439 |
w/e |
20/02/1960 |
21A |
Saltley |
w/e |
23/04/1960 |
18A |
w/e |
28/01/1961 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
40443 |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
21A |
Saltley |
w/e |
23/04/1960 |
18A |
w/e |
28/01/1961 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
40511 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
21A |
Saltley |
w/e |
23/04/1960 |
18A |
w/e |
28/01/1961 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44388 |
w/e |
26/03/1960 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
18A |
w/e |
29/12/1962 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92113 |
on |
30/11/1956 |
18B |
Westhouses (New) |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
18A |
w/e |
25/03/1961 |
6F |
Bidston |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92114 |
on |
30/11/1956 |
18B |
Westhouses (New) |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
18A |
w/e |
14/04/1962 |
17C |
Rowsley |
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0 |
58214 |
4w/e |
22/02/1958 |
15D |
Bedford |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
18A |
w/e |
24/06/1961 |
15D |
Coalville |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48650 |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
16A |
Nottingham |
w/e |
25/06/1960 |
18A |
w/e |
19/01/1963 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0 |
58228 |
|
|
|
|
w/e |
20/08/1960 |
18A |
w/e |
24/03/1962 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48184 |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
18B |
Westhouses |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
18A |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
16A |
Nottingham |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48197 |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
18B |
Westhouses |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
18A |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92014 |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
21A |
Saltley |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
18A |
w/e |
08/07/1961 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92070 |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
21A |
Saltley |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
18A |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92055 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
w/e |
24/09/1960 |
18A |
w/e |
25/03/1961 |
6F |
Bidston |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92056 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
w/e |
24/09/1960 |
18A |
w/e |
31/03/1962 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92058 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
w/e |
24/09/1960 |
18A |
w/e |
07/07/1962 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92059 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
w/e |
24/09/1960 |
18A |
w/e |
13/03/1965 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48545 |
w/e |
07/01/1961 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
21/01/1961 |
18A |
w/e |
24/11/1962 |
15B |
Kettering |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48045 |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
NTH |
Northwich |
w/e |
11/02/1961 |
18A |
w/e |
29/04/1961 |
8E |
Northwich |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48214 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
w/e |
11/02/1961 |
18A |
w/e |
24/06/1961 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48250 |
w/e |
14/05/1960 |
21B |
Bescot |
w/e |
11/02/1961 |
18A |
w/e |
25/03/1961 |
21B |
Bescot |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48360 |
4w/e |
20/04/1957 |
2E |
Northampton |
w/e |
11/02/1961 |
18A |
w/e |
29/04/1961 |
2E |
Northampton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48442 |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
w/e |
11/02/1961 |
18A |
w/e |
24/06/1961 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48479 |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
11/02/1961 |
18A |
w/e |
25/03/1961 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48523 |
w/e |
07/03/1959 |
21A |
Saltley |
w/e |
11/02/1961 |
18A |
w/e |
09/12/1961 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48613 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
w/e |
11/02/1961 |
18A |
w/e |
29/04/1961 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48647 |
w/e |
27/10/1951 |
21A |
Saltley |
w/e |
11/02/1961 |
18A |
w/e |
09/02/1963 |
16A |
Nottingham |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48695 |
w/e |
09/05/1959 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
w/e |
11/02/1961 |
18A |
w/e |
11/04/1961 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48302 |
w/e |
04/03/1961 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
w/e |
11/04/1961 |
18A |
w/e |
29/04/1961 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92055 |
w/e |
25/03/1961 |
6F |
Bidston |
w/e |
29/04/1961 |
18A |
w/e |
17/03/1962 |
17C |
Rowsley |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92113 |
w/e |
25/03/1961 |
6F |
Bidston |
w/e |
29/04/1961 |
18A |
w/e |
14/04/1962 |
17C |
Rowsley |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92052 |
w/e |
03/06/1961 |
21A |
Saltley |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
18A |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
16D |
Annesley |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48635 |
w/e |
11/04/1961 |
21A |
Saltley |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
18A |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48149 |
w/e |
26/03/1960 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
w/e |
08/07/1961 |
18A |
w/e |
22/02/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48007 |
w/e |
17/12/1960 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
18A |
w/e |
09/12/1961 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47367 |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
8E |
Brunswick |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
18A |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
58138 |
w/e |
20/02/1960 |
21A |
Saltley |
w/e |
18/11/1961 |
18A |
w/e |
13/01/1962 |
15D |
Coalville |
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
58143 |
w/e |
20/02/1960 |
21A |
Saltley |
w/e |
18/11/1961 |
18A |
w/e |
10/03/1962 |
15D |
Coalville |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44026 |
w/e |
01/07/1961 |
17B |
Burton |
w/e |
06/01/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
06/04/1963 |
18C |
Hasland |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92008 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
17C |
Rowsley |
w/e |
27/01/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
03/03/1962 |
17C |
Rowsley |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92019 |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
w/e |
27/01/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
10/03/1962 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92082 |
on |
31/05/1956 |
15A |
Wellingborough (New) |
w/e |
27/01/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
10/03/1962 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43928 |
4w/e |
17/07/1954 |
16A |
Nottingham |
w/e |
27/01/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
10/03/1962 |
16A |
Nottingham |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43969 |
w/e |
22/08/1959 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
w/e |
27/01/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
10/03/1962 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48143 |
w/e |
20/01/1962 |
15B |
Kettering |
w/e |
27/01/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
03/03/1962 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48432 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
w/e |
27/01/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
24/02/1962 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48645 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
15B |
Kettering |
w/e |
27/01/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
10/03/1962 |
15B |
Kettering |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44047 |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
27/01/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
10/03/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44261 |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
18C |
Hasland |
w/e |
27/01/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
10/03/1962 |
18C |
Hasland |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44551 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
17B |
Burton |
w/e |
27/01/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
10/03/1962 |
17B |
Burton |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12060 |
|
|
|
|
w/e |
03/02/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
21/11/1964 |
15E |
Coalville |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44213 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
21A |
Saltley |
w/e |
10/02/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
09/11/1963 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
Diesel |
Peak |
1Co-Co1 |
D1 |
w/e |
21/05/1960 |
9A |
Longsight |
w/e |
03/03/1962 |
18A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
Peak |
1Co-Co1 |
D2 |
w/e |
16/07/1960 |
1B |
Camden |
w/e |
03/03/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
16/06/1962 |
5A |
Crewe North |
Diesel |
Peak |
1Co-Co1 |
D3 |
w/e |
14/05/1960 |
5A |
Crewe North |
w/e |
03/03/1962 |
18A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
Peak |
1Co-Co1 |
D4 |
w/e |
02/04/1960 |
1B |
Camden |
w/e |
03/03/1962 |
18A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
Peak |
1Co-Co1 |
D5 |
w/e |
16/07/1960 |
1B |
Camden |
w/e |
03/03/1962 |
18A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
Peak |
1Co-Co1 |
D6 |
w/e |
21/05/1960 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
w/e |
03/03/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
14/04/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
Diesel |
Peak |
1Co-Co1 |
D7 |
w/e |
23/04/1960 |
1B |
Camden |
w/e |
03/03/1962 |
18A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
Peak |
1Co-Co1 |
D8 |
w/e |
03/03/1962 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
03/03/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
19/05/1962 |
18A |
Toton |
Diesel |
Peak |
1Co-Co1 |
D8 |
w/e |
10/02/1962 |
5A |
Crewe North |
w/e |
03/03/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
03/03/1962 |
18A |
Toton |
Diesel |
Peak |
1Co-Co1 |
D9 |
w/e |
21/05/1960 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
w/e |
03/03/1962 |
18A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
Peak |
1Co-Co1 |
D10 |
|
14/05/1960 |
5A |
Crewe North |
w/e |
03/03/1962 |
18A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
58128 |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
3B |
Bushbury |
w/e |
24/03/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
13/10/1962 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92052 |
w/e |
31/03/1962 |
17C |
Rowsley |
w/e |
14/04/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
13/07/1963 |
17C |
Rowsley |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92055 |
w/e |
17/03/1962 |
17C |
Rowsley |
w/e |
14/04/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
07/07/1962 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Diesel |
46 |
1Co-Co1 |
D140 |
on |
25/11/1961 |
17A |
Derby (New) |
w/e |
05/05/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
07/07/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
Diesel |
46 |
1Co-Co1 |
D145 |
w/e |
05/05/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
05/05/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
07/07/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
Diesel |
46 |
1Co-Co1 |
D149 |
w/e |
24/03/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
05/05/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
08/09/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
Diesel |
46 |
1Co-Co1 |
D152 |
on |
01/02/1962 |
17A |
Derby (New) |
w/e |
05/05/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
08/09/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
Diesel |
46 |
1Co-Co1 |
D158 |
on |
15/03/1962 |
17A |
Derby (New) |
w/e |
05/05/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
09/06/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
Diesel |
46 |
1Co-Co1 |
D143 |
on |
01/12/1961 |
17A |
Derby (New) |
w/e |
12/05/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
07/07/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
Diesel |
Peak |
1Co-Co1 |
D8 |
w/e |
03/03/1962 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
19/05/1962 |
18A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
Peak |
1Co-Co1 |
D6 |
w/e |
14/04/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
26/05/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
26/05/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48362 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
16A |
Nottingham |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
25/04/1964 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
Diesel |
Peak |
1Co-Co1 |
D6 |
w/e |
26/05/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
18A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
Peak |
1Co-Co1 |
D2 |
w/e |
16/06/1962 |
5A |
Crewe North |
w/e |
11/08/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
29/09/1962 |
5A |
Crewe North |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47442 |
w/e |
04/08/1962 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
25/08/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
26/01/1963 |
17C |
Rowsley |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47449 |
w/e |
04/08/1962 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
25/08/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
05/01/1963 |
99H |
Horwich Works |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47645 |
w/e |
04/08/1962 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
01/09/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
24/04/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48212 |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
18C |
Hasland |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
17/04/1965 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47283 |
w/e |
04/08/1962 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
13/04/1963 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92053 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
13/03/1965 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92055 |
w/e |
07/07/1962 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
13/03/1965 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48056 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
18C |
Hasland |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
07/08/1965 |
16F |
Burton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48082 |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
18C |
Hasland |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
11/01/1964 |
15C |
Kettering |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48095 |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
18C |
Hasland |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
06/04/1963 |
21A |
Saltley |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48284 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
18C |
Hasland |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
15B |
Kettering |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48494 |
w/e |
07/02/1959 |
18C |
Hasland |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
24/10/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Diesel |
Peak |
1Co-Co1 |
D2 |
w/e |
29/09/1962 |
5A |
Crewe North |
w/e |
13/10/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
1B |
Camden |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43861 |
w/e |
16/01/1960 |
15D |
Coalville |
w/e |
13/10/1962 |
18A |
on |
18/05/1963 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48306 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
10/11/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
04/07/1964 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44118 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
w/e |
08/12/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
17A |
Derby |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44235 |
w/e |
25/08/1962 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
w/e |
08/12/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
08/08/1964 |
16H |
Hasland |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44278 |
w/e |
16/01/1960 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
w/e |
08/12/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
22/08/1964 |
16G |
Westhouses |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44441 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
w/e |
08/12/1962 |
18A |
w/e |
09/11/1963 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44465 |
w/e |
04/03/1961 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
w/e |
08/12/1962 |
18A |
m/e |
07/1963 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44574 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
w/e |
08/12/1962 |
18A |
m/e |
10/1963 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43991 |
w/e |
22/12/1962 |
15D |
Coalville |
w/e |
12/01/1963 |
18A |
w/e |
08/08/1964 |
16G |
Westhouses |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44575 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
w/e |
26/01/1963 |
18A |
w/e |
08/08/1964 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43964 |
w/e |
25/08/1962 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
16/02/1963 |
18A |
w/e |
09/11/1963 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44210 |
w/e |
25/08/1962 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
16/02/1963 |
18A |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
15E |
Coalville |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44243 |
w/e |
25/08/1962 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
w/e |
16/02/1963 |
18A |
w/e |
10/08/1963 |
17C |
Rowsley |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44294 |
w/e |
25/08/1962 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
16/02/1963 |
18A |
w/e |
09/11/1963 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44381 |
w/e |
04/08/1962 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
16/02/1963 |
18A |
w/e |
06/04/1963 |
18C |
Hasland |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44531 |
w/e |
04/08/1962 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
16/02/1963 |
18A |
w/e |
25/04/1964 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44572 |
w/e |
25/08/1962 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
16/02/1963 |
18A |
w/e |
09/11/1963 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
47223 |
w/e |
04/08/1962 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
18A |
w/e |
18/01/1964 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5186 |
|
|
|
|
on |
19/03/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
08/02/1964 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5187 |
|
|
|
|
on |
22/03/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
04/01/1964 |
2E |
Saltley |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5188 |
|
|
|
|
on |
23/03/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
2E |
Saltley |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5189 |
|
|
|
|
on |
27/03/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
07/03/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5190 |
|
|
|
|
on |
04/04/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
07/03/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43947 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
15B |
Kettering |
w/e |
06/04/1963 |
18A |
w/e |
02/11/1963 |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44051 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
15B |
Kettering |
w/e |
06/04/1963 |
18A |
w/e |
09/11/1963 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5183 |
|
|
|
|
on |
08/04/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
04/01/1964 |
41D |
Canklow |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92057 |
w/e |
14/10/1961 |
16D |
Annesley |
w/e |
13/04/1963 |
18A |
w/e |
12/10/1963 |
2E |
Saltley |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44529 |
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
13/04/1963 |
18A |
w/e |
08/08/1964 |
15C |
Kettering |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92075 |
4w/e |
16/03/1957 |
38B |
Annesley |
w/e |
20/04/1963 |
18A |
w/e |
12/10/1963 |
16B |
Annesley |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5192 |
|
|
|
|
on |
29/04/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
08/02/1964 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5193 |
|
|
|
|
on |
29/04/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
07/03/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5184 |
|
|
|
|
on |
30/04/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
15/02/1964 |
41D |
Canklow |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5191 |
|
|
|
|
on |
30/04/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
08/02/1964 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5194 |
|
|
|
|
on |
30/04/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
08/02/1964 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5195 |
|
|
|
|
on |
30/04/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
22/02/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5197 |
|
|
|
|
on |
09/05/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
18/01/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5196 |
|
|
|
|
on |
10/05/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
07/03/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5198 |
|
|
|
|
on |
16/05/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
08/02/1964 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5199 |
|
|
|
|
on |
17/05/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
22/02/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47442 |
w/e |
26/01/1963 |
17C |
Rowsley |
w/e |
18/05/1963 |
18A |
w/e |
27/07/1963 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5201 |
|
|
|
|
on |
20/05/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5185 |
|
|
|
|
on |
22/05/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
04/01/1964 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92088 |
4w/e |
16/03/1957 |
38B |
Annesley |
w/e |
25/05/1963 |
18A |
w/e |
17/08/1963 |
16D |
Annesley |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5202 |
|
|
|
|
on |
28/05/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
04/01/1964 |
9A |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5203 |
|
|
|
|
on |
29/05/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5200 |
|
|
|
|
on |
31/05/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
07/03/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43969 |
w/e |
10/03/1962 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
w/e |
01/06/1963 |
18A |
on |
14/09/1963 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43977 |
w/e |
22/07/1961 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
w/e |
01/06/1963 |
18A |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44541 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
17B |
Burton |
w/e |
01/06/1963 |
18A |
w/e |
09/11/1963 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5204 |
|
|
|
|
on |
07/06/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5205 |
|
|
|
|
on |
14/06/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D77 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
15/06/1963 |
18A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5206 |
|
|
|
|
on |
19/06/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5207 |
|
|
|
|
on |
21/06/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5208 |
|
|
|
|
on |
21/06/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5209 |
|
|
|
|
on |
21/06/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5210 |
|
|
|
|
on |
21/06/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5211 |
|
|
|
|
on |
24/06/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5212 |
|
|
|
|
on |
28/06/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D57 |
on |
29/06/1963 |
17A |
Derby (New) |
w/e |
29/06/1963 |
18A |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5223 |
|
|
|
|
on |
04/07/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5213 |
|
|
|
|
on |
05/07/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
24/08/1963 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5214 |
|
|
|
|
on |
05/07/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
24/08/1963 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48125 |
w/e |
10/11/1962 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
18A |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5216 |
|
|
|
|
on |
11/07/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
24/08/1963 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D103 |
on |
30/05/1961 |
17A |
Derby (New) |
w/e |
13/07/1963 |
18A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48145 |
w/e |
15/12/1962 |
17C |
Rowsley |
w/e |
13/07/1963 |
18A |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
16G |
Westhouses |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5215 |
|
|
|
|
on |
15/07/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
24/08/1963 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5224 |
|
|
|
|
on |
19/07/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
22/02/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92052 |
w/e |
13/07/1963 |
17C |
Rowsley |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
18A |
w/e |
17/08/1963 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5225 |
|
|
|
|
on |
26/07/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
18/01/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5217 |
|
|
|
|
on |
02/08/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
24/08/1963 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5219 |
|
|
|
|
on |
09/08/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44038 |
w/e |
13/10/1962 |
21A |
Saltley |
w/e |
10/08/1963 |
18A |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5226 |
|
|
|
|
on |
23/08/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
07/03/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5203 |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
31/08/1963 |
18A |
w/e |
07/03/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5205 |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
31/08/1963 |
18A |
w/e |
07/03/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5207 |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
31/08/1963 |
18A |
w/e |
07/03/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5210 |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
31/08/1963 |
18A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5227 |
|
|
|
|
on |
02/09/1963 (New) |
18A |
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5228 |
|
|
|
|
on |
13/09/1963 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48170 |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
16A |
Nottingham |
w/e |
14/09/1963 |
16A |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48193 |
w/e |
19/12/1959 |
16A |
Nottingham |
w/e |
14/09/1963 |
16A |
w/e |
25/12/1965 |
40E |
Colwick |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48279 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
16A |
Nottingham |
w/e |
14/09/1963 |
16A |
w/e |
17/04/1965 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7568 |
|
|
|
|
on |
27/09/1963 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
29/02/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7570 |
|
|
|
|
on |
04/10/1963 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
2E |
Saltley |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48167 |
w/e |
26/01/1963 |
21A |
Saltley |
w/e |
12/10/1963 |
16A |
w/e |
25/12/1965 |
40E |
Colwick |
Diesel |
46 |
1Co-Co1 |
D144 |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
02/11/1963 |
16A |
w/e |
30/11/1963 |
41D |
Canklow |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5232 |
|
|
|
|
on |
06/11/1963 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
2E |
Saltley |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7576 |
|
|
|
|
on |
09/11/1963 (New) |
16A |
on |
01/12/1963 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7577 |
|
|
|
|
on |
09/11/1963 (New) |
16A |
on |
01/12/1963 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7575 |
|
|
|
|
on |
30/11/1963 (New) |
16A |
on |
01/12/1963 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7578 |
|
|
|
|
on |
30/11/1963 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
04/01/1964 |
50A |
York (North) |
Diesel |
30 |
A1A-A1A |
D5584 |
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
41f |
Wath |
w/e |
07/12/1963 |
16A |
w/e |
14/12/1963 |
41C |
Wath |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5234 |
|
|
|
|
on |
11/12/1963 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
28/12/1963 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7579 |
|
|
|
|
on |
13/12/1963 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
04/01/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5231 |
|
|
|
|
on |
14/12/1963 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
07/03/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7580 |
|
|
|
|
on |
14/12/1963 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
22/02/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5233 |
|
|
|
|
on |
19/12/1963 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
11/01/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5235 |
|
|
|
|
on |
19/12/1963 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
22/02/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5236 |
|
|
|
|
on |
19/12/1963 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
11/01/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5237 |
|
|
|
|
on |
19/12/1963 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
26/12/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5238 |
|
|
|
|
on |
19/12/1963 (New) |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5239 |
|
|
|
|
on |
20/12/1963 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
09/05/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90218 |
w/e |
18/03/1950 |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
w/e |
21/12/1963 |
16A |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
1G |
Woodford Halse |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90346 |
4w/e |
17/11/1956 |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
w/e |
21/12/1963 |
16A |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
1G |
Woodford Halse |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90237 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
2F |
Market Harborough |
w/e |
21/12/1963 |
16A |
w/e |
25/01/1964 |
1G |
Woodford Halse |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90433 |
4w/e |
18/02/1956 |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
w/e |
21/12/1963 |
16A |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
1G |
Woodford Halse |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90365 |
w/e |
23/07/1949 |
WFD |
Woodford Halse |
w/e |
21/12/1963 |
16A |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
1G |
Woodford Halse |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90697 |
4w/e |
20/10/1951 |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
w/e |
21/12/1963 |
16A |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
1G |
Woodford Halse |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90516 |
|
|
|
|
w/e |
21/12/1963 |
16A |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
1G |
Woodford Halse |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90520 |
|
|
|
|
w/e |
21/12/1963 |
16A |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
1G |
Woodford Halse |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7581 |
|
|
|
|
on |
27/12/1963 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
18/01/1964 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5242 |
|
|
|
|
on |
30/12/1963 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5240 |
|
|
|
|
on |
31/12/1963 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5241 |
|
|
|
|
on |
31/12/1963 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7582 |
|
|
|
|
on |
07/01/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
2E |
Saltley |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5243 |
|
|
|
|
on |
08/01/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
16A |
Toton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5244 |
|
|
|
|
on |
20/01/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
16A |
Toton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5245 |
|
|
|
|
on |
21/01/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
19/12/1964 |
16A |
Toton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7583 |
|
|
|
|
on |
21/01/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
22/08/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5246 |
|
|
|
|
on |
24/01/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
22/08/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5247 |
|
|
|
|
on |
31/01/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
16A |
Toton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7584 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/02/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
22/02/1964 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5248 |
|
|
|
|
on |
06/02/1964 (New) |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5249 |
|
|
|
|
on |
07/02/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
21/11/1964 |
15E |
Coalville |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44286 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
w/e |
08/02/1964 |
16A |
w/e |
02/05/1964 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7585 |
|
|
|
|
on |
13/02/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
22/02/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5250 |
|
|
|
|
on |
14/02/1964 (New) |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D46 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
15/02/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D75 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
15/02/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D81 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
15/02/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D92 |
w/e |
03/03/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
15/02/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D102 |
on |
18/05/1961 |
17A |
Derby (New) |
w/e |
15/02/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D104 |
on |
01/06/1961 |
17A |
Derby (New) |
w/e |
15/02/1964 |
16A |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D106 |
w/e |
09/06/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
15/02/1964 |
16A |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D117 |
on |
09/09/1961 |
17A |
Derby (New) |
w/e |
15/02/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D126 |
on |
09/11/1961 |
17A |
Derby (New) |
w/e |
15/02/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D132 |
on |
16/12/1961 |
17A |
Derby (New) |
w/e |
15/02/1964 |
16A |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5183 |
w/e |
04/01/1964 |
41D |
Canklow |
w/e |
15/02/1964 |
16A |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
2E |
Saltley |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92113 |
w/e |
08/02/1964 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
w/e |
15/02/1964 |
16A |
w/e |
24/10/1964 |
16B |
Annesley |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5251 |
|
|
|
|
on |
19/02/1964 (New) |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5252 |
|
|
|
|
on |
21/02/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
09/05/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7586 |
|
|
|
|
on |
25/02/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
29/02/1964 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5253 |
|
|
|
|
on |
26/02/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
09/05/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5254 |
|
|
|
|
on |
28/02/1964 (New) |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5255 |
|
|
|
|
on |
06/03/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
14/03/1964 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D100 |
on |
08/05/1961 |
17A |
Derby (New) |
w/e |
07/03/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D105 |
w/e |
03/02/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
07/03/1964 |
16A |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D109 |
on |
30/06/1961 |
17A |
Derby (New) |
w/e |
07/03/1964 |
16A |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43951 |
w/e |
12/01/1963 |
16A |
Nottingham |
w/e |
07/03/1964 |
16A |
w/e |
08/08/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44051 |
w/e |
09/11/1963 |
16D |
Nottingham |
w/e |
07/03/1964 |
16A |
w/e |
01/08/1964 |
15E |
Coalville |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7587 |
|
|
|
|
on |
09/03/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
2E |
Saltley |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7588 |
|
|
|
|
on |
10/03/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
09/05/1964 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5256 |
|
|
|
|
on |
13/03/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
22/08/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90299 |
4w/e |
22/01/1955 |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
w/e |
14/03/1964 |
16A |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
1G |
Woodford Halse |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90448 |
5w/e |
23/06/1951 |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
w/e |
14/03/1964 |
16A |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
1G |
Woodford Halse |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5257 |
|
|
|
|
on |
17/03/1964 (New) |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5258 |
|
|
|
|
on |
20/03/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5259 |
|
|
|
|
on |
25/03/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
22/08/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5260 |
|
|
|
|
on |
26/03/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
09/05/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5261 |
|
|
|
|
on |
02/04/1964 (New) |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5262 |
|
|
|
|
on |
10/04/1964 (New) |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5255 |
w/e |
14/03/1964 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7589 |
|
|
|
|
on |
13/04/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
09/05/1964 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5263 |
|
|
|
|
on |
14/04/1964 (New) |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7590 |
|
|
|
|
on |
15/04/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
09/05/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5264 |
|
|
|
|
on |
17/04/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
09/05/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5265 |
|
|
|
|
on |
22/04/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
09/05/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7591 |
|
|
|
|
on |
25/04/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
09/05/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44215 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
16A |
Nottingham |
w/e |
25/04/1964 |
16A |
w/e |
08/08/1964 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5266 |
|
|
|
|
on |
29/04/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
09/05/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5267 |
|
|
|
|
on |
29/04/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
09/05/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92048 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
17C |
Rowsley |
w/e |
02/05/1964 |
16A |
w/e |
13/03/1965 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92049 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
17C |
Rowsley |
w/e |
02/05/1964 |
16A |
w/e |
13/03/1965 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5269 |
|
|
|
|
on |
06/05/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
06/06/1964 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5268 |
|
|
|
|
on |
08/05/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
05/09/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7592 |
|
|
|
|
on |
13/05/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
06/06/1964 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5270 |
|
|
|
|
on |
14/05/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
06/06/1964 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5271 |
|
|
|
|
on |
15/05/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
01/08/1964 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5272 |
|
|
|
|
on |
22/05/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
06/06/1964 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5273 |
|
|
|
|
on |
22/05/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
06/06/1964 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5185 |
w/e |
04/01/1964 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
16A |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5274 |
|
|
|
|
on |
29/05/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
27/06/1964 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D62 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
30/05/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D68 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
30/05/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D84 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
30/05/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D110 |
on |
25/07/1961 |
17A |
Derby (New) |
w/e |
30/05/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D137 |
on |
30/12/1961 |
17A |
Derby (New) |
w/e |
30/05/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43928 |
w/e |
10/03/1962 |
16A |
Nottingham |
w/e |
30/05/1964 |
16A |
on |
19/09/1964 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48116 |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
18C |
Hasland |
w/e |
30/05/1964 |
16A |
w/e |
17/04/1965 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48359 |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
18C |
Hasland |
w/e |
30/05/1964 |
16A |
w/e |
27/06/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5275 |
|
|
|
|
on |
03/06/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
13/06/1964 |
16A |
Toton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7594 |
|
|
|
|
on |
03/06/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
04/07/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5276 |
|
|
|
|
on |
05/06/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
27/06/1964 |
16A |
Toton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5184 |
w/e |
15/02/1964 |
41D |
Canklow |
w/e |
06/06/1964 |
16A |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5277 |
|
|
|
|
on |
11/06/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
04/07/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5278 |
|
|
|
|
on |
12/06/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
04/07/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5275 |
on |
03/06/1964 |
16A |
Toton (New) |
w/e |
13/06/1964 |
16A |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5279 |
|
|
|
|
on |
18/06/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
01/08/1964 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5280 |
|
|
|
|
on |
20/06/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
01/08/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7595 |
|
|
|
|
on |
20/06/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
11/07/1964 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5281 |
|
|
|
|
on |
26/06/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
01/08/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
Peak |
1Co-Co1 |
D2 |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
1B |
Camden |
w/e |
27/06/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5276 |
on |
05/06/1964 |
16A |
Toton (New) |
w/e |
27/06/1964 |
16A |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7593 |
w/e |
06/06/1964 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
on |
27/06/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
04/07/1964 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5283 |
|
|
|
|
on |
02/07/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7596 |
|
|
|
|
on |
07/07/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5284 |
|
|
|
|
on |
09/07/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5285 |
|
|
|
|
on |
09/07/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5282 |
|
|
|
|
on |
10/07/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
22/08/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D101 |
w/e |
21/03/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
w/e |
25/07/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D108 |
w/e |
03/02/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
25/07/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5286 |
|
|
|
|
on |
29/07/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5287 |
|
|
|
|
on |
29/07/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
05/09/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5288 |
|
|
|
|
on |
30/07/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
22/08/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7581 |
w/e |
18/01/1964 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
w/e |
01/08/1964 |
16A |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7597 |
|
|
|
|
on |
12/08/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
22/08/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5289 |
|
|
|
|
on |
13/08/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
29/08/1964 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5290 |
|
|
|
|
on |
17/08/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5267 |
w/e |
09/05/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
w/e |
22/08/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5291 |
|
|
|
|
on |
24/08/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5292 |
|
|
|
|
on |
26/08/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
D1616 |
|
|
|
|
on |
29/08/1964 (New) |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5293 |
|
|
|
|
on |
02/09/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
D1617 |
|
|
|
|
on |
04/09/1964 (New) |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
D1618 |
|
|
|
|
on |
05/09/1964 (New) |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5202 |
w/e |
01/08/1964 |
9A |
Longsight |
w/e |
05/09/1964 |
16A |
w/e |
26/12/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5294 |
|
|
|
|
on |
07/09/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5295 |
|
|
|
|
on |
10/09/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
46 |
1Co-Co1 |
D148 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
12/09/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
46 |
1Co-Co1 |
D149 |
w/e |
08/09/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
12/09/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
46 |
1Co-Co1 |
D150 |
on |
30/12/1961 |
17A |
Derby (New) |
w/e |
12/09/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
46 |
1Co-Co1 |
D151 |
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
12/09/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
46 |
1Co-Co1 |
D153 |
w/e |
16/06/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
12/09/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
46 |
1Co-Co1 |
D154 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
12/09/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
46 |
1Co-Co1 |
D155 |
w/e |
15/06/1963 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
12/09/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
D1619 |
|
|
|
|
on |
12/09/1964 (New) |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
D1620 |
|
|
|
|
on |
17/09/1964 (New) |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5296 |
|
|
|
|
on |
18/09/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5297 |
|
|
|
|
on |
18/09/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
D1621 |
|
|
|
|
on |
19/09/1964 (New) |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5271 |
w/e |
01/08/1964 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5283 |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
16A |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5284 |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
16A |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5285 |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
16A |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
D1622 |
|
|
|
|
on |
26/09/1964 (New) |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5240 |
w/e |
04/07/1964 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
16A |
w/e |
19/12/1964 |
16A |
Toton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5241 |
w/e |
04/07/1964 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
16A |
w/e |
19/12/1964 |
16A |
Toton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5269 |
w/e |
06/06/1964 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5270 |
w/e |
06/06/1964 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5272 |
w/e |
06/06/1964 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5298 |
|
|
|
|
on |
28/09/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
24/10/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
D1623 |
|
|
|
|
on |
02/10/1964 (New) |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7500 |
|
|
|
|
on |
02/10/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
16F |
Burton |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
D1625 |
|
|
|
|
on |
03/10/1964 (New) |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5187 |
w/e |
04/01/1964 |
2E |
Saltley |
w/e |
03/10/1964 |
16A |
w/e |
10/10/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
D1624 |
|
|
|
|
on |
04/10/1964 (New) |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7501 |
|
|
|
|
on |
06/10/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
16F |
Burton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7502 |
|
|
|
|
on |
08/10/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
16F |
Burton |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
D1626 |
|
|
|
|
on |
10/10/1964 (New) |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
D1627 |
|
|
|
|
on |
10/10/1964 (New) |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7503 |
|
|
|
|
on |
14/10/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
16F |
Burton |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
D1628 |
|
|
|
|
on |
17/10/1964 (New) |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
D1629 |
|
|
|
|
on |
17/10/1964 (New) |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7504 |
|
|
|
|
on |
17/10/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
16F |
Burton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7505 |
|
|
|
|
on |
22/10/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
16F |
Burton |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
D1630 |
|
|
|
|
on |
23/10/1964 (New) |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3792 |
on |
31/10/1959 |
18C |
Hasland (New) |
w/e |
24/10/1964 |
16A |
w/e |
21/11/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7506 |
|
|
|
|
on |
27/10/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7507 |
|
|
|
|
on |
29/10/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
02/03/1968 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7578 |
w/e |
13/06/1964 |
50A |
York (North) |
w/e |
31/10/1964 |
16A |
w/e |
14/11/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7508 |
|
|
|
|
on |
05/11/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
30/01/1965 |
2E |
Saltley |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7509 |
|
|
|
|
on |
05/11/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
27/04/1968 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7510 |
|
|
|
|
on |
10/11/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
27/04/1968 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7511 |
|
|
|
|
on |
17/11/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
21/11/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7512 |
|
|
|
|
on |
20/11/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
09/10/1965 |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D13 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
21/11/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7513 |
|
|
|
|
on |
25/11/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
19/08/1967 |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7514 |
|
|
|
|
on |
25/11/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
09/10/1965 |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7515 |
|
|
|
|
on |
02/12/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7516 |
|
|
|
|
on |
04/12/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5243 |
on |
08/01/1964 |
16A |
Toton (New) |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5244 |
on |
20/01/1964 |
16A |
Toton (New) |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7517 |
|
|
|
|
on |
09/12/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
Diesel |
46 |
1Co-Co1 |
D152 |
w/e |
08/09/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
46 |
1Co-Co1 |
D156 |
on |
23/02/1962 |
17A |
Derby (New) |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
46 |
1Co-Co1 |
D158 |
w/e |
09/06/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
46 |
1Co-Co1 |
D163 |
w/e |
10/10/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
46 |
1Co-Co1 |
D165 |
w/e |
10/10/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5247 |
on |
31/01/1964 |
16A |
Toton (New) |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7518 |
|
|
|
|
on |
12/12/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
30/01/1965 |
2E |
Saltley |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5240 |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
16A |
Toton |
w/e |
19/12/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5241 |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
16A |
Toton |
w/e |
19/12/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5245 |
on |
21/01/1964 |
16A |
Toton (New) |
w/e |
19/12/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7520 |
|
|
|
|
on |
22/12/1964 (New) |
16A |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
2E |
Saltley |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5239 |
w/e |
09/05/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
w/e |
26/12/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5264 |
w/e |
09/05/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
w/e |
26/12/1964 |
16A |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
78042 |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
w/e |
03/04/1965 |
16A |
w/e |
18/09/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
78044 |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
w/e |
03/04/1965 |
16A |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
9K |
Bolton |
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
78055 |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
w/e |
03/04/1965 |
16A |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
9K |
Bolton |
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
78062 |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
w/e |
03/04/1965 |
16A |
w/e |
24/04/1965 |
9G |
Gorton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48116 |
w/e |
17/04/1965 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
w/e |
08/05/1965 |
16A |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
92088 |
w/e |
17/08/1963 |
16D |
Annesley |
w/e |
03/07/1965 |
16A |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48037 |
w/e |
25/05/1963 |
16D |
Annesley |
w/e |
03/07/1965 |
16A |
w/e |
25/12/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48079 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
16D |
Annesley |
w/e |
03/07/1965 |
16A |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48141 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
16D |
Annesley |
w/e |
03/07/1965 |
16A |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48142 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
16D |
Annesley |
w/e |
28/08/1965 |
16A |
w/e |
25/12/1965 |
40E |
Colwick |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44984 |
w/e |
11/07/1964 |
16B |
Annesley |
w/e |
25/12/1965 |
16A |
w/e |
25/12/1965 |
40E |
Colwick |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12051 |
w/e |
22/06/1957 |
16A |
Nottingham |
w/e |
19/02/1966 |
16A |
w/e |
19/03/1966 |
16G |
Westhouses |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12052 |
w/e |
22/06/1957 |
16A |
Nottingham |
w/e |
19/02/1966 |
16A |
w/e |
19/03/1966 |
16G |
Westhouses |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12063 |
w/e |
24/10/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
w/e |
19/02/1966 |
16A |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
78013 |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
w/e |
16/07/1966 |
16A |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
9K |
Bolton |
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
78021 |
w/e |
06/02/1965 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
w/e |
16/07/1966 |
16A |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
78028 |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
w/e |
16/07/1966 |
16A |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
9K |
Bolton |
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
78061 |
w/e |
03/10/1964 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
w/e |
16/07/1966 |
16A |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3476 |
w/e |
02/04/1966 |
41J |
Shirebrook |
w/e |
03/09/1966 |
16A |
w/e |
11/11/1967 |
16B |
Colwick |
Diesel |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3493 |
w/e |
04/02/1961 |
31B |
March |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
16A |
on |
22/06/1968 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3495 |
4w/e |
11/10/1958 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
16A |
on |
22/06/1968 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3497 |
on |
14/12/1957 |
30A |
Stratford (New) |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
16A |
w/e |
11/11/1967 |
16B |
Colwick |
Diesel |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3498 |
on |
21/12/1957 |
30A |
Stratford (New) |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
16A |
on |
01/06/1968 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3499 |
on |
28/12/1957 |
30A |
Stratford (New) |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
16A |
on |
20/01/1968 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3500 |
4w/e |
19/07/1958 |
30A |
Stratford |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
16A |
on |
20/01/1968 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3501 |
4w/e |
19/07/1958 |
30A |
Stratford |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
16A |
on |
29/06/1968 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3502 |
4w/e |
11/10/1958 |
30A |
Stratford |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
16A |
on |
03/02/1968 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3632 |
on |
28/10/1958 |
30A |
Stratford (New) |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
16A |
on |
27/07/1968 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
78020 |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
16A |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
78064 |
w/e |
08/02/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
16A |
m/e |
12/1966 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2116 |
6w/e |
13/04/1964 |
87E |
Landore |
w/e |
15/10/1966 |
16A |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
Diesel |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3446 |
on |
25/10/1957 |
35A |
New England (New) |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
16A |
on |
01/06/1968 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3447 |
on |
31/10/1957 |
35A |
New England (New) |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
16A |
on |
23/03/1968 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3448 |
on |
06/11/1957 |
35A |
New England (New) |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
16A |
on |
08/06/1968 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3449 |
on |
08/11/1957 |
35A |
New England (New) |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
16A |
on |
30/12/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3450 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
34E |
New England |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
16A |
on |
29/06/1968 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3452 |
w/e |
09/10/1965 |
41A |
Tinsley |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
16A |
on |
22/06/1968 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3473 |
w/e |
28/11/1959 |
36A |
Doncaster |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
16A |
on |
27/07/1968 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3475 |
w/e |
09/10/1965 |
41A |
Tinsley |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
16A |
on |
13/07/1968 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3482 |
on |
28/02/1958 |
36A |
Doncaster (New) |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
16A |
on |
22/06/1968 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3400 |
w/e |
29/11/1964 |
86A |
Cardiff Canton |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
16A |
on |
02/12/1984 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3402 |
w/e |
29/11/1964 |
86A |
Cardiff Canton |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
16A |
on |
16/09/1984 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3577 |
w/e |
19/11/1960 |
21A |
Saltley |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
16A |
w/e |
29/03/1969 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3050 |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
1A |
Willesden |
w/e |
16/12/1967 |
16A |
w/e |
28/02/1970 |
16F |
Burton |
Diesel |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3442 |
w/e |
11/01/1964 |
40E |
Colwick |
w/e |
16/12/1967 |
16A |
on |
29/09/1968 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3476 |
w/e |
11/11/1967 |
16B |
Colwick |
w/e |
16/12/1967 |
16A |
on |
01/06/1968 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3489 |
w/e |
11/01/1964 |
40E |
Colwick |
w/e |
16/12/1967 |
16A |
on |
06/04/1968 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3996 |
w/e |
22/04/1967 |
2F |
Bescot |
w/e |
16/12/1967 |
16A |
w/e |
26/06/1976 |
ED |
Eastfield |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3997 |
w/e |
22/04/1967 |
2F |
Bescot |
w/e |
16/12/1967 |
16A |
on |
16/06/1993 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3362 |
6w/e |
13/04/1964 |
87B |
Margam |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
16A |
9w/e |
18/03/1968 |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3363 |
5w/e |
27/03/1966 |
87E |
Landore |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
16A |
9w/e |
18/03/1968 |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3511 |
2w/e |
07/03/1965 |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
w/e |
03/02/1968 |
16A |
9w/e |
18/03/1968 |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3390 |
4w/e |
24/02/1968 |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
w/e |
23/03/1968 |
16A |
on |
19/12/1982 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3345 |
5w/e |
30/03/1968 |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
w/e |
06/04/1968 |
16A |
on |
22/02/1983 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3340 |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
16C |
Derby |
w/e |
13/04/1968 |
16A |
on |
19/12/1982 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3039 |
w/e |
28/10/1967 |
16C |
Derby |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
16A |
on |
02/11/1980 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3490 |
w/e |
11/01/1964 |
40E |
Colwick |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
16A |
on |
22/06/1968 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3025 |
w/e |
22/04/1967 |
2F |
Bescot |
w/e |
01/06/1968 |
16A |
w/e |
14/02/1970 |
16F |
Burton |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3026 |
w/e |
06/11/1965 |
2A |
Tyseley |
w/e |
01/06/1968 |
16A |
w/e |
08/07/1972 |
41A |
Tinsley |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3034 |
w/e |
22/04/1967 |
2F |
Bescot |
w/e |
01/06/1968 |
16A |
w/e |
16/10/1971 |
36A |
Doncaster |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3021 |
w/e |
22/04/1967 |
2F |
Bescot |
w/e |
08/06/1968 |
16A |
m/e |
12/1977 |
BU |
Burton |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3186 |
w/e |
15/06/1968 |
16C |
Derby |
w/e |
22/06/1968 |
16A |
7w/e |
27/07/1968 |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3404 |
w/e |
15/06/1968 |
16C |
Derby |
w/e |
22/06/1968 |
16A |
7w/e |
27/07/1968 |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3505 |
w/e |
15/06/1968 |
16C |
Derby |
w/e |
22/06/1968 |
16A |
7w/e |
27/07/1968 |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3514 |
w/e |
15/06/1968 |
16C |
Derby |
w/e |
22/06/1968 |
16A |
7w/e |
27/07/1968 |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3852 |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
1E |
Bletchley |
w/e |
22/06/1968 |
16A |
on |
04/10/1987 |
NC |
Norwich Thorpe |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3029 |
w/e |
22/04/1967 |
2F |
Bescot |
w/e |
13/07/1968 |
16A |
on |
07/12/1986 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3036 |
w/e |
22/04/1967 |
2F |
Bescot |
w/e |
27/07/1968 |
16A |
w/e |
21/07/1973 |
MC |
March |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3037 |
w/e |
22/04/1967 |
2F |
Bescot |
w/e |
27/07/1968 |
16A |
w/e |
15/07/1972 |
41A |
Tinsley |
Diesel |
09 |
0-6-0 |
D4106 |
w/e |
20/07/1968 |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
w/e |
10/08/1968 |
16A |
2w/e |
23/09/1968 |
75C |
Selhurst |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3044 |
3w/e |
29/07/1968 |
75C |
Selhurst |
w/e |
12/10/1968 |
16A |
on |
25/08/1974 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3056 |
w/e |
04/11/1967 |
16C |
Derby |
w/e |
29/03/1969 |
16A |
w/e |
13/07/1974 |
BU |
Burton |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3058 |
w/e |
16/04/1966 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
w/e |
29/03/1969 |
16A |
on |
04/07/1982 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3059 |
w/e |
11/11/1967 |
16C |
Derby |
w/e |
29/03/1969 |
16A |
w/e |
28/02/1970 |
16F |
Burton |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3777 |
w/e |
13/11/1965 |
16F |
Burton |
w/e |
17/05/1969 |
16A |
on |
26/06/1998 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3249 |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
16F |
Burton |
w/e |
28/02/1970 |
16A |
on |
04/07/1982 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3696 |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
16F |
Burton |
w/e |
28/02/1970 |
16A |
w/e |
08/05/1971 |
9A |
Longsight |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3789 |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
16F |
Burton |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
16A |
2w/e |
25/01/1975 |
DY |
Derby |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3788 |
on |
10/10/1959 |
15C |
Leicester Midland (New) |
w/e |
15/07/1972 |
16A |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
ED |
Eastfield |
Diesel |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
D5593 |
w/e |
06/08/1966 |
34G |
Finsbury Park |
w/e |
21/04/1973 |
16A |
w/e |
19/05/1973 |
FP |
Finsbury Park |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7595 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
TO |
on |
25/06/1985 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D11 |
w/e |
09/09/1972 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
w/e |
26/05/1973 |
TO |
on |
27/04/1987 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D35 |
w/e |
07/10/1972 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
w/e |
26/05/1973 |
TO |
on |
12/05/1986 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
D1849 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
w/e |
02/06/1973 |
TO |
w/e |
28/02/1976 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
D1850 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
w/e |
02/06/1973 |
TO |
m/e |
10/1976 |
BS |
Bescot |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
D1851 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
w/e |
02/06/1973 |
TO |
4w/e |
08/11/1975 |
BS |
Bescot |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
D1852 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
w/e |
02/06/1973 |
TO |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
BS |
Bescot |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3909 |
2w/e |
02/09/1972 |
9A |
Longsight |
w/e |
30/06/1973 |
TO |
on |
16/04/1991 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45002 |
w/e |
09/09/1972 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
TO |
4w/e |
06/10/1973 |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D36 |
w/e |
09/09/1972 |
D01 |
London Division |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
TO |
w/e |
12/01/1974 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
D1811 |
w/e |
08/05/1971 |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
D1812 |
w/e |
08/05/1971 |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
TO |
on |
15/05/1988 |
IM |
Immingham |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
D1813 |
w/e |
10/10/1970 |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
TO |
w/e |
12/01/1974 |
BS |
Bescot |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45101 |
2w/e |
07/07/1973 |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
w/e |
28/07/1973 |
TO |
on |
13/11/1986 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
D1825 |
w/e |
02/06/1973 |
CE |
Crewe Diesel |
w/e |
11/08/1973 |
TO |
w/e |
08/06/1974 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
D1826 |
w/e |
02/06/1973 |
CE |
Crewe Diesel |
w/e |
11/08/1973 |
TO |
w/e |
09/03/1974 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
D1827 |
w/e |
02/06/1973 |
CE |
Crewe Diesel |
w/e |
11/08/1973 |
TO |
w/e |
09/03/1974 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5238 |
2w/e |
10/06/1972 |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
w/e |
11/08/1973 |
TO |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5281 |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
w/e |
25/08/1973 |
TO |
on |
06/12/1982 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5282 |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
w/e |
25/08/1973 |
TO |
on |
19/12/1982 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
D8004 |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
64B |
Haymarket |
w/e |
01/09/1973 |
TO |
w/e |
09/08/1975 |
|
To Store |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
D8041 |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
65A |
Eastfield |
w/e |
01/09/1973 |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
D8082 |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
65A |
Eastfield |
w/e |
01/09/1973 |
TO |
on |
23/07/1993 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
D8084 |
4w/e |
31/10/1970 |
65A |
Eastfield |
w/e |
01/09/1973 |
TO |
m/e |
01/1977 |
TI |
Tinsley |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5283 |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
w/e |
08/09/1973 |
TO |
on |
28/08/1983 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5284 |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
w/e |
08/09/1973 |
TO |
on |
19/12/1982 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7614 |
w/e |
10/02/1973 |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
w/e |
08/09/1973 |
TO |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
BS |
Bescot |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D37 |
w/e |
09/09/1972 |
D01 |
London Division |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
TO |
w/e |
17/11/1973 |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D38 |
w/e |
09/09/1972 |
D01 |
London Division |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
TO |
w/e |
12/01/1974 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45109 |
w/e |
28/07/1973 |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
TO |
on |
27/01/1986 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D137 |
w/e |
09/09/1972 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
TO |
w/e |
16/03/1974 |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3025 |
w/e |
14/02/1970 |
16F |
Burton |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
TO |
on |
17/07/1983 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5187 |
w/e |
09/09/1972 |
D01 |
London Division |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
TO |
m/e |
10/1976 |
ED |
Eastfield |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5196 |
w/e |
22/07/1972 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
TO |
2w/e |
07/08/1976 |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5287 |
w/e |
17/01/1970 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
TO |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
WN |
Willesden |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
D1828 |
w/e |
02/06/1973 |
CE |
Crewe Diesel |
w/e |
13/10/1973 |
TO |
w/e |
09/02/1974 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5285 |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
w/e |
20/10/1973 |
TO |
on |
16/01/1983 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D76 |
w/e |
26/05/1973 |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
w/e |
27/10/1973 |
TO |
w/e |
03/11/1973 |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45107 |
w/e |
27/10/1973 |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
w/e |
03/11/1973 |
TO |
on |
27/07/1988 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7606 |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
WN |
Willesden |
w/e |
03/11/1973 |
TO |
w/e |
09/03/1974 |
BS |
Bescot |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7607 |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
WN |
Willesden |
w/e |
03/11/1973 |
TO |
w/e |
09/03/1974 |
BS |
Bescot |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
D1824 |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
w/e |
10/11/1973 |
TO |
on |
29/06/1992 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
D1829 |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
CE |
Crewe Diesel |
w/e |
10/11/1973 |
TO |
w/e |
09/02/1974 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
D8000 |
4w/e |
21/04/1973 |
64B |
Haymarket |
w/e |
10/11/1973 |
TO |
w/e |
09/08/1975 |
|
To Store |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
D8090 |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
65A |
Eastfield |
w/e |
10/11/1973 |
TO |
on |
06/07/1993 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
D8097 |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
65A |
Eastfield |
w/e |
10/11/1973 |
TO |
on |
11/09/1989 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
D8113 |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
65A |
Eastfield |
w/e |
10/11/1973 |
TO |
on |
13/09/1991 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D34 |
w/e |
15/01/1966 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
w/e |
17/11/1973 |
TO |
on |
07/05/1987 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D18 |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
w/e |
08/12/1973 |
TO |
on |
19/11/1987 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3023 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
1E |
Bletchley |
w/e |
22/12/1973 |
TO |
w/e |
09/11/1974 |
NH |
Newton Heath |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5291 |
w/e |
10/02/1973 |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
w/e |
12/01/1974 |
TO |
w/e |
07/09/1974 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D28 |
w/e |
08/12/1962 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
w/e |
02/02/1974 |
TO |
on |
22/01/1988 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
D5694 |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
40B |
Immingham |
w/e |
23/02/1974 |
TO |
w/e |
09/03/1974 |
IM |
Immingham |
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
D6835 |
w/e |
18/12/1971 |
41A |
Tinsley |
w/e |
23/02/1974 |
TO |
w/e |
09/03/1974 |
TI |
Tinsley |
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
37140 |
w/e |
09/02/1974 |
TI |
Tinsley |
w/e |
23/02/1974 |
TO |
w/e |
09/03/1974 |
TI |
Tinsley |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25136 |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
w/e |
09/03/1974 |
TO |
on |
27/03/1983 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D32 |
w/e |
09/09/1972 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
w/e |
16/03/1974 |
TO |
on |
27/04/1987 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45123 |
w/e |
06/01/1973 |
D01 |
London Division |
w/e |
27/04/1974 |
TO |
on |
22/07/1987 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47380 |
4w/e |
06/10/1973 |
TI |
Tinsley |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
TO |
w/e |
25/05/1974 |
TI |
Tinsley |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47381 |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
41A |
Tinsley |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
TO |
on |
05/06/1992 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25264 |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
BS |
Bescot |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
TO |
m/e |
01/1977 |
TO |
Toton |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D22 |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
w/e |
18/05/1974 |
TO |
on |
11/05/1987 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25214 |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
18/05/1974 |
TO |
4w/e |
17/04/1976 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47315 |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
41A |
Tinsley |
w/e |
25/05/1974 |
TO |
m/e |
11/1981 |
TO |
Toton |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D63 |
w/e |
27/04/1974 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
08/06/1974 |
TO |
w/e |
20/07/1974 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25270 |
w/e |
10/11/1973 |
BS |
Bescot |
w/e |
08/06/1974 |
TO |
on |
28/11/1982 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45133 |
w/e |
09/09/1972 |
D01 |
London Division |
w/e |
20/07/1974 |
TO |
on |
10/05/1987 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08617 |
w/e |
26/02/1972 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
w/e |
07/09/1974 |
TO |
on |
16/08/1981 |
98Su |
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45137 |
2w/e |
07/10/1972 |
D01 |
London Division |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
TO |
on |
15/06/1987 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08856 |
w/e |
22/06/1974 |
DY |
Derby |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25185 |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
WN |
Willesden |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
TO |
2w/e |
08/03/1975 |
WN |
Willesden |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20018 |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
64B |
Haymarket |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
TO |
4w/e |
17/04/1976 |
|
To Store |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D41 |
w/e |
09/09/1972 |
D01 |
London Division |
w/e |
09/11/1974 |
TO |
on |
04/01/1985 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D55 |
2w/e |
07/10/1972 |
D01 |
London Division |
w/e |
09/11/1974 |
TO |
on |
21/12/1987 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D62 |
w/e |
12/01/1974 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
09/11/1974 |
TO |
on |
07/05/1987 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
D66 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
09/11/1974 |
TO |
on |
07/04/1987 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08703 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
NH |
Newton Heath |
w/e |
09/11/1974 |
TO |
w/e |
19/06/1976 |
AN |
Allerton |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47434 |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
BS |
Bescot |
w/e |
07/12/1974 |
TO |
w/e |
08/03/1975 |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25093 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
w/e |
08/02/1975 |
TO |
2w/e |
22/02/1975 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25094 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
w/e |
08/02/1975 |
TO |
2w/e |
22/02/1975 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25190 |
w/e |
09/11/1974 |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
w/e |
08/02/1975 |
TO |
2w/e |
08/03/1975 |
WN |
Willesden |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25206 |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
BS |
Bescot |
2w/e |
08/03/1975 |
TO |
m/e |
07/1977 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25207 |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
BS |
Bescot |
2w/e |
08/03/1975 |
TO |
m/e |
07/1977 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45049 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
TO |
4w/e |
08/11/1975 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47355 |
w/e |
13/10/1973 |
CD |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
TO |
m/e |
11/1978 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47356 |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
CE |
Crewe Diesel |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
TO |
m/e |
11/1978 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47357 |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
CE |
Crewe Diesel |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
TO |
on |
11/05/2001 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08858 |
w/e |
16/11/1974 |
DY |
Derby |
2w/e |
31/05/1975 |
TO |
on |
01/10/1994 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47306 |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
IM |
Immingham |
w/e |
07/06/1975 |
TO |
on |
04/10/1987 |
TI |
Tinsley |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25137 |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
WN |
Willesden |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
TO |
w/e |
28/02/1976 |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25302 |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
WN |
Willesden |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
TO |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25092 |
3w/e |
12/07/1975 |
ED |
Eastfield |
w/e |
02/08/1975 |
TO |
2w/e |
23/08/1975 |
LA |
Laira |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25196 |
w/e |
07/09/1974 |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
w/e |
09/08/1975 |
TO |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25205 |
w/e |
10/08/1974 |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
w/e |
09/08/1975 |
TO |
3w/e |
20/11/1977 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08894 |
w/e |
22/03/1975 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
2w/e |
06/09/1975 |
TO |
on |
28/02/2007 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45033 |
w/e |
09/11/1974 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
TO |
2w/e |
12/03/1978 |
TO |
Toton |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45056 |
w/e |
09/11/1974 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
TO |
m/e |
04/1977 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45074 |
w/e |
09/11/1974 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
TO |
on |
04/09/1985 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47332 |
w/e |
12/01/1974 |
BS |
Bescot |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
TO |
4w/e |
08/11/1975 |
BS |
Bescot |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47359 |
2w/e |
30/11/1974 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
TO |
m/e |
10/1976 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47364 |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
CE |
Crewe Diesel |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
TO |
on |
01/12/1998 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47365 |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
CE |
Crewe Diesel |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
TO |
on |
04/09/1988 |
SF |
Stratford |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47366 |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
TO |
on |
15/05/1988 |
SF |
Stratford |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47369 |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
TO |
2w/e |
10/07/1976 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25047 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
TO |
2w/e |
07/08/1976 |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25049 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
TO |
2w/e |
10/07/1976 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25066 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D01 |
London Division |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
TO |
on |
01/05/1977 |
HA |
Haymarket |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25193 |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
TO |
4w/e |
17/04/1976 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25239 |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
4w/e |
08/11/1975 |
TO |
5w/e |
03/07/1976 |
ED |
Eastfield |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20050 |
w/e |
09/08/1975 |
98S |
|
4w/e |
08/11/1975 |
TO |
on |
14/12/1980 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20001 |
w/e |
09/08/1975 |
98S |
|
4w/e |
08/11/1975 |
TO |
m/e |
11/1978 |
TI |
Tinsley |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20004 |
w/e |
09/08/1975 |
98S |
|
4w/e |
08/11/1975 |
TO |
m/e |
11/1978 |
TI |
Tinsley |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20005 |
w/e |
09/08/1975 |
98S |
|
4w/e |
08/11/1975 |
TO |
m/e |
11/1978 |
TI |
Tinsley |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20006 |
w/e |
09/08/1975 |
98S |
|
4w/e |
08/11/1975 |
TO |
on |
04/10/1981 |
98Ss |
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20016 |
4w/e |
08/11/1975 |
98S |
|
4w/e |
08/11/1975 |
TO |
on |
04/10/1981 |
98Ss |
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25303 |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
LO |
Longsight |
2w/e |
10/01/1976 |
TO |
on |
19/02/1986 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25158 |
4w/e |
10/05/1975 |
BR |
Bristol Bath Road |
2w/e |
07/02/1976 |
TO |
w/e |
28/02/1976 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25159 |
4w/e |
10/05/1975 |
BR |
Bristol Bath Road |
2w/e |
07/02/1976 |
TO |
w/e |
28/02/1976 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47352 |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
w/e |
28/02/1976 |
TO |
m/e |
10/1976 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47353 |
2w/e |
10/01/1976 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
w/e |
28/02/1976 |
TO |
m/e |
10/1976 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
Diesel |
Peak |
1Co-Co1 |
44010 |
2w/e |
07/02/1976 |
98S |
|
4w/e |
17/04/1976 |
TO |
on |
12/05/1977 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20008 |
4w/e |
08/11/1975 |
98S |
|
4w/e |
17/04/1976 |
TO |
m/e |
11/1978 |
TI |
Tinsley |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45023 |
2w/e |
07/10/1972 |
D01 |
London Division |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
TO |
on |
12/09/1984 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45072 |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
TO |
on |
26/04/1985 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25078 |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
HA |
Haymarket |
w/e |
15/05/1976 |
TO |
m/e |
10/1976 |
ED |
Eastfield |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25029 |
4w/e |
25/10/1975 |
HA |
Haymarket |
4w/e |
12/06/1976 |
TO |
on |
07/08/1977 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45060 |
w/e |
09/11/1974 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
2w/e |
10/07/1976 |
TO |
on |
08/12/1985 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25107 |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
BS |
Bescot |
2w/e |
07/08/1976 |
TO |
on |
03/05/1981 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25280 |
4w/e |
08/11/1975 |
BS |
Bescot |
2w/e |
07/08/1976 |
TO |
on |
01/11/1981 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20013 |
4w/e |
08/11/1975 |
98S |
|
2w/e |
07/08/1976 |
TO |
on |
04/10/1981 |
98Ss |
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08757 |
w/e |
22/01/1972 |
2F |
Bescot |
2w/e |
21/08/1976 |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47354 |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
m/e |
10/1976 |
TO |
m/e |
11/1978 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47187 |
w/e |
23/11/1968 |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
m/e |
10/1976 |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47188 |
w/e |
23/11/1968 |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
m/e |
10/1976 |
TO |
m/e |
07/1981 |
TO |
Toton |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47189 |
w/e |
23/11/1968 |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
m/e |
10/1976 |
TO |
m/e |
07/1981 |
TO |
Toton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25094 |
6w/e |
04/09/1976 |
ED |
Eastfield |
m/e |
10/1976 |
TO |
m/e |
07/1977 |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25096 |
4w/e |
29/05/1976 |
ED |
Eastfield |
m/e |
10/1976 |
TO |
m/e |
10/1977 |
ED |
Eastfield |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25189 |
w/e |
28/02/1976 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
m/e |
10/1976 |
TO |
m/e |
03/1977 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25213 |
3w/e |
12/07/1975 |
ED |
Eastfield |
m/e |
10/1976 |
TO |
5w/e |
26/02/1978 |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20037 |
2w/e |
07/08/1976 |
98S |
|
m/e |
10/1976 |
TO |
on |
04/10/1981 |
98Ss |
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45058 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
w/e |
11/12/1976 |
TO |
m/e |
01/1977 |
TO |
Toton |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45058 |
w/e |
11/12/1976 |
TO |
Toton |
m/e |
01/1977 |
TO |
on |
03/09/1987 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25092 |
m/e |
10/1976 |
LO |
Longsight |
m/e |
01/1977 |
TO |
m/e |
04/1977 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25264 |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
TO |
Toton |
m/e |
01/1977 |
TO |
on |
14/12/1980 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20068 |
m/e |
01/1977 |
TI |
Tinsley |
m/e |
02/1977 |
TO |
m/e |
10/1981 |
TO |
Toton |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20084 |
m/e |
01/1977 |
IM |
Immingham |
m/e |
02/1977 |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20142 |
m/e |
01/1977 |
TI |
Tinsley |
m/e |
02/1977 |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20143 |
m/e |
01/1977 |
TI |
Tinsley |
m/e |
02/1977 |
TO |
on |
10/01/1992 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20148 |
m/e |
01/1977 |
TI |
Tinsley |
m/e |
02/1977 |
TO |
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
Toton |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20159 |
m/e |
01/1977 |
IM |
Immingham |
m/e |
02/1977 |
TO |
on |
13/09/1991 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25041 |
w/e |
28/02/1976 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
m/e |
05/1977 |
TO |
m/e |
07/1977 |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
56 |
Co-Co |
56031 |
|
|
|
|
on |
24/05/1977 (New) |
TO |
on |
04/10/1987 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45056 |
m/e |
04/1977 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
m/e |
06/1977 |
TO |
on |
29/11/1985 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47359 |
m/e |
10/1976 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
m/e |
06/1977 |
TO |
on |
15/05/1988 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47369 |
m/e |
10/1976 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
m/e |
06/1977 |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25249 |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
LO |
Longsight |
m/e |
07/1977 |
TO |
on |
29/01/1987 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25257 |
w/e |
09/11/1974 |
LO |
Longsight |
m/e |
07/1977 |
TO |
on |
02/12/1985 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25320 |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
m/e |
07/1977 |
TO |
on |
11/12/1983 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25321 |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
m/e |
07/1977 |
TO |
m/e |
11/1981 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25152 |
w/e |
28/02/1976 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
m/e |
09/1977 |
TO |
on |
26/01/1984 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47281 |
w/e |
27/09/1969 |
41A |
Tinsley |
m/e |
10/1977 |
TO |
on |
17/12/1998 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25101 |
m/e |
10/1976 |
BS |
Bescot |
m/e |
10/1977 |
TO |
m/e |
11/1981 |
BS |
Bescot |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25111 |
m/e |
04/1977 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
m/e |
10/1977 |
TO |
m/e |
03/1978 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25115 |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
m/e |
10/1977 |
TO |
m/e |
11/1981 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25173 |
m/e |
04/1977 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
m/e |
10/1977 |
TO |
m/e |
03/1978 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25193 |
m/e |
04/1977 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
m/e |
10/1977 |
TO |
on |
12/11/1984 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25302 |
m/e |
03/1977 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
m/e |
10/1977 |
TO |
on |
14/06/1985 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25137 |
w/e |
28/02/1976 |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
3w/e |
20/11/1977 |
TO |
on |
02/11/1980 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25308 |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
3w/e |
20/11/1977 |
TO |
on |
16/10/1983 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25309 |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
3w/e |
20/11/1977 |
TO |
on |
01/09/1986 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25310 |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
3w/e |
20/11/1977 |
TO |
m/e |
04/1979 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25311 |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
3w/e |
20/11/1977 |
TO |
m/e |
31/10/1979 |
TO |
Toton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25312 |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
3w/e |
20/11/1977 |
TO |
m/e |
31/10/1979 |
TO |
Toton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25313 |
w/e |
08/05/1971 |
D01 |
London Division |
3w/e |
20/11/1977 |
TO |
m/e |
02/1978 |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47204 |
m/e |
10/1976 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
5w/e |
26/02/1978 |
TO |
on |
04/10/1987 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47205 |
w/e |
28/02/1976 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
5w/e |
26/02/1978 |
TO |
on |
04/10/1987 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25301 |
w/e |
11/12/1976 |
ED |
Eastfield |
5w/e |
26/02/1978 |
TO |
m/e |
07/1981 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45033 |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
TO |
Toton |
2w/e |
12/03/1978 |
TO |
m/e |
07/1981 |
TO |
Toton |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45042 |
2w/e |
07/10/1972 |
D01 |
London Division |
2w/e |
12/03/1978 |
TO |
on |
29/04/1985 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25279 |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
m/e |
11/1978 |
TO |
on |
18/03/1987 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47480 |
w/e |
16/02/1974 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
m/e |
31/10/1979 |
TO |
on |
04/10/1987 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25310 |
m/e |
04/1979 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
m/e |
31/10/1979 |
TO |
on |
10/10/1982 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25311 |
3w/e |
20/11/1977 |
TO |
Toton |
m/e |
31/10/1979 |
TO |
on |
19/03/1986 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25312 |
3w/e |
20/11/1977 |
TO |
Toton |
m/e |
31/10/1979 |
TO |
on |
13/06/1982 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25066 |
on |
01/05/1977 |
HA |
Haymarket |
on |
14/12/1980 |
TO |
on |
21/06/1981 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45033 |
2w/e |
12/03/1978 |
TO |
Toton |
m/e |
07/1981 |
TO |
on |
04/02/1988 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45037 |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
CD |
Cricklewood East |
m/e |
07/1981 |
TO |
on |
27/07/1988 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47182 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
m/e |
07/1981 |
TO |
on |
01/11/2001 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47188 |
m/e |
10/1976 |
TO |
Toton |
m/e |
07/1981 |
TO |
on |
31/08/2005 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47189 |
m/e |
10/1976 |
TO |
Toton |
m/e |
07/1981 |
TO |
on |
17/05/1988 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25190 |
m/e |
06/1977 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
m/e |
09/1981 |
TO |
on |
28/01/1987 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47557 |
2w/e |
11/12/1976 |
LA |
Laira |
on |
06/09/1981 |
TO |
on |
01/11/1981 |
GD |
Gateshead |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47549 |
w/e |
08/03/1975 |
YK |
York (North) |
on |
06/09/1981 |
TO |
on |
01/11/1981 |
SF |
Stratford |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20068 |
m/e |
02/1977 |
TO |
Toton |
m/e |
10/1981 |
TO |
on |
04/10/1981 |
98Ss |
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20088 |
w/e |
08/11/1969 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
m/e |
10/1981 |
TO |
on |
04/10/1981 |
98Ss |
|
Diesel |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31149 |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
40B |
Immingham |
on |
18/10/1981 |
TO |
on |
04/10/1987 |
SF |
Stratford |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47433 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
YK |
York (North) |
m/e |
11/1981 |
TO |
on |
04/10/1987 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47315 |
w/e |
25/05/1974 |
TO |
Toton |
m/e |
11/1981 |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
47320 |
w/e |
11/07/1970 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
m/e |
11/1981 |
TO |
on |
10/08/1993 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25044 |
m/e |
10/1976 |
ED |
Eastfield |
m/e |
11/1981 |
TO |
m/e |
11/1981 |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25315 |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
m/e |
11/1981 |
TO |
on |
01/03/1987 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20016 |
on |
04/10/1981 |
98Ss |
|
on |
01/11/1981 |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20071 |
on |
04/10/1981 |
98Ss |
|
on |
01/11/1981 |
TO |
on |
23/07/1993 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20087 |
on |
04/10/1981 |
98Ss |
|
on |
01/11/1981 |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20176 |
on |
04/10/1981 |
98Ss |
|
on |
01/11/1981 |
TO |
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
Toton |
Diesel |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31326 |
on |
01/07/1981 |
98D |
|
on |
07/01/1982 |
TO |
on |
01/09/1991 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
97202 |
on |
06/12/1982 |
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/10/1983 (R) |
TO |
on |
01/01/1984 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
58 |
Co-Co |
58014 |
|
|
|
|
on |
05/04/1984 (New) |
TO |
on |
17/11/2000 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20054 |
2w/e |
11/01/1975 |
TI |
Tinsley |
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
on |
11/09/1989 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20063 |
on |
20/10/1981 |
98Ss |
|
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
on |
01/05/1991 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20139 |
m/e |
10/1981 |
98Su |
|
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
on |
01/05/1991 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20145 |
w/e |
08/03/1975 |
TI |
Tinsley |
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
on |
19/05/1991 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20146 |
4w/e |
06/03/1976 |
ED |
Eastfield |
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
on |
15/05/1988 |
IM |
Immingham |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20148 |
m/e |
02/1977 |
TO |
Toton |
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
on |
15/11/1991 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20176 |
on |
01/11/1981 |
TO |
Toton |
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
on |
21/10/1991 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20189 |
on |
21/01/1967 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division (New) |
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
on |
01/09/1990 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
56 |
Co-Co |
56112 |
|
|
|
|
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
on |
01/2003 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
56 |
Co-Co |
56113 |
|
|
|
|
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
56 |
Co-Co |
56114 |
|
|
|
|
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
on |
09/2008 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
56 |
Co-Co |
56115 |
|
|
|
|
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
56 |
Co-Co |
56116 |
|
|
|
|
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
on |
02/2003 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
56 |
Co-Co |
56117 |
|
|
|
|
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
56 |
Co-Co |
56118 |
|
|
|
|
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
on |
01/06/2006 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
56 |
Co-Co |
56119 |
|
|
|
|
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
on |
03/2004 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
56 |
Co-Co |
56120 |
|
|
|
|
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
on |
12/2003 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
56 |
Co-Co |
56121 |
|
|
|
|
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
on |
06/2005 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
56 |
Co-Co |
56122 |
|
|
|
|
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
on |
09/10/1992 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
56 |
Co-Co |
56123 |
|
|
|
|
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
on |
08/2003 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
56 |
Co-Co |
56124 |
|
|
|
|
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
on |
04/2009 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
56 |
Co-Co |
56125 |
|
|
|
|
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
56 |
Co-Co |
56126 |
|
|
|
|
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
on |
04/05/2001 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
56 |
Co-Co |
56127 |
|
|
|
|
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
on |
02/2002 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
56 |
Co-Co |
56128 |
|
|
|
|
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
on |
08/2005 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
56 |
Co-Co |
56129 |
|
|
|
|
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
on |
07/2003 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
56 |
Co-Co |
56130 |
|
|
|
|
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
on |
04/2004 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
56 |
Co-Co |
56131 |
on |
29/04/1984 |
GD |
Gateshead (New) |
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
on |
08/2005 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
56 |
Co-Co |
56132 |
on |
10/06/1984 |
GD |
Gateshead (New) |
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
on |
06/2005 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
56 |
Co-Co |
56133 |
|
|
|
|
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
on |
02/2004 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
56 |
Co-Co |
56134 |
|
|
|
|
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
on |
07/2002 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
56 |
Co-Co |
56135 |
|
|
|
|
on |
04/10/1987 |
TO |
on |
07/2003 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20218 |
4w/e |
27/01/1973 |
64B |
Haymarket |
on |
15/05/1988 |
TO |
on |
04/10/1989 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20219 |
4w/e |
27/01/1973 |
64B |
Haymarket |
on |
15/05/1988 |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20224 |
5w/e |
01/11/1969 |
64B |
Haymarket |
on |
15/05/1988 |
TO |
on |
26/01/1990 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20088 |
on |
01/11/1981 |
98Su |
|
on |
22/05/1988 |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
56 |
Co-Co |
56075 |
on |
05/06/1988 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
on |
04/09/1988 |
TO |
on |
04/2004 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60048 |
|
|
|
|
on |
03/04/1991 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60006 |
|
|
|
|
on |
23/04/1991 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60035 |
|
|
|
|
on |
23/04/1991 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60053 |
|
|
|
|
on |
25/04/1991 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60042 |
|
|
|
|
on |
29/05/1991 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60057 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/06/1991 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60055 |
|
|
|
|
on |
06/06/1991 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60061 |
|
|
|
|
on |
06/06/1991 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60041 |
|
|
|
|
on |
20/06/1991 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60043 |
|
|
|
|
on |
26/06/1991 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60060 |
|
|
|
|
on |
28/06/1991 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60044 |
|
|
|
|
on |
03/07/1991 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60069 |
|
|
|
|
on |
02/09/1991 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60071 |
|
|
|
|
on |
19/09/1991 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60011 |
|
|
|
|
on |
11/10/1991 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60068 |
|
|
|
|
on |
16/10/1991 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60072 |
|
|
|
|
on |
21/10/1991 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60070 |
|
|
|
|
on |
28/10/1991 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60004 |
on |
08/06/1991 |
ZQ |
(New) |
on |
03/11/1991 |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60012 |
|
|
|
|
on |
22/11/1991 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60073 |
|
|
|
|
on |
22/11/1991 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60076 |
|
|
|
|
on |
22/11/1991 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60077 |
|
|
|
|
on |
22/11/1991 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60074 |
|
|
|
|
on |
25/11/1991 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60075 |
|
|
|
|
on |
04/12/1991 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60087 |
|
|
|
|
on |
18/12/1991 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60099 |
|
|
|
|
on |
18/01/1992 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60088 |
|
|
|
|
on |
20/01/1992 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60092 |
|
|
|
|
on |
31/01/1992 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60090 |
|
|
|
|
on |
03/02/1992 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60091 |
|
|
|
|
on |
03/02/1992 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60083 |
|
|
|
|
on |
27/03/1992 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
60100 |
|
|
|
|
on |
09/12/1992 (New) |
TO |
|
|
|
|